TracBeam, L.L.C. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: TracBeam, L.L.C.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Case Number: 6:2013cv00093
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2014 Filing 266 FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Except as otherwise provided by previous Court Order, all costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/14. (mll, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 264 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit by Plaintiff against Defendant Google Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/14. (mll, )
August 6, 2014 Filing 264 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Claims against Google by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Dismissal)(Eichmann, John)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER re 260 Report of Mediation filed by David Folsom. The parties are ORDERED to file closing documents with the Court by August 29, 2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/4/2014. (gsg)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/27/14. (mll, )
May 22, 2014 Filing 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Settlement Conference held on 5/22/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
May 22, 2014 Filing 260 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled(Folsom, David)
May 20, 2014 Filing 259 Sealed Document: Google's Third Revised Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sealed Third Revised Exhibit List))(Perlson, David)
May 19, 2014 Filing 258 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
May 19, 2014 Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Sur-Reply to TracBeam's Motion to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes (Dkt. #201) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 16, 2014 Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 225 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Google's New Invalidity Argument filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Skiles Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 255 Defendant Google's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff TracBeam's Supplemental Complaint by Google, Inc..(Perlson, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 254 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
May 16, 2014 Filing 253 Google's SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 205 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Google, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 251 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in reply brief. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/15/2014. (gsg)
May 15, 2014 Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Seeking 2 additional pages for Reply on Claim Construction Motion) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting 2 additional pages)(Eichmann, John)
May 15, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/2/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 228 Motion to Amend/Correct and Extend Time re Plaintiff's Motion to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction. The deadline for Defendant's response is 5-13-2014; the deadline for Plaintiff's reply is 5-16-2014 at 12:00 p.m.; and the deadline for Defendant's surreply is 5-19-2014 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 242 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/14/14. (mll, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 181 Notice (Other), 163 Notice (Other), 221 Notice (Other) Plaintiff TracBeam L.L.C.s Amended Objections and Rebuttal Counter-designations to Googles Counter-designations (Dkt. 210) (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 14, 2014 Filing 247 Proposed Jury Instructions by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
May 13, 2014 Filing 246 Joint Final Pre-Trial Conference Order [Sealed]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Eichmann, John)
May 13, 2014 Filing 245 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Sistos Decl., # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 13, 2014 Filing 244 [SEALED] Google's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. Proposed Verdict Forms (Eichmann, John)
May 13, 2014 Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to TracBeam's Motion to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes (Dkt. #201) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio)
May 13, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Proposed Verdict Form (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Objections to TracBeam's Counter-Designations to Google's Deposition Designations (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Objections to TracBeam's Supplemental Deposition Designations (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Requested Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE by Google, Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts (Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 236 [Sealed] TracBeams proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law regarding prosecution laches. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 163 Notice (Other) Plaintiff TracBeam L.L.C.s Objections and Rebuttal Counter-designations to Googles Counter-designations (Dkt. 210) (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 13, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Bunt, Robert)
May 13, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. Estimate of Trial Time (Bunt, Robert)
May 13, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian E Mack on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4656207. (Mack, Brian)
May 12, 2014 Filing 231 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 205 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
May 12, 2014 Filing 230 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION in limine filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER re 225 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Google's New Invalidity Argument filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. The deadline for any response from Google is 5-16-2014. There shall be no reply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/12/14. (mll, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 228 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 220 Order, Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule Concerning Plaintiff's Motion to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 224 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/12/14. (mll, )
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 91 Sealed Motion to Strike; denying 152 Sealed Patent Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 153 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 154 Sealed Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions; granting in part and denying in part 157 Sealed Motion to Exclude Testimony; granting 185 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/09/14. (mll, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 225 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Google's New Invalidity Argument by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Eichmann, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
May 8, 2014 Filing 224 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 8, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 5/2/14 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014. (sms, )
May 7, 2014 Filing 222 SEALED Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support re 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
May 7, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 163 Notice (Other) TracBeam's Supplemental Deposition Designations (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER re 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. The Court ORDERS the following briefing schedule: The deadline for Defendant's response is 5-12-2014; The deadline for Plaintiff's reply is 5-15-2014 at 12:00 p.m.; and the deadline for Defendant's surreply is 5-16-2014. Oral arguments will be heard at the 5-22-2014 pretrial hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/05/14. (mll, )
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/05/14. (mll, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 218 Sealed Document - Notice of Filing of TracBeam's presentation slides (May 2 hearing). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Motion to strike Rose, # 2 Exhibit 2: prosecution laches, # 3 Exhibit 3: infringement, # 4 Exhibit 4: Rose Daubert, # 5 Exhibit 5: no anticipation by Loomis)(Eichmann, John)
May 5, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Google, Inc. (Bufe, John)
May 2, 2014 Filing 216 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2014 re 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report filed by Google: 152 SEALED PATENT MSJ of Prosecution Laches filed by Google; 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS filed by Google; 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm filed by TracBeam; 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE filed by Google; 185 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by TracBeam; 156 SEALED MSJ OF INVALIDITY filed by Google; 153 SEALED MSJ OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by Google; 176 Cross SEALED MOTION for Partial SJ re: Validity filed by TracBeam; 177 Cross SEALED MSJ re: Prosecution Laches filed by TracBeam;. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 211 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/14. (mll, )
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 199 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/14. (mll, )
May 1, 2014 Filing 213 [SEALED] TracBeams objections to Googles new evidence regarding Googles motion for summary judgment of prosecution laches and TracBeams cross-motion for summary judgment of no prosecution laches (Dkts. #190 & 206). (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 1, 2014 Filing 212 Sealed Document - Google's Second Revised Trial Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
May 1, 2014 Filing 211 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 30, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE by Google, Inc. re 181 Notice (Other), 163 Notice (Other) Google's Objections and Counter Designations to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Perlson, David)
April 30, 2014 Filing 209 Google's Objections to TracBeam's Revised Trial Exhibit List -- Sealed Document. (Perlson, David)
April 30, 2014 Filing 208 Plaintiff TracBeam's LLC Sealed Objections and Counter-Designations to Google's Deposition Designations [Entry 166](Noroozi, Kayvan) Modified on 5/1/2014 (gsg).
April 30, 2014 Filing 207 Plaintiff TracBeam's Sealed Objections to Defendant Google's Trial Exhibit List [Entry 164] (Noroozi, Kayvan) Modified on 5/1/2014 (gsg).
April 30, 2014 Filing 206 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Google's Notice of New Evidence regarding 152 Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches and 177 TracBeam's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of No Prosecution Laches. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sohn, # 2 Exhibit A - excerpt of Mills Report)(Jones, Michael)
April 29, 2014 Filing 205 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Smith, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2014: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 29, 2014 Filing 204 Opposed SEALED MOTION in limine by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
April 29, 2014 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of briefing in support of its Motion to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes (Dkt. #201) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dovel, Gregory)
April 29, 2014 Filing 202 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes.. (Dovel, Gregory)
April 29, 2014 Filing 201 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Resolve Outstanding Claim Construction Disputes by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(Dovel, Gregory)
April 28, 2014 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re 185 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
April 28, 2014 Filing 199 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 198 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches, 177 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Prosecution Laches filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Julien Adams, # 2 Exhibit 9)(Adams, Julien)
April 24, 2014 Filing 197 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 156 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, 176 Cross SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Validity filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Rick Lyon)(Lyon, Richard)
April 24, 2014 Filing 196 Sealed Document: Google's Revised Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Sealed Revised Exhibit List))(Perlson, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 195 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
April 24, 2014 Filing 194 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
April 24, 2014 Filing 193 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeff Eichmann, # 2 Exhibit H)(Eichmann, John)
April 24, 2014 Filing 192 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 24, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Skiles on behalf of Google, Inc. (Skiles, Seth)
April 23, 2014 Filing 190 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of New Evidence regarding Google's Motion for Summary Judgment of Prosecution 152 and TracBeam's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment of No Prosecution Laches 177 . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sohn, # 2 Ex. A - Expert Report of Robert Mills, # 3 Ex. B - Expert Report of Dr. Christopher Rose)(Jones, Michael)
April 18, 2014 Filing 189 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Sistos, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Sistos, Antonio)
April 18, 2014 Filing 188 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE filed by Google, Inc. (Sistos, Antonio)
April 18, 2014 Filing 187 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 156 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, 176 Cross SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Validity filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michalson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
April 18, 2014 Filing 186 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches, and OPPOSITION to 177 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Prosecution Laches filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Sohn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
April 18, 2014 Filing 185 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: TracBeam's proposed supplemental complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting leave to file supplemental complaint)(Eichmann, John)
April 18, 2014 Filing 184 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Kammerud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L, # 7 Exhibit M)(Perlson, David)
April 18, 2014 Filing 183 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Noroozi decl, # 2 Exhibit A: Maccoun depo, # 3 Exhibit B: Wells depo)(Eichmann, John)
April 16, 2014 Filing 182 TracBeam's Revised Exhibit List [Sealed]. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 15, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. TracBeam's Corrected Deposition Designations for Stephen David Zelinka (Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 15, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 176 Cross SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Validity, 177 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Prosecution Laches : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying without prejudice 133 Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Google may reurge its motion in the event TracBeam does not move to file a supplemental complaint under Rule 15(d) within 5 days of this Order. If Google opposes TracBeam's motion, it may file a response brief along with its answer within 5 days of TracBeam's motion to supplement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 132 Sealed Motion to Reply on Supplemental Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 153 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT, 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm, 156 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY, 152 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches, 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report, 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE, 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS : Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The pretrial remains set for 5-22-2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 177 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Prosecution Laches by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dennis Dupray, # 2 Affidavit of Julien Adams, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
April 14, 2014 Filing 176 Cross SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Validity by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Same pleading as #172) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rose Declaration), # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Affidavit of Rick Lyon, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
April 12, 2014 Filing 175 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 152 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dennis Dupray, # 2 Affidavit of Julien Adams, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
April 12, 2014 Filing 174 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
April 11, 2014 Filing 173 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Keyser report, # 2 Exhibit B: Keyser supp report, # 3 Exhibit C: Rose report, # 4 Exhibit D: Rose supp report, # 5 Exhibit E: Kadous depo, # 6 Exhibit F: Norton depo, # 7 Exhibit G: Google-Samsung MADA, # 8 Affidavit Keyser declaration, # 9 Affidavit Rose declaration, # 10 Affidavit Eichmann declaration)(Eichmann, John)
April 11, 2014 Filing 172 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 156 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Rose Declaration), # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Affidavit of Rick Lyon, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
April 11, 2014 Filing 171 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dispositive Motions. The new deadline for TracBeam to file oppositions to Google's dispositive motions is 4-11-2014. The new deadline for Google to file replies to its dispositive motions is 4-18-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/14. (mll, )
April 10, 2014 Filing 169 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Kammerud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
April 10, 2014 Filing 168 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: unsuccessful(Folsom, David)
April 9, 2014 Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Google's Dispositive Motions (including Daubert Motions) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
April 8, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Google's Deposition Designations)(Perlson, David)
April 8, 2014 Filing 165 Witness List by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
April 8, 2014 Filing 164 Sealed Document. (Google's Trial Exhibit List) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Perlson, David) Modified on 4/9/2014 (sm, ).
April 8, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. TracBeam's Deposition Designations (Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 8, 2014 Filing 162 Trial Witness List by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 8, 2014 Filing 161 Plaintiff's Exhibit List [Sealed]. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
April 8, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A Smith on behalf of Google, Inc. (Smith, Kevin)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 Motion for Leave to File Additional Issues in Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/14. (mll, )
March 26, 2014 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File TO ADDRESS ADDITIONAL ISSUES IN DAUBERT MOTIONS by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kammerud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 26, 2014 Filing 157 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF MR. ROBERT MILLS by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kammerud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
March 26, 2014 Filing 156 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Decl. of Seth Skiles, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit F)(Perlson, David)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF CHRISTOPHER ROSE by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Decl. of Antonio Sistos, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Sistos, Antonio)
March 26, 2014 Filing 154 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Laura Stamm by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Noroozi, Kayvan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2014: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 26, 2014 Filing 153 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Decl. of Waleed Kadous, # 3 Decl. of Antonio Sistos, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8)(Sistos, Antonio)
March 26, 2014 Filing 152 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prosecution Laches by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Sohn, # 2 Exhibit A - 022013 Dupray depo, # 3 Exhibit B - '231 Prosecution History, # 4 Exhibit C - '231 Prosecution History, # 5 Exhibit D - '231 Prosecution History, # 6 Exhibit E - '231 Prosecution History, # 7 Exhibit F - '231 Prosecution History, # 8 Exhibit G - '231 Prosecution History, # 9 Exhibit H - '231 Prosecution History, # 10 Exhibit I - '231 Prosecution History, # 11 Exhibit J - '231 Prosecution History, # 12 Exhibit K - '231 Prosecution History, # 13 Exhibit L - '231 Prosecution History, # 14 Exhibit M - '231 Prosecution History, # 15 Exhibit N - '231 Prosecution History, # 16 Exhibit O - '231 Prosecution History, # 17 Exhibit P - '231 Prosecution History, # 18 Exhibit Q - '231 Prosecution History, # 19 Exhibit R - '231 Prosecution History, # 20 Exhibit S - '231 Prosecution History, # 21 Exhibit T - '231 Prosecution History, # 22 Exhibit U - '231 Prosecution History, # 23 Exhibit V - '231 Prosecution History, # 24 Exhibit W - '231 Prosecution History, # 25 Exhibit X - '231 Prosecution History, # 26 Exhibit Y - '231 Prosecution History, # 27 Exhibit Z - '231 Prosecution History, # 28 Exhibit AA - '231 Prosecution History, # 29 Exhibit BB - 052413 Wagner report, # 30 Exhibit CC - 052413 Mossinghoff report, # 31 Exhibit DD - 022213 Dupray depo, # 32 Exhibit EE - 071113 Mossinghoff depo, # 33 Exhibit FF - 051513 TracBeam Resp to ROGS, # 34 Exhibit GG - 052013 TracBeam Supp Resp to RFA, # 35 Exhibit HH - '494 Prosecution History, # 36 Exhibit II - '231 Prosecution History, # 37 Exhibit JJ - '494 Prosecution History, # 38 Exhibit KK - '231 Prosecution History, # 39 Exhibit LL - '494 Prosecution History, # 40 Exhibit MM - '231 Prosecution History, # 41 Exhibit NN - '494 Prosecution History, # 42 Exhibit OO - '231 Prosecution History, # 43 Exhibit PP - '285 patent, # 44 Exhibit QQ - '231 Prosecution History, # 45 Exhibit RR - '092 patent, # 46 Exhibit SS - '245 patent, # 47 Exhibit TT - 022113 Dupray depo, # 48 Exhibit UU - 081413 Keyser report, # 49 Exhibit VV - 012714 Rose Supp report, # 50 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 24, 2014 Filing 151 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
March 13, 2014 Filing 150 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
March 7, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert B Wilson on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4554800. (Wilson, Robert)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/6/14. (mjc, )
March 5, 2014 Filing 147 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order - Modified Briefing for Dispositive & Daubert motions by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Eichmann, John)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/5/14. (mjc, )
February 28, 2014 Filing 145 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 132 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave and Cross-Motion to Strike (Dkt. 134) filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Perlson Declaration)(Perlson, David)
February 28, 2014 Filing 144 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 133 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
February 28, 2014 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Sur-Reply to Motion for Leave (Dkt. 132) by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time. TracBeam's Response to Google's Motion to Dismiss 133 is due on 2-28-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/27/14. (mll, )
February 26, 2014 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Google's Motion to Dismiss by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 138 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion Notice of Errata (Eichmann, John)
February 20, 2014 Filing 138 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 132 Opposed SEALED MOTION [Expedited] for Leave filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann reply declaration)(Eichmann, John)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/14. (mll, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Motion for Leave (dkt. 132) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Eichmann, John)
February 18, 2014 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 127 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Perlson, David)
February 12, 2014 Filing 134 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 132 Opposed SEALED MOTION [Expedited] for Leave filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Perlson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 10, 2014 Filing 133 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
February 6, 2014 Filing 132 Opposed SEALED MOTION [Expedited] for Leave by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 8)(Eichmann, John)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 Motion to Extend Time. The new deadline for parties to mediate before Judge Folsom is 4-10-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/14. (mll, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 130 Agreed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Further Mediation re 123 Order Referring Case to Mediator by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order extending mediation deadline)(Eichmann, John)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Emily C O'Brien terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/14. (mll, )
January 16, 2014 Filing 128 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emily O'Brien by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kammerud, Margaret)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SIXTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/13. (mll, )
December 26, 2013 Filing 126 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ON LETTER BRIEFS: granting 108 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 104 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file a Daubert Motion excluding six license agreements; granting 106 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file a Daubert Motion excluding the testimony of Robert Mills; granting 105 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity; granting 109 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file a Daubert Motion excluding the testimony of Christopher Rose; granting 107 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief request to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/13. (mll, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 122 Motion to Continue Trial. Parties shall meet and confer to reach agreement on the remaining pretrial dates and submit a proposed schedule to the Court within 10 days of the issuance of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Parties shall attend mediation by 2-10-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 122 Joint MOTION for Trial Continuance by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order resetting trial)(Eichmann, John)
November 26, 2013 Filing 121 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 105 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Reply ISO Invalidity Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 26, 2013 Filing 120 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 107 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Reply ISO Non-Infringement Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 26, 2013 Filing 119 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 109 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Reply ISO Rose Daubert Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 26, 2013 Filing 118 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 108 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Reply ISO Prosecution Laches Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 26, 2013 Filing 117 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 106 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Reply ISO Mills Daubert Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 26, 2013 Filing 116 SEALED Reply to Letter Brief re Stamm Daubert filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
November 21, 2013 Filing 115 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 109 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (Eichmann, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 114 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 107 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: responsive letter brief)(Eichmann, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 105 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (response to invalidity letter brief) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: responsive letter brief)(Eichmann, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 106 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (response to Mills Daubert letter brief) (Eichmann, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE by TracBeam, L.L.C. re 108 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (response to prosecution laches letter brief) (Eichmann, John)
November 20, 2013 Filing 110 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 104 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Responsive Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 109 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Rose Daubert Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 108 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Prosecution Laches Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 107 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Non-Infringement Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 106 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Mills Daubert Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 105 Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Invalidity Letter Brief))(Kammerud, Margaret)
November 8, 2013 Filing 104 SEALED Letter Brief filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: letter brief re Stamm opinions)(Eichmann, John)
October 7, 2013 Reset Court Deadlines per 103 Amended Docket Control Order: Jury Selection set for 3/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/13. (mll, )
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties are ORDERED to submit an Amended Docket Control Order to the Court by 10-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/13. (mll, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A - Tracbeam, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Ex B - Google, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Ex C - Alternative)(Jones, Michael)
October 2, 2013 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 27, 2013 Filing 99 SEALED SUR-REPLY TO REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The Court GRANTS the request to move the trial date, but DENIES the request to reset to 5-12-2014. Rather, the new trial date is set for 3-10-2014 at 9:00 AM. Jury selection will be held on 3-03-2014 at 9:00 AM. The pretrial conference will be held on 2-20-2014 at 9:00 AM. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and amend the Docket Control Order in light of the new trial setting. The parties are ORDERED to submit an amended Docket Control Order by 10-02-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/26/13. (mll, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 97 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report filed by Google, Inc.. (Sistos, Antonio)
September 18, 2013 Filing 96 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration)(Eichmann, John)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/13. (mll, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 94 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 92 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, AGREED MOTION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULING REGARDING DKT # 91 by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
September 12, 2013 Filing 93 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order 4th Amended DCO)(Jones, Michael)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 90 Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. The briefing schedule for Google's expected motion to strike the expert report of Dr. Rose is set asfollows: 1) Google's opening brief is due 9-06-2013; 2) TracBeam's opposition is due 9-16-2013; 3) Google's reply is due 9-20-2013; and 4) TracBeam's sur-reply is due 9-27-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/12/13. (mll, )
September 6, 2013 Filing 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rose's Expert Infringement Report by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sohn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 6, 2013 Filing 90 Agreed MOTION Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Strike by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/13. (mll, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 88 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 87 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Second Amended Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/03/13. (mll, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 80 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting permission to file a motion to strike. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to establish a briefing schedule for Google's expected motion to strike and to advise the Court of the schedule by 9-06-2013. Any sur-replies must be filed by 10-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/13. (mll, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2013 Filing 84 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Certificate of Service): 83 SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief.(Sistos, Antonio)
August 26, 2013 Filing 83 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 80 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Reply in support of Google's letter brief)(Sistos, Antonio)
August 23, 2013 Filing 82 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 80 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. Filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Response to Google letter brief)(Eichmann, John)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to File Letter Brief and to Expedite Letter Briefing Schedule. The deadline for filing letter briefs is extended until 8-20-2013, with the expectation that the parties will meet and confer to propose a further extension to the letter brief deadline in the future. TracBeam's response to Google's letter brief shall be due 8-23-2013. Google's reply shall be due 8-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/21/13. (mll, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 80 Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief re Mtn to Strike Rose)(Jones, Michael)
August 20, 2013 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief and to Expedite Letter Briefing Schedule by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 19, 2013 Filing 78 ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** Letter Brief filed by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sistos, Antonio) Modified on 8/20/2013 (gsg).
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/13. (mll, )
August 13, 2013 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Serve Damages Report) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of TracBeam, L.L.C. (Franzini, Simon)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Motion to Amend Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/13. (mll, )
July 23, 2013 Filing 73 Joint MOTION Amend Case Schedule by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying as moot Google's Motion to Compel (6:13mc20, #1); denying as moot 31 Sealed Motion to Compel; denying as moot 46 Sealed Motion to Compel; granting 47 Sealed Motion to Compel; granting 48 Sealed Motion to Compel; granting 58 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order; granting 70 Motion for Extension of Expert Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/09/13. (mll, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2013 re 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents filed by Google, Inc., 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) filed by TracBeam, L.L.C., 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response filed by Google, Inc., 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan & Judy Werlinger) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in-Sheets) (cwk)
July 8, 2013 Filing 70 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Invalidity Rebuttal Report by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
July 8, 2013 Filing 69 SEALED RESPONSE by Google, Inc. to 64 Sealed Plaintiff's Notice of Additional Disputes, filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Emily)
July 8, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4211857. (Verhoeven, Charles)
July 3, 2013 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Perlson, David)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Schenck terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/3/13. (mjc, )
July 1, 2013 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schenck, Christopher)
July 1, 2013 Filing 64 Sealed Document - Notice of Additional Disputes between TracBeam & Google - (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Google motion in D. Mass., # 2 Exhibit 2: TracBeam's response to Google Motion, # 3 Exhibit 3: Google reply, # 4 Exhibit 4: 6'26'13 email exchange re deadline extension, # 5 Exhibit 5: 6'27'13 email exchange re deadline extension, # 6 Exhibit 6: 6'28'13 meet & confer proposal)(Eichmann, John)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 58 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents, 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response, 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines:Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2013 08:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to attempt to reduce the number of disputed issues before the hearing. Parties are ORDERED to file a status report by 7-03-2013, at noon regarding the status of these motions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/27/13. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 62 SEALED Sur-reply in RESPONSE to Motion re 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Google Inc.'s Sur-reply, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Perlson, David)
June 25, 2013 Filing 61 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Eichmann declaration)(Eichmann, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 60 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration)(Eichmann, John)
June 19, 2013 Filing 59 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response filed by Google, Inc.. (Perlson, David)
June 18, 2013 Filing 58 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/13. (mll, )
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/13. (mll, )
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Combined Briefs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/13. (mll, )
June 12, 2013 Filing 54 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann decl.)(Eichmann, John)
June 12, 2013 Filing 53 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Emily C. O'Brien, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Affidavit Finnegan Southey)(O'Brien, Emily)
June 11, 2013 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Amended) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order - briefing schedule)(Eichmann, John)
June 10, 2013 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Google, Inc., TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
June 6, 2013 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Combined Briefs by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
May 31, 2013 Filing 49 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Eichmann, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 48 Opposed SEALED MOTION to compel and extend expert deadlines by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 47 SEALED MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony From Google in Response to Topics 21 and 33 Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Noroozi Declaration ISO TracBeam's MTC Google re Topics 21 and 33 and Exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
May 24, 2013 Filing 46 SEALED MOTION to Compel TracBeam to Response to Common Interrogatory No. 2 and to Strike Untimely Portions of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kammerud Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Affidavit Perlson Declaration, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Kammerud, Margaret)
May 22, 2013 Filing 45 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Bunt, Robert)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/21/13. (mjc, )
May 20, 2013 Filing 43 SEALED Exhibit B to Main Document: 42 Reply to Response to SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents. (Kammerud, Margaret)
May 20, 2013 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sohn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Kammerud, Margaret)
May 20, 2013 Filing 41 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/13. (mll, )
May 10, 2013 Filing 39 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2013 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Google's Motion to Compel by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Eichmann, John)
May 9, 2013 Filing 37 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1: objections to deposition notice, # 3 Exhibit 2: draft agreement)(Eichmann, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2013: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/13. (mll, )
May 4, 2013 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order (certain discovery and expert deadlines)) by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to amend DCO)(Eichmann, John)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/22/13. (mll, )
April 19, 2013 Filing 33 Unopposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT ITS INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS ON IMPROPER INVENTORSHIP by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Emily)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Leonard Davis. Motion granted: 30 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Order Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/18/13. (mjc, )
April 18, 2013 Filing 31 SEALED MOTION to Compel Additional 30(b)(6) Testimony and Production of Dupray/LeBlanc Documents by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sohn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kammerud, Margaret)
April 15, 2013 Filing 30 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended DCO)(Eichmann, John)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Lee Bernell terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/13. (mll, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alan D Albright terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/13. (mll, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Calvin Yu Cheng terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/11/13. (mll, )
April 10, 2013 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernell, Benjamin)
April 10, 2013 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
April 10, 2013 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheng, Calvin)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/28/13. cc:attys 3-28-13 (mll, )
March 27, 2013 Filing 22 First Amended ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Google, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
March 27, 2013 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to File First Amended Answer by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 27, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Melissa J Baily on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4065569. (Baily, Melissa)
March 21, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Sistos on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4057179. (Sistos, Antonio)
March 20, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Pirnie Kammerud on behalf of Google, Inc. (Kammerud, Margaret)
March 18, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by TracBeam, L.L.C. re Identification of Claims (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 13, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua L Sohn on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4042743. (Sohn, Joshua)
March 12, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aaron Bergstrom on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4041493. (Bergstrom, Aaron)
March 12, 2013 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Google Inc by Emily C O'Brien (APPROVED, Filing Fee $100, receipt number 0540-4041274) (bsw, )
March 12, 2013 Filing 13 ***DEFICIENT FILING. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Emily C O'Brien on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4041274. (O'Brien, Emily) Modified on 3/12/2013 (gsg).
March 7, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Google, Inc. (Perlson, David)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/28/13. cc:attys 3-04-13 (mll, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 9 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed DCO)(Eichmann, John)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pre-trial Mediation Completion due by 10/18/2013. Hon Edward A Infante is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/12/13. cc:attys 2-12-13(mll, )
February 12, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Edward A Infante is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-11-13(mll, )
February 4, 2013 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Agreed Protective Order by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Eichmann, John)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that parties submit a new Docket Control Order and Protective Order for this case within ten days. All court dates, including the pre-trial, trial, and briefing schedule, shall be identical to those established in the earlier action. (See 6:11-CV-96, Docket No. 110.) Additionally, the Court WAIVES the filing fee for this action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13(mll, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (mll, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 4 ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Google, Inc..(mll, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TracBeam, L.L.C. (mll, )
January 23, 2013 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., filed by TracBeam, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(mll, )
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER severing Defendant Google Inc from cause 6:11cv96 and assigning it to a new civil action. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/23/13. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TracBeam, L.L.C. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TracBeam, L.L.C.
Represented By: Julien Antonio Adams
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Gregory Scott Dovel
Represented By: John Jeffrey Eichmann
Represented By: Richard Elgar Lyon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Represented By: Benjamin Lee Bernell
Represented By: Robert C Bertin
Represented By: Calvin Yu Cheng
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Susan Baker Manning
Represented By: Christopher Schenck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Represented By: Edward Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?