Aloft Media, LLC v. Yahoo! Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC alleged that Defendants Yahoo!, Inc., Google, Inc. and AOL LLC infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,472,351 entitled \"Mobile E-Mail Manager Interface with Integrated Instant Messaging and Phone Call Initiator Feature.\"

Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc. and AOL LLC
Case Number: 6:2008cv00509
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Gregg
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 87 FINAL JUDGMENT. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit be DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/18/2009. (gsg)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY Aloft Media, LLC; Aloft Media, LLC; Aloft Media, LLC; Aloft Media, LLC; Aloft Media, LLC; Google, Inc.; Yahoo! Inc.; Aloft Media, LLC and Aloft Media, LLC terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/24/2009. (gsg) Modified on 8/24/2009 (gsg).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Complaint Against Google Inc with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/2009. (gsg)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 84 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 83 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Against Google Inc. With Prejudice by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 82 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/13/2009. (gsg)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 81 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 80 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC of Filing Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Albritton, Eric)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clay Harris on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 78 USCA for the Federal Circuit ORDER. Aloft Media LLC is directed to respond to Yahoo!'s petition for writ of mandamus within 14 days of the date of filing of this order. Issued by the Clerk at the Direction of the Court, 7-22-09. (mll, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 77 NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A Petition for Writ of Mandamus has been filed by Google, Inc and Yahoo! Inc, in the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Assigned to the Miscellaneous Docket. (Misc No. 906 -- In re Yahoo! Inc.) (mll, )
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 76 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven T Snyder for Google, Inc. (kls, )
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 75 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC re Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions and Rule 3-2 (John, Jaison)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Coleman, Debra)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/30/2009. (gsg)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 72 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Craig Tadlock by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 71 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Protective Order and entering Agreed Protective Order. Confidentiality Agreement is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/22/09. (mjc, )
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 70 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 69 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. The deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to file their proposed Protective Order shall be extended to and including June 17, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/12/2009. (gsg)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 67 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hesha Abrams added as Mediator. Mediation deadline (1st round) due Jauary 29, 2010. 2nd round due June 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/12/2009. (gsg)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 65 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER re 39 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Google, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. Defendants' Motion to Transfer is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/10/2009. (gsg)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 64 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC re 60 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Aloft Media, Inc.'s Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Albritton, Eric)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 63 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc. Of Agreed Mediator (Carroll, Otis)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER granting 61 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Submit Mediator. The deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to submit the name, address and telephone number of a mediator shall be extended to and including June 5, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/27/2009. (gsg)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 61 Joint MOTION To Extend Time to Submit Mediator re 55 Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 60 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 39 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Albritton, Eric)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 Response in Opposition to Motion. Responses due by 5/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/15/2009. (gsg)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 58 RESPONSE in Support re 39 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer filed by Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Carroll, Otis)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 57 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2010. Discovery due by 5/14/2010. Exhibit List due by 9/13/2010. Markman Hearing set for 2/25/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2010. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2009. (gsg)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 55 The Court ORDERS the parties to submit by Tuesday, May 26, 2009, the name, address, and phone number of a mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2009. (gsg)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 56 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/11/09. cc:attys 5-12-09(mll, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 53 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket control order by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 52 ORDER granting 50 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. The Deadline for Plaintiff and Defendants to file their proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order shall be extended to and including may 8, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/8/2009. (gsg)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1404(a) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Christopher Edgeworth, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Edgeworth Declaration, # 11 Affidavit Declaration of Craig Tadlock, # 12 Exhibit 1 to Tadlock Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 2 to Tadlock Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 3 to Tadlock Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 4 to Tadlock Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 5 to Tadlock Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 6 to Tadlock Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 7 to Tadlock Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 8 to Tadlock Declaration, # 20 Errata 9 to Tadlock Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 10 to Tadlock Declaration)(Tadlock, Charles)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 49 ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submitt proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. The Deadline shall be extended to and including May 1, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/22/2009. (gsg)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff's response shall be due on May 1, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/22/2009. (gsg)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Comply With Local P.R. 3-1 and 3-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/13/2009. (gsg)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend to Comply With Local P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 43 ORDER that the following dates be incorporated into the Docket Control Order which is due by April 22, 2009: (Markman Hearing set for 2/25/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 9/7/2010 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2010 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/8/2009. (gsg)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge John D. Love added as presiding judge by consent of the parties. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. (mll, )
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER assigning case to Judge John D Love by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/09. cc:attys 4-8-09(mll, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 4/6/2009. (refer to document #42) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 42 Minute Entry -- 4.6.09 Status Conf for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 4/6/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher C Carnaval for Google, Inc.. (mll, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 39 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Saari Decl, # 2 Beard Decl, # 3 Exhibit No. 1, # 4 Exhibit No. 2, # 5 Exhibit No. 3, # 6 Exhibit No. 4, # 7 Exhibit No. 5, # 8 Exhibit No. 6, # 9 Exhibit No. 7, # 10 Exhibit No. 8, # 11 Exhibit No. 9, # 12 Weingaertner Decl, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 38 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mll, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between Aloft Media and AOL in the instant action are hereby dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the terms of the Agreement. AOL shall retain its ability to assert all defenses and/or claims in the event of any further litigation. Each party is to bear its own costs and atty fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/06/09. cc:attys 4-6-09(mll, )
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 35 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss as to AOL LLC by Aloft Media, LLC, AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 34 ALOFT MEDIA, LLC's ANSWER to 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim OF YAHOO! INC. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Cravey, Christopher)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 33 ALOFT MEDIA, LLC's ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim OF AOL LLC by Aloft Media, LLC.(Cravey, Christopher)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/6/2009 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable Leonard E. Davis and the Honorable John D. Love in Judge Davis's Courtroom in Tyler, Texas. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/2/2009. (kls, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott T Weingaertner for Google, Inc. (kls, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Google, Inc. (kls, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 29 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC Request for Scheduling Conference (Tadlock, Charles)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC identifying Corporate Parent AOL Holdings for AOL LLC. (Findlay, Eric)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 26 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by AOL LLC.(Findlay, Eric)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 25 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Google, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooks Michael Beard on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Beard, Brooks)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 22 ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(Carroll, Otis)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of AOL LLC (Craft, Roger)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 20 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL LLC to 2/19/2009. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by AOL LLC.( Findlay, Eric)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 19 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 20 FOR CORRECT PLEADING Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AOL LLC.( Findlay, Eric) Modified on 1/21/2009 (mll, ).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 18 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 2/19/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 17 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 2/19/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Carroll, Otis)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 16 Return of Service Executed as to AOL LLC on 1/2/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 1/22/2009. (mll, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 15 Return of Service Executed as to Google, Inc. on 1/2/2005, by cert mail; answer due: 1/22/2005. (mll, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Williams, Danny)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER that the pltf file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/09. cc:pltf 1-7-09(mll, )
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 10 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC Designation of Lead Counsel (Albritton, Eric)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 11 Return of Service Executed as to Yahoo! Inc. on 12/31/2008, by cert mail; answer due: 1/20/2009. (mll, )
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Rodgers, Matthew)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc., AOL LLC. (mll, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Nelson, Kyle)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Stevens, Scott)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Biggs, Adam)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order 1 COMPLAINT against Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc., AOL LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001817670.), filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloft Media, LLC v. Yahoo! Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?