Clear With Computers LLC v. Tesla Motors Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Clear With Computers, LLC alleged that Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. infringed U.S. Patent No. 5,625,776 entitled "Electronic Proposal Preparation System for Selling Computer Equipment and Copy Machines" and U.S. Patent No. 7,606,739 entitled "Electronic Proposal Preparation System" by receiving a customer's desired equipment features and uses by presenting the customer with a plurality of questions relating to the features and uses of the equipment, receiving the answers, and generating a customized proposal in response to the answers.

Plaintiff: Clear With Computers LLC
Defendant: Tesla Motors Inc
Case Number: 6:2014cv00087
Filed: February 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2014 Filing 10 RESPONSE to COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
April 25, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Clear With Computers LLC by Tesla Motors Inc.(Stephens, Garland)
March 24, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Tesla Motors Inc to 4/25/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 21, 2014 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tesla Motors Inc.( Stephens, Garland)
March 14, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clear With Computers LLC. Tesla Motors Inc served on 3/5/2014, answer due 3/26/2014. (mjc, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Tesla Motors Inc and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
February 13, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Weinblatt on behalf of Clear With Computers LLC (Weinblatt, Richard)
February 11, 2014 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
February 11, 2014 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear With Computers LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clear With Computers LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tesla Motors Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4519054.), filed by Clear With Computers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear With Computers LLC v. Tesla Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear With Computers LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Richard C Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?