Aloft Media, LLC v. Oracle Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Defendant: Oracle Corporation, Oracle USA, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Google, Inc., Fair Isaac Corp., Fidelity Investments, LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Halliburton Co., E-Trade Securities, LLC and Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2009cv00304
Filed: July 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Gregg
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Filing 198 FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims are DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-28-11(mll, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 196 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by and between pltf and defts Halliburton Company and Halliburton Energy Services Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, )
January 21, 2011 Filing 196 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Halliburton Co. and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. with Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Aloft Media, LLC, Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $3,071.25 to Richard D Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 1-11-2011 as the Court's Technical Advisor, for a total amount of $6,142.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11(mll, ) Modified on 1/12/2011 (mll, ).
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 191 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings in this matter are stayed until further order of the Court. Parties shall file closing documents by 2-11-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/11/11. cc:attys 1-11-11 (mll, )
January 11, 2011 Filing 193 REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Settled(Knowles, James)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 186 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between pltf and deft Fair Isaac Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Parties will each bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/11. cc:attys 1-10-11 (mll, )
January 10, 2011 Filing 191 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Deadlines by Aloft Media, LLC, Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 10, 2011 Filing 190 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of United States Patent NOS. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 CORRECTED (PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 FOR INDEFINITENESS (DKT. NO. 165)) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21)(Williams, Danny)
January 7, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy Lynn Greskowiak on behalf of Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Greskowiak, Stacy)
January 6, 2011 Filing 188 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 (SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF THE CLAIMS-IN-SUIT (Dkt. No. 149)) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Danny)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam A Biggs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/06/11. cc:attys 1-06-11 (mll, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 186 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss Defenant Fair Isaac Corporation with Prejudice under FED.R.CIV.P.41(a)(2) by Aloft Media, LLC, Fair Isaac Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 5, 2011 Filing 185 NOTICE by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL DEADLINE (Aurentz, Phillip)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 173 Notice of Requested Time filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Halliburton Co., Aloft Media, LLC. The Markman Hearing scheduled for Thursday, January 13, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. will last a total of three (3) hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2011. (gsg)
January 5, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE. The Court has posted a standing order regarding summary judgment motions, motions to strike expert testimony/Daubert motions, motions in limine, exhibits and deposition designations that can be found on the Courts website. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2011. (gsg)
January 5, 2011 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Adam A. Biggs as Counsel of Record by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 3, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Edwards, Stephen)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 178 Motion to extend time. Briefing deadline is extended to 1-06-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/03/11. cc:attys 1-03-11 (mll, )
December 31, 2010 Filing 179 REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of United States Patent NOS. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 CORRECTED Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of United States Patent Nos. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 filed by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Aurentz, Phillip)
December 30, 2010 Filing 178 Unopposed MOTION TO EXTEND BREIFING DEADLINE by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 23, 2010 Filing 177 REPLY to 162 Claim Construction Brief (ALOFTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Dkt. No. 162)) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Williams, Danny)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 170 Motion Extend Mediation Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/2010. (gsg)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 166 Reply to Claim Construction Brief . Responses due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/2010. (gsg)
December 21, 2010 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of United States Patent NOS. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 CORRECTED (PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 FOR INDEFINITENESS (DKT. NO. 165)) filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 21, 2010 Filing 173 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC, Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (JOINT NOTICE OF REQUESTED TIME FOR MARKMAN HEARING AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS) (Williams, Danny)
December 21, 2010 Filing 172 REPLY to Response to Motion re 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 filed by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of Phillip Aurentz)(Aurentz, Phillip)
December 21, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 171 , Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED TO CORRECT DOCUMENT LINK.*** (mjc, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 171 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of United States Patent NOS. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 CORRECTED filed by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of Phillip Aurentz)(Aurentz, Phillip) Modified on 12/21/2010 (mjc, ).
December 20, 2010 Filing 170 Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Aloft Media, LLC, Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip)
December 20, 2010 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 166 Reply to Claim Construction Brief - Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-5(c) by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying as moot 163 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/10. cc:attys 12-14-10 (mll, )
December 9, 2010 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Williams, Danny)
December 9, 2010 Filing 166 CORRECTED REPLY to 162 Claim Construction Brief filed by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Aurentz, Phillip)
December 9, 2010 Filing 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of the Asserted Claims of United States Patent NOS. 7,499,898 and 7,593,910 CORRECTED by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip)
December 7, 2010 Filing 164 REPLY to 162 Claim Construction Brief filed by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Aurentz, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Aurentz, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2010: # 6 Exhibit A Searchable, # 7 Exhibit B Searchable) (mjc, ).
December 7, 2010 Filing 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 FOR INDEFINITENESS by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Phillip Aurentz in Support of MSJ, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Aurentz, Phillip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2010: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 23, 2010 Filing 162 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Williams, Danny)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Produce Documents. The Court extends the deadline for defts Halliburton Company and Halliburton Energy Services Inc to complete its rolling document production to 1-28-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/10. cc:attys 11-19-10 (mll, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION to Produce Documents by Halliburton Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 151 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Aloft Media, LLC. Pltf's claims against deft Fidelity Investments LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Parties will each bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:atty 11-15-10(mll, )
November 10, 2010 Filing 158 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wynne Morehan on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Morehan, David)
November 9, 2010 Filing 157 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Aloft Media, LLC, Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Fair Isaac Corporation, (JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Danny)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/8/2010. (gsg)
November 8, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. of Compliance with P.R.4-2 and Privilege Log Disclosure (Aurentz, Phillip)
November 5, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC of Privilege Log and Disclosures under P.R. 4-2 (Albritton, Eric)
November 4, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC - Notice of 2nd Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Albritton, Eric)
November 4, 2010 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 4, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aloft Media, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Fidelity Investments, LLC WITH PREJUDICE)(Albritton, Eric)
November 1, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Brinn Hall on behalf of Fair Isaac Corp. (Hall, Eric)
October 29, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY OF UNITED STATES PATENT NOS. 7,499,898 AND 7,593,910 by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Declaration of Phillip Aurentz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER appointing Richard D Egan to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/28/10. cc:attys 10-28-10(mll, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC, Fair Isaac Corp., Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. of Proposed Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CV of R. Egan)(Albritton, Eric)
October 15, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC under P.R. 4-1 (Albritton, Eric)
October 15, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE of Disclosure by Fair Isaac Corp. Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Quinn, Miriam)
October 15, 2010 Filing 144 NOTICE by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Aurentz, Phillip)
October 14, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gunter, Debra)
October 14, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yarbrough, Herbert)
October 13, 2010 Filing 141 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Req. for Termination of Notices - P. Miller (Schwent, Jason)
October 13, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Req. for Termination of Notices (Schwent, Jason)
October 13, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Req. for Termination of Notices - J. Howell (Schwent, Jason)
October 13, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE by Scottrade, Inc. Req. for Termination of Notices - T. Douglass (Schwent, Jason)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Scottrade are DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties will each bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-13-10 (mll, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 136 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Scottrade, Inc. WITH PREJUDICE under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Aloft Media, LLC, Scottrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 28, 2010 Filing 135 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC Notice of Compliance with Paragraph 2(c) of the Court's Discovery Order (Albritton, Eric)
September 21, 2010 Deadlines reset per 134 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2010; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 11-09-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 7/29/2011; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 8-12-2011. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2010, for pltf; 10-08-2010 for defts. Jury instructions due by 11/11/2011. Mediation Completion due by 12/21/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2011; Response to Dispositive Motions due 9-16-2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/11/2011. Motions in Limine due 11-07-2011; Responses to Motions in Limine due 11-10-2011. Jury Selection set for 12/5/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 1/13/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Expected Length of Trial is five days. (mll, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10 (mll, )
September 20, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # #131 and 132, Joint Motion to Amend/Correct. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kls, )
September 20, 2010 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 109 Order by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip)
September 20, 2010 Filing 132 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - SEE #133 for CORRECT ENTRY*** Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 109 Order by Halliburton Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip) Modified on 9/20/2010 (kls, ).
September 20, 2010 Filing 131 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR - SEE #133 for CORRECT ENTRY*** Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 109 Order by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Aurentz, Phillip) Modified on 9/20/2010 (kls, ).
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/02/10. cc:attys 9-02-10 (mll, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 30, 2010 Filing 128 Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC's ANSWER to 125 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Fair Isaac Corp. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 30, 2010 Filing 127 Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC's ANSWER to 123 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Halliburton Company and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 30, 2010 Filing 126 Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC's ANSWER to 124 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Scottrade, Inc. by Aloft Media, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
August 17, 2010 Filing 125 Defendant Fair Issac Corp.'s ANSWER to 117 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Fair Isaac Corp..(Govett, Brett)
August 13, 2010 Filing 124 ANSWER to 117 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Scottrade, Inc..(Schwent, Jason)
August 13, 2010 Filing 123 ANSWER to 117 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Halliburton Co..(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 5, 2010 Filing 122 Return of Service Executed as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 7/30/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 8/20/2010. (mll, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC First Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Albritton, Eric)
July 30, 2010 Filing 120 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC Notice of 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Albritton, Eric)
July 29, 2010 Filing 119 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (mll, )
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pltf shall serve amended Infringement Contentions on deft Halliburton Company within 5 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/28/10. cc:attys 7-29-10 (mll, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 117 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Fair Isaac Corp., Halliburton Co., Scottrade, Inc., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2010 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT HALLIBURTON COMPANY by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
July 20, 2010 Filing 115 NOTICE of Disclosure by Fair Isaac Corp. (Govett, Brett)
July 20, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph One of the Court's Discovery Order (Albritton, Eric)
July 19, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE of Disclosure by Halliburton Co. (Stevenson, Theodore)
July 19, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE of Disclosure by Scottrade, Inc. (Schwent, Jason)
July 12, 2010 Filing 111 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aloft Media, LLC Compliance With P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Albritton, Eric)
July 6, 2010 Filing 110 STIPULATION RELATING TO DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 29 by Aloft Media, LLC, Fair Isaac Corp., Halliburton Co., Scottrade, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
June 21, 2010 Deadlines set per 109 Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2010; Respond to Amended Pleadings 11-09-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 7/29/2011; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 8-12-2011. Joinder of Parties due by 7/9/2010, for pltf; 9-21-2010 for defts. Jury instructions due by 11/11/2011. Mediation Completion due by 12/20/2010. Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this case. Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2011; Response to Dispositive Motions due 9-16-2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/11/2011. Motions in Limine due 11-07-2011; Responses to Motions in Limine due 11-10-2011. Jury Selection set for 12/5/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 1/13/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Expected Length of trial is 5 days. (mll, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/21/10. cc:attys 6-22-10(mll, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/21/2010. (gsg)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/21/2010. (gsg)
June 18, 2010 Filing 106 Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order and Agreed Discovery Order by Aloft Media, LLC, Fair Isaac Corp., Halliburton Co., Scottrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 17, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miriam Latorre Quinn on behalf of Fair Isaac Corp. (Quinn, Miriam)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due by 6-21-2010. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 6-21-2010 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiffs PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-14-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/09/10. cc:attys 6-10-10(mll, )
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/10. cc:attys 6-08-10(mll, )
June 7, 2010 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 6/7/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
May 25, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Scottrade, Inc. (Gunter, Debra)
May 25, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Scottrade, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete PR 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/21/10. cc:attys 5-21-10 (mll, )
May 19, 2010 Filing 98 NOTICE by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc. Of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Carroll, Otis)
May 19, 2010 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/7/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/18/10. cc:attys 5-18-10(mll, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE by Aloft Media, LLC of Request for Scheduling Conference (Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Coleman, Debra)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Aloft Media, LLC. Defendants Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, TD Ameritrade Inc, and E-Trade Securities LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/17/10. cc:attys 5-17-10(mll, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aloft Media, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, E-Trade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have to 5-14-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/07/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, )
May 6, 2010 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, E-Trade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have to 5-07-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/10. cc:attys 4-30-10 (mll, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
April 19, 2010 Filing 87 RESPONSE to 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim OF DEFENDANT FAIR ISAAC CORP.S by Aloft Media, LLC. (Williams, Danny)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, E-Trade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have until 4-30-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/10. cc:attys 4-16-10 (mll, )
April 16, 2010 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Etrade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have to 4-16-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/10. cc:attys 4-02-10 (mll, )
April 2, 2010 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
March 24, 2010 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fair Isaac Corp. (Govett, Brett)
March 24, 2010 Filing 81 ANSWER to 43 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Fair Isaac Corp..(Govett, Brett)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Fair Isaac Corporation shall have until 4-05-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/10. cc:attys 3-23-10 (mll, )
March 22, 2010 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Fair Isaac Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting re 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Move, Or Otherwise RespondUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Move, Or Otherwise Respond. Accordingly, Defendants Charles Schwab & Co, Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, E-Trade Securities, LLC and TD Ameritrade, Inc. shall have until and including April 2, 2010, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/19/2010. (kls, )
March 18, 2010 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Move, Or Otherwise Respond by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Dismiss. All claims, counterclaims or causes of action asserted in this suit by pltf and defts SAP AG and SAP America Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each side will bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/10. cc:attys 3-12-10 (mll, )
March 11, 2010 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aloft Media, LLC, SAP AG, SAP America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Fair Isaac Corporation shall have until and including 3-22-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-08-10 (mll, )
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, E-Trade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have to 3-19-2010 to answer, move or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-08-10 (mll, )
March 5, 2010 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Repond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Fair Isaac Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
March 5, 2010 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint by E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah)
March 1, 2010 Filing 70 Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC's ANSWER to 68 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Aloft Media, LLC.(Williams, Danny)
February 24, 2010 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Halliburton Co. identifying Corporate Parent None for Halliburton Co.. (Stevenson, Theodore)
February 5, 2010 Filing 68 ANSWER to 43 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Halliburton Co..(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Fair Isaac Corporation shall have to 3-08-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10 (mll, )
February 4, 2010 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fair Isaac Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts Charles Schwab & Co Inc, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, E-Trade Securities LLC, and TD Ameritrade Inc shall have to 3-08-2010 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/10. cc:attys 2-03-10 (mll, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, Or Otherwise Respond by E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Robin Richie terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/11/10. cc:attys 1-11-10 (mll, )
January 11, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 60 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fair Isaac Corp. to 2/5/2010. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Michael Joe terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/8/10. (mjc, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richie, Christopher)
January 6, 2010 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fair Isaac Corp.( Govett, Brett)
January 6, 2010 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Unopposed Motion For Withdrawal of Representation By Christopher M. Joe - by E-Trade Securities, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SAP AG and SAP America Inc shall answer, move or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint on or before 3-09-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/31/09. cc:attys 12-31-09(mll, )
December 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 54 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Halliburton Co. to 2/5/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 52 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TD Ameritrade, Inc. to 2/5/2010. 60 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 51 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for E-Trade Securities, LLC to 2/5/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 50 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC to 2/5/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 49 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to 2/5/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 30, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Charles Elacqua on behalf of SAP AG, SAP America, Inc (Elacqua, Benjamin)
December 30, 2009 Filing 56 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 43 Amended Complaint, by SAP AG, SAP America, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Agreed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer)(Healey, David)
December 30, 2009 Filing 55 Plaintiff Aloft Media, LLC's ANSWER to 53 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Scottrade, Inc. (Second Amended Complaint) by Aloft Media, LLC.(Rodgers, Matthew)
December 30, 2009 Filing 54 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Halliburton Co..( Stevenson, Theodore)
December 30, 2009 Filing 53 ANSWER to 43 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Scottrade, Inc..(Schwent, Jason)
December 29, 2009 Filing 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint re TD Ameritrade, Inc..( Race, Deborah)
December 29, 2009 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint re E-Trade Securities, LLC.( Race, Deborah)
December 29, 2009 Filing 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint re Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC.( Race, Deborah)
December 29, 2009 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint re Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..( Race, Deborah)
December 29, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
December 29, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooks Michael Beard on behalf of E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Beard, Brooks)
December 29, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Race, Deborah)
December 29, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
December 18, 2009 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Halliburton Co., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., SAP AG, SAP America, Inc, Fair Isaac Corp., Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Albritton, Eric)
December 11, 2009 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scottrade, Inc. (Schwent, Jason)
December 8, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Amerson, J)
December 7, 2009 Filing 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Pamela M Miller for Scottrade, Inc.. (mll, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Howell for Scottrade, Inc.. (mll, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas E Douglass for Scottrade, Inc.. (mll, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 37 ANSWER to 16 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Aloft Media, LLC by Scottrade, Inc..(Schwent, Jason)
December 4, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 36 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fair Isaac Corp. to 1/8/2010. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re: Fair Isaac Corp.( Govett, Brett)
December 4, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 35 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Halliburton Co. to 1/6/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 4, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 32 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to 1/6/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 4, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 29 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for E-Trade Securities, LLC to 1/4/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Halliburton Co..( Stevenson, Theodore)
December 4, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Robin Richie on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (Richie, Christopher)
December 3, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip M Aurentz on behalf of Halliburton Co. (Aurentz, Phillip)
December 3, 2009 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Charles Schwab & Co., Inc..( Richie, Christopher)
December 2, 2009 Filing 31 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT # 36 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re: Fair Isaac Corp.(Govett, Brett) Modified on 12/4/2009 (mll, ).
December 1, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason M Schwent on behalf of Scottrade, Inc. (Schwent, Jason)
December 1, 2009 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re E-Trade Securities, LLC.( Joe, Christopher)
November 25, 2009 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed as to Fair Isaac Corp. on 11/18/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/9/2009. (mll, )
November 23, 2009 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed as to TD Ameritrade, Inc. on 11/16/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. on 11/16/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Halliburton Co. on 11/16/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to E-Trade Securities, LLC on 11/12/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/2/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to Fidelity Investments, LLC on 11/12/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/2/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to Scottrade, Inc. on 11/16/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2009. (mll, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Oracle Corporation and Oracle USA, Inc. terminated. Each side will bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/2009. (gsg)
November 19, 2009 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aloft Media, LLC, Oracle Corporation, Oracle USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 11, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of Halliburton Co. (Stevenson, Theodore)
November 11, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aimee Perilloux Fagan on behalf of Halliburton Co. (Fagan, Aimee)
November 10, 2009 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Halliburton Co., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle USA, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America, Inc, Fair Isaac Corp., Fidelity Investments, LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service on defts. (mll, )
November 9, 2009 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against SAP AG, SAP America, Inc, Halliburton Co., E-Trade Securities, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Oracle Corporation, Oracle USA, Inc., Fair Isaac Corp., Fidelity Investments, LLC, Scottrade, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Albritton, Eric)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss. All claims brought by Aloft Media LLC are dismissed with prejudice, and all claims, counterclaims and defenses made by Google Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and atty fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-22-09(mll, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aloft Media, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. In accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement between Aloft and Yahoo!, all claims by Aloft against Yahoo! are dismissed with prejudice and all claims by Yahoo! against Aloft are dismissed without prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/17/09. cc:attys 8-18-09 (mll, )
August 13, 2009 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aloft Media, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 31, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clay Harris on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
July 15, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
July 15, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Biggs, Adam)
July 15, 2009 Filing 8 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
July 14, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
July 14, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
July 14, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Rodgers, Matthew)
July 14, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Aloft Media, LLC (Williams, Danny)
July 14, 2009 Filing 3 DOCKET ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any related cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas involving the same patent /patents.(Judge Leonard Davis)
July 14, 2009 Filing 2 U.S. PATENT NO. 7,499,898 (rlf, )
July 14, 2009 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
July 14, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002073938.), filed by Aloft Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloft Media, LLC v. Oracle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloft Media, LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fair Isaac Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Trade Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?