Aloft Media, LLC v. Yahoo!, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc. and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv00291
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Gregg
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. All claims brought by Aloft Media LLC are dismissed with prejudice, and all claims, counterclaims and defenses made by Google Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and atty fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-22-09(mll, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. In accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement between Aloft and Yahoo!, all claims by Aloft against Yahoo! are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all claims by Yahoo! against Aloft are hereby dismissed without prejudge, with each party bearing its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/17/09. cc:attys 8-18-09 (mll, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Yahoo!, Inc., Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 31, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clay Harris on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
July 10, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Coleman, Debra)
July 9, 2009 Filing 9 DOCKET ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any related cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas involving the same patent /patents. (Judge Leonard Davis)
July 8, 2009 U.S. PATENT NO. 7,529,795 (rlf, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Biggs, Adam)
July 8, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
July 8, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
July 8, 2009 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Rodgers, Matthew)
July 8, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Williams, Danny)
July 8, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
July 8, 2009 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
July 8, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Yahoo!, Inc., Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002065975.), filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloft Media, LLC v. Yahoo!, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?