VirnetX Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: VirnetX Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., Aastra Technologies Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America and Aastra USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2010cv00417
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2012 Filing 601 SEALED Jury Questions to Witnesses at Trial. ***MUST GET COURT APPROVAL FOR COPIES*** (cwk)
November 6, 2012 Filing 600 SEALED Jury Notes. (cwk)
November 6, 2012 Filing 599 Sealed Document: VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY (Includes Foreperson's signature). (cwk)
November 6, 2012 Filing 598 JURY VERDICT. (cwk)
November 6, 2012 Filing 597 Jury Instructions. (cwk)
November 6, 2012 Filing 596 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 11/6/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
November 5, 2012 Filing 595 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/5/2012. (Court Reporter Jury Werlinger.) (cwk)
November 5, 2012 Filing 594 SEALED MOTION For Judgment as a Matter of Law by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 5, 2012 Filing 593 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2012: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
November 5, 2012 Filing 592 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Cawley, Douglas)
November 5, 2012 Filing 591 RESPONSE in Opposition re 589 MOTION To Dismiss For Lack Of Jurisdiction Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim As To Patent Claims For Which Virnetx Has Not Asserted Infringement filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 4, 2012 Filing 590 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
November 4, 2012 Filing 589 MOTION To Dismiss For Lack Of Jurisdiction Declaratory Judgment Counterclaim As To Patent Claims For Which Virnetx Has Not Asserted Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
November 4, 2012 Filing 588 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
November 4, 2012 Filing 587 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
November 3, 2012 Filing 586 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (APPLES PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) (Williams, Danny)
November 2, 2012 Filing 585 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT (Offer of Proof). (Williams, Danny)
November 2, 2012 Filing 584 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/2/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk)
November 2, 2012 Filing 583 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (APPLES PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) (Williams, Danny)
November 2, 2012 Filing 582 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
November 2, 2012 Filing 581 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (APPLES PROPOSED VERDICT FORM) (Williams, Danny)
November 2, 2012 Filing 580 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
November 2, 2012 Filing 579 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (Cawley, Douglas)
November 1, 2012 Filing 578 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Cisco Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of The Court's October 22, 2012 Order Concerning Derivation and Non-Joinder re 555 by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Jones, Michael)
November 1, 2012 Filing 577 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/1/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER Regarding First Supplemented Notice of Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/01/12. cc:attys 11-01-12(mll, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 575 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Responsive Brief Regarding Willful Blindness and Evidence of Intent. (Cawley, Douglas)
October 31, 2012 Filing 574 Sealed Document. First Supplemented Notice of Joint Stipulation relating to Certain Motions in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 31, 2012 Filing 573 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 10/31/2012. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk)
October 31, 2012 Filing 572 TRIAL BRIEF (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S RESPONSIVE TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING THE LEGAL STANDARD FOR INDUCED INFRINGEMENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 271(B)) by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
October 31, 2012 Filing 571 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
October 30, 2012 Filing 570 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VIRNETX'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING WILLFUL BLINDNESS AND EVIDENCE OF INTENT TO ENCOURAGE INFRINGEMENT (Cawley, Douglas)
October 30, 2012 Filing 569 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING THE LEGAL STANDARD FOR INDUCED INFRINGEMENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. § 271(B) by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
October 29, 2012 Filing 568 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 10/29/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk) (Main Document 568 replaced on 10/30/2012) (cwk, ).
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting 561 Motion for Hearing to Resolve Disputed Motions in limine and Motion to Dismiss Invalidity Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/12. cc:attys 10-29-12 (mll, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER denying 559 Sealed Motion to Dismiss Invalidity Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/12. cc:attys 10-29-12 (mll, )
October 28, 2012 Filing 565 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 559 Emergency SEALED MOTION Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Dismiss Invalidity Counterclaims (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S REPLY TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO DISMISS ITSINVALIDITY COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A)(2)) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
October 28, 2012 Filing 564 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT [Notice of Filing of Fourth Amended Exhibit H Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 482)]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)(Williams, Danny)
October 27, 2012 Filing 563 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Notice of Filing of Second Amended Exhibit Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 482) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 26, 2012 Filing 562 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 559 Emergency SEALED MOTION Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Dismiss Its Invalidity Counterclaims without Prejudice filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order A, # 4 Proposed Order B)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 10/29/2012 (gsg).
October 26, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Emergency Motion submitted, entry 557 . No authorization to file under seal. (gsg)
October 25, 2012 Filing 561 Joint MOTION for Hearing regarding disputed Motions in Limine and Apple's Emergency Motion to Dismiss by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER of proposed preliminary jury instructions regarding jurors questioning of witnesses. Any objections to these instructions shall be filed with the Court by 10-26-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/12. cc:attys 10-25-12(mll, )
October 25, 2012 Filing 559 Emergency SEALED MOTION Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Dismiss Invalidity Counterclaims by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Williams, Danny)
October 25, 2012 Filing 558 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE ENTRY 559 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Emergency SEALED MOTION Apple Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Dismiss Its Invalidity Counterclaims without Prejudice by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 10/29/2012 (gsg).
October 24, 2012 Filing 557 ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** Emergency SEALED MOTION Apple Inc's Motion to Dismiss Its Invalidity Counterclaims Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(A)(2) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 10/26/2012 (gsg).
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER denying 442 Sealed Patent Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement; denying 445 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein; denying 447 Sealed Patent Motion to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings; granting 550 Motion to Exceed Limits on Exhibit and Deposition Designations for Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/23/12. cc:attys 10-23-12 (mll, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting 440 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity; denying 441 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of Dr Mark Jones's Expert Report; granting 446 Motion to Strike Defendants' Untimely Disclosed PR 3-3 Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/12. cc:attys 10-22-12 (mll, )
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER that parties in this case shall notify their clients and investors that they should not contact the Court to inquire about the status of this case or any of its pending motions. All inquiries should be directed to counsel of record and this case's docket, available on Pacer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/12. cc:attys 10-19-12(mll, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 553 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2012 re 538 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by VirnetX Inc., 446 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY DISCLOSED P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED TESTIMONY AT TRIAL filed by VirnetX Inc., 550 Joint MOTION TO EXCEED LIMITS ON EXHIBIT AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR TRIAL filed by VirnetX Inc., 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 135 AND 151 PATENTS filed by Apple Inc., 440 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON THE DEFENDANTS' DERIVATION AND NONJOINDER THEORIES filed by VirnetX Inc., 441 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MARK JONESS MAY 22, 2012 EXPERT REPORT filed by Apple Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk)
October 16, 2012 Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 9/24/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013. (sms, )
October 16, 2012 Filing 551 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. STIPULATION (Cawley, Douglas)
October 16, 2012 Filing 550 Joint MOTION TO EXCEED LIMITS ON EXHIBIT AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR TRIAL by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 12, 2012 Filing 549 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
October 10, 2012 Filing 548 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ESTIMATES OF TIME FOR JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL) (Williams, Danny)
October 10, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VIRNETX, INC.'S ESTIMATES OF TIME FOR JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (Cawley, Douglas)
October 9, 2012 Filing 546 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 538 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO VIRNETXS MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
October 9, 2012 Filing 545 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 539 SEALED MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 5, 2012 Filing 544 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings (NOTICE OF SUBSEQUENT REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A STAY PENDING ONGOING REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS (D.I. 477)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Findlay, Eric)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER denying 502 Motion to Exceed Limits on Exhibit and Deposition Designations for Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/12. (mjc, )
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting 479 Sealed Patent Motion for Separate Trials. The pending case against Apple, Inc. is set for jury selection at 9:00 a.m. 10/29/2012 and trial at 9:00 a.m. 10/31/2012. The pending case against Cisco Systems, Inc., is set for jury selection at 9:00 a.m. 3/4/2013, with trial to start at 9:00 a.m. on 3/11/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/12. (mjc, )
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting 366 Motion for Reconsideration re 266 Order on Sealed Patent Motion,. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/2012. (gsg)
October 4, 2012 Filing 540 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings (NOTICE OF SUBSEQUENT REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A STAY PENDING ONGOING REEXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS (D.I. 477)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Supplement C)(Williams, Danny)
October 2, 2012 Filing 539 SEALED MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
October 2, 2012 Filing 538 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 2, 2012 Filing 537 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF JOINT STIPULATION RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Cawley, Douglas)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting 531 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-01-12 (mll, )
September 28, 2012 Filing 535 REPLY to Response to Motion re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Findlay, Eric)
September 28, 2012 Filing 534 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S IDENTIFICATION OF PRIOR ART PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. § 282) (Williams, Danny)
September 28, 2012 Filing 533 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT K PURSUANT TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 482] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Williams, Danny)
September 28, 2012 Filing 532 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT I PURSUANT TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 482] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 28, 2012 Filing 531 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 269 Order, 111 Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting 529 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/12. cc:attys 9-27-12 (mll, )
September 27, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Joint Motion, entry 525 submitted No certificate of conference. See entry 529 for corrected entry. (gsg)
September 27, 2012 Filing 529 Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Apple Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 26, 2012 Filing 528 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED EXHIBIT R PURSUANT TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 26, 2012 Filing 527 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S, # 2 Exhibit T)(Oussayef, Karim)
September 26, 2012 Filing 526 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T)(Williams, Danny)
September 26, 2012 Filing 525 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.*** Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Apple Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 9/27/2012 (gsg).
September 25, 2012 Filing 524 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motions for Summary Judgment filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit B.1, # 5 Exhibit C.1)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 25, 2012 Filing 523 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 441 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MARK JONESS MAY 22, 2012 EXPERT REPORT filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 25, 2012 Filing 522 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Scott Nettles' Expert Reports filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 25, 2012 Filing 521 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,188,180 by Cisco's Dynamic Multipoint VPN Systems filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Trent E. Campione, # 2 Exhibit G)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 25, 2012 Filing 520 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)(Williams, Danny)
September 25, 2012 Filing 519 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 440 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON THE DEFENDANTS' DERIVATION AND NONJOINDER THEORIES filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Peter Alexander, # 2 Exhibit A to Alexander Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
September 25, 2012 Filing 518 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 446 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY DISCLOSED P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED TESTIMONY AT TRIAL filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet A. Modi, # 2 Exhibit A to Modi Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
September 25, 2012 Filing 517 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 24, 2012 Filing 516 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/24/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
September 24, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Per Status Conference held 9/24/2012, Jury Selection will remain set for October 29, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. with Trial to commence on 10/31/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis (as to Defendant Apple only - the remaining Defendants will be rescheduled to March of 2013.) (rlf)
September 20, 2012 Filing 515 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trials filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 20, 2012 Filing 514 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 20, 2012 Filing 513 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O)(Oussayef, Karim)
September 20, 2012 Filing 512 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Filing Exhibit Pursuant to JPO (482) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P & Q Designations and Objections)(Williams, Danny)
September 20, 2012 Filing 511 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.***NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED EXHIBIT F (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 9/21/2012 (gsg).
September 20, 2012 Filing 510 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 135 AND 151 PATENTS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting 508 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by VirnetX Inc. Infringement claims asserted by VirnetX against defts NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America with respect to NECs IP-encrypted phone servers and IP-encrypted telephones sold in combination with such IP-encrypted phone servers are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and all other claims, defenses, and counterclaims made by NEC against VirnetX in the above-entitled cause are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/12. cc:attys 9-20-12(mll, )
September 19, 2012 Filing 508 STIPULATION of Dismissal by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting in part 504 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trials; Responses due by 9/20/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/12. cc:attys 9-18-12 (mll, )
September 18, 2012 Status Conference set for 9/24/2012 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting 503 Motion for Status Conference; Status Conference is set for 9-24-2012 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/12. cc:attys 9-18-12 (mll, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 505 RESPONSE in Opposition re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 17, 2012 Filing 504 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trials by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 17, 2012 Filing 503 Unopposed MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 14, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Unopposed Motion submitted. No certificate of conference. See entry 502 for corrected filing. (gsg)
September 13, 2012 Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Limits on Exhibit and Deposition Designations for Trial by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oussayef, Karim)
September 12, 2012 Filing 501 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-10, # 2 Exhibit B-9)(Findlay, Eric)
September 12, 2012 Filing 500 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 440 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON THE DEFENDANTS' DERIVATION AND NONJOINDER THEORIES filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 499 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 446 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY DISCLOSED P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED TESTIMONY AT TRIAL filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 498 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Findlay, Eric)
September 12, 2012 Filing 497 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 441 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MARK JONESS MAY 22, 2012 EXPERT REPORT () filed by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
September 12, 2012 Filing 496 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. re 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings Notice of Subsequent Reexamination Proceedings in Support of Defendants' Motion for a Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric)
September 12, 2012 Filing 495 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. re 482 Proposed Pretrial Order Notice of Filing Exhibits Pursuant to the Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Findlay, Eric)
September 12, 2012 Filing 494 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Scott Nettles' Expert Reports filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 14)(Findlay, Eric)
September 12, 2012 Filing 493 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,188,180 by Cisco's Dynamic Multipoint VPN Systems filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
September 11, 2012 Filing 492 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER (DKT. NO. 482) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 491 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Defendants' Submission of Exhibit Lists and Deposition Designations for Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Oussayef, Karim)
September 11, 2012 Filing 490 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Exceed Limits on Exhibit and Deposition Designations for Trial by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oussayef, Karim) Modified on 9/14/2012 (gsg).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 485 Motion for Leave to Identify Page Limits for Replies and Sur-Replies. The parties shall limit their replies to summary judgment motions to 20 pages collectively and shall limit their sur-replies to summary judgment motions to 20 pages collectively. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/12. cc:attys 9-11-12 (mll, )
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting 486 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-10-12 (mll, )
September 7, 2012 Filing 487 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 135 AND 151 PATENTS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript)(Williams, Danny)
September 6, 2012 Filing 486 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 269 Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 6, 2012 Filing 485 Joint MOTION FOR LEAVE TO IDENTIFY PAGE LIMITS FOR REPLIES AND SUR-REPLIES by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 484 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix A, # 4 Appendix B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 483 SEALED Cisco Systems, Inc's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding No Willful Infringement, Double Patenting, Laches, and Equitable Estoppel. (Oussayef, Karim)
September 4, 2012 Filing 482 Proposed Pretrial Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 481 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VIRNETX INC.'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Cawley, Douglas)
September 4, 2012 Filing 480 Sealed Proposed Finding Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law (Defendant Apple Inc.s Proposed Finding Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law Regarding The Unenforceability Of Virnetx, Inc.S U.S. Patent No. 6,502,135 Due To Inequitable Conduct). (Williams, Danny)
September 4, 2012 Notice of Hearing: The Dates for Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 at 9:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 11/13/2012 HAVE BEEN CHANGED. JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL ARE RESET TO 10/29/2012 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court is advising parties of its availability for this and other trials that are set in November 2012:10/29/2012 - Jury Selection with trial to commence immediately.10/30/2012 - 11/2/2012 - Trial.11/5/2012 - 11/9/2012 - Trial.11/14/2012 - 11/16/2012 - Trial.(rlf)
August 31, 2012 Filing 479 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trials by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Modi Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Modi Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Modi Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Modi Decl., # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 31, 2012 Filing 478 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Modi Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
August 31, 2012 Filing 477 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit 3 to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4 to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit 5 to Modi Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 31, 2012 Filing 476 SEALED PATENT CORRECTED RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Scott Nettles' Expert Reports filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 5, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting 473 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/12. cc:attys 8-30-12 (mll, )
August 30, 2012 Filing 474 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 465 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, NOTICE OF TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 29, 2012 Filing 473 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 269 Order by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2012 Filing 472 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts or Realtime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Findlay, Eric)
August 29, 2012 Filing 471 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 470 MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Modi Decl.)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 8/31/2012 (gsg).
August 29, 2012 Filing 470 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit 3 to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4 to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit 5 to Modi Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 8/31/2012 (gsg).
August 29, 2012 Filing 469 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS ADN REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Cawley, Douglas)
August 29, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 466, Sealed Patent Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
August 29, 2012 Filing 468 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL-TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS) (Williams, Danny)
August 28, 2012 Filing 467 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION for Separate Trials by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Modi Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Modi Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Modi Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Modi Decl., # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 8/31/2012 (gsg).
August 28, 2012 Filing 466 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION for a Stay Pending Ongoing Reexamination Proceedings by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet Modi, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Modi Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Modi Decl., # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 8/29/2012 (gsg).
August 25, 2012 Filing 465 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Scott Nettles' Expert Reports filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 464 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motions for Summary Judgment filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Hargrave, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit B-1, # 10 Exhibit B-2, # 11 Exhibit B-3, # 12 Exhibit B-4, # 13 Exhibit B-5, # 14 Exhibit B-6, # 15 Exhibit C-1, # 16 Exhibit C-2, # 17 Exhibit C-3, # 18 Exhibit C-4, # 19 Exhibit C-5, # 20 Exhibit C-6, # 21 Exhibit C-7, # 22 Exhibit C-8, # 23 Exhibit C-9, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 463 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 441 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MARK JONES'S MAY 22, 2012 EXPERT REPORT filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 462 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 461 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Nettles, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 461 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,188,180 by Cisco's Dynamic Multipoint VPN Systems filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Trent E. Campione, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 460 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 135 AND 151 PATENTS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 459 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 458 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, (ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO DEFENDANTS CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. AND APPLE INC.S OPPOSITION TO VIRNETX INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT# 458)). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl, # 2 Exhibit K)(Williams, Danny)
August 24, 2012 Filing 458 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 446 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY DISCLOSED P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED TESTIMONY AT TRIAL filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet A. Modi, # 2 Exhibit A to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Modi Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Modi Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Modi Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Modi Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Modi Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Modi Decl., # 11 Exhibit J to Modi Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 24, 2012 Filing 457 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 440 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON THE DEFENDANTS' DERIVATION AND NONJOINDER THEORIES filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ameet A. Modi, # 2 Exhibit A to Modi Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Modi Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Modi Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Modi Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Modi Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Modi Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Modi Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Modi Decl., # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 24, 2012 Filing 456 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason Cassady, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 455 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Abbott Hargrave on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Hargrave, Ryan)
August 22, 2012 Filing 454 NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth Raymond Hasenour (Hasenour, Seth)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting 451 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deposition of Christopher Vellturo may occur on 8-23-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/14/12. cc:attys 8-14-12 (mll, )
August 13, 2012 Filing 452 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 450 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Order on Sealed Motion (APPLES NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PRODUCE MR. ALLI FOR COMPLETION OF HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO THE COURTS ORDER (DKT. NO. 450)) (Williams, Danny)
August 13, 2012 Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting 272 Sealed Patent Motion for Sanctions; denying 250 Sealed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/8/12. (mjc, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 449 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Anthony Ramos for Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1SEALED ATTACHMENT)(pkb, ) (Main Document 449 replaced on 8/2/2012) (pkb, ).
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting 275 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; denying 277 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave; granting 235 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/30/12. cc:attys 7-30-12 (mll, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 447 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Joint Motions for Summary Judgment by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit A-8, # 10 Exhibit A-9, # 11 Exhibit B-1, # 12 Exhibit B-2, # 13 Exhibit B-3, # 14 Exhibit B-4, # 15 Exhibit B-5, # 16 Exhibit B-6, # 17 Exhibit B-7, # 18 Exhibit B-8, # 19 Exhibit C-1, # 20 Exhibit C-2, # 21 Exhibit C-3, # 22 Exhibit C-4, # 23 Exhibit C-5)(Findlay, Eric)
July 27, 2012 Filing 446 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS' UNTIMELY DISCLOSED P.R. 3-3 INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE RELATED TESTIMONY AT TRIAL by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stacie Greskowiak, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 27, 2012 Filing 445 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mr. Roy Weinstein by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Findlay, Eric)
July 27, 2012 Filing 444 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Scott Nettles' Expert Reports by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13)(Findlay, Eric)
July 27, 2012 Filing 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,188,180 by Cisco's Dynamic Multipoint VPN Systems by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Findlay, Eric)
July 27, 2012 Filing 442 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 135 AND 151 PATENTS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kelly, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Williams, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 27, 2012 Filing 441 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MARK JONESS MAY 22, 2012 EXPERT REPORT by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 27, 2012 Filing 440 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY BASED ON THE DEFENDANTS' DERIVATION AND NONJOINDER THEORIES by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting 438 Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/24/12. cc:attys 7-24-12 (mll, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
July 20, 2012 Filing 437 REBUTTAL TRIAL Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
July 20, 2012 Filing 436 Amended Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
July 20, 2012 Filing 435 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
July 20, 2012 Filing 434 REBUTTAL TRIAL Witness List by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
July 19, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions and Markman Proceedings held on 7/12/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2012. (sms, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 432 ANSWER to 346 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
July 13, 2012 Filing 431 ANSWER to 346 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Science Applications International Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
July 12, 2012 Filing 430 Trial Witness List by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Oussayef, Karim)
July 12, 2012 Filing 429 TRIAL Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
July 12, 2012 Filing 428 Trial Witness List by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
July 12, 2012 Filing 427 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2012 re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by VirnetX Inc., 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. filed by VirnetX Inc., 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. filed by VirnetX Inc., 277 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation, 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) filed by Apple Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
July 11, 2012 Filing 426 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Mazingo, Jason)
July 10, 2012 Filing 425 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Apple Inc. (Edwards, Stephen)
July 9, 2012 Filing 424 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 366 MOTION for Reconsideration re 266 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, MOTION for Reconsideration re 266 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE CONSTRUCTION OF THE TERM "SECURE COMMUNICATION LINK" (Cawley, Douglas)
July 9, 2012 Filing 423 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to 345 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
July 9, 2012 Filing 422 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Woloson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Woloson, Scott)
July 3, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiencies regarding the Replies to Letter Briefs, entries 387, 388, and 390 submitted. Incorrect docket events. See entries 416 , 417 , and 418 for corrected filings. (gsg)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting 413 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/02/12. cc:attys 7-03-12 (mll, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 277 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions; 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) ; 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.; 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; 366 MOTION for Reconsideration re 266 Order on Sealed Patent Motion; 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC.: Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/02/12. cc:attys 7-03-12(mll, )
July 2, 2012 Filing 419 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 345 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 2, 2012 Filing 418 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 317 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation Filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas)
July 2, 2012 Filing 417 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 318 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation Filed by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas)
July 2, 2012 Filing 416 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 323 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation Filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas)
July 2, 2012 Filing 415 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE to 377 Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/2/2012 (gsg).
July 2, 2012 Filing 414 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE to 357 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/2/2012 (gsg).
July 2, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Letter Brief, entry 391 submitted. Incorrect Docket Event. See entry 412 for corrected event. (gsg)
June 29, 2012 Filing 413 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 29, 2012 Filing 412 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by NEC Corporation of America and NEC Corporation to 316 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief and 378 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting 396 Motion to Permit Depositions Outside the Discovery Period. The depositions of Ed Hendrick may occur on 6-29-2012 and the 30(b)(6) deposition of SAIC may occur on 7-12-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/12. cc:attys 6-29-12 (mll, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 410 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 328 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 409 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 329 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 408 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 333 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 407 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 327 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 406 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 331 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 405 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 330 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 325 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 403 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 326 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 28, 2012 Filing 402 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. to 350 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 401 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. to 354 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 400 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. to 352 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 399 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc. to 355 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 398 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation to 356 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 397 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 315 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 28, 2012 Filing 396 Joint MOTION TO PERMIT DEPOSITIONS OUTSIDE THE DISCOVERY PERIOD (replaces DKT# 384) by Apple Inc., Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 395 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to 336 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 394 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to 338 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 393 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to 335 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 392 SEALED PATENT REPLY by Apple Inc. to 337 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 391 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. SEE ENTRY 412 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Letter Brief filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/2/2012 (gsg).
June 28, 2012 Filing 390 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.*** Letter Brief filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/3/2012 (gsg).
June 28, 2012 Filing 389 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 313 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Filed by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2012 Filing 388 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.*** Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/3/2012 (gsg).
June 28, 2012 Filing 387 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. DISREGARD.*** Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 7/3/2012 (gsg).
June 28, 2012 NOTICE FROM CLERK. Clerk modified entries 379 and 385 to show correct linkage. (gsg)
June 28, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Joint motion, entry 384 submitted. No certificate of conference. (gsg)
June 27, 2012 Filing 386 SEALED PATENT REPLY by VirnetX Inc. to 332 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 27, 2012 Filing 385 RESPONSE to 379 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (REPLY) by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 6/28/2012 (gsg).
June 26, 2012 Filing 384 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Joint MOTION TO PERMIT DEPOSITIONS OUTSIDE THE DISCOVERY PERIOD by Apple Inc., Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/28/2012 (gsg).
June 26, 2012 Filing 383 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arturo Padilla for Science Applications International Corporation. (pkb, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 382 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donald Urrabazo for Science Applications International Corporation. (pkb, )
June 26, 2012 Filing 381 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leisa Talbert Peschel on behalf of Apple Inc. (Peschel, Leisa)
June 22, 2012 Filing 380 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 317 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 22, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Notice other, entry 359 submitted. Incorrect event used. Should be filed under notice of compliance letter brief.(gsg)
June 22, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Response, entry 358 submitted. No authorization to file under seal. (gsg)
June 22, 2012 Filing 379 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Responding to Entry 334 ) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 6/28/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 378 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 316 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 377 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 318 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation Filed by VirnetX Inc. by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 376 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 338 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 375 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 336 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 374 SEALED RESPONSE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., NEC Corporation to 327 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., NEC Corporation. (replaces DKT No. 365 FILED IN ERROR) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 21, 2012 Filing 373 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc., NEC Corporation to 328 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed (replaces DKT No. 364 FILED IN ERROR) filed by Apple Inc., NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 21, 2012 Filing 372 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiffs Letter Brief, Dkt. No. 329)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 371 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiffs Letter Brief, Dkt. No. 331)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 370 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiffs Letter Brief, Dkt. No. 326)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 369 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Plaintiffs Letter Brief, Dkt. No. 330)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 368 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Responsive Letter Brief to VirnetX's Letter Brief Dkt. No. 325)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 367 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 333 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed (replaces Dkt No. 353 FILED IN ERROR) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 21, 2012 Filing 366 MOTION for Reconsideration re 266 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Karim Oussayef, # 2 Exhibit A to Oussayef Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Oussayef Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Oussayef Decl., # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 21, 2012 Filing 365 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 374 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** SEALED RESPONSE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., NEC Corporation to 327 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Apple Inc., NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/22/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 364 ***DUPLICATE FILING. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 332 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/22/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 363 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 332 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 21, 2012 Filing 362 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 337 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 361 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 335 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 360 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 313 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 359 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 379 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** NOTICE by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Defendants' Response to VirnetX's June 8, 2012 Letter Brief) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 6/22/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 358 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 317 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 6/22/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 357 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 323 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 356 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 324 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 355 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 319 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 354 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 322 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 353 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 367 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/22/2012 (gsg).
June 21, 2012 Filing 352 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 321 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 351 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 315 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 350 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to 314 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting 344 Motion for Leave to File Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/12. cc:attys 6-21-12 (mll, )
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting 343 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Drew Koning of Ropes & Gray has been withdrawn as counsel of record for NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America. Ropes & Gray LLP will remain as counsel for NEC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/12. cc:attys 6-21-12 (mll, )
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 341 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/12. cc:attys 6-21-12 (mll, )
June 21, 2012 Filing 346 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Third) 238 , COUNTERCLAIM against Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc. by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation.(McSwane, Douglas)
June 20, 2012 Filing 345 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 20, 2012 Filing 344 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief In Support of Its Motin to Strike by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
June 20, 2012 Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 20, 2012 Filing 342 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 346 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** First Amended ANSWER to Complaint 238 , COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc., and Science Applications International Corporation by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation.(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 6/21/2012 (mll, ). Modified on 6/21/2012 (mll, ).
June 20, 2012 Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File NEC's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 20, 2012 Filing 340 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE ENTRY 341 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File To File NEC's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by NEC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas) Modified on 6/21/2012 (gsg).
June 14, 2012 Filing 339 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Bradford John Black, # 2 Exhibit 53, # 3 Exhibit 54, # 4 Exhibit 55, # 5 Exhibit 56, # 6 Exhibit 57, # 7 Exhibit 58)(Findlay, Eric)
June 12, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Documents, entries 309 - 312. Incorrect docket event used. See entries 335 - 338 for corrected filings. (gsg)
June 11, 2012 Filing 338 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc..(DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -4) replaces Document Number 312 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 11, 2012 Filing 337 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc..(DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -3) replaces Document Number 311 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 11, 2012 Filing 336 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc..(DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -2) replaces Document Number 310 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 11, 2012 Filing 335 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc..(DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -1) replaces Document Number 309 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 8, 2012 Filing 334 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 333 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 332 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 331 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 330 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 329 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 328 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 327 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 326 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 325 Sealed Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 324 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 323 Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 322 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 321 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 320 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (APPLES SUR-REPLY TO VIRNETXS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) filed by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
June 8, 2012 Filing 319 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 318 Letter Brief filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - letter brief)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 317 Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 316 Sealed Letter Brief Requesting Permission to file MSJ of Non-Infringement filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-MSJ of Non-Infringement)(McSwane, Douglas)
June 8, 2012 Filing 315 Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 314 Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
June 8, 2012 Filing 313 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
June 8, 2012 Filing 312 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 338 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Document. (DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -4) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/12/2012 (gsg).
June 8, 2012 Filing 311 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 337 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Document. (DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -3) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/12/2012 (gsg).
June 8, 2012 Filing 310 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 336 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Document. (DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/12/2012 (gsg).
June 8, 2012 Filing 309 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 335 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Sealed Document. (DEFENDANT APPLE INCS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS -1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/12/2012 (gsg).
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting 307 Motion to Permit Depositions Outside the Discovery Period. The depositions of SAIC employees and former employees Duane Andrews, Don Foley and Jurgen Gobien may occur on 6/20-21/2012 and the deposition of John Glancy may occur on 7/10/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/12. cc:attys 6-07-12 (mll, )
June 6, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Joint Motion, entry 306, submitted. No certificate of conference. See entry 307 for corrected filing. (gsg)
June 6, 2012 Filing 307 Joint MOTION TO PERMIT DEPOSITIONS OUTSIDE THE DISCOVERY PERIOD by Apple Inc., Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
June 6, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Response to Motion, entry 301, submitted. Should have been a reply to response to motion. Correction should be made by one business day. (gsg)
June 6, 2012 Filing 306 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 307 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Joint MOTION TO PERMIT DEPOSITIONS OUTSIDE THE DISCOVERY PERIOD by Apple Inc., Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 6/6/2012 (gsg).
June 6, 2012 Filing 305 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30, # 2 Exhibit 31, # 3 Exhibit 32, # 4 Exhibit 33, # 5 Exhibit 34)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting 303 Motion to Take Deposition. The depositions of Aastras corporate witness may occur on 6-15-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/06/12. cc:attys 6-06-12 (mll, )
June 5, 2012 Filing 303 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition Outside the Discovery Period by Cisco Systems, Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 4, 2012 Filing 302 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 277 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Findlay, Eric)
June 4, 2012 Filing 301 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE ENTRY 305 FOR CORRECTED FILING*** SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30, # 2 Exhibit 31, # 3 Exhibit 32, # 4 Exhibit 33, # 5 Exhibit 34)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 6/6/2012 (gsg).
June 1, 2012 Filing 300 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 295 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, Proposed Order Denying Sealed Motion. (Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 6/1/2012 (gsg).
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting 297 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dmitriy Kheyfits terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/31/12. cc:attys 5-31-12 (mll, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 298 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices on behalf of Dmitriy Kheyfits (Findlay, Eric)
May 30, 2012 Filing 297 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dmitriy Kheyfits by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 29, 2012 Filing 296 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
May 25, 2012 Filing 295 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 277 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2012: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 24, 2012 Filing 294 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradford J Black (Black, Bradford)
May 24, 2012 Filing 293 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 291 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35 to Black Decl., # 2 Exhibit 36 to Black Decl., # 3 Exhibit 37 to Black Decl., # 4 Exhibit 38 to Black Decl., # 5 Exhibit 39 to Black Decl., # 6 Exhibit 40 to Black Decl., # 7 Exhibit 41 to Black Decl., # 8 Exhibit 42 to Black Decl., # 9 Exhibit 43 to Black Decl., # 10 Exhibit 44 to Black Decl., # 11 Exhibit 45 to Black Decl., # 12 Exhibit 46 to Black Decl., # 13 Exhibit 47 to Black Decl., # 14 Exhibit 48 to Black Decl., # 15 Exhibit 49 to Black Decl., # 16 Exhibit 50 to Black Decl., # 17 Exhibit 51 to Black Decl., # 18 Exhibit 52 to Black Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
May 24, 2012 Filing 292 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 291 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17 to Black Decl., # 2 Exhibit 18 to Black Decl., # 3 Exhibit 19 to Black Decl., # 4 Exhibit 20 to Black Decl., # 5 Exhibit 21 to Black Decl., # 6 Exhibit 22 to Black Decl., # 7 Exhibit 23 to Black Decl., # 8 Exhibit 24 to Black Decl., # 9 Exhibit 25 to Black Decl., # 10 Exhibit 26 to Black Decl., # 11 Exhibit 27 to Black Decl., # 12 Exhibit 28 to Black Decl., # 13 Exhibit 29 to Black Decl., # 14 Exhibit 30 to Black Decl., # 15 Exhibit 31 to Black Decl., # 16 Exhibit 32 to Black Decl., # 17 Exhibit 33 to Black Decl., # 18 Exhibit 34 to Black Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
May 24, 2012 Filing 291 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Bradford John Black, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Black Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 to Black Decl., # 5 Exhibit 3 to Black Decl., # 6 Exhibit 4 to Black Decl., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Black Decl., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Black Decl., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Black Decl., # 10 Exhibit 8 to Black Decl., # 11 Exhibit 9 to Black Decl., # 12 Exhibit 10 to Black Decl., # 13 Exhibit 11 to Black Decl., # 14 Exhibit 12 to Black Decl., # 15 Exhibit 13 to Black Decl., # 16 Exhibit 14 to Black Decl., # 17 Exhibit 15 to Black Decl., # 18 Exhibit 16 to Black Decl.)(Findlay, Eric)
May 21, 2012 Filing 290 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 18, 2012 Filing 289 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 1/5/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (sms, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 288 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Apple Inc.. (APPLES RESPONSE TO VIRNETXS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 214 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. VirnetXs request to include allegations against Apple Inc.s iMessage and Cisco Systems Inc.s Unified Border Element products in GRANTED. VirnetXs request to include additional claims under the Doctrine of Equivalents is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/16/12. cc:attys 5-16-12 (mll, )
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting 283 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by VirnetX Inc. Infringement claims asserted by VirnetX against Aastra defts with respect to Aastras IP-encrypted phone servers and IP-encrypted telephones sold incombination with such IP-encrypted phone servers are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and all other claims, defenses, and counterclaims made by Aastra against VirnetX in this civil action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation, including attorneys fees and expert fees and expenses, shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/14/12. cc:attys 5-15-12(mll, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 285 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) filed by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
May 11, 2012 Filing 284 ANSWER to 257 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
May 11, 2012 Filing 283 STIPULATION of Dismissal by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 282 ANSWER to 254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Science Applications International Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
May 10, 2012 Filing 281 ANSWER to 257 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Science Applications International Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
May 10, 2012 Filing 280 NOTICE by Science Applications International Corporation of Change of Firm Name (Tindel, Andy)
May 10, 2012 Filing 279 ANSWER to 254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
May 8, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cravey, Christopher)
May 7, 2012 Filing 277 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Karim Oussayef, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Oussayef Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Oussayef Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Oussayef Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Oussayef Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Oussayef Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Oussayef Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Oussayef Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Oussayef Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Oussayef Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Oussayef Decl., # 12 Exhibit 11 to Oussayef Decl., # 13 Exhibit 12 to Oussayef Decl., # 14 Exhibit 13 to Oussayef Decl., # 15 Exhibit 14 to Oussayef Decl., # 16 Exhibit 15 to Oussayef Decl., # 17 Exhibit 16 to Oussayef Decl., # 18 Exhibit 17 to Oussayef Decl., # 19 Exhibit 18 to Oussayef Decl., # 20 Exhibit 19 to Oussayef Decl., # 21 Exhibit 20 to Oussayef Decl., # 22 Exhibit 21 to Oussayef Decl., # 23 Exhibit 22 to Oussayef Decl., # 24 Exhibit 23 to Oussayef Decl., # 25 Exhibit 24 to Oussayef Decl., # 26 Exhibit 25 to Oussayef Decl., # 27 Exhibit 26 to Oussayef Decl., # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 7, 2012 Filing 276 ANSWER to 252 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
May 7, 2012 Filing 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL TESTING AND DEPLOYMENT DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND PRIOR LITIGATION DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANT CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
May 7, 2012 Filing 274 ANSWER to 252 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Science Applications International Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 270 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sreekar R Gadde terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/01/12. cc:attys 5-01-12 (mll, )
April 30, 2012 Filing 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 30, 2012 Filing 271 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 30, 2012 Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sreekar Gadde for NEC by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
April 27, 2012 Deadlines reset per 269 Amended Docket Control Order: Expert Witness List due by 5/22/2012; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 7-03-2012. Identify trial witnesses by 7/12/2012; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 7-20-2012. Jury instructions due by 8/29/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2012; Response to Dispositive Motions due 8-24-2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2012. (mll, )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/12. cc:attys 4-27-12(mll, )
April 26, 2012 Filing 268 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,,,,, 111 Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 26, 2012 Filing 267 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S SUR-REPLY TO VIRNETXS MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES, AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE INC) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Further, VirnetX Inc's Motion to Compel from Apple a Complete Response to VirnetX's Eighth Common Interrogatory 179 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/12. cc:attys 4-25-12 (mll, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 265 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Snider, Rosemary)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting 263 Motion to Take Deposition. The deposition of Mr. Gerald P. Kenney may proceed on 4-26-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/12. cc:attys 4-24-12 (mll, ) Modified on 4/24/2012 (mll, ).
April 23, 2012 Filing 263 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Gerald P. Kenney by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
April 20, 2012 Filing 262 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian Kao for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting 259 Motion to Take Deposition. The deposition of Mr. Henning Schulzrinne may proceed on 4-27-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/12. cc:attys 4-18-12 (mll, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 258 Motion for Discovery. The deposition of Banner & Witcoff may proceed on 4-26-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/12. cc:attys 4-18-12 (mll, )
April 17, 2012 Filing 259 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Mr. Henning Schulzrinne by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
April 17, 2012 Filing 258 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Permit Deposition by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
April 16, 2012 Filing 257 ANSWER to 238 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against VirnetX Inc. by Apple Inc..(Williams, Danny)
April 16, 2012 Filing 256 ANSWER to 238 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra USA, Inc..(Hyland, Jon)
April 16, 2012 Filing 255 ANSWER to 238 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra Technologies Ltd..(Hyland, Jon)
April 16, 2012 Filing 254 NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America's ANSWER to 238 Amended Complaint, (Third Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation.(McSwane, Douglas)
April 13, 2012 Filing 253 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
April 13, 2012 Filing 252 ANSWER to 238 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Science Applications International Corporation, VirnetX Inc. by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 248 Motion to Permit Deposition. The deposition of McDermott, Will & Emery may proceed on 4-24-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/13/12. cc:attys 4-13-12 (mll, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 250 SEALED MOTION (APPLES MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HALTING THE DEPOSITION OF MR. CHRISTOPHE ALLIE PURSUANT TO RULE 30(d) AND RULE 26) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 247 Motion to Permit Deposition. The deposition of Apple Inc. for topic 13 of VirnetXs First 30(b)(6) Notice to Apple may proceed on 4-20-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/12/12. cc:attys 4-12-12 (mll, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 248 Joint MOTION TO PERMIT THE DEPOSITION OF McDERMOTT, WILL & EMERY PURSUANT TO FRCP 30(b)(6) ON APRIL 24, 2012 by Apple Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 11, 2012 Filing 247 Joint MOTION TO PERMIT THE DEPOSITION OF APPLE INC PURSUANT TO FRCP 30(b)(6) ON APRIL 20, 2012 by Apple Inc., VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 245 Joint Motion to Permit the Deposition of Henning Schulzrinne. It is ordered that the deposition of Mr. Schulzrinne may proceed on 4/19/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/11/2012. (leh, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 245 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Mr. Henning Schulzrinne by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
April 9, 2012 Filing 244 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Drew Koning for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 243 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8)(Williams, Danny)
April 5, 2012 Filing 242 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Bufe, John)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 04/02/12. cc:attys 4-03-12(mll, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 239 Motion to Take Deposition. The deposition of Mr. Kendall Larsen may proceed on 4-20-2012, and the deposition of Mr. Sameer Mathur may proceed on 4-25-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/29/12. cc:attys 3-29-12 (mll, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 239 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Mr. Kendall Larsen and Mr. Sameer Mathur by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
March 28, 2012 Filing 238 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, filed by VirnetX Inc., Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 28, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 237, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE RE-FILED BY ATTORNEY.*** (gsg)
March 28, 2012 Filing 237 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE ENTRY 238 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, filed by VirnetX Inc., Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 3/28/2012 (gsg).
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying 120 Motion to Dismiss; denying 129 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting VirnetX's motion to join Science Applications International Corporation. SAIC has five Court days to join as a plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/20/12. (mjc, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE, EXECUTABLE BINARIES AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT APPLE, INC. by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Mark. T. Jones, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
March 14, 2012 Filing 234 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (DEFENDANTS SUR-REPLY TO VIRNETXS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Williams, Danny)
March 14, 2012 Filing 233 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (APPLES SUR-REPLY TO VIRNETXS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO INCLUDE IMESSAGE) filed by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
March 13, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Trent Edward Campione on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Campione, Trent)
March 9, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Hasenour, Seth)
March 8, 2012 Filing 230 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Andrew G Hamill for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 227 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/12. cc:attys 3-05-12 (mll, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to Motion re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 2, 2012 Filing 227 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 146 Protective Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 22, 2012 Filing 226 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Xiao Li for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 225 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 21, 2012 Filing 224 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2012: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
February 21, 2012 Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit J (No I), # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2012: # 19 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
February 21, 2012 Filing 222 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Bondor for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 221 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carolyn L James for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (mll, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 220 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sreekar R Gadde for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (mll, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 219 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Spaccarotella for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 217 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Luke Fleming McLeroy terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/12. cc:attys 2-15-12 (mll, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 215 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/08/12. cc:attys 2-08-12 (mll, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INFRINGMENT CONTENTIONS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 31, 2012 Filing 214 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 30, 2012 Filing 213 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan Whyman Olesek for Apple Inc. (mll, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 212 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marcia H. Sundeen for Apple Inc. (mll, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 211 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William J McCable as counsel for NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 209 Motion to Submit Additional Authority relating to the Construction of the Virtual Private Network Term of VirnetX Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/12. cc:attys 1-18-12 (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY REGARDING THE CONSTRUCTION OF "VIRTUAL PRIVATE NETWORK" by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 202 Motion to submit Additional Authority relating to theConstruction of the Secure Communication Link Term. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/12. cc:attys 1-13-12 (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney William J McCabe, Stuart Yothers, Andy Schwentker and Maxwell Fox for defts NEC Corporation NEC Corporation of America. Attorney Robert M Masters; Brock S Weber; Timothy P Cremen and Bhaskar Kakarla terminated; granting 200 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/12. cc:attys 1-13-12 (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 206 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry D Morgan on behalf of Apple Inc. (Morgan, Terry)
January 13, 2012 Filing 205 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Andrew Schwentker for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 204 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stuart W Yothers for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 203 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Maxwell A Fox for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (mll, )
January 13, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding DE 201. Per atty, document unnecessarily filed. No correction needed. (leh, )
January 12, 2012 Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION Defendants' Motion to Submit Additional Authority regarding the Construction of "Secure Communication Link" by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 20110607 - Response (highlighted), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 12, 2012 Filing 201 PLEASE IGNORE. Document filed in error. PLEASE IGNORE. Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Submit Additional Authority relating to the Construction of the "Secure Communication Link" Term by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 1/13/2012 (leh, ).
January 11, 2012 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert Masters, Timothy Cremen, Bhaskar Kakarla and Brock Weber, Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney William McCabe, Stuart Yothers, Andy Schwentker and Maxwell Fox by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $19,550.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 1-05-2012 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $39,100.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/09/12. cc:attys 1-10-12(mll, )
January 5, 2012 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 1/5/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Lackey, Walter)
January 3, 2012 Filing 196 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY filed by Apple Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
December 24, 2011 Filing 195 REPLY to Response to Motion re 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
December 21, 2011 Filing 194 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cawley, Douglas)
December 21, 2011 Filing 193 NOTICE by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America re 189 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE regarding Supplemental Invalidity Contentions) (Williams, Danny)
December 19, 2011 Filing 192 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER appointing Michael T McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/11. cc;attys 12-19-11(mll, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 188 Motion to Serve Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/11. cc:attys 12-15-11 (mll, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 14, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME REQUESTED FOR THE MARKMAN HEARING (Cawley, Douglas)
December 13, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY; Responses due by 12/15/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/11. cc:attys 12-09-11 (mll, )
December 8, 2011 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 8, 2011 Filing 183 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 182 Claim Construction Brief,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JOHN P. J. KELLY, Ph.D.)(Kheyfits, Dmitriy)
December 7, 2011 Filing 182 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P)(Kheyfits, Dmitriy)
December 2, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Third-Party Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Findlay, Eric)
November 30, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell Reed Sibley on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Sibley, Mitchell)
November 18, 2011 Filing 179 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL FROM APPLE A COMPLETE RESPONSE TO VIRNETX'S EIGHTH COMMON INTERROGATORY by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.1, # 2 Exhibit A.2, # 3 Exhibit A.3, # 4 Exhibit A.4, # 5 Exhibit A.5, # 6 Exhibit A.6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 18, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 AND ORDER DATED MAY 2, 2011 (Cawley, Douglas)
November 17, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Disclosure Regarding Technology Tutorial (Findlay, Eric)
November 9, 2011 Filing 176 NOTICE by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America of Compliance and Privilege Log (McSwane, Douglas)
November 8, 2011 Filing 175 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 7, 2011 Filing 174 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 175 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas) Modified on 11/8/2011 (mll, ).
November 4, 2011 Filing 173 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Austin Curry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Declaration of Mark T. Jones)(Cawley, Douglas)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 170 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Parties are ordered to meet and confer and narrow the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number, and to file an amended P.R. 4-3 Statement by 11-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-03-11 (mll, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time. NEC defts shall have to 11-07-2011 to serve privilege logs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/01/11. cc:attys 11-01-11 (mll, )
November 1, 2011 Filing 170 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 31, 2011 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Privilege Logs by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order and extending deadlines to file briefs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 10-31-11 (mll, )
October 28, 2011 Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 10-31-2011 to serve privilege logs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/11. cc:attys 10-20-11 (mll, )
October 19, 2011 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Privilege Logs by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 11, 2011 Filing 164 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cawley, Douglas)
October 7, 2011 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rodgers, Matthew)
October 5, 2011 Filing 162 PLEASE IGNORE. Atty filed pleading in wrong case. PLEASE IGNORE. . NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Curry, John) Modified on 10/6/2011 (leh, ).
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion for Leave to Extend the Deadline for filing the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Deadline is extended to 10/11/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/11. (mjc, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 159 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 Motion to Amend/Correct. The deadline set forth in theOrder Granting Defendants Motion to Amend the Discovery Order and Docket Control Order 117 shall be extended to 10-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/11. cc:attys 9-29-11 (mll, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to provide the Court with technology tutorials shall be extended to 11-10-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 156 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to Provide the Court with Technology Tutorials by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 20, 2011 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramzi Ragheb Khazen on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Khazen, Ramzi)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to seek relief from the Court regarding objections to Mr.Easttom lodged properly under the Protective Order shall be extended through 9-26-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-20-11 (mll, )
September 19, 2011 Filing 153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion Seeking Relief From The Court Under Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure of William C. Easttom by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendantsto seek relief from the Court regarding objections to Mr. William C Easttom lodged properly under the Protective Order shall be extended through 9-19-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11 (mll, )
September 14, 2011 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion Seeking Relief from the Court under Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure of William C. Easttom by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 30, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America of Compliance of service of Supplemental Disclosures (McSwane, Douglas)
August 29, 2011 Filing 149 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF COMPLIANCE (Williams, Danny)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Phillip Nollin Cockrell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/11. cc:attys 08/11/11 (mll, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Phillip N. Cockrell) by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11(mll, )
July 29, 2011 Filing 145 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
July 25, 2011 Filing 144 NOTICE by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Notice of Firm Name Change) (McSwane, Douglas)
July 7, 2011 Filing 143 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION for Leave to File An Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Jones, Michael)
July 5, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Notice of Service of Second Amended Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 138 Motion to Seal Pltf's Surreply to Defts' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION for Leave to File An Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss SAIC's Reply to Defendants' Response to SAIC's Motion for Leaved to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice for VirnetX' Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit filed by Science Applications International Corporation. (Tindel, Andy)
June 27, 2011 Filing 139 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Virnetx' Intentional Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
June 27, 2011 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFF'S SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION T DISMISS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 134 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/20/2011. (gsg)
June 16, 2011 Filing 136 RESPONSE to Motion re 129 MOTION for Leave to File An Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 16, 2011 Filing 135 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Virnetx' Intentional Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Jones, Michael)
June 16, 2011 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Their Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 9, 2011 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Virnetx' Intentional Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit filed by Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andy Tindel, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andy Tindel, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
June 8, 2011 Filing 132 ANSWER to 122 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2011 Filing 131 ANSWER to 121 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Seal Pltf's Response to Defts' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-08-11 (mll, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File An Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SAIC's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Andy Tindel, # 3 Exhibit A to Tindel Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
June 6, 2011 Filing 128 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Virnetx' Intentional Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sameer Mather, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Alternative Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 6, 2011 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
June 3, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Chang on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Chang, Peter)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/31/11. cc:attys 5-31-11(mll, )
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew G Hamill terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/11. cc:attys 5-26-11 (mll, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Curry, John)
May 23, 2011 Filing 122 Aastra Technologies Limited's ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra Technologies Ltd..(Hyland, Jon)
May 23, 2011 Filing 121 Aastra USA Inc.'s ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra USA, Inc..(Hyland, Jon)
May 20, 2011 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Virnetx' Intentional Failure to Secure Standing to Bring Suit by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Stadnick, # 2 Exhibit A - April 18th email, # 3 Exhibit B - April 20th email, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 17, 2011 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hamill, Andrew)
May 3, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 116 Order on Motion for Leave to File (Cawley, Douglas)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Order and Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/11. cc:attys 5-03-11 (mll, )
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/11. cc:attys 5-03-11 (mll, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct THE DISCOVERY ORDER AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 29, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re 106 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANTS' NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND) (Cawley, Douglas)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 106 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Responses due by 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 106 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [(UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT AND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS)] by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 19, 2011 Deadlines set per 111 Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2011; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 10-12-2011. Fact Discovery due by 4/13/2012; Expert Discovery due by 6-29-2012. Expert Witness List due by 4/27/2012; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 6-01-2012. Identify trial witnesses by 6/29/2012; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 7-10-2012. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2011, for deft. Jury instructions due by 8/24/2012. Mediation Completion due by 12/31/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2012; Response to Dispositive Motions due 8-17-2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2012. Motions in Limine due 9-28-2012; Responses to Motions in Limine due 10-05-2012. Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 1/5/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Estimated length of trial is 5-7 days. (mll, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/19/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, )
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/19/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc. Notice of Service of First Amended Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court extends the deadlines for the parties to submit proposed docket control and discovery orders to 3-03-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/11. cc:attys 4-11-11 (mll, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 5, 2011 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 Filing 105 ANSWER to 93 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 Filing 104 ANSWER to 91 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER to 92 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 Filing 102 ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
April 4, 2011 Filing 101 ANSWER to 90 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
March 31, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE of Disclosure by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Hyland, Jon)
March 30, 2011 Filing 99 NOTICE of Disclosure by VirnetX Inc. (Cawley, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 Filing 98 NOTICE by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America Notice of Compliance (McSwane, Douglas)
March 30, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF COMPLIANCE regarding Initial Disclosures (Williams, Danny)
March 30, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
March 25, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MEDIATION (Cawley, Douglas)
March 22, 2011 Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karim Z Oussayef for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
March 14, 2011 Filing 93 ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
March 14, 2011 Filing 92 ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ORIGINAL ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against VirnetX Inc. by Apple Inc..(Williams, Danny)
March 13, 2011 Filing 91 NEC Corporation & NEC Corporation of America's First Amended ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation.(McSwane, Douglas)
March 10, 2011 Filing 90 Aastra Technologies Limited's ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra Technologies Ltd..(Hyland, Jon)
March 10, 2011 Filing 89 Aastra USA Inc.'s ANSWER to 75 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra USA, Inc..(Hyland, Jon)
March 3, 2011 Filing 88 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Docket Control Order, # 4 Proposed Discovery Order)(Cawley, Douglas)
February 28, 2011 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America shall have to 3-14-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/22/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Cisco Systems Inc shall have to 3-14-2011 to answer, move or otherwise respond to pltf's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/22/11. cc:attys 2-22-11 (mll, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
February 17, 2011 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 75 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aastra USA Inc and Aastra Technologies Ltd shall have to 3-10-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/11. cc:attys 2-17-11 (mll, )
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. Apple Inc shall have to 3-14-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/11. cc:attys 2-17-11 (mll, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 80 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon)
February 16, 2011 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 2-28-2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 2-28-2011 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 2-18-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11(mll, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VIRNETX INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Cawley, Douglas)
February 7, 2011 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 2/7/2011. (refer to document #76) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 76 2.7.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 2/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cawley, Douglas)
January 24, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
January 24, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
January 17, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacie Lynn Greskowiak on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Greskowiak, Stacie)
January 14, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Jon Bentley Hyland on behalf of Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc. (Hyland, Jon)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/7/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11(mll, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE REGARDING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Cawley, Douglas)
November 22, 2010 Filing 68 ANSWER to 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
November 22, 2010 Filing 67 ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
November 22, 2010 Filing 66 ANSWER to 55 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
November 22, 2010 Filing 65 ANSWER to 52 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
November 22, 2010 Filing 64 ANSWER to 53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by VirnetX Inc..(Cawley, Douglas)
November 5, 2010 Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradford J Black for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
November 5, 2010 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew G Hamill for Cisco Systems, Inc. (mll, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (McSwane, Douglas)
October 29, 2010 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aastra USA, Inc. (Cockrell, Phillip)
October 29, 2010 Filing 59 Aastra USA Inc's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra USA, Inc..(Cockrell, Phillip)
October 29, 2010 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aastra Technologies Ltd. (Cockrell, Phillip)
October 29, 2010 Filing 57 Aastra Technologies Limited's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Aastra Technologies Ltd..(Cockrell, Phillip)
October 29, 2010 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Williams, Danny)
October 29, 2010 Filing 55 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Apple Inc..(Williams, Danny)
October 29, 2010 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
October 29, 2010 Filing 53 Cisco Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
October 29, 2010 Filing 52 NEC Corp and NEC Corp of America's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against VirnetX Inc. by NEC Corporation of America, NEC Corporation.(McSwane, Douglas)
October 26, 2010 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael P Stadnick for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Desmarais for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dmitriy Kheyfits for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ameet A Modi for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tamir Packin for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyung Kim on behalf of Apple Inc. (Kim, Kyung)
October 6, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruben Singh Bains on behalf of Apple Inc. (Bains, Ruben)
October 6, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Apple Inc. (Williams, Danny)
September 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 43 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NEC Corporation of America to 10/29/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 42 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NEC Corporation to 10/29/2010. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 43 NEC Corporation of America's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (McSwane, Douglas)
September 28, 2010 Filing 42 NEC Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (McSwane, Douglas).
September 16, 2010 Filing 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy P Cremen for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by VirnetX Inc.. NEC Corporation of America personally served on 8/19/2010 on Dionne Miles, Managing Agent authorized by law to accept service of process, answer due 9/9/2010. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by VirnetX Inc.. Cisco Systems, Inc. personally served on 8/18/2010 Bradley Ellison, person authorized to accept service of process, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by VirnetX Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by serving Registered Agent Meagan Nichols, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by VirnetX Inc.. Aastra USA, Inc. personally served on Sue Vertrees designated by law to accept process of service served on 8/18/2010, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Filing 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by VirnetX Inc.. Aastra Technologies Ltd. personally served on 8/20/2010 by Process Server Andrew Kovacs on Jamshid Rezaei, Director IT designated to accept process of service, answer due 9/10/2010. (ehs, )
September 9, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Pearson, Daniel)
September 9, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
September 9, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
September 9, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Parker, Robert)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Aastra defts will have to 10-29-2010 to answer, move or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/08/10. cc:attys 9-08-10 (mll, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NEC Corporation. (kls, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NEC Corporation of America. (kls, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hyland, Jon)
September 7, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 23 , Defendant's First Unopposed Application for Extension of Time. DOCUMENT FILED USING INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 29 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brock S Weber for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bhaskar Kakarla for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert M Masters for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 23 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc..( Hyland, Jon) Modified on 9/7/2010 (mjc, ).
September 3, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Bentley Hyland on behalf of Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc. (Hyland, Jon)
September 3, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Katz on behalf of Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc. (Katz, Robert)
September 3, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip Nollin Cockrell on behalf of Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc. (Cockrell, Phillip)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Apple Inc shall have to 10-29-2010 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/10. cc:attys 9-02-10 (mll, )
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Cisco Systems Inc shall have to 10-29-2010 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/10. cc:attys 9-02-10 (mll, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Apple Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
September 1, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
September 1, 2010 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
September 1, 2010 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 17, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Cassady, Jason)
August 17, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wayne Caldwell on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 17, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luke Fleming McLeroy on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (McLeroy, Luke)
August 17, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 12, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NEC Corporation of America. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Aastra USA, Inc. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NEC Corporation. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cawley, Douglas)
August 12, 2010 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Aastra Technologies Ltd. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (kls, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VirnetX Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VirnetX Holding Corporation for VirnetX Inc.. (Cawley, Douglas)
August 11, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aastra Technologies Ltd., Aastra USA, Inc., Apple Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2618483.), filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cawley, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VirnetX Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VirnetX Inc.
Represented By: Douglas A Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aastra Technologies Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aastra USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?