Stragent, LLC et al v. Classmates Online, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Stragent, LLC and SeeSaw Foundation
Defendant: Classmates Online, Inc., Classmates Media Corporation, United Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., Linden Research, Inc., Meebo, Inc., MTV Networks, Viacom Inc., MyLife.com, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Novell, Inc., Plaxo, Inc. and Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2010cv00242
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Gregg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Filing 121 FINAL JUDGMENT that parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in this suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 118 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and defts MTV Networks and Viacom Inc are dismissed with prejudice, except the counterclaims by defts which are dismissed without prejudice. Parties will each bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, )
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltfs and deft MySpace Inc are dismissed with prejudice, except the counterclaims by MySpace, which are dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-24-11 (mll, )
February 22, 2011 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants MTV Networks and Viacom Inc. under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by MTV Networks, SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC, Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 16, 2011 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant MySpace, Inc. under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by MySpace, Inc., SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 115 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings in this matter are hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. Parties shall submit closing documents no later than 2-25-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/26/11. cc:attys 1-26-11 (mll, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Stay all Deadlines and Proceedings by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/15/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/21/11. cc:attys 1-21-11(mll, )
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall file their agreed discovery and docket control orders by 1-25-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying as moot 69 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDERED that the Markman Hearing is set for 7/14/2011 09:00 at AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 5/7/2012 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2012 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying as moot 70 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg)
January 7, 2011 Filing 108 NOTICE by Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc. REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Robinson, William)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Deadline to comply with P R 3-1 and P R 3-2 is January 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/7/2011. (gsg)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam A Biggs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/06/11. cc:attys 1-06-11 (mll, )
January 6, 2011 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 1/4/2011. (refer to document #101) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Adam A. Biggs as Counsel of Record by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/05/11. cc:attys 1-05-11(mll, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC re 70 Defendant Classmates Online, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by and between pltfs and deft Classmates Online Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Parties will each bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-05-11 (mll, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 101 1.4.10 Minute Entry - Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 1/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Classmates Online, Inc. WITHOUT PREJUDICE Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Classmates Online, Inc., SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between pltfs and deft Gannett Co Inc in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/10. cc:attys 12-29-10 (mll, )
December 23, 2010 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Gannett Co., Inc., SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Replies due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-21-10 (mll, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Classmates Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(deGyarfas, Victor)
December 15, 2010 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Classmates Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC, Viacom Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Replies due by 12/27/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/08/10. cc:attys 12-08-10 (mll, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 91 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Classmates Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(deGyarfas, Victor)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER setting Status Conference for 1/4/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/10. cc:attys 12-03-10(mll, )
December 2, 2010 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion (PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO CLASSMATES ONLINE, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. NO. 70)) filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 85 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Defts United Online Inc and Classmates Media Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-16-10 (mll, )
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 84 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by and between pltfs and deft Plaxo Inc in this action are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties will each bear their own costs, expenses, and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-16-10 (mll, )
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Classmates Online, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 70 . Responses due by 12/2/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/10. (mjc, )
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 69 United Online, Inc. and Classmates Media Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue. Responses due by 11/12/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/2010. (gsg)
November 5, 2010 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 70 Classmates Online, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 5, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Defendants United Online, Inc. and Classmates Media Corporation WITHOUT PREJUDICE)(Albritton, Eric)
November 5, 2010 Filing 84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Plaxo, Inc. WITH PREJUDICE by Plaxo, Inc., SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 4, 2010 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 69 United Online, Inc. and Classmates Media Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, and Improper Venue by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Filing 82 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 65 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of MySpace Inc by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Filing 81 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 63 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of MTV Networks by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Filing 80 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 61 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Viacom Inc. by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Filing 79 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 59 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Plaxo Inc. by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Filing 78 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 57 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Gannett Co. Inc. by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; Responses due by 11/18/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/10.cc:attys 10-28-10 (mll, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 70 Defendant Classmates Online, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Response Deadline to 11/18/2010)(Albritton, Eric)
October 27, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC re 15 Order, Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Albritton, Eric)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Deft MyLife.com is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/26/10. cc:attys 10-27-10(mll, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal of MyLife.com, Inc.)(Albritton, Eric)
October 20, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc. (Robinson, William)
October 20, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 71 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MyLife.com, Inc. to 10/25/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 71 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MyLife.com, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (FRCP 2(b)(6) Based on the Failure of teh Patent-in-Suit to Claim Patentable Subject Matter Under 35 U.S.C. §101 by Classmates Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Affidavit of Victor de Gyarfas, # 3 Exhibit A to de Gyarfas Decl, # 4 Exhibit B to de Gyarfas Decl, # 5 Exhibit C to de Gyarfas Decl, # 6 Exhibit D to de Gyarfas Decl, # 7 Exhibit E to de Gyarfas Decl, # 8 Exhibit F to de Gyarfas Decl, # 9 Exhibit G to de Gyarfas Decl, # 10 Exhibit H to de Gyarfas Decl, # 11 Exhibit I to de Gyarfas Decl, # 12 Exhibit J to de Gyarfas Decl, # 13 Exhibit K to de Gyarfas Decl, # 14 Exhibit L to de Gyarfas Decl, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William)
October 18, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Subject Matter and Personal (F.R.C.P. §§12(b)1 and 12(b)(2); and Improper Venue (F.R.C.P. §12(b)(3) by Classmates Media Corporation, United Online, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Victor de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit A to de Gyarfas Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to de Gyarfas Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to de Gyarfas Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to de Gyarfas Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to de Gyarfas Decl., # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2010: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
October 18, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., Viacom Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
October 4, 2010 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gannett Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Gannett Co., Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fox Interactive Media, Inc. for MySpace, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 65 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC by MySpace, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MTV Networks identifying Corporate Parent Viacom International Inc. for MTV Networks. (Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 63 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC by MTV Networks.(Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viacom Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Viacom Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 61 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC by Viacom Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaxo, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for Plaxo, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
October 4, 2010 Filing 59 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC by Plaxo, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
October 4, 2010 Filing 58 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 67 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gannett Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Gannett Co., Inc.. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 10/5/2010 (mll, ).
October 4, 2010 Filing 57 ANSWER to 51 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC by Gannett Co., Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 27, 2010 Filing 56 Return of Service Executed as to MySpace, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 55 Return of Service Executed as to Linden Research, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of United Online, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
September 24, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
September 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 49 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MyLife.com, Inc. to 10/18/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 48 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Plaxo, Inc. to 9/17/2010. 1 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Deft Linden Research Inc is DISMISSED with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/10. cc:attys 9-20-10(mll, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MyLife.com, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Plaxo, Inc., United Online, Inc., Viacom Inc., filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
September 17, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 16, 2010 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MyLife.com, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
September 16, 2010 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Plaxo, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
September 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 47 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MySpace, Inc. to 9/17/2010. 1 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 46 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Viacom Inc. to 9/17/2010. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 15, 2010 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MySpace, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
September 15, 2010 Filing 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Viacom Inc..( Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Deft Meebo Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Parties will each bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/14/10. cc:attys 9-15-10(mll, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Deft Twitter Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Parties will each bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/14/10. cc:attys 9-15-10(mll, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William Joseph Robinson for Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc.. (mll, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 42 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin Mark Sobaje for Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc.. (mll, )
September 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 28 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Classmates Online, Inc. to 10/16/2010; Classmates Media Corporation to 10/16/2010; United Online, Inc. to 10/16/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 4, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 3, 2010 Filing 41 Return of Service Executed as to Classmates Media Corporation on 8/26/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 40 Return of Service Executed as to Gannett Co., Inc. on 8/27/2010,by cert mail; answer due: 9/17/2010. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jordan Jaffe for Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Viacom Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emily C Kalanithi for Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Viacom Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 37 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Evette D Pennypacker for Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Viacom Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 36 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Claude M Stern for Gannett Co., Inc., MTV Networks, MySpace, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Viacom Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 35 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jill R Zimmerman for Plaxo, Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony I Fenwick for Plaxo, Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jesse Dyer for Plaxo, Inc.. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor deGyarfas on behalf of Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc. (deGyarfas, Victor)
September 3, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 27 Notice of Appearance submitted by Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc. Document does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Plaxo, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
September 2, 2010 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer First Amended Complaint re Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., and United Online, Inc..( deGyarfas, Victor)
September 2, 2010 Filing 27 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor deGyarfas on behalf of Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., United Online, Inc. (deGyarfas, Victor) Modified on 9/3/2010 (mjc, ).
September 1, 2010 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to Viacom Inc. on 8/25/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/15/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Classmates Online, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to MTV Networks on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to Twitter, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to United Online, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to Meebo, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to MyLife.com, Inc. on 8/26/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 9/16/2010. (mll, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. Deft Novell Inc is DISMISSED without prejudice. Parties will bear its own costs, expenses and legal fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/25/10. cc:attys 8-25-10(mll, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., Linden Research, Inc., MTV Networks, Meebo, Inc., MyLife.com, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Plaxo, Inc., Twitter, Inc., United Online, Inc., Viacom Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., Linden Research, Inc., MTV Networks, Meebo, Inc., MyLife.com, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Plaxo, Inc., Twitter, Inc., United Online, Inc., Viacom Inc., filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Albritton, Eric)
August 20, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/27/10. cc:attys 7-28-10(mll, )
May 13, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wynne Morehan on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Morehan, David)
May 13, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
May 13, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
May 13, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaison Chorikavumkal John on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (John, Jaison)
May 13, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Mike Amerson on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Amerson, J)
May 13, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Rodgers, Matthew)
May 13, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Stragent, LLC (Williams, Danny)
May 12, 2010 Filing 7 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Albritton, Eric)
May 11, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Hill, Jack)
May 7, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Clay Harris on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Harris, Matthew)
May 7, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Coleman, Debra)
May 7, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam A Biggs on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Biggs, Adam)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC (Albritton, Eric)
May 6, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
May 6, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Classmates Media Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., Linden Research, Inc., MTV Networks, Meebo, Inc., MyLife.com, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Novell, Inc., Plaxo, Inc., Twitter, Inc., United Online, Inc., Viacom Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2471988.), filed by SeeSaw Foundation, Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stragent, LLC et al v. Classmates Online, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stragent, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SeeSaw Foundation
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classmates Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classmates Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meebo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTV Networks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MyLife.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaxo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?