Innovative Automation LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Innovative Automation LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00882
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims for relief asserted against APPLE INC. by INNOVATIVE AUTOMATION LLC herein are dismissed, with prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/13. cc:attys 1-03-13(mll, )
January 2, 2013 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Innovative Automation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 10, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Safier on behalf of Innovative Automation LLC (Safier, Seth)
November 19, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Innovative Automation LLC (Bunt, Robert)
November 19, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
November 16, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 16, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3877327.), filed by Innovative Automation LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Automation LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Automation LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?