Brown v. Larty et al
Plaintiff: Warren J Brown
Defendant: Shawn Larty, Unknown Alverlar, Lynnwood Cook, Eddie Baker and Unknown Ridings
Case Number: 6:2009cv00069
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint filed by Warren J Brown. ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to obey orders of the Court and for want of prosecution Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/9/2010. (gsg)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shawn Larty, GRANTING 47 MOTION to Seal filed by Texas Attorney General's Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2010. (gsg)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jose Avelar and, Shawn Larty. Plaintiffs claims against Shawn Larty and Jose Avelar regarding the use of force incident that occurred on October 29, 2008 are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/2010. (gsg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Larty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Larty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Alverlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynnwood Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ridings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?