Landmark Technology, LLC v. Samsonite LLC
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology, LLC
Defendant: Samsonite LLC
Case Number: 6:2013cv00769
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2014 Filing 29 FINAL JUDGMENT that this civil action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/22/14. (mll, )
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant, Samsonite LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement entered into by the parties. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/22/14. (mll, )
March 24, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, MUST BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (6:13cv578). Document # 27, Unopposed motion to withdraw is now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 21, 2014 Filing 27 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsonite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ackerman, Paul) Modified on 3/24/2014 (sm, ).
February 21, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Samsonite LLC (Thane, Joshua)
February 21, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Samsonite LLC (Doan, Jennifer)
February 21, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Douglas McCabe on behalf of Samsonite LLC (McCabe, Brent)
February 14, 2014 Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 13, 2014 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:13cv758 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv758 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated Lead Case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/13/14. (mll, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Samsonite LLC. (Shamilov, Saina)
February 4, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE*** Document # 20, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Samsonite LLC. (Shamilov, Saina) Modified on 2/4/2014 (sm, ).
January 30, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza)
January 29, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE by Landmark Technology, LLC re #15 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Interested Persons (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 29, 2014 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsonite LLC identifying Corporate Parent Deliah US Investments S.rl for Samsonite LLC. (Shamilov, Saina)
January 23, 2014 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ali Shalchi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 2/26/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/14/14. (mll, )
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss; Responses due by 1/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/09/14. (mll, )
January 7, 2014 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 7, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE by Landmark Technology, LLC CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 27, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Samsonite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Shamilov, Saina)
December 11, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Samsonite LLC to 12/27/2013. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Samsonite LLC.( Shamilov, Saina)
November 12, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #9 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Samsonite LLC to 12/12/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 8, 2013 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Samsonite LLC.( Ackerman, Paul)
October 29, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landmark Technology, LLC. Samsonite LLC served on 10/21/2013, answer due 11/11/2013. (mjc, )
October 17, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsonite LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
October 14, 2013 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 11, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley M Gibson on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Gibson, Stanley)
October 11, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
October 11, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 11, 2013 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 10, 2013 Magistrate Judge John D. Love added per General Order 13-15. (mll, )
October 10, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsonite LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4355769.), filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology, LLC v. Samsonite LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonite LLC
Represented By: Paul Douglas Ackerman
Represented By: Brent Douglas McCabe
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology, LLC
Represented By: Stanley M Gibson
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?