Klausner Technologies Inc v. Verizon Wireless et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc. alleged that Defendants infringed U.S. Patent Nos. 5,572,576 and 5,283,818 entitled "Telephone Answering Device Linking Displayed Data with Recorded Audio Message."

Plaintiff: Klausner Technologies Inc
Defendant: Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc, Citrix Systems, Inc., Comverse, Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., Embarq Communications Inc, Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., PhoneFusion, Inc and RingCentral, Inc
Case Number: 6:2008cv00341
Filed: August 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Dismiss. All claims or causes of action asserted in this suit between pltf and deft Embarq Communications Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09 (mll, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss Embarq Communiations, Inc.) by Klausner Technologies Inc, Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 7-20-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/14/09. cc:attys 7-14-09 (mll, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 141 Tenth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE granting 139 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Comverse, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/24/2009. (kls, )
June 23, 2009 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion to Dismiss Comverse, Inc. Without Prejudice) by Klausner Technologies Inc, Comverse, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Defendant Embarq Communications, Inc.'s Ninth Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is July 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/22/2009. (kls, )
June 19, 2009 Filing 137 Ninth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 135 Eighth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is June 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/2009. (gsg)
May 19, 2009 Filing 135 Eighth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Dismiss. All claims or causes of action asserted in this suit between pltf and deft RingCentral Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/09. cc:attys 4-23-09(mll, )
April 22, 2009 Filing 133 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion to Dismiss RingCentral, Inc.) by RingCentral, Inc, Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 5-20-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/21/09. cc:attys 4-21-09(mll, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Seventh Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Embarq's 7th Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Nelson, Mark)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 128 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing with prejudice party deft Citrix Systems, Inc. However, if Citrix is sued for infringement of the patents-in-suit, Citrix may challenge infringement as well as the scope, ownership, inventorship, validity and unenforceability of the patents. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/16/09. cc:attys 3-16-09 (mll, )
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing with prejudice party defts Google Inc and GrandCentral Communications, Inc. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/16/09. cc:attys 3-16-09(mll, )
March 12, 2009 Filing 128 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc. and Defendant Citrix Systems, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss) by Klausner Technologies Inc, Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2009 Filing 127 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 126, Agreed Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED IN TYLER DIVISION WITH PROPOSED ORDER.*** (mjc, )
March 5, 2009 Filing 126 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/6/2009 (mjc, ).
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 4-20-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/02/09. cc:attys 3-2-09 (mll, )
February 27, 2009 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sixth Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/09. cc:attys 2-24-09(mll, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Comverse, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 3-13-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/13/09. cc:attys 2-13-09 (mll, )
February 12, 2009 Filing 120 Ninth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
February 5, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Comverse, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 3-4-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/09. cc:attys 2-3-09 (mll, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 117 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 116 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond, 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deaver, Darin)
February 2, 2009 Filing 116 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 117 FOR CORRECT PLEADING. Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deaver, Darin) Modified on 2/3/2009 (mll, ).
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's complaint up to and including 2-13-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/09. cc:attys 1-30-09 (mll, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 114 Eighth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 1-31-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/09. cc:attys 1-21-09 (mll, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 112 NOTICE by Comverse, Inc. Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric)
January 20, 2009 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deaver, Darin)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 1-30-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/16/09. cc:attys 1-16-09 (mll, )
January 15, 2009 Filing 109 ANSWER to 105 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc.'s Reply to RingCentral, Inc.'s Counterclaim) by Klausner Technologies Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 15, 2009 Filing 108 Seventh MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 1-16-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/05/09. cc:attys 1-05-09 (mll, )
January 2, 2009 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RingCentral, Inc (Stevens, Scott)
January 2, 2009 Filing 105 Defendant RingCentral, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies Inc by RingCentral, Inc.(Stevens, Scott)
December 30, 2008 Filing 104 Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 1-17-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/08. cc:attys 12-17-08 (mll, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, and extending time to answer to 1-02-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/08. cc:attys 12-17-08 (mll, )
December 16, 2008 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Third) by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 98 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix's response is due by 12/31/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/08. (mjc )
December 15, 2008 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by RingCentral, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
December 12, 2008 Filing 98 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
December 10, 2008 Filing 97 ANSWER to 93 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of Google, Inc.) by Klausner Technologies Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2008 Filing 96 ANSWER to 91 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of GrandCentral Communications, Inc.) by Klausner Technologies Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Dismiss. This civil action is dismissed with prejudice as between pltf and deft LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. No costs or fees are awarded to either party, such that each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/08. cc:attys 12-03-08(mll, )
December 3, 2008 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2008 Filing 93 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies Inc by Google, Inc..(Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2008 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GrandCentral Communications, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for GrandCentral Communications, Inc. (Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2008 Filing 91 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies Inc by GrandCentral Communications, Inc.(Patton, Nicholas)
December 3, 2008 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Klausner Technologies Inc (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 3, 2008 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Klausner Technologies Inc (Bunt, Robert)
December 2, 2008 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion to Dismiss regarding Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.) by LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss. This civil action is dismissed without prejudice, as between pltf and deft Cox Communications, Inc. No costs or fees are to be awarded to either party, such that each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/08. cc:attys 12-02-08(mll, )
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 12-15-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/08. cc:attys 12-02-08 (mll, )
November 26, 2008 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice regarding Defendant Cox Communications, Inc.) by Klausner Technologies Inc, Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2008 Filing 84 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 80 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to 12/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 75 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cox Communications, Inc. to 12/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 12-17-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/08. cc:attys 11-17-08 (mll, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 80 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc..( Cammack, Decker)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Dismiss. This civil action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice and on merits, as between pltf Klausner Technologies, Inc., and defts Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, and Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/08. cc:attys 11-17-08 (mll, )
November 14, 2008 Filing 79 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Second Unopposed Motion for Extension)(Nelson, Mark)
November 14, 2008 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Comverse, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 12-01-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/08. cc:attys 11-17-08 (mll, )
November 13, 2008 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies Inc, Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2008 Filing 76 RESPONSE to 66 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc.'s Reply to Counterclaims of Comverse, Inc.) by Klausner Technologies Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2008 Filing 75 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cox Communications, Inc..( Pierce, Jon)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for deft RingCentral, Inc to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint is extended to 12-17-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/08. cc:attys 11-12-08 (mll, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, and pltf to file its response to Verizon defts' Motion to Transfer. The time to answer and respond to the Motion to Transfer is extended to 11-14-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/08. cc:attys 11-12-08 (mll, )
November 12, 2008 Filing 72 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 11, 2008 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by RingCentral, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
November 10, 2008 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint and Plaintiff to File Its Response to the Verizon Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule Deadlines by Klausner Technologies Inc, Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 31, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 12/3/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(gsg)
October 31, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GrandCentral Communications, Inc to 12/3/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(gsg)
October 31, 2008 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Patton, Nicholas)
October 31, 2008 Filing 68 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GrandCentral Communications, Inc.( Patton, Nicholas)
October 30, 2008 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comverse, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Comverse Technology, Inc. for Comverse, Inc.. (Booth, Daniel)
October 30, 2008 Filing 66 Comverse, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies Inc by Comverse, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Booth, Daniel)
October 29, 2008 Filing 65 Return of Service Executed as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. on 8/29/2008, by personal service. (mll, )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 61 Joint Motion to Extend of Time for Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc. to file Its Response to the Verizon Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule. It is therefore ORDERED that Klauser Technologies, Inc. shall have through November 10, 2008 to respond to the Verizon Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/2008. (kls, )
October 28, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Verizon Wireless answer due 11/10/2008; Verizon Data Services LLC answer due 11/10/2008; Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc answer due 11/10/2008. (mjc )
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD***ORDER granting 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to re 1 Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Cello Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services, LLC and Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. shall have through November 10, 2008 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/2008. (kls, ) Modified on 10/28/2008 (mjc ).
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Deadline is extended to 11/10/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/08. (mjc )
October 27, 2008 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule by Klausner Technologies Inc, Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 27, 2008 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Embarq to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is 11-17-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/08. cc:attys 10-20-08 (mll, )
October 17, 2008 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Embarq Communications Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Embarq Communications' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Nelson, Mark)
October 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 57 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 11/3/2008. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 56 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GrandCentral Communications, Inc to 11/3/2008. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 55 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to 11/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 16, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 48 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Wireless to 10/27/2008. 12 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 16, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 43 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cox Communications, Inc. to 11/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 16, 2008 Filing 57 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Patton, Nicholas)
October 16, 2008 Filing 56 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GrandCentral Communications, Inc.( Truelove, Justin)
October 16, 2008 Filing 55 Defendant LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ( Cammack, Decker)
October 16, 2008 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Google, Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (Truelove, Justin)
October 16, 2008 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas H Patton on behalf of GrandCentral Communications, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (Patton, Nicholas)
October 15, 2008 Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W Thornburgh for Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (mll, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian Wacter for Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (mll, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Citrix is granted an additional extension of time to respond to pltf's Complaint up to and including 11-17-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. cc:attys 10-15-08 (mll, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc.( Jones, Michael)
October 14, 2008 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, DEFENDANT CITRIX SYSTEMS, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Citrix Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing with prejudice deft PhoneFusion, Inc. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. cc:attys 10-14-08 (mll, )
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule; Response due by 10/27/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. cc:attys 10-14-08 (mll, )
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The deadline for deft RingCentral, Inc to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint is extended to 11-17-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/08. cc:attys 10-14-08 (mll, )
October 14, 2008 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cox Communications, Inc..( Pierce, Jon)
October 14, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 41 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comverse, Inc. to 10/30/2008. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 13, 2008 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by PhoneFusion, Inc, Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2008 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comverse, Inc..( Booth, Daniel)
October 10, 2008 Filing 40 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule (Agreed Second Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc. to File its Response to the Verizon Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule) by Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2008 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by RingCentral, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
October 2, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of RingCentral, Inc (Stevens, Scott)
September 19, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 37 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GrandCentral Communications, Inc to 10/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 17, 2008 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GrandCentral Communications, Inc.( Truelove, Justin)
September 17, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 36 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to 10/18/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 17, 2008 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc..( Cammack, Decker)
September 16, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 34 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RingCentral, Inc to 10/18/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 16, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 32 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Wireless (Cellco Partnership) to 10/15/2008. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 16, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 25 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PhoneFusion, Inc to 10/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule. Responses due by 10/15/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/08. cc:attys 9-15-08 (mll, )
September 15, 2008 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RingCentral, Inc.( Basch, Melissa)
September 12, 2008 Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa l Basch for RingCentral, Inc (RECEIPT 6-1-15154). (rml, )
September 12, 2008 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc.( Jones, Michael)
September 12, 2008 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Klausner Technologies, Inc. to File its Response to The Verizon Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule) by Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Dovel on behalf of Klausner Technologies Inc (Dovel, Gregory)
September 11, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christin K Cho on behalf of Klausner Technologies Inc (Cho, Christin)
September 11, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin Wilson Deaver on behalf of Embarq Communications Inc (Deaver, Darin)
September 11, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Aaron Luner on behalf of Klausner Technologies Inc (Luner, Sean)
September 11, 2008 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PhoneFusion, Inc.( Marlowe, Ronald)
September 11, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Jack Marlowe on behalf of PhoneFusion, Inc (Marlowe, Ronald)
September 10, 2008 Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. RingCentral, Inc served on 8/29/2008, answer due 9/18/2008. (kls, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that pltf file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all defts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/08. cc:pltf 9-10-08(mll, )
September 10, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 22 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comverse, Inc. to 10/16/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 10, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 21 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cox Communications, Inc. to 10/16/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 10, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Embarq Communications Inc to 10/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 9, 2008 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comverse, Inc..( McClellan, Douglas)
September 9, 2008 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cox Communications, Inc..( Pierce, Jon)
September 8, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Nelson on behalf of Embarq Communications Inc (Nelson, Mark)
September 8, 2008 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Embarq Communications Inc.( Nelson, Mark)
September 8, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 8 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Citrix Systems, Inc. to 10/16/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc )
September 8, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 10/17/2008. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc )
September 4, 2008 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Citrix Systems, Inc..(McNabnay,Neil)
September 3, 2008 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. PhoneFusion, Inc served on 8/28/2008, answer due 9/17/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. GrandCentral Communications, Inc served on 8/28/2008, answer due 9/17/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Embarq Communications Inc served on 8/28/2008, answer due 9/17/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Cox Communications, Inc. served on 8/28/2008, answer due 9/17/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Comverse, Inc. served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Google, Inc. served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Citrix Systems, Inc. served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Verizon Data Services LLC served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
September 3, 2008 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies Inc. Verizon Wireless served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008. (kls, )
August 29, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of New York Pursuant to the First to File Rule by Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Allen F. Gardner, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2008 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Patton, Nicholas)
August 26, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. cc:pltf 8-27-08 (mll, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., PhoneFusion, Inc, RingCentral, Inc, Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc, Citrix Systems, Inc., Comverse, Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., Embarq Communications Inc. (mll, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (mll, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Klausner Technologies Inc (mll, )
August 26, 2008 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 6-1-14913 (mll, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., GrandCentral Communications, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., PhoneFusion, Inc, RingCentral, Inc, Verizon Wireless, Verizon Data Services LLC, Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc, Citrix Systems, Inc., Comverse, Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., Embarq Communications Inc, filed by Klausner Technologies Inc. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit A, (2) Exhibit B, (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klausner Technologies Inc v. Verizon Wireless et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klausner Technologies Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Data Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Atlantic Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrix Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comverse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embarq Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GrandCentral Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhoneFusion, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?