Aloft Media, LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC alleged that Defendant Google, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,194,691 entitled "Network Browser Window with Adjacent Identifier Selector Interface for Storing Web Content."

Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv00440
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: Gregg
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit be DISMISSED in their entirety with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/9/2009. (gsg)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 59 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/9/2009. (gsg)
September 8, 2009 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant shall have up to and including September 4, 2009 to enter into a final written settlement agreement. All Docket Control and Discovery Order deadlines will be suspended up to this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/24/2009. (gsg)
August 20, 2009 Filing 57 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Suspend Deadlines by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all deadlines in this case be suspended for a period of two weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/6/2009. (gsg)
August 5, 2009 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 31, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clay Harris on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
July 27, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc. regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Jones, Michael)
July 24, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Patent Rule 3-1 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R. Perry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2009 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven T Snyder for Google, Inc.. (kls, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/14/2009. (gsg)
July 13, 2009 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (For entry of Agreed Protective Order) by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Agreed Protective Order))(Jones, Michael)
July 10, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC (Albritton, Eric)
July 10, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Coleman, Debra)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/30/2009. (gsg)
June 26, 2009 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Craig Tadlock by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 22, 2009 Filing 44 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 41 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Google, Inc. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Rodgers, Matthew)
June 22, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles)
June 5, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC (Albritton, Eric)
June 5, 2009 Filing 41 ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Google, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosure (Jones, Michael)
May 28, 2009 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. Attached Certificate of Service to Document # 37, First Amended Complaint.*** (mjc, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC re: P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2. (Cravey, Christopher)
May 26, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaison Chorikavumkal John on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (John, Jaison)
May 22, 2009 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT) against Google, Inc., filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2009: # 3 Certificate of Service) (mjc, ).
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2010. Discovery due by 5/7/2010. Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Order due by 7/22/2010. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/15/2009. (gsg)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/15/09. cc:attys 4-15-09(mll, )
April 13, 2009 Filing 34 Submission of DS Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order and Agreed Discovery Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for pltf and deft to file their proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order is extended to 4-13-09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/09. cc:attys 4-7-09 (mll, )
April 6, 2009 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2009 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for pltf and deft to file their proposed Docket Control and Discovery Order shall be extended to and including 4-6-09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/09. cc:attys 3-31-09 (mll, )
March 30, 2009 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. The deadline for Plaintiff and Defendant to file their proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order shall be extended to and including March 30, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/17/2009. (gsg)
March 16, 2009 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 21 Status Conference. The following dates are to be incorporated into the DOCKET CONTROL ORDER which is due by March 16, 2009. (Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/2009. (gsg)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/2009. (gsg)
March 4, 2009 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Extend Time to Comply With Local P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
March 4, 2009 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Love as presiding judge. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER assigning case to Judge Love by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/4/09. (mjc )
March 2, 2009 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 3/2/2009. (refer to doc #21) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 22 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mll, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 21 Minute Entry -- 3.2.09 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 3/2/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
February 25, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/2/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/13/09. cc:attys 2-13-09 (mll, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott T Weingaertner for Google, Inc.. (mll, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Google, Inc.. (mll, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher C Carnaval for Google, Inc.. (mll, )
January 6, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC Designation of Lead Counsel (Albritton, Eric)
January 5, 2009 Filing 14 Aloft Media LLCs ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Google Inc. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Rodgers, Matthew)
December 11, 2008 Filing 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Google, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 26, 2008 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Google, Inc. on 11/21/2008, by cert mail; answer due: 12/11/2008. (mll, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
November 20, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Michael Hill on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Hill, Matthew)
November 20, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Andrew Holt on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Holt, Jason)
November 20, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Williams, Danny)
November 19, 2008 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Rodgers, Matthew)
November 19, 2008 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Biggs, Adam)
November 19, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
November 19, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
November 19, 2008 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
November 19, 2008 Filing 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc. (mjc )
November 19, 2008 Case assigned to Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc )
November 19, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001772398.), filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloft Media, LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?