Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc and Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Case Number: 6:2013cv00419
Filed: May 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2016 Filing 555 Redacted Transcript of Pre-Trial Conference held on June 28, 2016 re: Docket No. 537. Redacted per Court Order Docket No. 550.(tlh, )
August 15, 2016 Filing 554 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, )
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 FINAL JUDGMENT that the above-entitled and numbered cause of action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is ORDERED to close the above- entitled civil action. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/15/16. (mll, )
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting 549 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Co. Inc.,, BestBuy.com, LLC. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Best Buy Defendants in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/09/16. (mll, )
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting 546 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. All claims, counterclaims, and defenses asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Apple in the above-captioned case can be dismissed with prejudice. All claims and defenses asserted by Defendant against Plaintiff in the above-captioned case can be dismissed with prejudice. All counterclaims asserted by Defendant against Plaintiff in the above-captioned case can be dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/09/16. (mll, )
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER granting 547 Motion to Redact re 537 Transcript of Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/09/16. (mll, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 549 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wallace, Brooke)
August 5, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 548 Stipulation of Dismissal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 548 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***STIPULATION of Dismissal by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 8/5/2016 (mjc, ).
August 1, 2016 Filing 547 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 537 Transcript,,,, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 27, 2016 Filing 546 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
July 8, 2016 Filing 545 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (Apple Inc.)(Folsom, David)
July 8, 2016 Case Stayed per 544 Order. (mll, )
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting 543 Sealed Motion to Stay. All unreached deadlines in the Court's Docket Control Order 522 are STAYED for a period of 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/08/16. (mll, )
July 8, 2016 Filing 543 Joint SEALED MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
July 7, 2016 Filing 542 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Melissa Richards Smith re 537 Transcript,,,,. (Smith, Melissa)
July 6, 2016 Filing 541 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC Notice of Mirror Worlds Proposed Jury Instruction re Apple I (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
July 6, 2016 Filing 540 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Preliminary Jury Instructions (Rooklidge, William)
July 6, 2016 Filing 539 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 510 SEALED MOTION in Limine, 509 MOTION in Limine Updated Notice of Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Agreed Motions in Limine (Gardner, Allen)
July 6, 2016 Filing 538 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 535 Sealed Document filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
July 1, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pre-Trial Conference held on 06/28/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2016. (bhs, )
July 1, 2016 Filing 536 Opposed MOTION and Request for Expedited Relief to Compel Production of Materials Relating to Mirror Worlds I by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
June 30, 2016 Filing 535 Sealed Notice of Filings Requested by the Court at the Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 30, 2016 Filing 534 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (SMC)
June 29, 2016 Filing 533 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 6/28/2016 Pretrial Conference before Judge Schroeder. (Smith, Melissa)
June 27, 2016 Filing 532 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re Exhibit Buckets for PTC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL HEARING. Parties shall be prepared to discuss trial logistics, argue motions in limine and pretrial objections, and raise any housekeeping issues with the Court. Each party shall have no more than two hours to present argument. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/27/16. (mll, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 530 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 510 SEALED MOTION in Limine, 509 MOTION in Limine (Updated Notice of Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Agreed Motions in Limine (Including the Resolution of Apple's Motion in Limine No. 2 and Mirror Worlds' Motion in Limine Nos. 4-5, 7-8)) (Smith, Melissa)
June 21, 2016 Filing 529 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Time Requested for Voir Dire, Opening Statements, Direct & Cross, and Closing Arguments (Smith, Melissa)
June 21, 2016 Filing 528 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Time Requested for Voir Dire, Opening Statements, Direct & Cross, and Closing Argument (Jacobson, Jonas)
June 20, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 524 Joint Pretrial Order. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING AT 527 .*** (mjc, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 527 Sealed Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - MW Updated Trial Witness List, # 2 Ex. 2 - MW Deposition Designations, # 3 Ex. 3 - Apple's Trial Witness List, # 4 Ex. 4 - Apple's Initial Deposition Designations, # 5 Ex. 5 - MW Exhibit List, # 6 Ex. 6 - Apple's Initial Exhibit List)(Gardner, Allen)
June 17, 2016 Filing 526 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 509 MOTION in Limine filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 17, 2016 Filing 525 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 510 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit R. Mangum, # 2 Exhibit A - MWI Jury Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit B - Bakewell Rebuttal, # 4 Exhibit C - Raich Depo Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit D - Weil Depo Excerpts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
June 17, 2016 Filing 524 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Sealed Joint Pretrial Order (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - MW Updated Trial Witness List, # 2 Ex. 2 - MW Deposition Designations, # 3 Ex. 3 - Apple's Trial Witness List, # 4 Ex. 4 - 2016-06-17 Apple's Initial Deposition Designations, # 5 Ex. 5 - MW Exhibit List, # 6 Ex. 6 - Apple's Initial Exhibit List)(Gardner, Allen) Modified on 6/20/2016 (mjc, ).
June 17, 2016 Filing 523 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC on Jury Instructions and Parties' Proposed Verdict Forms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER granting 517 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Apple Inc. Jury Selection set for 7/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2016 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/16/16. (mll, )
June 15, 2016 Filing 521 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense filed by Apple Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
June 15, 2016 Filing 520 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 497 MOTION for Reconsideration re 346 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,,,, due to intervening controlling authority filed by Apple Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
June 15, 2016 Filing 519 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Halo USSCT)(Gardner, Allen)
June 14, 2016 Filing 518 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement of Supplemental Authority (Jacobson, Jonas)
June 14, 2016 Filing 517 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
June 13, 2016 Filing 516 REPLY to Response to Motion re 497 MOTION for Reconsideration re 346 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,,,, due to intervening controlling authority and 498 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense re supplemental briefing addressing intervening controlling authority filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
June 13, 2016 Filing 515 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Regarding Request for Rehearing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rehearing Request)(Gardner, Allen)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER granting 512 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Jury Selection set for 7/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2016 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/08/16. (mll, )
June 7, 2016 Filing 513 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
June 6, 2016 Filing 512 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the DCO by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 6, 2016 Filing 511 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Jeffrey Eichmann on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Eichmann, John)
June 3, 2016 Filing 510 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
June 3, 2016 Filing 509 MOTION in Limine by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Mangum, Rustin)
June 3, 2016 Filing 508 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC Of Joint Stipulation Relating To Certain Motions In Limine (Mangum, Rustin)
June 3, 2016 Filing 507 RESPONSE in Opposition re 497 MOTION for Reconsideration re 346 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,,,, due to intervening controlling authority filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
May 31, 2016 Filing 506 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 05/19/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2016. (bhs, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 505 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Jacobson, Jonas)
May 31, 2016 Filing 504 NOTICE by Apple Inc. (Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting) (Smith, Melissa)
May 31, 2016 Filing 503 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Submission of Deposition Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Manheim, # 2 Ex. 2 - Keller)(Gardner, Allen)
May 27, 2016 Filing 502 Agreed MOTION FOR JURY QUESTIONNAIRE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -- Agreed Jury Questionnaire, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
May 26, 2016 Filing 501 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of decision denying institution of CBM review on section 101 and 112 grounds (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
May 19, 2016 Filing 500 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2016 re 457 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic filed by Apple Inc., 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 453 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Apple Inc., 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 450 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions by Apple's Technical Expert, Dr. Arthur Keller filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 467 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims are not Patent Eligible filed by Apple Inc., 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc., 438 Joint MOTION to Amend Jury Selection Date filed by Apple Inc., 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
May 18, 2016 Filing 499 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 EX A - TLI Decision)(Gardner, Allen)
May 16, 2016 Filing 498 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense re supplemental briefing addressing intervening controlling authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
May 16, 2016 Filing 497 MOTION for Reconsideration re 346 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,,,, due to intervening controlling authority by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
May 11, 2016 Filing 496 SEALED SURREPLY re 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
May 9, 2016 Filing 495 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
May 9, 2016 Filing 494 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar, 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report, 452 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Apple's Witnesses (Jacobson, Jonas)
May 5, 2016 Filing 493 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Lyon, Richard)
May 5, 2016 Filing 492 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
May 5, 2016 Filing 491 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 457 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
May 5, 2016 Filing 490 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
May 5, 2016 Filing 489 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 452 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Apple's Witnesses filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2016 Filing 488 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2016 Filing 487 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 450 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions by Apple's Technical Expert, Dr. Arthur Keller filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2016 Filing 486 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Apple Inc.)(Folsom, David)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting 484 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/27/16. (mll, )
April 26, 2016 Filing 484 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Mirror Worlds Motion to Strike the Untimely Contentions in Keller Infringement Report (Dkt 447) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
April 25, 2016 Filing 483 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 467 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims are not Patent Eligible (Jacobson, Jonas)
April 25, 2016 Filing 482 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
April 25, 2016 Filing 481 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 452 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Apple's Witnesses filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Affidavit of Rick Lyon)(Lyon, Richard)
April 25, 2016 Filing 480 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 450 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions by Apple's Technical Expert, Dr. Arthur Keller filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Lyon, Richard)
April 25, 2016 Filing 479 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Brooke Myers Wallace, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2016 Filing 478 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2016 Filing 477 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2016 Filing 476 REPLY to Response to Motion re 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2016 Filing 475 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 EX 1 - Feiner Report, # 2 EX 2 - Apple's Second Supplemental Response to Common Interrogatories, # 3 EX 3 - Apple's Fifth Supplemental Response to Common Interrogatories, # 4 EX 4 - Manheim Report, # 5 EX 5 - First Supplemental Manheim Report, # 6 EX 6 - Keller Report, # 7 EX 7 - Second Supplemental Manheim Report, # 8 EX 8 - Apple's Responses to Common Interrogatories, # 9 EX 9 - Invalidity Contentions, # 10 EX 10 - Apple's Fourth Supplemental Response to Common Interrogatories, # 11 EX 11 - Apple's Response to Fourth Set of Common Interrogatories, # 12 EX 12 - Corrected Appendix to P. R. 3-1, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2016 Filing 474 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 453 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Rick Lyon, # 3 Affidavit of Dan Manheim, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16)(Lyon, Richard)
April 15, 2016 Filing 473 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Rick Lyon, # 3 Affidavit of Dan Manheim, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14)(Lyon, Richard)
April 15, 2016 Filing 472 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 3 Affidavit of Dan Manheim, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12)(Jacobson, Jonas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 471 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Jacobson, Jonas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 470 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 452 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Apple's Witnesses filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2016 Filing 469 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 466 Sealed Response to Motion,, 467 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims are not Patent Eligible.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Arthur M.Keller, PH.D)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2016 Filing 468 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 450 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions by Apple's Technical Expert, Dr. Arthur Keller filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Rustin Mangum, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2016 Filing 467 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Asserted Claims are not Patent Eligible by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2016 Filing 466 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(Smith, Melissa)
April 12, 2016 Filing 465 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Resolution of Discovery Dispute (Jacobson, Jonas)
April 11, 2016 Filing 464 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
April 11, 2016 Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (gsg)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING 462 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 AT 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 7/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2016 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/8/2016. (gsg)
April 6, 2016 Filing 462 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 30, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, Sealed Motion #457 is the pending motion, re Order #460 allowing excess page limits. Document # 458, Sealed Motion is Now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting 459 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion To Exclude The Opinions Of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC's Damages Expert. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/23/16. (mll, )
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 449 Motion for Leave to Reallocate Pages and Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/23/16. (mll, )
March 23, 2016 Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Exclude the testimony of Plaintiffs damages expert, Walter Bratic by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 23, 2016 Filing 458 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Brooke Myers Wallace, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 3/30/2016 (sm, ).
March 23, 2016 Filing 457 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLCs Damages Expert, Mr. W. Bratic by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Declaration of Brooke Myers Wallace)(Smith, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 456 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 455 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 454 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 13)(Smith, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 453 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Melissa)
March 22, 2016 Filing 452 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Apple's Witnesses by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 22, 2016 Filing 451 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Apple's Section 101 Defense by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Affidavit of Dan Manheim, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 22, 2016 Filing 450 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions by Apple's Technical Expert, Dr. Arthur Keller by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 22, 2016 Filing 449 Joint MOTION for Leave to Reallocate Pages and Exceed Page Limit by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 19, 2016 Filing 448 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
March 18, 2016 Filing 447 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Contentions in Dr. Keller's Infringement Report by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Rick Lyon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Lyon, Richard)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/18/16. (mll, )
March 18, 2016 Filing 445 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the DCO by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 17, 2016 Filing 444 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Jacobson, Jonas)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER REGARDING LETTER BRIEFS. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and file no later than 3-18-2016 a proposed briefing schedule identifying the number of pages remaining and the summary judgment motions each side plans to file. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/16/16. (mll, )
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER denying as moot 301 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/16/16. (mll, )
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting 242 Sealed Motion to Compel. Apple is ORDERED to supplement its response to Common Interrogatory No. 5 as soon as practicable. Apple may file a Daubert motion relating to any supplemental expert report that Mirror Worlds's experts file as a result of production of the license agreements. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/16/16. (mll, )
March 11, 2016 Filing 440 RESPONSE to 435 Notice (Other) Apple Notice re 242 MW Mot to Compel filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
March 11, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 439, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 10, 2016 Filing 439 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 435 Notice (Other) Apple Notice re 242 MW Mot to Compel (Jacobson, Jonas) Modified on 3/11/2016 (sm, ).
March 10, 2016 Filing 438 Joint MOTION to Amend Jury Selection Date by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 10, 2016 Filing 437 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 356 SEALED MOTION to Compel that 356 is Moot (Jacobson, Jonas)
March 10, 2016 Filing 436 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC that 269 and 301 are Moot (Jacobson, Jonas)
March 10, 2016 Filing 435 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 242 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5 (Smith, Melissa)
March 7, 2016 Filing 434 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Rebuttal Trial Witness List (Smith, Melissa)
March 7, 2016 Filing 433 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Compliance Regarding Trial Witness Lists (Jacobson, Jonas)
March 7, 2016 Filing 432 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Rustin K. Mangum, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Melissa)
March 7, 2016 Filing 431 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Trial Witness List (Smith, Melissa)
February 29, 2016 Filing 430 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 29, 2016 Filing 429 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 29, 2016 Filing 428 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 29, 2016 Filing 427 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 29, 2016 Filing 426 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/26/16. (mll, )
February 25, 2016 Filing 424 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 24, 2016 Filing 423 NOTICE by Dell Inc. Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Dacus, Deron)
February 24, 2016 Filing 422 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 23, 2016 Filing 421 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Apple Inc. (Valek, Michael)
February 22, 2016 Filing 420 SEALED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 402 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting in part 416 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The request to move the deadline for filing dispositive and Daubert motions is granted; however, all briefing on dispositive and Daubert motions must be complete no later than 4-29-2016. Parties shall file a proposed Docket Control Order consistent with this Order no later than 2-26-2016. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/22/16. (mll, )
February 22, 2016 Filing 418 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 22, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 412 Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED UNDER SEAL PER ATTY.*** (mjc, ) Modified on 2/22/2016 (mjc, ).
February 19, 2016 Filing 417 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
February 19, 2016 Filing 416 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 19, 2016 Filing 415 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 405 Notice (Other) of Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under §112 (Jacobson, Jonas)
February 19, 2016 Filing 414 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 19, 2016 Filing 413 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 19, 2016 Filing 412 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas) Modified on 2/22/2016 (mjc, ).
February 19, 2016 Filing 411 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 10, 2016 Filing 410 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
February 8, 2016 Filing 409 NOTICE regarding a motion that is moot re 398 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Letter Brief for Apple's Technical Expert by Mirror Worlds Technologies (Jacobson, Jonas)
February 5, 2016 Filing 408 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
February 5, 2016 Filing 407 Opposed MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Reports of Walter Bratic, Dan Manheim, and R. Sukumar by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 406 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jacobson, Jonas)
January 29, 2016 Filing 405 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Intent to File a Motion for Summary Judgment on Patent Invalidity Under §112 (Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 404 SEALED Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 403 SEALED Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of No Indirect or Willful Infringement filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 402 SEALED Letter Brief Requesting Permission to Move to Exclude Dan Manheim filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 401 SEALED Letter Brief Requesting Permission to Move to Exclude Walter Bratic filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 400 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 399 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC Of Intent to File Motions for Summary Judgment on Patent Eligibility Under §101 (Jacobson, Jonas)
January 28, 2016 Filing 398 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Letter Brief for Apple's Technical Expert by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
January 21, 2016 Filing 397 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Service of Supplemental Expert Reports (Jacobson, Jonas)
January 18, 2016 Filing 396 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Service of Supplemental Expert Report (Jacobson, Jonas)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/29/15. (mll, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 394 Joint MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 361 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 362 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 369 Sealed Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/03/15. (mll, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 392 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 11/16/2015 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_butler@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2016. (bhb, )
November 16, 2015 Filing 391 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2015 re 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 369 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that Mirror Worlds' Infringement Claim is Barred by Claim and Issue Preclusion filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
November 16, 2015 Filing 390 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lamb, William)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against the Defendants in Consolidated Civil Action 6:13cv941 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All counterclaims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PRJUDICE. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation including attorney and expert fees and expenses shall be borne solely by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/09/15. (mll, )
November 4, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion, 369 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that Mirror Worlds' Infringement Claim is Barred by Claim and Issue Preclusion, 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses : Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (SMC)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/27/15. (mll, )
October 23, 2015 Filing 387 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC joint notice of completed briefing on preclusion motions (Jacobson, Jonas)
October 22, 2015 Filing 386 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 348 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, by Microsoft Corporation, Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER granting 384 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order with respect to the deadlines for Mirror Worlds' and Apple's opening and rebuttal expert reports. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/20/15. (mll, )
October 19, 2015 Filing 384 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the DCO by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting 382 Motion for Stipulation regarding discovery. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/19/15. (mll, )
October 19, 2015 Filing 382 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 19, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR., MUST BE FILED AS A MOTION Document # 381, Stipulation. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 16, 2015 Filing 381 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***STIPULATION REGARDING DISCOVERY by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wallace, Brooke) Modified on 10/19/2015 (sm, ).
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER denying without prejudice 175 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 187 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/30/15. (mll, )
September 25, 2015 Filing 379 REPLY to Response to Motion re 369 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that Mirror Worlds' Infringement Claim is Barred by Claim and Issue Preclusion filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
September 25, 2015 Filing 378 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
September 25, 2015 Filing 377 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER denying 349 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/24/2015. (gsg)
September 21, 2015 Filing 375 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 356 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
September 21, 2015 Filing 374 REPLY to Response to Motion re 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
September 21, 2015 Filing 373 REPLY to Response to Motion re 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
September 21, 2015 NOTICE FROM CLERK re Notice of Docket Correction regarding 370 and 371. CLERK IS MODIFYING THIS NOTICE TO REFLECT THAT IT IS DOCUMENTS #370 and #372, Response in support, THAT ARE IN ERROR. #371 IS NOT FILED IN ERROR. (sm, )
September 21, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Documents # 370 and #371, Resposnes in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 18, 2015 Filing 372 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas) Modified on 9/21/2015 (sm, ).
September 18, 2015 Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re 369 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that Mirror Worlds' Infringement Claim is Barred by Claim and Issue Preclusion filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
September 18, 2015 Filing 370 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas) Modified on 9/21/2015 (sm, ).
September 11, 2015 Filing 369 Cross SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment that Mirror Worlds' Infringement Claim is Barred by Claim and Issue Preclusion by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stuart M. Rosenberg, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
September 11, 2015 Filing 368 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stuart M. Rosenberg, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
September 11, 2015 Filing 367 RESPONSE in Opposition re 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 10, 2015 Filing 366 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 356 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Mandy Pezzano, # 2 Exhibit 26, # 3 Exhibit 27, # 4 Exhibit 28, # 5 Exhibit 29)(Reiter, Mark)
September 2, 2015 Filing 365 STIPULATION re email ESI by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
August 31, 2015 Filing 364 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 356 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Affidavit Of Jonas Jacobson, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
August 28, 2015 Filing 363 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses.. (Jacobson, Jonas)
August 28, 2015 Filing 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Validity Preclusion by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson)(Jacobson, Jonas)
August 28, 2015 Filing 361 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Apple's Claim Preclusion and Issue Preclusion Defenses by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Jacobson, Jonas)
August 24, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 349 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wallace, Brooke)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting 358 Motion Requesting Ruling on Letter Briefs and Agreed Briefing Schedule for Preclusion Motions. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/24/15. (mll, )
August 20, 2015 Filing 358 Joint MOTION requesting ruling on letter briefs re validity preclusion and agreed briefing schedule for preclusion motions by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jonas)
August 19, 2015 Filing 357 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 349 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Jacobson, Jonas)
August 14, 2015 Filing 356 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Mandy Pezzano, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
August 13, 2015 Filing 355 REPLY to Response to Motion re 349 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Apple Inc.. (Wallace, Brooke)
August 13, 2015 Filing 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rustin Kent Mangum on behalf of Apple Inc. (Mangum, Rustin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 353 RESPONSE to Motion re 349 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonas Jacobson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Jacobson, Jonas)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER SETTING AGREED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The following briefing schedule is set for Apple's Emergency Motion to Modify Order to Certify Interlocutory Appeal 349 . Plaintiff Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC's response is due on 8-07-2015. Defendant Apple Inc.'s reply is due on 8-13-2015. Plaintiff Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC's surreply is due on 8-19-2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/29/15. (mll, )
July 28, 2015 Filing 351 Agreed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER re 349 Emergency MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Apple Inc. Parties shall file an agreed briefing schedule, no later than 7-28-2015, whereby all briefing is completed by 8-19-2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/24/15. (mll, )
July 23, 2015 Filing 349 Emergency MOTION To Modify Order for Certificate of Appealability and request for expedited briefing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Certify, # 2 Text of Proposed Order re Request for Expedited Briefing)(Wallace, Brooke)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 6/3/2016. Evidentiary/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 7/5/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 7/18/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2016 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/22/15. (mll, )
July 17, 2015 Filing 347 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report per Dkt. 346 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER denying 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 262 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 277 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 292 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 300 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status update requesting any amendments to the Docket Control Order by 7-17-2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/07/15. (mll, )
July 2, 2015 Filing 345 RESPONSE to 343 Notice (Other) Apple Inc.'s Response to Mirror Worlds' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding the Kessler Doctrine filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 2, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 344, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 344 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 343 Notice (Other) Apple Inc.'s Response To Notice of Supp Authority (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/2/2015 (sm, ).
June 30, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC Notice of Supplemental Authority re Dkt. Nos. 254 & 262 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Speedtrack v. Office Depot Decision)(Lyon, Richard)
June 2, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 05/29/15 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Butler, CSR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018, brenda_butler@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2015. (bhb, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 341 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Microsoft Corporation)(Folsom, David)
May 29, 2015 Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2015 re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine filed by Apple Inc., 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bas)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting 336 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/20/15. (mll, )
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting 335 Motion to Join Hearing. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 277 shall be heard at 9:00 a.m. on 5-29-2015, at the United Stated Courthouse for the Eastern District of Texas, Texarkana Division. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/20/15. (mll, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 337 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine, 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine , NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
May 12, 2015 Filing 336 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 8, 2015 Filing 335 Agreed MOTION to Join Hearing by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 8, 2015 Filing 334 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Dovel on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Dovel, Gregory)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting 332 Emergency MOTION for Ruling on Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Dispositive Motions. All discovery between Mirror Worlds and Apple is STAYED pending decisions on the parties' fully-briefed cross-motions for summary judgment regarding the Kessler doctrine (Docket Nos. 254, 262) and the parties' cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings regarding invalidity (Docket Nos. 292, 300). The Court sets these cross-motions for hearing in the Texarkana Courthouse at 9:00 AM on 5-29-2015. Setting Hearing on Motion 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine, 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine : Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2015 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/08/15. (mll, )
May 5, 2015 Filing 332 Emergency MOTION for Ruling on Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Dispositive Motions by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Stuart M. Rosenberg)(Smith, Melissa)
April 28, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassandra Lee Gaedt on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gaedt, Cassandra)
April 20, 2015 Filing 330 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple Inc.. (Wallace, Brooke)
April 17, 2015 Filing 329 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Reiter, Mark)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting 316 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 317 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 319 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 320 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 323 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 324 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 327 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Cho, Christin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 326 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Cho, Christin)
April 7, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Chandler Kogan on behalf of Apple Inc. (Kogan, Christina)
April 6, 2015 Filing 324 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 315 Reply to Response to Motion, 314 Response in Opposition to Motion, for judgment on the pleadings by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
April 6, 2015 Filing 323 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 312 Response in Opposition to Motion, 313 Reply to Response to Motion, for judgment on the pleadings by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
March 31, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine, 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine (Notice of Joint Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiff and Defendant Apple, Inc.) (Hill, Jack)
March 27, 2015 Filing 321 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 301 MOTION to Stay Discovery pending dispositive motions filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard Lyon)(Lyon, Richard)
March 25, 2015 Filing 320 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 312 Response in Opposition to Motion, 313 Reply to Response to Motion, by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
March 23, 2015 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 315 Reply to Response to Motion, 314 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
March 23, 2015 Filing 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re 301 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 20, 2015 Filing 317 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
March 20, 2015 Filing 316 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 19, 2015 Filing 315 REPLY to Response to Motion re 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
March 19, 2015 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
March 19, 2015 Filing 313 REPLY to Response to Motion re 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Transcript I (9/27/2010 AM), # 2 Exhibit Trial Transcript II (9/27/2010 PM), # 3 Exhibit Trial Transcript III (9/28/2010 PM), # 4 Exhibit Unpublished opinion)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 19, 2015 Filing 312 RESPONSE in Opposition re 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Transcript I (9/27/2010 AM), # 2 Exhibit Trial Transcript II (9/27/2010 PM), # 3 Exhibit Trial Transcript III (9/28/2010 PM), # 4 Exhibit Unpublished order)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 18, 2015 Filing 311 RESPONSE to Motion re 301 MOTION to Stay Discovery pending dispositive motions filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard Lyon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Lyon, Richard)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 302 Motion to Expedite/Shorten Time of Briefing. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/13/15. (mll, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 309 RESPONSE in Opposition re 302 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 9/12/14 letter from Rooklidge to Franzini)(Lyon, Richard)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER re 302 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Apple Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to the Motion by 3-12-2015 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/11/15. (mll, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 307 SUR-REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 273 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply Letter Brief to Mirror Worlds' Letter Brief Requesting to File Summary Judgment on Validity Preclusion)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 9, 2015 Filing 306 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 299 Response to Motion, Notice of Consolidated Briefing Regarding Motion and Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Wallace, Brooke)
March 9, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 305, Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 305 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply Letter Brief to Mirror Worlds' Letter Brief Requesting to File Summary Judgment on Validity Preclusion)(Rosenberg, Stuart) Modified on 3/9/2015 (sm, ).
March 5, 2015 Filing 304 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Notice of Compliance (Valek, Michael)
March 5, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC to File Consolidated Briefing Regarding Motion and Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Reiter, Mark)
March 5, 2015 Filing 302 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Motion to Stay Discovery by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 5, 2015 Filing 301 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stuart M. Rosenberg, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
March 2, 2015 Filing 300 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
March 2, 2015 Filing 299 RESPONSE to Motion re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
February 23, 2015 Filing 298 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 287 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply in support of Mirror Worlds' letter brief requesting to file summary judgment on validity preclusion)(Franzini, Simon)
February 20, 2015 Filing 297 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soobert, Allan)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 295 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/20/2015. (sm, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 295 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 287 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting to file Summary Judgment on validity preclusion by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting 293 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Responses due by 3/2/2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/17/2015. (sm, )
February 17, 2015 Filing 293 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
February 13, 2015 Filing 292 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Stuart)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2015. (sm, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting 284 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Responses due by 2/17/2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/11/2015. (sm, )
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 285 Motion to Withdraw Hilda Galvan, Mark Finkelstein, Scott Poteet and Daniel O'Brien (Jones Day) as attorneys of record for defendants. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/11/2015. (sm, )
February 10, 2015 Filing 288 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Protective Order)(Lyon, Richard)
February 9, 2015 Filing 287 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief in Response to Mirror Worlds' Letter Brief Requesting to File Summary Judgment on Validity Preclusion)(Rooklidge, William)
February 6, 2015 Filing 286 JOINT STATUS REPORT re Motions to compel PC Manufacturers by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
February 6, 2015 Filing 285 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel)
February 6, 2015 Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cho, Christin)
February 2, 2015 Filing 283 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 269 SEALED MOTION to Amend Protective Order filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Denying Mirror Worlds Motion to Amend the Protective Order)(Soobert, Allan)
February 2, 2015 Filing 282 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard Lyon)(Lyon, Richard)
February 2, 2015 Filing 281 RESPONSE in Opposition re 269 SEALED MOTION to Amend Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of B. Wallace ISO Apple's Opposition to Mirror Worlds' Motion to Amend the PO, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ContentGuard PO, # 3 Exhibit 2 - VantagePoint PO, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Minerva PO, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Openwave PO, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Softview PO, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Shared Memory Graphics Order, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Email chain re PO, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Denying Mirror Worlds' Motion to Amend the PO)(Wallace, Brooke)
February 2, 2015 Filing 280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonas B Jacobson on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Jacobson, Jonas)
January 27, 2015 Filing 279 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Mattison Rosenberg on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rosenberg, Stuart)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER that parties will file a joint status report by February 6, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/27/2015. (sm, )
January 23, 2015 Filing 277 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
January 23, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Myers Wallace on behalf of Apple Inc. (Wallace, Brooke)
January 23, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 268 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Kessler Doctrine -- the Motion is Now Moot (Rooklidge, William)
January 21, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation (Pezzano, Amanda)
January 21, 2015 Filing 273 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter brief re MSJ re validity issue preclusion)(Franzini, Simon)
January 20, 2015 Filing 272 RESPONSE in Opposition re 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine filed by Apple Inc.. (Rooklidge, William)
January 20, 2015 Filing 271 REPLY TO RESPONSE in Support re 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine filed by Apple Inc.. (Rooklidge, William) Modified on 1/21/2015 (sm, ).
January 16, 2015 Filing 270 STATUS REPORT re Motions to compel PC Manufacturers by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (bas, ).
January 15, 2015 Filing 269 SEALED MOTION to Amend Protective Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Apple document, # 3 Exhibit 2 - PO in Rotatable Technologies, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation re confidential information, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Redlined PO)(Franzini, Simon)
January 15, 2015 Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Kessler Doctrine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel)
January 14, 2015 Filing 267 Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, )
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/15. (mll, )
January 13, 2015 Filing 265 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Soobert, Allan)
January 13, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Proceedings held on 11/13/14 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2015. (sms, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER re 187 Opposed MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Motion for Protection 177 filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, 175 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Timely Production of Relevant Documents filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. Parties shall meet and confer regarding these Motions and file a joint status report by 1-16-2015 to identify which disputes require the Court's attention. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/15. (mll, )
January 9, 2015 Filing 262 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment of no preclusion under the Kessler doctrine by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lyon Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Verdict form, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Infringement contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Interrogatory response, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 30(b)(6) deposition notice, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Hornkvist deposition notice, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
January 9, 2015 Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lyon Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Verdict form, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Infringement contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Interrogatory response, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 30(b)(6) deposition notice, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Hornkvist deposition notice, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyon, Richard)
December 16, 2014 Filing 260 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Microsoft Corporation for proceedings held on 11/13/2014 - Markman Hearing before Judge Leonard Davis. (Valek, Michael)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 258 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine; Responses due by 1/9/2015. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/14. (mll, )
December 11, 2014 Filing 258 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
December 8, 2014 Filing 257 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Exhibit S contained in main document): 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T - PX 344, # 2 Exhibit U - PX 1640, # 3 Exhibit V - PX 198, # 4 Exhibit W - Contention Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit X - Contention Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Y - Contention Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit Z - Contention Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit AA - Contention Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit BB - CFUUID Reference)(Galvan, Hilda)
December 8, 2014 Filing 256 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Exhibit J contained in main document): 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K - '227 patent, # 2 Exhibit L - Purchase Agreement, # 3 Exhibit M - Assignment, # 4 Exhibit N - Production Ltr, # 5 Exhibit O - Withdrawal of Claim 44, # 6 Exhibit P - Final Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Q - NSMetadata Query, # 8 Exhibit R - PX 343)(Galvan, Hilda)
December 8, 2014 Filing 255 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Exhibit A contained in main document): 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B - MWI Demonstratives, # 2 Exhibit C - MW P.R. 3-1, # 3 Exhibit D - MW Amended P.R. 3-1, # 4 Exhibit E - PX 127, # 5 Exhibit F - Contention Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit G - Source Code Ltr, # 7 Exhibit H - Contention Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit I - Contention Exhibit 16)(Galvan, Hilda)
December 8, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Infringement Claim is Precluded Under the Kessler Doctrine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Hornkvist Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Comparison Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Poteet Declaration)(Galvan, Hilda)
December 5, 2014 Filing 253 SEALED SURREPLY re 242 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5 filed by Apple Inc.. (Poteet, Scott)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/03/14. (mll, )
November 25, 2014 Filing 251 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 242 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5 filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/14. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 Filing 249 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 242 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - PalTalk Holdings, Inc. v. Microsoft Corp., # 2 Exhibit B - Apple's List of Withheld License Agreements, # 3 Exhibit C - PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC v. Yahoo! Inc., # 4 Exhibit D - Apple Press Release re Introduction of Mac OS X 10.4, # 5 Exhibit E - Letters from Looking Glass's Counsel, Charles R. Macedo (May 29, 2014; June 6, 2014), # 6 Exhibit F - Agreed Protective Order from Mirror Worlds, LLC v. Apple Inc., # 7 Exhibit G - Emails from Mirror Worlds' Counsel, Simon Franzini (May 22, 2014; May 23, 2014; May 28, 2014), # 8 Exhibit H - Email and Attachment from Mirror Worlds' Counsel, Simon Franzini (Oct. 29, 2014), # 9 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order Denying Mirror Worlds' Sealed Motion to Compel)(Poteet, Scott)
November 17, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of filing of Mirror Worlds' Markman Presentation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - "data unit" presentation slides, # 2 Exhibit 1b - indefiniteness presentation slides, # 3 Exhibit 2 - "computer system" presentation slides, # 4 Exhibit 3 - "main stream" and "substream" presentation slides, # 5 Exhibit 4 - "timestamp to identify" presentation slides, # 6 Exhibit 5 - "chronological indicator" presentation slides, # 7 Exhibit 6 - "perspective" presentation slides)(Franzini, Simon)
November 13, 2014 Filing 247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman and Motion held on 11/13/2014 re: 169 Microsoft's Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 7; 175 Mirror World's Motion to Compel Timely Production; 177 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Protective Order; and, 242 Mirror World's Motion to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
November 6, 2014 Filing 246 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
November 4, 2014 Filing 245 JOINT NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC Regarding Status of Outstanding Discovery Disputes (Franzini, Simon)
November 3, 2014 Filing 244 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Reply Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33 - Mirror Worlds' Opening Claim Construction Brief from Apple I, # 2 Exhibit 40 - Levy Daubert from Apple I)(Franzini, Simon)
November 3, 2014 Filing 243 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34 - November 17, 2010 IDS, # 2 Exhibit 35 - '032 Patent to Trojan, # 3 Exhibit 36 - Barron's Dictionary of Computer and Internet Terms, # 4 Exhibit 37 - Microsoft Press Computer Dictionary, # 5 Exhibit 38 - Free Online Dictionary of Computing, # 6 Exhibit 39 - Knox deposition excerpts, # 7 Exhibit 41 - Order denying Levy Daubert in Apple I, # 8 Exhibit 42 - Original Specification of '227 patent, # 9 Exhibit 43 - Webster's New Dictionary of Computer Terms, # 10 Exhibit 44 - Demonstrative Exhibit)(Franzini, Simon)
October 29, 2014 Filing 242 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Apple to Provide a Complete Response to Common Interrogatory 5 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's letter to Mirror Worlds refusing to produce license agreements, # 2 Exhibit 2 - list of withheld license agreements)(Franzini, Simon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2014: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting 240 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/14. (mll, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
October 22, 2014 Filing 239 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 238 Claim Construction Brief. REPLACES EXHIBIT 11 IN DOCKET ENTRY 238 . (Valek, Michael) Modified on 10/22/2014 (gsg).
October 20, 2014 Filing 238 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Valek, Michael)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER REGARDING LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/14. (mll, )
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER REGARDING LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/14. (mll, )
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER that parties SHALL be prepared to discuss any pending motion containing a live dispute on 11-13-2014 immediately following the Markman hearing. Parties SHALL meet and confer regarding such motions and file a joint status report by 11-04-2014 to identify which motions contain outstanding disputes. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/14. (mll, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 234 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '227 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Amendment 3, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Apple I Markman Order, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Mowry Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Knox Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Barron's Dictionary of Computer Terms, 2nd ed., # 7 Exhibit 7 - Random House Webster's Computer and Internet Dictionary, 3rd ed., # 8 Exhibit 8 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary, 2nd ed., # 9 Exhibit 9 - Data Management Handbook, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Electronic Document Management, # 11 Exhibit 11 - The Penguin Concise Dictionary of Computing, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Websters New World Dictionary of Computer Terms, 6th ed., # 13 Exhibit 13 - Websters New World Computer Dictionary, 10th ed., # 14 Exhibit 14 - Barrons Dictionary of Computer and Internet Terms, 5th ed., # 15 Exhibit 15 - Microsoft Computer Dictionary, 3rd ed., # 16 Exhibit 16 - Nov. 3, 1998 Rejection, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Jan. 20, 1999 interview summary, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Wiley Electrical and Electronics Engineering Dictionary, # 19 Exhibit 19 - EMACS, # 20 Exhibit 20 - XV Website,, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Ghostview Website, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Mowry depo, # 23 Exhibit 23 - McGraw-Hill Dictionary of Computing & Communications, # 24 Exhibit 24 - The IEEE Standard Dictionary of Electrical and Electronics Terms, 6th ed., # 25 Exhibit 25 - McGraw-Hill Computer Desktop Encyclopedia, 9th ed., # 26 Exhibit 26 - Original Application, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Amendment 1, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Amendment 2, # 29 Exhibit 29 - The American Heritage Dictionary, 3rd ed., # 30 Exhibit 30 - Random House Websters Dictionary, 4th ed., # 31 Exhibit 31 - Cambridge International Dictionary of English, # 32 Exhibit 32 - The Dictionary of Computer Graphics and Virtual Reality, 2nd. ed.)(Franzini, Simon)
October 6, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonas P Herrell on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4869166. (Herrell, Jonas)
October 6, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 232, Notice of letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 232 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Defendants Letter Brief Regarding Indefiniteness)(Franzini, Simon) Modified on 10/6/2014 (sm, ).
October 3, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of submission of Technology Tutorial (Henry, Claire)
October 2, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Notice of Compliance (Doan, Jennifer)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying 75 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/14. (mll, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re 223 Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Reiter, Mark)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 225 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for parties to complete claim construction discovery is extended to 9-30-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/26/14. (mll, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 226 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 223 Cross MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
September 23, 2014 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #224 Sealed additional attachment submitted by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. No certificate of authority to seal was included and exhibit was not attached separately and identified per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
September 23, 2014 Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 23, 2014 Filing 224 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 223 Cross MOTION for Protective Order . (Noroozi, Kayvan) Modified on 9/23/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 9/23/2014 (sm, ).
September 23, 2014 Filing 223 Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kayvan B. Noroozi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER appointing Michael McLemore as technical advisor, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/14. (mll, )
September 5, 2014 Filing 221 ANSWER to 216 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC.(Noroozi, Kayvan)
September 4, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC Regarding Potential Technical Advisors (Franzini, Simon)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/14. (mll, )
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 215 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michelle Stover terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/14. (mll, )
August 25, 2014 Filing 217 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mirror Worlds' Proposed Constructions and Supporting Evidence, # 2 Exhibit B - Microsoft Defendants' Proposed Constructions and Supporting Evidence, # 3 Exhibit C - Apple's Proposed Constructions and Supporting Evidence)(Franzini, Simon)
August 25, 2014 Filing 216 AMENDED ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc.. (Poteet, Scott)
August 25, 2014 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Daniel)
July 29, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 203 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Defendants' Notice of Waiver of Reply Brief (Doan, Jennifer)
July 18, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC re 75 MOTION to Change Venue regarding relocation of Eric Freeman (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Freeman Declaration)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
July 15, 2014 Filing 212 RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
July 8, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kayvan B Noroozi on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Noroozi, Kayvan)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 207 Stipulation filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Apple Inc. The proceedings in the Apple case as to Best Buy SHALL be stayed until further Court order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/14. (mll, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 209 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief re Plaintiffs Requested MSJ re No Claim or Issue Preclusion)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
July 7, 2014 Filing 208 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief re Plaintiffs Requested Cross-MSJ on Kessler)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
July 2, 2014 Filing 207 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings as to Best Buy Defendants by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC. (O'Brien, Daniel)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDERED THAT the proceedings in the Microsoft case as to Best Buy SHALL be stayed until further Court order. This Order does not affect the proceedings in the Apple case as to Best Buy or any other party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/1/2014. (gsg)
June 27, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Defendants' Notice of Decision) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 27, 2014 Filing 204 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Sur-reply Letter Brief re Defendants Requested MSJ on Kessler Doctrine)(Noroozi, Kayvan)
June 27, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 27, 2014 Filing 202 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 187 Opposed MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Motion for Protection 177 filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Lyon, Richard)
June 23, 2014 Filing 201 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answering Letter re Mirror Worlds' Requested MSJ on Claim and Issue Preclusion)(Galvan, Hilda)
June 23, 2014 Filing 200 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answering Letter re Mirror Worlds' Requested Cross-Motion on Kessler Doctrine)(Galvan, Hilda)
June 18, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation re 75 MOTION to Change Venue (Notice of New Precedent Relating to the Defendants' Pending Motion to Transfer and Pending Motion to Stay as to Microsoft's Customers) (Doan, Jennifer)
June 17, 2014 Filing 198 REPLY to Response to Motion re 187 Opposed MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Motion for Protection 177 filed by Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Valek, Michael)
June 16, 2014 Filing 197 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Letter Brief re MSJ that MW's infringement claim is precluded under the Kessler Doctrine)(Galvan, Hilda)
June 10, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Service of supplemental disclosures (Noroozi, Kayvan)
June 10, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC, Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Valek, Michael)
June 10, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Franzini, Simon)
June 10, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC of Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Poteet, Scott)
June 6, 2014 Filing 192 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Response to Apple's Letter Brief)(Franzini, Simon)
June 6, 2014 Filing 191 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Franzini, Simon)
June 6, 2014 Filing 190 Letter Brief filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Franzini, Simon)
June 5, 2014 Consolidated Defendant Samsung Electronics USA Inc removed from the Docket per 189 Order. (mll, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 183 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Sheet. The docket sheet shall be corrected to remove the mention to Samsung Electronics USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/05/14. (mll, )
June 4, 2014 Filing 188 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 187 Opposed MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Motion for Protection 177 .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Updated Certificate of Conference)(Franzini, Simon)
June 3, 2014 Filing 187 Opposed MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Response to Motion for Protection 177 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
June 3, 2014 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re 175 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Timely Production of Relevant Documents , Response to Motion for Protection 177 , and Cross-Motion to Compel Responses to Related Interrogatories filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
June 3, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Elgar Lyon, III on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Lyon, Richard)
June 3, 2014 Filing 184 AMENDED ANSWER to 92 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Noroozi, Kayvan)
May 30, 2014 Filing 183 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Sheet by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Consolidate Briefing Schedule for certain discovery motions. The briefing for Mirror Worlds' motion to compel the production of documents, Defendants' motion for protection, and Mirror Worlds' motion to compel on related interrogatories are consolidated according to the schedule set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/28/14. (mll, )
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Amend/Correct/Extend Deadline for Invalidity Contentions and Associated Pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/28/14. (mll, )
May 23, 2014 Filing 180 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Briefing Schedule for Certain Discovery Motions re 177 Sealed Response to Motion,,, 175 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Timely Production of Relevant Documents by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
May 23, 2014 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 155 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Extend Deadline for Invalidity Contentions and Associated Pleadings by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 20, 2014 Filing 178 Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief re MSJ that MW's infringement claim is precluded under the Kessler Doctrine)(Galvan, Hilda)
May 16, 2014 Filing 177 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 175 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Timely Production of Relevant Documents filed by Best Buy Stores LP, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael A. Valek, # 7 Affidavit /Declaration of Theresa Klusendorf, # 8 Affidavit /Declaration of Ken Murata, # 9 Affidavit /Declaration of Christopher Stidvent, # 10 Affidavit /Declaration of Kurt Cranor, # 11 Affidavit /Declaration of Jason Bonfig, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying without prejudice 174 Motion for Leave to Produce Confidential Documents from a Prior Related Lawsuit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/02/14. (mll, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 175 Opposed MOTION to Compel the Timely Production of Relevant Documents by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
April 23, 2014 Filing 174 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Produce Confidential Documents from a Prior Related Lawsuit by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave to Produce Documents from a Prior Related Lawsuit)(Galvan, Hilda)
April 21, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation (Notice of Additional Facts Relating to the Microsoft Defendants' Pending Motion to Transfer to the Western District of Washington) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 8, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 DISCLOSURES (Poteet, Scott)
March 3, 2014 Filing 171 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Azar Mouzari, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 3, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 170, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Filing 170 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Service of supplemental disclosures (Noroozi, Kayvan) Modified on 3/3/2014 (ch, ).
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 168 Motion to amend/correct Infringement Contentions and for Extension of Time. Mirror Worlds may amend/correct its Infringement Contentions to replace the claim charts served on January 6th with the corrected claim charts served on January 31st. The deadline for Apple and Best Buy to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is extended, to 4-07-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/14. (mll, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Mirror Worlds' Infringement Contentions and for an Extension of Time for Apple and Best Buy to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
January 29, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Andrew Finkelstein on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Finkelstein, Mark)
January 29, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Stover on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Stover, Michelle)
January 29, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Rooklidge on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Rooklidge, William)
January 29, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Bradley Poteet on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Poteet, Scott)
January 29, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Thomas O'Brien on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (O'Brien, Daniel)
January 29, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hilda Contreras Galvan on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Galvan, Hilda)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/24/14. (mll, )
January 23, 2014 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 21, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation (Howen, Stephen)
January 21, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Mirror Worlds' Initial Disclosures) (Franzini, Simon)
January 21, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. of Apple's Initial Disclosures (Stover, Michelle)
January 21, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
January 7, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. Hon David Folsom is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 2/5/2016. Hon David Folsom is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 3/7/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 11/13/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/14. (mll, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/14. (mll, )
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying as moot 103 Motion for Venue Discovery. Defendants shall answer the agreed interrogatories. After such answers have been provided, the parties may at their election conduct depositions upon the agreed topics. The parties are ORDERED to complete venue related discovery by 2-17-2014. The parties are further ORDERED to comply with the following briefing schedule regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue 75 . Mirror Worlds' response is due by 2-24-2014; Defendants' reply is due by 3-03-2014; and Mirror Worlds' surreply, is due by 3-10-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/14. (mll, ) .
January 6, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related) (Notice of Agreement) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mouzari, Azar)
January 6, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Notice of Submission of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Howen, Stephen)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER for parties to submit docket control and discovery orders by 1/9/2014 reflecting the length of trial is 5 days, time allowed for fact witness depositions in the Apple case will be 70 hours and certain documents in 6:13cv419 and 6:13cv941 are not required to be entered on any privilege log if they were created on or after 5/23/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/26/13. (mjc, )
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff and the OEM Defendants shall have until 1-03-2014 to resolve the outstanding issues related to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Venue Discovery or otherwise notify the Court of the outstanding issues. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/23/13. (mll, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Notice to the Court regarding issues related to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to take Venue Discovery by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 18, 2013 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2013 is cancelled. (cwk)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/13. (mll, )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/13. (mll, )
December 17, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Agreement With Regard to Electronically Stored Information Order and Notice of Dispute With Regard to Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying as moot 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER that all parties to the consolidated case shall meet and confer and submit a single Docket Control Order, a single Discovery Order, a single ESI Order, and a single Protective Order by 12-17-2013. Each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/13. (mll, )
December 13, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation (Notice of Agreement with Respect to ESI Order and Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute with Respect to Discovery Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 12, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 139 Notice (Other) Supplemental Notice of Dispute with Respect to Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Emails re Accused Features)(Poteet, Scott)
December 12, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Agreed E-Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Franzini, Simon)
December 12, 2013 Filing 139 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Disputes with Respect to Discover Order and Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Franzini, Simon)
December 12, 2013 Filing 138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
December 11, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Dale Howen on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Howen, Stephen)
December 10, 2013 **SEVERED Defendants Dell Inc, Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America LLC, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com LLC into Civil Action 6:13cv941; and CONSOLIDATED with this cause as Lead Case. The above Defendants are now designated as Consolidated Defendants in this Lead Case. (mll, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Sever. The Clerk shall assign a different civil number to the resulting severed case. The new civil action and the original action shall be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial purposes. Any relief not expressly granted in this Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/13. (mll, )
December 9, 2013 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with respect to Defendants Microsoft Corporation, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Best Buy Co., Inc. by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 9, 2013 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with respect to Defendants Apple, Inc., Best Buy Stores LP and BestBuy.com, LLC by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 AGREED ORDER ON VENUE RELATED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/05/13. (mll, )
December 4, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 108 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-Related), 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related), 76 MOTION to Sever (NOTICE OF AGREEMENT) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/13. (mll, )
November 14, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Hill, Jack)
November 14, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Ward, Thomas)
November 11, 2013 Filing 125 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related) filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Azar Mouzari, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Mouzari, Azar)
November 11, 2013 Filing 124 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION to Sever filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
November 8, 2013 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-Related) filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 8, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Valek, Michael)
November 8, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Reiter, Mark)
November 8, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Dawson, William)
November 6, 2013 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related) filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Franzini, Simon)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Fred Irvin Williams; Kellie M Johnson and Eric Joseph Klein terminated; the law firm of Strauss Hauer & Field LLP is SUBSTITUTED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/06/13. (mll, )
November 5, 2013 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-Related) filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
November 5, 2013 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mouzari, Azar)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER entered for expedited briefing re 108 Motion for Venue-Related Discovery. Response due by 11/5/2013; reply by 11/8/2013; and sur-reply by 11/11/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/13. (mjc, )
November 1, 2013 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related) filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Azar Mouzari, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Mouzari, Azar)
October 31, 2013 Filing 113 ANSWER to 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Mirror Worlds' Reply to Counterclaims of Microsoft) by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC.(Franzini, Simon)
October 31, 2013 Filing 112 ANSWER to 92 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Mirror Worlds' Reply to Counterclaims of Apple) by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC.(Franzini, Simon)
October 30, 2013 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION to Sever filed by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Azar Mouzari, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Valek, Michael)
October 29, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Franzini, Simon)
October 29, 2013 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Doan, Jennifer)
October 28, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-Related) by Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
October 25, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Microsoft Corporation (Reiter, Mark)
October 25, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC (Smith, Melissa)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING: denying 102 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on Mirror Worlds' Motion for Leave to Take Venue-Related Discovery 103 according to the following schedule: Response due by 11-01-2013; Reply due by 11-06-2013; and Sur-reply due by 11-11-2013. Defendants shall file a motion for leave to take venue-related discovery, if any, by 10-28-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 104 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Franzini, Simon)
October 21, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION for Discovery (Venue-related) by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
October 18, 2013 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION to Change Venue by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 10/22/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mjc, )
October 11, 2013 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION to Change Venue by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
October 10, 2013 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Sever filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
October 10, 2013 Filing 98 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, and Defenses of Defendants Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Randall, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2013 Filing 97 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Microsoft Corporation against Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC by Microsoft Corporation.(Valek, Michael)
October 10, 2013 Filing 96 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, and Defenses of Defendants Best Buy Stores, LP and BestBuy.com, LLC by Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC.(Valek, Michael)
October 10, 2013 Filing 95 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, and Defenses of Defendant Dell, Inc. by Dell Inc..(Valek, Michael)
October 10, 2013 Filing 94 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, and Defenses of Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company by Hewlett Packard Co..(Valek, Michael)
October 10, 2013 Filing 93 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Answer and Defenses of Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc. by Lenovo (United States) Inc..(Klein, Eric)
October 10, 2013 Filing 92 ANSWER to 79 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Galvan, Hilda)
October 2, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Azar Mouzari on behalf of Hewlett Packard Co. (Mouzari, Azar)
October 2, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Azar Mouzari on behalf of Dell Inc. (Mouzari, Azar)
October 2, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Azar Mouzari on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Mouzari, Azar)
October 1, 2013 Filing 88 ANSWER to 65 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Mirror Worlds' Reply to Counterclaims of Microsoft by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC.(Franzini, Simon)
October 1, 2013 Filing 87 ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Mirror Worlds' Reply to Counterclaims of Apple by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC.(Franzini, Simon)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted against Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. are hereby dismissed from this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/13. (mll, )
September 30, 2013 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Best Buy Co., Inc. by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
September 30, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Stover on behalf of Apple Inc. (Stover, Michelle)
September 30, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Andrew Finkelstein on behalf of Apple Inc. (Finkelstein, Mark)
September 30, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Bradley Poteet on behalf of Apple Inc. (Poteet, Scott)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 76 MOTION to Sever : Responses due by 10/10/2013; Replies due by 10/30/2013; Re: 75 MOTION to Change Venue : Response due 10-14-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/13. (mll, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION to Change Venue , 76 MOTION to Sever by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
September 23, 2013 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Best Buy Stores LP, BestBuy.com, LLC, filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Franzini, Simon)
September 13, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Best Buy Co. Inc., (Dawson, William)
September 13, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Best Buy Co. Inc., (Reiter, Mark)
September 12, 2013 Filing 76 MOTION to Sever by Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Kathleen Curran, # 2 Affidavit /Declaration of Robin Timothy Castell, # 3 Affidavit /Declaration of Kurt Cranor, # 4 Affidavit /Declaration of Megan Hoffman, # 5 Affidavit /Declaration of Jason Bonfig, # 6 Affidavit /Declaration of Kip Olson, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
September 12, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION to Change Venue by Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Michael Valek, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Michael Valek, # 11 Affidavit /Declaration of Gaya K. Holman, # 12 Affidavit /Declaration of Kathleen Curran, # 13 Affidavit /Declaration of Robin Timothy Castell, # 14 Affidavit /Declaration of Kurt Cranor, # 15 Affidavit /Declaration of Megan Hoffman, # 16 Affidavit /Declaration of Jason Bonfig, # 17 Affidavit /Declaration of Kip Olson, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. for Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
September 10, 2013 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co. Inc., (Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 72 Best Buy Co., Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Defenses by Best Buy Co. Inc.,.(Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Best Buy Co. Inc., (Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. (Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 69 Dell Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Defenses by Dell Inc..(Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett Packard Co. (Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 67 Hewlett-Packard Company's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Defenses by Hewlett Packard Co..(Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation (Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 65 Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC by Microsoft Corporation.(Valek, Michael)
September 10, 2013 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 62 Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics USA, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Randall, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allan M. Soobert on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Soobert, Allan)
September 10, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G Randall on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Randall, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 Filing 59 Lenovo's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Defenses in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Lenovo (United States) Inc..(Williams, Fred)
September 10, 2013 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Galvan, Hilda)
September 10, 2013 Filing 57 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Galvan, Hilda)
September 10, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Rooklidge on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rooklidge, William)
September 10, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Thomas O'Brien on behalf of Apple Inc. (O'Brien, Daniel)
September 10, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Best Buy Co. Inc., (Smith, Melissa)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Lenovo (United States) Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/14/13. (mll, )
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadlinefor Apple Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/14/13. (mll, )
August 13, 2013 Filing 51 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted against Defendant Lenovo Group, Limited are hereby dismissed from this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/13/13. (mll, )
August 12, 2013 Filing 49 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galvan, Hilda)
August 9, 2013 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lenovo Group, Ltd. without Prejudice by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Franzini, Simon)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Hewlett-Packard Co. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Dell, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Microsoft Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
August 1, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Hewlett Packard Co. (Valek, Michael)
August 1, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Dell Inc. (Valek, Michael)
August 1, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Hewlett Packard Co. (Dawson, William)
August 1, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Dell Inc. (Dawson, William)
August 1, 2013 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Hewlett Packard Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
August 1, 2013 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
August 1, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Hewlett Packard Co. (Reiter, Mark)
August 1, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Dell Inc. (Reiter, Mark)
July 30, 2013 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reiter, Mark) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2013; incorrect attachment originally submitted) (mll, ). Modified on 7/30/2013 (mll, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
July 22, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 35 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett Packard Co. to 8/23/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 22, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 34 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Buy Co. Inc., to 9/10/2013. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 19, 2013 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett Packard Co..( Reiter, Mark)
July 18, 2013 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Buy Co. Inc.,.( Reiter, Mark)
July 16, 2013 Filing 33 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett Packard Co..( Reiter, Mark) Modified on 7/17/2013 (gsg).
July 15, 2013 Filing 32 ***FILED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED AS A MOTION.*** Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Reiter, Mark) Modified on 7/22/2013 (gsg).
July 15, 2013 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed as to Hewlett Packard Co. on 6/18/2013, by personal service; answer due: 7/9/2013. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed as to Best Buy Co. Inc., on 6/18/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC on 6/18/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung Electronic USA Inc on 6/18/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed as to Microsoft Corporation on 6/18/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to Lenovo (United States) Inc. on 6/17/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Dell Inc. on 6/18/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 6/17/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Samsung Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 9-10-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/09/13. (mll, )
July 8, 2013 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Randall, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allan M. Soobert on behalf of Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Soobert, Allan)
July 8, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G Randall on behalf of Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Randall, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Buy Co. Inc., to 8/23/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
July 3, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell Inc. to 8/8/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
July 3, 2013 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Buy Co. Inc.,.( Reiter, Mark)
July 3, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Valek, Michael)
July 3, 2013 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2013: # 1 Corrected Application) (gsg, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2013: # 2 Corrected Application) (gsg, ).
July 2, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 8/23/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
July 2, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hilda Contreras Galvan on behalf of Apple Inc. (Galvan, Hilda)
July 2, 2013 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Galvan, Hilda)
July 1, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lenovo (United States) Inc. to 8/23/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
July 1, 2013 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lenovo (United States) Inc..( Williams, Fred)
June 28, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corporation to 8/23/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
June 28, 2013 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Dawson, William) Modified on 7/3/2013 (gsg).
June 28, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Dawson, William)
June 28, 2013 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.( Reiter, Mark)
June 28, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Reiter on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Reiter, Mark)
June 17, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kellie M Johnson on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Johnson, Kellie)
June 17, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Klein, Eric)
June 17, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Irvin Williams on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Williams, Fred)
May 31, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Dell Inc., Hewlett Packard Co., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Samsung Electronic USA Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es))(klb)
May 28, 2013 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Franzini, Simon)
May 23, 2013 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC (Franzini, Simon)
May 23, 2013 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
May 23, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Franzini, Simon)
May 23, 2013 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Franzini, Simon)
May 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4150200.), filed by Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Franzini, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Kellie M Johnson
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronic USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirror Worlds Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?