Property Disclosure Technologies LLC v. Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC et al
Plaintiff: Property Disclosure Technologies LLC
Defendant: Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Winans, Inc. and David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC
Consolidated Defendant: JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Keller Williams Reality, Inc., Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC, RE/MAX LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Weichert Co., Redfin Corporation, BRER Affiliates LLC, Zillow, Inc. and ERA Franchise Systems LLC
Not Yet Classified: William Joseph Cornelius
Case Number: 6:2014cv00013
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the causes of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the counterclaims DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/11/2015. (gsg)
January 26, 2015 NOTICE that the Markman Hearing set for Thursday, January 29, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. HAS BEEN CANCELLED. (mjm, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting in part #229 Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors Inc. Plaintiff's infringement claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant's counterclaims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant may file a motion seeking fees and/or costs related to this matter within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/21/15. (mll, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Reply to Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
January 15, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #227 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Estimate of Time for Markman Hearing (Lesher, Barrett)
January 9, 2015 Filing 234 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Lesher, Barrett)
January 9, 2015 Filing 233 RESPONSE to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, Christopher)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting #230 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/06/15. (mll, )
January 5, 2015 Filing 231 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #186 First SEALED MOTION To Strike and For Sanctions PLAINTIFF PROPERTY DISCLOSURE TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
December 29, 2014 Filing 230 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #219 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion for Sanctions by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 24, 2014 Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion to Dismiss Defendant JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
December 24, 2014 Filing 228 STIPULATION of Dismissal Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Stipulation of Dismissal of Asserted Claims and Covenant Not to Sue by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2015 AT 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 10/13/2015 at 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2015 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/23/2014. (gsg)
December 22, 2014 Filing 226 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling Order - Submission of Third Amended Docket Control Order per Order filed 12/18/14, Dkt No. 220 by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Ricketts, Michael)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #177 Sealed Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/22/14. (mll, )
December 19, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #179 Order Defendant's Notice of Compliance (Lesher, Barrett)
December 19, 2014 Filing 223 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: (Certificate of authority to seal) #219 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Lesher, Barrett)
December 19, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Jones, Michael)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #215 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Winans, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/18/14. (mll, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #213 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the Opening Claim Construction Brief is 12-22-2014 and the deadline for Defendants to file their Responsive Claim Construction Brief is 1-09-2015. Parties shall submit a complete Amended Docket Control Order by 12-22-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/18/14. (mll, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 219 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #186 First SEALED MOTION To Strike and For Sanctions filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Winans, Inc.. (Lesher, Barrett)
December 18, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Winans, Inc. re #179 Order Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Lesher, Barrett)
December 18, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #217 Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 217 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE by David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC, JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #179 Order Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Lesher, Barrett) Modified on 12/18/2014 (mjc, ).
December 18, 2014 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #177 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Winans Inc. and JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith as to Defendant Winans, Inc. by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 18, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, MOTION IS REQUIRED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 214, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 215 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Winans, Inc. Without Prejudice by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 214 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC re #177 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Winans Inc. and JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions as to Defendant Winans, Inc. (Ricketts, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2014 (sm, ).
December 16, 2014 Filing 213 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #149 Order Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opening Claim Construction Brief and for Defendants to File Responsive Claim Construction Brief by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Winans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 15, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC re #107 Order, #111 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Regarding Its Disclosure of Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims (Ricketts, Michael)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #210 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/12/14. (mll, )
December 12, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 210, Stipulation. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 11, 2014 Filing 210 STIPULATION for Extension of Time Regarding the Deadlines for Plaintiff to Serve Its Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims and for Defendants to Serve Their Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael) Modified on 12/12/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 12/12/2014 (mll, ).
December 8, 2014 Filing 209 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #186 First SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF PROPERTY DISCLOSURE TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
December 3, 2014 Filing 208 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #177 SEALED PLAINTIFF PROPERTY DISCLOSURE TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO MEDIATE IN GOOD FAITH filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
December 2, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Jackson, John)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #203 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Redfin Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/02/14. (mll, )
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #204 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #177 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Winans Inc. and JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith; Replies due by 12/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/02/14. (mll, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #185 Sealed Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Sanctions by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 1, 2014 Filing 203 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Redfin Corporation by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Redfin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #199 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Weichert Co. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/01/14. (mll, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER regarding #198 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court will give full consideration to the Motion to Dismiss #90 as to Defendant JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/25/14. (mll, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #197 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, and Sothebys International Realty Affiliates LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/25/14. (mll, )
November 25, 2014 Filing 199 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Weichert Co. With Prejudice by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Weichert Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 24, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION for Reconsideration by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2014: #2 REVISED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ).
November 24, 2014 Filing 197 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 20, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Winans, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Ricketts, Michael)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying as moot #42 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #90 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/14. (mll, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #191 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's deadline to file its response to Defendants Winans, Inc. and JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Motion to Strike and Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Plaintiffs Counsel is extended to 12-08-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/14. (mll, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's deadline to file its reply to Defendants Winans, Inc. and JB Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Sanctions for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith is 12-01-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/14. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 Show Cause Hearing set for 12/17/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Stay. Parties shall submit closing documents no later than 12-15-2014. If the parties fail to comply with the new deadline, the parties are ORDERED to submit an affidavit showing why Redfin remains on the Court's docket by 12-16-2014. The Court will then hear the matter on 12-17-2014 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/17/14. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #186 First SEALED MOTION To Strike and For Sanctions Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time, to December 8, 2014, to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion for Sanctions by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 17, 2014 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #185 Sealed Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time, to December 1, 2014, to Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Sanctions by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 14, 2014 Filing 189 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Winans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Correction to Dkt 188)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #188 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED TO CORRECT LINK TO PARTIES.*** (mjc, )
November 13, 2014 Filing 188 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC, JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ricketts, Michael) Modified on 11/14/2014 (mjc, ).
November 13, 2014 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay and Extend All Deadlines Between Property Disclosure Technologies LLC and Defendant Redfin Corporation by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Redfin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 6, 2014 Filing 186 First SEALED MOTION To Strike and For Sanctions by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Winans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett)
November 6, 2014 Filing 185 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #177 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Winans Inc. and JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Winans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lesher, Barrett)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #183 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff and Defendants shall have until 11-17-2014, to Submit Closing Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/06/14. (mll, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 183 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Closing Documents per Dkt No. 167 -- by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
November 3, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by BRER Affiliates LLC re #176 Order, Request For Termination Of Electronic Notices (Nelson, Mark)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING #180 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC and Defendant RE/MAX LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/31/2014. (gsg)
October 30, 2014 Filing 180 STIPULATION of Dismissal re RE/MAX LLC by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/27/14. (mll, )
October 22, 2014 Filing 178 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling Order - Submission of Second Amended Docket Control Order per Order filed 10/16/14, Dkt No. 174, by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Ricketts, Michael)
October 21, 2014 Filing 177 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Motion for Sanctions Against Winans Inc. and JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. for Failure to Mediate in Good Faith by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric W. Buether, #2 Exhibit A to Buether Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Buether Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Buether Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Buether Declaration, #6 Declaration of Nina Nelson, #7 Exhibit A to Nelson Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant BRER Affiliates LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/20/14. (mll, )
October 17, 2014 Filing 175 STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Property Disclosure Technologies LLC and BRER Affiliates LLC With Prejudice by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that the parties are to submit a complete Amended Docket Control Order, per the Standing Order, no later than October 22, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/2014. (gsg)
October 15, 2014 Filing 173 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #149 Order Joint Stipulation For Extension of Time to Exchange Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
October 14, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #171 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (O'Meara, Thomas)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura Sanders Fowler and Thomas Joseph O'Meara, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/09/14. (mll, )
October 8, 2014 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas J. O'Meara, Jr. and Laura Sanders Fowler by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(O'Meara, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2014: #2 REVISED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ).
October 2, 2014 Filing 169 RESPONSE to #164 Notice (Other), Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
October 2, 2014 Filing 168 MOTION to Amend/Correct #149 Order Joint Stipulation Regarding the Deadline for Meet-and-Confer Regarding Limitation of Disputed Terms by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Ricketts, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that parties submit closing documents no later than 11-03-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/01/14. (mll, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying #163 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/01/14. (mll, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 165 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: SETTLED-REALOGY GROUP(Cornelius, William)
September 29, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Winans, Inc. re #35 MOTION to Dismiss , #90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Claim That is Patentable Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 101, #119 Notice (Other) WINANS, INC.S AND JB GOODWIN REALTORS, INC.S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND REQUEST FOR ORAL HEARING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lesher, Barrett)
September 29, 2014 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC. (Basile, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 29, 2014 Filing 162 RESPONSE to #161 Notice (Other),, Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Buether, Eric)
September 25, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC re #120 Notice (Other), #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 of Supplemental Authority and Request for Oral Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Basile, Richard)
September 17, 2014 Filing 160 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: IMPASSE-JBGOODWIN(Cornelius, William)
September 17, 2014 Filing 159 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: IMPASSE-WINANS, INC.(Cornelius, William)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER staying deadlines as to Defendants Redfin Corporation and Re/Max LLC. Counsel shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket of this Court on or before 10-17-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/17/14. (mll, )
September 16, 2014 Filing 157 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: IMPASSE-REALOGY GROUP(Cornelius, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 156 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: SETTLED-REMAX(Cornelius, William)
September 16, 2014 Filing 155 REPORT of Mediation by William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr. Mediation result: SETTLED-REDFIN(Cornelius, William)
September 12, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE by Redfin Corporation of Supplemental Authority and Request for Oral Argument (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- buySafe v. Google Federal Circuit opinion)(Bennett, Natalie)
September 2, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE by Keller Williams Reality, Inc. Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notification (Houston, Andrea)
August 28, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barrett Chistopher Lesher on behalf of JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. (Lesher, Barrett)
August 28, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher B Welsh on behalf of JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. (Welsh, Christopher)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit by Plaintiff and Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/26/14. (mll, )
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/25/14. (mll, )
August 25, 2014 Filing 148 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC Amended Docket Control Order per Judge Love's Order dated August 19, 2014, Docket No. 143,. (Ricketts, Michael)
August 25, 2014 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Keller Williams Realty, Inc. by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
August 25, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE MOTION FOR ENTRY OR USE SUBMISSION EVENT Document # 146, Motion to Amend/Correct. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 146 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Amend/Correct #111 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, Amended Docket Control Order per Judge Love's Order dated August 19, 2014, Docket No. 143, by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Ricketts, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2014 (ch, ).
August 20, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BRER Affiliates LLC, Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc., Keller Williams Reality, Inc., RE/MAX LLC, Redfin Corporation, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC, Weichert Co., Winans, Inc. (P.R. 4-1) (Nadel, Michael)
August 19, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC re #143 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, #111 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Notice of Compliance Regarding Its P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Ricketts, Michael)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/19/14. (mll, )
August 14, 2014 Filing 142 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #111 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-1 by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricketts, Michael)
August 12, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ricketts on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Ricketts, Michael)
August 11, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE by Winans, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Lesher, Barrett)
August 11, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. (O'Meara, Thomas)
August 11, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BRER Affiliates LLC (Harper, Matthew)
August 11, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC (Jackson, John)
August 8, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Redfin Corporation (Additional Disclosures) (Nadel, Michael)
August 4, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC Defendants' Joint Notice of Compliance re Invalidity Contentions (Parker, Henrik)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Monica Nguyen Tavakoli terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/31/14. (mll, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 133 Keller Williams Realty, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint of JDL Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Property Disclosure Technologies LLC by Keller Williams Reality, Inc..(Weaver, David)
July 29, 2014 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tavakoli, Monica)
July 15, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Winans, Inc. (Welsh, Christopher)
July 14, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Weichert Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rizzi, Steven)
July 14, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE by Zillow, Inc. re #117 Order, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
July 14, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BRER Affiliates LLC (Harper, Matthew)
July 11, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC re #108 Order Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures (Tavakoli, Monica)
July 11, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Keller Williams Reality, Inc. (Pai, Ajeet)
July 11, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC (Jackson, John)
July 11, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Redfin Corporation (Nadel, Michael)
July 11, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC regarding service of Initial Disclosures (Parker, Henrik)
July 9, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. re #108 Order service of Initial Disclosures (O'Meara, Thomas)
July 7, 2014 Filing 121 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Claim That is Patentable Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 101 filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 27, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 of Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Authority)(Jackson, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE by BRER Affiliates LLC, Redfin Corporation, Winans, Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harper, Matthew)
June 27, 2014 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Claim That is Patentable Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 101 filed by RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Parker, Henrik)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #115 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Zillow, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/14. (mll, )
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. William Jospeh Cornelius, Jr added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/14. (mll, )
June 19, 2014 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Zillow, Inc. by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 16, 2014 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Claim That is Patentable Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 101 Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Response to Defendants Keller Williams Realty, Inc., JBGoodwin REaltors, Inc., RE/MAX LLC, and Weichert Co.'s Joint Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that the Court intends to appoint William Cornelius, Jr., as Mediator in this case. Any objections to the appointment may be submitted in camera within 5 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/11/14. (mll, )
June 11, 2014 Filing 112 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by all parties. This civil action is now assigned to US Magistrate Judge John D Love for all further proceedings in this case, including trial, order the entry of a final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 10-06-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 7/31/2015. Jury Selection set for 10/13/2015 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Markman Hearing set for 1/29/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until 6-09-2014, to file its Sur-Reply to the #42 Supplemental Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/10/14. (mll, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 105 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #42 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 9, 2014 NOTICE that the scheduling conference set for Wednesday, June 11, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. has been CANCELLED. (srg)
June 9, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #98 Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING AT #102 .*** (mjc, )
June 8, 2014 Filing 104 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 8, 2014 Filing 103 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 8, 2014 Filing 102 Submission of Corrected Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC Submission of Proposed Agreed Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, James W. Knowles, filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 99 Submission of Proposed Agreed E-Discovery order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 98 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED FILING AT #102 .***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) Modified on 6/9/2014 (mjc, ).
June 6, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC Notice of Compliance re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #42 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
June 6, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark John Ziegelbein on behalf of BRER Affiliates LLC (Ziegelbein, Mark)
June 2, 2014 Filing 92 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiff and Defendant Zillow Inc are stayed until 6-18-2014. If an agreement is reached, parties shall submit closing documents by 6-18-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/29/14. (mll, )
May 28, 2014 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) for Failure to Allege Infringement of a Claim That is Patentable Under 35 U.S.C. Sec. 101 by RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Parker, Henrik)
May 28, 2014 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Stay and Extend All Deadlines re Zillow, Inc. by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 27, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by BRER Affiliates LLC. (Harper, Matthew)
May 23, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Andrew Zeck on behalf of Zillow, Inc. (Zeck, Kevin)
May 23, 2014 NOTICE that the Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, June 3, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. has been CANCELLED and RESCHEDULED for Wednesday, June 11, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. (srg)
May 22, 2014 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Winans, Inc.. (Welsh, Christopher)
May 19, 2014 Filing 85 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #84 Notice (Other),.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 (Corrected))(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 19, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC re #63 Notice (Other) Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity of the '167 and '530 Patents (Dkt 21, 6:14-cv-34) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 19, 2014 Filing 83 ANSWER to #58 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 19, 2014 Filing 82 ANSWER to #57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 16, 2014 Filing 81 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #80 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 15, 2014 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 14, 2014 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. (O'Meara, Thomas)
May 13, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE by Keller Williams Reality, Inc. Certificate of Persons with Financial Interest (Weaver, David)
May 13, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC of Certificate of Financial Interest (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 13, 2014 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BRER Affiliates LLC (Nelson, Mark)
May 13, 2014 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Winans, Inc. (Lesher, Barrett)
May 13, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC of Certificate Regarding Financially Interested Parties (Parker, Henrik)
May 13, 2014 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zillow, Inc. (McCullough, Christina)
May 13, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE by Redfin Corporation Certificate of Financial Interest (per Doc. 43) (Nadel, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Weichert Co. (Harrison, Guy)
May 13, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC of Compliance Regarding Filing Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Form (Jackson, John)
May 13, 2014 Filing 68 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #67 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 12, 2014 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 12, 2014 Filing 66 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have to 5-12-2014, to file its Sur-Reply to the Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/09/14. (mll, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Joseph O'Meara, Jr on behalf of JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc. (O'Meara, Thomas)
May 8, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE by Redfin Corporation Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity of the '167 and '530 Patents (filed in Individual Case 6:14-cv-34 as Doc. 21) (Bennett, Natalie)
May 8, 2014 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tavakoli, Monica)
May 7, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Anthony Valenzuela on behalf of BRER Affiliates LLC (Valenzuela, Daniel)
May 7, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Paul Harper on behalf of BRER Affiliates LLC (Harper, Matthew)
May 7, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of RE/MAX LLC (Jones, Michael)
May 2, 2014 Filing 58 J.B. Goodwin Realtors, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Property Disclosure Technologies LLC by JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc..(O'Meara, Thomas)
May 1, 2014 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended), Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Property Disclosure Technologies LLC by Redfin Corporation.(Nadel, Michael)
May 1, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC Regarding Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's Response To Defendant BRER Affiliates LLC's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. 101 (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 30, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC Regarding RE/MAX's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to RE/MAX's Motion to Dismiss (Parker, Henrik)
April 30, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher B Welsh on behalf of Winans, Inc. (Welsh, Christopher)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is extended to 5-30-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/30/14. (mll, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in support of its motion for judgment on the pleadings of invalidity (Case No. 6:14-cv-34, Doc. 21). Replies due by 5/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/29/14. (mll, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Andrew Lavine on behalf of Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC, ERA Franchise Systems LLC, Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4637219. (Lavine, Michael)
April 29, 2014 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pltf 1st Amended Complaint [Dkt 21 under 14-CV-00019-JDL] by Keller Williams Reality, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Houston, Andrea)
April 29, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea M Houston on behalf of Keller Williams Reality, Inc. (Houston, Andrea)
April 29, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajeet P Pai on behalf of Keller Williams Reality, Inc. (Pai, Ajeet)
April 29, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Jordan McCullough on behalf of Zillow, Inc. (McCullough, Christina)
April 29, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramy E Hanna on behalf of Weichert Co. (Hanna, Ramy)
April 29, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henrik Davidson Parker on behalf of RE/MAX LLC (Parker, Henrik)
April 29, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J Rizzi on behalf of Weichert Co. (Rizzi, Steven)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 6/3/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/28/14. (mll, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 42 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by BRER Affiliates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
April 28, 2014 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Redfin's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Redfin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadel, Michael)
April 28, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Redfin Corporation (Dkt 19, 6:14-cv-00034-JDL) (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 28, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie A. Bennett on behalf of Redfin Corporation (Bennett, Natalie)
April 25, 2014 Consolidated Defendants Added: Century 21 Real Estate LLC (6:14cv15); Brer Affilates LLC (6:14cv16); Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC (6:14cv17); ERA Franchise Systems LLC (6:14cv18); Keller Williams Reality Inc (6:14cv19); Sotheby's International Realty Affilates LLC (6:14cv20); JBGoodwin Realtors Inc (6:14cv32); Redfin Corporation (6:14cv34); Re/max LLC (6:14cv35); Weichert Co (6:14cv36); Zillow Inc (6:14cv37). (mll, )
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:14cv13 shall serve as thelead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated Lead Case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/23/14. (mll, )
April 25, 2014 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '167 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '974 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Vacation Exchange Order)(Jackson, John)
April 25, 2014 Filing 36 STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff Property Disclosure Technologies LLC's First Amended Complaint by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Jackson, John)
April 23, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by Winans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Winans, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Lesher, Barrett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2014: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
April 14, 2014 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 10, 2014 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed as to Winans, Inc. on 4/2/2014, by cert mail; answer due: 4/23/2014. (mll, )
April 7, 2014 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 31, 2014 Filing 31 SUMMONS Issued as to Winans, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
March 28, 2014 Filing 30 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 28, 2014 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC identifying Corporate Parent Realogy Services Group LLC, Corporate Parent Realogy Group LLC (f/k/a Realogy Corporation), Corporate Parent Realogy Intermediate Holdings LLC (f/k/a Domus Intermediate Holdings Corp), Corporate Parent Realogy Holdings Corp (f/k/a Domus Holdings Corp.) for Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. (Jackson, John)
March 28, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) For Failure to Allege Infringement of a Patentable Claim Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
March 26, 2014 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Exhibit A is included in main document) : #26 Amended Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #2 Exhibit C - '974 Patent)(Joe, Christopher) Modified on 3/27/2014 (sm, ).
March 26, 2014 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
March 20, 2014 Filing 25 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #24 MOTION to Dismiss .. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Welsh, Christopher)
March 20, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC. (Welsh, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 20, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher B Welsh on behalf of David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC (Welsh, Christopher)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Hugh Findlay terminated as attorney of record for Defendant Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/13/14. (mjc, )
March 10, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC to 3/31/2014. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC.( Jackson, John)
March 7, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***. Document # 19, Application to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
March 7, 2014 Filing 19 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 3/7/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 3/7/2014 (sm, ).
February 18, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #18 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC to 3/20/2014. 27 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC.( Lesher, Barrett)
February 7, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard Basile on behalf of Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4513634. (Basile, Richard)
February 7, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC to 3/14/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 6, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Folsom on behalf of Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC (Folsom, David)
February 6, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC (Acosta, Matthew)
February 6, 2014 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC.( Jackson, John)
February 6, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC (Jackson, John)
January 31, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #12 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC to 2/21/2014. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC.( Lesher, Barrett)
January 28, 2014 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC on 1/22/2014, by cert mail; answer due: 2/12/2014. (mll, )
January 27, 2014 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC on 1/17/2014, by cert mail; answer due: 2/7/2014. (mll, )
January 24, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 14, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(klb)
January 13, 2014 Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Nguyen Tavakoli on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Tavakoli, Monica)
January 13, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Perantie, Mark)
January 13, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
January 13, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Buether, Eric)
January 13, 2014 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
January 13, 2014 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC (Joe, Christopher)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC, David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4476934.), filed by Property Disclosure Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,584,167, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,945,530, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Property Disclosure Technologies LLC v. Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: JBGoodwin Realtors, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Sanders Fowler
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Meara, Jr
Represented By: Barrett Chistopher Lesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Keller Williams Reality, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Andrea M Houston
Represented By: Ajeet P Pai
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sotheby's International Realty Affiliates LLC
Represented By: Richard Basile
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Michael Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Represented By: Steven J Rocci
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Henrik Davidson Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Richard Basile
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Michael Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Century 21 Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Richard Basile
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Michael Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Weichert Co.
Represented By: Ramy E Hanna
Represented By: Steven J Rizzi
Represented By: Guy N Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Redfin Corporation
Represented By: Natalie A. Bennett
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Michael S Nadel
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BRER Affiliates LLC
Represented By: Matthew Paul Harper
Represented By: Mark John Ziegelbein
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Daniel Anthony Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: Ramsey M Al-Salam
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Christina Jordan McCullough
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Zeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ERA Franchise Systems LLC
Represented By: Richard Basile
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Michael Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property Disclosure Technologies LLC
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Monica Nguyen Tavakoli
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Represented By: Niky R. Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Better Homes and Gardens Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Richard Basile
Represented By: John M Jackson
Represented By: Matthew C Acosta
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Michael Andrew Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winans, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B Welsh
Represented By: Barrett Chistopher Lesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Winans GMAC TEXASMLS.com LLC
Represented By: Christopher B Welsh
Represented By: Barrett Chistopher Lesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: William Joseph Cornelius
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?