Network-1 Technologies, Inc v. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Network-1 Security Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings Inc., Allied Telesis Holdings K.K., Allied Telesis, Inc., Avaya Inc., AXIS Communications AB, AXIS Communications, Inc., Dell Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Juniper Networks, Inc., Motorola Solutions, Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, Polycom, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Shoretel, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc. and Transition Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2011cv00492
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER ADOPTING 978 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge as those of the Court. In light of the foregoing, it is ORDERED that Network-1's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Estop pel (Docket No. 811 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, HP is estopped from asserting the following obviousness arguments at trial: (1) obviousness over Lehr in view of Woodmas and Chang; and (2) obviousness over Yano in view of Woodmas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/27/2017. (rlf)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER denying 994 Motion to Supplement the Expert Report of M. Ray Perryman, PhD. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/25/2017. (rlf)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 824 Sealed Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Robert Mills. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/23/2017. (rlf)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 ORDER ADOPTING 954 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 825 Defendants' (Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company and Hewlett-Packard Company) Motion for Summary Judgment of FRAND Obligation. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/16/2017. (rlf)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER denying 822 Defendant Juniper Networks. Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Knox's Infringement Opinions and Supplemental Infringement Reports. Because Juniper had the opportunity and did indeed depose Dr. Knox about his Second Supplemental Expert Report, Juniper's request for a half of a day deposition of Dr. Knox is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/11/2017. (rlf)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 810 Network-1 Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Hewlett-Packard Companys (HP) Expert, Dr. M. Ray Perryman. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/21/2017. (rlf)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER denying 821 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. James Knox. Defendants' motion to strike is denied as to Dr. Knox's apportionment analysis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/13/2017. (rlf)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 817 Motion to Exclude an Opinion and the Testimony of Juniper's Technical Expert Dr. Cameron H. G. Wright. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude is accordingly granted as to the above-italicized portions of the opinions on page 24 of Dr. Wrights November 30, 2016 Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/12/2017. (rlf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Network-1 Technologies, Inc v. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Network-1 Security Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Aaron Luner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Telesis Holdings K.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Telesis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avaya Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Communications AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrettcom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polycom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoretel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transition Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?