Adaptix, Inc. v. Ericsson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, MetroPCS Communications, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc. and AT&T, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer
Case Number: 6:2013cv00049
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 FINAL JUDGMENT. The Dismissed Claims are dismissed with prejudice and the Dismissed Counterclaims are dismissed as moot, without prejudice. Strictly with respect to these cases 6:12-CV-369 and 6:14-CV-503, as between Adaptix and the defendants in those cases, each side shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees related to the Dismissed Claims and/or the Dismissed Counterclaims. (The 6:12-CV-369 case is a consolidated matter that also includes case numbers 6:13-CV-49 and 6:13-CV-50.) Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/15/16. (mll, )
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, TO BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE. Document # 209, Motion to withdraw is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) Modified on 5/15/2015 (sm, ).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Lamar Cole on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Cole, Scott)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Baxter, Samuel)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/2015. (ch, )
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 GENERAL ORDER 14-20 ASSIGNING CIVIL AND CRIMINAL ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/2014. (ch, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Douglas William Meier; Steven M Anzalone and Jessica Cox Hill terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/2/2015. (sm, )
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/29/15. (mjc, )
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting Adaptix, Inc's Unopposed Motion To Modify The Court's Order Regarding Dispositive And Daubert Motions Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/13/14. (mrm, )
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack ofConstitutional and Prudential Standing #95 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/05/14. (mll, )
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Report and Recommendation Denying Ericsson's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Reconsideration of Same. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of K. Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #196 Motion to Consolidate Cases for all purposes, including trial. 6:13cv49 and 6:13cv50 are hereby CONSOLIDATED into the lead case, 6:12cv369. All docket entries should be made in the lead case number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/28/14. (bas, )
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/22/14. (bas, )
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (One Week) Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of the '172 Patent by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment Denying Adaptix's Prayer for Injunctive Relief by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan Grissum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Deposition of Dodd, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from the Answers and Objections to Ericssons First Set of Rogs, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from the Answers and Objections to T-Mobiles First Set of Rogs, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Declaration of Wicker, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Ericssons First Set of Rogs, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from T-Mobiles First Set of Rogs, #8 Exhibit 7 - Expert Report of Philip Green, #9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Deposition of Wells, #10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Expert Report of Becker, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 103(c) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Hui Liu, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #191 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102(f). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hayes, Paul)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102(f) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit Notice of Exhibits A,B,C Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 1, 14, 41, and their Respective Dependent Claims, of U.S. Patent 6,870,808 by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan Grissum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Deposition of Wells, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Report of Jones, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Declaration of Wicker, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from 7/28/14 Report of Wells, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from ATTM-00573485, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from Deposition of Bigler, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Deposition of Pachalla, #9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from 30(b)(6) Deposition of T-Mobile, #10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from TMO-00074509, #11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Deposition of Guill, #12 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 6,870,808, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of Claims 14, 31, 41, 9, and their Respective Dependent Claims, of U.S. Patent 6,870,808 by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan Grissum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Deposition of Wells, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,870,808, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Declaration of Wicker, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from 7/28/14 Report of Wells, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Report of Jones, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Damages Expert Philip Green by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix - Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1 - Green Report - AT&T, #3 Exhibit 2 - Green Report - T-Mobile, #4 Exhibit 3 - Becker report, #5 Exhibit 4- Green depo, #6 Exhibit 5 - Wells depo, #7 Exhibit 6 - Samsung license, #8 Exhibit 7 - Samsung amendment, #9 Exhibit 8 - part 1, NSN License, #10 Exhibit 8 - part 2, NSN License, #11 Exhibit 9 - Dodd depo, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172 by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan Grissum, #2 Exhibit 1 Excerpts from Deposition of Wells, #3 Exhibit 2 U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #4 Exhibit 3 Excerpts from ETSI TS 136 213 V.8.8.0, #5 Exhibit 4 Excerpts from ETSI TS 136 211 V.8.9.0, #6 Exhibit 5 Excerpts from 7/28/14 Report of Wells, #7 Exhibit 6 Excerpts from ERIC-04391366, #8 Exhibit 7 Excerpts from Declaration of Wicker, #9 Exhibit 8 Excerpts from Responses to Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Sealed Document. OBJECTIONS TO [DKT #182] SEALED MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAVENS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING ERICSSONS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE SAME (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer P. Ainsworth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B), 143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 10:00 AM in Tyler Courtroom (Judge Schneider's Courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. PARTIES WILL BE LIMITED TO A TOTAL OF 45 MINUTES PER SIDE. With regard to the other pending motions of which the Court is aware, the Court, in its discretion, may set hearings on these motions at a later date.(COURTROOM CHANGE ONLY) (lfs, )
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of the '172 Patent) by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Williams, #2 Exhibit 1 to Williams Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Williams Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Williams Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Williams Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Williams Declaration, #7 Declaration of Acampora, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #172 Sealed Motion for leave to file motion for sum jgm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/7/2014. (sm, )
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RESPONSE in Opposition re #172 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED PRETRIAL CONFERENCES AND TRIAL SCHEDULING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/30/2014. (sm, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) , #143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 10:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse (Judge Steger's Courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. PARTIES WILL BE LIMITED TO A TOTAL OF 45 MINUTES PER SIDE. With regard to the other pending motions of which the Court is aware, the Court, in its discretion, may set hearings on these motions at a later date.(lfs, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James John Foster on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Foster, James)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells's Expert Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Gannon, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Foster, #3 Exhibit G)(Hayes, Paul)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/26/14. (bas, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells's Expert Report by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Stipulation and Agreed Motion to Modify the Dispositive and Daubert Motions deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/22/14. (bas, )
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File STIPULATION AND AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY THE DISPOSITIVE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS DEADLINES by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan E Grissum on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Grissum, Morgan)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Dismiss Claims and Counterclaims Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 7,072,315 and 7,573,851. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/15/14. (mll, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness, #2 Declaration of James C. Williams, #3 Exhibit 1 to Williams Decl, #4 Exhibit 2 to Williams Decl, #5 Exhibit 3 to Williams Decl, #6 Exhibit 4 to Williams Decl, #7 Exhibit 5 to Williams Decl, #8 Declaration of Acampora, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells's Expert Report filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Williams, #2 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #3 Exhibit M - ERIC-ITC01375371)(Kubehl, Douglas)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Kubehl, Douglas)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATION AND AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS REGARDING U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,072,315 AND 7,573,851) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Antonio Piazza, filed by Adaptix, Inc.. AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Tadlock, Charles)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells's Expert Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of K. Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is SEPTEMBER 5, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/3/14. (bas, )
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells' Expert Report by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lipman, Steven)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/29/14. (bas, )
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File STIPULATION AND AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying #156 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/22/14. (bas, )
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #156 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. Wells's Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Williams, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Plaintiffs Answers to Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Adaptixs Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #5 Exhibit 4 - Correspondence from Jeff Becker, dated July 3, 2013, #6 Exhibit 5 - Correspondence from Thomas Fulford, dated November 22, 2013, #7 Exhibit 6 - Adaptixs Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #8 Exhibit 7 - Adaptixs Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,072,315, #9 Exhibit 8 - Correspondence from Rory Fontenla, dated September 6, 2013, #10 Exhibit 9 - Correspondence from Jeff Becker, dated March 21, 2014, #11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from the deposition transcript of Christian Skarby, dated April 4, 2014, #12 Exhibit 11 - Correspondence from Thomas Fulford, dated July 28, 2014, #13 Exhibit 12 - Correspondence from Daniel McGonagle, dated July 28, 2014, #14 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 6,246,713, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #156 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. Wells's Report filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Kubehl, Douglas)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. Wells's Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of K. Gannon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Defendants' Motion to Strike Portion of Dr. Wells's Report by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Wells's Expert Report by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ebby Abraham, #2 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 6,904,283, #3 Exhibit B Expert Report of Dr. Wells, #4 Exhibit C Excerpts of ETSI TS 136 231 v8.8.0, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,904,283, #6 Exhibit E - Docket No. 269, Civil Action No. 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #8 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #9 Exhibit H U.S. Patent No. 6,246,713, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Amended Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,870,808, #11 Exhibit J U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #12 Exhibit K 9/6/13 Letter to Paul J. Hayes, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PLAINTIFF'S SEALED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO Response to Motion re #143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of S. Lipman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Paul)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/12/14. (bas, )
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File STIPULATION AND AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/12/2014) (sm, ).
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan Grissum, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ericssons First Set of Intertogatories, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs Answers and Objections to Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from Jonathan Rubenstein, dated April 25, 2014, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs Answers and Objections to T-Mobile USA, Inc.s Second Set of Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Answers and Objections to AT&T Mobility LLCs First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 7 - Correspondence from Jonathan Rubenstein, dated May 21, 2014, #9 Exhibit 8 - Correspondence from Jonathan Rubenstein dated May 30, 2014, #10 Exhibit 9 - Correspondence from Michael Ercolini, dated June 7, 2014, #11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Hui Liu, dated July 1, 2014, #12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from the Deposition Transcript of Hui Liu, dated July 2, 2014, #13 Exhibit 12 - AD00008057, #14 Exhibit 13 - Eexcerpts from the Deposition of Curis Dodd, dated June 25, 2014, #15 Exhibit 14 - Correspondence from Daniel McGonagle, dated April 22, 2014, #16 Exhibit 15 - Correspondence from Brian Bosworth, dated April 24, 2014, #17 Exhibit 16 - Ccorrespondence from Brian Bosworth, dated April 24, 2014, #18 Exhibit 17 - Correspondence from Anthony Miele, dated April 28, 2014)(Kubehl, Douglas)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Notice of Compliance Regarding Mediation) (Kubehl, Douglas)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (Cert of authority) #148 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Hayes, Paul) Modified on 8/5/2014 (sm, ).
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: EXHIBIT A TO #147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) . (Hayes, Paul)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Opposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-6(B) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Miele, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED ADAPTIX, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER re #143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gannon Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Gannon Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Gannon Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Gannon Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Gannon Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Gannon Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Gannon Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/21/14. (bas, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. re #132 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents (Hayes, Paul)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Williams, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ericsson First Amended Answer (13-cv-49), #3 Exhibit 2 - Ericsson First Amended Answer (13-cv-50), #4 Exhibit 3 - AT&T First Amended Answer (13-cv-49), #5 Exhibit 4 - AT&T First Amended Answer (13-cv-50), #6 Exhibit 5 - MetroPCS First Amended Answer (13-cv-49), #7 Exhibit 6 - MetroPCS First Amended Answer (13-cv-50), #8 Exhibit 7 - T-Mobile First Amended Answer (12-cv-369), #9 Exhibit 8 - Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit 9 - Answers to Ericssons First Set of Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit 10 - Deposition of Liu - Vol. 1, #12 Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Liu - Vol. 2, #13 Exhibit 12 - AD00003653, #14 Exhibit 13 - 4-25-14 Correspondence from Rubenstein, #15 Exhibit 14 - Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, #16 Exhibit 15 - AD00005904, #17 Exhibit 16 - AD00005906, #18 Exhibit 17 - AD00003651, #19 Exhibit 18 - AD00003827, #20 Exhibit 19 - AD00006200, #21 Exhibit 20 - AD00008057, #22 Exhibit 21 - Deposition of Meiyappan, #23 Exhibit 22 - AD00007026, #24 Exhibit 23 - Deposition of Hoole, #25 Exhibit 24 - ATTM-00571877, #26 Exhibit 25 - Deposition of Hong, #27 Exhibit 26 - AD00306523, #28 Exhibit 27 - AD00006897, #29 Exhibit 28 - Answers to T-Mobiles Second Set of Interrogatories, #30 Exhibit 29 - Answers to AT&Ts First Set of Interrogatories, #31 Exhibit 30 - ATT-Final Export of Metadata, #32 Exhibit 31 - AT&Ts First Set of Interrogatories, #33 Exhibit 32 - 05-27-2014 Correspondence from Ercolini, #34 Exhibit 33 - Defendants Fourth Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to Adaptix, #35 Exhibit 34 - Deposition of Curtis Dodd, #36 Exhibit 35 - Deposition of James Hite, #37 Exhibit 36 - Deposition of Scott Prather, #38 Exhibit 37 - T-Mobiles Second Set of Interrogatories, #39 Exhibit 38 - July 8, 2014 Civil Minute Order - Civil Action No. 5:13-cv-1776, #40 Exhibit 39 - U.S. Patent No. 6,751,444, #41 Exhibit 40 - 05-30-2014 Correspondence from Jonathan Rubenstein, #42 Exhibit 41 - AD00007349, #43 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #140 Stipulation, filed by Ericsson, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/10/14. (bas, )
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): #140 Stipulation,.. (Rubenstein, Jonathan) Modified on 7/9/2014 (sm, ).
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION and Agreed Motion to Modify the Expert Discovery Deadlines by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCVOERY ORDER granting #135 Agreed MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURTS AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER filed by Adaptix, Inc. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2014 11:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Mediation Completion due by 8/7/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/25/14. (bas, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Notice of Submission of Agreed Mediator) (Kubehl, Douglas)
June 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #132 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, MetroPCS Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. Rubenstein, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Agreed MOTION TO MODIFY THE COURTS AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/16/14. (bas, )
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Ruling on Adaptix's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Opposed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Ercolini, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P Messina on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4679845. (Messina, Joseph)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/15/14. (bas, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-7) by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying #103 Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate Judge Craven's Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/01/14. (mll, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time to File its Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Objections to Magistrate's Report and Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/24/14. (mrm, )
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION for Reconsideration re #96 Memorandum & Opinion (Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Craven's Claim Construction Order and Motion for Reconsideration of the Same) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Service of Damages Disclosures (Hayes, Paul)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Defendants' Notice of Service of Damages Disclosures) (Rubenstein, Jonathan)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Gannon, Kevin)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION for Reconsideration re #96 Memorandum & Opinion (Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Craven's Claim Construction Order and Motion for Reconsideration of the Same) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Kubehl, Douglas)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing filed by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Anzalone, #2 Exhibit L)(Anzalone, Steven)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Reconsideration re #96 Memorandum & Opinion (Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Craven's Claim Construction Order and Motion for Reconsideration of the Same) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hayes, Paul)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Pretrial Conference reset for 1/15/2015 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Mediation Completion due by 8/7/2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/28/2014. (sm, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting as MODIFIED #97 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and MODIFY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/28/2014. (sm, )
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #97 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Hayes, Paul)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R Fulford on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4582799. (Fulford, Thomas)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Hayes, Paul)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Tuminaro on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4579643. (Tuminaro, Jonathan)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael D Specht on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4579635. (Specht, Michael)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ross G Hicks on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4579606. (Hicks, Ross)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel E Yonan on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4579423. (Yonan, Daniel)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R Gilman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Gilman, Robert)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Williams on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Williams, James)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffery S. Becker, #2 Exhibit A - Correspondence dated August 5, 2013, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence dated September 27, 2013, #4 Exhibit C - Correspondence dated October 14, 2013, #5 Exhibit D - Correspondence dated December 5, 2013, #6 Exhibit E - Correspondence dated February 26, 2014, #7 Exhibit F - Adaptix's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice of Ericsson, #8 Exhibit G - Correspondence dated September 11, 2013, #9 Exhibit H - Correspondence dated September 17, 2013, #10 Exhibit I - Adaptix's Second Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice of Ericsson, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is MARCH 25, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/13/14. (bas, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Reconsideration re #96 Memorandum & Opinion (Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Craven's Claim Construction Order and Motion for Reconsideration of the Same) by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffery S. Becker, #2 Exhibit 1 - Adaptix Inc.'s Technology Tutorial)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2014: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing (Ericsson's Response to Adaptix's Motion for An Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to the Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anzalone, Steven)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER directing Defendant to file a response on or before MARCH 14, 2014 re #100 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing filed by Adaptix, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/11/14. (bas, )
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 2/13/2014 before Judge Caroline Craven. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham, Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2014. (clb, )

February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #97 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Sealed, #2 Exhibit H - Sealed)(Hayes, Paul)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Scheduling/Discovery Order by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas R. Fulford, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - Sealed, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H - Sealed, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 2/27/2014 (sm, ).
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Claim Construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/26/2014. (sm, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SEALED PATENT MOTION The Ericsson Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's Lack of Constitutional and Prudential Standing by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Anzalone, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Anzalone, Steven) Modified on 2/20/2014 (mll, ).
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Markman Hearing held on 2/13/2014. (Court Reporters Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson.) (lfs, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing TIME CHANGE Markman Hearing REset for 2/13/2014 01:00 PM in Tyler Courthouse (Judge Steger courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (lfs, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Regarding Claim Construction Hearing on 2/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/10/2014. (sm, )
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Louis Miele on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4513247. (Miele, Anthony)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Tadlock, Charles)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re Claim Construction Hearing on February 13, 2014 the parties are to file a joint claim construction chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/31/2014. (sm, )
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MetroPCS Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for MetroPCS Communications, Inc.. (Kubehl, Douglas)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE by MetroPCS Communications, Inc. (MetroPCS Communications, Inc.'s First Amended Certificate of Interested Parties) (Kubehl, Douglas)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ***FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel Source Code by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas R. Fulford, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 1/27/2014 (gsg).
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE FROM CLERK re #81 Claim Construction Brief and #86 Corrected Claim Construction Brief that these entries have been MODIFIED, per judge, to reflect they are responsive claim construction briefs.(sm, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSIVE CORRECTED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samiyah Diaz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)Changes made:p. 7 ("Example 2 is clearly a diversity cluster as it is within..." has been replaced with "Example 2 is clearly a diversity cluster as it extends beyond...")p.17 ("The terms "2-D and "broadband" mean..." has been replaced with "The terms "2-D" and "broadband" require...")p.17 ("...the terms mean..." has been replaced with "...the terms require...")(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 1/16/2014 (sm, ).
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to File reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/15/2014. (sm, )
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Three-Page Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT OF ENGAGEMENT by David Keyzer. (sm, )
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR AND REGARDING TIME FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING on 2/13/2014, David Keyzer added as tech advisor.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/8/2014. (sm, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Samiyah Diaz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Hayes, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2014: #26 Corrected Reply to Claim Construction) (gsg, ). Modified on 1/16/2014 (sm, ).
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Filereply claim construction brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/6/2014. (sm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Claim Construction Brief by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for One-Day Extension)(Hayes, Paul)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/26/13. (bas, )
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Claim Construction Brief by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
December 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #74 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit S, #18 Exhibit T, #19 Exhibit U, #20 Exhibit V, #21 Exhibit X, #22 Exhibit Y, #23 Exhibit Z, #24 Exhibit AA, #25 Exhibit BB)(Kubehl, Douglas)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Sealed Version - Claim Construction Brief (Dkt. 74). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit W)(Kubehl, Douglas)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (REDACTED)filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Kubehl, Douglas)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas William Meier on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4451823. (Meier, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2014: #1 Sealed Attachment) (pkb, ).
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul C Goulet on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4448923. (Goulet, Paul)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Cox Hill on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4448594. (Hill, Jessica)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven M Anzalone on behalf of Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4429007. (Anzalone, Steven)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Samiyah Diaz, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Hayes, Paul)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File claim construction briefings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/12/2013. (sm, )
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Claim Construction Brief by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re Claim Construction briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/28/2013. (sm, )
October 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Parties' Claim Construction Briefs by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #63 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Please see corrected filing at #64 .*** (mjc, )
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ***CORRECTED FILING. REPLACES #63 .***Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Adaptix, Inc.. CORRECTED (previous version filed in error) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 9/18/2013 (mjc, ).
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED FILING #64 .***Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 9/18/2013 (mjc, ).
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Defendants' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2) (Kubehl, Douglas)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Defendants' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1) (Kubehl, Douglas)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Defendants' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4) (Kubehl, Douglas)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James C Hall terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/22/13. (bas, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smiley, Keith)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Hayes, Paul)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Defendant's Notice of Service of Identification of ESI Custodians) (Kubehl, Douglas)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson of Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Kubehl, Douglas)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adaptix, Inc. of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Lipman, Steven)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Adaptix, Inc. (Agreed E-Discovery Order). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order EDO)(Hayes, Paul)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is 6/14/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/12/13. (bas, )
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed E-Discovery Order by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File a motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order by AT&T Mobility LLC, Adaptix, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Jonathan)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Smiley, Keith)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/21/13. (bas, )
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Discovery due by 6/21/2014, Markman Hearing set for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven in Judge Steger's Courtroom 3rd floor, Tyler, TX, Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven in Tyler, TX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/21/13. (bas, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill and Thomas John Ward, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/20/13. (bas, )
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference held on 5/20/2013. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (lfs, )
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order -- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Kubehl, Douglas)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MetroPCS Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for MetroPCS Communications, Inc.. (Kubehl, Douglas)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RESCHEDULING THE COMBINED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING to FEBRUARY 13, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/14/13. (bas, )
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kubehl, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2013: #1 Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Proposeed Scheduling Order) (gsg, ).
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Bell Rubenstein on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Rubenstein, Jonathan)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samiyah Diaz on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Diaz, Samiyah)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Defendants' Certificate of Interested Parties (Kubehl, Douglas)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Certificate of Interested Parties (Lipman, Steven)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2013 10:30 AM in Judge Steger's Courtroom, Third Floor, Tyler, TX before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/10/13. (bas, )
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Hall on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hall, James)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/03/13. cc:attys 4-04-13(mll, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MetroPCS Communications, Inc. (Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant MetroPCS Communications, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by MetroPCS Communications, Inc..(Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Telecom, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson, Inc.. (Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Defendants Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson's Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson, Inc..(Kubehl, Douglas)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffery Scott Becker on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Becker, Jeffery)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vernon Edward Evans on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Evans, Vernon)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Mark Kubehl on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Kubehl, Douglas)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to MetroPCS Communications, Inc. on 1/22/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/12/2013. (mll, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Ericsson, Inc. on 1/22/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/12/2013. (mll, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 1/22/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/12/2013. (mll, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 1/22/2013, by cert mail. (mll, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing without prejudice all claims asserted against Defendant AT&T Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-06-13(mll, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(klb)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Ericsson, Inc., MetroPCS Communications, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3947759.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,146,172, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,573,851, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,904,283, #5 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,072,315)(Hill, Jack)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. Ericsson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Represented By: James C Williams
Represented By: Douglas Mark Kubehl
Represented By: Steven M Anzalone
Represented By: Jonathan Bell Rubenstein
Represented By: Douglas William Meier
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Vernon Edward Evans
Represented By: Paul C Goulet
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Becker
Represented By: Scott Lamar Cole
Represented By: Jessica Cox Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Morgan E Grissum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetroPCS Communications, Inc.
Represented By: James C Williams
Represented By: Douglas Mark Kubehl
Represented By: Jonathan Bell Rubenstein
Represented By: Vernon Edward Evans
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Becker
Represented By: Scott Lamar Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Morgan E Grissum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: James C Williams
Represented By: Douglas Mark Kubehl
Represented By: Jonathan Bell Rubenstein
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Vernon Edward Evans
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Becker
Represented By: Scott Lamar Cole
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Morgan E Grissum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: James C Williams
Represented By: Douglas Mark Kubehl
Represented By: Steven M Anzalone
Represented By: Jonathan Bell Rubenstein
Represented By: Douglas William Meier
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Vernon Edward Evans
Represented By: Paul C Goulet
Represented By: Jeffery Scott Becker
Represented By: Scott Lamar Cole
Represented By: Jessica Cox Hill
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Morgan E Grissum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E Lipman
Represented By: Ross G Hicks
Represented By: Michael D Specht
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Represented By: Anthony Louis Miele
Represented By: Keith Bryan Smiley
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: Joseph P Messina
Represented By: Jonathan Tuminaro
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: James C Hall
Represented By: Thomas Robert Fulford
Represented By: Robert R Gilman
Represented By: Daniel E Yonan
Represented By: Samiyah Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?