Klausner Technologies, Inc. v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Klausner Technologies, Inc. and IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: XO Communications, LLC, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, NEC Corporation of America, Mitel Networks, Inc., XO Communications, Inc., Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc., PAETEC Holding Corp., PAETEC Corp., Toshiba America, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Windstream Communications, Inc., NEC Corporation, Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation, PAETEC Communications, Inc., Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., ShoreTel, Inc. and Windstream Corporation
Not Classified By Court: James Knowles and Michael McLemore
Case Number: 6:2011cv00231
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting #377 Motion to Dismiss. The cause and all claims between Klausner Technologies, Inc., Klausner's successor in interest, IPVX Holdings, Inc., and Defendants PAETEC Communications, PAETEC Corp., and PAETECHolding Corp. are dismissed, without prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/13. (mll, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 377 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER. For ease of reference, the Courts claim interpretations are set forth in a table in Appendix A. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/2013. (gsg)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #374 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between Plaintiff and Defendants Primus Telecommunications Group Inc and Primus Telecommunications Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, ) Modified on 4/30/2013 (mll, ).
April 29, 2013 Filing 374 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2013 Filing 373 NOTICE of Settlement by IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2013 Filing 372 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. (Franzini, Simon)
March 25, 2013 Filing 371 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Aaron Luner on behalf of IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. (Luner, Sean)
March 25, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
March 25, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2013 Filing 368 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #315 Motion to Substitute Party. IPVX Holdings Inc is now joined as a party to this suit; however, Klausner will also remain a party to the suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, )
March 25, 2013 Notice to attorneys: IPVX Patent Holdings Inc has been added as a newly joined Plaintiff to this civil action per #367 Order. Counsel for IPVX should make their appearance by filing a Notice of Appearance. (mll, )
March 15, 2013 Filing 366 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 1/29/13 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2013. (sms, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/06/13. cc:attys 3-06-13(mll, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #362 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file an Amended Docket Control Order is extended to 3-05-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/06/13. cc:attys 3-06-13 (mll, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 363 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 5, 2013 Filing 362 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Docket Control Order by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Motion to extend deadlines. ORDERED to submit an amended docket control order within five days of the issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/2013. (gsg)
February 22, 2013 Filing 360 MOTION For Extenstion of Certain Deadlines by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting #358 Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13 (mll, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 358 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL CONSULTANT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/31/13. cc:attys 1-31-13(mll, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing and Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2013 re #315 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: #1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk)
January 25, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #315 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 25(C) : Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 355 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Franzini, Simon)
January 3, 2013 Filing 354 P.R. 4-5(d) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P.R. 4-5(d) Chart)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #352 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-5(d) is hereby extended to 1-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/12. cc:attys 12-21-12 (mll, )
December 20, 2012 Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of P.R. 4-5(d) Deadline by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2012 Filing 351 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re Privilege Logs (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2012 Filing 350 NOTICE by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Lateef, Irfan)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #348 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-5(d) is hereby extended to 12-20-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/07/12. cc:attys 12-07-12 (mll, )
December 6, 2012 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-5(d) Chart by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #346 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12 (mll, )
December 3, 2012 Filing 346 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Reply Claim Construction Brief by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2012 Filing 345 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2012 Filing 344 NOTICE by Klausner Technologies, Inc. OF ESTIMATED AMOUNT OF TIME REQUESTED FOR MARKMAN HEARING (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2012 Filing 343 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Jones, Michael)
November 28, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 12/13/2012 AT 9:00 am HAS BEEN CONTINUED AND MARKMAN HEARING RESET TO 1/29/2013 AT 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf)
November 23, 2012 Filing 342 NOTICE by PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp. re #341 Response to Non-Motion, Notice of Joinder in Primus Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Paetec Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief Regarding Specific Claim Terms)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
November 23, 2012 Filing 341 RESPONSE to #337 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,, RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Lee, Lance)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #338 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to comply with P.R. 45(b) is extended to 11-23-2012. However, the deadline for Plaintiff to comply with P.R. 45(c) is not extended. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/12. cc:attys 11-19-12 (mll, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re Privilege Log (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2012 Filing 338 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Certain Deadlines by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
November 13, 2012 Filing 337 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Order, #2 Exhibit B - P.R. 4-3, #3 Exhibit C - '576 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '818 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - Claim Construction Brief, #6 Exhibit 1 to Claim Construction Brief, #7 Exhibit 2 to Claim Construction Brief, #8 Exhibit 3 to Claim Construction Brief, #9 Exhibit 4 to Claim Construction Brief, #10 Exhibit 5 to Claim Construction Brief, #11 Exhibit 6 to Claim Construction Brief, #12 Exhibit 7 to Claim Construction Brief, #13 Exhibit 8 to Claim Construction Brief, #14 Exhibit 9 to Claim Construction Brief, #15 Exhibit 10 to Claim Construction Brief, #16 Exhibit 11 to Claim Construction Brief, #17 Exhibit 12 to Claim Construction Brief, #18 Exhibit 13 to Claim Construction Brief, #19 Exhibit 14 to Claim Construction Brief, #20 Exhibit 15 to Claim Construction Brief, #21 Exhibit 16 to Claim Construction Brief, #22 Exhibit 17 to Claim Construction Brief, #23 Exhibit 18 to Claim Construction Brief, #24 Exhibit 19 to Claim Construction Brief, #25 Exhibit 20 to Claim Construction Brief, #26 Exhibit 21 to Claim Construction Brief, #27 Exhibit 22 to Claim Construction Brief, #28 Exhibit 23 to Claim Construction Brief, #29 Exhibit 24 to Claim Construction Brief, #30 Exhibit 25 to Claim Construction Brief, #31 Exhibit F - Reply Claim Construction Brief, #32 Exhibit 25 to Reply Claim Construction Brief, #33 Exhibit 26 to Reply Claim Construction Brief, #34 Exhibit 27 to Reply Claim Construction Brief)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE by Klausner Technologies, Inc. of Compliance - Technology Tutorial (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #334 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit technology tutorials is extended to 11-15-2012; the deadline for Klausner to comply with P.R. 4-5(a) is extended to 11-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/12. cc:attys 11-02-12 (mll, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 334 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Certain Deadlines by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER appointing Michael McLemore as technical advisor to the Court in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/12. cc:attys 10-15-12(mll, )
October 4, 2012 Filing 332 AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2012 Filing 331 NOTICE by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re Technical Advisor (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/26/12. cc:attys 9-27-12(mll, )
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER re #327 Claim Construction Chart, filed by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., PAETEC Holding Corp., PAETEC Corp., Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to reduce the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number, and to file an amended P.R. 4-3 Statement by October 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/26/2012. (gsg)
September 25, 2012 Filing 328 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Protective Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 24, 2012 Filing 327 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Chart)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 31, 2012 Filing 326 NOTICE by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc. Notice of Disclosure (P.R. 4-2; Prelminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence) (Lee, Lance)
August 23, 2012 Filing 325 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re P.R. 4-2 and Privilege Log (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice. It is ordered that all claims between Klausner and Toshiba are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/3/2012. (leh, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 323 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Klausner Technologies, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/02/12. cc:attys 7-03-12 (mll, )
June 29, 2012 Filing 321 RESPONSE in Opposition re #315 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 25(C) filed by PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 29, 2012 Filing 320 NOTICE by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Wilcox, Melvin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #317 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are stayed 30 days from the date of this Order with respect to Klausner and Toshiba. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/12. cc:attys 6-29-12 (mll, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 317 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 19, 2012 Filing 316 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Lateef, Irfan)
June 12, 2012 Filing 315 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Party PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 25(C) by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Klausner, #2 Exhibit A - Assignment, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER denying #289 Motion for Limited Markman Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/12. cc:attys 6-07-12 (mll, )
June 7, 2012 Filing 313 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Toshiba's Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Lateef, Irfan)
June 7, 2012 Filing 312 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Lateef, Irfan)
June 4, 2012 Filing 311 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2012 Filing 310 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #289 Joint MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Joint Motion for Limited Markman Hearing filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER denying as moot #222 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/29/12. cc:attys 5-29-12 (mll, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Amend/Correct Order of Dismissal. All claims between Klausner and j2 are dismissed, with prejudice to the refiling of same. Ordered that the Order of Dismissal #305 is vacated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/25/12. (mjc, )
May 24, 2012 Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #305 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 24, 2012 Filing 306 REPLY to Response to Motion re #289 Joint MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Joint Motion for Limited Markman Hearing filed by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Lateef, Irfan)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ***VACATED PER #308 ORDER.***ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ordered that all claims between Siemens and j2 are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/24/2012. (leh, ) Modified on 5/25/2012 (mjc, ).
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting Defendants' #302 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants have until 6/6/12 to comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4; and Defendants have until 6/15/2012 to comply with P.R. 4-1. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/24/2012. (leh, )
May 24, 2012 Filing 303 NOTICE by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
May 23, 2012 Filing 302 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-3, P.R. 3-4, and P.R. 4-1 for all Defendants by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lateef, Irfan)
May 23, 2012 Filing 301 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re Initial, Damages and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #298 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between pltf and defts Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings Inc are dismissed, with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/16/12. cc:attys 5-16-12 (mll, )
May 16, 2012 Filing 299 NOTICE by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc. For Termination of Electronic Notices (Kordziel, Linda)
May 15, 2012 Filing 298 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 14, 2012 Filing 297 NOTICE by J2 Global Communications, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (McSwane, Douglas)
May 11, 2012 Filing 296 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #295 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Reply Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit 3 - Claim Construction Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 11, 2012 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #289 Joint MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Joint Motion for Limited Markman Hearing filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order granting #292 Agreed Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the cause and all claims against Defendants Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Electronics America Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. All costs are assessed aginst the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/11/2012. (leh, )
May 9, 2012 Filing 293 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Lateef, Irfan)
May 8, 2012 Filing 292 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 8, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Motion to Dismiss, entry #291 . Not in PDF Searchable Format. To be refiled by attorney. (gsg)
May 7, 2012 Filing 291 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY.*** Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 5/8/2012 (gsg).
May 7, 2012 Filing 290 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
April 30, 2012 Filing 289 Joint MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Joint Motion for Limited Markman Hearing by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Detrixhe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lateef, Irfan)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #286 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this civil action are stayed to 5-10-2012 with respect to Klausner and Samsung defts. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/12. cc:attys 4-27-12 (mll, )
April 26, 2012 Filing 287 NOTICE by XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTIFICATION (Corrado, John)
April 26, 2012 Filing 286 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
April 24, 2012 Filing 285 NOTICE by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Levy, David)
April 18, 2012 Filing 284 NOTICE by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (as to Michael E. Renaud, Stephen P. Cole and Courtney M. Quish) (Richardson, Michael)
April 18, 2012 Filing 283 NOTICE by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (as to Michael E. Richardson) (Richardson, Michael)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2012; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 10-11-2012. Discovery due by 3/15/2013. Expert Witness List due by 2/4/2013; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 2-13-2013. Identify trial witnesses by 3/29/2013; Rebuttal Trial Witnesses identified by 4-10-2013. Joinder of Parties due by 3/19/2012, for pltf; 5-23-2012 for defts. Jury instructions due by 9/27/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2013; Response to Dispositive Motions due 4-26-2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2013. James Knowles is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 12/13/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/12. cc:attys 4-17-12(mll, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/12. cc:attys 4-17-12(mll, )
April 16, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. James Knowles is appoionted as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the above-entitled cause are stayed to 4-26-2012 with respect to Klausner and Samsung. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/13/12. cc:attys 4-13-12 (mll, )
April 12, 2012 Filing 279 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
April 12, 2012 Filing 278 Joint MOTION for entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and defts XO Communications Inc and XO Communications LLC are DISMISSED. Each party will bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/12. cc:attys 4-10-12 (mll, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 276 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
April 9, 2012 Filing 275 Joint MOTION to Dismiss - Voluntary by Klausner Technologies, Inc., XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #273 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to File their proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order is extended to 4-12-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/03/12. cc:attys 4-03-12 (mll, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 273 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #270 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Klausner to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 with respect to XO Communications is extended to 4-09-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/02/12. cc:attys 4-02-12 (mll, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 271 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Klausner Technologies, Inc. re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 for PAETEC Entities (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2012 Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 for XO Communications, Inc. and XO Communications, LLC by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #268 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this cause are stayed to 4-12-2012 with respect to Klausner and Samsung. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/29/12. cc:attys 3-29-12 (mll, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 268 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Lance Lee for Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr and Deborah J Race terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/12. cc:attys 3-26-12 (mll, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Local Counsel by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis)
March 21, 2012 Filing 265 NOTICE by Klausner Technologies, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #261 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Klausner to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 with respect to PAETEC is extended to 4-02-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/20/12. cc:attys 3-20-12 (mll, )
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #260 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for to file their proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order is extended to 4-02-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/20/12. cc:attys 3-20-12 (mll, )
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #259 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Klausner to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 with respect to XO is extended to 4-02-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/20/12. cc:attys 3-20-12 (mll, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 for PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., and PAETEC Holdings Corp. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2012 Filing 260 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Klausner Technologies, Inc., PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
March 19, 2012 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 for XO Communications, Inc. and XO Communications, LLC by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 Filing 258 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott W Doyle for Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (mll, )
March 8, 2012 Filing 257 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan R DeFosse for Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc.. (mll, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 03-19-2012. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 03-19-2012 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 03-09-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/12. cc:attys 3-08-12(mll, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 3/5/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In sheet) (rlf, )
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #252 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Klausner to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 is extended to 3-19-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/02/12. cc:attys 3-02-12 (mll, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #251 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and defts Mitel Networks Corporation and Mitel Networks Inc are dismissed, with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/01/12. cc:attys 3-01-12 (mll, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 29, 2012 Filing 251 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Mitel Networks Corporation and Mitel Networks, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #249 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this cause are stayed 30 days from the date of this Order with respect to pltf and Samsung defts. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/12. cc:attys 2-28-12 (mll, )
February 27, 2012 Filing 249 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement re Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Defendants Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. and Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co. KG are dismissed with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/12. cc:attys 2-23-12 (mll, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 247 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 21, 2012 Filing 246 NOTICE of Settlement by Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E); Responses due by 2/27/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/21/12. cc:attys 2-21-12 (mll, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (Race, Deborah)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and defendants NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America are dismissed, with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/12. cc:attys 2-21-12 (mll, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 16, 2012 Filing 241 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendants NEC Corporation and NEC Corporation of America by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/5/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/14/12. cc:attys 2-14-12(mll, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 239 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael E Anderson (Anderson, Michael)
February 14, 2012 Filing 238 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P Corrado on behalf of XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC (Corrado, John)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) ; Responses due by 2/20/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/12. cc:attys 2-03-12 (mll, )
February 2, 2012 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #233 Motion to Dismiss. Pltf's claims against Windstream defts are dismissed with prejudice with respect to Windstream branded products. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/12. cc:attys 1-30-12 (mll, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 234 NOTICE by Klausner Technologies, Inc. of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Capshaw, Sidney)
January 27, 2012 Filing 233 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #231 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E); Responses due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/18/12. cc:attys 1-18-12 (mll, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #229 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1-24-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/11/12. cc:attys 1-11-12 (mll, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 229 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 10, 2012 Filing 228 RESPONSE to #225 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
January 10, 2012 Filing 227 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Enterprise Networks Holdings, Inc. for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael)
January 10, 2012 Filing 226 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba Corporation, Corporate Parent Toshiba America, Inc. for Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (Lateef, Irfan)
January 10, 2012 Filing 225 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc..(Lateef, Irfan)
January 10, 2012 Filing 224 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba Corporation (Lateef, Irfan)
January 10, 2012 Filing 223 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Toshiba Corporation.(Lateef, Irfan)
January 6, 2012 Filing 222 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(6) or Alternatively for a More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(E) by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen P. Cole, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltf against deft ShoreTel, Inc, and all counterclaims by ShoreTel are dismissed, with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/12. cc:attys 1-05-12 (mll, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER that no further extensions of time to answer will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/12. cc:attys 1-05-12(mll, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #215 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1-06-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/12. cc:attys 1-05-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-03-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #213 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:attys 1-03-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Filing 216 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss ShoreTel, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 3, 2012 Filing 215 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 27, 2011 Filing 214 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Corporation and Windstream Communications Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luner, Sean)
December 22, 2011 Filing 213 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #211 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-30-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/15/11. cc:attys 12-15-11 (mll, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 211 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #208 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-27-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/11. cc:attys 12-14-11 (mll, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-27-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/11. cc:attys 12-14-11 (mll, )
December 13, 2011 Filing 208 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 12, 2011 Filing 207 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-16-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #202 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 12-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 203 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 29, 2011 Filing 202 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 29, 2011 Filing 201 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #198 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #198 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation. Answer due by 11/29/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/11. (mjc, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #197 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #197 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Answer due 12/2/11. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/16/11. (mjc, )
November 16, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. answer due 12/2/2011. (mjc, )
November 16, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Windstream Communications, Inc. answer due 11/29/2011; Windstream Corporation answer due 11/29/2011. (mjc, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 198 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 15, 2011 Filing 197 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #194 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #194 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including November 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/2011. (gsg)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #192 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #192 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Answer is due 11/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (mjc, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 194 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. answer due 11/18/2011. (mjc, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #191 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including November 15, 2011.Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/2011. (gsg)
November 9, 2011 Filing 192 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 8, 2011 Filing 191 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 2, 2011 Filing 190 RESPONSE to #186 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
November 2, 2011 Filing 189 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent for Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 2, 2011 Filing 188 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 1, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
November 1, 2011 Filing 186 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 11-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 11-01-11 (mll, )
October 28, 2011 Filing 184 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 11-11-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/11. cc:attys 10-27-11 (mll, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 182 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 21, 2011 Filing 181 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R Paul Zeineddin for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (mll, )
October 20, 2011 Filing 180 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Joseph Barta for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (mll, )
October 20, 2011 Filing 179 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Neil P Sirota for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (mll, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #174 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #174 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation. Answer is due 11/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/11. (mjc, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #173 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #173 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Answer due 10/28/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/11. (mjc, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #172 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Answer due 11/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/11. (mjc, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #171 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Answer is due 11/1/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/19/11. (mjc, )
October 19, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. answer due 11/1/2011; Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. answer due 11/1/2011; Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. answer due 10/28/2011; Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. answer due 11/1/2011; Windstream Communications, Inc. answer due 11/1/2011; Windstream Corporation answer due 11/1/2011. (mjc, )
October 18, 2011 Filing 174 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 18, 2011 Filing 173 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 18, 2011 Filing 172 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 18, 2011 Filing 171 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #168 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10-21-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/11/11. cc:attys 10-11-11 (mll, )
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/11. cc:attys 10-07-11 (mll, )
October 7, 2011 Filing 168 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #165 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Answer is due by 10/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/11. (mjc, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #164 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. Answer is due by 10/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/5/11. (mjc, )
October 5, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. answer due 10/18/2011; Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. answer due 10/18/2011. (mjc, )
October 5, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. answer due 10/18/2011. (mjc, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 165 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 4, 2011 Filing 164 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Windstream Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10-18-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, )
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/28/11. cc:attys 9-28-11 (mll, )
September 27, 2011 Filing 161 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 26, 2011 Filing 160 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 23, 2011 Filing 159 RESPONSE to #157 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
September 22, 2011 Filing 158 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc. (Kordziel, Linda)
September 22, 2011 Filing 157 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by Mitel Networks, Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.(Kordziel, Linda)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #153 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-22-11 (mll, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11 (mll, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to 10-04-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11 (mll, )
September 20, 2011 Filing 153 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 19, 2011 Filing 152 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 19, 2011 Filing 151 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #149 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #149 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. Answer due by 9/30/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/14/11. (mjc, )
September 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. answer due 9/30/2011. (mjc, )
September 13, 2011 Filing 149 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 13, 2011 Filing 148 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John P Corrado for XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC (mll, )
September 13, 2011 Filing 147 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E Anderson for XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC (mll, )
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the Windstream Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-20-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/09/11. cc:attys 9-09-11 (mll, )
September 8, 2011 Filing 145 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Windstream Communications, Inc. and Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Mitel Networks Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-22-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/07/11. cc:attys 9-08-11 (mll, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-20-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/07/11. cc:attys 9-08-11 (mll, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 142 RESPONSE to #137 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-21-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, )
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alcatel-Lucent defendants shall have to 9-20-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, )
September 6, 2011 Filing 139 RESPONSE to #130 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
September 6, 2011 Filing 138 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hanna F Madbak for J2 Global Communications, Inc. (mll, )
September 6, 2011 Filing 137 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Bufe, John)
September 6, 2011 Filing 136 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Bufe, John)
September 6, 2011 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Bufe, John)
September 6, 2011 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Bufe, John)
September 6, 2011 Filing 133 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Mitel Networks Corporation and Mitel Networks, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 6, 2011 Filing 132 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 2, 2011 Filing 131 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J2 Global Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for J2 Global Communications, Inc.. (McSwane, Douglas)
September 2, 2011 Filing 130 j2 Global Communications, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by J2 Global Communications, Inc..(McSwane, Douglas)
September 2, 2011 Filing 129 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 2, 2011 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 29, 2011 Filing 127 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp. identifying Corporate Parent PAETEC Holding Corp. for PAETEC Corp. ; Corporate Parent PAETEC Corp. for PAETEC Communications, Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 26, 2011 Filing 126 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victor Siber for J2 Global Communications, Inc.. (mll, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Windstream Communications, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant J2 Global Communications, Inc. has to 9-06-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/23/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Samsung Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-05-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alcatel-Lucent Defendants shall have to 9-06-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, )
August 22, 2011 Filing 119 RESPONSE to #116 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ShoreTel, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Luner, Sean)
August 22, 2011 Filing 118 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Windstream Communications, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 22, 2011 Filing 117 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ShoreTel, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
August 22, 2011 Filing 116 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by ShoreTel, Inc..(Cordell, Ruffin)
August 22, 2011 Filing 115 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 22, 2011 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by J2 Global Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
August 22, 2011 Filing 113 ANSWER to #108 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2011 Filing 112 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 19, 2011 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 19, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
August 19, 2011 Filing 109 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Samsung Entities by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 18, 2011 Filing 108 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., PAETEC Communications, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc. Claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant, Toshiba America, Inc., are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2011 Filing 105 ANSWER to #99 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc..(Luner, Sean)
August 10, 2011 Filing 104 ANSWER to #97 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc..(Luner, Sean)
August 10, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER to #94 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Klausner Technologies, Inc..(Luner, Sean)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Toshiba defts have to 8-22-2011, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung Defendants shall have to 8-22-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 8-22-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by XO Communications, LLC, XO Communications, Inc..(Lee, Lance)
August 8, 2011 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
August 8, 2011 Filing 97 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc..(Carroll, Otis)
August 8, 2011 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by ShoreTel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
August 8, 2011 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America identifying Corporate Parent NEC Corporation for NEC Corporation of America. (Levy, David)
August 8, 2011 Filing 94 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Klausner Technologies, Inc. by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America.(Levy, David)
August 5, 2011 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lateef, Irfan)
August 5, 2011 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
August 5, 2011 Filing 91 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. have to 8-22-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-05-11 (mll, )
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mitel defts have to 9-08-2011, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-05-11 (mll, )
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp. and PAETEC Holding Corp. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 8-18-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/11. cc:attys 8-05-11 (mll, )
August 4, 2011 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 4, 2011 Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Move or otherwise Respond to Complaint by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kordziel, Linda)
August 4, 2011 Filing 85 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re PAETEC Entities by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 3, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher O Green on behalf of ShoreTel, Inc. (Green, Christopher)
August 3, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Noah Graubart on behalf of ShoreTel, Inc. (Graubart, C.)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Siemens shall have to 9-07-20ll to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/11. cc:attys 8-03-11 (mll, )
August 2, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Shore Tel has to 8-08-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, )
July 25, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Klausner Technologies, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2011 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by ShoreTel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting Agreed Motion #76 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #76 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re PAETEC Entities. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED and the deadline for Defendants PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp. and PAETEC Holding Corp. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including August 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/21/2011. (kls, )
July 20, 2011 Filing 76 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re PAETEC Entities by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 13, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/11/11. cc:attys 7-12-11(mll, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Toshiba has up to and including 8-08-2011, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, )
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Windstream Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 8-08-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Siemens Enterprise Communications Inc shall have to 8-08-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-07-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alcatel-Lucent defts shall have to 8-08-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-07-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for PAETEC defts to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 7-21-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/11. cc:attys 7-07-11 (mll, )
July 7, 2011 Filing 67 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Windstream Corporation by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 6, 2011 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
July 5, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 5, 2011 Filing 64 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re PAETEC Entities by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ShoreTel, Inc. to 7/22/2011. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ShoreTel, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. XO Communications defts shall have to 8-08-2011 to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/11. cc:attys 6-28-11 (mll, )
June 24, 2011 Filing 61 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re XO Communications Inc. and XO Communications, LLC by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Primus defts shall have to 8-08-2011 to answer or respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/23/11. cc:attys 6-23-11 (mll, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 59 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, re Primus Entities by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 21, 2011 Filing 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Phillip A Bennett for Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 57 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Detrixhe for Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (mll, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig S Summers on behalf of Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. (Summers, Craig)
June 17, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irfan A Lateef on behalf of Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. (Lateef, Irfan)
June 17, 2011 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Renaud for Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (mll, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen P Cole for Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (mll, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Courtney Quish for Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.. (mll, )
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Mitel has up to and including August 9, 2011, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/14/2011. (gsg)
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #41 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PAETEC Holding Corp. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft.) Modified on 6/10/2011 (mll, ).
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #40 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PAETEC Corp. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft.) Modified on 6/10/2011 (mll, ).
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #39 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PAETEC Communications, Inc. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft.)( mll, )
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #42 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #46 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for XO Communications, LLC to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft.)( mll, )
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #36 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #45 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for XO Communications, Inc. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by pltf on behalf of deft.)( mll, )
June 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #43 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kordziel, Linda)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Toshiba has to 7-07-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-08-11 (mll, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert W Busby for NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (mll, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 3, 2011 Filing 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re XO Communications, LLC.( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 3, 2011 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re XO Communications, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC have until and through August 8, 2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/2011. (kls, )
June 3, 2011 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 3, 2011 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
June 3, 2011 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PAETEC Holding Corp..( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 3, 2011 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PAETEC Corp..( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 3, 2011 Filing 39 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PAETEC Communications, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney)
June 2, 2011 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
June 2, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Bufe, John)
June 2, 2011 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc..( Richardson, Michael)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. NEC defts shall have to 8-08-2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/31/11. cc:attys 6-01-11 (mll, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, and Stipulation by Klausner Technologies, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David)
May 27, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #27 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Windstream Corporation to 7/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. NEC Corporation waiver signed on 5/25/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (mll, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed as to Mitel Networks, Inc. on 5/20/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/10/2011. (mll, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 30 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George R McGuire for PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp. (mll, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp. (Gunter, Debra)
May 24, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 24, 2011 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Windstream Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
May 23, 2011 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to J2 Global Communications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to NEC Corporation of America on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to PAETEC Communications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to PAETEC Corp. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to PAETEC Holding Corp. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to Primus Telecommunications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to ShoreTel, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Toshiba America, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Windstream Communications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Windstream Corporation on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to XO Communications, Inc. on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 23, 2011 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to XO Communications, LLC on 5/17/2011, by personal service; answer due: 6/7/2011. (mll, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Windstream Communications, Inc., Windstream Corporation, XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es))(kls, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, ShoreTel, Inc., Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(kls, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NEC Corporation, PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(kls, )
May 16, 2011 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es))(kls, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Aaron Luner on behalf of Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Luner, Sean)
May 10, 2011 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 10, 2011 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc., J2 Global Communications, Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel Networks, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, PAETEC Communications, Inc., PAETEC Corp., PAETEC Holding Corp., Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc., Primus Telecommunications, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, ShoreTel, Inc., Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Windstream Communications, Inc., Windstream Corporation, XO Communications, Inc., XO Communications, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3026223.), filed by Klausner Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '576 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '818 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 10, 2011 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klausner Technologies, Inc. v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Communications, LLC
Represented By: John P Corrado
Represented By: Michael E Anderson
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Represented By: Neil Phillip Sirota
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Rafik Paul Zeineddin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitel Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Communications, Inc.
Represented By: John P Corrado
Represented By: Michael E Anderson
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Parker Cole
Represented By: Courtney M Quish
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAETEC Holding Corp.
Represented By: George R McGuire
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAETEC Corp.
Represented By: George R McGuire
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Craig S Summers
Represented By: Jonathan I. Detrixhe
Represented By: Irfan A Lateef
Represented By: Phillip A Bennett
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Irfan A Lateef
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primus Telecommunications, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R DeFosse
Represented By: Deborah J Race
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Scott W Doyle
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primus Telecommunications Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R DeFosse
Represented By: Deborah J Race
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Scott W Doyle
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitel Networks Corporation
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAETEC Communications, Inc.
Represented By: George R McGuire
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Enterprise Communications GmBH & Co. KG
Represented By: Stephen Parker Cole
Represented By: Courtney M Quish
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Phillip Sirota
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Rafik Paul Zeineddin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba American Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Craig S Summers
Represented By: Jonathan I. Detrixhe
Represented By: Irfan A Lateef
Represented By: Phillip A Bennett
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J2 Global Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Victor Siber
Represented By: Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr
Represented By: Hanna F Madbak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Neil Phillip Sirota
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Rafik Paul Zeineddin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShoreTel, Inc.
Represented By: C. Noah Graubart
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Christopher O Green
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windstream Corporation
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klausner Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Aaron Luner
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPVX Patent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Sean Aaron Luner
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: James Knowles
Represented By: James W Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael McLemore
Represented By: Michael Thomas McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?