Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Adobe Systems Incorporated et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Apple Inc., Argosy Publishing, Inc., Blockbuster Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Ebay Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., New Frontier Media, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Perot Systems Corp., Playboy Enterprises International, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., Staples, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Texas Instruments Inc., Yahoo! Inc. and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 6:2009cv00446
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2012 Filing 1434 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hotline Conference held on 1/6/2012 before Judge Bush. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Crystal Cannon,Telephone number: 903/819-2155. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2013. (pad, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 1433 BILL OF COSTS by Yahoo! Inc.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $105,286.41. (mll, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 1432 BILL OF COSTS by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $40,650.19. (mll, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 1431 BILL OF COSTS by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. Costs Taxed in the amount of $102,239.19. (mll, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 1430 BILL OF COSTS by Amazon.com Inc. Costs Taxed in the amount of $97,624.65. (mll, )
September 5, 2012 Filing 1429 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re 1427 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. USCA Case Number 12-1632 (mll, )
August 24, 2012 Filing 1428 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Related Orders and Certified Copy of the Docket Sheet by the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (pkb, )
August 24, 2012 ELECTRONIC Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders and Certified Copy of the Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 1427 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (pkb, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 1427 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 1297 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Sealed Patent Motion, 914 Memorandum & Opinion, 1417 Judgment, 1322 Memorandum & Opinion, 1181 Hotline Order, 1416 Order, 1354 Judgment and 1414 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and The Regents of the University of California. Filing fee $ 455 paid, Receipt # 0540-3734863. (pkb, )
August 17, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1425, Notice of Appeal. INCORRECT DOCKETING EVENT USED, PLEASE IGNORE.*** (pkb, ) Modified on 8/24/2012 (pkb, ).
August 17, 2012 Filing 1426 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1425 ***PLEASE IGNORE, INCORRECT DOCKETING EVENT USED. CORRECTED NOTICE DOCKETED AS DOCUMENT # 1427***NOTICE OF APPEAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3734863. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 8/24/2012 (pkb, ).
August 17, 2012 Filing 1424 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Google and YouTube's Unopposed Amended Bill of Costs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Bill of Costs)(Jones, Michael)
August 15, 2012 Filing 1423 UNOPPOSED SUBMISSION OF AMENDED PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Bill of Costs)(Joe, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2012 (sm, ).
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER granting 1421 Motion to Amend Bill of Costs. Defendants shall submit their Amended Bill of Costs no later than 8-17-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/12. cc:attys 8-06-12 (mll, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 1421 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of Defendants' Amended Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER granting 1419 Motion to Seal Documents. ORDERED that Exhibit C, Exhibit H, and Exhibit I of Dkt. No. 1342 be sealed by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/30/12. cc:attys 7-30-12 (mll, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 1419 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 1342 Trial Brief,, (Unopposed Motion Requesting Certain Pleadings Be Sealed) by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 24, 2012 Filing 1418 NOTICE. The Court has received a request from a journalist for a copy of the publicly disclosed trial exhibits from the jury trial conducted from February 2 to February 9, 2012, in the above captioned case. Any party that objects to such request must file a well-articulated objection by 7-27-2012, 5:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/24/12. cc:attys 7-25-12(mll, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Claims 1 and 6 of U.S. Patent No. 5,838,906 are found to be invalid. Claims 1, 3, 10, 16, 18, 20, 22, 36, 38, 40, and 42 of U.S. Patent No. 7,599,985 are found to be invalid. Accordingly, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiffs take nothing from Amazon.com Inc.; Google Inc.; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.; Yahoo! Inc.; and YouTube, LLC and that all pending motions are DENIED. Plaintiffs claims for infringement are dismissed with prejudice based on Defendants invalidity affirmative defense, and Defendants counterclaims other than for invalidity are hereby dismissed without prejudice as moot. Defendants costs of court should be taxed against Plaintiffs. The parties are directed to the Standing Order Regarding Bill of Costs on the Courts website. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:attys 7-20-12(mll, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER re 1404 Sealed Memorandum Regarding Defendants' Bills of Costs. Defendants shall resubmit an agreed Bill of Costs to the clerk in light of the guidance given herein. The parties shall meet and confer extensively to avoid presenting additional costs disputes to the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:attys 7-20-12(mll, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 ORDER granting 1406 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 1368 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 1400 Motion for Hearing; granting 1405 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment; granting in part 1410 Sealed Patent Motion to De-Designate the Supplemental Invalidity Report of Defendants' Validity Expert Richard Phillips. Defts are ordered to produce a redacted copy of the supplemental report that is not designated as confidential. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:attys 7-20-12 (mll, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 1367 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:attys 7-20-12 (mll, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 1413 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of POST-VERDICT HEARING held on 6/11/12 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill E. McFadden, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 593-3213, Sunbelt Reporting & Litigation Services NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2012. (tja, )
June 11, 2012 Filing 1412 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post-Verdict Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2012. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
June 10, 2012 Filing 1411 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1410 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE THE SUPPLEMENTAL VALIDITY REPORT OF DEFENDANTS' VALIDITY EXPERT RICHARD PHILLIPS (Defendants' Response Seeking Enforcement of Protective Order and Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion to De-Designate Dr. Phillips' Supplemental Expert Report on Invalidity) filed by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
June 6, 2012 Filing 1410 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE THE SUPPLEMENTAL VALIDITY REPORT OF DEFENDANTS' VALIDITY EXPERT RICHARD PHILLIPS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
May 30, 2012 Filing 1409 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California re 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
May 9, 2012 Filing 1408 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated of Request to Terminate Electronic Notices (Wolff, Jason)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1407 NOTICE by Blockbuster Inc. of Request to Terminate Electronic Notices (Wooten, David)
May 3, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing POST-VERDICT Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2012 09:30 AM is RESET for 6/11/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1406 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 1368 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1405 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment PURSUANT TO RULES 59(e) AND 60(a) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
April 26, 2012 Filing 1404 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Defendants Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhbit 6)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 26, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: POST-VERDICT Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf)
April 26, 2012 Filing 1403 Sealed Document - Bill of Costs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit C-3, # 7 Exhibit C-4, # 8 Exhibit C-5, # 9 Exhibit C-6, # 10 Exhibit C-7, # 11 Exhibit C-8, # 12 Exhibit C-9, # 13 Exhibit C-10)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/27/2012 (gsg, ).
April 26, 2012 Filing 1402 Sealed Document - Bill of Costs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A0133 Form, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of B. Stroy, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 4/27/2012 (gsg).
April 25, 2012 Filing 1401 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher M. Joe, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Part 2)(Joe, Christopher)
April 25, 2012 Filing 1400 Unopposed MOTION FOR HEARING ON RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 re 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER granting 1396 Motion to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of defts' Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/12. cc:attys 4-23-12 (mll, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 1398 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1368 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment Defendants Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Correct Judgment Pursuant to Rules 59(e) and 60(a). filed by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Defendants Sur-Reply)(Reines, Edward)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1397 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 filed by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reines, Edward)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1396 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER granting 1393 Motion to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline. The deadline for filing Defendants Bill of Costs is extended to 4-20-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/13/12. cc:attys 4-13-12 (mll, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 1394 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric William Buether (Buether, Eric)
April 12, 2012 Filing 1393 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion to Amend Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
April 9, 2012 Filing 1392 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(McKool, Mike)
April 9, 2012 Filing 1391 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1368 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment Pursuant to Rules 59(e) and 60(a) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 ORDER granting 1389 Motion to Amend/Correct Bill of Costs. The deadline for filing Defendants Bill of Costs is extended to 4-13-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/12. cc:attys 4-05-12 (mll, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 1389 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline For Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
April 2, 2012 Sealed Exhibits placed in Clerk's vault:Special Exhibits 1 and 2, admitted 2/7/2012;Plaintiffs' Offers of Proof (PX 65, 66, 453-456) admitted 2/8/2012;Defendants' Offers of Proof (1-4) admitted 2/8/2012;Defendants' Offers of Proof (JDX 245, 246, 254, 261, and 500) admitted 2/9/2012. (cwk)
April 2, 2012 Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Exhibits submitted at trial stored in Clerk's Office Exhibit Locker. (cwk)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1384 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 filed by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Phillips' Direct MediaView Demonstrative, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Phillips' Viola Chart Demonstrative, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Viola Type Demonstrative)(Doan, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2012: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
March 29, 2012 Filing 1383 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1368 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct Judgment Pursuant to Rules 59(e) and 60(a) filed by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 ORDER granting 1381 Motion to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of defts' Bill of Costs. The deadline for filing defts' Bill of Costs is extended to 4-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/29/12. cc:attys 3-29-12 (mll, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 1381 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline For Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., The Regents of the University of California, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
March 19, 2012 Filing 1380 NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (McNabnay, Neil)
March 14, 2012 Filing 1379 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/9/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan. shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1378 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings, Afternoon Session, held on 2/8/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werling/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1377 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings, Morning Session, held on 2/8/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1376 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings, Afternoon Session, held on 2/7/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1375 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings, Morning Session, held on 2/7/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1374 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings, Afternoon Session, held on 2/6/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1373 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Examination Proceedings held on 2/6/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1372 Sealed Portion of Pretrial Proceedings held on 1/24/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1371 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Motion Proceedings held on 2/6/12 before Judge Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 1370 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Hearing Proceedings held on 1/24/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (sms, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 ORDER granting 1366 Motion to Amend Post-Trial Deadlines. Defts shall have to 3-30-2012 to file their Bills of Costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/12. cc:attys 3-12-12 (mll, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 1368 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1354 Judgment by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1367 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law UNDER RULE 50(b) THAT THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER RULE 59 by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1366 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Unopposed Motion to Amend Post-Trial Deadline For Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER granting 1364 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and defts CDW Corporation and CDW LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/12. cc:attys 3-08-12 (mll, )
March 6, 2012 Filing 1364 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AND CDW CORPORATION by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 ORDER granting 1362 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadline. Defts shall file their Bills of Costs no later than 3-12-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/12. cc:attys 2-28-12 (mll, )
February 27, 2012 Filing 1362 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Post-Trial Deadline for Submission of Defendants' Bill of Costs by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 ORDER granting 1360 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft Adobe Systems Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attys' fees with respect to these claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/27/12. cc:attys 2-27-12 (mll, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 1360 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AND ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 ORDER granting 1358 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Staples, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to and in accordance with the Settlement Agreement. Each of the foregoing parties shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to these claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/12. cc:attys 2-23-12 (mll, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 1358 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AND STAPLES, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER that all claims between pltfs and deft The Go Daddy Group Inc are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to their settlement agreement. Each of the parties shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees with respect to these claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/13/12. cc:attys 2-13-12 (mll, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 1354 FINAL JUDGMENT. Pltfs shall take nothing from defts, and all pending motions are DENIED. Defts' costs of court shall be taxed against pltfs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/13/12. cc:attys 2-13-12(mll, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1357 Exhibit Lists: Defendant's List of Exhibits Admitted at Trial 02.06.12 - 02.09.12 (Attachments: # 1 cumulative exhibit list Feb 6, # 2 exhibit list 2, # 3 cumulative exhibit list Feb 7, # 4 exhibit list, # 5 cumulative exhibit list Feb 8, # 6 full cumulative exhibit list)(als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1356 Exhibit List: Plaintiff's Lists of Exhibits Admitted at trial 02.06.12 - 02.09.12 (Attachments: # 1 exhibit list, # 2 exhibit list, # 3 exhibit list, # 4 cumulative exhibit list)(als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1353 JURY VERDICT. (als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1352 SEALED Jury Notes. (als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1351 Jury Instructions. (als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1350 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: <b?Jury Trial completed on 2/9/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger & Shea Sloan.) (als, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1348 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1347 Order,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 2 of 17), # 2 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 3 of 17), # 3 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 4 of 17), # 4 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 5 of 17), # 5 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 6 of 17), # 6 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 7 of 17), # 7 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 8 of 17), # 8 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 9 of 17), # 9 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 10 of 17), # 10 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 11 of 17), # 11 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 12 of 17), # 12 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 13 of 17), # 13 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 14 of 17, # 14 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 15 of 17), # 15 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 16 of 17), # 16 Exhibit C to 1342 (Part 17 of 17)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 ORDER re 1345 Notice of receipt by the Clerk's Office of a large binder filed by YouTube, LLC, The Go Daddy Group, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Google Inc., Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Staples, Inc., withdrawing permission to submit the large binder non-electronically and ordering that it be submitted electronically within one business day according to the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/9/12. (mjc, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1346 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
February 9, 2012 Filing 1345 NOTICE of receipt by the Clerk's Office of a large binder and a DVD which are exhibits to 1342 and were tendered by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1342 Trial Brief. Exhibits will be placed in the vault in the Clerk's Office. (mjc, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1344 NOTICE of receipt by the Clerk's Office of three CDs and two DVDs which are exhibits to 1340 and were tendered by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1340 Trial Brief. Exhibits will be placed in the vault in the Clerk's Office. (mjc, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 1343 TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Reines, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying [] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under 102A, B and G filed by Mr. Reines on behalf of Amazon and Yahoo. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/8/2012. (als, )
February 8, 2012 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under 102A, B and G by Mr. Reines on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (als, )
February 8, 2012 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under sections 102A and 102B by Mr. Budwin on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (als, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting [] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under section 101. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/8/12. (als, )
February 8, 2012 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law under section 101 by Mr. Budwin on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (als, )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER taking under advisement [] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to no evidence of invalidity.FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/8/12. (als, )
February 8, 2012 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to no evidence of invalidty presented by Mr. Budwin on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (als, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 1349 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 2/8/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger & Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 exhibit lists tendered at trial on 2/8/12) (als, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 1342 TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING TIME LIMITATION FOR INVALIDITY TRIAL by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF JENNIFER HALTOM DOAN IN SUPPORT OF, # 2 DECLARATION OF ANDREW L. PERITO IN SUPPORT OF, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1341 PLEASE IGNORE. FILED IN ERROR. CORRECTED DOCUMENT REFILED AT DE 1342. PLEASE IGNORE. TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING TIME LIMITATION FOR INVALIDITY TRIAL by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer H. Doan, # 2 Declaration of Andrew L. Perito, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 2/9/2012 (leh, ).
February 8, 2012 Filing 1340 TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' OFFER OF PROOF #5 REGARDING PRIOR ART CODE AND DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew L. Perito In Support Of, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1339 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF LICENSES IN THE VALIDITY TRIAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1338 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law ON DEFENDANTS' ASSERTIONS OF INVALIDITY by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1337 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
February 8, 2012 Filing 1336 Proposed Jury Instructions by Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Reines, Edward)
February 7, 2012 Filing 1335 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
February 7, 2012 Filing 1334 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 2/7/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger & Shea Sloan.) (als, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 ORDER granting 1330 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft Citigroup Inc, are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the settlement agreement. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/07/12. cc:attys 2-07-12 (mll, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 1333 Sealed Document. Jury Questionnaires. (als, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 1332 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection and Trial held on 2/6/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger & Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (als, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 1330 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gafford, Galyn)
February 6, 2012 Filing 1329 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1317 Emergency MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS, VIDEO DEMONSTRATIONS, SOURCE CODE AND PREVIOUSLY UNIDENTIFIED PRIOR ART filed by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Andrew L. Perito In Support Of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Declaration Of Scott Walker In Support of Opposition)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 5, 2012 Filing 1328 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated of Change in Lead Attorney (Wolff, Jason)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1327 NOTICE by CDW Corporation re 1315 Order -- CDW LLC's Joinder in Certain Defendants' Objections (at Dkt. 1326) to the Court's Agenda for the Invalidity Trial and the in Limine Order Relating to Context for the Invalidity Trial (Hartzell, Julianne)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1326 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1315 Order Defendants' Objection to the Court's Agenda for the Invalidity Trial and in Limine Order Relataing to Context for the Invalidity Trial (Reines, Edward)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1325 NOTICE of Settlement by Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Fuller, Michael)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1324 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1305 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT 1297) RE GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE (DKT 790) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT 1297) RE GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE (DKT 790) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. R. Johnson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1323 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Neil Warren for Adobe Systems Incorporated. (mll, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER construing the term "browser application". Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/12. cc:attys 2-03-12(mll, )
February 3, 2012 Filing 1321 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ada Elene Brown on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California (Brown, Ada)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1320 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1313 Emergency MOTION to Strike THE SUPPLEMENTAL ERRATA SHEET OF ERIC BINA filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1319 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1313 Emergency MOTION to Strike THE SUPPLEMENTAL ERRATA SHEET OF ERIC BINA filed by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1318 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1301 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Re The Term "Browser Application" filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - Academic Dictionary)(Wolff, Jason)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1317 Emergency MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' LATE-PRODUCED DOCUMENTS, VIDEO DEMONSTRATIONS, SOURCE CODE AND PREVIOUSLY UNIDENTIFIED PRIOR ART by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit 1, # 14 Exhibit 2, # 15 Exhibit 3, # 16 Exhibit 4, # 17 Exhibit 5, # 18 Exhibit 6, # 19 Exhibit 7, # 20 Exhibit 8, # 21 Exhibit 9, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1316 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 ORDER in Limine. No party shall state or imply that infringement has been conceded or that infringement is yet to be determined by this or any other jury. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/02/12. cc:attys 2-02-12(mll, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 ORDER that defts respond no later than noon, 2-03-2012 to 1313 Emergency MOTION to Strike THE SUPPLEMENTAL ERRATA SHEET OF ERIC BINA filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/02/12. cc:attys 2-02-12(mll, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 1313 Emergency MOTION to Strike THE SUPPLEMENTAL ERRATA SHEET OF ERIC BINA by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2012: # 7 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ).
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1306 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Plaintiffs shall respond to Go Daddys Motion for Judgment 1305 no later than 5:00 PM on Friday, 2-03-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/12. cc:attys 2-01-12 (mll, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 ORDER that Citigroup Inc. shall be party to the upcoming invalidity trial set for 2-06-2012, unless the appropriate papers regarding settlement or dismissal are filed with the Court beforehand. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/12. cc:attys 2-01-12(mll, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 ORDER setting agenda for the Invalidity Trial set for 2-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/12. cc:attys 2-01-12(mll, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 1309 ANSWER to 1248 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
February 1, 2012 Filing 1308 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 1301 Motion for Leave. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 1307 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REGARDING THE TERM "BROWSER APPLICATION" filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike)
January 30, 2012 Filing 1306 MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT 1305) by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 30, 2012 Filing 1305 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER THE COURT'S ORDER (DKT 1297) RE GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE (DKT 790) by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 ORDER granting 1301 Motion for Leave to File a Brief Regarding the Term "Browser Application." Pltfs shall respond no later than 2-01-2012. Pltfs' response shall not exceed 5 pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/12. cc:attys 1-27-12 (mll, )
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1269 Motion to Correct the Caption; denying as moot 1268 Motion to Correct the Caption. The Court directs the Clerks Office to amend the caption by (1) adding The Regents of the University of California as the second listed Plaintiff; and (2) removing Apple Inc., Blockbuster Inc., eBay Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., New Frontier Media, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Perot Systems Corp., Playboy Enterprises International, Inc., Rent-A-Center, Inc., Sun Microsystems Inc., and Texas Instruments Inc. from the list of Defendants. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/12. cc:attys 1-27-12 (mll, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 1302 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1301 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Re The Term "Browser Application" Exhibit A to Brief - 2011-10-27 Phillips Report excerpts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B to Brief - 2011-11-15 Martin Report excerpt, # 2 Exhibit G to Brief - 2011-08-10 Michael Doyle Depo, # 3 Exhibit H to Brief - 2011-08-11 Michael Doyle Depo, # 4 Exhibit I to Brief - 2011-07-21 Cheong Ang Depo)(Wolff, Jason)
January 27, 2012 Filing 1301 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Re The Term "Browser Application" by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defs Brief re the Term "Browser Application", # 2 Exhibit C to Brief - p353-meyrowitz82, # 3 Exhibit D to Brief - IRIS Hypermedia_Haan92, # 4 Exhibit E to Brief - ADBE0196713 Rowe92, # 5 Exhibit F to Brief - DBE0196715 Hindus93)(Wolff, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2012: # 6 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal, # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
January 26, 2012 Filing 1299 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 1288 Sealed Document. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 ORDER denying 860 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike; denying 861 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike; denying 868 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike; denying 869 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 873 Sealed Patent Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 874 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 877 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 901 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 902 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony; denying 903 Sealed Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 904 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 905 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Reports; denying 906 Motion to Strike/Preclude Expert Testimony; denying 930 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike; denying 1150 Sealed Patent Motion to Preclude Reliance on Documents; denying 1151 Sealed Patent Motion Regarding Portions of Expert Testimony; denying 1152 Sealed Motion to Strike; denying 1154 Sealed Motion to Strike; granting 1182 Motion for Leave to File Motion in Limine; granting in part 1186 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; denying in part 1189 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting 1271 Motion in Limine; granting 1273 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting 1282 Motion to Include Jury Questionnaire with Jury Summons. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12 (mll, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 790 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; denying 870 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; granting in part and denying in part 876 Sealed Patent Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; granting 1149 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12 (mll, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 1300 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (als, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 1296 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Adobe's {Proposed) Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Its License Defense Arising From The Sun/Oracle License (Scherkenbach, Frank)
January 24, 2012 Filing 1295 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Go Daddy's [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to its License Defense Based on its use of Server-Side Microsoft Software. (Mukherji, Proshanto)
January 24, 2012 Filing 1294 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Labbe, John)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1293 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT ADOBE'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FOR ADOBE'S LACHES, EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL AND IMPLIED LICENSE. (Scherkenbach, Frank)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1292 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Inequitable Conduct (Reines, Edward)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1291 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc.s Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Equitable Estoppel filed by Amazon.com, Inc. and Yahoo!, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reines, Edward)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1290 Proposed Findings of Fact by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1289 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Licensing and Exhaustion. (Jones, Michael)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1288 Sealed Document. (Joe, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2012: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
January 23, 2012 Filing 1287 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. DEFENDANT STAPLES, INC.'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Ewenstein, Richard)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1286 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING DEFENDANTS' INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (McKool, Mike)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1285 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING DEFENDANTS' LACHES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (McKool, Mike)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1284 Proposed Findings of Fact by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1283 NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. re 1264 Order J.C. Penney's Objection to Final Trial Plan (Joe, Christopher)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1282 Joint MOTION to Include Jury Questionnaire by Mail with Jury Summons by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., The Regents of the University of California, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Juror Questionnaire)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1281 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Plan and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 1/19/12 before Chief District Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/16/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2012. (sms, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 ORDER granting 1260 Motion to Extend Deadlines Regarding Deposition Designations Related to Google, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/12. (mjc, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 ORDER granting 1254 Motion. The Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are due on Monday, 1/23/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/12. (mjc, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER granting 1272 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motions In Limine Regarding The Invalidity Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/12. (mjc, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER granting 1270 Motion for Leave to File Two Additional Motion in Limine Issues Solely for the Validity Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/12. (mjc, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 1276 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1273 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING THE INVALIDITY TRIAL filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1275 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1271 MOTION in Limine (SECOND OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE SOLELY FOR THE VALIDITY TRIAL) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1274 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. re 1263 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Sealed Patent Motion,, Order on Motion to Sever, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 1264 Order Objection to Final Trial Plan (Reines, Edward)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1273 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING THE INVALIDITY TRIAL by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Perito, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1272 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING THE INVALIDITY TRIAL by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1271 MOTION in Limine (SECOND OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE SOLELY FOR THE VALIDITY TRIAL) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1270 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File TWO ADDITIONAL MOTION IN LIMINE ISSUES SOLELY FOR THE "INVALIDITY TRIAL" by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1269 Opposed MOTION TO CORRECT THE CAPTION (CORRECTED) re 1268 Opposed MOTION TO CORRECT THE CAPTION by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 22, 2012 Filing 1268 Opposed MOTION TO CORRECT THE CAPTION by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 21, 2012 Filing 1267 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by The Regents of the University of California, Eolas Technologies Incorporated to 1241 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, filed by The Regents of the University of California, Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1266 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1152 SEALED MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Strike "Supplemental" Expert Reports of David Martin Disclosing New Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1265 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1151 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1264 FINAL TRIAL PLAN. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/20/12. cc:attys 1-20-12(mll, )
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 ORDER denying 1118 Motion for Discovery; denying as moot 1133 Sealed Patent Motion for a Separate Trial; denying as moot 1134 Sealed Patent Motion for a Separate Trial; denying as moot 1158 Motion to Sever and for Separate Trial; denying 1159 Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims for Trial; denying as moot 1169 Motion to Increase the Court's Limit of Designated Exhibits for Trial; denying as moot 1171 Sealed Motion for Separate trial or to Sever; denying as moot 1176 Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits; denying 1218 Sealed Motion for Jury Trial on Inequitable Conduct; denying as moot 1219 Sealed Patent Motion to Sever and for an Individual Trial; denying as moot 1226 Sealed Patent Motion to Sever and/or for Individual Trial; denying as moot 1242 Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Serve Certain Pretrial Documents; denying as moot 1252 Sealed Patent Motion to Sever and for a Separate Trial; denying as moot 1255 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Court's Standing Order; denying as moot 1256 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Court's Standing Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/20/12. cc:attys 1-20-12 (mll, )
January 20, 2012 Filing 1262 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1154 SEALED MOTION to Strike a Portion of the December 13, 2011 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. David M. Martin, Jr. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(McKool, Mike)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1261 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL REQUEST (McKool, Mike)
January 20, 2012 Filing 1260 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND DEADLINES REGARDING DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS RELATED TO GOOGLE, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 19, 2012 Filing 1259 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC re 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) of Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Suppl Authority D.I. 1225 to Defs MSJ of Invalidity (Healey, David)
January 19, 2012 Filing 1258 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2012 re 1134 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial filed by Amazon.com Inc., 1133 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial filed by Yahoo! Inc., 1159 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims for Trial filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Citigroup Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., CDW Corporation, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Staples, Inc., 1176 MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits filed by YouTube, LLC, The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Citigroup Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Google Inc., CDW Corporation, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Staples, Inc., 1218 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Jury Trial on Inequitable Conduct filed by YouTube, LLC, The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Citigroup Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Google Inc., CDW Corporation, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Staples, Inc., 1242 MOTION for Leave for Additional Time to Serve Certain Pre-Trial Documents filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., 1158 Opposed MOTION to Sever or for Separate Trial filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, 1219 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever and for an Individual Trial filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., 1171 SEALED MOTION for Separate Trial or To Sever filed by Staples, Inc., 1169 Unopposed MOTION TO INCREASE THE COURT'S LIMIT OF DESIGNATED EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, 1118 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory filed by YouTube, LLC, The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Citigroup Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Google Inc., CDW Corporation, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., 1226 SEALED PATENT MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and/or For Individual Trial filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (als, )
January 19, 2012 Filing 1257 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated of Change in Lead Attorney (Scherkenbach, Frank)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1256 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadlines Regarding Defendants' Deposition Designations by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1255 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Court's Standing Order for Deposition Designations by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1254 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law for Bench Issues by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1253 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1249 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Exhibit 4)(Joe, Christopher)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1252 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant CDW LLC's Motion to Sever and for a Separate Trial by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Labbe, John)
January 18, 2012 Filing 1251 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrina G Eash on behalf of The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (Eash, Katrina)
January 18, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: In Addition to the Trial Plan Hearing, the Court will take up the following Motions:Yahoo!, Inc.s Motion for a Separate Trial (Docket No. 1133); Amazon.com, Inc.s Motion for a Separate Trial (Docket No. 1134); Adobe System Inc.s Motion for Separate Trial or to Sever (Docket No. 1158); Staples, Inc.s Motion for Separate Trial or to Sever (Docket No. 1171); Defendants Google, Inc. and YouTube LLCs Motion to Sever and for an Individual Trial (Docket No. 1219); Defendant J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.s Motion to Sever and/or for Individual Trial (Docket No. 1226); Defendants Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims for Trial (Docket No. 1159); Defendants Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits (Docket No. 1176); Google, Inc. and YouTube, LLCs Motion for Leave for Additional Time to Serve Certain Pre-Trial Documents (Docket No. 1242); Defendants Motion for Jury Trial on Inequitable Conduct (Docket No. 1218); Opposed Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen, and Los Alamos National Laboratory (Docket No. 1118). Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER granting 1237 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Citigroup to file its Reply in Support of its Daubert Motion is extended to 1-27-2012, and the corresponding deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Sur-Reply is extended to 2-03-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/12. cc:attys 1-18-12 (mll, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 1249 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1152 SEALED MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Strike "Supplemental" Expert Reports of David Martin Disclosing New Infringement Contentions filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Joe, Christopher)
January 17, 2012 Filing 1248 ANSWER to 1075 Amended Complaint, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..(Joe, Christopher)
January 17, 2012 Filing 1247 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1158 Opposed MOTION to Sever or for Separate Trial filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 17, 2012 ***PLEASE DISREGARD PREVIOUS ERROR NOTICE. Document # 1244 Proposed Pretrial Order IS NOT ERRORED OR TERMINATED. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
January 17, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1244 Proposed Pretrial Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 1246 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT ON ITS DAMAGES MODEL (McKool, Mike)
January 16, 2012 Filing 1245 Proposed Jury Instructions by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A, # 4 Appendix B, # 5 Appendix C, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K)(McKool, Mike)
January 16, 2012 Filing 1244 Proposed Pretrial Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(McKool, Mike) Modified on 1/17/2012 (mjc, ). Modified on 1/17/2012 (mjc, ).
January 15, 2012 Filing 1242 MOTION for Leave for Additional Time to Serve Certain Pre-Trial Documents by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Jones, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 110111 email from Jones, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 14, 2012 Filing 1241 SEALED PATENT SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 905 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jan. 4 Trans Weinstein, # 2 Exhibit B - Jan. 5 Trans Weinstein)(Jones, Michael)
January 14, 2012 Filing 1240 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS AND OPINIONS OF ROY WEINSTEIN [#905] by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1239 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1186 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (OMNIBUS) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Silvey Depo Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - Bakewell Report Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - Weinstein Report Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - Doyle Depo Excerpts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1238 SEALED REPLY to Response to CDW's Sealed Motion 1154 to Strike a Portion of the December 13, 2011 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. David M. Martin, Jr. filed by CDW Corporation. (Sanderson, Scott)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1237 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fuller, Michael)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1236 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1189 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1235 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1188 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Initiate A Re-Examination of the '906 Patent filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1234 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1202 Opposed MOTION in Limine CORRECTED - to Exclude Plaintiffs' Suggestion, Argument or Evidence That CDW Could Completely Remove or Disable Accused Features at Minimal Cost filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1233 RESPONSE to 1190 Notice (Other) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1232 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1151 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Google Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Healey, David)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1231 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1150 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO A/ B TESTING PRODUCED BY J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. AFTER CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1230 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1149 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONSTRUING THE MICROSOFT AND APPLE AGREEMENTS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 ORDER granting 1228 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/12. cc:attys 1-13-12 (mll, )
January 13, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1227 Sealed Patent Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.***(mjc, )
January 12, 2012 Filing 1228 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Pretrial Deadline for Exchange of Electronic Copies of Numbered Trial Exhibits by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 12, 2012 Filing 1227 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1150 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO A/ B TESTING PRODUCED BY J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. AFTER CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 1/13/2012 (gsg).
January 12, 2012 Filing 1226 SEALED PATENT MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and/or For Individual Trial by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
January 12, 2012 Filing 1225 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
January 11, 2012 Filing 1224 NOTICE by Citigroup Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Fuller, Michael)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER granting 1215 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Revised Deposition Designations. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/11/12. cc:attys 1-11-12 (mll, )
January 11, 2012 Filing 1222 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (McKool, Mike)
January 11, 2012 Filing 1221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gayle Rosenstein Klein on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Klein, Gayle)
January 11, 2012 Filing 1220 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Healey, David)
January 11, 2012 Filing 1219 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Sever and for an Individual Trial by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Weinstein Report excerpt, # 2 Exhibit B - Martin Supp Report excerpt, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 10, 2012 Filing 1218 SEALED MOTION Defendants Motion for Jury Trial on Inequitable Conduct by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Y. Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
January 10, 2012 Filing 1217 NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. The Go Daddy Group, Inc.'s Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (McNabnay, Neil)
January 10, 2012 Filing 1216 NOTICE by CDW Corporation (CDW LLC) of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real-Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (pursuant to the Court's 09/15/2011 Amended Docket Order) (Labbe, John)
January 10, 2012 Filing 1215 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1174 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Unopposed Motion For Deadline For Defendants To Submit Revised Deposition Designations by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
January 10, 2012 Filing 1214 NOTICE by Staples, Inc. Notice of Request for Daily and Realtime Transcripts (Richardson, Michael)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 ORDER setting Hearing for 1/19/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis re 1168 Notice of Status Update Regarding the Parties' Relative Positions on a Trial Plan. Eolas Technologies Inc shall file a document showing its approximate damage model with regard to each Defendant by 1-16-2012. The Court instructs the parties to be prepared to start trial immediately following jury selection on 2-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/12. cc:attys 1-10-12(mll, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER granting 1201 Motion for Leave to File motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/12. cc:attys 1-10-12 (mll, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER granting 1194 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/12. cc:attys 1-10-12 (mll, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 ORDER granting 1184 Motion for Leave to File Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/12. cc:attys 1-10-12 (mll, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 1209 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1208 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Estimated Trial Time) (Doan, Jennifer)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1207 NOTICE by Citigroup Inc. Notice of Time Estimate for Trial (Fuller, Michael)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1206 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California PLAINTIFFS' TRIAL TIME ESTIMATES (McKool, Mike)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1205 NOTICE by CDW Corporation Notice of Time Estimated for Trial (Labbe, John)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1204 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC of Estimated Trial Time (Jones, Michael)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1203 NOTICE by Staples, Inc. Notice of Time Estimate for Trial (Boudreau, Alexandra)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1202 Opposed MOTION in Limine CORRECTED - to Exclude Plaintiffs' Suggestion, Argument or Evidence That CDW Could Completely Remove or Disable Accused Features at Minimal Cost by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Labbe, John)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1201 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Stand-Alone Motion in Limine by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Labbe, John)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1200 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings) (Doan, Jennifer)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1199 NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. Notice of Time Estimate for Trial (Mukherji, Proshanto)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1198 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated Notice of Time Estimate for Trial (Healey, David)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1197 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1150 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO A/ B TESTING PRODUCED BY J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. AFTER CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1196 NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. J.C. Penney's Notice of Request For Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Joe, Christopher)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1195 NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. J.C. Penney's Notice of Time Estimate For Trial (Joe, Christopher)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1194 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 979 Order (Unopposed Motion to Amend Deadline for Submitting Joint Pretrial Order) by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 9, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1192 Motion in Limine submitted by CDW Corporation. Document does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
January 8, 2012 Filing 1193 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1176 MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 7, 2012 Filing 1192 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Opposed MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Suggestion, Argument or Evidence That CDW Could Completely Remove or Disable Accused Features at Minimal Cost by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Labbe, John) Modified on 1/9/2012 (mjc, ).
January 6, 2012 Filing 1191 Joint MOTION in Limine (OMNIBUS) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1190 NOTICE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc. re 1189 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine Statement by Go Daddy, CDW and JC Penney Regarding Defendants Motion in Limine, Issue No. 4 (Mukherji, Proshanto)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1189 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1188 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Initiate A Re-Examination of the '906 Patent by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Weinstein Core Rpt, # 2 Exhibit B - Expert Rpt of Weinstein re Adobe, # 3 Exhibit C - Expert Rpt of Martin, # 4 Exhibit D - Sadowski Depo Excerpts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1187 DEFENDANTS SEALED PATENT RESPONSE [OPPOSITION] to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1149 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONSTRUING THE MICROSOFT AND APPLE AGREEMENTS filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Y. Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1186 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (OMNIBUS) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1185 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1151 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected and Unopposed MFL to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Initiate a Re-Examination of the '906 Patent by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1182 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Efforts to Initiate a Re-Examination of the '906 Patent by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 01/06/12. cc:attys 1-06-12(mll, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 1180 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1154 SEALED MOTION to Strike a Portion of the December 13, 2011 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. David M. Martin, Jr. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1179 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND TRIAL EXHIBITS (McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1178 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1152 SEALED MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Strike "Supplemental" Expert Reports of David Martin Disclosing New Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush: Telephone Hotline Conference held on 1/6/2012. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (ttm, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 1176 MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Emails)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 6, 2012 Filing 1175 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1127 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Roy Weinstein as Against Citigroup filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC of Defendants' Initial Deposition Designations (Healey, David)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1173 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF ISSUES TO BE TRIED TO THE BENCH (McKool, Mike)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1172 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC of Identification of Issues To Be Tried By The Court (Jones, Michael)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1171 SEALED MOTION for Separate Trial or To Sever by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
January 5, 2012 Filing 1170 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 1176 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** MOTION for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - emails)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 1/6/2012 (mll, ).
January 5, 2012 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing:HOTLINE Discovery Hearing set for Friday, 1/6/2012 10:00 AM Central Standard Time in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush. Parties to appear telephonically and counsel shall provide the Court and parties with conference call dial-in information no later than 9:00 AM CST. (ttm, )
January 5, 2012 Filing 1169 Unopposed MOTION TO INCREASE THE COURT'S LIMIT OF DESIGNATED EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
January 4, 2012 Filing 1168 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated STATUS UPDATE REGARDING THE PARTIES' RELATIVE POSITIONS ON A TRIAL PLAN (McKool, Mike)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER granting 815 Motion for Leave to Supplement PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions; denying as moot 852 Sealed Patent Motion for Separate Trial; denying as moot 854 Motion to Set Deadlines for Discovery and Expert Reports; denying as moot 976 Motion to Expedite Motion to Dismiss for Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-04-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Filing 1166 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1159 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims for Trial of Joinder (Jones, Michael)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1165 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC re 1151 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin of Joinder (Jones, Michael)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Guy Fasone, III on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Fasone, Thomas)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1163 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1134 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial, 1133 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ORDER granting 1156 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 1090 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-03-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 ORDER granting 1153 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motions to Strike and Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-03-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 ORDER granting 1148 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions with Respect to Staples Inc's New Way Websites. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-03-12 (mll, )
December 30, 2011 Filing 1159 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims for Trial by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 29, 2011 Filing 1158 Opposed MOTION to Sever or for Separate Trial by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
December 27, 2011 Filing 1157 SEALED PATENT CONSOLIDATED REPLY to PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial re 1133 (Yahoo!) and 1134 (Amazon) filed by Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Y. Huang, # 2 Exhibit A)(Reines, Edward
December 27, 2011 Filing 1156 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 1090 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 27, 2011 Received three DVD copies of Exhibit E and three DVD copies of Exhibit F to Docket Number 1150 via Fed Ex. Sent two copies of each to chambers and put the third copy in the vault under seal. (mjc, )
December 27, 2011 Filing 1155 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Labbe for CDW Corporation. (mll, )
December 23, 2011 Filing 1154 SEALED MOTION to Strike a Portion of the December 13, 2011 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. David M. Martin, Jr. by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Supplemental Expert Report of David M. Martin, Jr.), # 2 Exhibit B (Expert Report of David M. Martin, Jr.))(Sanderson, Scott)
December 23, 2011 Filing 1153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Strike and Daubert Motions by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (granting requested extension of deadline))(Sanderson, Scott)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1152 SEALED MOTION J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Motion to Strike "Supplemental" Expert Reports of David Martin Disclosing New Infringement Contentions by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1151 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion Regarding Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David J. Healey, # 2 Exhibit A - 2011-11-30 Supplemental Expert Report of David Martin, # 3 Exhibit B - David Martin Vol 1 Rough Draft, # 4 Exhibit C - 2011-11-17 Maggs Expert Report - CONF AEO, # 5 Exhibit D - www.godaddy.com, # 6 Exhibit E - videos.godaddy.com, # 7 Exhibit F - www.adobe.com video, # 8 Exhibit G - www.adobe.com-financial, # 9 Exhibit H - www.photoshop.com, # 10 Exhibit I - 2011-03-03 Defendants Markman, # 11 Exhibit J - US Patent 5367621, # 12 Exhibit K - Felten Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L - 2011-11-15 Rebuttal Rpt re Noninfringement of Phillips w Exs - HC AEO, # 14 Exhibit M - Applicant Remarks., # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2011: # 16 Exhibit J Searchable) (mjc, ).
December 22, 2011 Filing 1150 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE RELIANCE ON DOCUMENTS AND FACTS RELATED TO A/ B TESTING PRODUCED BY J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. AFTER CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1149 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONSTRUING THE MICROSOFT AND APPLE AGREEMENTS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1148 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO STAPLES, INC.'S NEW WAY WEBSITES by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1147 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Parker Chad Ankrum on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Ankrum, Parker)
December 22, 2011 Filing 1146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Keith Waldrop on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Waldrop, Jonathan)
December 21, 2011 Filing 1145 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1134 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 21, 2011 Filing 1144 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1133 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 20, 2011 Filing 1143 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Lumish, Douglas)
December 19, 2011 Filing 1142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Lee on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Lee, Joseph)
December 19, 2011 Filing 1141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (Homrig, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER granting 1139 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/11. cc:attys 12-19-11 (mll, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 1139 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 979 Order by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 16, 2011 Filing 1138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Lane on behalf of The Go Daddy Group, Inc. (Lane, John)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1135 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The Court ORDERS that briefing on the two motions for separate trial proceed according to the following schedule: Response due: 12-21-2011; Reply due: 12-27-2011; and Surreply due: 1-03-2012. All parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in an effort to arrive at a joint, proposed trial plan and schedule. The parties shall submit their joint, proposed trial plan and schedule to the Court by 1-04-2012. If the parties are unable to arrive at a consensus, they shall file a status update regarding the parties relative positions on a trial plan by 1-04-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/11. cc:attys 12-15-11 (mll, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 1136 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1118 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(McKool, Mike)
December 12, 2011 Filing 1135 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing on Yahoo!s Motion for Separate Trial by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
December 12, 2011 Filing 1134 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward R. Reines, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
December 12, 2011 Filing 1133 SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Separate Trial by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Declaration of Edward R. Reines, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
December 12, 2011 Filing 1132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Wheeler Creekmore, IV on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Creekmore, Stephen)
December 9, 2011 Filing 1131 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1118 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER granting 1129 Motion to Amend/Correct briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/11. cc:attys 12-09-11 (mll, )
December 8, 2011 Filing 1129 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 979 Order Motion to Revise Schedule for Briefing of Motions to Strike and Daubert Motions by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., Texas Instruments Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 8, 2011 Filing 1128 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1127 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Roy Weinstein as Against Citigroup CORRECTED EXHIBIT A. (Fuller, Michael)
December 8, 2011 Filing 1127 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Roy Weinstein as Against Citigroup by Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A,EXHIBIT A FILED IN ERROR; SEE DOCUMENT 1128 FOR CORRECT EXHIBIT # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Fuller, Michael) Modified on 12/9/2011 (mll, ).
December 5, 2011 Filing 1126 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1118 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
December 5, 2011 Filing 1125 ANSWER to 1109 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
December 2, 2011 Filing 1124 NOTICE by Frito-Lay, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (McSwane, Douglas)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ORDER granting 1122 Motion to Remove Attorney From ECF Notifications. Electronic notices sent in this case to Douglas R. McSwane, Jr. shall terminate effective the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/02/11. cc:attys 12-02-11 (mll, )
December 1, 2011 Filing 1122 Unopposed MOTION To Remove Attorney from Receiving CM/ECF Notifications by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER granting 1119 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiffs shall file any brief in opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery no later than 12-05-2011; that Defendants file any reply brief no later than 12-09-2011, and that Plaintiffs file any sur-reply brief no later than 12-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER granting 1117 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs deadline to serve its rebuttal expert report to Nicholas P. Godicis expert reports is extended to 12-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 1119 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite (Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Expedited Briefing on Defendants' Motion For Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory) by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
November 29, 2011 Filing 1118 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Serve Discovery on Apple, Inc., Patrick Heynen and Los Alamos National Laboratory by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Discovery Topics, # 3 Exhibit 2 - July 20 Email Exchange)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 29, 2011 Filing 1117 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1105 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ORDER granting 1113 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltfs and deft Frito-Lay Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-28-11 (mll, )
November 22, 2011 Filing 1115 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 9/21/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 70 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, )
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 ORDER granting 1112 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 1050 Motion for Leave to Supplement PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/22/11. cc:attys 11-22-11 (mll, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 1113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED, THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AND FRITO-LAY, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
November 21, 2011 Filing 1112 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
November 18, 2011 Filing 1111 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1090 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(McKool, Mike)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 ORDER granting 1101 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Amazon, Go Daddy, and Yahoo's deadline to serve their rebuttal expert report on noninfringement is extended to 11-17-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/11. cc:attys 11-18-11 (mll, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 1109 Go Daddy's ANSWER to 1075 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 17, 2011 Filing 1108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Silena Paik for Staples, Inc. (mll, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 1107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexandra C Boudreau for Staples, Inc. (mll, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 1106 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard Ewenstein for Staples, Inc. (mll, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER granting 1102 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Report on Damages. The Plaintiffs' deadline to serve its rebuttal expert report to Nicholas P. Godici's expert reports is extended up to and including 11/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/11. (leh, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER granting 1100 JC Penny Corporation Inc's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Report on Damage. The deadline for JC Penny Corporation Inc to serve its rebuttal expert report on damage is extended to 11/23/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/11. (leh, )
November 16, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 1103 Response in Opposition to Motion. Clerk has modified this entry to be a "sealed" entry per request of atty. Certificate of authority to seal was included and was entry was meant to be sealed but sealed event not used at time of filing. (sm, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 1102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Motion to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Report on Damages) by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File EXPERT REPORT ON NONINFRINGEMENT by Amazon.com Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukherji, Proshanto)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline For J.C. Penney's Rebuttal Expert Report on Damages by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1099 NOTICE by Perot Systems Corp. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Dacus, Deron)
November 14, 2011 Filing 1098 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (McSwane, Douglas)
November 9, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1095 Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS OVER PAGE LIMITS. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 1097 .*** (mjc, )
November 9, 2011 Filing 1097 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 1095 .***>REPLY to Response to Motion re 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 11/9/2011 (mjc, ).
November 9, 2011 Filing 1096 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Quigley on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Quigley, James)
November 9, 2011 Filing 1095 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 11/9/2011 (mjc, ).
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER granting 1092 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Staples, Inc. shall file any brief in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery no later than 11-15-2011, that Plaintiffs file any reply brief no later than 11-18-2011, and that Staples file any sur-reply brief no later than 11-22-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, )
November 4, 2011 Filing 1093 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Yee, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
November 4, 2011 Filing 1092 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
November 4, 2011 Filing 1091 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1090 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 14 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 24 Part 2)(McKool, Mike)
November 4, 2011 Filing 1090 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Fasone, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 AMENDED ORDER that the 11-17-2011 hearing is cancelled, and arguments on all pending motions will be heard at the 1-24-2012 Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/11. cc:attys 11-02-11(mll, ) Modified on 11/2/2011 (mll, ).
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER granting 1087 Motion to Correct the Docket. The Regents of the University of California be removed as a defendant in this case and properly included as a plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/11. cc:attys 11-02-11 (mll, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 1087 Unopposed MOTION TO CORRECT DOCKET by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1086 ANSWER to 1025 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1085 ANSWER to 1028 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1084 ANSWER to 1016 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1083 ANSWER to 1055 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1082 ANSWER to 1058 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1081 ANSWER to 1024 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1080 ANSWER to 1026 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1079 ANSWER to 1013 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Filing 1078 ANSWER to 1017 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 ORDER granting 1074 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 10-31-11 (mll, )
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER Cancelling Deadline. The Court ORDERS that the 11-17-2011 hearing is cancelled, and arguments on all pending motions will be heard at the 1-19-2012 Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 10-31-11(mll, )
October 28, 2011 Filing 1075 AMENDED COMPLAINT (CORRECTED THIRD AMENDED) against Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, The Regents of the University of California.(McKool, Mike)
October 28, 2011 Filing 1074 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 891 Amended Complaint, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1073 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 930 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew B. Rappaport, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1072 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 904 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Garvish, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1071 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 906 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Jonathan H. Bari filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1070 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 868 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1069 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 860 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr. Concerning New Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher J. Mierzejewski, # 2 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1068 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 876 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Microsoft/Apple License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 10/31/2011 (mll, ).
October 27, 2011 Filing 1067 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 861 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1066 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 902 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin and Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1065 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 903 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1064 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 905 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Filing 1063 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 901 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein on Go Daddy's Damages filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER granting 1057 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER granting 1056 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, with respect to Eolas and Frito-Lay. Fact Discovery cutoff is extended to 11-18-2011; Expert Reports due 11-29-2011; Rebuttal expert reports and rebuttal trial witnesses identified by 12-19-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER granting 1054 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER granting 1053 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 907 Sealed Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 1058 AMENDED ANSWER to PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Yee, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2011 Filing 1057 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Frito-Lay, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Answer)(Yee, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2011 Filing 1056 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
October 26, 2011 Filing 1055 Corrected ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(Mukherji, Proshanto)
October 26, 2011 Filing 1054 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A CORRECTED ANSWER by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Mukherji, Proshanto) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
October 25, 2011 Filing 1053 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 907 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER granting 1051 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Frito-Lay, Inc. shall file any brief in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions no later than 11-04-2011; Plaintiffs shall file any reply brief no later than 11-09-2011; and Frito-Lay shall file any sur-reply brief no later than 11-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-25-11 (mll, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 1051 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R.3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 24, 2011 Filing 1050 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO FRITO-LAY, INC.'S HAPPINESS.LAYS.COM by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Fasone III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER denying 1042 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 1048 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 876 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Microsoft/Apple License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1047 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 873 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Enhanced Damages for Willful Infringement filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1046 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 877 SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1045 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 870 SEALED MOTION Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Its License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1044 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
October 21, 2011 Filing 1043 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 874 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
October 20, 2011 Filing 1042 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 20, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1038 Motion to Withdraw. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY TO REFILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** (mjc, )
October 18, 2011 Filing 1041 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 904 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julianne M. Hartzell, # 2 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Weinstein CDW Report, # 3 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Tzau Deposition, # 4 Exhibit I - Exemplary CDW Metrics Data, # 5 Exhibit J - June 3, 2011 Correspondence, # 6 Exhibit K - 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice)(Hartzell, Julianne)
October 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1037 Sealed Patent Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION. TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT DOCKET EVENT.*** (mjc, )
October 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1032, Sealed Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
October 18, 2011 Filing 1039 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 901 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein on Go Daddy's Damages filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER granting 1029 Motion for Leave to File Substitute Declaration. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/11. cc:attys 10-18-11 (mll, )
October 17, 2011 Filing 1038 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Withdraw 907 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Yahoo! Inc.. (Reines, Edward) Modified on 10/20/2011 (mjc, ).
October 17, 2011 Filing 1037 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN [Dkt. 904] by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julianne M. Hartzell, # 2 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Weinstein CDW Report, # 3 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Tzau Deposition, # 4 Exhibit I - Exemplary CDW Metrics, # 5 Exhibit J - June 3, 2011 Correspondence, # 6 Exhibit K - 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice)(Hartzell, Julianne) Modified on 10/18/2011 (mjc, ).
October 17, 2011 Filing 1036 REPLY to Response to Motion re 906 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Jonathan H. Bari filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Reines, Edward)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1035 REPLY to Response to Motion re 902 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin and Roy Weinstein filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1034 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 905 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1033 REPLY to Response to Motion re 903 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Healey, David)
October 17, 2011 Filing 1032 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 903 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 10/18/2011 (gsg).
October 17, 2011 Filing 1031 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION Reply in Support of Motion by Staples, Inc. to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations re 930 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations filed by Staples, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1030 FRITO-LAY, INC.'S ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, (Third), COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Frito-Lay, Inc..(Yee, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1029 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Substitute Declaration by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Substitute Declaration (Declaration of Wolff ISO of Reply ISO Defendants' MSJ of Invalidity Under Section 102(B)), # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Substitute Declaration)(Wolff, Jason)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1028 Staples, Inc.'s Third Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Answer (pages 16-17), # 2 Exhibit Third Amended Answer (pages 18 - 27), # 3 Exhibit Third Amended Answer (pages 28 - 33), # 4 Exhibit Third Amended Answer (pages 34 - 48), # 5 Exhibit Third Amended Answer (pages 49 - 69))(Richardson, Michael)
October 13, 2011 Filing 1027 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 1019 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 1026 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Amazon.com Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1025 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Yahoo! Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1024 CDW, LLC's ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by CDW Corporation.(Sanderson, Scott)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1023 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 876 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Microsoft/Apple License Defense filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T, # 2 Exhibit U, # 3 Exhibit V, # 4 Exhibit W)(Sanderson, Scott)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1022 REPLY to Response to Motion re 877 SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] 996 filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Reines, Edward)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1021 REPLY to Response to Motion re 874 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1020 REPLY to Response to Motion re 873 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Enhanced Damages for Willful Infringement filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1019 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1018 Ex E - McRae 13 and Martin 29 Response in Support of Motion,,,,. (Wolff, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2011: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
October 11, 2011 Filing 1018 RESPONSE in Support re 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Decl of Jason Wolff, # 2 Exhibit B - Bina Depo Exh 04, # 3 Exhibit C - Bina Depo Exh 07, # 4 Exhibit D - Pars 586-593 Excerpts from Phillips Expert Report on Invalidity)(Wolff, Jason)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1017 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by YouTube, LLC.(Jones, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1016 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Google Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1015 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 870 SEALED MOTION Adobe's Reply In Support of Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Its License Defense filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Eolas PR 3-1 Discl)(Mukherji, Proshanto)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1014 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, Citigroup's Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Citigroup Inc..(Fuller, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1013 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, Adobe System Incorporated's Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Healey, David)
October 11, 2011 Filing 1012 ANSWER to 891 Amended Complaint, GO DADDY'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLANTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER granting 1009 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 10-11-2011, to file their replies to motions for summary judgment; parties shall also have to 10-21-2011, to file their surreplies to motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER granting 1008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, )
October 7, 2011 Filing 1009 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies and Sur-Replies to Motions For Summary Judgment by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 7, 2011 Filing 1008 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Reply and Sur-Reply Briefs re Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Its License Defense by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukherji, Proshanto)
October 6, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2012 AT 9:00 am HAS BEEN CONTINUED AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESET TO 1/24/2012 AT 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
October 5, 2011 Filing 1007 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 902 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin and Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Campbell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1006 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 904 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F, Garvish II, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1005 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 901 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein on Go Daddy's Damages filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1004 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 930 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1003 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 907 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1002 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 905 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1001 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 903 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 5, 2011 Filing 1000 RESPONSE in Opposition re 906 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Jonathan H. Bari filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
October 3, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $4,950.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 9-20-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $9,900.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11(mll, )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER granting 991 Motion for Leave to File Response Brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/11. cc:attys 9-29-11 (mll, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 996 RESPONSE in Opposition re 877 SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 28, 2011 Filing 995 RESPONSE in Opposition re 874 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2011: # 8 Exhibit B Searchable, # 9 Exhibit C Searchable, # 10 Exhibit D Searchable) (mjc, ).
September 28, 2011 Filing 994 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2011: # 12 Exhibit E Searchable) (mjc, ).
September 28, 2011 Filing 993 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 870 SEALED MOTION Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Its License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 28, 2011 Filing 992 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 876 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Microsoft/Apple License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 28, 2011 Filing 991 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A RESPONSE BRIEF TO DEFENDANT ADOBE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 28, 2011 Filing 990 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 873 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Enhanced Damages for Willful Infringement filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Campbell, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER granting 965 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court construes the term executable application as set forth in this Order. The portion of the Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order setting forth the claim construction of executable application as contained in the 906 and 985 patents (Docket No. 914) is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/23/11. cc:attys 9-23-11 (mll, )
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER granting 890 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 967 Sealed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11 (mll, )
September 21, 2011 Filing 997 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2011 re 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated, 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER granting 986 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 968 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/11. cc:attys 9-22-11 (mll, )
September 20, 2011 Filing 986 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 968 MOTION to Compel LOG-IN INFORMATION FOR STAPLESLINK.COM AND EWAY.COM FROM STAPLES INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER denying as moot 658 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-20-11 (mll, )
September 19, 2011 Filing 984 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 967 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Statement of Non-Opposition to Add The Regents of The UC as a Co-Plaintiff Based on Conditions to Minimize Prejudice to the Defendants filed by Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
September 19, 2011 Filing 983 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 967 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Statement of Non-Opposition to Add The Regents of The UC as a Co-Plaintiff Based on Conditions to Minimize Prejudice to the Defendants filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 16, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO, 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF : Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 982 REPLY to Response to Motion re 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
September 16, 2011 Filing 981 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 982 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike) Modified on 9/16/2011 (mll, ).
September 16, 2011 Filing 980 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
September 15, 2011 Deadlines set per 979 Docket Control Order: Jury instructions due by 1/9/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2012. Evidentiary Hearing re Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions set for 11/17/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Evidentiary Hearing on Dauberts and Motions to Strike re: amended infringement and invalidity contentions, rebuttal expert reports and Summary Judgment (coinciding with pretrial conference) set for 1/19/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/6/2012 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 979 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11(mll, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER granting 975 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 968 MOTION to Compel LOG-IN INFORMATION FOR STAPLESLINK.COM AND EWAY.COM FROM STAPLES INC.; Responses due by 9/20/2011; Replies due by 9/22/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11 (mll, )
September 14, 2011 Filing 977 Joint MOTION to Enter Revised Docket Control Order by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Frito-Lay, Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2011 Filing 976 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Its Motion to Dismiss by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
September 14, 2011 Filing 975 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 968 MOTION to Compel LOG-IN INFORMATION FOR STAPLESLINK.COM AND EWAY.COM FROM STAPLES INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 13, 2011 Filing 974 RESPONSE in Opposition re 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLO cutory Appeal filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Jones, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER granting 969 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Defendant Staples shall file any brief in opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel no later than 9-14-2011 and that Plaintiff file any reply brief no later than 9-16-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/12/11. cc:attys 9-12-11 (mll, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER denying 793 Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/12/11. cc:attys 9-12-11 (mll, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 970 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
September 9, 2011 Filing 969 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL LOG-IN INFORMATION FOR STAPLES.LINK.COM AND EWAY.COM FROM STAPLES, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 9, 2011 Filing 968 MOTION to Compel LOG-IN INFORMATION FOR STAPLESLINK.COM AND EWAY.COM FROM STAPLES INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 7, 2011 Filing 967 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Statement of Non-Opposition to Add The Regents of The UC as a Co-Plaintiff Based on Conditions to Minimize Prejudice to the Defendants by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
September 6, 2011 Filing 966 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF (McKool, Mike)
September 6, 2011 Filing 965 MOTION for Reconsideration re 914 Memorandum & Opinion, EOLAS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER CONSTRUCTION OF "EXECUTABLE APPLICATION" IN MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (DKT. NO. 914) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CERTIFY THE QUESTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
September 1, 2011 Filing 964 NOTICE by Staples, Inc. re 955 Sealed Response to Motion,, 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF (Richardson, Michael)
September 1, 2011 Filing 963 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit F)(Mukherji, Proshanto)
August 31, 2011 Set Deadlines as to 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER granting 957 Motion to Vacate the Schedule and For Case Management Conference. Eolas shall file its Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Claim Construction Order Regarding Executable Application no later than 9-06-2011. Defendants response is due 9-13-2011. Plaintiffs reply is due 9-16-2011. Copies of all briefs should be provided to the technology advisorin this case. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding Plaintiffs 890 Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint To Add The Regents of The University of California As A Plaintiff, and file a status update no later than 9-06-2011 regarding whether this motion has been resolved. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Leave to Add The Regents of TheUniversity of California are hereby set for hearing on 9-21-2011 at 2:00p.m. Parties shall meet and confer regarding a revised docket controlorder in light of the continuance of this matter and shall submit a revised docket control order no later than 9-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/31/11. cc:attys 9-01-11 (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 961 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daryl Joseffer for Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 960 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam M Conrad for Google Inc., YouTube, LLC (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER granting in part 950 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/31/11. cc:attys 8-31-11 (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 958 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E Florey for Adobe Systems Incorporated (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 957 Joint MOTION to Vacate the Schedule and for Case Management Conference at the August 31, 2011 Hearing by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
August 30, 2011 Filing 956 SEALED PATENT MOTION REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE LATE-DISCLOSED INFRINGEMENT ALLEGATIONS by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Comparison of script tag to HTMLObjectElement, # 2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Martin Report, # 3 Exhibit C - Adobe Scene 7 Screen Shot, # 4 Exhibit D - Email service of Martin Report, # 5 Exhibit E - Email regarding Ang deposition scheduling)(Hartzell, Julianne)
August 29, 2011 Filing 955 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF filed by Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Reines, Edward)
August 29, 2011 Filing 954 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 854 MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS filed by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (McSwane, Douglas)
August 29, 2011 Filing 953 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 861 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Roy Weinstein filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 952 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 860 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr. Concerning New Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 951 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense DEFENDANT GO DADDY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE filed by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 950 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages JOINT MOTION TO EXCEED OPPOSITION, REPLY AND SUR-REPLY PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFS RELATING TO GO DADDY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NONINFRINGEMENT BASED ON ITS LICENSE DEFENSE by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 949 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 852 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trial and to Reset Pretrial Schedule filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER granting 947 Motion to Revise Schedule for Rebuttal Expert Reports. Service of Rebuttal Reports deadline is reset to 9-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, )
August 26, 2011 Filing 947 Unopposed MOTION To Revise Schedule for Rebuttal Expert Reports by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 26, 2011 Filing 946 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion 852 for Separate Trial and to Reset Pretrial Schedule filed by Frito-Lay, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Yee Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas)
August 26, 2011 Filing 945 REPLY to Response to Motion re 854 MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 26, 2011 Filing 944 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Michael Joe on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Joe, Christopher)
August 26, 2011 Filing 943 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Request for Termination of Electronics Notices as to Eric M. Albritton (Albritton, Eric)
August 26, 2011 Filing 942 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 937 Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
August 25, 2011 Filing 941 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 868 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER granting 936 Motion for Extension of Time. Go Daddy Group Inc shall have until 8-31-2011 to file its reply brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER granting 933 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Supplement. Eolas shall serve supplemental infringement contentions against Staples for thestapleslink.com and eway.com websites within three days of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 938 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 860 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr. Concerning New Infringement Contentions filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josh Budwin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2011: # 29 Exhibit R Searchable) (mjc, ).
August 24, 2011 Filing 937 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 861 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Roy Weinstein filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2011: # 11 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
August 24, 2011 Filing 936 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Eolas Opposition to Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER granting 872 Motion to withdraw motion; withdrawing 567 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-24-11 (mll, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 934 NOTICE by Citigroup Inc. Trial Witness List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, Michael)
August 24, 2011 Filing 933 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO STAPLES, INC.'S STAPLESLINK.COM AND EWAY.COM by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 24, 2011 Filing 932 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 907 Sealed Motion. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 931 RESPONSE in Support re 567 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Intervening Rights filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 23, 2011 Filing 930 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
August 23, 2011 Filing 929 NOTICE by Perot Systems Corp. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Evans, Vernon)
August 23, 2011 J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. was added as a party effective today when it was brought to our attention by chambers that the corporation was not added when the Amended Complaint 517 was filed on 12/7/2010. (mjc, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 928 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
August 23, 2011 Filing 927 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Perantie, Mark)
August 23, 2011 Filing 926 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Carpenter, Brian)
August 23, 2011 Filing 925 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Buether, Eric)
August 23, 2011 Filing 924 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 898 Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
August 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2011 01:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER granting 908 Motion to Expedite; granting 908 Motion for Hearing. Oral argument on Eolas 890 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Add The Regents of the University of California as a Co-Plaintiff will be heard as part of the already scheduled hearing set for 8-31-2011 at 1:00 pm. Defendants are ordered to file their brief in opposition to Eolas Motion for Leave no later than Monday 8-29-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11. (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 922 [Corrected] Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 22, 2011 Filing 921 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. Atty filed corrected document at DE 922. PLEASE IGNORE. Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 8/23/2011 (leh, ).
August 22, 2011 Filing 920 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by CDW Corporation. (Sanderson, Scott)
August 22, 2011 Filing 919 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Williams, Danny)
August 22, 2011 Filing 918 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Cravey, Christopher)
August 22, 2011 Filing 917 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Rodgers, Matthew)
August 22, 2011 Filing 916 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO Document # 899 Sealed Patent Response. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 915 Rebuttal Witness List by Citigroup Inc.. (Fuller, Michael)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 914 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 568 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 913 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER granting 896 Motion for Extension of Time. Staples, Inc. shall have until 8-23-2011 to file a motion to strike portions of David Martin's expert report. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting 895 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. The briefing schedule for CDWs Motions to Strike Portions of the Martin Report is as follows: CDWs Motion due 8-17-2011; Eolas Opposition due 8-25-2011; CDWs Reply due 8-30-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER granting 879 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Apple Inc are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to a settlement agreement between the parties. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 909 ORDER granting 878 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 908 MOTION to Expedite, MOTION for Hearing re 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 19, 2011 Filing 907 SEALED MOTION Yahoo!, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2011: # 6 Certficate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
August 19, 2011 Filing 906 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Daubert Motion to Preclude Expert Testimony of Jonathan H. Bari by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Aaron Huang, # 2 Exhibit A to Huang Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Huang Decl, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
August 19, 2011 Filing 905 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Opinions of Roy Weinstein by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of L. Robinson, # 3 Exhibit A - Weinstein Google Report 7-29-11, # 4 Exhibit B - James Stetson 7-26-11 Deposition Transcript Pages, # 5 Exhibit C- Weinstein Core Report 07-25-11)(Jones, Michael)
August 19, 2011 Filing 904 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 2 Exhibit B to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 3 Exhibit C to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 4 Exhibit D to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 5 Exhibit E to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 6 Exhibit F to CDW LLC's Motion to Exclude Weinstein's Expert Testimony, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hartzell, Julianne)
August 19, 2011 Filing 903 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Weinstein Core Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Adobe Report, # 3 Exhibit C - JC Penney Report Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit D - CDW Report Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit E - Oracle License Agreement, # 6 Exhibit F - Robeson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G - Excerpts fr Martin Report, # 8 Exhibit H - Eolas PR 3-1 Disclosure - Claim 1a-1f, # 9 Exhibit I - Adobe Profit Split Damages, # 10 Exhibit J - Amazon Profit Split Damages, # 11 Exhibit K - CDW Profit Split Damages, # 12 Exhibit L - Google Profit Split Damages, # 13 Exhibit M - Go Daddy Profit Split Damages, # 14 Exhibit N - JC Penney Profit Split Damages, # 15 Exhibit O - Staples Profit Split Damages, # 16 Exhibit P - Yahoo Profit Split Damages, # 17 Exhibit Q - Staples Report Excerpt, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
August 19, 2011 Filing 902 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of David Martin and Roy Weinstein by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott A. Sanderson, # 2 Exhibit A to Sanderson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Sanderson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Sanderson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Sanderson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Sanderson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Sanderson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Sanderson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Sanderson Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Sanderson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Sanderson Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Sanderson Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Sanderson Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Sanderson Declaration, # 15 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Scott)
August 19, 2011 Filing 901 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein on Go Daddy's Damages by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John R Lane, # 2 Exhibit Ex A - Expert Report of Roy Weinstein re Go Daddy, # 3 Exhibit Ex B - Weinstein Core Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit Ex C - GD-EOLAS120071-75, # 5 Exhibit Ex D - Martin GoDaddy Attachments, # 6 Exhibit Ex E - GD-EOLAS147350, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
August 19, 2011 Filing 900 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - SEALED NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DKT 899 FRITO-LAY'S OPPOSITION TO EOLAS'S MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS. (McSwane, Douglas)
August 19, 2011 Filing 899 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 854 MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS filed by Frito-Lay, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2011: # 2 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal and Certificate of Service Corrected) (mjc, ).
August 19, 2011 Filing 898 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 852 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trial and to Reset Pretrial Schedule filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Declaration of Robert M. Parker, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2011: # 13 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
August 19, 2011 Filing 897 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Latchford, Shawn)
August 19, 2011 Filing 896 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike as to David Martin's Expert Report by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
August 19, 2011 Filing 895 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on CDW's Motion to Strike Portions of Martin Report [Dkt. 868] by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hartzell, Julianne)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER that parties submit expedited briefing as to 872 Motion to Withdraw 567 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Intervening Rights. Eolass opposition brief due on 8-23-2011; Defendants reply brief due on 8-25-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-19-11(mll, )
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER granting 871 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Adobe Systems Incorporated is granted leave to file a summary judgment motion unique to Adobe Systems Incorporated, not to exceed eleven pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-19-11 (mll, )
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 892 ORDER granting 867 Joint Stipulation of No Pre-Suit Damages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-19-11(mll, )
August 18, 2011 Filing 891 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT) against Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Frito-Lay, Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 890 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 889 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCUMENT 890 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA AS A CO-PLAINTIFF by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike) Modified on 8/18/2011 (mll, ).
August 18, 2011 Filing 888 ANSWER to 822 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 887 ANSWER to 810 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 886 ANSWER to 809 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 885 ANSWER to 808 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 884 ANSWER to 804 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 883 ANSWER to 803 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 882 ANSWER to 802 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 881 ANSWER to 796 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 880 ANSWER to 797 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated.(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 Filing 879 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 872, Motion for Summary Judgment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
August 18, 2011 Filing 878 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CLARIFY OR EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS] by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
August 18, 2011 Filing 877 SEALED MOTION [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION] by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
August 17, 2011 Filing 876 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Microsoft/Apple License Defense by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Scott)
August 17, 2011 Filing 875 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 877 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** MOTION to Seal Document [DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) Modified on 8/18/2011 (mll, ).
August 17, 2011 Filing 874 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Han Xu, # 2 Exhibit A - Martin Main report, # 3 Exhibit B - www.youtube.com Flash video, # 4 Exhibit C - Eolas PR 3-1 Disclosures, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 17, 2011 Filing 873 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Enhanced Damages for Willful Infringement by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A - 072611 James Stetson Depo Trans, # 3 Exhibit B - 071111 James Stetson Depo Trans, # 4 Exhibit C - 081011 Michael Doyle Depo Trans, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 17, 2011 Filing 872 MOTION re 567 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Intervening Rights [DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INTERVENING RIGHTS [DKT. NO. 567]] by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward) Modified on 8/18/2011 (gsg). Modified on 8/18/2011 (mll, ).
August 17, 2011 Filing 871 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposed Motion for Leave to File a Summary Judgment Motion Unique to Adobe by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Adobe's MFL to File a SJM Unique to Adobe)(Healey, David)
August 17, 2011 Filing 870 SEALED MOTION Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on Its License Defense by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement License Agree btw Eolas and Oracle, # 2 Exhibit B - Robeson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Excerpts fr Martin Report, # 4 Exhibit D - Excerpts fr Eolas PR 3-1 Disclosure - Claim 1, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Adobe's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Healey, David)
August 17, 2011 Filing 869 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Section 102(b) by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mukherji, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 906 - Adobe - PDF - Authoring Tools and Players, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 985 - Adobe - PDF - Authoring Tools and Players, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Doyle Vol I Exh 01-Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 2011-06-24 Michael Doyle - VOL I - HIGHLY CONF - Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 2011-01-21 Eolas Resp and Obj to Adobe 1st Rogs, # 7 Wulff Supplemental Declaration, # 8 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Wulff, # 9 Exhibit 1 - Camelot - HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL, # 10 Exhibit 2 - Carousel - HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL, # 11 Exhibit 3 - NYTimes, # 12 Exhibit 4 - Fortune, # 13 Exhibit 5 - BYTE, # 14 Exhibit 6 - BusinessWeek, # 15 Exhibit 7 - Datamation, # 16 Exhibit 8 - 1992 Annual Report, # 17 Exhibit 9 - Acrobat Announcement., # 18 Exhibit 10 - Summary of Announcements, # 19 Exhibit 11 - WSJ, # 20 Exhibit 12 - SEC, # 21 Exhibit 13 - Acrobat Guide, # 22 Exhibit 14 - Acrobat Tour, # 23 Exhibit 15 - Acrobat for DOS Annoucement, # 24 Exhibit 16 - Acrobat Guide screenshot, # 25 Exhibit 17 - Acrobat Guide screenshot w index, # 26 Exhibit 18 - Acrobat Guide screenshot w thumbnails, # 27 Exhibit 19 - Acrobat Guide screenshot w zoom, # 28 Exhibit 20 - Acrobat Guide with toolbar, # 29 Exhibit 21 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot, # 30 Exhibit 22 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot, # 31 Exhibit 23 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot w thumbnails, # 32 Exhibit 24 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot w zoom, # 33 Exhibit 25 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot, # 34 Exhibit 26 - Acrobat Guide for DOS screenshot with thumbs, # 35 Exhibit 27 - Portable Document Format Ref Manual, # 36 Exhibit 28 - CONFIDENTIAL ADBE0196062-ADBE0196071, # 37 Text of Proposed Order Granting MSJ of Invalidity)(Healey, David)
August 17, 2011 Filing 868 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Late-Disclosed Infringement Allegations by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Findlay, Eric)
August 17, 2011 Filing 867 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of No Pre-Suit Damages by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
August 17, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 852 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trial and to Reset Pretrial Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2011 01:00 PM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc, )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER granting 853 Motion to Expedite Briefing on Frito-Lay's Emergency Motion for Separate Trial and To Reset Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/17/11. (mjc, )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER granting 863 Motion to Expedite Briefing on Eolas' Motion to Set Deadlines for Discovery and Expert Reports as to defendant Frito-Lay.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/17/11. (mjc, )
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER granting 862 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Rebuttal Expert Reports to 8/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/17/11. (mjc, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 863 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 16, 2011 Filing 862 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines for Rebuttal Expert Reports by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated, Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thane, Joshua)
August 16, 2011 Filing 861 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Roy Weinstein by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of L. Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A - 072511 Weinstein Core Report, # 3 Exhibit B - 072911 Weinstein Google Report, # 4 Exhibit C - 071111 Stetson Transcript, # 5 Exhibit D - 072611 Stetson Transcript, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 16, 2011 Filing 860 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr. Concerning New Infringement Contentions by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Han Xu, # 2 Exhibit A - Martin Main report, # 3 Exhibit B - Google Android Browser, # 4 Exhibit C - Google Chrome, # 5 Exhibit D - 906 Android for Mobile Devices, # 6 Exhibit E- 985 Android for Mobile Devices, # 7 Exhibit F - 906 Google Chrome, # 8 Exhibit G - www.youtube.com Flash video, # 9 Exhibit H - services.google.com, # 10 Exhibit I - Excerpts from Martin Report, # 11 Exhibit J - Excerpts from Martin Report, # 12 Exhibit K - 985 OtherDomains, # 13 Exhibit L - www.youtube.com HTML 5 video, # 14 Exhibit M - Chart 985 HTML 5 Video Player, # 15 Exhibit N - Google Picasa, # 16 Exhibit O - picasa.google.com, # 17 Exhibit P - Google Docs - Documents, # 18 Exhibit Q - Google Docs - Presentation, # 19 Exhibit R - Google Docs - Spreadsheet, # 20 Exhibit S - 985 Documents, # 21 Exhibit T - 985 youtube.com, # 22 Exhibit U - Fenner v HP, # 23 Exhibit V - Anascape v Microsoft, # 24 Exhibit W - Visto v Seven, # 25 Exhibit X - Eolas Ltr to Infringement Contentions, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 16, 2011 Filing 859 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER granting 855 Motion for Extension of Time to File And Respond To Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, )
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ORDER granting 850 Motion for Briefing Schedule for Google's Motions to Strike Portions of the Martin and Weinstein Reports. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, )
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER granting 847 Motion to Proceed with Jointly Scheduled Depositions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 855 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Respond to Dispositive Motions by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabrielson, Anthony)
August 15, 2011 Filing 854 MOTION TO SET DEADLINES FOR DISCOVERY AND EXPERT REPORTS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 15, 2011 Filing 853 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Frito Lay's Emergency Motion for Separate Trial and to Reset Pre-trial Schedule by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
August 15, 2011 Filing 852 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trial and to Reset Pretrial Schedule by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joyner, # 2 Declaration of Yee, # 3 Exhibit A to Yee Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Yee Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Yee Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Yee Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Yee Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Yee Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Yee Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Yee Declaration, # 11 Exhibit I to Yee Declaration, # 12 Exhibit J to Yee Declaration, # 13 Exhibit K to Yee Declaration, # 14 Exhibit L to Yee Declaration, # 15 Exhibit M to Yee Declaration, # 16 Exhibit N to Yee Declaration, # 17 Exhibit O to Yee Declaration, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER granting 846 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Rebuttal Trial Witness Lists and Rebuttal Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 850 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Google's Motions to Strike Portions of the Martin and Weinstein Reports by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 15, 2011 Filing 849 Trial Witness List by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Witness List)(Jones, Michael)
August 15, 2011 Filing 848 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC Second Amended Initial Disclosure Statement (Jones, Michael)
August 15, 2011 Filing 847 Joint MOTION TO PROCEED WITH JOINTLY SCHEDULED DEPOSITONS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 14, 2011 Filing 846 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines for Rebuttal Trial Witness Lists and Rebuttal Expert Reports by CDW Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Scott)
August 12, 2011 Filing 845 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CDW Corporation of Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Gabrielson, Anthony)
August 12, 2011 Filing 844 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CDW Corporation of Trial Witness List (Gabrielson, Anthony)
August 12, 2011 Filing 843 REPLY to Response to Motion re 815 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+ filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 12, 2011 Filing 842 Trial Witness List by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
August 12, 2011 Filing 841 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CDW Corporation Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Gabrielson, Anthony)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER granting 837 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Eolass deadline for replying to Google and YouTubes counterclaims is extended to 8-19-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/11. cc:attys 8-11-11 (mll, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 839 RESPONSE in Opposition re 815 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+ [Corrected] filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Han Xu, # 2 Exhibit A - Music Beta, # 3 Exhibit B - Google +, # 4 Exhibit C - Davis-Lynch, # 5 Exhibit D - Power-One, # 6 Exhibit E - Eon Corp, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 10, 2011 Filing 838 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne LeRoy Mason on behalf of Frito-Lay, Inc. (Mason, Dwayne)
August 10, 2011 Filing 837 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 796 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 797 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 10, 2011 Filing 836 ***PLEASE IGNORE. Filed in Error. Atty re-filed correct document at DE 839. ***PLEASE IGNORE. RESPONSE in Opposition re 815 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+ filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Han Xu, # 2 Exhibit A - Music Beta, # 3 Exhibit B- Google+, # 4 Exhibit C - Davis-Lynch, # 5 Exhibit D - Power-One, # 6 Exhibit E - Eon Corp, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2011 (leh, ).
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER granting 833 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft eBay Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11(mll, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 834 ORDER granting 830 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 833 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND EBAY, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $3,300.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 7-29-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $6,600.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-08-11(mll, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 831 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren N Robinson for Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (mll, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 830 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports on Damages Issues as Between Eolas and eBay by Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huang, Aaron)
August 5, 2011 Filing 829 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Lance Thollander on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Thollander, Joel)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER granting 819 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-05-11 (mll, )
August 4, 2011 Filing 827 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Bennett, Natalie)
August 4, 2011 Filing 826 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Jurek, Kenneth)
August 4, 2011 Filing 825 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Bachtell, Brett)
August 4, 2011 Filing 824 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC of Name Change for Rebecca R. Hermes (Jones, Michael)
August 4, 2011 Filing 823 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Heartfield, J)
August 4, 2011 Filing 822 AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims 517 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 5, # 2 Part 3 of 5, # 3 Part 4 of 5, # 4 Part 5 of 5)(Richardson, Michael)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER granting 818 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense; Responses due by 8/16/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/11. cc:attys 8-04-11 (mll, )
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER granting 817 Motion to Expedite. Google Inc. shall file any brief in opposition to Eolas motion no later than 8-10-2011 and that Eolas shall file any reply brief no later than 8-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/04/11. cc:attys 8-04-11 (mll, )
August 4, 2011 Filing 819 MOTION for Leave to File Staples, Inc.'s Second Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit A (part 3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit A (part 4 of 4), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
August 3, 2011 Filing 818 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 3, 2011 Filing 817 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite EOLAS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO GOOGLE MUSIC AND GOOGLE+ by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER granting 814 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions due from all parties 8-15-2011; Responses due to Dispositive Motions that are filed on the Dispositive Motion Deadline 9-02-2011; Daubert Motions due 8-19-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/11. cc:attys 8-03-11 (mll, )
August 2, 2011 Filing 815 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to its PR 3-1 Infringement Contentions with Respect to Google Music and Google+ by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Order)(McKool, Mike)
August 2, 2011 Filing 814 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Respond to Certain Motions by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Ebay Inc., Google Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukherji, Proshanto)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER granting 806 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and extending expert witness deadlines as to certain parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, )
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting 800 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Eolas and Defendants shall have additional time to 8-12-2011, to exchange trial witness lists. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, )
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting 795 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Eolas shall serve supplemental infringement contentions for the 985 patent against Staples for the Staples Carousel functionality within three days of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, )
August 1, 2011 Filing 810 Defendant CDW LLC's Fourth ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by CDW Corporation.(Duston, Thomas)
August 1, 2011 Filing 809 The Go Daddy Group Inc.'s ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
August 1, 2011 Filing 808 Adobe Systems Incorporated's ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Healey, David)
August 1, 2011 Filing 807 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Staples, Inc. (Redden, Joe)
July 31, 2011 Filing 806 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 249 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 29, 2011 Filing 805 AMENDED ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Ebay Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 29, 2011 Filing 804 AMENDED ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 29, 2011 Filing 803 AMENDED ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Yahoo! Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 29, 2011 Filing 802 ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by J.C. Penney Company, Inc..(Joe, Christopher)
July 29, 2011 Filing 801 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Citigroup Inc..(Fuller, Michael)
July 29, 2011 Filing 800 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Exchange Trial Witness Lists by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc., CDW Corporation, Citigroup Inc., Ebay Inc., J.C. Penney Company, Inc., Staples, Inc., The Go Daddy Group, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 29, 2011 Filing 799 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 809 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** The Go Daddy Group Inc.'s Third Amended ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by The Go Daddy Group, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 8/1/2011 (mll, ). Modified on 8/3/2011 (mll, ).
July 29, 2011 Filing 798 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 808 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Adobe Systems Incorporated's Second Amended ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Healey, David) Modified on 8/1/2011 (mll, ). Modified on 8/3/2011 (mll, ).
July 29, 2011 Filing 797 YouTube, LLC's ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by YouTube, LLC.(Jones, Michael)
July 29, 2011 Filing 796 Google, Inc.'s ANSWER to 517 Amended Complaint,, Second Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Eolas Technologies Incorporated by Google Inc..(Jones, Michael)
July 29, 2011 Filing 795 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO STAPLES' ADDED CAROUSEL FUNCTIONALITY by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER granting 786 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 793 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 762 Transcript,,, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Redact Transcript by J.C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER granting 785 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, and extending deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, )
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER granting 781 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and extend deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 790 SEALED MOTION Defendant Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based On Its License Defense by The Go Daddy Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting 784 Motion to Stay. All pretrial activities as to FritoLay Inc shall be stayed to 8-05-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/11. cc:attys 7-25-11 (mll, )
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER granting 782 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Office Depot Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/11. cc:attys 7-25-11(mll, )
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER granting 780 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Douglas Powers terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/11. cc:attys 7-25-11 (mll, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 786 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 768 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 22, 2011 Filing 785 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 768 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 22, 2011 Filing 784 Joint MOTION to Stay by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay)(Yee, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2011 Filing 783 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CDW Corporation Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Gabrielson, Anthony)
July 22, 2011 Filing 782 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND OFFICE DEPOT, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 22, 2011 Filing 781 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 768 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 21, 2011 Filing 780 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew D. Powers by Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 779 ORDER granting 777 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Expert Reports on Damages Issues as Between Eolas and Citigroup. Parties with burden of proofdesignate expert witnesses on damages issues: Friday, August 26, 2011(Eolas' submission to Citigroup only). Parties designate rebuttal expertwitnesses on damages issues: Friday, September 23, 2011 (Citigroup's submission to Eolas only). No other deadlines are affected by this Order, including the trial setting. This Order does not modify the dates for any parties' submission of expert reports on damages issues other than between Eolas and Citigroup. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/21/2011. (kls, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting 776 Motion to Stay. Before the Court is Plaintiff Eolas Technologies Incorporated's and Defendant Apple Inc.'s Joint Motion to Stay. After careful consideration, the Court is of the opinion that the Motion is meritorious and should be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that all pre-trial activities as to Apple Inc. shall be stayed and extended for two weeks. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/20/2011. (kls, )
July 20, 2011 Filing 777 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 768 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 20, 2011 Filing 776 Joint MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER granting 770 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christian J Hurt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/11. (mjc, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 774 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Bobrow, Jared)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER granting 772 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Expert Reports. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the following deadlines are now in place, replacing deadlines for the same previously issued by the Court. Parties with burden of proof designate expert witnesses on non-damages issues: 7/20/2011. Parties designate rebuttal expert witnesses on non-damages issues: 8/17/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/18/2011. (kls, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 772 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 768 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 14, 2011 Filing 771 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Christopher Michael Joe re 762 Transcript,,,. (Joe, Christopher)
July 13, 2011 Filing 770 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christian J. Hurt by Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (McClellan, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER granting 767 Motion to Amend/Correct and proceed with jointly scheduled depositions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, )
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER granting 766 Motion to Amend/Correct and Extend Deadlines for Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/11. cc:attys 7-13-11 (mll, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 767 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 247 Order by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 12, 2011 Filing 766 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 759 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 12, 2011 Filing 765 NOTICE by Rent-A-Center, Inc. Rent-A-Center, Inc.'s Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Warren, Sanford)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER granting 761 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Clay Harris terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/12/11. cc:attys 7-12-11 (mll, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER denying as moot 712 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/12/11. cc:attys 7-12-11 (mll, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 762 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 6/29/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. 66 pages. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2011. (sms, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 761 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Matthew C. Harris as Counsel of Record by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 8, 2011 Filing 760 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated re 712 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES' ENTITIES, 743 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Sealed Patent Motion,,,, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, JOINT NOTICE BY EOLAS AND ADOBE WITH RESPECT TO EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL CERTAIN DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE (McKool, Mike)
July 8, 2011 Deadlines reset per 759 Order: Expert Witness List due by 7/18/2011; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 8-15-2011. (mll, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER granting 755 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER granting 752 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Rent-A-Center Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-08-11(mll, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER granting 751 Motion to Stay. All pre-trial activities as to Frito-Lay, Inc. shall be stayed and extended for two weeks. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER granting 750 Motion to Proceed with Certain Depositions. Eolas may proceed with the depositions of Chris Motes and Paul Fischer on 7-07-2011, notwithstanding the collective 350 hour deposition limitation in the discovery order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 755 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 670 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 7, 2011 Filing 754 NOTICE by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Fowler, Mark)
July 6, 2011 Filing 753 NOTICE by New Frontier Media, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Simons, Michael)
July 6, 2011 Filing 752 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND RENT-A-CENTER, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 6, 2011 Filing 751 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 6, 2011 Filing 750 Unopposed MOTION TO PROCEED WITH CERTAIN DEPOSITIONS WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT YAHOO! INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
July 5, 2011 Filing 749 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas W McClellan on behalf of Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (McClellan, Douglas)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER granting 742 Motion to Withdraw Counsel. Joseph P Reid is hereby withdrawn as atty of record for deft Adobe Systems Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/05/11. cc:attys 7-05-11 (mll, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 747 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rodgers, Matthew)
July 5, 2011 Filing 746 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cravey, Christopher)
July 5, 2011 Filing 745 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Apple Inc. (Williams, Danny)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER denying as moot 634 Motion for Leave to Amend PICs; granting 659 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting 667 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting 675 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; granting 689 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; denying as moot 714 Motion to Compel; granting 723 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting 728 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. The Court ORDERS parties to meet and confer regarding the docket control order and submit an agreed amended docket control order reflecting any deadlines that need to be modified in light of these rulings.Finally, the Court ORDERS parties to meet and confer regarding Docket No. 712 , Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery From Adobe Systems Inc. Regarding Investment/Licensing Agreements. In light of the Courts rulings on these discovery matters, the Court hopes the parties can reach an agreement on this issue. Plaintiff shall file a notice regarding the status of this meet andconfer with the Court no later than Friday, 7-08-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/30/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 742 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Reid, Joseph)
June 30, 2011 Filing 740 NOTICE by Eolas Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF CHANGE OF NAME (Harting, Gretchen)
June 29, 2011 Filing 744 6.29.11 Minute Entry - Motion Hrg: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2011 re 659 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR DISCOVERY filed by Eolas; 634 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Eolas; 714 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION filed by Eolas; 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by Eolas; 675 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR DISCOVERY filed by Eolas; 667 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR PRODUCTION filed by Eolas; 728 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by Eolas. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER granting 733 Motion to Expedite Briefing on Eolas' Motion to Compel Discovery. eBay's opposition brief is due 6-28-2011 and Eolas' reply brief is due 6-29-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 739 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 728 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM eBAY INC. REGARDING THE eBAY/MERCEXCHANGE LICENSE AND DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION OF AJAY GOPAL filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
June 28, 2011 Filing 738 SEALED Sur-Reply to Motion re 712 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES' ENTITIES filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Healey, David)
June 27, 2011 Filing 737 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 728 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM eBAY INC. REGARDING THE eBAY/MERCEXCHANGE LICENSE AND DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION OF AJAY GOPAL filed by Ebay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Reines, Edward)
June 27, 2011 Filing 736 REPLY to Response to Motion re 714 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FROM EBAY INC. AND AMAZON.COM, INC. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (McKool, Mike)
June 27, 2011 Filing 735 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 712 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES' ENTITIES filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
June 27, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 731 - Response - Incorrect Attachment 1 - Refiled Correctly as Docket Entry #732. PLEASE IGNORE DOCKET ENTRY #731*** (kls, )
June 26, 2011 Filing 733 Joint MOTION to Expedite JOINT MOTION REGARDING BRIEFING ON EOLAS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM EBAY INC. REGARDING THE eBAY/MERCEXCHANGE LICENSE AND DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION OF AJAY GOPAL by Ebay Inc., Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Reines, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
June 25, 2011 Filing 732 RESPONSE in Opposition re 714 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FROM EBAY INC. AND AMAZON.COM, INC. [AMAZON.COM, INC.'S AND EBAY INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EOLAS'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE] filed by Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Perito, Andrew)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting 729 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Defendant shall file any brief in opposition to Plaintiffs motion no later than 6-27-2011, and that Plaintiff shall file any reply brief no later than 6-28-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/24/11. cc:attys 6-27-11 (mll, )
June 24, 2011 Filing 731 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTACHMENT 1 INCORRECT - REFILED CORRECTLY AS DOCKET ENTRY #732*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 714 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FROM EBAY INC. AND AMAZON.COM, INC. [AMAZON.COM,INC.'S AND EBAY INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EOLAS'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE] filed by Amazon.com Inc., Ebay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Perito, Andrew) Modified on 6/27/2011 (kls, ).
June 24, 2011 Filing 730 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 712 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES' ENTITIES filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Healey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
June 23, 2011 Filing 729 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM EBAY INC. REGARDING THE eBAY/MERCEXCHANGE LICENSE AND DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION OF AJAY GOPAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 23, 2011 Filing 728 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM eBAY INC. REGARDING THE eBAY/MERCEXCHANGE LICENSE AND DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION OF AJAY GOPAL by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary Snider, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 23, 2011 Filing 727 NOTICE by Texas Instruments Inc. re 708 Order, Terminate Motions, Add and Terminate Parties,,, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Roth, Carl)
June 23, 2011 Filing 726 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ivan Wang on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Wang, Ivan)
June 23, 2011 Filing 725 NOTICE by Blockbuster Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Breedlove, Scott)
June 23, 2011 Filing 724 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 675 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS Staples' Sur-Reply in Support of its Response to Eolas' Motion to Compel Discovery from Staples, Inc. Regarding Web Analytics filed by Staples, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael)
June 23, 2011 Filing 723 SEALED MOTION Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff Eolas' Motion to Compel Discovery From Staples, Inc. Regarding Web Analytics by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
June 22, 2011 Filing 722 NOTICE by Playboy Enterprises International, Inc. re 720 Order, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Weaver, David)
June 22, 2011 Filing 721 SEALED Sur-Reply to Motion re 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Citigroup Inc.. (Fuller, Michael)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER granting 710 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Playboy Enterprises International Inc are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the Settlement Agreement. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-22-11(mll, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER granting 709 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Michael Joe terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-21-11 (mll, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER granting 715 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Defts eBay Inc and Amazon.com Inc shall file any brief in opposition to pltf's Motion to Compel Discovery no later than 6-24-2011, and pltf shall file any reply brief no later than 6-27-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-21-11 (mll, )
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER granting 713 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Deft Adobe Systems shall file any brief in opposition to pltf's Motion to Compel Discovery no later than 6-24-2011, and pltf shall file any reply brief no later than 6-27-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/11. cc:attys 6-21-11 (mll, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 716 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 715 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FROM EBAY INC. AND AMAZON.COM, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 714 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF SOURCE CODE FROM EBAY INC. AND AMAZON.COM, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Budwin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 713 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES ENTITIES by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 712 MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY FROM ADOBE SYSTEMS, INC. REGARDING INVESTMENT/LICENSING AGREEMENTS WITH INTELLECTUAL VENTURES' ENTITIES by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary Snider, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 711 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 659 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by J.C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Email string Budwin/Joe, # 2 Affidavit Ex 2 - Deborah Butler Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Coremetrics/JCP Agreement Excerpts)(Joe, Christopher)
June 20, 2011 Filing 710 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND PLAYBOY ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 20, 2011 Filing 709 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Buether Joe & Carpenter, LLC as Counsel of Record for Defendant Frito-Lay, Inc. by Frito-Lay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER GRANTING 706 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. ORDERED that all claims by Plaintiffs Eolas Technologies Incorporated against Defendant Texas Instruments, Inc., and all claims by Texas Instruments, Inc. against Eolas Technologies Incorporated, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/17/2011. (gsg)
June 16, 2011 Filing 707 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gafford, Galyn)
June 16, 2011 Filing 706 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER GRANTING 702 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. ORDERED that all claims by Plaintiffs Eolas Technologies Incorporated against Defendant Perot Systems Corp., and all claims by Perot Systems Corp. against Eolas Technologies Incorporated, are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each of the foregoing parties shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees with respect to these claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/15/2011. (gsg)
June 15, 2011 Filing 704 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Baxter, Samuel)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER granting 700 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert J Goldman terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/14/11. (mjc, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 702 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND PEROT SYSTEMS CORP. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 14, 2011 Filing 701 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 675 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Fasone III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(McKool, Mike)
June 13, 2011 Filing 700 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert Goldman by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2011 Filing 699 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 659 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Garvish, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(McKool, Mike)
June 13, 2011 Filing 698 NOTICE by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC of Designation of Lead Counsel - James R. Batchelder (Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2011 Filing 697 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James R Batchelder for Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (mll, )
June 10, 2011 Filing 696 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 675 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Hardt Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Kate)
June 10, 2011 Filing 695 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sandra S Fujiyama for Apple Inc. (mll, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 675 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM STAPLES, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS, 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS, 659 SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS, 634 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR ANDROID 3.0, 667 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATION OF RULE 30(b)(6) WITNESSES FROM AMAZON, EBAY AND YAHOO! AND FOR YAHOO! TO PRODUCE THIRD PARTY SEARCH AGREEMENTS : Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court STAYS the 6-24-2011 expert report deadline until 7 days after it rules on these motions. 690 Motion for Expedited Briefing is GRANTED. Citigroup shall respond to 689 Motion to Compel by 6-16-2011. Pltf shall file any reply brief by 6-20-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/09/11. cc:attys 6-10-11(mll, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER granting 691 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Oracle America Inc are dismissed with prejudice, in accordance with the Settlement Agreement. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/09/11. cc:attys 6-10-11(mll, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 692 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of Eolas Technologies Incorporated (Snider, Rosemary)
June 8, 2011 Filing 691 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EOLAS TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED AND ORACLE AMERICA, INC. by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 8, 2011 Filing 690 Opposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EOLAS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 8, 2011 Filing 689 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM CITIGROUP, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary Snider, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ORDER granting 683 Motion to Stay. All pre-trial activities as to Rent-A-Center Inc shall be stayed and extended for two weeks. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-08-11 (mll, )
June 7, 2011 Filing 687 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase & Co. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 6, 2011 Filing 686 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 675 Sealed Patent Motion. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER granting 682 Motion to Stay. All pretrial activities as to Texas Instruments shall be stayed and extended for two weeks. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/11. cc:attys 6-06-11 (mll, )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER granting 681 Motion to Stay. All pretrial activities as to Office Depot shall be stayed and extended for two weeks. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/11. cc:attys 6-06-11 (mll, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 683 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 3, 2011 Filing 682 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 3, 2011 Filing 681 Joint MOTION to Stay by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McKool, Mike)
June 3, 2011 Filing 680 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 659 J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Response to Eolas' Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Web Analytics, SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by J.C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
June 3, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 678 Sealed Response. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.*** (mjc, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 679 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 667 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATION OF RULE 30(b)(6) WITNESSES FROM AMAZON, EBAY AND YAHOO! AND FOR YAHOO! TO PRODUCE THIRD PARTY SEARCH AGREEMENTS SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATION OF RULE 30(b)(6) WITNESSES FROM AMAZON, EBAY AND YAHOO! AND FOR YAHOO! TO PRODUCE THIRD PARTY SEARCH AGREEMENTS SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DESIGNATION OF RULE 30(b)(6) WITNESSES FROM AMAZON, EBAY AND YAHOO! AND FOR YAHOO! TO PRODUCE THIRD PARTY SEARCH AGREEMENTS filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Fasone III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(McKool, Mike)
June 2, 2011 Filing 678 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 659 , J.C.Penney Corporation, Inc.'s Response to Eolas' Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Web Analytics, SEALED PATENT MOTION DISCOVERY FROM J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC. REGARDING WEB ANALYTICS filed by J.C. Penney Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher) Modified on 6/3/2011 (mjc, ).
June 2, 2011