Lowe v. Richarson
Plaintiff: Arthur Lowe
Defendant: Jacob A Richarson
Case Number: 6:2010cv00310
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: Judith K. Guthrie
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Final Judgment filed by Arthur Lowe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 11/15/2010. (gsg)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 31 MOTION for Reconsideration re 18 Memorandum & Opinion, Order, 19 Judgment filed by Arthur Lowe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 11/3/2010. (gsg)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint filed by Arthur Lowe. ORDERED that the civil rights complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice, and all motions not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 9/3/2010. (gsg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. Richarson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob A Richarson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?