Parallel Networks, LLC v. Adidas America, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Parallel Networks, LLC
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC, Gillette Company The, Andersen Windows, Inc., Jones Retail Corporation, Subaru of America, Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Caterpillar Inc, Jones Investment Company, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Motorola, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC, American Girl LLC, General Motors LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC, Dillard's, Inc., Nautica Apparel, Inc., BBY Solutions, Inc., AT&T, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Bloomingdale's Inc, Andersen Corporation, Aeropostale, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Wolverine World Wide, Inc., American Suzuki Motor Corporation, Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Brunswick Corporation, Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, HSN Interactive LLC, Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC, Hayneedle, Inc., Hasbro, Inc., Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Adidas Interactive, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc., H-D Michigan, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Macy's West Stores, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., HSN LP, Herman Miller, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Victoria, Russell Brands, LLC, LG Electronics USA, Inc., New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc., PRL USA Holdings, Inc. and Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC
Case Number: 6:2010cv00491
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER TO CLERK TO CLOSE THE CASE as all defendants have been dismissed and there is nothing for the district court to resolve. This case is currently on appeal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/6/16. (mjc, )
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting #540 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. The Court hereby dismisses all claims against Caterpillar Inc. without prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/24/15. (mll, )
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting #539 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. The Court hereby dismisses all claims against Limited Brands, Inc. without prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/24/15. (mll, )
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The claims asserted herein by plaintiff against defendant Bloomingdale's, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice; the counterclaims and defenses asserted by defendant Bloomingdale's, Inc. against plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/18/15. (mll, )
February 13, 2015 Filing 541 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Parallel Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
February 13, 2015 Filing 540 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Parallel Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
February 13, 2015 Filing 539 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Parallel Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Leonard Davis recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/15/15. (mjc, )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants Brunswick Corporation and Brunswick Bowling and Billiards Corporation are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each Party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/14. (mll, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER that the Clerk of Court terminate the following dismissed parties: Adidas America, Inc.; Aeropostale, Inc.; Asics America Corporation; Briggs & Stratton Corporation; Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC ; Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc.; Dillard's, Inc.; The Goodyear Tire &Rubber Company; H-D Michigan, Inc.; Harley-Davidson, Inc.; Hayneedle, Inc.; HSN Interactive LLC; HSN LP; Jones Retail Corporation; LG Electronics USA, Inc.; Macy's West Stores, Inc.; Macy's.com, Inc.; Motorola Mobility, Inc.; NewBalance Athletic Shoe, Inc.; Nissan North America, Inc.; Ralph Lauren Media, LLC; Russell Brands, LLC; Subaru of America, Inc.; Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC; Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/16/14. (mll, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER granting #534 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Andersen Windows Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. All claims between Plaintiff and Andersen Corporation which were previously dismissed without prejudice are now dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/05/14. (mll, )
June 3, 2014 Filing 534 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER that all claims and counterclaims between plaintiff Parallel Networks, LLC and defendant Nautica Retail USA, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/18/13. (mll, )
January 12, 2012 Case Stayed per 630 Order. Associated Cases: 6:10-cv-00111-LED, 6:10-cv-00112-LED, 6:10-cv-00275-LED, 6:10-cv-00474-LED, 6:10-cv-00491-LED(mll, )
March 25, 2011 Filing 532 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shane A Nelson on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC (Nelson, Shane)
March 22, 2011 Filing 531 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Nicholas Patariu on behalf of H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc. (Patariu, David)
March 22, 2011 Filing 530 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Nicholas Patariu on behalf of Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation (Patariu, David)
March 21, 2011 Filing 529 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gerald Graham on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (Graham, Robert)
March 15, 2011 This cause is CONSOLIDATED with civil action 6:10cv111 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 528 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #454 Motion to Bifurcate. This case is CONSOLIDATED, with civil action 6:10cv111 designated as the Lead Case. The Court sets Markman and summary judgment hearing in this case for 6-21-2011 at 9:30 a.m. By 3-31-2011: (1) defts shall provide the Court with three terms they need construed; (2) the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule and proposed Docket Control Order; (3) the parties shall submit an agreed Technical Advisor or proposed Technical Advisors if they cannot agree. If the case is not resolved following the Court's claim construction summary judgment rulings, it is the Court's intention to hold the parties to their current 10-13-2011 Markman date, if needed, and 9-04-2012 trial date. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-16-11 (mll, )
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER denying #324 Motion to Dismiss; denying #344 Motion to Dismiss; denying #355 Motion to Dismiss; denying #255 Motion to Dismiss; denying #268 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11 (mll, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 526 NOTICE of Disclosure by LG Electronics USA, Inc. Initial Disclosure (Cornelius, William)
March 9, 2011 Filing 525 NOTICE of Disclosure by New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
March 9, 2011 Filing 524 NOTICE of Disclosure by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER granting #505 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Gillette Company and Procter & Gamble Company shall have to 3-07-2011 to serve their initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11 (mll, )
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting #497 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for deft LG Electronics USA Inc to serve initial disclosure is extended to 3-11-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/11. cc:attys 3-08-11 (mll, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 521 NOTICE of Disclosure by Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company regarding Initial Disclosures under FRCP 26(a)(1) (Fischman, Gary)
March 7, 2011 Filing 520 NOTICE by Andersen Windows, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Bloomingdale's Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jones Retail Corporation, Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC regarding proposal to limit case to 5 asserted claims and 5 claim terms for construction (Cordell, Ruffin)
March 7, 2011 Filing 519 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #517 Notice (Other).. (Heartfield, J)
March 7, 2011 Filing 518 NOTICE of Disclosure by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 1 of Discovery Order (Tadlock, Charles)
March 7, 2011 Filing 517 NOTICE by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. regarding proposal to limit case to 5 asserted claims and 5 claim terms for construction (Heartfield, J)
March 4, 2011 Filing 516 NOTICE of Disclosure by BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC Service of Initial Disclosures (Kopinski, Nicole)
March 4, 2011 Filing 515 NOTICE of Disclosure by bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC regarding Initial Disclosures (Tyler, Wilhemina)
March 4, 2011 Filing 514 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nissan North America, Inc. Service of Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2011 Filing 513 NOTICE by AT&T, Inc. of Compliance with Local Rule CV-26(c) (Ennis, Chad)
March 4, 2011 Filing 512 NOTICE of Disclosure by Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation regarding service of initial disclosures (Fischman, Gary)
March 4, 2011 Filing 511 NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl)
March 4, 2011 Filing 510 NOTICE of Disclosure by Andersen Windows, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Bloomingdale's Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jones Retail Corporation, Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC (Conrad, David)
March 4, 2011 Filing 509 NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles)
March 4, 2011 Filing 508 NOTICE of Disclosure by Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC regarding service of initial disclosure (Fischman, Gary)
March 4, 2011 Filing 507 NOTICE of Disclosure by H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc. regarding service of Initial Disclosures (Fischman, Gary)
March 4, 2011 Filing 506 NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP (Werber, Matthew)
March 4, 2011 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File serve initial disclosures to and including Monday, March 7, 2011 by Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary)
March 4, 2011 Filing 504 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hayneedle, Inc. (Sulentic, James)
March 4, 2011 Filing 503 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adidas America, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Hawes, Clay)
March 4, 2011 Filing 502 NOTICE of Disclosure by American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hawes, Clay)
March 4, 2011 Filing 501 NOTICE of Disclosure by Motorola Mobility, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
March 4, 2011 Filing 500 NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Beck, David)
March 4, 2011 Filing 499 NOTICE of Disclosure by Russell Brands, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Gillam, Harry)
March 4, 2011 Filing 498 NOTICE of Disclosure by Navistar, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
March 4, 2011 Filing 497 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Initial Disclosure by LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William)
March 4, 2011 Filing 496 NOTICE of Disclosure by General Motors LLC regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
March 4, 2011 Filing 495 NOTICE of Disclosure by American Suzuki Motor Corporation regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
March 4, 2011 Filing 493 NOTICE of Disclosure by Herman Miller, Inc. (Hanasz, Joseph)
March 4, 2011 Filing 492 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jill Acquisition LLC (Stitham, Stacy)
March 4, 2011 Filing 491 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hasbro, Inc. (Stitham, Stacy)
March 1, 2011 Filing 494 3.1.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/1/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting #484 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary R Sorden terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/11. cc:attys 3-02-11 (mll, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 489 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of Hasbro, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC (Cornelius, William)
February 28, 2011 Filing 488 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Cornelius, William)
February 18, 2011 Filing 487 NOTICE by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Compliance with Court Order Regarding Submission of Parallel Networks' Settlement Agreements (Tadlock, Charles)
February 18, 2011 Filing 486 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. Firm Name Change and New E-Mail Address (Patterson, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2011 Filing 485 NOTICE of Change of Address by William C Rooklidge (Rooklidge, William)
February 15, 2011 Filing 484 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request Termination of Electronic Notices by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorden, Gary)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #481 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Lance Vincent is allowed to withdraw from this action and be removed from further service or updates. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-14-11 (mll, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #480 Motion to Substitute Party. Motorola Mobility, Inc. added and SUBSTITUTED for Motorola, Inc.; Motorola, Inc. terminated. The caption in this action is reformed to include Motorola Mobility Inc in place of Motorola Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-14-11 (mll, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 481 MOTION to Withdraw (Lance Vincent) by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vincent, Lance)
February 11, 2011 Filing 480 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party Motorola Mobility, Inc. for Motorola, Inc. Due to a Split of Motorola, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
February 9, 2011 Filing 477 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Bachtell on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Bachtell, Brett)
February 9, 2011 Filing 476 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Bisbikis on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Bisbikis, John)
February 9, 2011 Filing 475 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth J Jurek on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Jurek, Kenneth)
February 9, 2011 Filing 474 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
February 9, 2011 Filing 473 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
February 8, 2011 Filing 479 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Gabriel for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (mll, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 478 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert D Cultice for Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (mll, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 472 Joint Statement Regarding the Discovery Order by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parallel Networks's Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Discovery Order)(Bennett, David)
February 8, 2011 Filing 471 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed agreed Docket Control Order)(Bennett, David)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER Cancelling Status Conference and resetting for 3/1/2011 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/08/11. cc:attys 2-08-11(mll, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 469 NOTICE by Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company Notice of Change of Designation of Lead Counsel from William Rooklidge to Gary Fischman (Fischman, Gary)
February 7, 2011 Filing 468 NOTICE by Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC Notice of Change of Designation of Lead Counsel from Matthew Wolf to Gary Fischman (Fischman, Gary)
February 7, 2011 Filing 467 NOTICE by American Suzuki Motor Corporation of Joinder in Joint Motion by All 6:10cv111 Parties for Bifurcation of Damages Issues (Jones, Michael)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #460 Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Bifurcate under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/7/11. (mjc, ) Modified on 2/7/2011 (mjc, ).
February 4, 2011 Filing 465 RESPONSE in Opposition re #454 MOTION to Bifurcate Damages Issues filed by Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
February 4, 2011 Filing 464 NOTICE by BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC Joinder in Joint Motion By All 6:10-cv-00111 Parties to Bifrucate Damage Issues (Faulkner, Rickey)
February 4, 2011 Filing 463 NOTICE by LG Electronics USA, Inc. re #461 Sealed Response to Motion (Notice of Joinder) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 4, 2011 Filing 462 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Hayneedle, Inc. (Dotson, Darrell)
February 3, 2011 Filing 461 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #454 MOTION to Bifurcate Damages Issues filed by Hasbro, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter J. Brann, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 3, 2011 Filing 460 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Coldwater, Hasbro, and J. Jills Opposition to Motion to Bifurcate by Hasbro, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 3, 2011 Filing 459 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Dotson, Darrell)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER regarding Status Conference set for 2-10-2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/02/11. cc:attys 2-02-11(mll, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 457 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP. (mll, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 456 NOTICE by HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP re #454 MOTION to Bifurcate Damages Issues Notice of Joinder (Lanser, Joseph)
January 26, 2011 Filing 455 NOTICE by Hayneedle, Inc. Notice of Joinder in the Joint Motion by 6:10 CV 00111 Parties to Bifurcate the Damages Issues (Love, Gregory)
January 25, 2011 Filing 454 MOTION to Bifurcate Damages Issues by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Intel v CSIRO 2008 WL 5378037, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
January 25, 2011 Filing 453 NOTICE by AT&T, Inc. of Joinder in Motion by All 6:10-CV-0111 Parties to Bifurcate Damage Issues (Ennis, Chad)
January 25, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Bifurcate Damages Issues submitted by Parallel Networks, LLC. DEFICIENCY: No Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by Next Business Day (kls, )
January 25, 2011 Filing 452 NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC of Joinder in Joint Motion by All 6:10-cv-00111 Parties to Bifurcate Damages Issues (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 24, 2011 Filing 451 NOTICE by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. of Joinder in Joint Motion by all 6:10-cv-00111 Parties to Bifurcate Damages Issues (Heartfield, J)
January 24, 2011 Filing 450 NOTICE by Navistar, Inc. of Joinder in the Joint Motion by All 6:10-cv-00111 Parties to Bifurcate the Damages Issues (Findlay, Eric)
January 24, 2011 Filing 449 NOTICE by Adidas America, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc., American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC , of Joinder in Joint Motion by All 6:10-CV-00111 Parties to Bifurcate Damages Issues. (Hawes, Clay)
January 24, 2011 Filing 448 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. of Joinder in Joint Motion by All 6:10-CV-00111 Parties to Bifurcate Damages Issues (Patterson, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2011 Filing 447 NOTICE by Herman Miller, Inc. of Joinder in the Joint Motion by All 6:10-cv-00111 Parties to Bifurcate the Damages Issues (Hanasz, Joseph)
January 24, 2011 Filing 446 NOTICE by Andersen Windows, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Bloomingdale's Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jones Retail Corporation, Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC of Joinder in Joint Motion by All 6:10-CV-00111 Parties to Bifurcate Damages Issues (Conrad, David)
January 24, 2011 Filing 445 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE*** MOTION to Bifurcate Damages Issues by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Intel v CSIRO 2008 WL 5378037, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles) Modified on 1/25/2011 (kls, ).
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #443 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 2-08-2011 to submit their agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/20/11. cc:attys 1-20-11 (mll, )
January 19, 2011 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order Filed on Behalf of All Defendants by Motorola, Inc., Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting #441 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties are given to 1-25-2011 to submit their agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, )
January 13, 2011 Filing 441 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders Filed on Behalf of All Defendants by Motorola, Inc., Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 13, 2011 Filing 440 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian L Michaelis for HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP (mll, )
January 6, 2011 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 1/4/2011. (refer to document #431) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
January 5, 2011 NOTICE of CORRECTION: The Court's Order #438 entered on 1.5.2011 set the Pretrial Conference on August 23, 2011. The correct date for the Pretrial Conference is August 23, 2012. Parties are to submit their Docket Conrol Order accordingly. (rlf, )
January 5, 2011 Filing 439 NOTICE by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Compliance with Court Order to Submit Letter Regarding Settlements (Tadlock, Charles)
January 5, 2011 Status Conference set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 1-18-2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 1-18-2011 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 1-08-2011. In addition, parties in cause 6:10cv111 have filed a Joint Motion to Bifurcate Damages Issues. The Court sets that motion for hearing on 2-10-2011 at 10:00 a.m. The Court notifies all parties that it will hold a status conference in each of the above cases at the same time as the hearing on the joint motion on 2-10-2011 at 10:00 a.m. The primary issue at this status conference will be whether to bifurcate any or all of the cases. Any party seeking to bifurcate its case may file briefing on this issue not later than 1-24-2011 with responsive briefing due 2-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/05/11. cc:attys 1-05-11(mll, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #424 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft PRL USA Holdings Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-05-11(mll, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #423 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft Nautica Apparel Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-05-11(mll, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #422 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft adidas Interactive Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/11. cc:attys 1-05-11(mll, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 434 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Craig D Leavell for Navistar, Inc.. (mll, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 433 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Simeon G Papacostas for Navistar, Inc.. (mll, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 432 1.4.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 1/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 431 1.4.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 1/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 430 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP (Mazingo, Jason)
December 30, 2010 Filing 429 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Kyle Komenda on behalf of Andersen Windows, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Bloomingdale's Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Jones Retail Corporation, Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC (Komenda, Jonathan)
December 23, 2010 Filing 428 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP (Thames, Earl)
December 22, 2010 Filing 427 REPLY to Response to Motion re #355 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Indirect and Willful Infringement for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 22, 2010 Filing 426 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Sulentic for Hayneedle, Inc. (mll, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 425 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John P Passarelli for Hayneedle, Inc. (mll, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 424 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Without Prejudice by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 21, 2010 Filing 423 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Nautica Apparel, Inc., Without Prejudice by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 21, 2010 Filing 422 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant adidas Interactive, Inc., Without Prejudice by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 20, 2010 Filing 421 RESPONSE in Support re #324 MOTION to Dismiss NAVISTAR'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PARALLEL NETWORKS' ALLEGATIONS OF INDIRECT AND WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Navistar, Inc.. (Steadman, Paul)
December 20, 2010 Filing 420 REPLY to Response to Motion re #344 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Russell Brands, LLC. (Kuehnert, Joel)
December 20, 2010 Filing 419 RESPONSE in Support re #268 MOTION to Dismiss Parallel Networks, LLC's Claims of Induced, Contributory, and Willful Infringement filed by Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael)
December 20, 2010 Filing 418 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian A Tollefson for LG Electronics USA, Inc. (mll, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 417 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Navistar, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
December 20, 2010 Filing 416 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Navistar, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
December 16, 2010 Filing 415 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hayneedle, Inc. (Love, Gregory)
December 16, 2010 Filing 414 REPLY to Response to Motion re #255 MOTION to Dismiss filed by bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Tyler, Wilhemina)
December 16, 2010 Filing 413 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wilhemina Joni Tyler on behalf of bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Tyler, Wilhemina)
December 16, 2010 Filing 412 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #313 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Wolverine World Wide, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 411 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #356 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 410 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #328 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of American Suzuki Motor Corporation by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 409 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #278 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 408 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #311 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Subaru of America, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 407 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #337 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Ralph Lauren Media LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 406 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #304 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Procter and Gamble Company and The Gillette Company by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 405 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #296 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Nissan North America, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 404 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #282 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 403 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #352 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Nautica Retail USA, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 402 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #301 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 401 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #276 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 400 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #321 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Macy's West Stores, Inc. and Macys.com, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 399 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #331 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of LG Electronics USA, Inc. ("LGE") by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 398 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #299 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 397 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #274 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Jones Retail Corporation by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 396 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #259 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Jill Acquisition LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 395 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #261 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN Interactive LLC's and HSN LP's by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 394 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #285 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Hayneedle, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 393 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #257 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Hasbro, Inc by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 392 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #315 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Harley-Davidson, Inc. and H-D Michigan, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 391 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #270 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 390 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #308 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Dillard's, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 389 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #272 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 388 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #267 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Chico's Retail Services, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 387 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #307 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Brunswick Corporation and Brunswick Bowling & Billiards Corporation by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 386 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #309 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Briggs & Stratton Corporation and Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 385 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #319 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Bloomingdale's, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 384 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #279 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of BBY Solutions, Inc., and Bestbuy.com, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 383 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #333 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Asics by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 382 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #326 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Anderson Windows, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 381 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #341 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Aeropostale, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 380 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #335 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Women's Apparel Group, LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 16, 2010 Filing 379 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #339 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Adidas America Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting #374 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures shall be served by 1-24-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/10. cc:attys 12-15-10 (mll, )
December 15, 2010 Filing 377 RESPONSE to Motion re #355 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Indirect and Willful Infringement for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eolas v Adobe - ED Texas May 6 2010, #2 Exhibit B - Clear with Computers v Berdorf Goodman - ED Texas Mar 29 2010, #3 Exhibit C - Realtime Data v Morgan Stanley, #4 Exhibit D - PA Advisors v Google - ED Texas 080808, #5 Exhibit E - Xpoint Tech v Microsoft - Del - Robinson (Dismiss), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 15, 2010 Filing 376 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Matthew J Moore on behalf of American Suzuki Motor Corporation (Moore, Matthew)
December 15, 2010 Filing 375 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Moore on behalf of American Suzuki Motor Corporation (Moore, Matthew)
December 14, 2010 Filing 374 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for an Extension for Service of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #372 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Defendant Motorola Trademark Holdings LLC is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attys fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/10. cc:attys 12-14-10(mll, )
December 10, 2010 Filing 372 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC Without Prejudice by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 10, 2010 Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re #344 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Realtime Data v Morgan Stanley, #2 Exhibit B - PA Advisors v Google, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 10, 2010 Filing 370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #324 MOTION to Dismiss Parallel Networks's Allegations of Indirect and Willful Infringement filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 9, 2010 Filing 369 RESPONSE in Opposition re #268 MOTION to Dismiss Parallel Networks, LLC's Claims of Induced, Contributory, and Willful Infringement filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eolas v Adobe, #2 Exhibit B - Clear With Computers v Bergdorf Goodman, #3 Exhibit C - Realtime Data v Morgan Stanley, #4 Exhibit D - PA Advisors v Google, #5 Exhibit E - Xpoint v Microsoft, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER setting Status Conference for 1/4/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/10. cc:attys 12-09-10(mll, )
December 8, 2010 Filing 367 NOTICE by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Tadlock, Charles)
December 7, 2010 Filing 366 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC (Lang, Shannon)
December 7, 2010 Filing 365 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc. (Lang, Shannon)
December 7, 2010 Filing 364 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc. (Lang, Shannon)
December 7, 2010 Filing 363 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of Aeropostale, Inc. (Lang, Shannon)
December 7, 2010 Filing 362 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A Lang on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc. (Lang, Shannon)
December 6, 2010 Filing 361 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James L Katz for Herman Miller, Inc. (mll, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 360 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Parallel Networks's Opposition to BergdorfGoodman.com, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Eolas v Adobe, #2 Exhibit B - Clear With Computers v Bergdorf Goodman, #3 Exhibit C - Xpoint v Microsoft, #4 Exhibit D - Fotomedia v AOL, #5 Exhibit E - Hewlett-Packard v Intergraph, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 2, 2010 Filing 359 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Robert Colsher for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (mll, )
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #354 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Jeffrey L Johnson is hereby withdrawn as attorney of record for American Girl LLC and Mattel Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/10. cc:attys 12-02-10 (mll, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 357 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Limited Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Intimate Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Victoria's Secret Direct Holding, LLC for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 1, 2010 Filing 356 Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 1, 2010 Filing 355 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Indirect and Willful Infringement for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 30, 2010 Filing 354 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #350 Motion to Amend/Correct. The name of deft Victoria's Secret is changed to Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/10. cc:attys 11-30-10 (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 352 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc..(Hawes, Clay)
November 30, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #343 , Answer. PLEASE IGNORE. ENTRY TO BE REFILED WITH CORRECT PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED.*** (mjc, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 351 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
November 29, 2010 Filing 350 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Change the Name of Defendant Victoria's Secret by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #318 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft Jones Investment Company Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/29/10. cc:attys 11-29-10(mll, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 348 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Russell Brands, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Union Underwear Company, Inc, Corporate Parent Fruit of the Loom, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Russell Brands, LLC. (Kuehnert, Joel)
November 29, 2010 Filing 347 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mattel, Inc. for American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 346 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by American Girl LLC, Mattel, Inc..(Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 345 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Nautica Retail USA, Inc. for Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 344 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or, In the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Russell Brands, LLC. (Kuehnert, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 29, 2010 Filing 343 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc..(Hawes, Clay) Modified on 11/30/2010 (mjc, ).
November 29, 2010 Filing 342 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aeropostale, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 341 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Aeropostale, Inc..(Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 340 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Adidas America, Inc.. (Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 339 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc..(Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 338 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC identifying Other Affiliate PRL USA Holdings, Inc. for PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC. (Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 337 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Ralph Lauren Media, LLC.(Hawes, Clay)
November 29, 2010 Filing 336 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Monomoy Capital Partners for Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 29, 2010 Filing 335 WOMEN'S APPAREL GROUP, LLC'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 29, 2010 Filing 334 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asics America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ASICS Corporation for Asics America Corporation. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 29, 2010 Filing 333 ASICS'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Asics America Corporation.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 29, 2010 Filing 332 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 29, 2010 Filing 331 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by LG Electronics USA, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #306 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC to 11/29/2010. 5 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #305 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jones Investment Company, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 5 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #298 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Victoria's Secret to 12/1/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #290 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mattel, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #288 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Girl LLC to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #286 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PRL USA Holdings, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 330 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES #329 .***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Suzuki Motor Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Suzuki Motor Corporation for American Suzuki Motor Corporation. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/29/2010 (mjc, ).
November 29, 2010 Filing 329 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #330 .***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Suzuki Motor Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Suzuki Motor Corporation for American Suzuki Motor Corporation. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/29/2010 (mjc, ).
November 29, 2010 Filing 328 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by American Suzuki Motor Corporation.(Jones, Michael)
November 24, 2010 Filing 327 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Andersen Windows, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Andersen Corporation for Andersen Windows, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 326 Andersen's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Andersen Windows, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 325 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Navistar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation for Navistar, Inc.. (Steadman, Paul)
November 24, 2010 Filing 324 MOTION to Dismiss by Navistar, Inc.. (Steadman, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
November 24, 2010 Filing 323 Navistar's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by Navistar, Inc..(Steadman, Paul)
November 24, 2010 Filing 322 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc. for Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 321 Macy's' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 320 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bloomingdale's Inc identifying Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc. for Bloomingdale's Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 319 Bloomingdale's' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Bloomingdale's Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 318 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Parallel Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 24, 2010 Filing 317 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan M Sobel for Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc. (mll, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 316 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mitchell S Feller for Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc. (mll, )
November 24, 2010 Filing 315 Harley-Davidson, Inc. and H-D Michigan, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc..(White, Jason)
November 24, 2010 Filing 314 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 313 WOLVERINE'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Wolverine World Wide, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 312 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Subaru of America, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 311 SUBARU'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Subaru of America, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 310 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dillard's, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 309 Briggs & Stratton Corporation and Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC, Briggs & Stratton Corporation.(Wolf, Matthew)
November 24, 2010 Filing 308 DILLARD'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Dillard's, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 307 Brunswick Corporation and Brunswick Bowling & Billiards Corporation ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Brunswick Corporation, Brunswick Billiards, Inc..(White, Jason)
November 24, 2010 Filing 306 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 305 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jones Investment Company, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
November 24, 2010 Filing 304 The Procter & Gamble Company and The Gillette Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company.(Rooklidge, William)
November 24, 2010 Filing 303 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Motorola, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
November 24, 2010 Filing 302 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Motorola, Inc. for Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (Findlay, Eric)
November 24, 2010 Filing 301 Defendants Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC.(Findlay, Eric)
November 24, 2010 Filing 300 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
November 24, 2010 Filing 299 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
November 24, 2010 Filing 298 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Victoria's Secret.( Ainsworth, Charles)
November 23, 2010 Filing 297 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc.. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2010 Filing 296 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Nissan North America, Inc..(Patterson, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #284 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC, and dismissing deft Andersen Corporation with out prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-23-10(mll, )
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Russell Brands LLC shall have to 11-29-2010 to answer or respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-23-10 (mll, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 293 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John F Ward for Victoria's Secret. (mll, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 292 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Zinna for Victoria's Secret. (mll, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 291 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Mattel, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 290 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mattel, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 289 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of American Girl LLC (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 288 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Girl LLC. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 287 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of PRL USA Holdings, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 286 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PRL USA Holdings, Inc.(Hawes, Clay)
November 22, 2010 Filing 285 Defendant, Hayneedle, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Hayneedle, Inc..(Love, Gregory)
November 22, 2010 Filing 284 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Parallel Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2010 Filing 283 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent New Balance, Inc. for New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott)
November 22, 2010 Filing 282 Defendant New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc..(Stevens, Scott)
November 22, 2010 Filing 281 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Luxottica Group S.p.A. for Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 280 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC (Faulkner, Rickey)
November 22, 2010 Filing 279 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC.(Faulkner, Rickey)
November 22, 2010 Filing 278 SUNGLASS HUT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 277 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Motors Corporation for Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 276 MITSUBISHI'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 275 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jones Retail Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Jones Apparel Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Jones Group Inc. for Jones Retail Corporation. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 274 JONES RETAIL CORPORATION'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Jones Retail Corporation.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 273 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citizen Watch Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Citizen Holdings Co., Ltd. for Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 272 CITIZEN WATCH'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 271 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 270 GOODYEAR'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 269 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chico's Retail Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chico's FAS, Inc. for Chico's Retail Services, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 268 MOTION to Dismiss Parallel Networks, LLC's Claims of Induced, Contributory, and Willful Infringement by Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
November 22, 2010 Filing 267 CHICO'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Chico's Retail Services, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 22, 2010 Filing 266 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc..(Richardson, Michael)
November 22, 2010 Filing 265 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN Interactive LLC identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN Interactive LLC. (Lanser, Joseph)
November 22, 2010 Filing 264 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN LP identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN LP. (Lanser, Joseph)
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #252 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ralph Lauren Media, LLC to 11/29/2010. 5 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #250 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nautica Retail USA, Inc. to 11/29/2010; Nautica Apparel, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #248 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Aeropostale, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #246 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adidas America, Inc. to 11/29/2010; Adidas Interactive, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #243 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics USA, Inc. to 11/29/2010. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 263 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN LP identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN LP. (Lanser, Joseph)
November 22, 2010 Filing 262 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN Interactive LLC identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN Interactive LLC. (Lanser, Joseph)
November 22, 2010 Filing 261 HSN LP's and HSN Interactive LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by HSN LP, HSN Interactive LLC.(Lanser, Joseph)
November 22, 2010 Filing 260 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jill Acquisition LLC (Stitham, Stacy)
November 22, 2010 Filing 259 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Jill Acquisition LLC.(Stitham, Stacy)
November 22, 2010 Filing 258 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hasbro, Inc. (Stitham, Stacy)
November 22, 2010 Filing 257 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Hasbro, Inc..(Stitham, Stacy)
November 19, 2010 Filing 256 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Crowe, Daniel)
November 19, 2010 Filing 255 MOTION to Dismiss by bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Crowe, Daniel)
November 19, 2010 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Russell Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 18, 2010 Filing 253 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Ralph Lauren Media, LLC (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 252 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ralph Lauren Media, LLC. (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 251 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 250 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 249 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Aeropostale, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 248 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aeropostale, Inc.(Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 247 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 246 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc.(Hawes, Clay)
November 18, 2010 Filing 245 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T, Inc. (Ennis, Chad)
November 18, 2010 Filing 244 AT&T Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by AT&T, Inc..(Ennis, Chad)
November 16, 2010 Filing 243 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics USA, Inc.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 12, 2010 Filing 242 Return of Service Executed as to New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 241 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #236 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to the Counterclaims of General Motors LLC by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
November 8, 2010 Filing 240 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Brandon Conrad on behalf of Andersen Corporation, Andersen Windows, Inc., Asics America Corporation, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc. (Conrad, David)
November 8, 2010 Filing 239 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicole E Kopinski for BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC. (mll, )
November 8, 2010 Filing 238 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emmett J McMahon for BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC. (mll, )
November 8, 2010 Filing 237 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors LLC. (Jones, Michael)
November 8, 2010 Filing 236 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by General Motors LLC.(Jones, Michael)
November 5, 2010 Filing 235 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jordan L Hirsch for Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (mll, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 234 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Summersgill for Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (mll, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 233 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan W Woodard for Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (mll, )
November 4, 2010 Filing 232 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eastman Kodak Company (Beck, David)
November 4, 2010 Filing 231 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kodak Imaging Network, Inc. (Beck, David)
November 1, 2010 Filing 230 Return of Service Executed as to Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC on 10/4/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/25/2010. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 229 Return of Service Executed as to Wolverine World Wide, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 228 Return of Service Executed as to Victoria's Secret on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 227 Return of Service Executed as to Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC on 10/1/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 226 Return of Service Executed as to Subaru of America, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 225 Return of Service Executed as to Russell Brands, LLC on 10/14/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 224 Return of Service Executed as to Ralph Lauren Media, LLC on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 223 Return of Service Executed as to Procter & Gamble Company on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 222 Return of Service Executed as to PRL USA Holdings, Inc. on 10/14/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 221 Return of Service Executed as to Nissan North America, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 220 Return of Service Executed as to Navistar, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 219 Return of Service Executed as to Nautica Retail USA, Inc. on 10/14/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 218 Return of Service Executed as to Nautica Apparel, Inc. on 10/14/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 217 Return of Service Executed as to Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 216 Return of Service Executed as to Motorola, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 215 Return of Service Executed as to Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 214 Return of Service Executed as to Mattel, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 213 Return of Service Executed as to Macy's West Stores, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 212 Return of Service Executed as to Macys.com, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 211 Return of Service Executed as to LG Electronics USA, Inc. on 10/14/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 210 Return of Service Executed as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 209 Return of Service Executed as to Kodak Imaging Network, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 208 Return of Service Executed as to Jones Retail Corporation on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 207 Return of Service Executed as to Jones Investment Company, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 206 Return of Service Executed as to Jill Acquisition LLC on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 205 Return of Service Executed as to HSN LP on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 204 Return of Service Executed as to HSN Interactive LLC on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 203 Return of Service Executed as to Herman Miller, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 202 Return of Service Executed as to Hayneedle, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 201 Return of Service Executed as to Hasbro, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 200 Return of Service Executed as to Harley-Davidson, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 199 Return of Service Executed as to H-D Michigan, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 198 Return of Service Executed as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 197 Return of Service Executed as to Gillette Company The on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 196 Return of Service Executed as to General Motors LLC on 10/1/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/22/2010. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 195 Return of Service Executed as to Eastman Kodak Company on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 194 Return of Service Executed as to Dillard's, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 193 Return of Service Executed as to Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 192 Return of Service Executed as to Chico's Retail Services, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/22/2010. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 191 Return of Service Executed as to Brunswick Corporation on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 190 Return of Service Executed as to Brunswick Billiards, Inc. on 10/7/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 189 Return of Service Executed as to Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 188 Return of Service Executed as to Briggs & Stratton Corporation on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 187 Return of Service Executed as to Bloomingdale's Inc on 10/4/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 186 Return of Service Executed as to BestBuy.com, LLC on 9/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 185 Return of Service Executed as to bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 184 Return of Service Executed as to BBY Solutions, Inc. on 9/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 183 Return of Service Executed as to Andersen Corporation on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 182 Return of Service Executed as to Andersen Windows, Inc. on 10/4/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 181 Return of Service Executed as to Asics America Corporation on 10/6/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 180 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 179 Return of Service Executed as to American Suzuki Motor Corporation on 10/7/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 178 Return of Service Executed as to American Girl LLC on 10/1/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 177 Return of Service Executed as to Aeropostale, Inc. on 9/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 176 Return of Service Executed as to Adidas Interactive, Inc. on 9/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 175 Return of Service Executed as to Adidas America, Inc. on 9/30/2010, by cert mail. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 174 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Fokas (Fokas, Terry)
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #166 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Brunswick Billiards, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #165 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Brunswick Corporation to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 173 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur Gollwitzer, III for AT&T, Inc.. (mll, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 172 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward H Rice for General Motors LLC. (mll, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 171 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marina N Saito for General Motors LLC. (mll, )
October 28, 2010 Filing 170 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #132 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to the Counterclaims of Herman Miller, Inc. by Parallel Networks, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
October 26, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Victoria's Secret (Bunt, Robert)
October 26, 2010 Filing 168 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #169 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Parallel Networks, LLC (Bunt, Robert) Modified on 10/26/2010 (mll, ).
October 25, 2010 Filing 167 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation (White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 166 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brunswick Billiards, Inc. to November 24, 2010.( White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 165 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brunswick Corporation to November 24, 2010.( White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C White on behalf of Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation (White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation (Fischman, Gary)
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #160 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for H-D Michigan, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #159 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Harley-Davidson, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #149 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #147 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC to 11/24/2010. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #146 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Briggs & Stratton Corporation to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #141 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BBY Solutions, Inc. to 11/22/2010; BestBuy.com, LLC to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #140 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Eastman Kodak Company to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #139 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kodak Imaging Network, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #138 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Victoria's Secret to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #136 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Suzuki Motor Corporation to 11/29/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #135 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mattel, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #134 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Girl LLC to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 162 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joel M Kuehnert for Russell Brands, LLC. (mll, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 161 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nathan Warren Johnson for Russell Brands, LLC. (mll, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 160 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re H-D Michigan, Inc. to November 24, 2010.( White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 159 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harley-Davidson, Inc. to November 24, 2010.( White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 158 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc. (White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 157 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C White on behalf of H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc. (White, Jason)
October 25, 2010 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of H-D Michigan, Inc., Harley-Davidson, Inc. (Fischman, Gary)
October 25, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam V Floyd on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Floyd, Adam)
October 25, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Phillip Ennis on behalf of AT&T, Inc. (Ennis, Chad)
October 22, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Bachtell on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Bachtell, Brett)
October 22, 2010 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Bisbikis on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Bisbikis, John)
October 22, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth J Jurek on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Jurek, Kenneth)
October 22, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
October 22, 2010 Filing 149 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kohl's Department Stores, Inc..( Heartfield, J)
October 22, 2010 Filing 148 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joo Mee Kim for LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (mll, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 147 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC to November 24, 2010.( Wolf, Matthew)
October 22, 2010 Filing 146 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Briggs & Stratton Corporation to November 24, 2010.( Wolf, Matthew)
October 22, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE of Disclosure by Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendants Briggs & Stratton Corporation and Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC (Wolf, Matthew)
October 22, 2010 Filing 144 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew M Wolf on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC (Wolf, Matthew)
October 22, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC (Fischman, Gary)
October 22, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Eastman Kodak Company, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
October 22, 2010 Filing 141 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or otherwise respond re BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC.( Faulkner, Rickey)
October 22, 2010 Filing 140 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Eastman Kodak Company.( Beck, David)
October 22, 2010 Filing 139 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kodak Imaging Network, Inc..( Beck, David)
October 22, 2010 Filing 138 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Victoria's Secret.( Ainsworth, Charles)
October 21, 2010 Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of American Suzuki Motor Corporation (Gardner, Allen)
October 21, 2010 Filing 136 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Suzuki Motor Corporation.( Jones, Michael)
October 21, 2010 Filing 135 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mattel, Inc. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2010 Filing 134 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Girl LLC. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2010 Filing 133 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Herman Miller, Inc. (Hanasz, Joseph)
October 21, 2010 Filing 132 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Parallel Networks, LLC by Herman Miller, Inc..(Hanasz, Joseph)
October 21, 2010 Filing 131 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph R Lanser for HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP. (mll, )
October 21, 2010 Filing 130 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Levinson for HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP. (mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #128 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Procter & Gamble Company to 11/24/2010. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #127 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gillette Company The to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #124 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wolverine World Wide, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #122 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hayneedle, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #117 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Aeropostale, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #116 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adidas Interactive, Inc. to 11/19/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #115 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adidas America, Inc. to 11/19/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #114 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #111 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #107 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Russell Brands, LLC to 11/21/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 19, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company (Fischman, Gary)
October 19, 2010 Filing 128 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Procter & Gamble Company.( Rooklidge, William)
October 19, 2010 Filing 127 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gillette Company The.( Rooklidge, William)
October 19, 2010 Filing 126 NOTICE of Disclosure by Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendants The Procter & Gamble Company and The Gillette Company (Rooklidge, William)
October 19, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Rooklidge on behalf of Gillette Company The, Procter & Gamble Company (Rooklidge, William)
October 19, 2010 Filing 124 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wolverine World Wide, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HSN defts' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 11-22-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/10. cc:attys 10-19-10 (mll, )
October 19, 2010 Filing 122 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hayneedle, Inc..(Love, Gregory)
October 19, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Hayneedle, Inc. (Love, Gregory)
October 19, 2010 Filing 117 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aeropostale, Inc..( Vincent, Bobby)
October 19, 2010 Filing 116 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas Interactive, Inc..( Vincent, Bobby)
October 19, 2010 Filing 115 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas America, Inc..( Vincent, Bobby)
October 19, 2010 Filing 114 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc..( Stevens, Scott)
October 19, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
October 19, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bobby Lance Vincent on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc. (Vincent, Bobby)
October 18, 2010 Filing 120 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura Beth Miller for Herman Miller, Inc.. (mll, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 119 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph S Hanasz for Herman Miller, Inc.. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2010: #1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
October 18, 2010 Filing 111 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC.( Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2010 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond by HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension)(Blair, Misty)
October 18, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of General Motors LLC (Gardner, Allen)
October 18, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC (Gardner, Allen)
October 15, 2010 Filing 118 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Lieberman for LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #105 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #104 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nautica Apparel, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #103 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nautica Retail USA, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #101 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Navistar, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 107 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Russell Brands, LLC.( Gillam, Harry)
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #98 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jill Acquisition LLC to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #97 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hasbro, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #96 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics USA, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #92 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Subaru of America, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #91 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jones Retail Corporation to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #90 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jones Investment Company, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #89 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nissan North America, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #88 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T, Inc. to 11/18/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #83 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC to 11/24/2010; Motorola, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #82 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Macy's West Stores, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #81 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Macys.com, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #80 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bloomingdale's Inc to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #79 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asics America Corporation to 11/29/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #102 Notice of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft J Jill Group Inc is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/10. cc:attys 10-15-10(mll, )
October 14, 2010 Filing 105 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 14, 2010 Filing 104 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nautica Apparel, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 14, 2010 Filing 103 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nautica Retail USA, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 13, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Complaint Against Defendant J. Jill Group, Inc. Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
October 13, 2010 Filing 101 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Navistar, Inc..( Steadman, Paul)
October 13, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Richard Steadman on behalf of Navistar, Inc. (Steadman, Paul)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #86 Notice of Dismissal filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. Deft Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America Inc is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/10. cc:attys 10-13-10(mll, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 98 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jill Acquisition LLC.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 13, 2010 Filing 97 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hasbro, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 13, 2010 Filing 96 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics USA, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 13, 2010 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacy O Stitham for Hasbro, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC. (mll, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Swetnam-Burland for Hasbro, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC. (mll, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 93 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J Brann for Hasbro, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC. (mll, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 92 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Subaru of America, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 13, 2010 Filing 91 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jones Retail Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 13, 2010 Filing 90 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jones Investment Company, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 13, 2010 Filing 89 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nissan North America, Inc..( Patterson, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2010 Filing 88 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T, Inc..( Gaffney, Brian)
October 12, 2010 Filing 87 Letter from CT Corporation notifying that The Corporation Trust Company is not the registered agent for an entity by the name of The J Jill Group Inc. (mll, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE by Parallel Networks, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Complaint Against Defendant Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America, Inc. Without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
October 12, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft General Motors LLC has to 11-08-2010 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 83 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
October 12, 2010 Filing 82 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Macy's West Stores, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 12, 2010 Filing 81 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Macys.com, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 12, 2010 Filing 80 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bloomingdale's Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 12, 2010 Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asics America Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #77 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Andersen Windows, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #76 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Andersen Corporation to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #75 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ralph Lauren Media, LLC to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #74 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #73 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dillard's, Inc. to 11/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 7, 2010 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 7, 2010 Filing 77 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Andersen Windows, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 7, 2010 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Andersen Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 6, 2010 Filing 75 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ralph Lauren Media, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 6, 2010 Filing 74 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 6, 2010 Filing 73 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dillard's, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #69 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PRL USA Holdings, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #68 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #67 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Joseph Cox on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Cox, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ray Sorden on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Sorden, Gary)
October 6, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Patterson on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2010 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PRL USA Holdings, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 5, 2010 Filing 68 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
October 4, 2010 Filing 67 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.( McNabnay, Neil)
September 29, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Fokas on behalf of Parallel Networks, LLC (Fokas, Terry)
September 28, 2010 Filing 66 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 65 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Wolverine World Wide, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 64 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Victoria's Secret. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 63 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Procter & Gamble Company. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 62 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to J. Jill Group, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 61 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 60 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Subaru of America, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 59 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Russell Brands, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 58 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Ralph Lauren Media, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 57 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to PRL USA Holdings, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 56 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 55 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 54 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Navistar, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 53 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nautica Retail USA, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 52 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nautica Apparel, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 51 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 50 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 48 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 47 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mattel, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 45 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Macys.com, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Macy's West Stores, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 43 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics USA, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Jones Retail Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Jones Investment Company, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Jill Acquisition LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Herman Miller, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hayneedle, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HSN LP. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HSN Interactive LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to H-D Michigan, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Gillette Company The. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hasbro, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Harley-Davidson, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to General Motors LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Eastman Kodak Company. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Dillard's, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Chico's Retail Services, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Brunswick Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Brunswick Billiards, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Briggs & Stratton Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bloomingdale's Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to BestBuy.com, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to BBY Solutions, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Andersen Windows, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Andersen Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Asics America Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to American Suzuki Motor Corporation. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to American Girl LLC. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Aeropostale, Inc.. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adidas Interactive, Inc. (kls, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adidas America, Inc.. (kls, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George S Bosy for Parallel Networks, LLC. (mll, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David R Bennett for Parallel Networks, LLC. (mll, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
September 23, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
September 23, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Parallel Networks, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
September 23, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
September 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against AT&T, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc., American Girl LLC, American Suzuki Motor Corporation, Andersen Corporation, Andersen Windows, Asics America Corporation, BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC, Bloomingdale's Inc, Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC, Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation, Caterpillar Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, General Motors LLC, Gillette Company The, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, H-D Michigan, Inc., HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP, Harley-Davidson, Inc., Hasbro, Inc., Hayneedle, Inc., Herman Miller, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC, Jones Investment Company, Inc., Jones Retail Corporation, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc., Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc., Navistar, Inc., New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Ralph Lauren Media, LLC, Russell Brands, LLC, Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC, bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2684260.), filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,446,111, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2010: #3 Exhibit A - Searchable Patent) (mjc, ).
September 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against AT&T, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Adidas Interactive, Inc., Aeropostale, Inc., American Girl LLC, American Suzuki Motor Corporation, Andersen Corporation, Andersen Windows, Asics America Corporation, BBY Solutions, Inc., BestBuy.com, LLC, Bloomingdale's Inc, Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC, Brunswick Billiards, Inc., Brunswick Corporation, Caterpillar Inc, Chico's Retail Services, Inc., Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc., Dillard's, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, General Motors LLC, Gillette Company The, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, H-D Michigan, Inc., HSN Interactive LLC, HSN LP, Harley-Davidson, Inc., Hasbro, Inc., Hayneedle, Inc., Herman Miller, Inc., J. Jill Group, Inc., Jill Acquisition LLC, Jones Investment Company, Inc., Jones Retail Corporation, Kodak Imaging Network, Inc., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., Limited Brands, Inc., Macy's West Stores, Inc., Macys.com, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola, Inc., Nautica Apparel, Inc., Nautica Retail USA, Inc., Navistar, Inc., New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., PRL USA Holdings, Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, Ralph Lauren Media, LLC, Russell Brands, LLC, Subaru of America, Inc., Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC, Wolverine World Wide, Inc., Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC, bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2684260.), filed by Parallel Networks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,446,111, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2010: # 3 Exhibit A - Searchable Patent) (mjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parallel Networks, LLC v. Adidas America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Michael J Zinna
Represented By: Michael G Gabriel
Represented By: Robert Gerald Graham
Represented By: Patrick R. Colsher
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: John F Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bergdorfgoodman.com, LLC
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Daniel A Crowe
Represented By: Wilhemina Joni Tyler
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillette Company The
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: William C Rooklidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andersen Windows, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Retail Corporation
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: William C Rooklidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Investment Company, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Jason C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America, Inc.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motor Sales of America, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell S Feller
Represented By: Jonathan M Sobel
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women's Apparel Group, LLC d/b/a Boston Apparel Group, LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Girl LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BestBuy.com, LLC
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Represented By: Nicole E Kopinski
Represented By: Emmett J McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Power Products Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Wolf
Represented By: Shane A Nelson
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautica Apparel, Inc.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBY Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Represented By: Nicole E Kopinski
Represented By: Emmett J McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Vincent Floyd
Represented By: Chad Phillip Ennis
Represented By: Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Represented By: Brian James Gaffney
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jill Group, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limited Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asics America Corporation
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chico's Retail Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomingdale's Inc
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andersen Corporation
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeropostale, Inc.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John George Bisbikis
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Kenneth J Jurek
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Brett E Bachtell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine World Wide, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Suzuki Motor Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J Moore
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Billiards, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Jason C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Jonathan W Woodard
Represented By: Michael J Summersgill
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Jordan L Hirsch
Represented By: David J Beck
Represented By: Robert D Cultice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Corporation
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Jason C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell S Feller
Represented By: Jonathan M Sobel
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN Interactive LLC
Represented By: Brian L Michaelis
Represented By: Joseph R Lanser
Represented By: Jason Dwain Mazingo
Represented By: Misty C Blair
Represented By: Michael R Levinson
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizen Watch Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Lauren Media, LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayneedle, Inc.
Represented By: John P Passarelli
Represented By: James M Sulentic
Represented By: Darrell Glyn Dotson
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Represented By: Matthew M Wolf
Represented By: Shane A Nelson
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautica Retail USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-D Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Jason Fischman
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Jason C White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's West Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Cox
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Patterson
Represented By: Gary R Sorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Acquisition LLC
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodak Imaging Network, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W Woodard
Represented By: Michael J Summersgill
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Jordan L Hirsch
Represented By: David J Beck
Represented By: Robert D Cultice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macys.com, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Richard Steadman
Represented By: Simeon G Papacostas
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Craig D Leavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN LP
Represented By: Brian L Michaelis
Represented By: Joseph R Lanser
Represented By: Jason Dwain Mazingo
Represented By: Misty C Blair
Represented By: Michael R Levinson
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Miller, Inc.
Represented By: James L Katz
Represented By: Laura Beth Miller
Represented By: Joseph S Hanasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Michael J Zinna
Represented By: Michael G Gabriel
Represented By: Robert Gerald Graham
Represented By: Patrick R. Colsher
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: John F Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Brands, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Warren Johnson
Represented By: Joel M Kuehnert
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joo Mee Kim
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Brian A. Tollefson
Represented By: Steven Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Balance Athletic Shoe, Inc.
Represented By: John George Bisbikis
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Represented By: Darrell Glyn Dotson
Represented By: Kenneth J Jurek
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Brett E Bachtell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRL USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Shannon Ashley Lang
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunglass Hut Trading, LLC
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jonathan Kyle Komenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parallel Networks, LLC
Represented By: Terry Fokas
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Represented By: David R Bennett
Represented By: George S Bosy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?