EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00943
Filed: December 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/29/13. (mll, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION for Leave to File Initial Disclosures in Support of Apple's Motion to Transfer (ECF 21) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Krellner, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Findlay, Eric)
October 28, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC re 1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for U.S. Patent No. 5,663,757 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scardino, Daniel)
October 21, 2013 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) filed by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Daaboul, Rola)
October 4, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Initial Disclosures in Support of Apple's Motion to Transfer (ECF 21) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Krellner, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Findlay, Eric)
October 2, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond William Mort, III on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Mort, Raymond)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cabrach John Connor terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/23/13. (mll, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Cabrach Connor by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scardino, Daniel)
July 8, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rola Daaboul on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Daaboul, Rola)
June 3, 2013 Filing 30 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) filed by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Halderman, Mark)
May 22, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Young, # 2 Affidavit of Anderson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Findlay, Eric)
May 13, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) filed by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Halderman, Mark)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A); Responses due by 5/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/29/13. (mll, )
April 26, 2013 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dkt. No. 21 by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Halderman, Mark)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. EON is granted an extension to 4-29-2013 to file an Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/22/13. (mll, )
April 19, 2013 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Halderman, Mark)
April 17, 2013 This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv941, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv941 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/16/13. (mll, )
April 3, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Buckley, # 3 Affidavit of Anderson, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26)(Findlay, Eric)
April 3, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark W Halderman on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Halderman, Mark)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeff R Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/07/13. cc:attys 3-07-13 (mll, )
March 6, 2013 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeff R. Johnson by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scardino, Daniel)
February 27, 2013 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
February 27, 2013 Filing 16 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Apple Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
February 18, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan K Anderson on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4004251. (Anderson, Bryan)
February 18, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip W Woo on behalf of Apple Inc. (Woo, Philip)
February 18, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kelly A Krellner on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4004106. (Krellner, Kelly)
February 15, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ashish Nagdev on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4003849. (Nagdev, Ashish)
February 6, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Apple Inc. (Craft, Roger)
February 6, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Apple Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
January 28, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 2/27/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Chen, Li)
January 17, 2013 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 1/7/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2013. (mll, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Dacus, Deron)
January 2, 2013 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Scardino, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
December 19, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
December 19, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeff R Johnson on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Johnson, Jeff)
December 19, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cabrach John Connor on behalf of EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Connor, Cabrach)
December 19, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC (Scardino, Daniel)
December 19, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3922929.), filed by EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '757 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '101 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '546 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - '491 Patent, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scardino, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EON Corp. IP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Cabrach John Connor
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jeff R Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Scardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?