Smartflash LLC et al v. Apple Inc, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies Limited
Defendant: Apple Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. and Game Circus LLC
Case Number: 6:2013cv00447
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2015 Filing 621 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-Federal Circuit re 619 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc.. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case Number 16-1059 (dlc, )
October 5, 2015 Filing 620 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 10/5/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 480 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 440 Order on Sealed Motion, 432 Memorandum & Opinion, 619 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 479 Order, 606 Judgment, 581 Order on Sealed Motion, 423 Report and Recommendations, 481 Order, 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 608 Order, 388 Report and Recommendations, 379 Order on Sealed Motion, 229 Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 605 Order on Sealed Motion, 390 Report and Recommendations, 487 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 585 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 582 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 484 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 606 Judgment, 229 Report & Recommendation, 351 Order Adopting, 432 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 481 Order, 479 Order Adopting, 480 Order Adopting, 582 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 423 Report and Recommendation, 484 Order Adopting, 585 Order, 388 Report and Recommendation, 487 Order Adopting, 390 Report and Recommendation, 482 Order Adopting, 605 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 581 Order, 608 Order, 379 Sealed Opinion, 440 Order, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 619 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
October 2, 2015 Filing 619 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 606 Judgment by Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5419596. (Perry, Mark)
October 2, 2015 Filing 618 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aaron M Panner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5418651. (Panner, Aaron)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting 610 Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby STAYED pending the Federal Circuit's resolution of the appeal on liability and invalidity issues, and the trial currently set for jury selection on 11-02-2015, is REMOVED form the trial docket. Parties are ORDERED to file a joint notice with the Court within 10 days after any final decision from the Federal Circuit alerting the Court of the subsequent determination. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/16/15. (mll, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 616 RESPONSE to Motion re 610 Opposed MOTION to Stay Damages Retrial SMARTFLASH'S RESPONSE OF NON-OPPOSITION (IN PERTINENT PART) TO APPLE'S MOTION TO STAY DAMAGES RETRIAL filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 10, 2015 Filing 615 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas Hallward-Driemeier (Hallward-Driemeier, Douglas)
September 8, 2015 Filing 614 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF JOINT PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING NEW DAMAGES TRIAL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Joint Proposed Docket Control Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting 611 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Smartflash will respond to Apple's Motion to Stay Damages Retrial by 9-14-2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/08/15. (mll, )
September 6, 2015 Filing 612 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/13/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2015. (sholmes, )
September 4, 2015 Filing 611 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on the Motion to Stay Damages Retrial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark)
September 4, 2015 Filing 610 Opposed MOTION to Stay Damages Retrial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark)
September 2, 2015 Filing 609 NOTICE by Robot Entertainment, Inc. REQUESTING TO TERMINATE ELECTRONIC NOTIFICATION (Kohm, Bryan)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 608 *REDACTED 607 * ORDER granting in part and denying in part 597 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/2/15. (mrm, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 606 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/2/15. (mrm, )
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 547 Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Rule 59 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/2/15. (mrm, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 603 Sealed Document. Apple's Notice of Supplemental Materials (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit B - Apple's Opening Demonstratives, # 3 Exhibit F - Apple's Demonstratives for Cross-Exam of Mr. Mills, # 4 Exhibit H - Apple's Closing Demonstratives, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N, # 10 Exhibit O, # 11 Exhibit P, # 12 Exhibit Q, # 13 Exhibit R)(Perry, Mark)
August 17, 2015 Filing 602 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIALS. (Attachments: # 1 Pearson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit I)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 13, 2015 Filing 604 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 8/13/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
August 12, 2015 Filing 601 REPLY to Response to Motion re 597 MOTION for Reconsideration re 581 Order on Sealed Motion SMARTFLASH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 7, 2015 NEW TRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 581], OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON INFRINGEMENT AND VAL SMARTFLASH'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 7, 2015 NEW TRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 581], OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON INFRINGEMENT AND VALIDITY, BIFURCATION OF THE DAMAGES TRIAL, AND CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 11, 2015 Filing 600 RESPONSE in Opposition re 597 MOTION for Reconsideration re 581 Order on Sealed Motion SMARTFLASH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 7, 2015 NEW TRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 581], OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON INFRINGEMENT AND VAL filed by Apple Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER re 597 MOTION for Reconsideration re 581 Order on Sealed Motion SMARTFLASH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 7, 2015 NEW TRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 581], OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. Apple shall file a response to 597 Motion by 8-11-2015. STATUS CONFERENCE RESET for 8/13/2015 09:00 AM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/04/15. (mll, ) Modified on 8/5/2015 (mll, ).
August 4, 2015 Filing 598 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Dawson, William)
August 3, 2015 Filing 597 MOTION for Reconsideration re 581 Order on Sealed Motion SMARTFLASH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S JULY 7, 2015 NEW TRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 581], OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON INFRINGEMENT AND VALIDITY, BIFURCATION OF THE DAMAGES TRIAL, AND CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 3, 2015 Filing 596 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Stephen Rosenthal on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rosenthal, Brett)
July 31, 2015 Filing 595 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Apple Inc. (Rho, Jennifer)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER denying 591 Motion to Stay. Status Conference set for 8/6/2015 09:00 AM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/30/15. (mll, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 593 MANDATE of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT in accordance with the judgment of this Court, entered July 30, 2015, and pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure as to 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. (dlc, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 592 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ACCOMPANIED BY OPINION affirming as to 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. Circuit Judges: Newman, Linn, and O'Malley. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion, # 2 Info Sheet - Petition for Rehearing, # 3 Info Sheet - Writ of Certiorari)(dlc, )
July 28, 2015 Filing 591 MOTION to Confirm Stay of Proceedings and Take Damages Retrial off Calendar Pending the Federal Circuit's Decision by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 590 RESPONSE to 589 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT'S ISSUANCE OF A TEMPORARY STAY filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 15, 2015 Filing 589 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Of The Federal Circuit's Issuance Of A Temporary Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 13, 2015 Filing 587 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H Mark Lyon on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lyon, H)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT vacating the court order in-part; the portion of the court's June 23, 2015, order denying the motions is vacated, as to 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. (dlc, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 586 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/1/15 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2015. (sholmes, )
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER terminating 550 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Court exercises its discretion and declines to reconsider the 101 issue in the context of a post-trial JMOL when the same as been heard and fully addressed during pre-trial. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/08/15. (mll, )
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/8/15. (mll, )
July 8, 2015 Filing 583 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Supplemental Authority) (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 573 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/06/15. (mll, )
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting 548 Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Issue of Damages Under Rule 50(b) and/or a New Trial under 59(e). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 7, 2015. (jml)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting 549 Motion for Judgment of No Willful Infringement as a Matter of Law. The Court hereby directs the entry of judgment as a matter of law for Apple on the issue of willfulness. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/02/15. (mll, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 579 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 7/1/2015 re Dkt. Nos. 547, 548, 549, 550 and 551. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
June 30, 2015 Filing 578 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 573 MOTION for Reconsideration re 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, SMARTFLASH'S SURREPLY TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PRIOR ORDERS IN LIGHT OF WILLIAMSON V. CITRIX ONLINE filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
June 29, 2015 Filing 577 REPLY to Response to Motion re 573 MOTION for Reconsideration re 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER setting all post-verdict motions for a hearing on July 1, 2015 at 1:30 pm in Marshall, Texas. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/26/2015. (gsg)
June 26, 2015 Filing 575 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 573 MOTION for Reconsideration re 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF BOTH PARTIES' REQUEST THAT APPLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [DKT. 573] BE HEARD AT THE UPCOMING POST-TRIAL HEARING (Caldwell, Bradley)
June 26, 2015 Filing 574 RESPONSE to Motion re 573 MOTION for Reconsideration re 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, SMARTFLASH'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PRIOR ORDERS IN LIGHT OF WILLIAMSON V. CITRIX ONLINE filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 24, 2015 Filing 573 MOTION for Reconsideration re 351 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 482 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
June 24, 2015 Filing 572 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Relevant Determination from Related Appeal Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 548 SEALED MOTION, 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF , 547 SEALED MOTION, 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/24/2015. (gsg)
June 15, 2015 Filing 570 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 15, 2015 Filing 569 SMARTFLASH'S CONSOLIDATED SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 548 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Issue of Damages, 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101, 547 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Omnibus Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, 549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment of No Willful Infringement as a Matter of Law filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Curry, John)
June 15, 2015 Filing 568 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101 Of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2015 Filing 567 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 566 Reply to Response to Motion - Sealed Declaration of John F. Summers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 4, 2015 Filing 566 REPLY to Response to Motion re 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Public Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 4, 2015 Filing 565 REPLY to Response to Motion re 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2015 Filing 564 REPLY to Response to Motion re 549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment of No Willful Infringement as a Matter of Law filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2015 Filing 563 REPLY to Response to Motion re 548 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Issue of Damages filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2015 Filing 562 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 547 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Omnibus Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2015 Filing 561 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. USCA Case Number 15-1701 (dlc, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 558 Memorandum Opinion & Order, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 558 Memorandum Opinion & Order and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 559 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 559 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 558 Order on Sealed Motion by Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5223202. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER denying 546 Sealed Motion for Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2015. (jrg3)
May 29, 2015 Filing 557 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Of Recent Developments In Support Of Defendants Motion To Stay Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 26, 2015 Filing 556 RESPONSE to Motion re 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 26, 2015 Filing 555 SMARTFLASH'S CONSOLIDATED SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 548 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Issue of Damages, 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101, 547 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Omnibus Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, 549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment of No Willful Infringement as a Matter of Law filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 20, 2015 Filing 554 REPLY to Response to Motion re 546 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motion To Stay Litigation Pending Covered Business Method Review Of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,334,720; 8,118,221; And 8,336,772 By The United States Patent & Trademark Office filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2015 Filing 553 RESPONSE in Opposition re 546 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motion To Stay Litigation Pending Covered Business Method Review Of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,334,720; 8,118,221; And 8,336,772 By The United States Patent & Trademark Office filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Summers Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 1, 2015 Filing 552 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF - Sealed Declaration of John F. Summers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 1, 2015 Filing 551 MOTION PLAINTIFF SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Public Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 1, 2015 Filing 550 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Apple's Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 1, 2015 Filing 549 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment of No Willful Infringement as a Matter of Law by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 1, 2015 Filing 548 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Issue of Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 1, 2015 Filing 547 SEALED MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion and Memorandum in Support of Its Omnibus Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and/or Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 23, 2015 Filing 546 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motion To Stay Litigation Pending Covered Business Method Review Of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,334,720; 8,118,221; And 8,336,772 By The United States Patent & Trademark Office by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2014-00194, # 3 Exhibit B - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2014-00190, # 4 Exhibit C - Chart, # 5 Exhibit D - PTABs Scheduling Orders in Other cases, # 6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from the February 16, 2015 Afternoon Session Trial Transcript, # 7 Exhibit F - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2015-00015, # 8 Exhibit G - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2015-00018, # 9 Exhibit H - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2014-00192, # 10 Exhibit I - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2015-00016, # 11 Exhibit J - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2015-00017, # 12 Exhibit K - PTABs Decision in Case CBM2014-00193, # 13 Exhibit L - U.S. Patent No. 8,336,772, # 14 Exhibit M - Just the Stats, # 15 Exhibit N - Excerpts from the transcript of the January 6, 2015 Pre-Trial Hearing, # 16 Exhibit O - Excerpts from the transcript of the August 8, 2014 deposition of Patrick Racz, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER that all post-trial motions be filed within 21 days of the date of this Order; responses shall be filed within 45 days of the date of this Order; replies shall be filed within 55 days of the date of this Order; and sur-replies filed within 65 days of the date of this Order. The Court sets all post-verdict motions for hearing on 7-01-2015 at 1:30 pm. Evidentiary/Post-Verdict Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/10/15. (mll, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 544 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 536 Opposed MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING REGARDING SMARTFLASH'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 8, 2015 Filing 543 REPLY to Response to Motion re 535 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Post-Trial Briefing Schedule filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 7, 2015 Filing 542 RESPONSE in Opposition re 535 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Post-Trial Briefing Schedule filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Post)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting 538 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/01/15. (mll, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting 537 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/01/15. (mll, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER granting 536 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Apple is ORDERED to respond to Smartflash's motion for entry of post-trial briefing schedule no later than 4-07-2015 at 5pm. If Smartflash wishes to submit a Reply to Apple's Response,Smartflash is ORDERED to reply by 4-08-2015 at 5pm. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/01/15. (mll, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 538 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Shawn Latchford as Counsel of Record for Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Latchford, Shawn)
March 31, 2015 Filing 537 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record for Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 31, 2015 Filing 536 Opposed MOTION to Expedite MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING REGARDING SMARTFLASH'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 31, 2015 Filing 535 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Post-Trial Briefing Schedule by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Jason D. Cassady, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting in part 528 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/29/15. (mll, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 533 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Blaine H Evanson on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5124741. (Evanson, Blaine)
March 30, 2015 Filing 532 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark A Perry on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5124710. (Perry, Mark)
March 28, 2015 Filing 531 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Anthony Vincent on behalf of Apple Inc. (Vincent, Robert)
March 23, 2015 Filing 530 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
March 3, 2015 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #529 Sealed Motion for atty fees submitted by Chelsea L Davis. No certificate of conference or certificate of authority to seal was included and not a party to suit. Motion is now TERMINATED. (sm, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 528 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Trial Exhibits) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cyndi Wheeler in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Wheeler Declaration, # 3 Exhibiy B to Wheeler Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 03/02/15. (mll, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 526 APPLE INC.'S FINAL EXHIBIT LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTED DURING TRIAL.(jml)
February 27, 2015 Filing 525 PLAINTIFFS', SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED, FINAL ADMITTED EXHIBIT LIST THROUGH 2/23/2015.(jml)
February 26, 2015 Filing 524 Sealed Transcript - Sealed Portions Nos. 4 and 5, 2/19/15 - Morning Session (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 523 Sealed Transcript - Sealed Portion No. 3, 2/17/15 - Afternoon Session(sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 522 Sealed Transcript - Sealed Portions Nos. 1 and 2, 2/17/15 - Morning Session (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 521 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/24/15 All Day before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 520 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/23/15 Afternoon Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 519 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/23/15 Morning Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 518 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/19/15 Afternoon Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 517 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/19/15 Morning Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 516 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/18/15 Afternoon Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 515 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/18/15 Morning Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 514 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/17/15 Afternoon Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 513 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/17/15 Morning Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 511 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 2/16/15 Afternoon Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 509 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire and Trial Proceedings held on 2/16/15 Morning Session before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporters: Shelly Holmes/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2015. (sms, )
February 24, 2015 Filing 512 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 2/24/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 24, 2015 Filing 504 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
February 24, 2015 Filing 503 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
February 23, 2015 Filing 510 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/23/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 23, 2015 Filing 502 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Proffer of Evidence That Would Be Elicited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 23, 2015 Filing 501 Sealed Document.Defendant Apple Inc.'s Memorandum In Support of Its Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 22, 2015 Filing 500 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Memorandum In Support of Its Planned Oral Rule 50(a) Motion For Judgment As A Matter of Law by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 22, 2015 Filing 499 Proposed Jury Instructions by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Third Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B Smartflash's Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C Apple's Proposed Verdict Form)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 21, 2015 Filing 498 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF FIFTH AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Fifth Amended Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 19, 2015 Filing 508 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/19/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 19, 2015 Filing 497 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Hallward-Driemeier on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5065274. (Hallward-Driemeier, Douglas)
February 18, 2015 Filing 507 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/18/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 17, 2015 Filing 506 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 2/17/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 17, 2015 Filing 496 Proposed Jury Instructions by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Smartflash's Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C - Apple's Proposed Verdict Form)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 16, 2015 Filing 494 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Second Amended Pre-Admitted Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 16, 2015 Filing 493 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Pre-Admitted Exhibit List and Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 15, 2015 Filing 492 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 14, 2015 Filing 491 Proposed Jury Instructions by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Second Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 13, 2015 Filing 490 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF FIRST AMENDED PRE-ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 13, 2015 Filing 489 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF FOURTH AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Fourth Amended Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 13, 2015 Filing 488 Sealed Document. Apple Inc's Submission of Third Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 388 Report and Recommendations, and denying Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 (6:13CV447, 270 ; 6:13CV448, Doc. No. 325). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's January 26, 2015 Order Denying Apple's Emergency Motion to Strike the Second Supplemental Expert Report of Robert Mills, and overruling Apple's objections. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Filing 485 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited JOINT NOTICE OF CLAIM AND PRIOR ART REDUCTIONS (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 423 Report and Recommendations, and denying Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 101 (6:13CV447, 266 ; 6:13CV448, Doc. No. 320). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 389 Report and Recommendations, and denying Apple's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement (6:13CV447, 267 ; 6:13CV448, Doc. No. 318). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 390 Report and Recommendations, and denying Apple's and Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-infringement (6:13CV447, 271 & 272 ; 6:13CV448, Doc. No. 322). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER adopting 432 Memorandum & Opinion of the Magistrate Judge and overruling parties' objections. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 391 Report and Recommendations, and denying Apple's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness (6:13CV447, 269 ; 6:13CV448, Doc. No. 323). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's rulings on Standing, Plaintiff's Motion in Limine B, and Exhibits Related to Patent Ownership. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/15. (mjc, )
February 12, 2015 Filing 478 Proposed Jury Instructions by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 12, 2015 Filing 477 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL PRE-ADMITTED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 12, 2015 Filing 476 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE Apple Inc.'s Objections To The Magistrates Order 440 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Sealed Patent Motion,,,, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q, # 2 Exhibit R)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 12, 2015 Filing 475 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 433 Response to Non-Motion, Plaintiffs Smartflash LLC's And Smartflash Technologies Limited's Objection To Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Motion To Strike Stephen Becker filed by Apple Inc. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Parties shall meet and confer and submit revised proposed instructions (preliminary and final) and revised proposed verdict forms on or before 10:00 p.m. on 2-17-2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/12/15. (mll, )
February 11, 2015 Filing 473 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT D AND SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS O AND P PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Amended Supplemental Exhibit D and Supplemental Exhibits O and P)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 11, 2015 Filing 472 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.s Notice Of Withdrawal Of Motion For Leave To Amend Answer And Counterclaims Without Prejudice (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 11, 2015 Filing 471 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 460 Sealed Patent Document Apple's Submission of Objections and Counter Designations To Smartflash's Supplemental Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 10, 2015 Filing 470 RESPONSE to 432 Memorandum & Opinion Objections to Order and Opinion on Supplemental Claim Construction filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2015 Filing 469 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 417 Sealed Document. APPLE'S OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING APPLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT AND NO INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2015 Filing 468 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 416 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY 5, 2015 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INDEFINITENESS filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2015 Filing 467 RESPONSE to 432 Memorandum & Opinion Defendants' Objections To The Magistrate's January 26, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order On Claim Construction filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 9, 2015 Filing 466 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 415 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY 5, 2015 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2015 Filing 465 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 414 Sealed Document. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MITCHELL'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING INVALIDITY UNDER 35 U.S.C. 102, 103 filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2015 Filing 464 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Orders On Standing, Plaintiff's Motion in Limine B, and Exhibits Related to Patent Ownership (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Darrell W. Stark, # 2 Exhibit Q)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 9, 2015 Filing 463 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Objections to the January 26, 2015 Order Denying Apple's Emergency Motion to Strike the Untimely Second Supplemental Expert Report of Robert Mills (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Darrell W. Stark, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/9/2015. (gsg)
February 6, 2015 Filing 461 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc's Notice of Supplemental Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Third Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Stephen L. Becker, # 2 Exhibit 2, Third Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Ravi Dhar)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 5, 2015 Filing 460 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 5, 2015 Filing 459 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/4/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2015. (sholmes, )
February 4, 2015 Filing 458 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc's Notice of Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 4, 2015 Filing 457 Sealed Document. Defendants' Objection to the Magistrate's Report and Recommandation Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 USC 101. (Attachments: # 1 Delcaration of Josef B. Schenker in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Schenker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Schenker Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 3, 2015 Filing 456 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Submission Of Second Amended Identification Of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER GRANTING 377 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/3/2015. (gsg)
February 3, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 1/26/15 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2015. (sms, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER REGARDING THIRD PARTY WITNESSES. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/03/15. (mll, )
February 2, 2015 Filing 452 Sealed Document. Apple's Notice of Filing of Pre-Admitted Exhibit List and Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 2, 2015 Filing 451 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF PRE-ADMITTED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 2, 2015 Filing 450 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 393 SEALED MOTION , Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker in Support of Apple's Reply, # 2 Exhibit G to the Schenker Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 2, 2015 Filing 449 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF THIRD AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 2, 2015 Filing 448 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.s Response To Plaintiffs Smartflash LLCs And Smartflash Technologies Limiteds Notice Of Compliance With The Courts January 27, 2015 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 2, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/4/2015 01:00 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that only the time for the hearing has changed.***(jml)
February 1, 2015 Filing 447 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE REGARDING APPLE'S BRIEF ON PATENT OWNERSHIP. (Attachments: # 1 Summers Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 30, 2015 Filing 446 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Submission of Amended Identification of Rebuttal Trial Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 30, 2015 Filing 445 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 434 Second SEALED MOTION To Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 403 And 702 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Pearson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 29, 2015 Filing 444 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to 405 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Memorandum and Opinion and Order as it Relates in Part to Robert Mills filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Lee Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Lee Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Lee Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Lee Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Lee Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Lee Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Lee Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Lee Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Lee Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Lee Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 29, 2015 Filing 442 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S JANUARY 27, 2015 ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/4/2015 01:30 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting 325 Motion for Leave to Increase Limit for Exhibit Designations; granting in part 422 Sealed Motion for Leave to Increase the Limit for Exhibit Designations. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/15. (mll, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE: granting in part 375 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 377 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting 395 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/15. (mll, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER granting in part 412 Motion to Extend Trial Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/15. (mll, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting 394 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/29/15. (mll, )
January 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2015 01:30 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 28, 2015 Filing 437 Sealed Document. JOINT STIPULATION OF SMARTFLASH AND APPLE. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 27, 2015 Filing 436 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 1/26/15 Pre-trial Conference before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Plaintiff shall outline the testimony it plans to elicit from this witness or other non-expert third-party prior art fact witnesses, and Defendant shall respond, asserting any privilege it believes may be appropriate, so that the Court can rule on the issue of whether any privilege exists regarding these third-party witnesses. Plaintiffs' brief is due on 1-29-2015 at 5:00 PM. Defendants' response is due 2-02-2015 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/27/15. (mll, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 443 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Pretrial Conference held on 1/26/2015. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 434 Second SEALED MOTION To Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 403 And 702 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan F. Raymond, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of M Raymond, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of M Raymond, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of M Raymond, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of M Raymond, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of M Raymond, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of M Raymond, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of M Raymond, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of M Raymond, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of M Raymond, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of M Raymond, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of M Raymond, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of M Raymond, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of M Raymond, # 15 Exhibit N to Declaration of M Raymond, # 16 Exhibit O to Declaration of M Raymond, # 17 Exhibit P to Declaration of M Raymond, # 18 Exhibit Q to Declaration of M Raymond, # 19 Exhibit R to Declaration of M Raymond, # 20 Exhibit S to Declaration of M Raymond, # 21 Exhibit T to Declaration of M Raymond, # 22 Exhibit U to Declaration of M Raymond, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 26, 2015 Filing 433 SEALED RESPONSE Plaintiffs Smartflash LLC's and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Motion to Strike Stephen Becker 400 Order on Sealed Motion filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court ADOPTS the claim construction for the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/26/15. (mll, )
January 23, 2015 Filing 431 Emergency SEALED MOTION To Strike Untimely Second Supplemental Expert Report Of Robert Mills by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A - to the Declaration of S Lee, # 3 Exhibit B - to the Declaration of S Lee, # 4 Exhibit C - to the Declaration of S Lee, # 5 Exhibit D - to the Declaration of S Lee, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 23, 2015 Filing 430 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 422 Opposed SEALED MOTION OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INCREASE THE LIMIT FOR EXHIBIT DESIGNATIONS filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 23, 2015 Filing 429 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 412 Emergency MOTION Extend Trial Time re 403 Order filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Stewart Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 22, 2015 Filing 428 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 22, 2015 Filing 427 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 395 SEALED MOTION Supplemental Motion In Limine filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 McCarty Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 22, 2015 Filing 426 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.s Notice of Supplemental Expert Reports (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Supplemental Report of Stephen L. Becker, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2nd Supplemental Expert Report of Ravi Dhar)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/22/2015. (gsg)
January 21, 2015 Filing 424 Sealed Document. APPLE INC.'S SUBMISSION OF SECOND AMENDED EXHBIIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 21, 2015 Filing 423 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/21/15. (mll, )
January 21, 2015 Filing 422 Opposed SEALED MOTION OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INCREASE THE LIMIT FOR EXHIBIT DESIGNATIONS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Stewart Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 21, 2015 Filing 421 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF SECOND AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 20, 2015 Filing 420 Sealed Portion of Transcript (Cont) of Dispositive Motions Hearing before the Honorable Nicole K. Mitchell, United States Magistrate Judge, held on December 2, 2014. (tlh, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 419 Sealed Portion of Transcript of Dispositive Motions Hearing before the Honorable Nicole K. Mitchell, United States Magistrate Judge on December 2, 2014. (tlh, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 418 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL UNSEALED TRANSCRIPT of Dispositive Motion Proceedings held on 12/2/2014 before Judge Nicole K. Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill E. McFaddin,Telephone number: (903) 530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (tlh, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 417 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommandation Regardng Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding No Willful Infringement and No Infringement.(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 20, 2015 Filing 416 Sealed Document. Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommandation Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness.(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 20, 2015 Filing 415 Sealed Document. Apple's and Defendants' Objections to the January 5, 2015 Report and Recommandation Regarding Apple's and Defendants' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement.(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 20, 2015 Filing 414 Sealed Document. Defendants' Objection to the Magistrate's Report and Recommandation Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Invalidity. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel W. Richards in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Richards Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Richards Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a response by Friday January 23, 2015, at 12:00 pm CST re 412 Emergency MOTION Extend Trial Time re 403 Order filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 1/20/2015. (gsg)
January 20, 2015 Filing 412 Emergency MOTION Extend Trial Time re 403 Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Batchelder, James)
January 20, 2015 Filing 411 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 393 SEALED MOTION , Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Pearson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit C-3, # 7 Exhibit C-4, # 8 Exhibit C-5, # 9 Exhibit C-6, # 10 Exhibit C-7, # 11 Exhibit C-8, # 12 Exhibit C-9, # 13 Exhibit C-10, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 19, 2015 Filing 410 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 406 Sealed Document, SMARTFLASH'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS'PATENT OWNERSHIP BRIEFS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summers Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Racz Declaration, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 15, 2015 Filing 409 Sealed Document. Notice Of Supplemental Expert Report (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report Of Anthony Wechselberger)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 14, 2015 Filing 408 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Expert Report of Robert Mills, # 2 Second Supplemental Expert Report of William E. Wecker)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 13, 2015 Filing 407 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited of Submission of Agreed Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Agreed Juror Questionnaire)(Ward, Thomas)
January 12, 2015 Filing 406 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.s Brief On The Issue Of Patent Ownership (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Lee Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Lee Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Lee Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Lee Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Lee Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Lee Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Lee Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Lee Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Lee Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Lee Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Lee Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Lee Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Lee Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to Lee Declaration, # 17 Exhibit P to Lee Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 12, 2015 Filing 405 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER AS IT RELATES IN PART TO ROBERT MILLS [DKT. NO. 374] (Attachments: # 1 Pearson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 8, 2015 Jury Selection set for 2/16/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SETTINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/08/15. (mll, )
January 7, 2015 Filing 402 NOTICE by Game Circus LLC Request to Terminate ECF Notices (Dunwoody, Samuel)
January 7, 2015 Filing 401 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 1/6/15 Pre-trial Conference before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 6, 2015 Filing 404 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2015. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 276 Sealed Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr Stephen Becker. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/06/15. (mll, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited of January 6, 2015 Potential Conflicts With Trial Date (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 6, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of January 6, 2015 Potential Conflicts With Trial Date (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 6, 2015 Filing 397 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. CORRECTED NOTICE OF STATUS RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 6, 2015 Filing 396 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF STATUS RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 5, 2015 Filing 395 SEALED MOTION Supplemental Motion In Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A to Schenker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Schenker Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2015: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
January 5, 2015 Filing 394 Unopposed SEALED MOTION To File A Supplemental Motion In Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 5, 2015 Filing 393 SEALED MOTION , Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A to Schenker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Schenker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Schenker Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Schenker Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Schenker Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Schenker Declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
January 5, 2015 Filing 392 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF OBJECTIONS TO APPLE INC.'S FIRST AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 5, 2015 Filing 391 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/05/15. (mll, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 390 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 272 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infrigement filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 271 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple Inc., be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/05/15. (mll, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 389 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Apple Inc., be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/05/15. (mll, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 388 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 270 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/05/15. (mll, )
January 2, 2015 Filing 387 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited SMARTFLASH'S REQUESTED TIME FOR JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 2, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Estimated Trial Time (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 31, 2014 Filing 385 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Submission of First Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 31, 2014 Filing 384 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO ENTER THE FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2014 Filing 383 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 381 Sealed Response to Motion, Proposed Order. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 30, 2014 Filing 382 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 375 SEALED MOTION Motions In Limine filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Stewart Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2014 Filing 381 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 377 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 30, 2014 Filing 380 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF FIRST AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 First Amended Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 24, 2014 Filing 378 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Of Federal Circuit, District Court, And Patent And Trademark Office Supplemental Authority In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. § 101 [DKTS. 266 (-447 Case), 320 (-448 Case)] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 23, 2014 Filing 377 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 McManis Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2014 Filing 376 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF JOINT STIPULATION RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2014 Filing 375 SEALED MOTION Motions In Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. Plaintiffs shall have leave to amend its expert reports in accordance with this Order and shall resubmit them within 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/23/14. (mjc, )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting 367 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file Motions in Limine is extended to 12-23-2014. Parties are ORDERED to submit a revised Docket Control Order reflecting this change within five business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/23/14. (mll, )
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting 366 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counter-claims between Plaintiff and Defendant Game Circus LLC are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses and attorneys' fees shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/23/14. (mll, )
December 19, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
December 19, 2014 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per General Order 14-20. Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell no longer assigned to the case. (mll, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 371 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITEDS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS USE OF CERTAIN WITNESSES IDENTIFIED UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(3)(A)(i) (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 18, 2014 Filing 370 Sealed Document Apple Inc's Submission of Objections to Smartflash LLC's and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Exhibit List. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 18, 2014 Filing 369 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Submission of Objections to Smartflash LLC's and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Use of Certain Witnesses Identified Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3)(A)(i) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 18, 2014 Filing 368 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 18, 2014 Filing 367 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Apple Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 18, 2014 Filing 366 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 17, 2014 Filing 365 SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 360 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Caldwell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Jones Declaration, # 10 Text of Proposed Order, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 15, 2014 Filing 364 Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Notice of withdrawn Argument. (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 363 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC Defendants' Submission of Objections and Counter Designations to Smartflash's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Q)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 11, 2014 Filing 362 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O and P)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 11, 2014 Filing 361 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 - Defendants' Supplemental Notice of New Federal Circuit Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101] (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 9, 2014 Filing 360 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. George T. Ligler in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Benjamin Goldberg in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 9, 2014 Filing 359 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC re 327 Sealed Document [Corrected] Defendants' Submission of Objections and Rebuttal Designations To Smartflash's Opening Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 9, 2014 Filing 358 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 12/2/2014; 12/4/2014 SJ/Daubert hearing before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 8, 2014 Filing 357 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF NEW FEDERAL CIRCUIT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. § 101 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 5, 2014 Filing 355 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 302]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, H, I and J)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 5, 2014 Filing 354 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 5, 2014 Filing 353 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC re 327 Sealed Document Defendants' Submission of Objections and Rebuttal Designations To Smartflash's Opening Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 5, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 4, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 356). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 4, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Apple Inc. (Refer to original minutes at DE 356). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 4, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 356). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 4, 2014 Filing 356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2014 re 270 SEALED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103; 269 SEALED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness; 267 SEALED Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement; 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS 229 Report and Recommendations as the findings and conclusions of this Court; overrules 251 Objections, and denies 161 Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/04/14. (mll, )
December 3, 2014 Filing 350 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 3, 2014 Filing 349 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Apple Inc. (Latchford, Shawn)
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 276 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 348). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 348) (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 277 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 348). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 348). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes at DE 348). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Refer to original minutes, DE 348). (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 Filing 348 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing held on 12/2/2014 re 317 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH O2 MICRO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESOLVE MANUFACTURED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISPUTES THAT DEFENDANTS INTEND TO ARGUE TO THE JURY; 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101; 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702; 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702; 277 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER; 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones; 276 Opposed SEALED MOTION LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing continued to 12/4/2014 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
December 2, 2014 Filing 346 Unopposed SEALED MOTION To Replace Exhibit C To The October 24, 2014 Declaration Of Lauren N. Robinson In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness [Dkt. 269] by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Replacement Copy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 1, 2014 Filing 345 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE REGARDING TRIAL AVAILABILITY (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 1, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 343, Sealed Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
December 1, 2014 Filing 344 SEALED CORRECTED Response to Motion re 317 Opposed SEALED PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH O2 MICRO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESOLVE MANUFACTURED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISPUTES THAT DEFENDANTS INTEND TO ARGUE TO THE JURY filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A - CORRECTED, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) Modified on 12/2/2014 (sm, ).
December 1, 2014 Filing 343 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE ENTRY 344 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 317 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH O2 MICRO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESOLVE MANUFACTURED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISPUTES THAT DEFENDANTS INTEND TO ARGUE TO THE JURY filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D (Fukuda, Ching-Lee) Modified on 12/1/2014 (gsg).
November 25, 2014 Filing 342 NOTICE by Game Circus LLC of Potential Conflicts With Trial Date (Dunwoody, Samuel)
November 25, 2014 Filing 341 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Potential Conflicts with Trial Date (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting 322 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and Form of Verdict is hereby extended to 12-03-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/25/14. (mll, )
November 25, 2014 Filing 339 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 338 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 337 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 272 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infrigement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 336 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 271 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 335 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 334 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 333 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 332 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, # 2 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 331 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 270 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 24, 2014 Filing 330 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to Motion re 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 21, 2014 Filing 329 SEALED Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting 321 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/21/14. (mll, )
November 20, 2014 Filing 327 Sealed Document. Defendants Submission Of Exhibit List And Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E - Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit T - Exhibit List)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 20, 2014 Filing 326 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Defendants Apple Inc.s And Game Circus LLCs Proposed Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 20, 2014 Filing 325 Agreed MOTION Joint Motion for Leave to Increase the Limit for Exhibit Designations by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 20, 2014 Filing 324 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO THE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. 302] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit S)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 20, 2014 Filing 323 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. SMARTFLASH'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 20, 2014 Filing 322 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND FORM OF VERDICT by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 19, 2014 Filing 321 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Addressing New Federal Circuit Authority Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. s 101 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ultramercial Inc. v. Hulu LLC, # 2 Exhibit B - Supplemental Brief, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting 319 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/19/14. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 14, 2014 Filing 318 Sealed Document. Certificate of Conference to Sealed Motion filed at Docket No. 317. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 14, 2014 Filing 317 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE COMPLIANCE WITH O2 MICRO, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO RESOLVE MANUFACTURED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISPUTES THAT DEFENDANTS INTEND TO ARGUE TO THE JURY by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Caldwell Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 13, 2014 Filing 316 RESPONSE to 298 Response to Non-Motion, PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND INDEFINITENESS filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 12, 2014 Filing 315 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond, # 2 Exhibit T to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit U to Raymond Declaration, # 4 Exhibit V to Raymond Declaration, # 5 Exhibit W to Raymond Declaration, # 6 Exhibit X to Raymond Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 314 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit O to Lee Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 313 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 270 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel W. Richards, # 2 Exhibit A to Richards Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Richards Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Richards Declaration, # 5 Declaraton of Anthony J. Wechselberger, # 6 Declaration of Stephen L. Becker, # 7 Declaration of George T. Ligler)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 312 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond, # 2 Exhibit DD to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit EE to Raymond Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 311 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 272 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infrigement filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit P to Lee Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Q to Lee Declaration, # 4 Exhibit R to Lee Declaration, # 5 Exhibit S to Lee Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 310 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit BB to Lee Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 309 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 271 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel W. Richards, # 2 Exhibit G to Richards Declaration, # 3 Exhibit H to Richards Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 308 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 307 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 12, 2014 Filing 305 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Game Circus LLC. (Dunwoody, Samuel)
November 12, 2014 Filing 304 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 276 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/12/14. (mll, )
November 12, 2014 Filing 302 Proposed Pretrial Order by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 12, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 12, 2014 Filing 300 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 277 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 10, 2014 Filing 299 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO ENTER THE FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 6, 2014 Filing 298 RESPONSE to 275 Response to Non-Motion, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation Regarding Claim Construction and Indefiniteness by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 4, 2014 Filing 297 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 296 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, # 2 Declaration of Patrick S. Racz, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 295 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 272 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infrigement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 14 Exhibit 1, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 294 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 271 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 293 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 270 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Mark T. Jones with attachments, # 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Mark T. Jones with attachments, # 3 Exhibit C Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 292 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Declaration of Mark T. Jones with Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 291 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Warren J. McCarty, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Declaration of Mark T. Jones with Exhibits K & L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 290 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 289 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 276 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B, Schenker, # 2 Ex 1 to the Schenker Declaration, # 3 Ex 2 to the Schenker Declaration, # 4 Ex 3 to the Schenker Declaration, # 5 Ex 4 to the Schenker Declaration, # 6 Ex 5 to the Schenker Declaration, # 7 Ex 6 to the Schenker Declaration, # 8 Ex 7 to the Schenker Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 4, 2014 Filing 288 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark T. Jones with Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2014 Filing 287 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 277 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A - Jones Infringement Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Mills Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit C - Apple Rebuttal Report, # 5 Exhibit D - Mills Rebuttal Report, # 6 Exhibit E - 720 Claim Chart, # 7 Exhibit F - 317 Claim Chart)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 4, 2014 Filing 286 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel R. Pearson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 284 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to complete the second mediation between Smartflash and Game Circus is hereby extended to 11-12-2014. Parties shall submit an amended docket control order reflecting this change within five business days; denying as moot 283 Motion to Enter Third Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/03/14. (mll, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 284 Agreed MOTION AGREED JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SECOND MEDIATION BETWEEN SMARTFLASH AND GAME CIRCUS by Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 31, 2014 Filing 283 Joint MOTION TO ENTER The Third Amended Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Docket Control Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 29, 2014 Report & Recommendations 229 is assigned to Judge Michael Schneider for review and consideration. (mll, )
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting 281 Motion to Continue. The deadline to complete the second mediation is hereby extended to 11-05-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/29/14. (mll, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 281 Agreed MOTION to Continue the Deadline to Complete Second Mediation by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 28, 2014 Filing 280 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond in Support, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1 to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2 to Raymond Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A Part 3 to Raymond Declaration, # 5 Exhibit A Part 4 to Raymond Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A part 5 to Raymond Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B to Raymond Declaration, # 8 Exhibit C to Raymond Declaration, # 9 Exhibit D to Raymond Declaration, # 10 Exhibit E to Raymond Declaration, # 11 Exhibit F to Raymond Declaration, # 12 Exhibit G to Raymond Declaration, # 13 Exhibit H to Raymond Declaration, # 14 Exhibit I to Raymond Declaration, # 15 Exhibit J to Raymond Declaration, # 16 Exhibit K to Raymond Declaration, # 17 Exhibit L to Raymond Declaration, # 18 Exhibit M to Raymond Declaration, # 19 Exhibit N to Raymond Declaration, # 20 Exhibit O to Raymond Declaration, # 21 Exhibit P to Raymond Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Q to Raymond Declaration, # 23 Exhibit R to Raymond Declaration, # 24 Exhibit S to Raymond Declaration, # 25 Exhibit T to Raymond Declaration, # 26 Exhibit U to Raymond Declaration, # 27 Exhibit V to Raymond Declaration, # 28 Exhibit W to Raymond Declaration, # 29 Exhibit X to Raymond Declaration, # 30 Exhibit Y to Raymond Declaration, # 31 Exhibit Z to Raymond Declaration, # 32 Exhibit AA to Raymond Declaration, # 33 Exhibit BB to Raymond Declaration, # 34 Exhibit CC to Raymond Declaration, # 35 Declaration of David Reibstein, # 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 28, 2014 Filing 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Megan F. Raymond's Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702, # 2 Exhibit A to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Raymond Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Raymond Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Raymond Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Raymond Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F, Part 1 to Raymond Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F, Part 2 to Raymond Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F, Part 3 to Raymond Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Raymond Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Raymond Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Raymond Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Raymond Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Raymond Declaration, # 15 Exhibit L to Raymond Declaration, # 16 Exhibit M to Raymond Declaration, # 17 Exhibit N to Raymond Declaration, # 18 Exhibit O to Raymond Declaration, # 19 Exhibit P to Raymond Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Q to Raymond Declaration, # 21 Exhibit R to Raymond Declaration, # 22 Exhibit S to Raymond Declaration, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 28, 2014 Filing 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimoney from Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones, # 2 Exhibit A to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Raymond Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Raymond Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Raymond Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Raymond Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to RaymondDeclaration, # 8 Exhibit G to RaymondDeclaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Raymond Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Raymond Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Raymond Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Raymond Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Raymond Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Raymond Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Raymond Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to Raymond Declaration, # 17 Exhibit P to Raymond Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Q to Raymond Declaration, # 19 Exhibit R to Raymond Declaration, # 20 Exhibit S to Raymond Declaration, # 21 Exhibit T to Raymond Declaration, # 22 Exhibit U to Raymond Declaration, # 23 Exhibit V to Raymond Declaration, # 24 Exhibit W to Raymond Declaration, # 25 Exhibit X to Raymond Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Y to Raymond Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Z to Raymond Declaration, # 28 Exhibit AA to Raymond Declaration, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 28, 2014 Filing 277 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 28, 2014 Filing 276 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 27, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE to 251 Sealed Document PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND INDEFINITENESS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
October 27, 2014 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #263 and #264 Sealed Motions to exclude submitted by Smartflash LLC and regarding the #268, #273 and #274 Sealed Motions to exclude submitted by Defendants. No certificate of conferences were included in all these motions. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refilled. These motions are now TERMINATED. (sm, )
October 25, 2014 Filing 274 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony From Plaintiffs' Technical Expert Dr. Mark Jones by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 273 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to FRE 403 and 702 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Megan Raymond in support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Robert Mills Expert Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A to Raymond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Raymond Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Raymond Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Raymond Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Raymond Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F (part 1) to Raymond Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F (part 2) to Raymond Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F (part 3) to Raymond Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Raymond Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Raymond Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Raymond Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Raymond Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Raymond Declaration, # 15 Exhibit L to Raymond Declaration, # 16 Exhibit M to Raymond Declaration, # 17 Exhibit N to Raymond Declaration, # 18 Exhibit O to Raymond Declaration, # 19 Exhibit P to Raymond Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Q to Raymond Declaration, # 21 Exhibit R to Raymond Declaration, # 22 Exhibit S to Raymond Declaration, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Sharon) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 272 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infrigement by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Declaration of Benjamin Goldberg Ph.d in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 24, 2014 Filing 271 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren N. Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Lauren)
October 24, 2014 Filing 270 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102, 103 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Anthony J. Wechselberger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Wolfe, PhD in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren Robinson in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under Sections 102 and 103, # 5 Exhibit A to Robinson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B to Robinson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C to Robinson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D (part 1) to Robinson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit D (part 2) to Robinson Declaration, # 10 Exhibit E to Robinson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit F to Robinson Declaration, # 12 Exhibit G to Robinson Declaration, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Sharon)
October 24, 2014 Filing 269 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Indefiniteness by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren N. Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Lauren)
October 24, 2014 Filing 268 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED Defendants MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Related to Survey's Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702 by Game Circus LLC, Apple, Samsung, HTC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Megan Raymond in Support, # 2 Exhibt A Pt1, # 3 Exhibit A Pt 2, # 4 Exhibit A Pt 3, # 5 Exhibit A Pt 4, # 6 Exhibit A Pt 5, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Exhibit M, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit O, # 21 Exhibit P, # 22 Exhibit Q, # 23 Exhibit R, # 24 Exhibit S, # 25 Exhibit T, # 26 Exhibit U, # 27 Exhibit V, # 28 Exhibit W, # 29 Exhibit X, # 30 Exhibit Y, # 31 Exhibit Z, # 32 Exhibit AA, # 33 Exhibit BB, # 34 Exhibit CC, # 35 Declaration of David Reibstein, # 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ).
October 24, 2014 Filing 267 SEALED MOTION Apple's Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lauren N. Robinson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Lauren)
October 24, 2014 Filing 266 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Declaration of Sharon Lee in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Puruant to 35 U.S.C. 101, # 5 Ex A to Lee Declaration, # 6 Ex B to Lee Declaration, # 7 Ex C to Lee Declaration, # 8 Ex D to Lee Declaration, # 9 Ex E to Lee Declaration, # 10 Ex F to Lee Declaration, # 11 Ex G to Lee Declaration, # 12 Ex H to Lee Declaration, # 13 Ex I to Lee Declaration, # 14 Ex K to Lee Declaration, # 15 Ex L to Lee Declaration, # 16 Ex M to Lee Declaration, # 17 Ex N to Lee Declaration, # 18 Declaration of Anthony J. Wschselberger in Support of Summary Judgment, # 19 Declaration of Andrew Wolfe PH.d in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 24, 2014 Filing 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 24, 2014 Filing 264 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY WECHSELBERGER by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ).
October 24, 2014 Filing 263 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. STEPHEN BECKER by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 10/27/2014 (sm, ).
October 22, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 7/17/14, before Judge Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden, Telephone number: 903/593-3213. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2015. (dlc, )
October 21, 2014 Filing 261 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Expert Report. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. George T. Ligler)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER REGARDING LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/20/14. (mll, )
October 16, 2014 Filing 259 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 249 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC Filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Reply Letter Brief in Support of Request to File Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 16, 2014 Filing 258 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 248 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC Filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Reply Letter Brief in Support of Request to File Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 16, 2014 Filing 257 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Expert Report of William E. Wecker)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 15, 2014 Filing 256 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 246 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., 245 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 247 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., 244 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 243 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC Filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Defendants' Joint Reply Letter Brief Regarding Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 101, 112, # 2 Exhibit B, Defendants' Reply Letter Brief Regarding Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102, 103, # 3 Exhibit C, Defendants' Reply in Support of its Letter Brief Regarding Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit D, Apple Inc.'s Reply Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement, # 5 Exhibit E, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply Letter Brief In Support of its Request for Permission to File a Daubert Motion to Exclude Robert Mills and William Wecker from Testifying at Trial, and to Exclude Portions of Mark Jones Testimony at Trial.)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 14, 2014 Filing 255 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 246 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., 241 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC, 242 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC, 245 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 239 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC, 247 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., 244 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 243 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, 240 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC Filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 254, Sealed Response to notices. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 10, 2014 Filing 254 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 246 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 241 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 242 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 245 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 239 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 247 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 244 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 243 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 240 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 10/14/2014 (sm, ).
October 10, 2014 Filing 253 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 249 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC Filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Letter Brief requesting permission to file a motion to strike portions of the rebuttal opinions of Mr. Anthony Wechselberger)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 10, 2014 Filing 252 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 248 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC Filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Letter Brief requesting permission to file a Daubert motion regarding portions of the opinions of Dr. Stephen Becker)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 8, 2014 Filing 251 Sealed Document. Defendants Objections To The Magistrates Report And Recommendation Regarding Claim Construction And Indefiniteness (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 238 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/07/14. (mll, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 249 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Letter Brief Requesting Leave to File Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 3, 2014 Filing 248 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Letter Brief Requesting Leave to File Daubert Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 3, 2014 Filing 247 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple Inc.s Letter Brief Requesting Permission to file a Daubert Motion to Exclude Smartflashs Expert Opinions)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 3, 2014 Filing 246 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple Inc.s Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motions for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement and No Indirect Infringement)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 3, 2014 Filing 245 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Letter Brief Regarding Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 3, 2014 Filing 244 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Letter Brief Regarding Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 102, 103)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 3, 2014 Filing 243 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Letter Brief Regarding Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. §§ 101, 112)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 3, 2014 Filing 242 Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief - Non-Infringement)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 241 Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 240 Letter Brief filed by Game Circus LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 239 SEALED Letter Brief Regarding Daubert Motions filed by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 3, 2014 Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION to Seal NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE re: DAUBERT MOTIONS & EXHIBIT 1 (LETTER BRIEF) by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strauss, Jordan)
October 3, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2014 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 237 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 200 MOTION to Amend/Correct Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
October 2, 2014 Filing 236 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Expert Reports (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Stephen L. Becker, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Ravi Dhar)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/01/14. (mll, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 234 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO ENTER SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Docket Control Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 26, 2014 Filing 233 Rebuttal Witness List by Game Circus LLC. (Strauss, Jordan)
September 26, 2014 Filing 232 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
September 26, 2014 Filing 231 Rebuttal Trial Witness List by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 227 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Parties are ORDERED to submit an amended Docket Control Order incorporating these dates and deadlines within five business days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/25/14. (mll, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 229 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court hereby ADOPTS the above claim constructions for the patents-in-suit. The Court recommends that Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment for Invalidity be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/24/14. (mll, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 228 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 227 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend the Deadline to File Letter Briefs for Daubert Motions filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
September 24, 2014 Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend the Deadline to File Letter Briefs for Daubert Motions by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
September 23, 2014 Filing 226 Sealed Document. SMARTFLASH'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Mark T. Jones)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 22, 2014 Filing 225 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 224 Second Declaration of Josef B. Schenkar (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
September 22, 2014 Filing 224 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION to Amend/Correct Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 218 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Thompson Gorham and Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV terminated as counsel for Defendant Game Circus LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/17/14. (mll, )
September 16, 2014 Filing 222 Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Robinson, Lauren)
September 16, 2014 Filing 221 Trial Witness List by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 16, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Regarding Identification of Trial Witnesses Pursuant to the Court's Amended Docket Control Order (Robinson, Lauren)
September 16, 2014 Filing 219 Trial Witness List by Game Circus LLC. (Strauss, Jordan)
September 16, 2014 Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE by Game Circus LLC of Service of Expert Disclosures (Strauss, Jordan)
September 15, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Craig Wilson on behalf of Game Circus LLC (Wilson, Michael)
September 15, 2014 Filing 215 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Christine Strauss on behalf of Game Circus LLC (Strauss, Jordan)
September 15, 2014 Filing 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamil N Alibhai on behalf of Game Circus LLC (Alibhai, Jamil)
September 12, 2014 Filing 213 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 200 MOTION to Amend/Correct Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 11, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Wallace Dunwoody, IV on behalf of Game Circus LLC (Dunwoody, Samuel)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/11/14. (mll, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 192 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant KingsIsle Entertainment Incorporated are DISMISSED without prejudice. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/11/14. (mll, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 191 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Robot Entertainment Inc are DISMISSED without prejudice. All costs and expenses relating to this litigation shall be borne solely by the party incurring the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/11/14. (mll, )
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/8/2014. (gsg)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, )
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/02/14. (mll, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 204 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Order Focusing Patent Claims & Prior Art by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 29, 2014 Filing 203 Joint Submission of Proposed Agreed Amended Docket Control order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 26, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC that the Opening Expert Report of Anthony Wechselberger regarding the invalidity of the asserted claims was served upon all counsel of record via electronic mail on August 25, 2014. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 25, 2014 Filing 201 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 200 . Declaration of Josef B. Schenker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 25, 2014 Filing 200 MOTION to Amend/Correct Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2014: # 2 Text of Proposed Order - Corrected) (mjc, ).
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 195 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/19/14. (mll, )
August 19, 2014 Filing 198 SEALED RESPONSE - PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC to 196 Sealed Document, filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Caldwell, Bradley)
August 15, 2014 Filing 197 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 14, 2014 Filing 196 Sealed Document. Defendant's Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Post, # 2 Exhibit A, to the Declaration of Kevin J. Post, # 3 Exhibit B, to the Declaration of Kevin J. Post, # 4 Exhibit C, to the Declaration of Kevin J. Post, # 5 Exhibit D, to the Declaration of Kevin J. Post)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 14, 2014 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/14/14. (mll, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
August 7, 2014 Filing 192 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 7, 2014 Filing 191 STIPULATION of Dismissal STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 187 Motion to Amend/Correct the Discovery Order. Defendants shall be allotted 10 testifying experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/7/14. (mjc, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 188 Sealed Patent Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Log for E-mail ESI Discovery. The deadline for Game Circus LLC to exchange its privilege log for e-mail ESI discovery is no later than 10 days after completing its e-mail ESI production. Game Circus shall complete its e-mail ESI production by 8/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/7/14. (mjc, )
August 6, 2014 Filing 188 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Log for E-Mail ESI Discovery by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
August 6, 2014 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 67 Order by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/01/14. (mll, )
July 30, 2014 Filing 185 Joint MOTION For Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 25, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Lee on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4762338. (Lee, Sharon)
July 24, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel W Richards on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4761180. (Richards, Daniel)
July 17, 2014 Filing 182 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Markman Hearing held on 7/17/2014. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited of Parties' Meet and Confer Relating to Final Election of Claims (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 11, 2014 Filing 180 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 11, 2014 Filing 179 REPLY to Response to Motion re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness [Corrected] filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 10, 2014 Filing 178 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark T. Jones, # 2 Declaration of Justin T. Nemunaitis, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 10, 2014 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/10/2014. (gsg)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 121 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,334,720; 7,942,317; 8,033,458; 8,061,598; 8,118,221; AND 8,336,772 BY THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE filed by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, Robot Entertainment, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/8/2014. (gsg)
July 7, 2014 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INDEFINITENESS filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 7, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 172 Response in Opposition to Motion, SMARTFLASH LLC'S AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF AMENDED BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 3, 2014 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 3, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited of Estimated Amount of Time for Markman Hearing (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline for privilege logs regarding all non-email discovery is 7/9/2014. The deadline to exchange privilege logs regarding all e-mail ESI discovery will be no later than 7/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/3/14. (mjc, )
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 165 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs Smartflash LLC and Smartflash Technologies Limited's Notice of Supplemental Fact Regarding Apple's Motion to Transfer and Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/3/14. (mjc, )
July 2, 2014 Filing 168 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 2, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) of Corrected Declaration of Mark Buckley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Declaration Of Mark Buckley In Support Of Defendant Apple's Motions to Sever And Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 2, 2014 Filing 166 Sealed Document. PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL FACT REGARDING APPLE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [DKT. NOS. 46 & 127] (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 2, 2014 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION to Seal PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL FACT REGARDING APPLE'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [DKT. NOS. 46 & 127] UNDER SEAL by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 162 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/30/2014. (gsg)
June 30, 2014 Motion/Report and Recommendation Assigned to District Judge Michael H. Schneider for disposition re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a). This case remains assigned to the magistrate judge. (mjc, )
June 27, 2014 Filing 163 SEALED RESPONSE by Robot Entertainment, Inc., Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. to 160 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Robot Entertainment, Inc., Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Cromarty Declaration, # 2 Lee Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 27, 2014 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Responsive Claim Construction Brief) by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 20, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Andrew Cromarty, PH.D, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 13, 2014 Filing 160 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Jones Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 Nemunaitis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 6, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 70 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 4, 2014 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell as presiding judge per General Order 14-12. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. The opening claim construction brief will be due 6-13-2014. The response will be due 6-27-2014 and the reply will be due 7-10-2014. Parties will have an additional five pages for their opening and response claim construction briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/03/14. (mll, )
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadline for exchanging privilege logs is hereby extended to 7-02-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/03/14. (mll, )
June 2, 2014 Filing 156 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
June 2, 2014 Filing 155 ANSWER to 144 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 2, 2014 Filing 154 ANSWER to 143 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 2, 2014 Filing 153 ANSWER to 142 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 2, 2014 Filing 152 ANSWER to 141 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 30, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 147 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Of Parties Meet And Confer Relating To Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 28, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 147 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Of Defendants Disclosure Relating To Indefinite Means-Plus-Function Terms (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 27, 2014 Filing 149 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 22, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF REVISED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 126 Motion to Construe More than 10 Terms. Lead counsel shall meet and confer in an attempt to reach agreed constructions, narrow the issues, and otherwise resolve their differences regarding the disputed claim terms. Parties shall file a notice by 5-30-2014 informing the Court of any agreed constructions and identifying which terms still require construction by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/20/14. (mll, )
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER appointing David Keyzer to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/16/14. (mll, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 15, 2014 Filing 144 ANSWER to 132 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Robot Entertainment, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
May 15, 2014 Filing 143 ANSWER to 132 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
May 15, 2014 Filing 142 ANSWER to 132 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Game Circus LLC.(Walsh, Thomas)
May 15, 2014 Filing 141 ANSWER to 132 Amended Complaint, Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Apple Inc..(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 13, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd; Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. Regarding Technical Advisor (Joint) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Joint Notice of Dispute Regarding Agreed Protective Order. Parties are ORDERED to submit to the Court a revised proposed protective order incorporating the rulings discussed above within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/14. (mll, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 138 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,334,720; 7,942,317; 8,033,458; 8,061,598; 8,118,221; AND 8,336,772 BY THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time. The current deadline for proposing technical advisors is hereby extended to no later than 5-13-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/14. (mll, )
May 8, 2014 Filing 136 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Submission Regarding Technical Advisors by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Amend P R 3-3 Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/6/2014. (gsg)
May 5, 2014 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 2, 2014 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,334,720; 7,942,317; 8,033,458; 8,061,598; 8,118,221; AND 8,336,772 BY THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin J. Post, # 2 Exhibit A to Post Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Post Declaration)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
May 1, 2014 Filing 132 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC.(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to exchange privilege logs is hereby extended to 6-02-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/30/14. (mll, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 130 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 28, 2014 Filing 129 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 21, 2014 Filing 128 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 121 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,334,720; 7,942,317; 8,033,458; 8,061,598; 8,118,221; AND 8,336,772 BY THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin Nemunaitis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 18, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Apple's Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. s. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 14, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION Joint Submission Regarding Defendants Opposed Request To Construe More Than 10 Terms by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Terms to be Construed, # 2 Exhibit B - Personal Audio v. Apple EDTX.pdf, # 3 Exhibit C- Ex Parte Lakkala PTAB, # 4 Exhibit D - Ex Parte Erol PTAB, # 5 Exhibit E -Ex Parte Smith PTAB, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 125, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 11, 2014 Filing 125 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Joint Submission Regarding Defendants Opposed Request To Construe More Than 10 Terms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Terms to be Construted, # 2 Exhibit B - Personal Audio v. Apple EDTX, # 3 Exhibit C - Ex Parte Lakkala PTAB, # 4 Exhibit D - Ex Parte Erol PTAB, # 5 Exhibit E - Ex Parte Smith PTAB, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) Modified on 4/14/2014 (sm, ).
April 8, 2014 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants Invalidity Contentions by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Josef B. Schenker, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2014: # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 120 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/8/2014. (gsg)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 45 Motion to Sever; denying 46 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot 98 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 115 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/04/14. (mll, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 121 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING COVERED BUSINESS METHOD REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,334,720; 7,942,317; 8,033,458; 8,061,598; 8,118,221; AND 8,336,772 BY THE UNITED STATES PATENT & TRADEMARK OFFICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sharon Lee, # 2 Exhibit A - AIA Statistics, # 3 Exhibit B - Inter Parties Reexam Filing Data, # 4 Exhibit C - PTAB Trials, # 5 Exhibit D - 2014-01-27 Smartflash Responses to Apple's First Set of Individual Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit E - PersonalWeb Techs Slip Op, # 7 Exhibit F - CBM2012-0001 Paper No 10, # 8 Exhibit 2014-1232 Slip Op., # 9 Exhibit 2013-11-13 Smartflash Election of Asserted Claims)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2014: # 10 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 3, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION to Seal Their Motion to Stay Litigation Pending by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 116 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs to 5/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/2/14. (mjc, )
April 2, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 Disclosure (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
April 2, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-2 DISCLOSURE (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 1, 2014 Filing 116 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXCHANGE PRIVILEGE LOGS by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 31, 2014 Filing 115 MOTION for Hearing re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a), 46 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
March 19, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc. of Compliance with the Court's November 22, 2013 Discovery Order and Docket Control Order (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
March 18, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Josef B Schenker on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4568607. (Schenker, Josef)
February 26, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Joseph McCarty, III on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McCarty, Warren)
February 25, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Thomas Nemunaitis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Nemunaitis, Justin)
February 24, 2014 Filing 110 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 21, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 Discloure (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 21, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULE 4-1 DISCLOSURE (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 13, 2014 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) filed by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sharon Lee in Support of Defendants' Reply to Smartflash's Opposition Regarding Defendants' Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit A - 2014-01-31 Letter from Stewart to Post, # 3 Exhibit B - 2011-09-08 MobileMedia Ideas LLC, Slip Op.)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
February 4, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc's Notice of Service of Additional Disclosure Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Order (Robinson, Lauren)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Keese terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 2/4/2014. (gsg)
February 4, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE by Robot Entertainment, Inc. re 67 Order [ROBOT ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE] (Gorham, Andrew)
February 4, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. re 67 Order [KINGSISLE ENTERTAINMENT INCORPORATED'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE] (Gorham, Andrew)
February 4, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by Game Circus LLC re 67 Order [GAME CIRCUS L.L.C.'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE] (Gorham, Andrew)
February 4, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDER (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 3, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 31, 2014 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Apple, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Keese, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
January 17, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1401(a) by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 30, 2013 Filing 97 ANSWER to 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT ROBOT ENTERTAINMENT, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2013 Filing 96 ANSWER to 82 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT GAME CIRCUS LLC'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2013 Filing 95 ANSWER to 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT KINGSISLE ENTERTAINMENT INCORPORATED'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2013 Filing 94 ANSWER to 84 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 20, 2013 Filing 91 BRIEF filed PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER PROVISIONS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 20, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robot Entertainment, Inc. (Walsh, Thomas)
December 20, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. (Walsh, Thomas)
December 20, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Game Circus LLC (Walsh, Thomas)
December 17, 2013 Filing 87 BRIEF filed Defendants' in Support of Their Proposed Protective Order Provisions by Apple Inc.. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/16/13. (mll, )
December 13, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited NOTICE OF DISPUTE REGARDING AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AGREED MEDIATOR AND JOINT MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order 447, # 2 Exhibit B - Protective Order 448)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 12, 2013 Filing 84 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Apple Inc..(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
December 12, 2013 Filing 83 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
December 12, 2013 Filing 82 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Game Circus LLC.(Walsh, Thomas)
December 12, 2013 Filing 81 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Robot Entertainment, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM LIMITATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/06/13. (mll, )
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART TO REDUCE COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/06/13. (mll, )
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until 12-13-2013 to submit an agreed upon protective order and agreed upon mediator or to otherwise submit the parties' proposals to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/06/13. (mll, )
December 5, 2013 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order and Mediator by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Lauren)
November 26, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (P.R. 3-1, 3-2) (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 25, 2013 Filing 75 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1404(a) filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Racz, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Summers, # 3 Exhibit A to Summers Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Summers Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Summers Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Summers Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Summers Decl., # 8 Exhibit F to Summers Decl.)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 25, 2013 Filing 74 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Sever filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A to Summers Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Summers Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Summers Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Summers Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Summers Decl.)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 25, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 73 Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE. CORRECTED DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED.*** (mjc, )
November 25, 2013 Filing 73 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Sever filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick Racz, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Summers, # 3 Exhibit A to Summers Decl., # 4 Exhibit B to Summers Decl., # 5 Exhibit C to Summers Decl., # 6 Exhibit D to Summers Decl., # 7 Exhibit E to Summers Decl., # 8 Exhibit F to Summers Decl.)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 11/25/2013 (mjc, ).
November 25, 2013 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc., filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited, Smartflash LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '720 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '317 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '458 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - '598 Patent, # 5 Exhibit E - '221 Patent, # 6 Exhibit F - '772 Patent)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 3-21-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 10/31/2014. Evidentiary/Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Markman Hearing set for 7/17/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/22/13. (mll, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that parties have until 12-05-2013 to submit a Proposed Protective Order and to agree on a mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/22/13. (mll, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/22/13. (mll, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/22/13. (mll, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Scheduling Conference held on 11/21/2013. (Court Reporter L Hardwick.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (leh, )
November 20, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Scott McManis on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (McManis, Jason)
November 19, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Robot Entertainment, Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
November 19, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited re 44 Order, Set Hearings NOTICE OF AGREEMENTS AND STATUS OF CASE ORDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit C ESI Order, # 4 Exhibit D Order Focusing Patent Claims & Prior Art)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 18, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV on behalf of Robot Entertainment, Inc. (Walsh, Thomas)
November 15, 2013 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1404(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration Of Mark Buckley In Support Of Apple's Motion To Transfer Venue, # 2 Affidavit Reply Declaration Of Megan F. Raymond, # 3 Exhibit A)(Raymond, Megan)
November 14, 2013 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Sever filed by Apple Inc.. (Raymond, Megan)
November 14, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time. Smartflash's deadline to fully comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 is now 11-25-2013. Defendants' deadline to fully comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is now 1-27-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/13/13. (mll, )
November 8, 2013 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, AND 3-4 DEADLINES by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 6, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Franklin Summers on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Summers, John)
November 5, 2013 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1404(a) PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Declaration of Patrick Racz, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE by Robot Entertainment, Inc. of Certificate of Interested Parties (Kohm, Bryan)
November 4, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS' CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2013 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Sever PLAINTIFFS SMARTFLASH LLC AND SMARTFLASH TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Summers, # 2 Exhibit A Part 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit A Part 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 3 of 3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE by Game Circus LLC Certificate of Interested Persons (Walsh, Thomas)
November 4, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. Certificate of Interested Persons (Walsh, Thomas)
November 4, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Certificate of Interested Persons (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/29/13. (mll, )
October 24, 2013 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Game Circus LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Al-Salam, Ramsey)
October 18, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C Section 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Nichols Decl, # 2 Affidavit Duffy Decl, # 3 Affidavit Hudson Decl, # 4 Affidavit Buckley Decl, # 5 Affidavit Parish Decl, # 6 Affidavit Fukuda Decl, # 7 Affidavit Raymond Decl, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 18, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION to Sever by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Nichols Decl, # 2 Affidavit Duffy Decl, # 3 Affidavit Hudson Decl, # 4 Affidavit Buckley Decl, # 5 Affidavit Raymond Decl, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 11/21/2013 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/17/13. (mll, )
August 27, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren N Robinson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Robinson, Lauren)
August 20, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Batchelder on behalf of Apple Inc. (Batchelder, James)
August 19, 2013 Filing 41 ANSWER to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT GAME CIRCUS LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 19, 2013 Filing 40 ANSWER to 31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT KINGSISLE ENTERTAINMENT INCORPORATED'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 19, 2013 Filing 39 ANSWER to 29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited.(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 15, 2013 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell Pursuant to General Order 13-13. Magistrate Judge John D. Love no longer assigned to the case. (mll, )
August 1, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Stewart on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Stewart, Christopher)
July 30, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 25, 2013 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Robot Entertainment, Inc. (Corbin, Teresa)
July 25, 2013 Filing 35 Robot Entertainment, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement by Robot Entertainment, Inc..(Corbin, Teresa)
July 25, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Megan F Raymond on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4237101. (Raymond, Megan)
July 25, 2013 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Game Circus LLC (Walsh, Thomas)
July 25, 2013 Filing 32 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Game Circus LLC.(Walsh, Thomas)
July 24, 2013 Filing 31 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
July 24, 2013 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. (Walsh, Thomas)
July 24, 2013 Filing 29 Apple Inc. ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited by Apple Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
July 24, 2013 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
July 24, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Keese on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4235690. (Keese, Daniel)
July 24, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ching-Lee Fukuda on behalf of Apple Inc. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
July 24, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J Post on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4234881. (Post, Kevin)
July 5, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Game Circus LLC to 7/25/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
July 5, 2013 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Game Circus LLC.( Al-Salam, Ramsey)
June 24, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 23 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. to 7/24/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc..( Walsh, Thomas)
June 18, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 7/24/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Albritton, Eric)
June 17, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
June 13, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Robot Entertainment, Inc. to 7/25/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 12, 2013 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Robot Entertainment, Inc..( Kohm, Bryan)
June 11, 2013 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc. on 6/3/2013, by personal service; answer due: 6/24/2013. (mll, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. Robot Entertainment, Inc. served on 6/4/2013, answer due 6/25/2013. (mjc, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. Apple Inc. served on 6/4/2013, answer due 6/25/2013. (mjc, )
June 7, 2013 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. Game Circus LLC served on 6/4/2013, answer due 6/25/2013. (mjc, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., Game Circus LLC, KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc., Robot Entertainment, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es))(klb)
May 30, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Henry, Claire)
May 30, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Ward, Thomas)
May 30, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Ward, Thomas)
May 29, 2013 Filing 11 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
May 29, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
May 29, 2013 Judge Michael H. Schneider and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, )
May 29, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hamad M Hamad on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Hamad, Hamad)
May 29, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Pearson on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Pearson, Daniel)
May 29, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Cassady, Jason)
May 29, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited (Curry, John)
May 29, 2013 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash Technologies Limited (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 29, 2013 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Smartflash LLC (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 29, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Additional page)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 29, 2013 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Caldwell, Bradley)
May 29, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4157664.), filed by Smartflash LLC, Smartflash Technologies Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 7334720, # 3 Exhibit B - US 7942317, # 4 Exhibit C - US 8033458, # 5 Exhibit D - US 8061598, # 6 Exhibit E - US 8118221, # 7 Exhibit F - US 8336772)(Caldwell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartflash LLC et al v. Apple Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smartflash LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Represented By: John Austin Curry
Represented By: Hamad M Hamad
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Daniel R Pearson
Represented By: Thomas John Ward
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smartflash Technologies Limited
Represented By: Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Represented By: John Austin Curry
Represented By: Hamad M Hamad
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Daniel R Pearson
Represented By: Thomas John Ward
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robot Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KingsIsle Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Game Circus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?