Innovative Sonic Limited v. Research in Motion Ltd et al Featured Case

Innovative Sonic, Ltd., a Mauritius corporation based in Taiwan, sued BlackBerry maker Research In Motion ('RIM') over two smartphone-related patents. The first U.S. patent issued in 2005, No. 6,925,183 (the “’183 Patent”) is called Preventing Shortened Lifetimes of Security Keys in a Wireless Communications Security System.” The second U.S. patent issued in 2008, No. RE 40,077 (the “’077 Patent”) is called the “Window-Based Polling Scheme for a Wireless Communications Protocol. Innovative Sonic claims that RIM infringes the '183 and '077 patents through its Blackberry smartphone models Storm, Storm 2, Tour 9630, Bold 9000, and Bold 9700.

Plaintiff: Innovative Sonic Limited
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd and Research In Motion Corporation
Case Number: 6:2010cv00455
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2011 Case opened in Northern District of Texas as 3:11-cv-706. (gsg)
April 6, 2011 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Texas. (gsg)
March 21, 2011 Filing 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jesse L Dyer for Innovative Sonic Limited. (mll, )
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Change Venue. This case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/17/2011. (gsg)
March 16, 2011 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barbara Parvis, # 2 Declaration of Li Chen, # 3 Exhibit 1-RIM Irving facilities to Northern District Dallas Division, # 4 Exhibit 2-RIM Irving facilities to Eastern District Tyler Division, # 5 Exhibit 3-Flight options from Toronto to DFW, # 6 Exhibit 4-Flight options from Taiwan to DFW, # 7 Exhibit 5-Flight options from Taiwan to Tyler, # 8 Exhibit 6-Judicial caseload report of the Northern and Eastern Districts of Texas, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
March 11, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa H Keyes on behalf of Innovative Sonic Limited (Keyes, Melissa)
February 17, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by Innovative Sonic Limited Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities (Lemieux, Ronald)
February 17, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd Certificate of Interested Persons (Chen, Li)
February 2, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward G Poplawski on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Poplawski, Edward)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/2/2011. (gsg)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/2/2011. (gsg)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/2/2011. (gsg)
January 7, 2011 Filing 21 ANSWER to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Innovative Sonic Limited.(Lemieux, Ronald)
December 16, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE by Innovative Sonic Limited NOTICE THAT CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Lemieux, Ronald)
December 14, 2010 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Chen, Li)
December 14, 2010 Filing 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Innovative Sonic Limited by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.(Chen, Li)
December 10, 2010 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to Research in Motion Ltd on 10/25/2010, answer due: 11/15/2010. (gsg)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that Plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready dfor a scheduling confernece when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/28/2010. (gsg)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond. ORDERED that Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Ltd. be given to and including December 14, 2010 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/8/2010. (gsg)
October 4, 2010 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 4, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tung Thanh Nguyen on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Nguyen, Tung)
October 4, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Li Chen on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Chen, Li)
October 4, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Pritikin on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd (Pritikin, David)
September 21, 2010 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Research In Motion Corporation on 9/15/2010, answer due: 10/6/2010. (gsg)
September 21, 2010 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Innovative Sonic Limited (Nelson, Shanee)
September 9, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vid R Bhakar on behalf of Innovative Sonic Limited (Bhakar, Vid)
September 9, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Scott Lemieux on behalf of Innovative Sonic Limited (Lemieux, Ronald)
September 9, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shanee Y W Nelson for Innovative Sonic Limited. (mll, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Innovative Sonic Limited (Race, Deborah)
September 3, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Research In Motion Corporation. (kls, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Research in Motion Ltd. (kls, )
September 2, 2010 Judge Michael H. Schneider added. (mll, )
September 2, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carroll, Otis)
September 2, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2653356.), filed by Innovative Sonic Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, '183 patent, # 2 Exhibit B, ''077 patent, # 3 Exhibit C, '795 patent, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Otis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: # 5 '183 Patent Searchable, # 6 '795 Patent Searchable, # 7 '077 Patent Searchable) (mjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sonic Limited v. Research in Motion Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sonic Limited
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?