Adaptix, Inc. v. NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Defendant: NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., AT&T Inc., NEC Corporation of America, AT&T Mobility LLC and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Case Number: 6:2013cv00585
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/29/15. (mjc, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 94 FINAL JUDGMENT. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 01/20/15. (mll, )
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Dismiss. All claims for relief asserted by Adaptix against NEC are dismissed with prejudice. All claims for relief asserted by NEC against Adaptix are dismissed with prejudice. Adaptix's infringement claims against AT&T are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims and counterclaims asserted by AT&T against Adaptix are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees, costs of court, and expenses. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 01/20/15. (mll, )
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven E Lipman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/20/2015. (sm, )
January 19, 2015 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
January 16, 2015 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:( Pretrial Conference reset for 8/8/2016 01:30 PM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven., Mediation Completion due by 11/30/2015., Markman Hearing set for 6/4/2015 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.), GRANTING #88 Joint MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order filed by Adaptix, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/7/2015. (sm, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
November 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference reset for 4/25/2016 11:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven per amended scheduling order. (sm, )
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:(Markman Hearing set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.) terminating #85 Joint MOTION Motion to amend the Docket Control Order filed by Adaptix, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/10/2014. (sm, )
November 10, 2014 Filing 86 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Revised Order per judge): #85 Joint MOTION Motion to amend the Docket Control Order .. (Allgood, Adam)
October 31, 2014 Filing 85 Joint MOTION Motion to amend the Docket Control Order by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
October 3, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, DUPLICATE FILING OF #83. Document # 84, Claim Construction Statement. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 1, 2014 Filing 84 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Paul) Modified on 10/3/2014 (sm, ).
October 1, 2014 Filing 83 Joint Claim Construction Chart and prehearing statement by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hayes, Paul)
September 15, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC's, NEC CASIO MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, LTD.'s and NEC Corporation of America's Notice of Compliance re Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions (Rambo, Rick)
September 12, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC's, NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd.'s and NEC Corporation of America's Notice of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Rambo, Rick)
September 9, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel McGonagle on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4826905. (McGonagle, Daniel)
September 9, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel McGonagle on behalf of Adaptix, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4825870. (McGonagle, Daniel)
September 8, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adaptix, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Service of Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence (P.R. 4-2) (Hayes, Paul)
August 15, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF PATENT RULE 4-1 DISCLOSURES (Hayes, Paul)
August 15, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-1 (Allgood, Adam)
August 12, 2014 Filing 75 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS ANSWER to #70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Adaptix, Inc..(Hayes, Paul)
August 12, 2014 Filing 74 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS ANSWER to #69 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Adaptix, Inc..(Hayes, Paul)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/25/14. (bas, )
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/25/14. (bas, )
July 25, 2014 Filing 71 Submission of p,s by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Joint Motion For Entry of Protective Order and Order Regarding E-Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - [Propsoed] Order Regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases)(Allgood, Adam)
July 22, 2014 Filing 70 Defendant NEC Corporation of America's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by NEC Corporation of America.(Rambo, Rick)
July 22, 2014 Filing 69 Defendant NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd.'s First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd..(Rambo, Rick)
July 22, 2014 Filing 68 Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Rambo, Rick)
July 15, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Hayes, Paul)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Stipulation of Dismissal of AT&T Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Adaptix, Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/3/14. (mjc, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 65 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AT&T INC. PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(1)(a)(ii) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2016 11:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2014. Mediation Completion due by 6/26/2015. Designation of Mediator due by 6/5/2015, Markman Hearing set for 2/3/2015 10:00 AM in Judge Steger's Courtroom, 3rd floor (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Motions due by 9/3/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/25/14. (bas, )
June 19, 2014 NOTICE of CANCELLATION of Scheduling Conference previously set on July 1, 2014 at 11:00 before U. S. Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. Scheduling Order to follow. (lfs, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 63 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Hayes, Paul)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is JULY 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/10/14. (bas, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 61 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions to Transfer Venue by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allgood, Adam)
May 13, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Tadlock, Charles)
May 13, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE by NEC Corporation of America , Defendant NEC Corporation of America, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Parties (Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. , Defendant NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd's Certificate of Interested Parites (Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC , Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Certificate of Interested Parties (Rambo, Rick)
May 13, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE by AT&T Inc. , Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Parties (Rambo, Rick)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2014 11:00 AM in Judge Steger's Courtroom 3rd Floor, Tyler, TX before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/28/14. (bas, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Inc. (Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Inc..(Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC Corporation of America (Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. (Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant NEC Corporation of America's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by NEC Corporation of America.(Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd..(Rambo, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Filing 46 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Rambo, Rick)
December 4, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. (Notice of Related Cases) (Tadlock, Charles)
December 4, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven)
December 4, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samiyah Diaz on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Diaz, Samiyah)
December 4, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
December 4, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Smiley, Keith)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All other defendants remain in the case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/03/13. (mll, )
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/3/2013. (sm, )
December 3, 2013 Answer Due Deadline Updated for AT&T Inc. to 2/3/2014; AT&T Mobility LLC to 2/3/2014; Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 2/3/2014; NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. to 2/3/2014; NEC Corporation of America to 2/3/2014 per order granting motion to extend. (sm, )
December 2, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
November 27, 2013 Filing 37 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless Without Prejudice by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 27, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adaptix, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline is DECEMBER 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/18/13. (bas, )
November 17, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John D Zele on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406817. (Zele, John)
November 15, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy D Peterson on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406638. (Peterson, Jeremy)
November 15, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert W Busby on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406628. (Busby, Robert)
November 15, 2013 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick)
November 15, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Allgood, Adam)
November 15, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L Rambo on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Rambo, Rick)
November 15, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford A Cangro on behalf of AT&T Inc. (Cangro, Bradford)
November 15, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Allgood, Adam)
November 15, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L Rambo on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Rambo, Rick)
November 15, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford A Cangro on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Cangro, Bradford)
November 7, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 12/3/2013. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
November 7, 2013 Filing 24 Defendant Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless' Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.( Godfrey, Geoffrey)
October 28, 2013 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless on 9/23/2013, by cert mail. (mll, )
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline is NOVEMBER 9, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/9/13. (bas, )
October 9, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Clutter, Patrick)
October 9, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Jones, Michael)
October 8, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Godfrey, Geoffrey)
September 30, 2013 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed as to NEC Corporation of America, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 30, 2013 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Inc., by cert mail. (mll, )
September 30, 2013 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 30, 2013 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless on 8/27/2013, by cert mail. (mll, )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline is NOVEMBER 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/16/13. (bas, )
September 13, 2013 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clonts, David)
September 13, 2013 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline for NEC Corporation of America and NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd. to answer is DECEMBER 3, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/12/13. (bas, )
September 11, 2013 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for NEC Corporation of America and NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd. by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
August 21, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, NEC Corporation of America and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(klb)
August 19, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, NEC Corporation of America and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(klb)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/8/13. (bas, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (mll, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Adaptix, Inc.. (Tadlock, Charles)
August 7, 2013 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Adaptix, Inc.. (Tadlock, Charles)
August 7, 2013 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4256397.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
August 7, 2013 Judge Michael H. Schneider added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd.
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Represented By: John D Zele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Represented By: David R Clonts
Represented By: John D Zele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Represented By: John D Zele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Represented By: David R Clonts
Represented By: John D Zele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Geoffrey Mark Godfrey
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E Lipman
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Represented By: Daniel James McGonagle
Represented By: Keith Bryan Smiley
Represented By: Samiyah Diaz
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?