WI-LAN Inc. v. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. et al Featured Case

Canadian technology company WI-LAN files patent infringement lawsuit over 4 patents ('326 Patent for 'Processing Data Transmitted and Received Over a Wireless Link Connecting a Central Terminal and a Subscriber Terminal of a Wireless Telecommunications System'; '327 Patent for 'Controlling Interference in a Cell of a Wireless Telecommunications System'; '817 Patent for Processing Data Transmitted and Received Over a Wireless Link Connection a Central Terminal and a Subscriber Terminal of a Wireless Telecommunications System'; and the '211 Patent for 'Processing Data Transmitted and Received Over a Wireless Link Connecting a Central Terminal and a Subscriber Terminal of a Wireless Telecommunications System' against mobile and cell phone makers Ericsson, Exedea, HTC, LG, Mobilecomm, and Sony Ericsson.

Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Exedea INC., LG Electronics, Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2010cv00521
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2014 Filing 541 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of this Court, entered April 1, 2014, as to 533 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by WI-LAN Inc., 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Sony Mobile Communications AB. (dlc, )
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER of USCA dismissing the appeal as to 533 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by WI-LAN Inc., 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Sony Mobile Communications AB. Issued as Mandate: April 1, 2014. (dlc, )
March 3, 2014 Filing 539 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-Federal Circuit re 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Sony Mobile Communications AB. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case Number 14-1322, (dlc, )
March 3, 2014 Filing 538 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-Federal Circuit re 533 Notice of Appeal-FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 534 Amended Notice of Appeal-FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by WI-LAN Inc. USCA Case Number 14-1320 (dlc, )
February 28, 2014 Filing 537 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 529 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
February 28, 2014 Transmission of 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, 529 Order and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 536 Notice of Cross Appeal, (dlc, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 536 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 529 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-4544127. (Wynne, Richard)
February 27, 2014 Filing 535 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-Federal Circuit of 529 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 471 Amended Final Judgment, 533 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 534 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, and certified copy of docket sheet. (dlc, )
February 27, 2014 Transmission of 533 Notice of Appeal, 534 Amd Notice of Appeal, 471 Amd Final Judgment, 529 Order and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 533 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 534 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (dlc, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 534 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 533 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
February 27, 2014 Filing 533 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 529 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by WI-LAN Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-4543199. (Weaver, David)
February 11, 2014 **Please disregard docket entry 532 Bill of Costs as filed in error. Defendant Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc was dismissed per 500 Order granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal.** (mll, )
February 11, 2014 Filing 532 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** BILL OF COSTS by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $336,526.24. (mll, ) Modified on 2/11/2014 (mll, ).
February 11, 2014 Filing 531 BILL OF COSTS by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Costs Taxed in the amount of $183,207.98. (mll, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDERED THAT any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/7/2014. (gsg)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER denying 475 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 481 Motion for New Trial; denying 482 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/28/14. (mll, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 528 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2013 re 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants; 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211 filed by Plaintiff; 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY filed by Plaintiff (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
November 13, 2013 Sealed Exhibits placed in Clerk's vault: Plaintiff's and Defendant's Sealed Exhibits admitted at trial. Plaintiff's and Defendant's Exhibits submitted at trial stored in Clerk's Office Exhibit Locker. Associated Cases: 6:10-cv-00521-LED, 6:13-cv-00521-LED(cwk)
October 29, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis is RESET to 11/21/2013 at 1:30 PM. (cwk)
October 23, 2013 Per request of Plaintiff's counsel, Plaintiff's Offer of Proof Exhibits 1-5 returned to Sonja Guenter via Federal Express at Plaintiff's expense (#7969-8384-1260). Plaintiff will submit these exhibits to the court in electronic format. (cwk)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting 526 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have until 10-25-2013, to submit the sealed and unsealed trial exhibits in accordance with the Court's Order (Docket No. 522 ). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/21/13. (mll, )
October 18, 2013 Filing 526 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trial Exhibits by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting 524 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the mediation between Wi-LAN and Ericsson is hereby extended until 11-22-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/13. (mll, )
October 16, 2013 Filing 524 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Complete Mediation by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
October 16, 2013 Filing 523 NOTICE by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB re 518 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, Notice of Compliance with Mediation Order (Wynne, Richard)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting 485 Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/13. (mll, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 521 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. re 500 Order,,,, 499 Stipulation of Dismissal [NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS] (Pai, Ajeet)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting 519 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., and Exedea, Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, )
October 1, 2013 Filing 519 STIPULATION of Dismissal [JOINT] by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER Setting Hearing on all post-trial Motions: 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 485 Joint MOTION to Seal [PARTIALLY OPPOSED] JOINT MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS, 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211, 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY : Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties are ordered to attend mediation by 11-01-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/13. (mll, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 517 Sealed Transcript from 7/9/13 Morning Session. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 516 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 7/15/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 515 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings Afternoon Session held on 7/12/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 514 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings Morning Session held on 7/12/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 513 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 7/11/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 512 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 7/11/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 511 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 7/10/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 510 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning held on 7/10/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 509 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 7/9/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 508 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 7/9/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 507 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 7/8/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 506 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings -Morning Session held on 7/8/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, Judy Werlinger, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2013. (sms, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 505 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Trial Tr. July 12 2013 AM)(Wynne, Richard)
September 23, 2013 Filing 504 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211 filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Trial Tr. July 12 2013 AM, # 2 Exhibit B -- Trial Tr. July 15 2013)(Wynne, Richard)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting 501 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 485 Joint MOTION to Seal [PARTIALLY OPPOSED] JOINT MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS; Replies due by 10/4/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/23/13. (mll, )
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER ENTERING PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court expressly FINDS that its summary judgment Order 410 has fully disposed of Ericsson's and Sony Mobile's counterclaims regarding the PCR Agreements. The Court expressly FINDS that there is no just reason for delaying entry of separate and immediately appealable final judgment as to those counterclaims pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Having considered the papers and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Movants' 490 Unopposed Joint Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/13. (mll, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 501 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits (Dkt. No. 485) by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting 499 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WI-LAN Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. All claims at issue between Plaintiff and Defendant Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc in this action, including all claims presented by Wi-LAN and all of Alcatel-Lucent's counterclaims, are dismissed with prejudice. Wi-LAN and Alcatel-Lucent each shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The following are ordered WITHDRAWN: Alcatel Lucent's joinder to Defendants' Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. No. 475 ); Alcatel-Lucent's Agreed Bill of Costs (Dkt. No. 478 ); Alcatel-Lucent's joinder to Defendants' oppositions (Dkt. Nos. 491 , 492 ) to Wi-LAN's Motion for a New Trial (Dkt. No. 481 ) and Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Invalidity (Dkt. No. 482 ); Alcatel-Lucent's joinder to Alcatel-Lucent and HTC's opposition (Dkt.No. 495 ) to Wi-LAN, Ericsson, and Sony Mobile's Partially Opposed Joint Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/13. (mll, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 499 STIPULATION of Dismissal [JOINT] with Prejudice by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
September 12, 2013 Filing 498 REPLY to Response to Motion re 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, David)
September 12, 2013 Filing 497 REPLY to Response to Motion re 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211 filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Weaver, David)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting 493 Sealed Patent Motion for Disclosure of Certain Materials Under the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/10/13. (mjc, )
September 9, 2013 Filing 495 RESPONSE in Opposition re 485 Joint MOTION to Seal [PARTIALLY OPPOSED] JOINT MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Akshay S. Deoras, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Deoras, Akshay)
September 9, 2013 Filing 494 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, David)
September 9, 2013 Filing 493 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION of Alcatel and HTC for Disclosure of Certain Materials Under the Protective Order in Wi-Lan Inc. v. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Case No. 6:10cv521 by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 30, 2013 Filing 492 RESPONSE to Motion re 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211 filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Markman Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B: Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C: Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit D: Trial Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E: Trial Transcript, # 6 Exhibit F: PX 1, # 7 Exhibit G: PX 2, # 8 Exhibit H: PX 3, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Heinlen, James)
August 30, 2013 Filing 491 RESPONSE to Motion re 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Trial Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B: Trial Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C: Trial Transcript, # 4 Exhibit D: Trial Transcript, # 5 Exhibit E: Trial Transcript, # 6 Exhibit F: Trial Transcript, # 7 Exhibit G: Trial Transcript, # 8 Exhibit H: DDX 13-19, # 9 Exhibit I: DDX 13-31, # 10 Exhibit J: DX 124, # 11 Exhibit K: DX 148, # 12 Exhibit L: PX 1, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Heinlen, James)
August 29, 2013 Filing 490 Joint MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC., THE ERICSSON DEFENDANTS, AND THE SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 54(b) by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting 487 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) Modified on 8/28/2013 (mll, ).
August 27, 2013 Filing 488 REPLY to Response to Motion re 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 487 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- R. Rader et al., "Make Patent Trolls Pay in Court")(Wynne, Richard)
August 27, 2013 Filing 487 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 26, 2013 Filing 486 REPLY to Response to Motion re 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- R. Rader, et al., Make Patent Trolls Pay in Court)(Wynne, Richard)
August 21, 2013 Filing 485 Joint MOTION to Seal [PARTIALLY OPPOSED] JOINT MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
August 16, 2013 Filing 484 RESPONSE in Opposition re 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - July 9 PM Tr, # 2 Exhibit B - 2013-03-21 Pre-Trial Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - July 10 AM Tr, # 4 Exhibit D - Lanning report excerpt, # 5 Exhibit E - Email from Justin Cohen to Ajeet Pai (June 23, 2013), # 6 Exhibit F - July 12 AM Tr, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
August 14, 2013 Filing 483 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 479 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Sony Mobile Communications AB. USCA Case Number 13-1566 (Attachments: # 1 Official Caption)(dlc, )
August 13, 2013 Filing 482 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [RENEWED] OF NO INVALIDITY OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ON INVALIDITY by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Tiedemann, # 2 Exhibit B - Gitlin, # 3 Exhibit C - Gilhousen, # 4 Exhibit D - IS-95-A, # 5 Exhibit E - Trial Transcript (July 12, 2013 Morning Session), # 6 Exhibit F - Trial Transcript (July 8, 2013 Afternoon Session), # 7 Exhibit G - Trial Transcript (July 9, 2013 Afternoon Session), # 8 Exhibit H - Trial Transcript (July 8, 2013 Morning Session), # 9 Exhibit I - Trial Transcript (July 12, 2013 Afternoon Session), # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
August 13, 2013 Filing 481 MOTION for New Trial CONCERNING THE NON-INFRINGEMENT OF CERTAIN CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326; 6,222,819; 6,195,327 AND 6,381,211 by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Trial Transcript (July 9, 2013 Morning Session), # 2 Exhibit B - Trial Transcript (July 11, 2013 Morning Session), # 3 Exhibit C - Trial Transcript (July 11, 2013 Afternoon Session), # 4 Exhibit D - Trial Transcript (July 10, 2013 Afternoon Session), # 5 Exhibit E - PX-1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,088,326, # 6 Exhibit F - PX-2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,195,327, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
August 13, 2013 Filing 480 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 8/13/13, by U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to 410 Order, 479 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
August 13, 2013 Transmission of 479 Notice of Appeal, 410 Order and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 479 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, (dlc, )
August 13, 2013 Filing 479 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 410 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,, by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-4264267. (Wynne, Richard)
August 6, 2013 Filing 478 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
August 6, 2013 Filing 477 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cost Worksheet)(Wynne, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2013: # 2 Corrected Bill of Costs) (gsg, ).
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting 474 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to file their motions for bills of costs is extended to 8-06-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/13. (mll, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
July 29, 2013 Filing 474 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting 472 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Patrick Kane terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/24/13. (mll, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 472 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ALCATEL-LUCENT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF RYAN P. KANE AS COUNSEL AND TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES FOR HIM by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 22, 2013 Filing 471 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/13. (mll, )
July 16, 2013 Filing 470 FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiff shall take nothing from Defendants and all pending motions are DENIED. Defendants' costs of court should be taxed against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/16/13. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 469 Defendants' Exhibits Admitted at Trial 07/08/2013-07/15/2013MAIN DOCUMENT: Defendants' Exhibit List 1. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Exhibit List 2, # 2 Defendants' Exhibit List 3, # 3 Defendants' Exhibit List 4, # 4 Defendants' Exhibit List 5 - Final)(cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 468 428 Plaintiff's Exhibits Admitted at Trial 07/08/2013-07/15/2013MAIN DOCUMENT: Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 2, # 2 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 3, # 3 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 4, # 4 Plaintiff's Exhibit List 5 - Final(cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 467 SEALED Jury Questions to Witnesses at Trial. ***MUST GET COURT APPROVAL FOR COPIES*** (cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 466 SEALED Jury Verdict in its entirety. (cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 465 JURY VERDICT. (cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 464 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 6 of Jury Trial completed on 7/15/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
July 15, 2013 Filing 463 RESPONSE to Motion re 459 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW THAT CLAIMS 2 AND 5 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,381,211, CLAIMS 2, 5, AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO.6,088,326, AND CLAIM 11 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,222,819 ARE NOT INFRI nged filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borgman, Steven)
July 15, 2013 Filing 462 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 458 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Damages filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Weaver, David)
July 14, 2013 Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re 456 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Invalidity DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO WI-LAN'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OF NO INVALIDITY filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 14, 2013 Filing 460 RESPONSE in Opposition re 455 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Defendants' Equitable and Other Defenses DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO WI-LAN'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW ON DEFENDANTS' EQUITABLE AND OTHER DEFENSES filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 12, 2013 Filing 459 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW THAT CLAIMS 2 AND 5 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,381,211, CLAIMS 2, 5, AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO.6,088,326, AND CLAIM 11 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,222,819 ARE NOT INFRINGED AND INVALID, AND CLAIMS 11 AND 12 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,195,327 ARE NOT INFRINGED by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 12, 2013 Filing 458 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Damages by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 12, 2013 Filing 457 RESPONSE to Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 12, 2013 Filing 456 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Invalidity by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 12, 2013 Filing 455 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Defendants' Equitable and Other Defenses by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 12, 2013 Filing 454 Proposed Jury Instructions by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
July 12, 2013 Filing 453 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
July 12, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 451 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED.*** (mjc, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 452 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 5 of Jury Trial held on 7/12/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
July 12, 2013 Filing 451 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce) Modified on 7/12/2013 (mjc, ).
July 11, 2013 Filing 450 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 4 of Jury Trial held on 7/11/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
July 11, 2013 Filing 449 RESPONSE to Motion re 445 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That Claims 2 and 5 of U.S. Patent No. 6,381,211, Claims 2, 5, and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 6,088,326, Claim 11 of U.S. Patent No. 6,222,819, and Claims 11 and 12 of U.S. Patent No. 6,195,327 Are Not Infringed filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 11, 2013 Filing 448 RESPONSE to Motion re 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law That Wi-LAN Is Not Entitled to Any Damages filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 11, 2013 Filing 447 Supplemental MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW THAT CLAIMS 2 AND 5 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,381,211, CLAIMS 2, 5, AND 9 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,088,326, CLAIM 11 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,222,819, AND CLAIMS 11 AND 12 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,195,327 ARE NOT INFRINGED by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 10, 2013 Filing 446 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 3 of Jury Trial held on 7/10/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
July 10, 2013 Filing 445 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 10, 2013 Filing 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER that the Court hereby waives the filing fee on the severed declaratory judgment action in Civil Action 6:13cv521. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/10/13. (mll, )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting in part 435 Sealed Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Report and Testimony of John C Jarosz. The Court strikes the portion of Mr. Jarosz's report that apportions the worlwide portfolio licenses by using Wi-Lan's U.S. vs. non-U.S. litigation expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/09/13. (mll, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 441 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 2 of Jury Trial held on 7/9/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (cwk)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting 433 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 413 SEALED MOTION for Clarification; Responses due by 7/19/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/09/13. (mll, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 439 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, ERICSSON, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
July 8, 2013 Filing 438 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 435 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, ERICSSON, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
July 8, 2013 Filing 437 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Day 1 of Jury Trial held on 7/8/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk). (Main Document 437 replaced on 7/12/2013) (cwk).
July 8, 2013 Filing 436 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 435 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, ERICSSON, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ.. (Attachments: # 1 Authorization to File Under Seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 7, 2013 Filing 435 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, ERICSSON, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Deoras, Akshay)
July 6, 2013 Filing 434 Amended Witness List by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
July 3, 2013 Filing 433 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 413 SEALED MOTION for Clarification by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
July 3, 2013 Filing 432 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Examination of the Jury Panel held on 7/1/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2013. (sms, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 431 Sealed Transcript - 6/25/13 (sms, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 430 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Proceedings on 6/25/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2013. (sms, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 429 Sealed Transcript - 5/9/13 (sms, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 428 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 5/9/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2013. (sms, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 427 Amended Witness List by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
July 3, 2013 Filing 426 Defendants Witness List by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
July 1, 2013 Filing 425 Sealed Document. Juror Questionnaires. (cwk)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting 422 Motion to Sever and Stay the Ericsson Defendants' License Defense, pending resolution of a currently pending arbitration proceeding in Canada relating to the license issue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/1/13. (mjc, )
July 1, 2013 Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 7/1/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk)
June 29, 2013 Filing 422 Joint MOTION to Sever and, Joint MOTION to Stay THE ERICSSON DEFENDANTS LICENSE DEFENSE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 337 Sealed Daubert Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of John C Jarosz Regarding Issues Related to Damages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting 415 Motion for Approval of Juror Questionnaire. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TIMES; denying as moot 347 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 418 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
June 24, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. regarding Motions in Limine pursuant to the Court's docket control order (Nos. 99 and 384, as amended) (Weaver, David)
June 24, 2013 Filing 416 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. regarding claims for trial (Hill, Jack)
June 21, 2013 Filing 415 Joint MOTION Approval of Proposed Agreed Juror Questionnaire by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Juror Questionnaire, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER that the parties to the above-styled cases attend mediation with the Honorable Robert Faulkner prior to trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/19/13. (mll, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 413 SEALED MOTION for Clarification by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
June 7, 2013 Filing 412 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF WI-LAN'S THIRD AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Objections to Wi-LAN's Third Amended Exhibit List)(Deoras, Akshay)
June 5, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James W Geriak on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4167548. (Geriak, James)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting 352 Sealed Motion to Strike Extrinsic Evidence; granting 171 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 172 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 181 Sealed Motion, Sony Mobile Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/4/13. (mjc, )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting 406 Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits for Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 408 Sealed Document. Wi-LAN's Notice of Pre-Trial Disclosure (Attachments: #1) Exhibit A - Wi-LAN's 3rd Amended Trial Exhibit List, #(2) Exhibit B - Wi-LAN's Objections to Defendants' 2nd Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Weaver, David)
May 31, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 7/1/2013 at 9:00 AM HAS BEEN CONTINUED AND TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 7/8/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (JURY SELECTION REMAINS SET ON 7/1/2013 AT 9:00 A.M.)(rlf)
May 24, 2013 Filing 407 Sealed Document (Defendants' Notice of Pretrial Disclosure). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Second Amended Exhibit List)(Deoras, Akshay)
May 24, 2013 Filing 406 MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits for Trial by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER denying 399 Sealed Motion to Redact the Transcript of the Pretrial Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/13. (mll, )
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting 385 Sealed Motion to Enforce the Clawback Provision Against Defendants; denying 388 Sealed Motion to Enforce Compliance. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/13. (mll, )
May 9, 2013 Filing 403 STIPULATION re 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment Wi-LAN Stipulation Regarding Prior WI-LAN PATENTS under Patent and Conflict Resolution Agreements by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
May 9, 2013 Filing 402 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2013 re 385 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC.S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLAWBACK PROVISION AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND TO STRIKE CLAWED BACK PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT FROM COURTS FILE, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by WI-LAN Inc., 388 SEALED MOTION to Enforce March 14, 2013 Order filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Exedea INC., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Sony Mobile Communications AB, 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by WI-LAN Inc., 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk)
May 6, 2013 Filing 401 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 385 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC.'S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLAWBACK PROVISION AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND TO STRIKE CLAWED BACK PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT FROM COURTS FILE, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
May 6, 2013 Filing 400 Sealed Document.WI-LAN INC.S SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO BOTH DEFENDANTS REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF [DKT 388] THEIR MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDER OF MARCH 14, 2013 (Weaver, David)
May 2, 2013 Filing 399 Unopposed SEALED MOTION FOR REDACTION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE PRETRIAL HEARING HELD ON MARCH 21, 2013 by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit March 21, 2013 Pretrial Hearing transcript, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
May 1, 2013 Filing 398 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION to Enforce March 14, 2013 Order filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
April 30, 2013 Filing 397 Second Revised Witness List by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
April 29, 2013 Filing 396 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 385 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC.S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLAWBACK PROVISION AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND TO STRIKE CLAWED BACK PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT FROM COURTS FILE, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Email from M. McCartney, # 2 Exhibit B -- Wi-LAN Clawback Letter, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
April 26, 2013 Filing 395 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 388 SEALED MOTION to Enforce March 14, 2013 Order filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A - Declaration of Seth Lindner, # 2 Affidavit B - Declaration of Ajeet Pai, # 3 Exhibit C - ISO Pai Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - ISO Pai Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E - ISO Pai Declaration, # 6 Exhibit F - ISO Pai Declaration, # 7 Exhibit G - ISO Pai Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H - ISO Pai Declaration, # 9 Exhibit I - ISO Pai Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J - ISO Pai Declaration, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 26, 2013 Filing 394 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Wynne, Richard)
April 26, 2013 Filing 393 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
April 26, 2013 Filing 392 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
April 19, 2013 Filing 391 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 387 Transcript,,, AND WI-LAN'S INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION (Weaver, David)
April 18, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 385 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC.S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLAWBACK PROVISION AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND TO STRIKE CLAWED BACK PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT FROM COURTS FILE, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, 388 SEALED MOTION to Enforce March 14, 2013 Order, 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence, 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for 5/9/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting 389 Motion to Expedite. Defendants' Motion to Enforce Compliance with the Court's Order of March 14, 2013 388 and Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Clawback Provision Against Defendants, and to Strike Clawed Back Privileged Document from Court's File 385 are set for hearing on 5-09-2013 at 1:30 P.M. The Motion Hearing on Wi-Lan, Ericsson, and Sony Mobiles Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt Nos. 171, 172, 181, 276, and 352) is reset to 5-09-2013 at 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/13. (mll, )
April 17, 2013 Filing 389 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Enforce Compliance with the Court's Order of March 14, 2013 [Dkt. 388] by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William)
April 16, 2013 Filing 388 SEALED MOTION to Enforce March 14, 2013 Order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Apr 10 2013 Letter from A. Pai to Defendants, # 2 Exhibit B -- Trans. of Mar 21 2013 Pre-Trial Conference, # 3 Exhibit C -- WIL-0417486, # 4 Exhibit D -- Wi-LAN Apr 10 2013 Privilege Log, # 5 Exhibit E -- Mar 26 2013 Ltr from A. Pai to Defendants, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
April 12, 2013 Filing 387 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Hearing Proceedings held on 3/21/13 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (sms, )
April 12, 2013 Filing 386 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 2/26/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013. (sms, )
April 10, 2013 Filing 385 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF WI-LAN INC.S MOTION TO ENFORCE CLAWBACK PROVISION AGAINST DEFENDANTS, AND TO STRIKE CLAWED BACK PRIVILEGED DOCUMENT FROM COURTS FILE, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ajeet Pai, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ISO Decl. of Ajeet Pai, # 3 Exhibit 2 - ISO Decl. of Ajeet Pai, # 4 Exhibit 3 - ISO Decl. of Ajeet Pai, # 5 Exhibit 4 - ISO Decl. of Ajeet Pai, # 6 Exhibit 5 - ISO of Motion to Enforce, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Setting Hearing on Motion 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence, 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 7/1/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/13. (mll, )
April 5, 2013 Filing 383 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. Pursuant to 373 Court's Order dated 03/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
March 26, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 276 Supplement to Ericsson & Sony Mobile Dft's Sumamry Jgm Briefing, 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence, 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 AT 9:30 AM HAS BEEN CONTINUED AND MOTION HEARING IS RESET TO 5/3/2013 AT 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER resetting jury selection and trial to 7-01-2013, and resetting pretrial conference to 6-25-2013; Setting Hearing on Motion 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment, 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 353 Joint MOTION in Limine, 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and report to the Court by 4-05-2013 whether additional discovery, or supplementation to the previously filed motions, is necessary in light of the documents recently produced. The parties are also ORDERED to meet and confer and submit a new Docket Control Order incorporating the aforementioned dates. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, )
March 21, 2013 Filing 381 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
March 20, 2013 Filing 380 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 362 Order,,, Notice of Submission of Privileged Documents for In Camera Inspection (Hill, Jack)
March 20, 2013 Filing 379 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. Regarding Motions In Limine (Hill, Jack)
March 20, 2013 Filing 378 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wynne, Richard)
March 20, 2013 Filing 377 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order(Weaver, David)
March 19, 2013 Filing 376 Sealed Document - Wi-LAN's Notice of PreTrial Disclosure (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wi-LAN Second Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Weaver, David)
March 19, 2013 Filing 375 ***DEFICIENT FILING. SEE ENTRY 377 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order(Weaver, David) Modified on 3/20/2013 (gsg).
March 19, 2013 Filing 374 Sealed Document - Notice of Corrected Exhibit to Dkt No. 360 (Ex. F - Wells Declaration attaching Ex. 1, previously omitted) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F - Corrected Wells Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Wells CV)(Weaver, David)
March 19, 2013 Filing 373 Sealed Document. NOTICE OF CORRECTED AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Amended Privilege Log)(Hill, Jack)
March 18, 2013 Filing 372 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Trial Time Estimates (Findlay, Eric)
March 18, 2013 Filing 371 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson OF TRIAL TIME ESTIMATES (Deoras, Akshay)
March 18, 2013 Consolidated Defendants Added: HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc (Civil Action 6:13cv252). (mll, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. of Trial Time Estimates (Hill, Jack)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL PLAN. Defendants HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc are CONSOLIDATED with the remaining defendants for trial. These cases will proceed to the jury as a single trial on all issues and as to all parties. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/13. cc:attys 3-18-13(mll, )
March 18, 2013 Defendants HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc are SEVERED from this cause and assigned to Civil Action 6:13cv252. (mll, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting 306 Motion to Sever. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to sever Defendants HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc., and Exedea Inc. from theremaining Defendants in this case. Wi-LAN is ORDERED to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/13. cc:attys 3-18-13 (mll, )
March 18, 2013 Filing 367 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Dominguez, Adrienne)
March 18, 2013 Filing 366 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nam H Kim on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4049036. (Kim, Nam)
March 18, 2013 Filing 365 Sealed Document. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS AND AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Privilege Log)(Hill, Jack)
March 15, 2013 Filing 364 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 354 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order (Weaver, David)
March 15, 2013 Filing 363 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 355 SEALED MOTION Wi-LAN's Motions in Limine filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Akshay S. Deoras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER re 330 Sealed Request for In Camera Review of Non-Privileged Documents on Wi-Lan's Privilege Log. Wi-Lan is ORDERED to conduct a full and thorough review of the documents withheld, in light of the current order. Wi-Lan is then ORDERED to produce the documents it deems not privileged by 3-18-2013 at noon. Wi-Lan is also ORDERED to submit, by 3-18-2013 at noon, an amended privilege log to Defendant HTC and to the Court. Thereafter, HTC may make a second selection of 25 documents on Plaintiff's privilege log for in camera review by 3-19-2013 at noon. Wi-Lan is then ORDERED to submit the documents selected by HTC for in camera review by 3-20-2013 at 10:00 A.M., with a copy of the specific assertions of privilege. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/13. cc:attys 3-15-13(mll, )
March 14, 2013 Filing 361 SEALED RESPONSE/SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE ERICSSON AND SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMARY-JUDGMENT BRIEFING by WI-LAN Inc. to 276 SEALED MOTION-SUPPLEMENT TO THE ERICSSON AND SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS SUMMARY-JUDGMENT BRIEFING Sealed Document filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
March 14, 2013 Filing 360 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 347 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT'S AND HTC'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 3, AND 4 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326 AND 6,381,211 filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Lanning Depo Excerpts, #(2) Exhibit B - Wells Depo Excerpts, #(3) Exhibit C - Akl Depo Excerpts, #(4) Exhibit D - Olivier Depo Excerpts, #(5) Exhibit E - Wicker Depo Excerpts, #(6) Exhibit F - Declaration of Wells, #(7) Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
March 13, 2013 Filing 359 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 337 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ REGARDING ISSUES RELATED TO DAMAGES filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
March 11, 2013 Filing 358 Sealed Document - Wi-LAN's NOTICE OF PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Wi-LAN's First Amended Trial Exhibit List, # 2Exhibit B - Wi-LAN's Objections to Defendants First Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Pai, Ajeet)
March 11, 2013 Filing 357 Exhibit List DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF WI-LAN'S FIRST AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Objections to Wi-LAN's First Amended Trial Exhibit Lis)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 11, 2013 Filing 356 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 337 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ REGARDING ISSUES RELATED TO DAMAGES filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Akshay S. Deoras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 11, 2013 Filing 355 SEALED MOTION Wi-LAN's Motions in Limine by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
March 11, 2013 Filing 354 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Akshay S. Deoras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 11, 2013 Filing 353 Joint MOTION in Limine by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
March 11, 2013 Filing 352 SEALED MOTION to Strike Extrinsic Evidence by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
March 11, 2013 Filing 351 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
March 11, 2013 Filing 350 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob K Baron on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Baron, Jacob)
March 11, 2013 Filing 349 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. Regarding Mock Jury Study (Hill, Jack)
March 9, 2013 Filing 348 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 337 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ REGARDING ISSUES RELATED TO DAMAGES filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Excerpts of Expert Report of John Jarosz, #(2) Exhibit B - Excerpts of Deposition of John Jarosz, #(3) Exhibit C - Excerpts of Deposition of John Jarosz, #(4) Exhibit D - Excerpts of Expert Report of Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D., #(5) Exhibit E-1 - Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, #(6) Exhibit E-2 - Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Report of W. Christopher Bakewell, #(7) Exhibit F - Excerpts of Deposition of David John Irving, #(8) Exhibit G - Excerpts of Deposition of William F. Zucker, #(9) Exhibit H - Excerpts of Deposition of Nils Fredrik Gessler, #(10) Exhibit I - Excerpts of Deposition of Marcia Markovich, #(11) Exhibit J - Excerpts of Deposition of Stephen Sneeden, #(12) Exhibit K - Excerpts of Deposition of Yu Wan Lin, #(13) Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
March 8, 2013 Filing 347 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT'S AND HTC'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1, 3, AND 4 OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,088,326 AND 6,381,211 by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark Lanning, # 2 Affidavit of Akshay S. Deoras, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Part 1 of 3, # 7 Exhibit 4 - Part 2 of 3, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Part 3 of 3, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Deoras, Akshay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2013: # 12 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
March 7, 2013 Filing 346 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 340 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Order on Sealed Motion,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, (Joint Notice regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Briefing Schedule) (Hill, Jack)
March 7, 2013 Filing 345 SEALED RESPONSE/OPPOSITION TO THE ERICSSON AND SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL SUMMARY-JUDGMENT BRIEFING by WI-LAN Inc. to 276 SEALED MOTION-SUPPLEMENT TO THE ERICSSON AND SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS SUMMARY-JUDGMENT BRIEFING Sealed Document filed by WI-LAN Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Parolin Declaration, #(2) Exhibit 1A - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(3) Exhibit 1B - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(4) Exhibit 2 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(5) Exhibit 3 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(6) Exhibit 4 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(7) Exhibit 5 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(8) Exhibit 6 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(9) Exhibit 7 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(10) Exhibit B - Jarosz Declaration, #(11) Exhibit C - Weaver Declaration, #(12) Exhibit 1 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(13) Exhibit 2 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(14) Exhibit 3 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(15) Text of Proposed Order) (Weaver, David)
March 7, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 342, Sealed Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 6, 2013 Filing 344 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 343 Notice (Other) WI-LANS RESPONSE TO HTCS NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED BY WI-LAN, INC. FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW (Pai, Ajeet)
March 6, 2013 Filing 343 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Regarding Documents Submitted by Wi-LAN, Inc. for In Camera Review (Findlay, Eric)
March 5, 2013 Filing 342 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing and 276 SEALED MOTION- SUPPLEMENT TO THE ERICSSON AND SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS SUMMARY-JUDGMENT BRIEFING filed by WI-LAN Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Parolin Declaration, #(2) Exhibit 1A - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(3) Exhibit 1B - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(4) Exhibit 2 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(5) Exhibit 3 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(6) Exhibit 4 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(7) Exhibit 5 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(8) Exhibit 6 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(9) Exhibit 7 - ISO Parolin Declaration, #(10) Exhibit B - Jarosz Declaration, #(11) Exhibit C - Weaver Declaration, #(12) Exhibit 1 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(13) Exhibit 2 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(14) Exhibit 3 - ISO Weaver Declaration, #(15) Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David) Modified on 3/7/2013 (sm, ).
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER denying 305 Sealed Motion for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/13. cc:attys 3-05-13 (mll, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting in part 240 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel; denying as moot 255 Sealed Motion to Compel; granting 275 Sealed Motion to Supplement summary judgment briefing; denying as moot 277 Motion for Leave to File two letter briefs; granting 288 Motion to Strike Defendants' Letter Briefs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/13. cc:attys 3-05-13 (mll, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 339 Sealed Document. Wi-LAN Inc.'s NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW Attachments:#1) Exhibit A(Pai, Ajeet)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting 331 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to submit the 80 documents identified by HTC for in camera inspection, along with Plaintiff's assertions of privilege and accompanying affidavits, is extended to 5:00 p.m., 3-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-04-13 (mll, )
March 2, 2013 Filing 337 SEALED MOTION ALCATEL-LUCENT, HTC, AND SONY MOBILE'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN C. JAROSZ REGARDING ISSUES RELATED TO DAMAGES by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Akshay Deoras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 1, 2013 Filing 336 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson re 329 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendants' Objections to Wi-LAN's Rebuttal Designations (Deoras, Akshay)
March 1, 2013 Filing 335 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. Joint Notice of Compliance Regarding Daubert Motion Briefing Schedule (Deoras, Akshay)
March 1, 2013 Filing 334 RESPONSE to 329 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Wi-LAN's Objections to Defendants Counter Designations filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
March 1, 2013 Filing 332 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. re 328 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Revised Proposed Briefing Schedule for Supplemental Briefing on Ericsson and Sony Mobile Motions for Summary Judgment (Wynne, Richard)
March 1, 2013 Filing 331 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Produce Documents for In Camera Inspection by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
February 28, 2013 Filing 330 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. DEFENDANTS HTC CORPORATION, HTC AMERICA, INC., AND EXEDEA INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric)
February 26, 2013 Filing 333 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 2/26/2013 re 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing, 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order, 288 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL COMMUNICATIONS AND DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN, INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions, 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support, 255 SEALED MOTION to Compel. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk)
February 25, 2013 Filing 329 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. re 99 Order JOINT REBUTTAL DESIGNATIONS AND OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Wi-LAN's rebuttal deposition designations and objections to Alcatel-Lucent, Ericsson and Sony Mobiles deposition designations, # 2 Exhibit B - Wi-LANs rebuttal deposition designations and objections to HTCs deposition designations, # 3 Exhibit C - Defendants Alcatel-Lucent, Ericsson, Sony Mobile and HTCs rebuttal deposition designations and objections to Wi-LANs deposition designations)(Weaver, David)
February 25, 2013 Filing 328 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. re 314 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,,,,, Joint Notice of Withdraw of Ericsson/Sony Mobile Motion to Compel [ECF 255] and Withdrawal of Wi-LAN's Opposition to Ericsson/Sony Mobile Motion for Leave to Supplement Summary-Judgment Briefing [ECF 283] (Wynne, Richard)
February 25, 2013 Filing 327 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. re 314 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,,,,, JOINT PROPOSED TRIAL PLAN (Weaver, David)
February 25, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 325, Proposed Pretrial Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 25, 2013 Filing 326 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Henry, Claire)
February 25, 2013 Filing 325 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Proposed Pretrial Order /PROPOSED TRIAL PLAN by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David) Modified on 2/25/2013 (sm, ).
February 25, 2013 Filing 324 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Weaver, David)
February 25, 2013 Filing 323 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 7, #(2) Exhibit 8, #(3) Exhibit 9, #(4) Exhibit 10, #(5) Exhibit 11)(Weaver, David)
February 22, 2013 Filing 322 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support filed by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Findlay, Eric)
February 22, 2013 Filing 321 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E)(Wynne, Richard)
February 21, 2013 Filing 320 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Michael Heinlen on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Heinlen, James)
February 19, 2013 Filing 319 RESPONSE to Motion re 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
February 19, 2013 Filing 318 Wi-LAN's SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order filed by WI-LAN Inc.(Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit 2, #(3) Exhibit 3, #(4) Exhibit 4, #(5) Exhibit 5, #(6) Exhibit 6, #(7) Text of Proposed Order) (Weaver, David)
February 15, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Pamela J Naughton on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4003807. (Naughton, Pamela)
February 15, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew M Mueller on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4003787. (Mueller, Matthew)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting 313 Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Exhibits for Trial. Each side is permitted to designate 400 exhibits for trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13 (mll, )
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 255 SEALED MOTION to Compel, 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing, 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL COMMUNICATIONS AND DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN, INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE, 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order, 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support, 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions, 288 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 :Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court also sets the following briefing schedule for 305 Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order, and 306 HTC's Motion to Sever: Plaintiff's Response is due on or before 2-19-2013 at 12:00 P.M.; Defendants' Reply is due on or before 2-22-2013 at 12:00 P.M.; Plaintiff's Sur-Reply is due on or before 2-25-2013 at 12:00 P.M. Parties are also ORDERED to submit a proposed trial plan on or before 2-25-2013 at 12:00 P. M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13(mll, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 313 Unopposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS FOR TRIAL by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
February 14, 2013 Filing 312 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 311 Proposed Pretrial Order,, NOTICE OF PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE (Pai, Ajeet)
February 14, 2013 Filing 311 Proposed Pretrial Order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wi-LAN Witness List, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Alcatel-Lucent Witness List, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Ericsson -Sony Mobile Witness List, # 4 Exhibit 4 - HTC Witness List, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Wi-Lan Depo Designations, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Alcatel-Lucent Depo Designations, # 7 Exhibit 7 - HTC Depo Designations, # 8 Exhibit Wi-Lan Exhibit List, # 9 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List)(Pai, Ajeet)
February 13, 2013 Filing 310 Proposed Jury Instructions by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
February 13, 2013 Filing 309 Sealed Document. Wi-LAN's PRELIMINARY PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Pai, Ajeet)
February 13, 2013 Filing 308 Sealed Document. Alcatel-Lucent's Preliminary Proposed Statements of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Laches (Deoras, Akshay)
February 5, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Cornelius, William)
February 4, 2013 Filing 306 MOTION to Sever and Memorandum In Support by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 4, 2013 Filing 305 SEALED MOTION for Clarification of the Construction of a Single Term in the Court's Claim-Construction Order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
February 4, 2013 Filing 304 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gwendolyn Johnson Samora on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Samora, Gwendolyn)
January 29, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mira Atanassova Mulvaney on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3975972. (Mulvaney, Mira)
January 25, 2013 Filing 302 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Weaver, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Findlay, Eric)
January 25, 2013 Filing 300 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Wynne, Richard)
January 25, 2013 Filing 299 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Deoras, Akshay)
January 18, 2013 Filing 298 Amended Witness List by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
January 18, 2013 Filing 297 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
January 18, 2013 Filing 296 REPLY to Response to Motion re 288 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
January 15, 2013 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re 288 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting 291 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Paul Harper terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/13. cc:attys 1-15-13 (mll, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting 290 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/13. cc:attys 1-15-13 (mll, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 292 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
January 11, 2013 Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Paul Harper by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
January 10, 2013 Filing 290 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order - JOINT MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Han, Jeffrey)
January 7, 2013 Filing 289 REPLY to Response to Motion re 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Findlay, Eric)
January 7, 2013 Filing 288 MOTION to Strike 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions and Request to Strike Defendants Letter Briefs filed under Dkt. 280 and 287 by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed)
January 4, 2013 Filing 287 Letter Brief filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric)
January 3, 2013 Filing 286 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
December 27, 2012 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Syed Fareed, # 2 Exhibit A - Docket Control Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed)
December 27, 2012 Filing 284 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 255 SEALED MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Discovery filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
December 24, 2012 Filing 283 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO [Sealed] Motion re 275 Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fareed, Syed)
December 20, 2012 Filing 282 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL COMMUNICATIONS AND DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN, INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
December 17, 2012 Filing 281 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 255 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wynne, Richard)
December 14, 2012 Filing 280 Letter Brief filed by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., and Exedea, Inc.'s Letter Brief Requesting Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity)(Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2012 Filing 279 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL COMMUNICATIONS AND DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN, INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE filed by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Bader, # 2 Exhibit S1)(Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2012 Filing 278 SEALED Wi-LAN's RESPONSE to The Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Discovery re 255 filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of David Weaver, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc.s Objections To Ericsson and Sony Mobiles Notice Of Deposition Under Rule 30(b)(6) dated August 23, 2012, # 3 Exhibit 3-excerpts from the transcript of the deposition of Andrew Parolin dated August 31, 2012, # 4 Exhibit 4-excerpts from the transcript of the deposition of William Middleton dated Septembe 28, 2012, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
December 7, 2012 Filing 277 MOTION for Leave to File Two Letter Briefs Requesting Permission to File Certain Motions by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2012 Filing 276 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Wynne, Richard)
December 7, 2012 Filing 275 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Ericsson and Sony Mobile Defendants' Summary-Judgment Briefing by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
December 5, 2012 Filing 274 Revised Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 265 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Parties shall have to 12-21-2012, to complete expert depositions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 209 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions; denying 212 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, )
November 30, 2012 Filing 271 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
November 30, 2012 Filing 270 Rebuttal Trial Witness Witness List by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
November 30, 2012 Filing 269 SEALED WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC.S THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS to 254 (Weaver, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 268 SEALED WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS ABS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS 253 (Weaver, David)
November 30, 2012 Filing 267 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
November 30, 2012 Filing 266 Revised Trial Witness List by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
November 30, 2012 Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
November 30, 2012 Filing 264 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
November 29, 2012 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Constance S Huttner on behalf of WI-LAN Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3893113. (Huttner, Constance)
November 26, 2012 Filing 262 SEALED Wi-LAN's RESPONSE re 240 HTC's MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ajeet Pai ISO Wi-LAN's Response to HTC's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of William Middleton ISO Wi-LAN's Response to HTC's Motion to Compel, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
November 26, 2012 Filing 261 SEALED WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO 251 DEFENDANT TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSONS THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS (Weaver, David)
November 26, 2012 Filing 260 SEALED Reply by WI-LAN Inc. to 250 Ericsson Inc.'s Fourth Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Weaver, David)
November 20, 2012 Filing 259 Trial Witness List by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
November 20, 2012 Filing 258 trial Witness List by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
November 20, 2012 Filing 257 Trial Witness List by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay)
November 20, 2012 Filing 256 Trial Witness Witness List by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
November 20, 2012 Filing 255 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
November 13, 2012 Filing 254 SEALED RESPONSE by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 1 Complaint, Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
November 13, 2012 Filing 253 SEALED RESPONSE by Sony Mobile Communications AB to 1 Complaint, Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 249 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 241 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/12. cc:attys 11-13-12 (mll, )
November 8, 2012 Filing 251 SEALED RESPONSE by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to 1 Complaint. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson's Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Wynne, Richard)
November 8, 2012 Filing 250 SEALED RESPONSE by Ericsson Inc. to 1 Complaint, Ericsson Inc.'s Fourth Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (Wynne, Richard)
November 6, 2012 Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 241 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 245 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/12. cc:attys 11-05-12 (mll, )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/12. cc:attys 11-05-12 (mll, )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/12. cc:attys 11-05-12 (mll, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 1, 2012 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Expert Report (Damages) by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Deoras, Akshay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
November 1, 2012 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Expert Report (Damages) by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dominguez, Adrienne)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 239 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Wi-LANshall have until 11-02-2012 to serve its responsive expert report concerning validity; and Alcatel-Lucent shall have until 11-02-2012 to serve its responsive expert report concerning infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/12. cc:attys 10-31-12 (mll, )
October 30, 2012 Filing 241 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
October 26, 2012 Filing 240 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF INTERNAL COMMUNICATIONS AND DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY WI-LAN, INC. ON THE GROUND OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Martin R. Bader, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Bader Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Bader Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Bader Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Bader Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Bader Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Bader Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Bader Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Bader Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Bader Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Bader Decl., # 12 Exhibit 11 to Bader Decl., # 13 Exhibit 12 to Bader Decl., # 14 Exhibit 13 to Bader Decl., # 15 Exhibit 14 to Bader Decl., # 16 Exhibit 15 to Bader Decl., # 17 Exhibit 16 to Bader Decl., # 18 Exhibit 17A to Bader Decl., # 19 Exhibit 17B to Bader Decl., # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 24, 2012 Filing 239 MOTION to Amend/Correct UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY EXPERT REPORT AND AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deoras, Akshay)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 237 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/12. cc;attys 10-22-12 (mll, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 237 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 16, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Patrick Kane on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3832271. (Kane, Ryan)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting 233 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Anthony Valek terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/12. cc:attys 10-15-12 (mll, )
October 15, 2012 Filing 234 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R Borgman on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Borgman, Steven)
October 12, 2012 Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael A. Valek by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 229 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc;attys 10-01-12 (mll, )
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 228 Motion to Seal Exhibit A of 207 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-01-12 (mll, ) Modified on 10/1/2012 (mll, ).
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 227 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-01-12 (mll, )
September 26, 2012 Filing 229 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order Docket Control Order by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
September 13, 2012 Filing 228 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
September 13, 2012 Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Han, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 224 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/07/12. cc:attys 9-10-12 (mll, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 225 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Joshua Tobin on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Tobin, David)
September 5, 2012 Filing 224 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order and 215 Order by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
September 4, 2012 Filing 223 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 209 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Wynne, Richard)
August 30, 2012 Filing 222 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 212 MOTION for Protective Order In Opposition to Sony Mobile Defendants' Motion for Protective Order filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
August 24, 2012 Filing 221 REPLY to Response to Motion re 209 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Pai, Ajeet)
August 20, 2012 Filing 220 REPLY to Response to Motion re 212 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Wynne, Richard)
August 13, 2012 Filing 219 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 209 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 10, 2012 Filing 218 SEALED Wi-LAN's RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 212 MOTION for Protective Order filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wi-LAN's Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 2- Wi-LAN's 1st Set of Discovery Requests to All Defendants, # 3 Exhibit 3 [CONF] Sony Mobile's 1st Amended Responses to Wi-LAN's 1st Set of Discovery Requests, # 4 Exhibit 4- Wi-LAN's Responses and Objections to Defendants' 1st Set of Common Interrogatories, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter on Behalf of Defendants dated 7-27-2012)(Pai, Ajeet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2012: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
August 10, 2012 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janice Le Ta on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ta, Janice)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 214 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12 (mll, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 214 Joint Motion to Amend 99 Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/2/2012. (leh, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 214 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order [DOCKET CONTROL ORDER] by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet) Modified on 8/3/2012 (mjc, ).
August 1, 2012 Filing 213 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD.***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Amending Docket Control Order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet) Modified on 8/2/2012 (gsg).
July 31, 2012 Filing 212 MOTION for Protective Order by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 31, 2012 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy E Hudson on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Hudson, Timothy)
July 31, 2012 Filing 210 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Cohen, Justin)
July 25, 2012 Filing 209 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF AJEET P. PAI IN SUPPORT OF WI-LAN INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGMENT CONTENTIONS, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Initial Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - WI-LANS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-6), # 4 Exhibit 3 - Wi-LAN's Amended Contentions, # 5 Exhibit Wynne Letter 7-9-2012, # 6 Exhibit Wi-LANs First Set of Discovery Requests to All Defendants, # 7 Exhibit 6 - HTC CORPORATION, HTC AMERICA, INC., AND EXEDEA INC.S RESPONSES TO WI-LAN, INC.'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO ALL DEFENDANTS, # 8 Exhibit 7 - DEFENDANTS SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB ANDSONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC. 's FIRST AMENDED RESPONSES TO WI-LAN's FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 207 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/17/12. cc:attys 7-17-12 (mll, )
July 12, 2012 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM HTC CORPORATION, HTC AMERICA, AND EXEDEA INC. by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF AJEET P. PAI IN SUPPORT OFWI-LAN INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF LICENSE AGREEMENTS FROM HTC CORPORATION, HTC AMERICA, AND EXEDEA INC., # 2 Exhibit A - July 6, 2012 letter to Wi-LAN from HTC Counsel, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pai, Ajeet)
July 5, 2012 Filing 206 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/12. cc:attys 6-25-12(mll, )
June 23, 2012 Filing 204 Joint MOTION for Protective Order FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN WI-LAN INC., NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INC., AND SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB AND SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC. by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - STIPULATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN WI-LAN,INC., NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INC., SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB AND SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC.)(Pai, Ajeet)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER that pltf shall pay $1,365.00 and defts shall pay $1,365.00 to Richard Egan for services rendered and expenses incurred through 05-31-2012 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $2,730.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/18/12. cc:attys 6-18-12(mll, )
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER. The Court orders payment of costs in the amount of $16,946.71 to be paid to the technical consultant in this case, Mr. Richard D. Egan. The costs are to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/2012. (leh, )
May 18, 2012 Filing 201 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 4/26/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012. (sms, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 174 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment That Patent Claims Are Indefinite. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/16/12. cc:attys 5-16-12 (mll, )
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Albert Fedock terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/12. cc;attys 5-10-12 (mll, )
May 9, 2012 Filing 198 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Wynne, Richard)
May 4, 2012 Filing 197 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Wynne, Richard)
May 4, 2012 Filing 196 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John A. Fedock by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 30, 2012 Filing 195 SEALED PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE SONY MOBILE DEFENDANTS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 181 filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 26, 2012 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 4/26/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 193 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13)(Sostek, Bruce)
April 24, 2012 Filing 192 AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. and NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-5(d). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart, # 2 Exhibit B-Redline Comparison of Amended Chart)(Weaver, David)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER Between Qualcomm Inc, Wi-Lan Inc, HTC Corp, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/12. cc:attys 4-24-12(mll, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 190 SEALED PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-DECLARATION OF JONATHAN WELLS, PH.D.)(Weaver, David)
April 20, 2012 Filing 189 Joint MOTION for Protective Order FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-STIPULATION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INC., WI-LAN, INC., HTC CORP., HTC AMERICA, INC., AND EXEDEA INC.)(Weaver, David)
April 19, 2012 Filing 188 NOTICE OF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART with JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Weaver, David)
April 19, 2012 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re 174 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that Patent Claims Are Indefinite filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of James Olivier, Ph.D.)(Wynne, Richard)
April 13, 2012 Filing 186 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 172 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE ERICSSON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent and Conflict Resolution Agreement between Wi-LAN and Ericsson, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrew Parolin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 13, 2012 Filing 185 RESPONSE in Opposition re 174 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that Patent Claims Are Indefinite filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan Wells, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ISO Declaration of Jonathan Wells - Jonathan Wells CV, # 3 Exhibit B - Wi-Lan's proposed constructions for "means" terms, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 13, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF TIME REQUIRED FOR MARKMAN HEARING (Weaver, David)
April 13, 2012 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajeet P Pai on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Pai, Ajeet)
April 13, 2012 Filing 182 REPLY to 167 Claim Construction Brief,,,,, filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey T. Han, # 2 Exhibit I - true and correct copy of U.S. Patent No. 5,603,095, # 3 Exhibit II - true and correct copy of U.S. Patent No. 5,239,682, # 4 Exhibit III - true and correct copy of U.S. Patent No. 5,659,598., # 5 Exhibit IV - true and correct copy of WO 96/37054., # 6 Exhibit V - true and correct copy of Sanford Bingham, Multiplexers, Computerworld, Nov. 27, 1989, at 61., # 7 Exhibit VI - true and correct copy of David J. Stang, Network)(Weaver, David)
April 13, 2012 Filing 181 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Beming Decl., # 2 Exhibit 2. Vecella Decl., # 3 Exhibit 3. Mahon Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4. Wynne Decl., # 5 Exhibit 5. Wi-LAN ltr to LME, # 6 Exhibit 6. SEMC CRA, # 7 Exhibit 7. Wi-LAN ltr to SEMC, # 8 Exhibit 8. 068 Patent Claim Chart, # 9 Exhibit 9.897 Patent Claim Chart, # 10 Exhibit 10. Ericsson CRA, # 11 Exhibit 11. Excerpts of Wi-LAN 3-1 Disclosures, # 12 Exhibit 12. Wi-LAN Prior License Agreement, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
April 13, 2012 Filing 180 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
April 5, 2012 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Bufe, John)
April 3, 2012 Filing 178 REPORT of Mediation by James W Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James)
April 3, 2012 Filing 177 REPORT of Mediation by James W Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 171 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. It is ORDERED that Wi-LAN's motion for partial summary judgment shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/2012. (leh, )
March 30, 2012 Filing 175 SEALED RESPONSE by HTC Corporation, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB to 167 Claim Construction Brief,,,,, filed by HTC Corporation, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., Ericsson Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Akshay S. Deoras in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Deoras, Akshay)
March 30, 2012 Filing 174 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that Patent Claims Are Indefinite by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Responses due by 4/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sostek, Bruce)
March 30, 2012 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedock, John)
March 27, 2012 Filing 172 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Beming Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2. Vecella Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3. Mahon Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4. Wynne Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5. Oct. 30 2006 Ltr Wi-LAN to Blomqvist, # 6 Exhibit 6. Ericsson CRA, # 7 Exhibit 7. Oct. 20 2006 Ltr Wi-LAN to Flint, # 8 Exhibit 8. Wi-LAN 068 Patent Claim Chart, # 9 Exhibit 9. Wi-LAN 897 Patent Claim Chart, # 10 Exhibit 10. Sony Ericsson CRA, # 11 Exhibit 11. Wi-LAN PR3-1 Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit 12. Fujitsu-Wi-LAN License, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
March 26, 2012 Filing 171 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-PATENT AND CONFLICT RESOLUTION AGREEMENT, # 2 Exhibit B-PATENT AND CONFLICT RESOLUTION AGREEMENT, # 3 Exhibit C-WI-LAN INC PATENT ACQUISITION AGREEMENT, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 169 Motion to Change the Names of Parties. The Courts records and docket for the above-captioned action shall be changed to indicate the corporate name change of Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB to Sony Mobile Communications AB and the corporate name change of Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/12. cc:attys 3-26-12 (mll, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION Motion to Change Names of Parties by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 166 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Juliet Mitchell Dirba terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/16/12. cc:attys 3-19-12 (mll, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 167 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF JEFFREY T. HAN IN SUPPORT OF WI-LANS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF, # 2 Exhibit A-U.S. Patent No. 6,088,326, # 3 Exhibit B-U.S. Patent No. 6,195,327, # 4 Exhibit C-U.S. Patent No. 6,222,819, # 5 Exhibit D-U.S. Patent No. 6,381,211, # 6 Exhibit E-copy of The IEEE Standard Dictionary of Electrical and Electronics Terms (6th ed. 1996), # 7 Exhibit F-copy of Alan Freedman, The ComputerGlossary (7th ed. 1995), # 8 Exhibit G-copy of Harry Newton, Newtons Telecom Dictionary (11th ed. 1996), # 9 Exhibit H-copy of Ramjee Prasad, CDMA for Wireless Personal Communications (1996), # 10 Exhibit I-copy of Theodore S. Rappaport,Wireless Communications (1996), # 11 Exhibit J-copy of Shing-Fong Su, The UMTS Air-Interface in RF Engineering (2007), # 12 Exhibit K-copy of 3GPP TS 25.211,v.6.10.0 (Release 6), # 13 Exhibit L-copy of Jean Conan & Rolando Oliver, Hardware and Software Implementation of the Viterbi Decoding Algorithm for Convolutional Codes, in MIMI 76: Proceedings of the International Symposium on Mini and Micro Computers (M.H. Hamza ed., 1977), # 14 Exhibit M-Definition of Overlay, OxfordDictionaries Online, http://oxforddictionaries.com/definition/overlay?q=overlay, # 15 Exhibit N-copy of the Manual of Patent Examining Procedure (6th ed. rev. 3, July 1997))(Weaver, David)
March 15, 2012 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Juliet M. Dirba by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedock, John)
March 14, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. Notice of Service of Wi-LAN Inc.'s Technology Tutorial (Fedock, John)
March 5, 2012 Filing 164 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeanne M Heffernan for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (mll, )
February 29, 2012 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Valek, Michael)
February 29, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Adam Linder on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Linder, Seth)
February 23, 2012 Filing 161 RESPONSE to 153 Response to Non-Motion WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC.S SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by WI-LAN Inc.. (Fedock, John)
February 23, 2012 Filing 160 RESPONSE to 154 Response to Non-Motion WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS ABS SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by WI-LAN Inc.. (Fedock, John)
February 23, 2012 Filing 159 RESPONSE to 152 Response to Non-Motion WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSONS SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by WI-LAN Inc.. (Fedock, John)
February 23, 2012 Filing 158 RESPONSE to 151 Response to Non-Motion WI-LAN INC.S REPLY TO DEFENDANT ERICSSON INC.S THIRD AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by WI-LAN Inc.. (Fedock, John)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion to Appoint Technical Advisor. Richard Egan is appointed Technical Advisor in this civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/12. cc:attys 2-17-12 (mll, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 156 Joint MOTION to Appoint Expert Technical Advisor by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Richard Egan CV, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedock, John)
February 10, 2012 Filing 155 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Graham M Buccigross for Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (mll, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 154 SEALED RESPONSE by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB to 1 Complaint, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
February 9, 2012 Filing 153 SEALED RESPONSE by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 1 Complaint, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.'s Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
February 9, 2012 Filing 152 SEALED RESPONSE by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to 1 Complaint, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
February 9, 2012 Filing 151 SEALED RESPONSE by Ericsson Inc. to 1 Complaint,, filed by Ericsson Inc. -- Ericsson Inc.'s Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Wynne, Richard)
February 7, 2012 Filing 150 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Parties Proposed Construction of Each Disputed Claim Term, Phrase, or Clause, # 2 Exhibit B - Wi-LAN'S IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE, # 3 Exhibit C - DEFENDANTS' IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE)(Fedock, John)
February 7, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency. DE 148 filed in error. Atty refiled pleading at DE 149. (leh, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 149 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 150 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-PARTIES PROPOSED CONSTRUCTION OF EACH DISPUTED CLAIM TERM, PHRASE, OR CLAUSE, # 2 Exhibit B-Wi-LAN'S IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE, # 3 Exhibit C-DEFENDANTS' IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE)(Fedock, John) Modified on 2/7/2012 (mll, ).
February 6, 2012 Filing 148 ***PLEASE IGNORE. FILED IN ERROR.*** JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Parties Proposed Construction of Each Disputed Claim Term, Phrase, or Clause, # 2 Exhibit B-Wi-LAN'S IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE, # 3 Exhibit C-DEFENDANTS' IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE)(Fedock, John) Modified on 2/7/2012 (leh, ). Modified on 2/7/2012 (mll, ).
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 146 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Inge Larish terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/28/11. cc:attys 12-28-11 (mll, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Inge Larish) by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/11. cc:attys 12-19-11(mll, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 144 Joint MOTION for Protective Order FOR ENTRY OF AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Protective Order)(Fedock, John)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. Defendants request permission to file a motion for summary judgment that this action is barred by a covenant not to sue. Plaintiff requests permission to file a cross-motion for partial summary judgment on Defendants affirmative defense of covenant not to sue and their counterclaim for breach of contract. The Court GRANTS both Defendants request and Plaintiffs request. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/11. cc:attys 11-22-11(mll, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 139 Motion to Seal Document. The letter briefs submitted by Plaintiff Wi-LAN Inc. on 11-18-2011, shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/11. cc:attys 11-21-11 (mll, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 141 SEALED RESPONSE by WI-LAN Inc. to 132 SEALED Letter Brief Response filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
November 21, 2011 Filing 140 SEALED RESPONSE by WI-LAN Inc. to 133 SEALED Letter Brief Response filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Weaver, David)
November 21, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 138 Sealed Letter Brief submitted by WI-LAN Inc. Document does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal or a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
November 21, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 137 Sealed Response submitted by WI-LAN Inc. Document does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal or a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (mjc, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document re Letter Briefs by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
November 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 136 Opposed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 138 ***DOUCMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED LETTER BRIEF RESPONSE by WI-LAN Inc. to 132 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB (Weaver, David) Modified on 11/21/2011 (mjc, ).
November 18, 2011 Filing 137 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED RESPONSE by WI-LAN Inc. to 133 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Weaver, David) Modified on 11/21/2011 (mjc, ).
November 18, 2011 Filing 136 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Opposed MOTION to Seal Document File Under Seal Letter Briefs by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David) Modified on 11/18/2011 (mjc, ).
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Seal Document. The letter briefs submitted by Ericsson and Sony Ericsson on 11-04-2011, shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, )
November 8, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Fedock, John)
November 4, 2011 Filing 133 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Wynne, Richard)
November 4, 2011 Filing 132 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB (Wynne, Richard)
November 4, 2011 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Letter Briefs by Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 129 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 72 Motion to Sever; denying 73 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11 (mll, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avelyn Marie Ross on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ross, Avelyn)
September 21, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Under PR 3-4(a) (Wynne, Richard)
September 21, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Under PR 3-4(a) (Wynne, Richard)
September 19, 2011 Filing 124 WiLAN's Reply to Sony Ericsson's (SEAB) First Amended Answer and Counterclaims - ANSWER to 114 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WI-LAN Inc..(Weaver, David)
September 19, 2011 Filing 123 WiLAN's Reply to Sony Ericsson's (SEUS) First Amended Answer and Counterclaims - ANSWER to 113 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WI-LAN Inc..(Weaver, David)
September 19, 2011 Filing 122 WiLAN Reply to Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims - ANSWER to 112 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WI-LAN Inc..(Weaver, David)
September 19, 2011 Filing 121 WiLAN Reply to Ericsson Inc.'s 2nd Amended Answer and 1st Amended Counterclaims - ANSWER to 111 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WI-LAN Inc..(Weaver, David)
September 15, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Findlay, Eric)
September 14, 2011 Filing 119 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. Disclosures Under P.R. 3-4 (Deoras, Akshay)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Disclosures Under PR 3-4(a) and Para. 2.B of Discovery Order by Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 11, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed Kamil Fareed on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Fareed, Syed)
September 2, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Deoras, Akshay)
September 2, 2011 Filing 114 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB.(Wynne, Richard)
September 2, 2011 Filing 113 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc..(Wynne, Richard)
September 2, 2011 Filing 112 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson.(Wynne, Richard)
September 2, 2011 Filing 111 Second Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Ericsson Inc..(Wynne, Richard)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Dowling Hornberger terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-24-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Withdrawal of David D. Hornberger by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
August 18, 2011 Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lee Hsu for Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (mll, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 107 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Serving Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
July 26, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Deoras, Akshay)
July 25, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by WI-LAN Inc. Disclosures Under P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Fedock, John)
July 25, 2011 Filing 104 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by WI-LAN Inc. (Fedock, John)
July 25, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Findlay, Eric)
July 25, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB (Harper, Matthew)
July 25, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Harper, Matthew)
July 18, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. James W Knowles is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (kls, )
July 14, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael E Jones on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Jones, Michael)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/06/11. cc:attys 7-06-11(mll, )
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 JOINT AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/06/11. cc:attys 7-06-11(mll, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 24, 2011 Filing 96 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
June 24, 2011 Filing 95 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 6-24-2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 6-24-2011 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/09/11. cc:attys 6-10-11 (mll, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 93 6.9.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 6/9/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Craft, Roger)
May 6, 2011 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Albert Fedock on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Fedock, John)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/9/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/03/11. cc:attys 5-04-11(mll, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE by WI-LAN Inc. re 88 Order, that Case is Ready for Scheduling Conference (Hill, Jack)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-16-11(mll, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Han on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Han, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2011 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Change Venue filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
March 7, 2011 Filing 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
February 24, 2011 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
February 24, 2011 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
February 17, 2011 Filing 82 ANSWER to 69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB by WI-LAN Inc..(Hill, Jack)
February 17, 2011 Filing 81 ANSWER to 68 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by WI-LAN Inc..(Hill, Jack)
February 14, 2011 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Juliet M. Durba, # 2 Exhibit A to Durba Decl., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
February 14, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION to Change Venue filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David D. Hornberger, # 2 Exhibit A to Hornberger Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Hornberger Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Hornberger Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Hornberger Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Hornberger Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Hornberger Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Hornberger Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Hornberger Decl., # 10 Affidavit Declaration of William Middleton, # 11 Exhibit A to Middleton Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
February 8, 2011 Filing 78 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel N Yannuzzi for Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (mll, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 77 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Akshay S Deoras for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (mll, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 76 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Arovas for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (mll, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert A Appleby for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (mll, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 74 ANSWER to 61 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. by WI-LAN Inc..(Hill, Jack)
January 26, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION to Change Venue by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jon Maron, # 2 Affidavit James Clifford, # 3 Affidavit of Inge Larish, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 26, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Sever Claims by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Inge Larish, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Affidavit of Jon Maron, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 24, 2011 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB (Sostek, Bruce)
January 24, 2011 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Sostek, Bruce)
January 24, 2011 Filing 69 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB.(Sostek, Bruce)
January 24, 2011 Filing 68 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson.(Sostek, Bruce)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Seal Document. Docket Entries 56 and 57 are hereby SEALED. Pltf and other parties shall restrict access to the sealed documents to outside counsel only until proper designation under a protective order can be made. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/11. cc:attys 1-18-11 (mll, )
January 17, 2011 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 56 Answer to Counterclaim, 57 Answer to Counterclaim and For Confidentiality Order by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
January 4, 2011 Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Martin R Bader for Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (mll, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 64 HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation and Exedea Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
January 3, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge A Larish on behalf of Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Larish, Inge)
January 3, 2011 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel-Lucent for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
January 3, 2011 Filing 61 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc..(Jones, Michael)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal filed by WI-LAN Inc. All claims asserted by pltf against LG Electronics defts are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/10. cc:attys 12-30-10(mll, )
December 30, 2010 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen S Korniczky for Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (mll, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
December 22, 2010 Filing 57 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 53 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Ericsson Inc. by WI-LAN Inc..(Hill, Jack)
December 22, 2010 Filing 56 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of of Defendant Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. by WI-LAN Inc..(Hill, Jack)
December 14, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G Mote on behalf of LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Mote, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard D Harris on behalf of LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Harris, Richard)
December 2, 2010 Filing 53 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Ericsson Inc.. (Sostek, Bruce)
December 2, 2010 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
December 2, 2010 Filing 51 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc..(Sostek, Bruce)
December 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. to 1/3/2011. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WI-LAN Inc.. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson waiver sent on 11/23/2010, answer due 1/24/2011. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WI-LAN Inc.. Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB waiver sent on 11/23/2010, answer due 1/24/2011. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 29, 2010 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
November 29, 2010 Filing 46 Ericsson Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WI-LAN Inc. by Ericsson Inc..(Sostek, Bruce)
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 45 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to 1/3/2011. 36 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 44 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to 1/3/2011. 36 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 23, 2010 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc..( Maiers, Eric)
November 23, 2010 Filing 44 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..( Maiers, Eric)
November 12, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Jason Maiers on behalf of LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Maiers, Eric)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Exedea Inc's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 1-03-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/10. cc:attys 11-08-10(mll, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HTC Corporation's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 1-03-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/10. cc:attys 11-08-10 (mll, )
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft HTC America Inc's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 1-03-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/10. cc:attys 11-08-10 (mll, )
November 4, 2010 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for Defendant Exedea Inc. by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
November 4, 2010 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for Defendant HTC Corporation by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
November 4, 2010 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, for Defendant HTC America, Inc. by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
November 3, 2010 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WI-LAN Inc.. Exedea INC. waiver sent on 11/1/2010, answer due 1/3/2011; HTC America, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2010, answer due 1/3/2011; HTC Corporation waiver sent on 11/1/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 34 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to 11/28/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 33 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to 11/28/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 31 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. to 12/1/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 27 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. to 12/2/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 26 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ericsson Inc. to 11/29/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
October 29, 2010 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..( Swick, Randall)
October 29, 2010 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc..( Swick, Randall)
October 27, 2010 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed as to Exedea INC. on 10/18/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 11/8/2010. (mll, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc..( Jones, Michael)
October 27, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Paul Harper on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Harper, Matthew)
October 27, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Wynne, Richard)
October 27, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S Sostek on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. (Sostek, Bruce)
October 26, 2010 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc..( Harper, Matthew)
October 26, 2010 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ericsson Inc..( Harper, Matthew)
October 25, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juliet Mitchell Dirba on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Dirba, Juliet)
October 18, 2010 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. on 10/12/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 11/2/2010. (mll, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. on 10/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 11/5/2010. (mll, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to Ericsson Inc. on 10/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/29/2010. (mll, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to HTC America, Inc. on 10/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/29/2010. (mll, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. on 10/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/29/2010. (mll, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. on 10/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/29/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ).
October 12, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chuck Patrick Ebertin on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ebertin, Chuck)
October 6, 2010 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
October 6, 2010 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Exedea INC. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics, Inc. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HTC America, Inc. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Ericsson Inc.. (kls, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (kls, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Dowling Hornberger on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Hornberger, David)
October 5, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Weaver, David)
October 5, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
October 5, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of WI-LAN Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
October 5, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Ericsson Inc., Exedea INC., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2701349.), filed by WI-LAN Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WI-LAN Inc. v. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?