Scott v. Pfizer Pharmaceutical Featured Case

A Texas inmate files a pro se product liability lawsuit against Pfizer, alleging that taking the drug Bextra "was the proximate cause of his heart attack, dizziness, depression, mood changes, weight gain, and nausea."

Plaintiff: Harril Glen Scott
Defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceutical
Case Number: 6:2011cv00276
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: Judith K. Guthrie
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. CASE: 6:11-cv-00276.DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:12-cv-02033, filed 04/24/2012. (mll, )
April 20, 2012 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California San Francisco Division. (mll, )
April 19, 2012 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-131) transferring this civil action to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division, and assigned to the MDL Docket of the Hon. Charles R Breyer. (MDL 1699 In re: Bextra and Celebrex Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation) (mll, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment, or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Harril Glen Scott. (mll, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Pending Transfer to the Northern District of California and to the MDL 1699 Docket. (mll, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER adopting 18 Report & Recommendations, and denying 8 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/02/12. cc:pltf 2-03-12 (mll, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Harril Glen Scott as to 18 Report and Recommendations. (mll, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Pfizer Pharmaceutical, and forwarded to the US Marshal for service. (mll, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Clerk issue and the US Marshal serve process on defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 01/04/12. cc:pltf 1-05-12(mll, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Harril Glen Scott, be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 01/04/12. cc:pltf 1-05-12(mll, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 01/04/12. cc:pltf 1-05-12 (mll, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot 4 Motion to Submit New Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 01/04/12. cc:pltf 1-05-12 (mll, )
January 3, 2012 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pfizer Pharmaceutical, filed by Harril Glen Scott.(mll, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 Report and Recommendations, and granting 11 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Harril Glen Scott. Plaintiffs request to dismiss Dr. Tisdale is GRANTED and that the Defendant Dr. Duane Tisdale is hereby dismissed as a party to this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/12. cc:pltf 1-04-12(mll, )
October 17, 2011 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Harril Glen Scott as to 12 Report and Recommendations, on 10-12-11. (mll, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Harril Glen Scott, be granted and that the deft Dr Duane Tisdale be dismissed as a party to this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 10/06/11. cc:pltf 10-07-11(mll, )
August 24, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Harril Glen Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(mll, )
August 19, 2011 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Harril Glen Scott as to 9 Report and Recommendations, on 8-16-11. (mll, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 1 Complaint filed by Harril Glen Scott, be dismissed without prejudice for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 08/05/11. cc:pltf 8-08-11(mll, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by Harril Glen Scott. (mjc, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Harril Glen Scott as to 6 Order Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee, on 6-28-11. (mll, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. The Clerk shall file pltf's pleadings without prepayment of the filing fee. Pltf is not required to pay an initial partial filing fee. Pltf shall pay $350, the balance of the full filing fee, in monthly installments, and pay 20 percent of each deposit made into his trust account. Pltf's Motion 2 to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith K. Guthrie on 06/23/11. cc:pltf 6-24-11(mll, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Harril Glen Scott. (mll, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Submit New Evidence by Harril Glen Scott. (mjc, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Guthrie (gsg)
May 31, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed with data sheet by Harril Glen Scott. (gsg)
May 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pfizer Pharmaceutical, filed by Harril Glen Scott. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Cover Letter/Envelope)(gsg)
May 31, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Guthrie. (gsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Pfizer Pharmaceutical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harril Glen Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceutical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?