Gemalto S.A. v. HTC Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Gemalto S.A.
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC, HTC Corporation, Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Google Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Not Classified By Court: Harlan A Martin and Michael McLemore
Case Number: 6:2010cv00561
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Filing 483 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 482 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Group Limited for Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Perlson, David)
September 29, 2014 Filing 481 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 19, 2014 Filing 480 REPLY to Response to Motion re #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Perlson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sistos, Antonio)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #478 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Replies due by 9/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/12/2014. (gsg)
September 11, 2014 Filing 478 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 5, 2014 Filing 477 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2014 ***PLEASE IGNORE NO LONGER FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 476, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, ) Modified on 8/27/2014 (sm, ).
August 27, 2014 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #476 Notice and Notice of Docket Correction regarding #476 . #476 Notice is no longer filed in error and remains on docket. Clerk has modified the entry to reflect it is also related to #447 Motion. Please Ignore previous Clerks notice to ignore #476 filing. (sm, )
August 26, 2014 Filing 476 NOTICE of Resubmission of Exhibit A by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and #447 Motion for Atty Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
August 19, 2014 Filing 475 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 28, 2014 Filing 474 MANDATE of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #451 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Gemalto S.A. In accordance with the judgment of this Court, entered June 19, 2014, and pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appeallate Procedure, the mandate is hereby issued. (dlc, )
July 3, 2014 Filing 473 STIPULATION re #460 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Joint Stipulation by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
June 19, 2014 Filing 472 Notice of Entry of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT affirming the district court's claim construction and summary judgment of no infringement as to #451 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Gemalto S.A. (Attachments: #1 USCA-Federal Circuit Opinion, #2 Info Sheet for Petition for Rehearing, #3 Info Sheet for Writ of Certiorari)(dlc, )
September 4, 2013 Filing 471 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 9/4/13, by U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to #465 Amended Judgment, #470 Amended Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
September 4, 2013 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, #465 Amended Judgment and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #470 Amended Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (dlc, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 470 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to #465 Amended Judgment; amending #451 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Gemalto S.A. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 9/4/2013 (dlc, ).
August 16, 2013 Filing 469 STIPULATION re #467 Order on Motion to Unseal Document Joint Stipulation Regarding Making Public Certain Briefs and Exhibits Filed Under Seal by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
August 13, 2013 Filing 468 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Amended Final Judgment [Dkt. 465] by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER denying without prejudice #466 Motion to Unseal Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/13. (mll, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 466 Joint MOTION to Unseal Document Joint Motion to Make Public Portions of Certain Briefs and Exhibits Filed Under Seal by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 5, 2013 Filing 465 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Gemalto S.A. shall pay Defendants' costs in the amount set forth in the Agreed Bill of Costs 464 . All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 463 SEALED RESPONSE Joint Notice Regarding Order on Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs [Dkt. 459], filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting #461 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/30/2013. (gsg)
July 26, 2013 Filing 461 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Order On Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs [Dkt. 459] by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #447 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/12/13. (mll, ) Modified on 7/12/2013 (mll, ).
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting in part #448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs. The Motion is GRANTED-IN-PART as to whether costs are taxable, but the Court defers a determination of the appropriate amount of costs. The parties are ordered to meet and confer to reach an agreement regarding costs and file a notice with the Court reflecting such agreement by 7-26-2013. If the parties cannot come to an agreement by that date Gemalto may file a response not to exceed 5 pages, addressing Defendants' petition #448 no later than 7-26-2013. Defendants may then file a reply not to exceed 3 pages by 8-02-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/27/13. (mll, )
May 24, 2013 Filing 458 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #447 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 17, 2013 Filing 457 REPLY to Response to Motion re #448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
May 17, 2013 Filing 456 REPLY to Response to Motion re #447 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Perlson In Support of Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David)
May 10, 2013 Filing 455 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #451 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Gemalto S.A. USCA Federal Circuit Case Number 13-1397 (Attachments: #1 Official Caption)(dlc, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 454 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 7, 2013 Filing 453 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #447 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 6, 2013 Filing 452 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 5/6/13, from U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order Adopoting, Report and Recommendation, Memorandum Opinion, Order and Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
May 6, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgement, Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, Memorandum & Opinion, #251 Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #451 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 451 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #444 Final Judgment, #443 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, #242 Memorandum & Opinion, #251 Order by Gemalto S.A.. Filing fee paid $ 455.00, Receipt No. 0540-4123060. (dlc, )
May 3, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 450, Notice of Appeal. This appeal is to the Federal Circuit, not 5th Circuit. This entry will be refiled using the correct event. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (dlc, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 450 ***FILED IN ERROR, This appeal is to the Federal Circuit not 5th Circuit, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #444 Judgment, by Gemalto S.A.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-4123060. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 5/6/2013 (dlc, ). Modified on 7/21/2017 (rlf).
May 1, 2013 Filing 449 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs Declaration of Kristin J. Madigan In Support of Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7a, #8 Exhibit 7b, #9 Exhibit 7c, #10 Exhibit 7d, #11 Exhibit 7e, #12 Exhibit 8a, #13 Exhibit 8b - Part 1, #14 Exhibit 8b - Part 2, #15 Exhibit 8b - Part 3, #16 Exhibit 8b - Part 4, #17 Exhibit 8c - Part 1, #18 Exhibit 8c - Part 2, #19 Exhibit 8c - Part 3, #20 Exhibit 8c - Part 4, #21 Exhibit 8d - Part 1, #22 Exhibit 8d - Part 2, #23 Exhibit 8d - Part 3, #24 Exhibit 8d - Part 4, #25 Exhibit 8e - Part 1, #26 Exhibit 8e - Part 2, #27 Exhibit 8e - Part 3, #28 Exhibit 8e - Part 4, #29 Exhibit 9a, #30 Exhibit 9b, #31 Exhibit 9c, #32 Exhibit 9d)(Perlson, David)
May 1, 2013 Filing 448 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Taxation of Costs by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 30, 2013 Filing 447 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Perlson In Support of Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #445 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison Jessica Speigel terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/24/13. (mll, )
April 23, 2013 Filing 445 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 16, 2013 Filing 444 FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/13. (mll, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER adopting #433 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge; overruling objections, and granting #306 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, )
April 8, 2013 Filing 442 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF GEMALTO S.A.'S OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FEBRUARY 25, 2013 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [DKT. 433] (Baxter, Samuel)
March 29, 2013 Filing 441 RESPONSE to #437 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
March 29, 2013 Filing 440 RESPONSE to #437 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Sistos, Antonio)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting #438 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #438 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #437 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion. Responses due by 3/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/21/13. (mjc, )
March 20, 2013 Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #437 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 11, 2013 Filing 437 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Gemalto S.A. to #433 Report and Recommendations, filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 7, 2013 Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 2/12/13 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill E. McFadden, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 593-3213. (97 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2013. (tja, )
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Motion to to Relieve Parties of Upcoming Dedlines. ORDERED that the parties are relieved of all current docket control order deadlines in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/1/2013. (gsg)
February 28, 2013 Filing 434 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Agreed Motion to Relieve Parties of Upcoming Deadlines by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 25, 2013 Filing 433 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants Motion be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/25/2013. (gsg)
February 25, 2013 NOTICE that the pre-trial conference set for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. has been CANCELLED. (srg)
February 22, 2013 Filing 432 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #378 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 22, 2013 Filing 431 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #379 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 22, 2013 Filing 430 SEALED REPLY in support of Letter Brief requesting leave to file a Daubert motion excluding the testimony of Dr. Hellestrand and Mr. Landry #377 filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 22, 2013 Filing 429 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 22, 2013 Filing 428 MOTION to Strike #404 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 22, 2013 Filing 427 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #420 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 21, 2013 Filing 426 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #419 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 21, 2013 Filing 425 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B Elgin on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4009411. (Elgin, Andrew)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #417 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/20/13. cc:attys 2-20-13 (mll, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 423 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Defendants' Notice of Estimated Trial Time (Perlson, David)
February 19, 2013 Filing 422 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. ESTIMATES OF TIME FOR JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (Baxter, Samuel)
February 19, 2013 Filing 421 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 15, 2013 Filing 420 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motions in Limine by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 15, 2013 Filing 419 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 15, 2013 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION in Limine by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 15, 2013 Filing 417 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 14, 2013 Filing 416 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #379 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 415 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Gemalto S.A. to #380 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 414 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #377 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 413 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF FURTHER REDUCTION IN ASSERTED CLAIMS (Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2013 Filing 412 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Derek J Tang on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4000878. (Tang, Derek)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER denying #335 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions Concerning Android Devices Launched Since April 2012; denying #336 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/13/13. (mjc, )
February 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2013 re #335 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 filed by Gemalto S.A. (mjm)
February 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2013 re #336 MOTION to Compel FINANCIAL INFORMATION CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 filed by Gemalto S.A. (mjm, )
February 12, 2013 Filing 410 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sam Stake on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3997816. (Stake, Sam)
February 12, 2013 Filing 409 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Howard Y Chen on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3997687. (Chen, Howard)
February 12, 2013 Filing 408 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2013 re #385 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Obviousness of All Claims and Anticipation of Claim 3 of the '727 Patent filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC, #383 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Pre-Notice Damages filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC, #384 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm)
February 11, 2013 Filing 407 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 11, 2013 Filing 406 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #384 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement of Errata (Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2013 Filing 405 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #404 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 11, 2013 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #385 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Obviousness of All Claims and Anticipation of Claim 3 of the '727 Patent filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neeraj Gupta, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 11, 2013 Filing 403 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #383 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Pre-Notice Damages filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 11, 2013 Filing 402 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #384 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 11, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #398 Notice. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING #401 .*** (mjc, )
February 8, 2013 Filing 401 ***CORRECTED FILING. REPLACES #398 .***NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Perlson, David) Modified on 2/11/2013 (mjc, ).
February 8, 2013 Filing 400 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Joint Submission of Jury Materials (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
February 8, 2013 Filing 399 Sealed Document. Joint Final Pre-Trial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/11/2013 (gsg).
February 8, 2013 Filing 398 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED FILING #401 .***NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Perlson, David) Modified on 2/11/2013 (mjc, ).
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting #396 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/13. cc:attys 2-08-13 (mll, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 396 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 7, 2013 Filing 395 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Aaron Nelson on behalf of All Defendants (Nelson, David)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting #391 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-06-13 (mll, )
February 6, 2013 Filing 393 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Notice of Appearance of Counsel David A. Nelson (Jones, Michael) Modified on 2/7/2013 (gsg).
February 5, 2013 Filing 392 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL-TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Baxter, Samuel)
February 5, 2013 Filing 391 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 5, 2013 Filing 390 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Defendants' Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Jones, Michael)
February 5, 2013 Filing 389 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert B Wilson on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3986740. (Wilson, Robert)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/4/2013. (gsg)
February 4, 2013 Filing 387 Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 4, 2013 Filing 386 Redaction of 331 Transcript,,,. (tja, )
February 4, 2013 Filing 385 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Obviousness of All Claims and Anticipation of Claim 3 of the '727 Patent by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Palsberg, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Palsberg, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Palsberg, #5 Declaration of Cierniak, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25)(Perlson, David)
February 4, 2013 Filing 384 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgment of No Direct or Indirect Infringement by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Perlson, David)
February 3, 2013 Filing 383 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Pre-Notice Damages by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 382 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #317 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 1, 2013 Filing 381 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 1, 2013 Filing 380 Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 379 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 31, 2013 Filing 378 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #380 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 2/1/2013 (mll, ).
January 31, 2013 Filing 377 SEALED Letter Brief requesting leave to file a Daubert motion excluding the testimony of Dr. Hellestrand and Mr. Landry filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER denying #343 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment; granting #345 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment; granting #344 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment; granting #342 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file a motion for summary judgment. If parties would like oral argument on unfiled motions for summary judgment, parties should expedite briefing to have all Motions submitted no later than 10:00 A.M. on 2-04-2013, and all Responses due no later than 10:00 A.M. on 2-11-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/30/13. cc:attys 1-30-13(mll, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 375 SUR-REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #342 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2013 Filing 374 SUR-REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #345 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2013 Filing 373 SUR-REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #343 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2013 Filing 372 SUR-REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #344 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #336 MOTION to Compel FINANCIAL INFORMATION CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012, #335 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 : Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
January 28, 2013 Filing 371 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #345 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 28, 2013 Filing 370 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #344 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 28, 2013 Filing 369 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #343 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 28, 2013 Filing 368 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #342 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., filed by HTC Corporation, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC America Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 28, 2013 Filing 367 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #335 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition re #336 MOTION to Compel FINANCIAL INFORMATION CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 365 *** DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE WITH AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #335 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 1/28/2013 (gsg).
January 25, 2013 Filing 364 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #342 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 Filing 363 RESPONSE to #353 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) OBJECTION TO DOCUMENT STYLED "DEFENDANTS' ERRATA REGARDING NOTICE OF REDUCTION OF PRIOR ART REFERENCES" by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 Filing 362 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #339 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Errata Regarding Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of All Asserted Claims (Perlson, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 361 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #343 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 Filing 360 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #344 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 Filing 359 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief SEALED re #345 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Gemalto S.A. filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2013 Filing 358 ***FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. DISREGARD.*** Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/25/2013 (gsg).
January 24, 2013 Filing 357 SEALED AMENDED PATENT RESPONSE by Gemalto S.A. to #350 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #348 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on Gemalto's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Infringement. This is a text only order and no document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/23/13. (mjm)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #351 Motion to Redact re 331 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/23/2013. (gsg)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER AMENDING THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #352 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/23/2013. (gsg)
January 23, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #319 Notice (Other) Errata to Defendants' Notice of Reduction of Prior Art References (Perlson, David)
January 22, 2013 Filing 352 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 18, 2013 Filing 351 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 331 Transcript,,, by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 18, 2013 Filing 350 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Gemalto S.A. to #337 Sealed Document filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 18, 2013 Filing 349 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 18, 2013 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ON GEMALTO'S SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #346 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/15/13. cc:attys 1-15-13 (mll, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 346 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 345 SEALED Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment of no indirect infringement filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 344 SEALED Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment of no pre-notice damages for failure to comply with the requirements of 35 U.S.C. 287(a) filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 343 SEALED Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment of no willful infringement filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 11, 2013 Filing 342 Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting #340 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of All Asserted Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/11/13. (mjc, )
January 9, 2013 Filing 340 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of All Asserted Claims [#339] by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 9, 2013 Filing 339 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W)(Perlson, David)
January 8, 2013 Filing 338 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE ENTRY #339 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T, #2 Exhibit U, #3 Exhibit V, #4 Exhibit W)(Perlson, David) Modified on 1/9/2013 (gsg).
January 8, 2013 Filing 337 SEALED DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 56(C)(2) TO UNTIMELY AND IMPROPER SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
January 7, 2013 Filing 336 MOTION to Compel FINANCIAL INFORMATION CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 335 Opposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS CONCERNING ANDROID DEVICES LAUNCHED SINCE APRIL 2012 by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 334 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by David A Perlson re 331 Transcript,,,. (Perlson, David)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #332 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/03/13. cc:attys 1-03-13 (mll, )
January 2, 2013 Filing 332 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER Setting Oral Hearing on Motion #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/20/2012. (gsg)
December 19, 2012 Filing 329 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dirk D Thomas on behalf of Gemalto S.A.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3923467. (Thomas, Dirk)
December 19, 2012 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
December 19, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
December 17, 2012 Filing 328 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hugh Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Jeremy C. Andrus, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit G, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 14, 2012 Filing 327 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY.*** Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #309 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/17/2012 (gsg).
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/12. (mjc, )
December 13, 2012 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #309 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 13, 2012 Filing 324 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF FURTHER REDUCTION IN ASSERTED CLAIMS (Baxter, Samuel)
December 12, 2012 Filing 323 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela Marie Vorpahl on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Vorpahl, Angela)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #284 Sealed Patent Motion as directed at the bench. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/10/12. (mjc, )
December 7, 2012 Filing 320 RESPONSE to #319 Notice (Other) by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
December 6, 2012 Filing 319 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC OF REDUCTION OF PRIOR ART REFERENCES (Perlson, David)
December 5, 2012 Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2012 re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY filed by Gemalto S.A. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #315 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/05/12. cc:attys 12-05-12 (mll, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #314 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, )
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter John Ayers terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, )
December 4, 2012 Filing 315 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
December 3, 2012 Filing 314 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
December 3, 2012 Filing 313 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Peter J. Ayers by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 29, 2012 Filing 312 SEALED Sur-Reply In Response to Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
November 28, 2012 Filing 311 Joint MOTION Agreed Motion for Oral Hearing by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Reschedule Hearing. The hearing on Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel is rescheduled to 12-05-2012 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/21/12. cc:attys 11-21-12 (mll, )
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #308 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/21/12. cc:attys 11-21-12 (mll, )
November 21, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY. Motion Hearing reset for 12/5/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 308 Agreed MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 20, 2012 Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule the Hearing on the Emergency Motion to Compel by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 306 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Boldt, #3 Declaration of Jao, #4 Declaration of Kim, #5 Declaration of Swetland, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit P, #22 Exhibit Q, #23 Exhibit R, #24 Exhibit S)(Perlson, David)
November 16, 2012 Filing 305 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Radu A. Lelutiu, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #301 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/12. (mjc, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 303 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kristin J Madigan on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3871255. (Madigan, Kristin)
November 13, 2012 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew S Warren on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3871249. (Warren, Matthew)
November 9, 2012 Filing 301 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #298 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 6, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY: Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
November 5, 2012 Filing 300 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Isaac Peterson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/05/12. cc:attys 11-05-12(mll, )
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #297 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/05/12. cc:attys 11-05-12 (mll, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 297 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #294 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 2, 2012 Filing 296 Joint MOTION Agreed Motion For Entry of Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
October 24, 2012 Filing 295 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY Defendants' Surreply to Plaintiff's Request to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Discovery filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #283 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/23/12. cc:attys 10-23-12 (mll, )
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #275 Motion to Compel. Gemalto shall reduce the number of asserted claims to 1012 no later than 11-06-2012 and Defendants shall reduce the number of prior art references and any combinations thereof to be asserted in support of Defendant's anticipation or obviousness theories at trial no later than 11-20-2012. Absent extraordinary circumstances, a manageable number per claim is no more than 23 references. Defendants must also identify how these references will be used, i.e. anticipatory or in combination, against each asserted claim. Any motions to further limit the number of asserted claims or prior art references/combinations must be filed no later than 12-04-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/23/12. cc:attys 10-23-12 (mll, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 292 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY (REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO GEMALTO'S REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING) filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 23, 2012 Filing 291 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #283 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Perlson, David)
October 23, 2012 Filing 290 REPLY to Response to Motion re #275 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 22, 2012 Filing 289 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Cert of authority): #287 Sealed Response to Motion, #286 Sealed Response to Motion,.. (Perlson, David) Modified on 10/22/2012 (sm, ).
October 22, 2012 Filing 288 REPLY to Response to Motion re #283 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 21, 2012 Filing 287 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Perlson, David)
October 21, 2012 Filing 286 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #283 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Perlson, David)
October 19, 2012 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re #275 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peterson, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 19, 2012 Filing 284 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE DISCOVERY by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurie L. Fitzgerald, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 17, 2012 Filing 283 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #281 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Serve Second Supplemental Infringement Contentions against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3-6(b). This is a text only order and no document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/12. (mjm, )
October 12, 2012 Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying #276 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/4/2012. (gsg)
October 4, 2012 Filing 279 REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM [DKT. 275] MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM [DKT. 275] filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 3, 2012 Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM [DKT. 275] MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM [DKT. 275] filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER denying #266 Motion to Strike. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer on any necessary discovery deadline extensions in the Docket Control Order and any extension of the P.R. 3-6 (a)(2) deadline to amend invalidity contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/02/12. cc:attys 10-02-12 (mll, )
October 2, 2012 Filing 276 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM [DKT. 275] by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 2, 2012 Filing 275 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO SERVE AMENDED INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS THAT REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ALLEGED PRIOR ART REFERENCES TO NO MORE THAN FOUR (4) PER CLAIM by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pierre J. Hubert, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 28, 2012 Filing 274 Redaction of #236 Transcript,,,,. (tja, )
September 26, 2012 Filing 273 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #272 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion of Opposition (Jones, Michael)
September 25, 2012 Filing 272 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #266 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 24, 2012 Filing 271 REPLY to Response to Motion re #266 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
September 21, 2012 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2012: #4 CorrectedProposed Order) (gsg, ).
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #260 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request for leave to file motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/19/12. cc:attys 9-20-12(mll, )
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #267 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Second Amended Infringement Contentions by 9-21-2012. Defendants shall file their reply in support of their Motion to Strike by 9-25-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/17/12. cc:attys 9-17-12 (mll, )
September 14, 2012 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 14, 2012 Filing 266 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 14, 2012 Filing 265 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #260 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Filed by Gemalto S.A. by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Motion to Substitute Party. Motorola Mobility LLC is substituted for Motorola Mobility Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/12/12. cc:attys 9-13-12 (mll, )
September 12, 2012 Party Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC is SUBSTITUTED for Motorola Mobility Inc per #264 Order. (mll, )
September 10, 2012 Filing 263 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Motorola Mobility LLC for Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2012: #2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER denying #257 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/04/12. cc:attys 9-04-12 (mll, )
August 31, 2012 Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #257 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 31, 2012 Filing 260 Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Perlson, David)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/27/12. cc;attys 8-28-12 (mll, )
August 27, 2012 Filing 258 REPLY to Response to Motion re #254 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2012 Filing 257 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - L, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 27, 2012 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #254 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - L, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER that parties respond to #254 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Gemalto S.A., by 8-27-2012 at 12:00 pm CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/23/12. cc:attys 8-23-12(mll, )
August 22, 2012 Filing 254 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying #246 Motion to Stay; denying #247 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/12. (mjc, )
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying as moot Defendants' #250 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Surreply to Plaintiff Gemalto S.A.'s Amended Objections to the Magistrate Judge's 6/28/2012 Claim Construction Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/10/2012. (leh, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER overruling #244 pltf's objections, and adopting #242 Memorandum Opinion of the US Magistrate Judge as the Opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-09-12(mll, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 250 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #244 Response to Non-Motion (Surreply) by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 30, 2012 Filing 249 RESPONSE to #244 Response to Non-Motion REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS AMENDED OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S JUNE 28, 2012 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (DKT. 242) by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER adopting #241 Report & Recommendations, and granting in part #181 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/27/12. cc:attys 7-30-12 (mll, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 23, 2012 Filing 246 Joint MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 20, 2012 Filing 245 RESPONSE to #244 Response to Non-Motion Amended Objections to Claim Construction Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
July 10, 2012 Filing 244 RESPONSE to #242 Memorandum & Opinion AMENDED OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S JUNE 28, 2012 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 9, 2012 Filing 243 RESPONSE to #242 Memorandum & Opinion by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/12. cc:attys 6-28-12(mll, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 241 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc., Google Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, HTC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., be GRANTED-IN-PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/12. cc:attys 6-28-12(mll, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Motion to Redact Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-13-12 (mll, )
June 12, 2012 Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #236 Transcript,,,, by Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 8, 2012 Filing 238 Transcript Redaction Request re #236 Transcript,,,, by attorney Michael E Jones. (Jones, Michael)
June 5, 2012 Filing 237 RESPONSE to #234 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 5, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTIONS HEARING held on 5/29/12 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill E. McFadden, CSR, Sunbelt Reporting,Telephone number: (903) 593-3212; jmcfadden@sunbeltreporting.com. (130 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2012. (tja, )
June 1, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Supplemental Motion, entry 230, submitted. Should be filed as a notice. See entry #234 for corrected filing. (gsg)
May 31, 2012 Filing 234 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness Regarding the Declaration of Neeraj Gupta Submitted by Plaintiff Gemalto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 30, 2012 Filing 233 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #184 Sealed Patent Motion to disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from accessing confidential information under the protective order and acting as consultants in this matter. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff agreed not to utilize Teece as an expert against MMI. Teece may, however, serve as an expert against the remaining defendants. All other requests in Defendants motion are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/30/12. cc:attys 5-30-12 (mll, )
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #186 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/30/12. cc:attys 5-30-12 (mll, )
May 29, 2012 Filing 235 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2012 re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Gemalto S.A., #184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
May 29, 2012 Filing 230 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY #234 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sistos, Antonio) Modified on 6/1/2012 (gsg).
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $17,250.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 05-04-2012 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $34,500.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/29/12. cc:attys 5-29-12(mll, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 228 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Radu A Lelutiu for Gemalto S.A. (pkb, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #225 Motion to Amend/Correct. The deadline for Defendants to file a supplemental brief regarding Mr. Guptas expert declaration is extended from May 24, 2012 to May 29, 2012. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a responsive brief regarding Mr. Guptas expert declaration is extended from May 31, 2012 to June 5, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/25/2012. (gsg)
May 24, 2012 Filing 226 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurie L. Fitzgerald, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 24, 2012 Filing 225 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #199 Order on Motion to Strike,, by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Order granting the Parties' #222 Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/22/2012. (leh, )
May 21, 2012 Filing 223 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF GEMALTO S.A.'S SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David)
May 21, 2012 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 18, 2012 Filing 221 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peterson, #2 Exhibits A - L)(Perlson, David)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #219 Motion for leave to serve its First Amended and Supplemental Infringement Contentions against Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/18/12. cc:attys 5-18-12 (mll, )
May 17, 2012 Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 15, 2012 Filing 218 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL; Responses due by 5/18/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/15/12. cc:attys 5-15-12 (mll, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting in part #187 Sealed Patent Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/15/12. cc:attys 5-15-12 (mll, )
May 15, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL: Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
May 14, 2012 Filing 215 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #187 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peterson, #2 Exhibits A - S)(Perlson, David)
May 14, 2012 Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
May 14, 2012 Filing 213 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 5/3/12 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 593-3213. (116 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012. (tja, )
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting Defendants' #211 Emergency Motion to Strike Plaintiff's #209 Letter Brief. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Letter Brief is STRICKEN in its entirety. Plaintiff may file a 3 page brief putting forth its proposed construction for "resource constraints" by 5/15/2012, in compliance with the Local Rules. Defendants may respond by 5/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2012. (leh, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 211 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Letter Brief and Undisclosed Extrinsic Evidence by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #208 Motion for Extension of Time. Gemalto shall file its supplemental brief on 5-08-2012 and Defendants shall file a reply by 5-14-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/09/12. cc:attys 5-09-12 (mll, )
May 8, 2012 Filing 209 STRICKEN PER #212 COURT ORDER. Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Jeremy C. Andrus, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J-1, #14 Exhibit J-2, #15 Exhibit J-3, #16 Exhibit J-4)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 5/11/2012 (leh, ).
May 7, 2012 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File POST-MARKMAN BRIEFING by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 3, 2012 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 5/3/2012. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachment - Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL, #187 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER; Responses due by 5/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/02/12. cc:attys 5-02-12 (mll, )
May 1, 2012 Filing 205 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Baxter, Samuel)
May 1, 2012 Filing 204 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 1, 2012 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL, #187 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
May 1, 2012 Filing 202 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael)
April 30, 2012 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
April 30, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Ayers, Peter)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying #193 Motion to Strike. Defendants may depose Neeraj Gupta relating to his declaration attached to Plaintiffs response to Defendants summary judgment briefing (Doc. No. 191-1) and/or submit a declaration from Defendants own expert rebutting Dr. Guptas declaration. Defendants may submit a supplemental brief of no more than five pages by 5-24-2012. Plaintiff may file a responsive brief of no more than three pages by 5-31-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/12. cc:attys 4-30-12 (mll, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 198 REPLY to Response to Motion re #193 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Undisclosed Extrinsic Evidence and Claim Construction Notice of Waiver of Reply in Support filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Jones, Michael)
April 27, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter: Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
April 26, 2012 Filing 197 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peterson, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B)(Perlson, David)
April 26, 2012 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #193 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Undisclosed Extrinsic Evidence and Claim Construction filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 25, 2012 Filing 195 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #193 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Undisclosed Extrinsic Evidence and Claim Construction.. (Perlson, David)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying #192 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and jointly submit a claim construction chart listing each partys proposed construction for each of the terms to be addressed at the Markman hearing, including any terms purported to be indefinite. The parties should prioritize and list the terms in order of most importance; the Court will address the terms in the prioritized order presented in the claim construction chart. The parties shall submit the chart no later than 4-30-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/25/12. cc:attys 4-25-12 (mll, )
April 25, 2012 Filing 193 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Undisclosed Extrinsic Evidence and Claim Construction by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2012: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 24, 2012 Filing 192 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2012 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #188 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, and extending certain deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/23/12. cc:attys 4-23-12 (mll, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 189 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit BB, #3 Exhibit CC, #4 Exhibit DD)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 20, 2012 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 20, 2012 Filing 187 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Laurie Fitzgerald, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 18, 2012 Filing 186 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurie L. Fitzgerald, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 16, 2012 Filing 185 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Blair, #2 Declaration of Laurie L. Fitzgerald, #3 Declaration of David J. Teece, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 12, 2012 Filing 184 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Disqualify Dr. David J. Teece and Mr. John A. Blair from Accessing Confidential Information Under the Protective Order and Acting as Consultants in this Matter by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Laufert, #2 Declaration of I. Peterson, #3 Exhibit A - Teece online bio, #4 Exhibit B - Testimony List - Teece, #5 Exhibit C - 34_Blair_John_CV, #6 Exhibit D - BRG-MMI Consulting Agreement (redacted), #7 Exhibit E - 1823 Pacer Sheet, #8 Exhibit F - 595 Pacer Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit G - 700 Pacer Docket Sheet, #10 Exhibit H - 040612 email from Fitzgerals=d, #11 Exhibit I - 030612 Ltr to A. Spiegel re Feb 28 meet and confer, #12 Exhibit J - 032612 email from Fitzgerald, #13 Exhibit K - 032312 ltr to Harel from Peterson, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2012 Filing 183 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #184 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Opposed SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Proposed Consultants by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laufert, #2 Declaration of Peterson, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 CONF. Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 4/12/2012 (mll, ).
April 10, 2012 Filing 182 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME REQUESTED FOR THE MARKMAN HEARING (Cote, Robert)
April 2, 2012 Filing 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. Responses due by 4/20/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 2, 2012 Filing 180 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Guthery Depo Excerpts, #18 Wilkinson Depo Excerpts)(Sistos, Antonio)
March 29, 2012 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher James Mierzejewski on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Mierzejewski, Christopher)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/27/12. cc:attys 3-28-12(mll, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Michael Bellaire on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Bellaire, Todd)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Amend/Correct Order #171 . The deadline for parties to object to the appointment of Michael T. McLemore as a technical advisor in this case is extended 3-21-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/19/12. cc:attys 3-19-12 (mll, )
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/19/12. cc:attys 3-19-12 (mll, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Order No. 171 by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 16, 2012 Filing 173 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting Defendants' #158 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment of indefiniteness. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/7/2012. (leh, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying Defendants' #148 Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims to Six Claims Per Patent, without prejudice to reurging. The Court does however, ORDER Gemalto to reduce the number of asserted claims to a managaeable number no later than 9/14/2012. In order to simplify cases for claims construction, the Court ORDERS the parties to identify and prioritize all of the claim terms to be construed at the claim construction hearing and to submit a finalized agenda reflecting the list of prioritized terms no later than 4/27/2012. Further, should any party object to the Court's consideration of Michael T. McLemore as technical advisor in this case, objections should be filed in camera with the Court no later than 3/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/7/2012. (leh, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 170 Letter Brief filed by Gemalto S.A. (Cote, Robert)
February 28, 2012 Filing 169 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., re #157 Notice (Other) Amended PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sistos, Antonio)
February 28, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre Jean Hubert on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Hubert, Pierre)
February 28, 2012 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurie LaVigna Fitzgerald on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Fitzgerald, Laurie)
February 28, 2012 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Jessica Speigel on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Speigel, Allison)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File PR 4-5(a) Opening Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/27/12. cc:attys 2-27-12 (mll, )
February 25, 2012 Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(A) OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 24, 2012 Filing 163 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V1, #23 Exhibit V2, #24 Exhibit V3, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X1, #27 Exhibit X2, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Appendix 1, #31 Appendix 2, #32 Appendix 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 24, 2012 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Berger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 23, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. STATEMENT REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISORS (Baxter, Samuel)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/22/12. cc:attys 2-22-12 (mll, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 17, 2012 Filing 158 Letter Brief filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Perlson, David)
February 17, 2012 Filing 157 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Gemalto S.A., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sistos, Antonio)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #153 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #148 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims; Responses due by 2/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/16/12. cc:attys 2-17-12 (mll, )
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/16/12. cc:attys 2-17-12 (mll, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 15, 2012 Filing 153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #148 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/13/12. cc:attys 2-14-12 (mll, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for first mediation to be completed is extended to on or before 4-30-2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/10/12. cc:attys 2-10-12 (mll, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 150 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 9, 2012 Filing 149 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #137 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 31, 2012 Filing 148 MOTION to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2011-06-09 Gemalto's Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit B-2011 06 24 - Ltr to P Ayers (2), #3 Exhibit C- 8-22-11 RE_ Gemalto v. HTC et al, #4 Exhibit D- 9-29-11 RE_ Gemalto v. HTC et al, #5 Exhibit E- 12-1-11 Gemalto v HTC et al, #6 Exhibit F-12-15-11 RE_ Gemalto v. HTC, #7 Exhibit G- 12-20-11 RE_ Gemalto v. HTC, #8 Exhibit H- McKool ltr 1-12-12, #9 Exhibit I- 2011-01-13 Gemalto's PR 4-2 Disclosures, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12 (mll, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/24/12. cc:attys 1-24-12 (mll, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 145 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2012 Filing 144 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Joint Motion to Amend #84 Docket Control Order. The deadline for Privilege Logs to be exchanged by the parties is extended from 1/13/2012 to 1/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/12/12. (leh, )
January 11, 2012 Filing 142 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 10, 2012 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F Petrsoric on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Petrsoric, John)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying as moot #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/21/11. cc:attys 12-21-11 (mll, )
December 13, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Perlson, David)
December 5, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Gemalto S.A. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #135 Joint Motion to Amend 799 Docket Control Order. The deadline for first mediation to be completed is extended from 1/5/2012 to 2/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/23/11. (leh, )
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Order. The deadline for production of documents and things to be completed is extended from November 25, to December 2, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/11. cc:attys 11-22-11 (mll, )
November 22, 2011 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 21, 2011 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #83 Order by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. Defendants' #81 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/18/11. (leh, )
October 31, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC re #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, #131 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 is extended to 10-31-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/31/11. cc:attys 10-31-11 (mll, )
October 28, 2011 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-3 by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 is extended to 10-28-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/26/11. cc:attys 10-26-11 (mll, )
October 25, 2011 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-3 by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/14/11. cc:attys 10-17-11 (mll, )
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 is extended to 10-26-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/13/11. cc:attys 10-17-11 (mll, )
October 14, 2011 Filing 125 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shahar Harel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5A, #7 Exhibit 5B, #8 Exhibit 5C, #9 Exhibit 6A, #10 Exhibit 6B, #11 Exhibit 6C, #12 Exhibit 6D, #13 Exhibit 7A, #14 Exhibit 7B, #15 Exhibit 7C, #16 Exhibit 8, #17 Exhibit 9, #18 Exhibit 10A, #19 Exhibit 10B, #20 Exhibit 10C, #21 Exhibit 10D, #22 Exhibit 10E, #23 Exhibit 10F, #24 Exhibit 10G, #25 Exhibit 10H, #26 Exhibit 10I, #27 Exhibit 10J, #28 Exhibit 10K, #29 Exhibit 11, #30 Exhibit 12A, #31 Exhibit 12B, #32 Exhibit 12C, #33 Exhibit 13, #34 Exhibit 14, #35 Exhibit 15, #36 Exhibit 16)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 13, 2011 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages IN PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harel, Shahar)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-12-11 (mll, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 122 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 7, 2011 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Comply with P-R 3-3 by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/3/11. (mjc, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/3/11. (mjc, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 118 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Perlson, David)
September 30, 2011 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Additional Pages in Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 30, 2011 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Replies due by 9/30/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 20, 2011 Filing 113 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT GEMALTO'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO ROY PATEL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF GEMALTO'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-16-11 (mll, )
September 14, 2011 Filing 111 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #110 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, #2 Exhibit O-1, #3 Exhibit O-2, #4 Exhibit O-3, #5 Exhibit O-4, #6 Exhibit O-5, #7 Exhibit O-6, #8 Exhibit O-7, #9 Exhibit O-8, #10 Exhibit O-9, #11 Exhibit O-10, #12 Exhibit O-11, #13 Exhibit P-1, #14 Exhibit P-2, #15 Exhibit P-3, #16 Exhibit P-4, #17 Exhibit P-5, #18 Exhibit P-6, #19 Exhibit P-7, #20 Exhibit P-8, #21 Exhibit Q-1, #22 Exhibit Q-2, #23 Exhibit Q-3, #24 Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit T-1, #27 Exhibit T-2, #28 Exhibit T-3, #29 Exhibit T-4, #30 Exhibit U-1, #31 Exhibit U-2, #32 Exhibit U-3, #33 Exhibit U-4, #34 Exhibit U-5, #35 Exhibit V-1, #36 Exhibit V-2, #37 Exhibit V-3, #38 Exhibit V-4, #39 Exhibit W, #40 Exhibit X-1, #41 Exhibit X-2, #42 Exhibit X-3, #43 Exhibit X-4, #44 Exhibit X-5, #45 Exhibit X-6, #46 Exhibit Y, #47 Exhibit X, #48 Exhibit AA, #49 Declaration of Danita Maseles, #50 Declaration of Scott Guthery, #51 Declaration of Pehr Jansson, #52 Declaration of Ksheerabdhi Krisha, #53 Declaration of Michael Montgomery, #54 Declaration of Roy Patel, #55 Declaration of Tim Wilkinson, #56 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 14, 2011 Filing 110 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Handley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit C-4, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J-1, #15 Exhibit J-2, #16 Exhibit J-3, #17 Exhibit J-4, #18 Exhibit J-5, #19 Exhibit J-6, #20 Exhibit J-7, #21 Exhibit J-8, #22 Exhibit J-9, #23 Exhibit J-10, #24 Exhibit J-11, #25 Exhibit J-12, #26 Exhibit K-1, #27 Exhibit L, #28 Exhibit M-1, #29 Exhibit M-2, #30 Exhibit M-3, #31 Exhibit M-4, #32 Exhibit M-5, #33 Exhibit M-6, #34 Exhibit M-7, #35 Exhibit M-8, #36 Exhibit M-9, #37 Exhibit M-10 Part 1, #38 Exhibit M-10 Part 2, #39 Exhibit M-10 Part 3, #40 Exhibit M-11, #41 Exhibit M-12)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 14, 2011 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFF GEMALTO S.A.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Harlan A Martin added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-06-11(mll, )
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Responses due by 9/14/2011. The Court will not entertain any further requests for extensions of time to respond to Defendants Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-06-11 (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 31, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Harlan A. Martin, filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER regarding submission of proposed technical advisors, letter briefs and briefing schedule for claim construction/summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-19-11(mll, )
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for parties to notify the Court of an agreed upon Mediator is extended to 9-01-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/08/11. cc:attys 8-09-11 (mll, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 1, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Gemalto S.A. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Responses due by 8/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/27/11. cc:attys 7-27-11 (mll, )
July 27, 2011 Filing 99 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrea Pallios Roberts for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (mll, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elaine M Chao terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/25/11. cc:attys 7-25-11 (mll, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 18, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura A Handley on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Handley, Laura)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Responses due by 8/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/14/11. cc:attys 7-14-11 (mll, )
July 12, 2011 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 30, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 (Baxter, Samuel)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Responses due by 7/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/30/11. cc:attys 6-30-11 (mll, )
June 29, 2011 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California; Responses due by 7/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/09/11. cc:attys 6-09-11 (mll, )
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for pltf to comply with PR 3-2 is extended to 6-23-2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/09/11. cc:attys 6-09-11 (mll, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 8, 2011 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 8, 2011 Filing 85 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Isaac S Peterson for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (mll, )
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 3-01-2012. Discovery due by 9/14/2012. Expert Witness List due by 7/25/2012; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 8-24-2012. Identify trial witnesses by 9/14/2012; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 9-28-2012. Joinder of Parties due by 6/9/2011, for pltf; 10-12-2011, for defts. Jury instructions due by 12/15/2012. Mediation Completion due by 1/5/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2012; Responses to Dispositive Motions due 10-16-2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2012. Motions in Limine due 2-05-2013; Responses to Motions in Limine due 2-14-2013. Jury Selection set for 3/4/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/3/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/03/11. cc:attys 6-03-11(mll, )
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/3/2011. (gsg)
June 2, 2011 Filing 82 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order, #3 Proposed Docket Control Order, #4 Proposed Discovery Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 31, 2011 Filing 81 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Peterson in Support, #2 Exhibits to Decl. of Peterson, #3 Decl. of Davis in Support, #4 Decl. of Whaley in Support, #5 Decl. of Maron in Support, #6 Decl. of Kang in Support, #7 Decl. of Rochford in Support, #8 Decl. of Peyret in Support)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2011: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
May 27, 2011 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are granted an extension to 5-27-2011 to file a proposed docket control order and discovery order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/23/11. cc:attys 5-23-11 (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 18, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin P.B. Johnson on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Johnson, Kevin)
May 18, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Perlson, David)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. It is therefore ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 is extended to June 9, 2011, the deadline for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 is extended to October 12, 2011, and the deadline for the parties to submit a proposed docket control order and discovery order is extended to May 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/9/2011. (kls, )
May 6, 2011 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 5-09-2011 to file a proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/03/11. cc:attys 5-03-11 (mll, )
May 2, 2011 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aaron Gabriel Fountain; Mark D Fowler; Robert Buergi and Brian K Erickson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/26/11. cc:attys 4-26-11 (mll, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian K. Erickson, Aaron Fountain, Mark Fowler and Robert Buergi by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties are granted an extension to 5-02-2011 to file a proposed docket control order and discovery order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/18/11. cc:attys 4-18-11 (mll, )
April 15, 2011 Filing 68 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 15, 2011 Filing 67 **PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY WILL REFILE WITH CORRECT DOCUMENT **Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File A PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 4/15/2011 (rml, ).
April 15, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 67, Motion for ext of time. ATTY WILL REFILE PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Markman Hearing set for 5/3/2012 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 3/4/2013 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/11/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/12/2011. (gsg)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/11. cc:attys 4-11-11(mll, )
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Extend Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-1, P.R. 3-2, P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/5/11. (mjc, )
April 4, 2011 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm )
April 4, 2011 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Order, Set Hearings by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 3, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Bufe, John)
March 28, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Bufe, John)
March 18, 2011 Filing 59 ANSWER to #39 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemalto S.A..(Baxter, Samuel)
March 18, 2011 Filing 58 ANSWER to #37 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemalto S.A..(Baxter, Samuel)
March 18, 2011 Filing 57 ANSWER to #38 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Gemalto S.A..(Baxter, Samuel)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/4/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11(mll, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc. HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (mll, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (mll, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward J DeFranco for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (mll, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean S Pak for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (mll, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph Milowic, III for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc. (mll, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elaine M Chao for Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (mll, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exedea, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for Exedea, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
March 1, 2011 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for HTC Corporation. (Gardner, Allen)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Dismiss. Deft Motorola Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/11. cc:attys 3-01-11 (mll, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE by Gemalto S.A. NOTICE OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Baxter, Samuel)
February 25, 2011 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint, by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC.(Erickson, Brian)
February 25, 2011 Filing 39 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemalto S.A. by Motorola Mobility, Inc..(Gardner, Allen)
February 25, 2011 Filing 38 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemalto S.A. by Google Inc..(Gardner, Allen)
February 25, 2011 Filing 37 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gemalto S.A. by HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Exedea, Inc..(Gardner, Allen)
February 24, 2011 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Motorola, Inc. Without Prejudice by Gemalto S.A., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 18, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Perlson, David)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for all defts to answer, move, or otherwise respond is extended to 2-25-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/11. cc:attys 2-14-11 (mll, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 33 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 9, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Jones, Michael)
February 9, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Gardner, Allen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Erickson, Brian)
January 31, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC (Fountain, Aaron)
January 28, 2011 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Buergi for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (mll, )
January 28, 2011 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Fowler for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (mll, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es))(kls, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/10. cc:attys 12-15-10(mll, )
December 3, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola, Inc. to 1/31/2011; Google Inc. to 1/31/2011. 32 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 2, 2010 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
December 2, 2010 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 30, 2010 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to HTC America Inc. on 11/9/2010, by personal service; answer due: 11/30/2010. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung Telecommunications America LLC on 11/9/2010, by personal service; answer due: 11/30/2010. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to Motorola, Inc. on 11/9/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to Google Inc. on 11/9/2010, by personal service. (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung defts shall have to 1-31-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/10. cc:attys 11-30-10 (mll, )
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defts HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc, and Exedea Inc shall have to 1-31-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/10. cc:attys 11-30-10 (mll, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 29, 2010 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, AND STIPULATION OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 29, 2010 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 12/30/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 17, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
November 17, 2010 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2010 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola, Inc. to 12/30/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Lawrence Smith on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Smith, Geoffrey)
November 9, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(kls, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A Cote, Jr on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Cote, Robert)
November 1, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter John Ayers on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Ayers, Peter)
November 1, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shahar Harel on behalf of Gemalto S.A. (Harel, Shahar)
October 29, 2010 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Schubert for Gemalto S.A.. (mll, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
October 27, 2010 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gemalto S.A. identifying Corporate Parent Gemalto N.V. for Gemalto S.A.. (Baxter, Samuel)
October 22, 2010 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2728876.), filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 22, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Exedea, Inc., Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2728876.), filed by Gemalto S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gemalto S.A. v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea, Inc.
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc.
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Elaine M Chao
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Sean S Pak
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Sam Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: Aaron Gabriel Fountain
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Robert Buergi
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Represented By: Derek J Tang
Represented By: Aaron Gabriel Fountain
Represented By: Robert B Wilson
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kristin J Madigan
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Brian K Erickson
Represented By: Howard Y Chen
Represented By: Sam Stake
Represented By: Matthew S Warren
Represented By: Andrew B Elgin
Represented By: Isaac S Peterson
Represented By: Robert Buergi
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Harlan A Martin
Represented By: Harlan A Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael McLemore
Represented By: Michael Thomas McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemalto S.A.
Represented By: John Francis Petrsoric
Represented By: Pierre Jean Hubert
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Kevin Robert Schubert
Represented By: Laura A Handley
Represented By: Laurie LaVigna Fitzgerald
Represented By: Dirk Dion Thomas
Represented By: Todd Michael Bellaire
Represented By: Christopher James Mierzejewski
Represented By: Robert A Cote, Jr
Represented By: Allison Jessica Speigel
Represented By: Radu A Lelutiu
Represented By: Peter John Ayers
Represented By: Geoffrey Lawrence Smith
Represented By: Shahar Harel
Represented By: Angela Vorpahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?