Unified Messaging Solutions LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Unified Messaging Solutions LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Charter Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Comerica Incorporated, Comerica Bank, eHarmony, Inc., E*TRADE Financial Corporation, E*TRADE Bank, LinkedIn Corporation, Match.com, Inc., Regions Financial Corporation, Regions Bank, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Cequel Communications, LLC, True Beginnings, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc., TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation
Counter_claimant: Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC and TXU Energy Retail Company LLC
Counter_defendant: Unified Messaging Solutions LLC
Case Number: 6:2011cv00120
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Denton
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2011 Filing 229 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Maxwell on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Maxwell, David)
September 8, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of Cequel Communications, LLC, Windstream Corporation (Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 7-12-2012. Discovery due by 4/1/2013. Expert Witness List due by 1/14/2013; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 2-13-2013. Identify trial witnesses by 6/18/2013; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 6-28-2013. Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2011, for pltf; 12-16-2011 for defts. Jury instructions due by 7/16/2013. Mediation Completion due by 8/8/2012. Hon. Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this case. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2013; Response to Dispositive Motions due 7-22-2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2013. Jury Selection set for 9/3/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/01/11. cc:attys 9-02-11(mll, )
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/01/11. cc:attys 9-02-11(mll, )
September 1, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Robert W Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this case. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 225 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Bostic for Comcast Corporation. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 224 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthias Andreas Kamber for Comcast Corporation. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 223 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Silbert for Comcast Corporation. (mll, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 222 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 225 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Bostic for Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (mll, ) Modified on 8/31/2011 (mll, ).
August 31, 2011 Filing 221 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 224 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthias Andreas Kamber for Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (mll, ) Modified on 8/31/2011 (mll, ).
August 31, 2011 Filing 220 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 223 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Silbert for Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (mll, ) Modified on 8/31/2011 (mll, ).
August 30, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher C Smith on behalf of Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated (Smith, Christopher)
August 30, 2011 Filing 218 Submission of Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control amd Discovery Orders by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 29, 2011 Filing 217 Defendant Facebook, Inc. ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, by Facebook, Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
August 29, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re Advisory to the Court re Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Motion for Transfer)(Keefe, Heidi)
August 29, 2011 Filing 215 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, by Comcast Corporation.(Dacus, Deron)
August 29, 2011 Filing 214 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by eHarmony, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 213 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, and Defenses by ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation.(Guaragna, John)
August 29, 2011 Filing 212 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Charter Communications, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 211 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation.(Walsh, Thomas)
August 29, 2011 Filing 210 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, by Verizon Data Services LLC.(Siebman, Clyde)
August 29, 2011 Filing 209 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by TXU Energy Retail Company LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 208 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 207 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Match.Com LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 206 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by LinkedIn Corporation.(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 205 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
August 29, 2011 Filing 204 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Cequel Communications, LLC.(Rambo, Rick)
August 29, 2011 Filing 203 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Windstream Corporation.(Rambo, Rick)
August 29, 2011 Filing 202 Defendant's ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 201 AMENDED ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, by True Beginnings, LLC. (Hilton, Zachary)
August 29, 2011 Filing 200 Defendant's ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Regions Bank.(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 199 Defendant's ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Regions Financial Corporation.(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 198 ANSWER to 187 Amended Complaint,,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated.(Jakubowski, Matthew)
August 26, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC Regarding Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Nelson, Edward)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Research in Motion Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-25-11 (mll, )
August 23, 2011 Filing 195 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Research in Motion Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 186 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-22-11 (mll, )
August 18, 2011 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taj Jamar Clayton on behalf of Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, Match.Com LLC, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Reliant Energy, Inc., TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, eHarmony, Inc. (Clayton, Taj)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER - Markman Hearing set for 9/13/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 9/3/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael G Rhodes on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael)
August 15, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 15, 2011 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sudhir Anantrai Pala on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Pala, Sudhir)
August 12, 2011 Filing 187 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Cequel Communications, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation, Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Match.Com LLC, Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc., TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, True Beginnings, LLC, Verizon Data Services LLC, Windstream Corporation, eHarmony, Inc., filed by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2011: # 6 Exhibit E Searchable) (mjc, ).
August 9, 2011 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/9/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 179 Order, Set Hearings Regarding Plaintiff's P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures and Defendants' P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 8, 2011 Filing 185 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Verizon Data Services LLC (Siebman, Clyde)
August 8, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Wade Hilton on behalf of True Beginnings, LLC (Hilton, Zachary)
August 5, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Lance Johnson on behalf of ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation (Johnson, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation (Frost, Claudia)
July 21, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, LinkedIn Corporation, Match.Com LLC, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, eHarmony, Inc. (Du, Jane)
July 20, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Marie Haddock on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Haddock, Alison)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/9/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-11-11(mll, )
June 15, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Bittner, Michael)
June 6, 2011 Filing 177 RESPONSE to 174 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Regions Financial Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
June 6, 2011 Filing 176 RESPONSE to 173 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Regions Bank by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
June 6, 2011 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation for Regions Bank; Corporate Parent None for Regions Financial Corporation. (Jones, Michael)
June 6, 2011 Filing 174 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Regions Financial Corporation.(Jones, Michael)
June 6, 2011 Filing 173 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Regions Bank.(Jones, Michael)
May 31, 2011 Filing 172 RESPONSE to 168 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Verizon Data Services LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 31, 2011 Filing 171 RESPONSE to 166 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Match.com, LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 27, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC of Request for Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward)
May 26, 2011 Filing 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Data Services LLC (Molster, Charles)
May 26, 2011 Filing 168 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Verizon Data Services LLC.(Molster, Charles)
May 26, 2011 Filing 167 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match.Com LLC identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActiveCorp for Match.Com LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 26, 2011 Filing 166 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Match.Com LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/11. cc:attys 5-26-11 (mll, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 164 RESPONSE to 128 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendant Research in Motion Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 26, 2011 Filing 163 RESPONSE to 108 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Comerica Incorporated and Comerica Bank by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 26, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Verizon Data Services LLC (Molster, Charles)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Research in Motion Corporation shall have to 5-13-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/25/11. cc:attys 5-25-11 (mll, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 160 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cequel Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
May 25, 2011 Filing 159 RESPONSE to 125 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 158 RESPONSE to 107 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Cequel Communications, LLC d/b/a Suddenlink Communications by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 157 RESPONSE to 110 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Windstream Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 156 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan J Heinrich for Research In Motion Corporation (mll, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 155 RESPONSE to 97 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant TXU Energy Retail Company LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 154 RESPONSE to 119 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 153 RESPONSE to 117 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant LinkedIn Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 152 RESPONSE to 121 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant eHarmony. Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 24, 2011 Filing 151 RESPONSE to 95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Atmos Energy Corporation and Atmos Energy Services, LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
May 23, 2011 Filing 150 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cequel Communications, LLC. (Rambo, Rick)
May 23, 2011 Filing 149 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Windstream Corporation. (Rambo, Rick)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion to Withdraw, and withdrawing 90 Motion to Dismiss. Regions Financial Corporation and Regions Bank shall have to 6-06-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/23/11. cc:attys 5-23-11 (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 90 MOTION to Dismiss by Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Substitute Party. Match.Com LLC added; Match.com, Inc. terminated. Match.com LLC shall have five business days from the date of this Order to answer pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/11. cc:attys 5-19-11 (mll, )
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 106 Motion to Substitute Party. Verizon Data Services LLC added; Verizon Communications, Inc. terminated. Verizon Data Services LLC shall have five business days from the date of entry of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/11. cc:attys 5-19-11 (mll, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 144 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard de Bodo for ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation. (mll, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 143 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew V Devkar for ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation. (mll, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 142 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Morgan Chu for Research In Motion Corporation. (mll, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 141 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric B Hanson for Research In Motion Corporation. (mll, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 140 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrei Iancu for Research In Motion Corporation. (mll, )
May 17, 2011 Filing 139 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Reginald J Hill for Charter Communications, Inc.. (mll, ) Modified on 5/17/2011 (mll, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2011: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
May 17, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation (Richardson, Michael)
May 16, 2011 Filing 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by True Beginnings, LLC (Allen, Vincent)
May 16, 2011 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 13, 2011 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
May 13, 2011 Filing 134 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Facebook, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
May 13, 2011 Filing 133 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charter Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 132 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Charter Communications, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 131 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by True Beginnings, LLC.(Allen, Vincent)
May 13, 2011 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comcast Corporation (Dacus, Deron)
May 13, 2011 Filing 129 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Comcast Corporation.(Dacus, Deron)
May 13, 2011 Filing 128 Defendant Research in Motion Corporation's Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Research In Motion Corporation.(Redden, Joe)
May 13, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
May 13, 2011 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 125 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2011 Filing 124 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent E*TRADE Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent E*TRADE Bank Holdings for. (Guaragna, John)
May 13, 2011 Filing 123 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation.(Guaragna, John)
May 13, 2011 Filing 122 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eHarmony, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 121 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by eHarmony, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 120 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NRG Energy, Inc. for Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 119 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 118 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation (McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 117 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by LinkedIn Corporation.(McNabnay, Neil)
May 13, 2011 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Walsh, Thomas)
May 13, 2011 Filing 115 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A..(Walsh, Thomas)
May 13, 2011 Filing 114 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comerica Bank identifying Corporate Parent Comerica Incorporated for Comerica Bank, Comerica Bank. (Jakubowski, Matthew)
May 13, 2011 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comerica Incorporated (Jakubowski, Matthew)
May 13, 2011 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Match.com, LLC for Match.com, Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 13, 2011 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Windstream Corporation (Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2011 Filing 110 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Windstream Corporation.(Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2011 Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cequel Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Corporate Parent Cebridge Connection Holdings, LLC (fka Classic Holdco LLC), Corporate Parent Cequel Communications Corp., Corporate Parent Cequel Communications Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cequel Communications Holdings II, LLC for Cequel Communications, LLC. (Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2011 Filing 108 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated.(Jakubowski, Matthew)
May 13, 2011 Filing 107 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Cequel Communications, LLC.(Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2011 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Verizon Data Services LLC for Verizon Communications Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 13, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 88 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Charter Communications, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 13, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 94 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 13, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 102 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comcast Corporation to 5/13/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 100 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. All claims in this action by pltf against deft Reliant Energy Inc are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/11/11. cc:attys 5-12-11(mll, )
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 99 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. All claims in this action by pltf against deft Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/11/11. cc:attys 5-12-11(mll, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford P Lyerla on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc. (Lyerla, Bradford)
May 10, 2011 Filing 102 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comcast Corporation.( Dacus, Deron)
May 10, 2011 Filing 101 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Gennari for Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation. (mll, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 100 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Reliant Energy, Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 10, 2011 Filing 99 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 9, 2011 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TXU Energy Retail Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Energy Future Holdings Corp. for TXU Energy Retail Company LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 9, 2011 Filing 97 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by TXU Energy Retail Company LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
May 9, 2011 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Atmos Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Atmos Engery Holdings, Inc. for Atmos Energy Services, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 9, 2011 Filing 95 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Unified Messaging Solutions LLC by Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil)
May 9, 2011 Filing 94 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Weinstein, Mark)
May 9, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation (Caracappa, John)
May 9, 2011 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regions Financial Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Regions Financial Corporation. (Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2011 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Regions Bank identifying Corporate Parent Regions Financial Corporation for Regions Bank. (Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2011 Filing 90 MOTION to Dismiss by Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation (Gardner, Allen)
May 6, 2011 Filing 88 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Charter Communications, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
May 5, 2011 Filing 87 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re True Beginnings, LLC.( Allen, Vincent)
May 5, 2011 Filing 86 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 5, 2011 Filing 85 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reliant Energy, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 5, 2011 Filing 84 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Match.com, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 5, 2011 Filing 83 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LinkedIn Corporation. (McNabnay, Neil)
May 5, 2011 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 76 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ETRADE Financial Corporation to 5/13/2011; ETRADE Bank to 5/13/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 75 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for T-Mobile USA, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 77 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 83 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LinkedIn Corporation to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 85 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Reliant Energy, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 86 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 87 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Beginnings, LLC to 5/13/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 78 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 84 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 79 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Bank to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 80 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Incorporated to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 81 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bank of America, N.A. to 5/13/2011; Bank of America Corporation to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 4, 2011 Filing 81 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A..( Walsh, Thomas)
May 4, 2011 Filing 80 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Incorporated.( Lee, Lance)
May 4, 2011 Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Bank.( Lee, Lance)
May 4, 2011 Filing 78 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications Inc.( Molster, Charles)
May 3, 2011 Filing 77 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony, Inc..( Hult, Matthew)
May 3, 2011 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation.( Guaragna, John)
May 3, 2011 Filing 75 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re T-Mobile USA, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
May 3, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Davis on behalf of Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Cequel Communications, LLC, Windstream Corporation (Davis, Thomas)
May 3, 2011 Filing 73 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windstream Corporation.( Rambo, Rick)
May 3, 2011 Filing 72 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Cequel Communications, LLC.( Rambo, Rick)
May 3, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 72 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC to 5/13/2011; Cequel Communications, LLC to 5/13/2011. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 3, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 73 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Windstream Corporation to 5/13/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Yungwirth, Matthew)
April 29, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Norwood Jameson on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Jameson, Louis)
April 29, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 69 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 28, 2011 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc..( Molster, Charles)
April 28, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (Molster, Charles)
April 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 67 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comcast Corporation to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 15, 2011 Filing 67 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comcast Corporation.( Dacus, Deron)
April 12, 2011 Filing 66 Return of Service Executed as to Comcast Corporation on 3/21/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 65 Return of Service Executed as to ETRADE Bank on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 64 Return of Service Executed as to Atmos Energy Corp. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 63 Return of Service Executed as to Atmos Energy Services, LLC on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 62 Return of Service Executed as to Bank of America Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 61 Return of Service Executed as to Bank of America, N.A. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 60 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC as to Charter Communications, Inc. Service rejected because Corporation Trust Company is no longer agent. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 59 Return of Service Executed as to Charter Communications, Inc. on 3/21/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 58 Return of Service Executed as to Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 57 Return of Service Executed as to Cequel Communications, LLC on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 56 Return of Service Executed as to Comerica Bank on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 55 Return of Service Executed as to Comerica Incorporated on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 54 Return of Service Executed as to ETRADE Financial Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 53 Return of Service Executed as to eHarmony, Inc. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 52 Return of Service Executed as to Windstream Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 51 Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 50 Return of Service Executed as to Facebook, Inc. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 49 Return of Service Executed as to LinkedIn Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 48 Return of Service Executed as to Match.com, Inc. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 47 Return of Service Executed as to Regions Bank on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 46 Return of Service Executed as to Regions Financial Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 45 Return of Service Executed as to Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 44 Return of Service Executed as to Research In Motion Corporation on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 43 Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 42 Return of Service Executed as to True Beginnings, LLC on 3/21/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Filing 41 Return of Service Executed as to TXU Energy Retail Company LLC on 3/18/2011, by personal service. (mll, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER for the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/12/11. (mjc, )
April 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 38 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Charter Communications, Inc. to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Windstream Corporation's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 5-09-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/11. cc:attys 4-08-11 (mll, )
April 8, 2011 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Charter Communications, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 32 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Bank to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 34 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ETRADE Financial Corporation to 5/11/2011; ETRADE Bank to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 33 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comerica Incorporated to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 35 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TXU Energy Retail Company LLC to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 37 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Windstream Corporation to 5/11/2011. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windstream Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
April 7, 2011 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, on behalf of Defendant Windstream Corporation by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
April 7, 2011 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TXU Energy Retail Company LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
April 6, 2011 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation.( Guaragna, John)
April 6, 2011 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Incorporated.( Lee, Lance)
April 6, 2011 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comerica Bank.( Lee, Lance)
April 6, 2011 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Cequel Communications, LLC.( Carroll, Otis)
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 26 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 28 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for eHarmony, Inc. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 27 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Reliant Energy, Inc. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 29 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LinkedIn Corporation to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 31 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC to 5/9/2011; Cequel Communications, LLC to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc. Deadline is extended to 5/9/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/5/11. (mjc, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LinkedIn Corporation.( Weinstein, Mark)
April 5, 2011 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eHarmony, Inc..( Hult, Matthew)
April 5, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Facebook, Inc. answer due 5/9/2011. (mjc, )
April 4, 2011 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reliant Energy, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
April 4, 2011 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
April 4, 2011 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, on behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
April 1, 2011 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Match.com, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
April 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 20 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ban of America, N.A. to 5/9/2011; Bank of America Corporation to 5/9/2011. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 21 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Regions Financial Corporation to 5/9/2011; Regions Bank to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 19 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for T-Mobile USA, Inc. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 24 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Match.com, Inc. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 23 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Beginnings, LLC to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re True Beginnings, LLC.( Allen, Vincent)
March 31, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Jerome Allen on behalf of True Beginnings, LLC (Allen, Vincent)
March 30, 2011 Filing 21 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including May 9, 2011 re Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation. (Jones, Michael)
March 29, 2011 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation.( Walsh, Thomas)
March 28, 2011 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including May 9, 2011 re T-Mobile USA, Inc. ( Jones, Michael)
March 28, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Edwards, Stephen)
March 25, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 16 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atmos Energy Corp. to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 25, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 13 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Corporation to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 25, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 17 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atmos Energy Services, LLC to 5/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 23, 2011 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atmos Energy Services, LLC.( McNabnay, Neil)
March 23, 2011 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atmos Energy Corp..( McNabnay, Neil)
March 21, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Redden, Joe)
March 21, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation (Richardson, Michael)
March 21, 2011 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( Richardson, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Reliant Energy, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc., TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, True Beginnings, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Windstream Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Comerica Incorporated, ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation, Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Match.com, Inc., Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation, eHarmony, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, Ban of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Cequel Communications, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Comerica Bank, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Albritton, Eric)
March 16, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Cecil, Thomas)
March 16, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie Brow Lindsey on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Lindsey, Christie)
March 16, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Brent)
March 16, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Nelson, Edward)
March 15, 2011 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Unified Messaging Solutions LLC (Ward, Thomas)
March 15, 2011 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation for Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Hill, Jack)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atmos Energy Corp., Atmos Energy Services, LLC, Ban of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Cequel Communications Holdings I, LLC, Cequel Communications, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Comerica Bank, Comerica Incorporated, ETRADE Bank, ETRADE Financial Corporation, Facebook, Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Match.com, Inc., Regions Bank, Regions Financial Corporation, Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC, Reliant Energy, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, T-Mobile USA, Inc., TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, True Beginnings, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Windstream Corporation, eHarmony, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2935933.), filed by Unified Messaging Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unified Messaging Solutions LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unified Messaging Solutions LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Brent Nelson Bumgardner
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Cecil
Represented By: Stephen E Edwards
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christie Brow Lindsey
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmos Energy Corp.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmos Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Bradford P Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Incorporated
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHarmony, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Hult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Financial Corporation
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Bank
Represented By: John M Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Mark R Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Match.com, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Financial Corporation
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Bank
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Energy Retail Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Joe W Redden, Jr
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cequel Communications, LLC
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Rick L Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Beginnings, LLC
Represented By: Vincent Jerome Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Matthew Sean Yungwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TXU Energy Retail Company LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Rick L Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Atmos Energy Corp.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Atmos Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TXU Energy Retail Company LLC
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Unified Messaging Solutions LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Brent Nelson Bumgardner
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Cecil
Represented By: Stephen E Edwards
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christie Brow Lindsey
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Brent Nelson Bumgardner
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Cecil
Represented By: Stephen E Edwards
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christie Brow Lindsey
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?