Warren v. Rupter et al
Plaintiff: Marion C Warren
Defendant: John Rupter, Mark Fryhoff, Lawann Shead and Larry Young
Case Number: 6:2011cv00388
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment on Qualified Immunity and Response to Warren's Objections to Magistrate's Report and to His Request for Injunctive Relief filed by Leonard D Young, Lawann Shead. ORDERED that the civil action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/16/2013. (gsg)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 55 Report and Recommendations on default judgment. ORDERED that the Plaintiffs motion for a default judgment (docket no. 24) is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/9/2012. (gsg)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 27 Report and Recommendations. It is ordered that the Plaintiff's 22 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/9/2012. (leh, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that the plaintiff's claims against defendants Warden Rupert and LT Poole are DISMISSED with prejudice as frivolous and they are ORDERED dismissed as parties from this lawsuit. Th e dismissal of these claims will have no effect on the plaintiff's claims against the defendants Officer Shead and Sgt. Young. The dismissal of these claims and parties shall not count as a strick for purposes of 28 USC 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/11. (leh, ) Modified on 11/14/2011 (leh, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Rupter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion C Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rupter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fryhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawann Shead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?