Blue Spike, LLC v. Audible Magic Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Blue Spike, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Dailymotion S.A., Specific Media, LLC, GoMiso, Inc, Yap.tv, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., iMesh, Inc., Myxer, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., TuneCore, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Boodabee Technologies Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Dailymotion, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Coincident.TV, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Accedo Broadband AB and Brightcove, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00576
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Michael H Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:12cv499, Blue Spike, LLC v. Texas Instruments, Inc., for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as lead counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. Any motions including motions challenging venue or jurisdiction filed prior to consolidation in all cases must be refiled in the consolidated case 6:12cv499 to be considered by the Court. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference when all Defendants in the consolidated case have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. The notice must include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any other related cases filed in the Eastern District of Texas involving the same patents. If the consolidated case is not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Furthermore, attorney Stephen E. Edwards has moved to withdraw from several of the cases listed above. The Court GRANTS the motions in all cases in which it is pending. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-26-13(mll, )
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Susan Van Keulen on behalf of TuneCore, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3951342. (Van Keulen, Susan)
December 27, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of Accedo Broadband AB, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. (Lackey, Walter)
December 27, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Accedo Broadband AB, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
December 7, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher James Higgins on behalf of Accedo Broadband AB, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. (Higgins, Christopher)
December 6, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Accedo Broadband AB, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. (Chatterjee, Indra)
December 6, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel M Ramsey on behalf of Accedo Broadband AB, Accedo Broadband NA, Inc., Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. (Ramsey, Gabriel)
October 9, 2012 This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv499, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv499 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-10-12(mll, )
September 27, 2012 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Myxer, Inc., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, TuneCore, Inc., Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc., Accedo Broadband NA, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es), #12 Summons(es), #13 Summons(es), #14 Summons(es), #15 Summons(es), #16 Summons(es), #17 Summons(es), #18 Summons(es), #19 Summons(es))(klb)
September 27, 2012 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Accedo Broadband AB and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
September 26, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Dailymotion S.A., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Soundcloud Ltd. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(klb)
August 27, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
August 27, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T Garteiser on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Garteiser, Randall)
August 27, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Johns on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Johns, Christopher)
August 27, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher A Honea on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Honea, Christopher)
August 27, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Benefield, Michael)
August 27, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Edwards on behalf of Blue Spike, LLC (Edwards, Stephen)
August 27, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blue Spike, LLC (Albritton, Eric)
August 27, 2012 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Myxer, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, TuneCore, Inc., Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3749974.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Patent 8214175, #3 Exhibit B - Patent 7949494, #4 Exhibit C - Patent 7660700, #5 Exhibit D - Patent 7346472)(Albritton, Eric)
August 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audible Magic Corporation, Boodabee Technologies Inc., Brightcove, Inc., Coincident.TV, Inc., Dailymotion S.A., Dailymotion, Inc., Facebook, Inc., GoMiso, Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Mediafire, LLC, Metacafe, Inc., MySpace, LLC, Myxer, Inc., Photobucket.com, Inc., Qlipso Media Networks Ltd., Qlipso, Inc., Soundcloud Ltd., Soundcloud, Inc., Specific Media, LLC, TuneCore, Inc., Yap.tv, Inc., Zedge Holdings, Inc., iMesh, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3749974.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Patent 8214175, # 3 Exhibit B - Patent 7949494, # 4 Exhibit C - Patent 7660700, # 5 Exhibit D - Patent 7346472)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Spike, LLC v. Audible Magic Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace, LLC
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dailymotion S.A.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specific Media, LLC
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoMiso, Inc
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yap.tv, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediafire, LLC
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accedo Broadband NA, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iMesh, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myxer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zedge Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TuneCore, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Van Keulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photobucket.com, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boodabee Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metacafe, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dailymotion, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qlipso Media Networks Ltd.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coincident.TV, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audible Magic Corporation
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qlipso, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soundcloud Ltd.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soundcloud, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accedo Broadband AB
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brightcove, Inc.
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Gabriel M Ramsey
Represented By: Christopher James Higgins
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Spike, LLC
Represented By: Stephen E. Edwards
Represented By: Christopher S Johns
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Randall T Garteiser
Represented By: Christopher A Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?