Chrimar Systems, Inc. et al v. Alcatel-Lucent S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Chrimar Systems, Inc, Chrimar Systems, Inc. and Chrimar Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent S.A, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Company and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Consolidated Defendant: AMX, LLC
Not Classified By Court: James Knowles and David Keyzer
Case Number: 6:2015cv00163
Filed: March 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 508 Amended Final Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/22/2020. (gsg)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Alcatel-Lucent S.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/21/2020. (gsg)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #495 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/21/2020. (gsg)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting #504 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Kyung T. Kim shall be allowed to withdraw and is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendant ALE USA Inc. in the above-referenced matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/17/20. (mll, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 504 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Kyung T. Kim as Counsel by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
March 11, 2020 Filing 503 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 502 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #495 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
March 4, 2020 Filing 501 RESPONSE in Support re #495 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Cravey, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 500 RESPONSE in Support re #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Peschel, Leisa)
March 4, 2020 Filing 499 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. RESPONSE in Support re #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Cravey, Christopher) Modified on 3/4/2020 (mll, ).
February 26, 2020 Filing 498 RESPONSE in Opposition re #495 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Email from R. Wynne to C. Cravey, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
February 26, 2020 Filing 497 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES CORRECTED filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 496 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
February 12, 2020 Filing 495 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Alcatel-Lucent S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ALE Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 - ALE Itemized Costs, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cravey Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email correspondence re ALE's request for costs, #5 Exhibit 5 - '012 Final Rejection in ex parte reexam, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email correspondence re Chrimar MTD and CNS, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email correspondence re Chrimar new CNS and disclaimer, #8 Exhibit 8 - Chrimar new CNS submitted in appeal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Disclaimer of '012 patent claims, #10 Exhibit 10 - Fed. Cir. Order denying MTS and consolidating appeals for oral argument, #11 Exhibit 11 - Chrimar IPR Appeal Case 18-1499 (Rule 36 affirmance), #12 Exhibit 12 - Lawson and ePlus Consent Order, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 494 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Alcatel-Lucent S.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A July 18, 2018 Email from Chris Cravey to Justin Cohen, #2 Exhibit B Chrimar Second Covenant Not to Sue, #3 Exhibit C Chrimar Statutory Disclaimer of the 012 Patent, #4 Exhibit D Declaration of Leisa Talbert Peschel, #5 Exhibit E Excerpts from Appeal No. 2017-1848, Doc. 24, #6 Exhibit F Excerpts from Appeal No. 2017-1848, Doc. 35, #7 Exhibit G Excerpts of April 19, 2016 Early Damages Expert Hearing Transcript, #8 Exhibit H May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to Chrimar Holding (McKool), #9 Exhibit I May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to Chrimar Holding (TK), #10 Exhibit J May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to CMS (McKool), #11 Exhibit K May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to CMS (TK), #12 Exhibit L May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to Robert Mills, #13 Exhibit M May 31, 2016 Notice of Subpoena to McKool Smith, #14 Exhibit N September 16, 2016 Email from Stacy Gunder, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
January 29, 2020 Filing 493 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and in accordance with the Mandate of the Federal Circuit #492 . Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. Any requests for costs or fees shall be timely made. Any relief not specifically granted is denied. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/29/2020. (mjc, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 492 MANDATE of Federal Circuit as to #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (ksd )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER of FEDERAL CIRCUIT DENYING petition for en banc rehearing filed by Chrimar Systems and ChirMar Holding Company. (ksd)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER of FEDERAL CIRCUIT vacating & remanded for dismissal as to #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (ksd )
September 19, 2019 Filing 489 FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT as to #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. This cause is ordered Vacated & Remanded for Dismissal. (ksd)
June 11, 2019 Filing 488 USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER deferring Chrimar's Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Moot to the merits panel as to #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (rlf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 487 USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER lifting the stay of the briefing schedule and setting an expedited briefing schedule as to #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. This appeal and Appeal Nos. 2018-1499, -1500, -1503, and -1984 (consolidated) shall be considered companion cases for purposes of oral argument. (rlf)
September 26, 2018 Filing 486 FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal re #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. USCA Case Number 18-2420. (rlf)
September 24, 2018 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders #481 , #476 , #480 and #484 , and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #485 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (rlf)
September 21, 2018 Filing 485 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #476 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Stay, #480 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #484 Order on Motion to Stay by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6953358. Appeal Record due by 9/23/2018. (Cravey, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER denying #482 Motion to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/7/2018. (rlf)
September 6, 2018 Filing 483 RESPONSE in Opposition re #482 MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 6, 2018 Filing 482 MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 481 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. All relief not granted in this Final Judgment is DENIED. All pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED. Chrimar is the prevailing party, and as the prevailing party, Chrimar shall recover its costs from ALE in the amount of $100,020.58 (Doc. No. #442 ). This is a final judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/24/2018. (rlf)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER denying #477 Motion for Reconsideration re #476 Order on Motion to Dismiss and Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/24/2018. (rlf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 479 RESPONSE in Opposition re #477 MOTION for Reconsideration of Grant of Chrimar's Motion to Dismiss #469 and Denial of ALE's Motion to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents #470 filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 16, 2018 Filing 478 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC Joint Submission Regarding Amended Final Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 477 MOTION for Reconsideration of Grant of Chrimar's Motion to Dismiss #469 and Denial of ALE's Motion to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents #470 by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cravey, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting #469 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #470 Motion to Stay. Count I of the First Amended Complaint for infringement of the '012 Patent is DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. Within 7 days of this Order parties shall submit an amended final judgment to the Court consistent with this opinion and the mandate of the Federal Circuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/08/18. (mll, )
August 4, 2018 Filing 475 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. re #469 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint-Infringement of the '012 Patent Notice that Briefing Is Complete and Motion Is Ripe for Determination (Wynne, Richard)
August 4, 2018 Filing 474 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #470 Opposed MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
August 3, 2018 Filing 473 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #469 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint-Infringement of the '012 Patent filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cravey, Christopher)
August 3, 2018 Filing 472 REPLY to Response to Motion re #470 Opposed MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Cravey, Christopher)
July 27, 2018 Filing 471 RESPONSE in Opposition re #470 Opposed MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 24, 2018 Filing 470 Opposed MOTION to Stay and/or Sever Ongoing Royalties Pending Final Resolution of the Invalidity of the Asserted Patents by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2018-01-23 IPR '012 Patent - Final Written Decision, #2 Exhibit 2 2017-12-20 IPR '107 Patent - Final Written Decision, #3 Exhibit 3 2017-12-29 IPR '838 Patent - Final Written Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 2018-04-26 IPR '760 Patent - Final Written Decision, #5 Exhibit 5 IPR Appeal Consolidation order, #6 Exhibit 6 Excerpts IPR2016-01391 Institution Decision, #7 Exhibit 7 Excerpts IPR2016-01399 Institution Decision, #8 Exhibit 8 Excerpts IPR2016-01397 Institution Decision, #9 Exhibit 9 Excerpts IPR2016-01389 Institution Decision, #10 Exhibit 10 Excerpts ALE Op Appeal Brief, #11 Exhibit 11 2017-10-23 ALE Reply Appeal Brief, #12 Exhibit 12 Notice of Appeal Argument for April 6, #13 Exhibit 13 Letter Updating NDCA court re IPR Status, #14 Exhibit 14 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel, #15 Exhibit 15 Excerpts Answer Ex Parte Reexam 012 patent, #16 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cravey, Christopher)
July 20, 2018 Filing 469 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint-Infringement of the '012 Patent by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER TO FILE. The Court ORDERS that any motion to dismiss claims pertaining to the 012 Patent be submitted within 10 days of this Order and any motion to stay be filed within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/10/2018. (rlf)
July 10, 2018 Filing 467 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 7/10/2018. (srb)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 7/10/2018 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/15/2018. (rlf)
June 14, 2018 Filing 465 MANDATE of USCA FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #447 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, #438 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. In accordance with the judgment of this Court, entered May 8, 2018, and pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, the formal mandate is hereby issued. (rlf)
June 1, 2018 Filing 464 USCA ERRATUM as to #463 USCA JUDGMENT. (rlf)
May 8, 2018 Filing 463 USCA JUDGMENT as to #447 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, #438 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. The Federal Circuit Court vacates in part the district court's second claim construction order, affirms the district court's remaining claim constructions and the infringement damages award and the fraud judgment, and remands for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Before Judges Prost, Wallach and Taranto. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Entry, #2 Rehearing Information, #3 Supreme Court Information)(mjc, )
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ALEs #451 Motion to Modify is DENIED. (PREVIOUSLY FILED AS 457 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on 7/26/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/26/2017. (rlf)
August 2, 2017 Filing 461 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Regarding Redactions to Sealed Order [ECF 457] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- July 31 2017 Email from C. Cravey)(Wynne, Richard)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting #459 Motion to Withdraw #458 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/2/2017. (gsg)
August 1, 2017 Filing 459 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #458 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 28, 2017 Filing 458 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #460 *** SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS UNDER RULE 11 by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Settlement Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit B -- Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit C -- 01-26-2017 Email from S. Gunder, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard) Modified on 8/2/2017 (gsg).
July 17, 2017 Filing 456 SEALED Sur-Reply by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. in Opposition to #451 Sealed Motion, filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D -- Email between C. Cravey and R. Wynne, #2 Exhibit E -- Email between R. Wynne and L. Peschel)(Wynne, Richard)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting #453 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #451 SEALED MOTION TO MODIFY FINAL JUDGMENT; Replies due by 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/17/17. (mll, )
July 14, 2017 Filing 454 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #451 SEALED MOTION TO MODIFY FINAL JUDGMENT, #453 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #452 Sealed Response to Motion, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Williams, Danny)
July 14, 2017 Filing 453 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #452 Sealed Response to Motion, by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 6, 2017 Filing 452 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #451 SEALED MOTION TO MODIFY FINAL JUDGMENT filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit B -- Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit C -- 01-26-2017 Email from S. Gunder, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
June 30, 2017 Filing 451 SEALED MOTION TO MODIFY FINAL JUDGMENT by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant ALE USA Inc's Motion to Modify Final Judgment)(Williams, Danny)
April 17, 2017 Filing 449 NOTICE by Hewlett Packard Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Notice of Agreement to be Bound by Protective Order) (Doan, Jennifer)
April 13, 2017 Filing 450 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #447 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. USCA Case Number 17-1911 (Attachments: #1 Key Rule Changes)(dlc, )
April 12, 2017 Filing 448 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 4/12/17, by USCA-Federal Circuit as to #423 Final Judgment, #447 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #412 Memorandum Opinion & Order, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
April 12, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #412 Memorandum Opinion & Order, #423 Final Judgment and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #447 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
April 11, 2017 Filing 447 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6244051. (Cohen, Justin)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER denying #424 Third-Party Hewlett-Packard Company and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Companys Motion to Intervene. For this limited purpose, the Court finds the requested transcript can be produced pursuant to the Protective Order governing this case. It is ORDERED that Chrimar shall produce Mr. Millss trial testimony designated as RESTRICTEDATTORNEYS EYES ONLY to HPs counsel within 7 days of the issuance of this Order. Before production (and as a condition thereof), HPs counsel shall file a notice in agreement to be bound by the Courts Protective Order in this action. Should HP and Chrimar choose to negotiate and submit to the Court a separate protective order, production should be halted until the Court has entered such a protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2017. (rlf)
April 10, 2017 Filing 445 STIPULATED ORDER ON EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AGAINST ALE USA INC. (rlf)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #443 Motion to Enter Stipulation [443-1] as Order. The Clerk of Court shall enter the stipulation (Doc. No. 443-1) as order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/10/2017. (rlf)
April 7, 2017 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION enter Stipulation as Order by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 5, 2017 Filing 442 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $100,020.58. (rlf)
April 3, 2017 Filing 441 Agreed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
March 29, 2017 Filing 440 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-Federal Circuit re #438 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case Number 17-1848 (Attachments: #1 Key Rule Changes)(dlc, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 439 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #423 Judgment, #438 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
March 29, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #423 Final Judgment, and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #438 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 438 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6220212. (Williams, Danny)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #436 Motion for Extension of Time. Chrimar shall file its bill of costs no later than 4-03-2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/24/17. (mll, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 436 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
March 20, 2017 Filing 435 REPLY to Response to Motion re #424 MOTION to Intervene to Access Sealed Testimony of Mr. Robert Mills filed by Hewlett Packard Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company . (Doan, Jennifer)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #432 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Chrimar shall file its bill of costs no later than March 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/15/2017. (rlf)
March 13, 2017 Filing 433 RESPONSE in Opposition re #424 MOTION to Intervene to Access Sealed Testimony of Mr. Robert Mills filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
March 13, 2017 Filing 432 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
March 7, 2017 Filing 431 NOTICE of Change of Address by Leisa Talbert Peschel (Peschel, Leisa)
March 7, 2017 Filing 430 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kyung Tai Kim (Kim, Kyung)
March 7, 2017 Filing 429 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Needham Cravey (Cravey, Christopher)
March 7, 2017 Filing 428 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian K Buss (Buss, Brian)
March 7, 2017 Filing 427 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Kent Wooten (Wooten, David)
March 7, 2017 Filing 426 NOTICE of Change of Address by Danny Lloyd Williams (Williams, Danny)
February 28, 2017 Filing 425 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at case termination. AO 120 e-mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mjc, )
February 27, 2017 Filing 424 MOTION to Intervene to Access Sealed Testimony of Mr. Robert Mills by Hewlett Packard Company, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 27, 2017 Filing 423 FINAL JUDGMENT entered consistent with the jury verdict. Chrimar is awarded $324,558.34 for damages as of 9/30/2016, along with pre-judgment interest of $18,918.98 and post-judgment interest of 0.83% compounded annually. Chrimar is further awarded post-judgment royalties for so long as the infringement continues. Chrimar shall also recover its costs from ALE. All relief not granted is denied. All pending motions are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/27/17. (mjc, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 422 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Agreed Final Judgment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Cohen, Justin)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER granting #420 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Final Judgment. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to jointly file a proposed final judgment in accordance with the Courts rulings by February 22, 2017. To the extent the Parties still have a disagreement pertaining to interest or ongoing royalties, the Parties shall submit those disputes to the Court with the proposed final judgment by February 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/21/2017. (rlf)
February 20, 2017 Filing 420 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Final Judgment by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
February 13, 2017 Filing 419 Final Admitted Exhibits List by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.(srb)
February 13, 2017 Filing 418 Final Admitted Exhibits List by Chrimar Systems, Inc.(srb)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 417 REDACTED/UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 378 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for a New Trial; denying 379 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/3/2017. (rlf)
February 10, 2017 Filing 416 Sealed Document.Joint Submission of Proposed Redacted Version of Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order, Dkt. No. 414 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying #381 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); denying without prejudice #382 Motion for Award of Ongoing Royalties; denying without prejudice #383 Motion for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest; denying #384 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Within 7 days of the issuance of this Order, parties are to meet and confer on the issue of pre- and post-judgment interest as well as ongoing royalties. Within 14 days of the issuance of this Order parties shall jointly file a proposed final judgment in accordance with the Court's rulings. To the extent parties still have a disagreement pertaining to interest or ongoing royalties, parties shall submit those disputes to the Court with the proposed final judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/03/17. (mll, )
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, the Court finds that ALE has failed to meet its burden in proving equitable estoppel, waiver, prosecution laches, and inequitable conduct. Judgment will issue as a separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/24/17. (mll, )
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 380 Sealed Motion to Declare this Case Exceptional and For Attorney's Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/23/17. (mll, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 411 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg Harlan Parker on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Parker, Greg)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting #375 Motion to enter prior record on claim construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/5/2017. (gsg)
December 21, 2016 Filing 409 Sealed Document. ALE's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Declare This Case Exceptional Under 35 U.S.C. 285. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Williams, Danny)
December 21, 2016 Filing 408 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties, #383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, #381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
December 21, 2016 Filing 407 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Sealed Document. ALE Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Declare This Case Exceptional Under 35 U.S.C. 285 (Williams, Danny) Modified on 12/21/2016 (rlf).
December 21, 2016 Filing 406 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties, #383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, #381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny) Modified on 12/21/2016 (rlf).
December 21, 2016 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #406 Sealed Patent Sur-Reply and #407 Sealed Document submitted by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. Per Attorney, filed in error and documents have been refilled. (rlf)
December 20, 2016 Filing 405 SEALED SUR-REPLY by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. to #378 Sealed Patent Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial (Wynne, Richard)
December 20, 2016 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #379 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ALE's IEEE-Related Equitable Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #402 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Chrimar's deadline to file its Reply in Support of its Motion to Declare this Case Exceptional #400 and its Reply to Response to Motion for Award of Ongoing Royalties, Motion for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, and Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) #401 is extended to 12-15-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/19/16. (mll, )
December 16, 2016 Filing 402 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #400 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, #401 Reply to Response to Motion, by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
December 15, 2016 Filing 401 REPLY to Response to Motion re #382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties, #383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, #381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Interest Calculation), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Final Judgment))(Schulte, David)
December 15, 2016 Filing 400 Sealed Reply In Support of Chrimar's Motion to Declare This Case Exceptional Under 35 U.S.C. 285 380 filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Justin S. Cohen)
December 15, 2016 Filing 399 RESPONSE to #377 Notice (Other) Surreply in Opposition to ALE Brief on Equitable Issues filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
December 13, 2016 Filing 398 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #378 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vasquez, Richard)
December 13, 2016 Filing 397 REPLY TO RESPONSE to #394 Response to Non-Motion, (ALE Brief on Equitable Issues) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny) Modified on 12/13/2016 (gsg).
December 13, 2016 Filing 396 REPLY to Response to Motion re #379 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ALE's IEEE-Related Equitable Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
December 5, 2016 Filing 395 Proposed Findings of Fact by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
December 5, 2016 Filing 394 RESPONSE to #377 Notice (Other) Response to ALE Brief on Equitable Issues filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- PTX-124, #2 Exhibit B -- PTX-090, #3 Exhibit C -- PTX-085, #4 Exhibit D -- PTX-087, #5 Exhibit E -- PTX-141, #6 Exhibit F -- PTX-116, #7 Exhibit G -- PTX-008, #8 Exhibit H -- DX-249, #9 Exhibit I -- Schivley Declaration)(Wynne, Richard)
December 5, 2016 Filing 393 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #378 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
December 5, 2016 Filing 392 RESPONSE in Opposition re #382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties, #383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, #381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 5, 2016 Filing 391 Sealed Document. ALE Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Declare this Case Exceptional Under 35 U.S.C. 285. Response to Document 380 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 12/6/2016 (mjc, ).
December 5, 2016 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on ALE's Defenses and Counterclaims that were Pleaded but Not Asserted At Trial filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 5, 2016 Filing 389 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #379 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ALE's IEEE-Related Equitable Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
December 2, 2016 Filing 388 RESPONSE to Motion re #375 MOTION Defendant ALE's Renewal of Its Opposed Motion for Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Parties' deadline to respond to all Post-Trial Motions and other documents filed on 11-10-2016, is hereby extended until and including 12-05-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/22/16. (mll, )
November 21, 2016 Filing 386 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #385 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #375 MOTION Defendant ALE's Renewal of Its Opposed Motion for Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record , #382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties, #383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest, #381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) , #379 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ALE's IEEE-Related Equitable Defenses and Counterclaims, #378 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial, #384 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on ALE's Defenses and Counterclaims that were Pleaded but Not Asserted At Trial, #376 Proposed Findings of Fact, #377 Notice (Other) , 380 SEALED MOTION to Declare This Case Exceptional by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 385 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #384 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on ALE's Defenses and Counterclaims that were Pleaded but Not Asserted At Trial.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Justin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 384 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) on ALE's Defenses and Counterclaims that were Pleaded but Not Asserted At Trial by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 383 MOTION for Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 382 MOTION for Award of Ongoing Royalties by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 381 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 10, 2016 Filing 379 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ALE's IEEE-Related Equitable Defenses and Counterclaims by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Trial Ex. DX-249, #2 Exhibit B -- Trial Ex. PTX-085, #3 Exhibit C -- Trial Ex. PTX-090, #4 Exhibit D -- Trial Ex. PTX-087, #5 Exhibit E -- Trial Ex. PTX-124, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 378 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Motion for New Trial by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 377 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. of Brief on Equitable Issues (Williams, Danny)
November 10, 2016 Filing 376 Proposed Findings of Fact by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
November 10, 2016 Filing 375 MOTION Defendant ALE's Renewal of Its Opposed Motion for Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #373 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #372 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/10/16. (mll, )
November 9, 2016 Filing 373 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #372 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by AMX, LLC, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 3, 2016 Filing 372 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by AMX, LLC, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting #370 Motion to Stay Deadlines. ORDERED that the trial scheduled to begin on October 24, 2016 is vacated and all pending deadlines are stayed for thirty (30) days for Defendant AMX only. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/21/2016. (gsg)
October 20, 2016 Filing 370 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by AMX, LLC, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
October 18, 2016 Filing 369 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on 10/7/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 368 Sealed Transcript. Jury Trial, 10/6/2016 (Chris Bickham, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 367 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held on 10/6/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 366 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held on 10/6/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 365 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury trial, Afternoon Session, held on 10/5/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 364 Sealed Transcript. Jury Trial, 10/5/2016 (Chris Bickham, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held on 10/5/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 362 10/4/2016, Jury Trial, Sealed Transcript. (Chris Bickham, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held on 10/4/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 360 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held on 10/4/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporters: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com..

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held on 10/3/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. chris.bickham@yahoo.com.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 18, 2016 Filing 358 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held on 10/3/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham and Tonya Jackson, chris.bickham@yahoo.com. Telephone number: 409-654-2891.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (Chris Bickham, )

October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #353 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #354 Motion to Expedite; denying #355 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Expert Report; denying as moot #356 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/17/16. (mll, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 356 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on #355 Second Renewed Motion to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 14, 2016 Filing 355 Second SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills [RENEWED] by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A _ Excerpt of Mills Testimony ALE Trial, #2 Ex. B_ 2016-06-14 R. Mills, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 13, 2016 Filing 354 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on #353 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 13, 2016 Filing 353 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement [RENEWED] by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Trial Transcripts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 13, 2016 Filing 352 Amended Exhibit List by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC.(srb)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL BRIEFING. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/11/16. (mll, )
October 7, 2016 Mr. Schulte renewed his previous ORAL MOTION made for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying ORAL Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law made by Mr. Schulte. By Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/7/16. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying Mr. Schulte's renewed previous Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. By Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/7/16. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying Mr. Buss' renewed previous Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. By Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/7/16. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 ORAL MOTION made for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 MR. Buss renewed his previous ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 350 Final Jury Instructions. Signed 10/07/2016. US Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, )
October 7, 2016 Filing 349 JURY VERDICT. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 348 Sealed Jury Verdict without redaction of foreperson. (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 347 Plaintiffs Exhibit List of exhibits admitted during Jury Trial (mjm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 346 Defendants Exhibit List of exhibits admitted during Jury Trial. (mjm ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2016: #1 FRONT AND BACK of Defendant's Exhibit list admitted during Jury ) (mjm,
October 7, 2016 Filing 345 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Day 5 of Jury Trial held and completed on 10/7/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (mjm)
October 6, 2016 Filing 344 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Jury Trial held on 10/6/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (srb)
October 6, 2016 Filing 343 Proposed Jury Instructions by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Chrimar's Proposed Verdict Form, #2 ALE's Proposed Verdict Form)(Cohen, Justin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Jury Trial held on 10/5/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (srb)
October 4, 2016 Filing 341 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Jury Trial held on 10/4/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (srb) Modified on 9/11/2018 (dm, ).
October 3, 2016 Filing 340 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Jury Selection held on 10/3/2016. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (srb)
October 3, 2016 Electronic Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Jury Trial held on 10/3/2016. See minute entry Doc. 340. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (srb)
October 1, 2016 Filing 339 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. and Defendant ALE USA Inc. of Amended Joint Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions in Case No. 6:15-cv-163-JDL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
September 30, 2016 Filing 338 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. & AMX, LLC of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions for Chrimar Systems, Inc. v. AMX, LLC, 6:15-cv-164-JDL (Cohen, Justin)
September 30, 2016 Filing 337 STIPULATION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Notice of Stipulation Regarding The '012 and '760 Patents by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
September 29, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. & Defendant ALE USA, Inc. Concerning Amended Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER re #333 Stipulation filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/29/16. (mll, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER denying #303 Sealed Patent Motion to Continue Trial Setting. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/29/16. (mll, )
September 29, 2016 Filing 333 STIPULATION Regarding ALE's Additional Motion in Limine No. 20 (ECF 307) by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER denying without prejudice #307 Sealed Motion in limine. Parties shall continue to meet and confer and submit to the Court an agreed motion by the close of business on 9-30-2016. If an agreement cannot be reached, the Court will take up the issue briefly before the commencement of trial on 10-03-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/29/16. (mll, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #315 Sealed Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/29/16. (mll, )
September 29, 2016 Filing 330 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #307 SEALED MOTION Additional Motion in Limine (No. 20) filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
September 29, 2016 NOTICE that Jury Selection and Trial is set for October 3, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge John Love, 221 W. Ferguson, Room 106, Tyler, Texas (Judge Schneider's Courtroom). (srb)
September 28, 2016 Filing 329 REPLY to Response to Motion re #307 SEALED MOTION Additional Motion in Limine (No. 20) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
September 28, 2016 Filing 328 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #315 SEALED MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 22-27 and 40-56 of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti Re Validity and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Justin S. Cohen
September 28, 2016 Filing 327 Amended Witness List by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
September 28, 2016 Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition re #307 SEALED MOTION Additional Motion in Limine (No. 20) filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Email chain, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 28, 2016 Filing 325 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re #264 Notice (Other), of Submission of Replacement Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - ALE Amended Witness List)(Williams, Danny)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #296 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/28/16. (mll, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 323 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #303 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION for Brief Continuance Due to Medical Necessity filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #304 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part #306 Sealed Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/27/16. (mll, )
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER re #315 SEALED MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 22-27 and 40-56 of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti Re Validity and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. Chrimar shall file a response by close of business on 9-29-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/27/16. (mll, )
September 27, 2016 Filing 320 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION to Strike New and Previously Undisclosed Test Data and Opinions Relying Thereon and Notice of Joinder to Defendant AMX's Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 304), #304 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 2-12 of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
September 27, 2016 Filing 319 REPLY to Response to Motion re #304 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 2-12 of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164). (Bluestone, David)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER construing the terms "adapted" and "physically connect" re #298 Opposed SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION UNDER 02 MICRO, NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/26/16. (mjc, )
September 26, 2016 Filing 317 Proposed Jury Instructions by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
September 26, 2016 Filing 316 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION to Strike New and Previously Undisclosed Test Data and Opinions Relying Thereon and Notice of Joinder to Defendant AMX's Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 304) filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Danny)
September 26, 2016 Filing 315 SEALED MOTION Defendant ALE USA Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 22-27 and 40-56 of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti Re Validity and Request for Expedited Briefing by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 26, 2016 Filing 314 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. re #292 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Sealed Patent Motion,,,, Submission of Stipulation to Be Read to the Jury (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation Regarding Richard Holleman)(Wynne, Richard)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER that Responses to Docket Numbers #303 and #307 shall be filed no later than 9-28-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/26/16. (mll, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. For the reasons set forth herein, Chrimar's motion in limine number 2 is DENIED as to Mr. Boenke's testimony, and GRANTED as to Dr. Shoemake, Mr. Jones, and Mr. Lang's testimony. Chrimar's motion in limine number 3 is DENIED as to the ADTRAN report and GRANTED as to the Cisco report. Chrimar's motion in limine number 9 is DENIED as to exhibits 7 and 8, and GRANTED as to exhibits 9 through 22. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/23/16. (mll, )
September 26, 2016 Filing 311 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #296 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion in Limine filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vasquez, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2016: #3 Corrected Cover Page for Exhibit A) (mjc, ).
September 26, 2016 Filing 310 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #306 SEALED MOTION to Strike New and Previously Undisclosed Test Data and Opinions Relying Thereon and Notice of Joinder to Defendant AMX's Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 304) filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Madisetti Supp. Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - OS6450 Hardware Guide Excperts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 26, 2016 Filing 309 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #298 Opposed SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION UNDER 02 MICRO, NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Chrimar I Markman Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B -- 012 Patent, #3 Exhibit C -- Crayford Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D -- 107 Patent Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E -- 838 Patent Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F -- 760 Patent Excerpts, #7 Exhibit G -- 250 Patent Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H -- Madisetti Report Excerpts, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 26, 2016 Filing 308 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #304 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 2-12 of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Madisetti Supp Rpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pl 3rd Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - AMX response to 3rd rogs, #4 Exhibit 4 - ALE response to 3rd rogs, #5 Exhibit 5 - Bakewell Early Damages Rpt, #6 Exhibit 6 - Noble Depo Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - AMX Supp. Rog Response, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of Madisetti Opening Rpt, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of Seifert Rebuttal Rpt, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Carlson Rebuttal Rpt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of Crayford Rebuttal Rpt, #12 Exhibit 12 - Pl 2nd Set of Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit 13 - AMX Supp. Responses to 2nd Interrogatories, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 23, 2016 Filing 307 SEALED MOTION Additional Motion in Limine (No. 20) by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 23, 2016 Filing 306 SEALED MOTION to Strike New and Previously Undisclosed Test Data and Opinions Relying Thereon and Notice of Joinder to Defendant AMX's Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 304) by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 22, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. re #304 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 2-12 of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti and Request for Expedited Briefing (Cohen, Justin)
September 22, 2016 Filing 304 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike and Preclude Paragraphs 2-12 of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Vijay Madisetti and Request for Expedited Briefing by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Bluestone, #2 Ex. 1 - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. V. Madisetti, #3 Ex. 2 - 2015-08-31 Chrimar's PR 3-1 Disclosures, #4 Ex. 3 - 2015-10-14 Chrimar's PR 3-1 Disclosures, #5 Ex. 4 - Emails btw Bluestone and Cohen, #6 Ex. 5 - Madisetti Depo, #7 Proposed Order on Motion to Strike, #8 Proposed Order on Expedited Briefing)(Thames, Earl)
September 21, 2016 Filing 303 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION for Brief Continuance Due to Medical Necessity by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Montgomery letter, #2 Ex. B - Aetna letter, #3 Ex. C - Noble Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER for Defendants to file a response by 5 oclock P.M. Monday September 26, 2016 re #296 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion in Limine filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/21/2016. (gsg)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting in part #284 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/21/2016. (gsg)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER TO RESPOND re #298 Opposed SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION UNDER 02 MICRO, NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. Court ORDERS that Chrimar file a response by close of business on September 26, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/21/2016. (gsg)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER ON TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/21/2016. (gsg)
September 20, 2016 Filing 298 Opposed SEALED MOTION EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION UNDER 02 MICRO, NOTICE OF STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
September 19, 2016 Filing 297 SEALED Joint Submission Concerning Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine Nos. 2, 3, and 9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit A -- Cohen Declaration, #25 Exhibit B -- Shoemake Excerpts, #26 Exhibit C -- Lang Excerpts, #27 Exhibit D -- Jones Excerpts, #28 Exhibit E -- D. Law Excerpts, #29 Exhibit F -- Mills Depo Excerpts, #30 Exhibit G -- CMS088040, #31 Exhibit H -- Hawkins email, #32 Exhibit I -- Redacted Mills Rpt Ex. 11)(Wynne, Richard)
September 19, 2016 Filing 296 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion in Limine by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
September 19, 2016 Filing 295 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #284 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Mills Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B -- Mills Second Supp. Rpt., #3 Exhibit C -- ALE License Agmt, #4 Exhibit D -- Mills AMX Rpt Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E -- Mills ALE/ALU Rpt Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F -- Bakewell Rpt Excperts, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
September 15, 2016 Filing 294 EXPEDITED PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. for proceedings held on 9/13/2016 Pretrial Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Kim, Kyung) Modified on 9/15/2016 (dlc, ).
September 15, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/16, before Judge Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Toni Hudson, Telephone number: 361/949-2988. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2016. (dlc, )
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #268 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #270 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #271 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/14/16. (mll, )
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER ON TRIAL TIME LIMITATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/13/16. (mll, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 290 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AMX, LLC for proceedings held on 9/13/16 Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Hon. John D. Love. (Thames, Earl) (To be transcribed by Toni Hudson, Exceptional Reporting) Modified on 9/13/2016 (dlc, ).
September 13, 2016 Filing 289 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2016. (Court Reporter S. Baum) (srb)
September 13, 2016 Electronic Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2016 re #271 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. See Minute Entry at Doc. 289. (Court Reporter S. Baum) (srb)
September 13, 2016 Electronic Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2016 re #270 AMX MOTION in Limine. See Minute Entry at Doc. 289. (Court Reporter S. Baum) (srb) Modified on 9/13/2016 (srb).
September 13, 2016 Electronic Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2016 re #268 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. See Minute Entry Doc. 289. (Court Reporter S. Baum) (srb)
September 12, 2016 Filing 288 NOTICE by AMX, LLC re #264 Notice (Other), of Submission of Replacement Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Ex. I - AMX's First Amended Trial Exhibit List and Chrimar's Objections, #2 Ex. J - AMX's First Amended Deposition Designations with Chrimar's Objections and Counter-Designations)(Jones, Michael)
September 12, 2016 Filing 287 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Notice and Stipulation Relating to Motions in Limine (Cohen, Justin)
September 12, 2016 Filing 286 Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with the Court's Order [Dk. No. 253] Sealed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Supplemental Report of Mr. Mills)(Cohen, Justin)
September 12, 2016 Filing 285 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re #264 Notice (Other), of Submission of Replacement Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L (replacement), #2 Exhibit M (replacement))(Williams, Danny)
September 9, 2016 Filing 284 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - 090716 Mills depo excerpt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Joint Notice on Order of Trials (Cohen, Justin)
September 2, 2016 Filing 282 SEALED RESPONSE to #270 AMX's SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
September 2, 2016 Filing 281 SEALED RESPONSE to #268 ALE's SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
September 2, 2016 Filing 280 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #271 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2016: #30 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
September 2, 2016 Filing 279 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #271 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 Mills 2nd Supplemental Expert Report (Filed Under Seal), #2 Ex. 2 Excerpts from 6-14-16 Mills Depo. (Filed Under Seal), #3 Ex. 3 Excerpts from Bakewell Rebuttal Report (Filed Under Seal), #4 Ex. 4 Excerpts from Madisetti Rebuttal Report (Filed Under Seal), #5 Ex. 5 Geier Opening Report (Filed Under Seal), #6 Ex. 6 Excerpts from Decision on Request for Ex Parte Reexamination (Filed Under Seal), #7 Ex. 7 PTAB Statistics (Filed Under Seal), #8 Ex. 8 Excerpts from Bakewell Early Damages Report (Filed Under Seal), #9 Ex. 9 Mills 2nd Supplemental (Corrected) Expert Report (Filed Under Seal), #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Filing 278 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Estimated Trial Time (Cohen, Justin)
September 2, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE by AMX, LLC of Estimated Trial Time (Jones, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #272 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the parties are allowed to file up to a 20-page Response to Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/2/2016. (gsg)
September 2, 2016 Filing 275 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re Identification of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Williams, Danny)
September 2, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. of Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Williams, Danny)
September 1, 2016 Filing 273 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Regarding Sealed Order (Dkt. No. 255) (Cohen, Justin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 272 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Responses to Motions in Limine by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 30, 2016 Filing 271 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
August 30, 2016 Filing 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - McCormack Depo, #2 Ex. B - Holleman Expert Rpt, #3 Ex. C - Holleman Depo, #4 Ex. D - Madisetti Rebuttal Rpt, #5 Ex. E - Ex J to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #6 Ex. F - Ex K to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #7 Ex. G - Ex L to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #8 Ex. H - Ex M to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #9 Ex. I - POEfinder Brochure, #10 Ex. J - Petrick Depo, #11 Ex. K - 041316 Wynne email, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/30/16. (mll, )
August 30, 2016 Filing 268 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting in part #222 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/30/16. (mll, )
August 29, 2016 Filing 266 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #222 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Accordance with the Court's June 22, 2016 Order filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
August 29, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #261 Motion in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE.*** (mjc, )
August 29, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #265 Motion in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE.*** (mjc, )
August 29, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #263 Motion in Limine. PLEASE IGNORE. DCOUMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE.*** (mjc, )
August 26, 2016 Filing 265 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - McCormack Depo, #2 Ex. B - Holleman Expert Rpt, #3 Ex. C - Holleman Depo, #4 Ex. D - Madisetti Rebuttal Rpt, #5 Ex. E - Ex J to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #6 Ex. F - Ex K to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #7 Ex. G - Ex L to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #8 Ex. H - Ex M to Madisetti Opening Rpt, #9 Ex. I - POEfinder Brochure, #10 Ex. J - Petrick Depo, #11 Ex. K - 041316 Wynne email, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 8/29/2016 (mjc, ).
August 26, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Joint Submission of Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Cohen, Justin)
August 26, 2016 Filing 263 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION in Limine by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- R. Mills Depo Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B -- R. Seifert Depo Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C -- C. Boenke Jan 2015 Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D -- C. Boenke Dec 2015 Depo Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E -- Network-1 v. Cisco Invalidity Opinion, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard) Modified on 8/29/2016 (mjc, ).
August 26, 2016 Filing 262 NOTICE by AMX, LLC of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 282(c) (Jones, Michael)
August 26, 2016 Filing 261 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** SEALED MOTION in Limine by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Relevant Excerpts from Dr. Madisettis Infringement Report, #2 Exhibit 2 Relevant Excerpts from Mr. Crayfords Invalidity Report, #3 Exhibit 3 Relevant Excerpts from Dr. Madisettis Rebuttal Report, #4 Exhibit 4 Relevant Excerpts from Chrimars Amended PR 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures, #5 Exhibit 5 Chrimar I Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 Touchscreen Gestures case, #7 Exhibit 7 Relevant Excerpts from the Deposition of Al Petrick, #8 Exhibit 8 Relevant Excerpts from the Deposition of Michael McCormack, #9 Exhibit 9 Relevant Excerpts from Mr. Hollemans Expert Report, #10 Exhibit 10 CMS089724 (April 27, 2001 Email from Geoff Thompson), #11 Exhibit 11 Relevant Excerpts from Mr. Mills Expert Report as to ALU/ALE, #12 Exhibit 12 Relevant Excerpts from the Deposition of Robert Mills (Vol. 2), #13 Exhibit 13 Chrimar Response to Interrogatory No. 2, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 8/29/2016 (mjc, ).
August 25, 2016 Filing 260 REPLY to Response to Motion re #222 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Accordance with the Court's June 22, 2016 Order filed by AMX, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 259 NOTICE by AMX, LLC of Proposed Trial Plan (Jones, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 258 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. Regarding ALE Trial Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Danny)
August 25, 2016 Filing 257 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Chrimar's Proposed Trial Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re trial plan in Wi-LAN v. Alcatel-Lucent)(Cohen, Justin)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/23/16. (mll, )
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ***UNSEALED PER NOTICE #273 .***SEALED ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/23/16. (mll, ) Modified on 9/14/2016 (mjc, ).
August 22, 2016 Filing 254 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
August 17, 2016 Filing 252 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 08/11/2016 before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2016. (bhs, )
August 15, 2016 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Accordance with the Court's June 22, 2016 Order filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Hoffmann Decl., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #249 Motion to Withdraw #245 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/12/16. (mjc, )
August 11, 2016 Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION re #245 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Against ALE and AMX for Trial Withdrawal of Motion by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
August 11, 2016 Filing 248 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2016 re #204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (srb)
August 11, 2016 Filing 247 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AMX, LLC regarding Compliance with Pretrial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
August 11, 2016 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2016 re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. See original entry Doc. 248. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (srb)
August 11, 2016 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2016 re #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., AMX, LLC. See Entry Doc. 248. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (srb)
August 10, 2016 Filing 246 NOTICE by AMX, LLC of U.S. Patent & Trademark Office's Decisions to Institute Inter Partes Reviews (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - 107 decision, #2 Ex. 2 - 760 decision, #3 Ex. 3 - 838 decision)(Jones, Michael)
August 10, 2016 Filing 245 ***WITHDRAWN PER #250 ORDER.***Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Against ALE and AMX for Trial by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order in Wi-LAN v. Alcatel-Lucent et al., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 8/15/2016 (mjc, ).
August 9, 2016 Filing 244 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by AMX, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2016 Filing 243 SEALED SUR-REPLY by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. in opposition to #205 Sealed Patent Motion,, filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H -- Mills Vol. II Depo Excerpts)(Wynne, Richard)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #240 Motion to Replace Expert. Clyde R. Camp is hereby substituted in place of the late Richard J. Holleman as an expert witness for Plaintiffs on IEEE policies and procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/08/16. (mll, )
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying as moot #224 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/08/16. (mll, )
August 6, 2016 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION to Replace Deceased IEEE Expert by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Clyde Camp CV, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 6, 2016 Filing 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' MTN FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTDEFENDANTS IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164), Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 38)(Nguyen, Teri) Modified on 8/18/2016 (mjc, ).
August 5, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Cohen, Justin)
August 5, 2016 Filing 237 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Defendants' Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Jones, Michael)
August 5, 2016 Filing 236 Proposed Pretrial Order by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
August 5, 2016 Filing 235 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Joint Submission of Jury Materials (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cohen, Justin)
August 5, 2016 Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #224 MOTION to Compel ALE to Produce Network-1 License Agreement informing Court that the Motion is moot filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 5, 2016 Filing 233 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #224 MOTION to Compel ALE to Produce Network-1 License Agreement filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wooten, David)
August 5, 2016 Filing 232 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Request for Daily Trial Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Cohen, Justin)
August 5, 2016 Filing 231 NOTICE by AMX, LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
August 4, 2016 Filing 230 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Chrimar Holding Company and LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N.1, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V)(Cohen, Justin)
August 3, 2016 Filing 229 ***FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT NOT SIGNED BY ATTORNEY. TO BE REFILED*** SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC and Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N.1, #2 Exhibit O, #3 Exhibit P, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 8/4/2016 (mll, ).
August 3, 2016 Filing 228 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 9 - Robert Mills Depo, #2 Ex. 10 - Report of Mills)(Jones, Michael)
August 3, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 6/21/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2016. (sms, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 226 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Buss, Brian)
August 1, 2016 Filing 225 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FF -- Carlson Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit GG -- Petrick Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit HH -- Holleman Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit II -- Ringle Depo Excerpts)(Wynne, Richard)
July 30, 2016 Filing 224 MOTION to Compel ALE to Produce Network-1 License Agreement by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Law360 Article on License, #2 Exhibit 2 -- July 20 email from ALE refusing to produce license agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Network-1 Consent to Production by ALE and ALU, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #207 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/29/16. (mll, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 222 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Accordance with the Court's June 22, 2016 Order by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Bluestone, #2 Ex 1 - Seifert Expert Report Pages, #3 Exh 2 - Schivley 1-23-98 Letter, #4 Exh 3 - draft patent application, #5 Exh 4 - Boenke schematic, #6 Exh 5 - Boenke patent write up, #7 Exh 6 - letter to Cohen and Lenihan, #8 Exh 7 - privilege log 1 highlighted, #9 Exh 8 - privilege log 2 highlighted, #10 Exh 9 - privilege log nd cal highlighted, #11 Exh 10 - email correspondence, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #219 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Defendants Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. All attorneys' fees, expenses,and costs to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/22/16. (mjc, )
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying as moot #129 Sealed Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement as to Defendants Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/22/16. (mjc, )
July 21, 2016 Filing 219 Joint MOTION to Dismiss as to Defs. Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
July 21, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Curtis Schulte on behalf of Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Schulte, David)
July 20, 2016 Filing 217 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Petrick, #2 Petrick Ex 01, #3 Declaration of Bright, #4 01 - Excerpts Carlson 6.2.16 dep, #5 02 - Excerpts 2015-02-18 30(b)(6) Austermann Day 2, #6 03 - CMS125426, #7 04 - 250 Patent cover page, #8 05 - Excerpts 4-28-16 McCormack, #9 06 - Carlson exhibit 04, #10 07 - IEEE slides La Jolla, #11 08 - Excerpts 2016-06-10 R. Holleman (Full), #12 09 - Richard Holleman-Exhibit 18, #13 10 - Austermann, John 120915 Condensed, #14 11- Excerpts 5-8-2012 John Austermann III, #15 12 - Excerpts 430 appln ('622 FH), #16 13 - WO1999053627-PAMPH-ea5, #17 14 - Excerpts 5-6-2012 Naamani Dep, #18 15 - Excerpts Naamani 8_7_09, #19 16 - Excerpts Thompson 8.13.02, #20 17 - Excerpts G. Thompson 4-28-12 Dep, #21 18 - CMS016807, #22 19 - Excerpts Austermann Aug 8, 9, 2002 Depo, #23 20 - John Austermann, Vol II-Exhibit 78, #24 21 - John Austermann, Vol II-Exhibit 51, #25 22 - Excerpts Austerman Dep 4.22.16, #26 23 - IEEE slides Vancouver, #27 24 - 6-15-16 - ChriMar - Petrick - Full, #28 25 - Exhibit 35, #29 26 - 1988 IEEE-SA, #30 27 - 2000Style Manual, #31 28 - Excerpts McCormack Deposition, #32 29 - 2016.05.13 #392 Redacted Response #379 MSJ, #33 30 - Exhibit 25, #34 31 - Exhibit 40, #35 32 - Exhibit 36, #36 33 - Exhibit 41, #37 34 - Exhibit 42, #38 35 - Chrimar_ITC00124363-77, #39 36 - John Austermann, Vol II-Exhibit 37, #40 37 - IEEE Slides La Jolla, #41 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 20, 2016 Filing 216 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
July 20, 2016 Filing 215 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Mills Rpt (AMX), #2 Exhibit B -- Mills Rpt Excerpts (ALE), #3 Exhibit C -- Mills Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D -- Early Damages Hearing Excerpts, #5 Exhibit E -- Madisetti Rpt Excerpts, #6 Exhibit F -- CPI Article, #7 Exhibit G -- Wynne Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 20, 2016 Filing 214 RESPONSE to Motion re #207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
July 20, 2016 Filing 213 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement filed by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Bluestone, #2 01 - Geier Decl, #3 01.A - (SEALED) Geier Rpt, #4 02 - (SEALED) Madisetti Dep, #5 03 - (SEALED) Baxter Dep, #6 04 - Baxter Dep Ex. 9, #7 05 - Seifert Decl, #8 05.A - Seifert Rpt, #9 06 - Infringement Contentions, #10 07 - Interrogatory Responses, #11 08 - Chrimar's Answer to AMX's Counterclaims, #12 09 - Motion to Compel, #13 10 - (SEALED) FG1010-310 Test Results, #14 11 - (SEALED) FG1010-310 Test Images, #15 12 - Baxter Rpt, #16 13 - Geier Dep, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 19, 2016 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter, #204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS, #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills, #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srb)
July 7, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter, #204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS, #205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills, #206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement: Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srb, )
June 30, 2016 Filing 212 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Williams, Danny)
June 28, 2016 Filing 211 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. ORDER ATTACHED TO ENTRY #207 .***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter.. (Williams, Danny) Modified on 7/1/2016 (mjc, ).
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER denying #197 Motion for Leave to File Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/16. (mll, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 209 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #198 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., AMX, LLC Filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Reply Letter Brief re MSJ of Noninfringement 838 and 760)(Jones, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 208 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #197 MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent Nos '838 and '760 filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Justin S. Cohen)
June 27, 2016 Filing 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 U.S. Patent No. 8,155,012, #2 Exhibit 2 U.S. Patent No. 8,942,107 claims, #3 Exhibit 3 U.S. Patent No. 9,019,838 claims, #4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 8,902,760 claims, #5 Exhibit 5 Jan 20 2016 Baxter Dep Tr, #6 Exhibit 6 June 14 2016 Madisetti Dep Tr, #7 Exhibit 7 Seifert Report, #8 Exhibit 8 IEEE 802.3-1993, #9 Exhibit 9 IEEE 802.3u-1995, #10 Exhibit 10 Crayford Report, #11 Exhibit 11 Dec 6, 2011 Am & Pet Ext Time, #12 Exhibit 12 Pls Objs & Resp to ALE RFAs, #13 Exhibit 13 Baxter Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 Oct 22 2014 Baxter Dep Tr, #15 Exhibit 15 U.S. Patent No. 5,568,525, #16 Exhibit 16 U.S. Patent No. 5,200,686, #17 Exhibit 17 U.S. Patent No. 2,822,519, #18 Exhibit 18 Feb 2 2016 Seifert Dep Tr, #19 Exhibit 19 IEEE 802.3i-1990, #20 Exhibit 20 March 10 2016 Markman Hearing Tr, #21 Exhibit 21 U.S. Patent No. 6,134,666, #22 Exhibit 22 U.S. Patent No. 5,406,260, #23 Exhibit 23 Oct 30, 2014 Markman Hearing Tr, #24 Exhibit 24 Chrimar Resp Rog 2, #25 Exhibit 25 Jun 15 2016 Madisetti Dep Tr, #26 Exhibit 26 Exhibit 5 to 2014 Baxter Dep, #27 Exhibit 27 Chrimar Resp to MSJ Indefiniteness, #28 Exhibit 28 Madisetti Report to AMX, #29 Exhibit 29 Madisetti Report to ALE, #30 Exhibit 30 April 21 2016 Austermann Dep Tr, #31 Affidavit (Declaration) of Leisa Talbert Peschel ISO MSJ)(Williams, Danny) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2016: #32 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
June 27, 2016 Filing 206 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 012, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. V. Madisetti's Declaration, #3 Exhibit B.1 - Dr. V. Madisetti's Opening Rpt (ALE), #4 Exhibit B.1.G - IEEE 802.3af-2003, #5 Exhibit B.1.H - IEEE 802.3at-2009, #6 Exhibit B.1.I-ALE - Accuse Products, #7 Exhibit B.1.J-ALE - 012 Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit B.2 - Dr. V. Madisetti's Opening Rpt (AMX), #9 Exhibit B.2.I-AMX - Accused Products, #10 Exhibit B.2.J-AMX - 012 Claim Chart, #11 Exhibit C - R. Mills's Declaration, #12 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Claim Construction Hearing Transcript (October 30, 2014), #13 Exhibit E - S. Carlson's Declaration, #14 Exhibit F - 8088 Smart DeskPhone Data Sheet, #15 Exhibit G - 8088 Smart DeskPhone User Manual, #16 Exhibit H - DXLink Multi-Format Transmitter Data Sheet, #17 Exhibit I - DXLink Multi-Format Transmitter Quick Start Guide, #18 Exhibit J - Excerpts from I. Crayford's Rebuttal Expert Report, #19 Exhibit K - Excerpts from I. Crayford's Deposition Transcript (June 23 & 24, 2016), #20 Exhibit L - Excerpts from R. Seifert's Deposition Transcript (June 10 & 11, 2016), #21 Exhibit M - Excerpts from R. Seifert's Deposition Transcript (February 2, 2016), #22 Exhibit N - Excerpts from R. Noble's Deposition Transcript (April 21, 2016), #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
June 27, 2016 Filing 205 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report and Exclude the Opinions of Robert Mills by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent Hawkins ISO Mtn to Exclude or Strike Expert Report, #2 Ex. 1 - Mills Depo, #3 Ex. 2 - Mills AMX Report, #4 Ex. 3 - Mills ALE Report, #5 Ex. 4 - Mills Early Patent Damages, #6 Ex. 5 - Early Damages Hearing - CONFIDENTIAL, #7 Ex. 6 - Madisetti Vol. 1, #8 Ex. 7 - Amended Infringement Contentions to AMX, #9 Ex. 8 - Amended Infringement Contentions to ALE, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 204 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' IEEE-RELATED DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Cummings Dep., #2 Exhibit B -- 260 Patent Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C -- 622 Patent, #4 Exhibit D -- Petrick Rpt Excerpt, #5 Exhibit E -- Carlson Dep., #6 Exhibit F -- Austermann 4-22-16 Dep, #7 Exhibit G -- Austermann 5-8-12 Dep, #8 Exhibit H -- Austermann 2-17-15 Dep, #9 Exhibit I -- Petrick Dep, #10 Exhibit J -- Carlson Slides 7-2000, #11 Exhibit K -- 802.3af Minutes 7-2000, #12 Exhibit L -- 802.3af Minutes Excerpt 9-2000, #13 Exhibit M -- McCormack Dep, #14 Exhibit N -- Austermann 2-18-15 Dep, #15 Exhibit O -- 10-25-2000 Ltr Schivley to Scozzafava, #16 Exhibit P -- 12-2000 PatCom Minutes, #17 Exhibit Q -- LoA for '260 Patent, #18 Exhibit R -- McCormack 10-7-2004 Email, #19 Exhibit S -- Thompson 4-27-2001 Email, #20 Exhibit T -- Thompson 10-12-2001 Ltr to Austermann, #21 Exhibit U -- McCormack-Austermann email exchange, #22 Exhibit V -- '012 Patent Excerpt, #23 Exhibit W -- IEEE Ltr to FTC 4-17-2002, #24 Exhibit X -- 2000 Style Manual Excerpt, #25 Exhibit Y -- Patent Tutorial Excerpt, #26 Exhibit Z -- Verified Report of R. Holleman, #27 Exhibit AA -- 2000 IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws, #28 Exhibit BB -- Black's Law Dictionary Excerpt, #29 Exhibit CC -- 2000 IEEE-SA Standards Board Operations Manual, #30 Exhibit DD -- 2005 Style Manual Excerpt, #31 Exhibit EE -- Wynne Decl., #32 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/24/16. (mll, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 202 REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Partial Settlement(Knowles, James)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER re #3 Complaint, filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs Chrimar Systems, Inc., et al and Defendants Alcatel-Lucent S.A., et al. to submit closing documents no later than July 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/23/2016. (gsg)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/22/16. (mll, )
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #146 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/22/16. (mll, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 198 Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent Nos. '838 and '760 filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief re MSJ of Noninfringement)(Jones, Michael)
June 22, 2016 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief regarding Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent Nos '838 and '760 by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Filing 196 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order to Extend Selected Pretrial Deadlines by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
June 21, 2016 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2016 re #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel> filed by AMX, LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (srb)
June 21, 2016 Filing 194 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel ALE's Notice of Joinder in Motion (Williams, Danny)
June 21, 2016 NOTICE that the hearing scheduled for Tuesday, June 21, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. on Doc. 129 has been CANCELLED. (srg)
June 15, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 193, Transcript. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (tlh, )
June 14, 2016 Filing 193 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) PLEASE DISREGARD. NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: held on 5/17/2016 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawna Hicks,Telephone number: (903) 276-1090. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2016. (tlh). Modified on 6/15/2016 (tlh, ) .
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER re #183 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. Plaintiffs letter brief request (Doc. No. 183) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/14/2016. (gsg)
June 14, 2016 Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Teri Hong-Phuc Nguyen on behalf of AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164) (Nguyen, Teri)
June 14, 2016 Filing 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hersh H Mehta on behalf of AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5788713. (Mehta, Hersh)
June 14, 2016 Filing 189 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #188 SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief,.. (Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 188 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #183 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC Filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter brief)(Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying #152 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/13/16. (mjc, )
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #184 Motion for Leave to Take Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/09/16. (mll, )
June 9, 2016 Filing 185 SEALED REPLY in Support of Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #152 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief)(Williams, Danny)
June 7, 2016 Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions Outside of the Expert Discovery Deadline by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 6, 2016 Filing 183 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Requesting Leave to File Daubert Motion Relating to Opinions of Steven Carlson (Wynne, Richard)
June 6, 2016 Filing 182 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Support of Response to Motion re #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER that Defendants file a reply letter brief by 6-09-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/03/16. (mll, )
May 31, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
May 26, 2016 Filing 180 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel filed by AMX, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying #159 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/25/2016. (gsg)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #151 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/25/16. (mll, )
May 25, 2016 Filing 177 CORRECTED REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Danny)
May 25, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 173, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 25, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY HAS REFILED UNSEALED (SEE #177 Reply). Document # 172, Sealed Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #154 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/16. (mll, )
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #149 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/16. (mll, )
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying #150 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/24/16. (mll, )
May 24, 2016 Filing 173 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re #159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 5/25/2016 (sm, ).
May 24, 2016 Filing 172 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 5/25/2016 (sm, ).
May 23, 2016 Filing 171 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #154 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response Letter Brief)(Justin S. Cohen)
May 23, 2016 Filing 170 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #153 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response Letter Brief)(Justin S. Cohen)
May 23, 2016 Filing 169 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #151 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Response Letter Brief)(Justin S. Cohen)
May 23, 2016 Filing 168 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #149 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC Filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response Letter Brief)(Williams, Danny)
May 23, 2016 Filing 167 RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #150 Filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Justin)
May 23, 2016 Filing 166 RESPONSE to #152 SEALED Defendants' Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, Filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Justin)
May 23, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 165, Notice of Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 20, 2016 Filing 165 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 5/23/2016 (sm, ).
May 20, 2016 Filing 164 RESPONSE in Opposition re #159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
May 18, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher D Bright on behalf of AMX, LLC (Bright, Christopher)
May 17, 2016 Filing 162 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): #161 Sealed Response to Motion,,,.. (Wynne, Richard)
May 16, 2016 Filing 161 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- NDA, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Provisional, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Boenke Tr., #4 Exhibit 4 -- Cummings Tr., #5 Exhibit 5 -- Austermann Tr., #6 Exhibit 6 -- 250 patent reexam cert., #7 Exhibit 7 -- 250 reexam office action, #8 Exhibit 8 -- 250 patent claims, #9 Exhibit 9 -- 250 reexam interview request, #10 Exhibit 10 -- fax in advance of interview, #11 Exhibit 11 -- Interview summary, #12 Exhibit 12 -- Office action response excerpts, #13 Exhibit 13 -- Declaration in 250 Reexam, #14 Exhibit 14 -- Notice of intent to issue reexam cert., #15 Exhibit 15 -- Noble tr., #16 Exhibit 16 -- Chrimar interrog response excerpts, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re #159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees. The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on this matter as follows: Chrimar shall file any response in opposition by 5-20-2016; Defendants shall file any reply by 5-24-2016; Chrimar shall file any sur-reply by 5-27-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/16/16. (mll, )
May 13, 2016 Filing 159 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Chrimar's California Damages Expert Report, Expedited Briefing, and Attorneys' Fees by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #129 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Mediation Settlement Agreement with the Alcatel-Lucent Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/12/16. (mll, )
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/12/16. (mll, )
May 11, 2016 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For the Production of Patent Prosecution Files and Deposition of Prosecuting Attorneys by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 10, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing Proceedings held on 4/19/16, before Judge Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawna Gauntt-Hicks, Telephone number: 903/276-1090. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2016. (dlc, )
May 9, 2016 Filing 154 SEALED Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willfulness filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letter Brief re Willfulness MSJ)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 153 SEALED Letter Brief regarding Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Mills filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letter Brief re Daubert of Damages Expert Mills)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 152 SEALED Letter Brief re Motion to Strike Undisclosed Expert Opinions filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letter Brief re Mtn to Strike Undisclosed Expert Opinions)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 151 Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to 35 USC Sec. 101 filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letter Brief re 101 MSJ)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 150 Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of '012 Patent filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Letter Brief re MSJ Invalidity of '012)(Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2016 Filing 149 Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Justin)
May 2, 2016 Filing 148 RESPONSE to #145 Notice (Other) of Correction to the Markman Hearing Record filed by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164), Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bluestone, David)
April 27, 2016 Filing 147 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #129 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Mediation Settlement Agreement with the Alcatel-Lucent Defendants filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
April 26, 2016 Filing 146 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluestone, David)
April 26, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction to the Markman Hearing Record (Cohen, Justin)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/25/16. (mll, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 143 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patel, Vishal)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Leave to Amend Elections. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/19/16. (mll, )
April 19, 2016 Filing 141 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AMX, LLC for proceedings held on 4/19/2016 Evidentiary Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Jones, Michael)
April 19, 2016 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/19/2016. (Court Reporter Shauna Hicks.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
April 18, 2016 Filing 139 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #129 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Mediation Settlement Agreement with the Alcatel-Lucent Defendants filed by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Chris Cravey, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chris Cravey, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chris Cravey, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chris Cravey, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Chris Cravey, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Chris Cravey, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
April 18, 2016 Filing 138 Joint MOTION to Amend Preliminary Elections by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/13/16. (mll, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 136 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Authorize Deposition of Michael McCormack After Discovery Deadline by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
April 8, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert S McArthur on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (McArthur, Robert)
April 8, 2016 Filing 134 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED FILING #135 .***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert S McArthur on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (McArthur, Robert) Modified on 4/8/2016 (mjc, ).
April 8, 2016 Filing 133 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen C Steinberg on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Steinberg, Stephen)
April 8, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Lindgren on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Lindgren, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric W Benisek on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Benisek, Eric)
April 8, 2016 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Vasquez on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Vasquez, Richard)
April 8, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #134 Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING #135 .*** (mjc, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 129 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Mediation Settlement Agreement with the Alcatel-Lucent Defendants by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Richard Rodgers terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/2016. (gsg)
March 30, 2016 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Matthew R. Rodgers) by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 29, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vishal Hemant Patel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patel, Vishal)
March 29, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dominguez, Adrienne)
March 29, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyung Tai Kim on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Kim, Kyung)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, ORDER re #97 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/28/2016. (gsg)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/28/2016. (gsg)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner terminated as attorney of record for Defendant AMX, LLC. Further ordered that ECF notices be terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/23/16. (mjc, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 3/10/16 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (sms, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 21, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #103 , Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING #104 .*** (mjc, )
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/16/16. (mll, )
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Entry of Prior Orders re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record ; denying #102 Motion to Strike #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/10/16. (mjc, )
March 10, 2016 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 3/10/2016, Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2016 re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
March 10, 2016 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2016 re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (PLEASE REFER TO ORIGINAL MINUTE ENTRY, #116) (mjm, )
March 10, 2016 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2016 re #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (PLEASE REFER TO ORIGINAL MINUTE ENTRY NUMBER 116) (mjm, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Thames, Earl)
March 7, 2016 Filing 114 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Williams, Danny)
March 7, 2016 Filing 113 SUR-REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164), Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Bluestone, David)
March 4, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Baxter Decl. Excerpts)(Wynne, Richard)
March 3, 2016 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 3, 2016 Filing 110 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. The Court ORDERS an expedited response on this Motion to be filed no later than 3-03-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/29/16. (mll, )
February 29, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record, #102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions: Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
February 25, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY to #100 Responsive Claim Construction Brief, filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Justin)
February 25, 2016 Filing 107 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (Wynne, Richard)
February 25, 2016 Filing 106 Joint Claim Construction Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
February 25, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
February 22, 2016 Filing 104 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES #103 .***REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 3/21/2016 (mjc, ).
February 22, 2016 Filing 103 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE #104 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT.***REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11)(Williams, Danny) Modified on 3/21/2016 (mjc, ).
February 19, 2016 Filing 102 Opposed MOTION to Strike #100 Claim Construction Brief, Motion to Strike Untimely Claim-Construction Positions by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Defendants PR 4-1 Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Defendants PR 4-2 Disclosures, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
February 18, 2016 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
February 18, 2016 Filing 100 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Williams, Danny)
February 11, 2016 Filing 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Due to Indefiniteness by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
February 10, 2016 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Justin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2016: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
February 4, 2016 Filing 97 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Patent No. 8,155,012, #2 Exhibit B: Patent No. 8,942,107, #3 Exhibit C: Patent No. 8,902,760, #4 Exhibit D: Patent No. 9,019,838, #5 Exhibit E: Declaration of Les Baxter, #6 Exhibit F: Excerpt of Deposition of Rich Seifert, #7 Exhibit G: Excerpt of App. for Patent No. 8,155,012)(Justin S. Cohen)
February 4, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. -- Defendants' Notice of Submission of Technical Tutorial -- (Jones, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #89 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a motion for summary judgment as to indefiniteness. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 94 Letter Brief filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cohen, Justin)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/28/16. (mll, )
January 27, 2016 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #41 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
January 27, 2016 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent S.A. for Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Wooten, David)
January 26, 2016 Filing 90 Opposed MOTION Entry of Prior Orders on Claim Construction and Related Record by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
January 15, 2016 Filing 89 Letter Brief filed by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Ltr Brief re MSJ Indefiniteness)(Jones, Michael)
January 13, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Kent Wooten on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Wooten, David)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER appointing David Keyzer to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/07/16. (mll, )
January 7, 2016 Filing 86 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #83 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
January 6, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE by AMX, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv164) Joint Notice of Agreement for Proposed Technical Advisor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Curriculum Vitae of David Keyzer)(Hawkins, Brent)
December 24, 2015 REPLACED/SUBSTITUTED Exhibit B to Document #81 per #84 Order. (mll, )
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk shall substitute Exhibit B attached to the motion #82 in place of the version filed on 12-17-2015 #81 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/23/15. (mll, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 83 AMENDED ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by AMX, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 21, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION to Amend/Correct #81 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement AND Substitute Exhibit B by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent S.A, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (corrected))(Bluestone, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2015: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
December 17, 2015 Filing 81 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under P.R. 4-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Plaintiffs' Proposed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B -- Defendants' Proposed Constructions)(Wynne, Richard) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/24/2015) (mll, ).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting (as modified) #64 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/03/15. (mll, )
November 20, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Williams, Danny)
November 20, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AMX, LLC regarding Compliance with PR 4-2 (Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/20/2015. (gsg)
November 19, 2015 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions to Defendant ALE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall file under seal 72 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel Inspection and Testing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/17/15. (mll, ) Modified on 11/17/2015 (mll, ).
November 16, 2015 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 72 Reply to Response to Motion by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
November 13, 2015 Filing 73 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 72 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 -- Declaration of Richard Wynne, #2 Exhibit 11 -- AMX Price List (Annotated))(Wynne, Richard)
November 9, 2015 Filing 71 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #70 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Noble, #2 Ex. A Price List 11.6.15)(Gardner, Allen)
November 9, 2015 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 MOTION to Compel Inspection and Testing of AMX's Accused Products filed by AMX, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Nguyen, #2 Ex. 1 2015-10-30 Ltr. from D. Bluestone to J. Cohen re Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/09/15. (mll, )
November 5, 2015 Filing 68 REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Partially Settled(Knowles, James)
November 5, 2015 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions to Defendant AMX by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
October 30, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AMX, LLC Statement of Damages (Hawkins, Brent)
October 26, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AMX, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Hawkins, Brent)
October 26, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION to Compel Inspection and Testing of AMX's Accused Products by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
October 23, 2015 Filing 63 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** MOTION to Compel an Inspection of AMX's Accused Products by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 10/26/2015 (mll, ).
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES entered, granting #61 Motion for E-Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/28/15. (mjc, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Enter Proposed E-Discovery Order by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
September 16, 2015 Filing 60 ANSWER to #53 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim s of AMX by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
September 16, 2015 Filing 59 ANSWER to #52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim s of ALE USA Inc. by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
September 16, 2015 Filing 58 ANSWER to #51 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim s of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. and Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
September 1, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. regarding compliance with Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order and Local Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Wynne, Richard)
September 1, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AMX, LLC regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
September 1, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, Danny)
September 1, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. re Service of Initial Disclosures (Williams, Danny)
August 26, 2015 Filing 53 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by AMX, LLC.(Bluestone, David)
August 26, 2015 Filing 52 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc..(Williams, Danny)
August 26, 2015 Filing 51 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc..(Williams, Danny)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/21/15. (mll, )
August 20, 2015 Filing 49 Joint MOTION TO ENTER PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin)
August 20, 2015 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AMX, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Harman International Industries, Incorporated for AMX, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/20/15. (mll, )
August 18, 2015 Filing 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints Adding Patents.. (Wynne, Richard)
August 18, 2015 Filing 45 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints Adding Patents.. (Wynne, Richard)
August 18, 2015 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaints Adding Patents by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 18, 2015 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against AMX, LLC, filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- 012 Patent, #2 Exhibit B -- 107 Patent, #3 Exhibit C -- 760 Patent, #4 Exhibit D -- 838 Patent)(Wynne, Richard)
August 18, 2015 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- 012 Patent, #2 Exhibit B -- 107 Patent, #3 Exhibit C -- 760 Patent, #4 Exhibit D -- 838 Patent)(Wynne, Richard)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 11-13-2015; Second Mediation Completion due by 7/1/2016. Early Damages Expert/Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/19/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 10/3/2016 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Markman Hearing set for 3/10/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/14/15. (mll, )
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/14/15. (mll, )
August 13, 2015 Filing 39 Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery Order by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 13, 2015 Filing 38 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 1, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, James Knowles, filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Wynne, Richard)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER assigning case to Judge John D Love by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/31/15. (mll, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 35 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, )
July 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
July 28, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Jones, Michael)
July 21, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David H Bluestone on behalf of AMX, LLC (Bluestone, David)
July 17, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 (Wynne, Richard)
July 15, 2015 Filing 31 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Complaint by AMX, LLC (Doc. No. 19 in -164 case) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
July 15, 2015 Filing 30 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
July 15, 2015 Filing 29 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
July 7, 2015 Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 01:30 PM in Marshall before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. (gsg)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/7/2015. (gsg)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues -- except venue -- with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 6:15-CV-00163. All parties are instructed to file any future filings except relating to venue in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Counsel who has appeared pro hac vice in any member case may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case without filing an additional application to appear pro hac vice in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/25/15. (mll, )
June 29, 2015 Consolidated Defendants added: AMX LLC (6:15cv164). (mll, )
June 24, 2015 Filing 26 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc..(Williams, Danny)
June 24, 2015 Filing 25 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc..(Williams, Danny)
June 16, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Cohen, Justin)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Motion Denied as Moot #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/10/2015. (gsg)
June 8, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Alcatel-Lucent S.A. (Cohen, Justin)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER STAYING CASE. This civil action 6:13-CV-163 is STAYED pending resolution of case number 6:13-CV-880. Within ten days of resolution of case number 6:13-CV-880, the parties shall confer and provide the Court a proposal for how to proceed with case number 6:13-CV-163. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/19/15. (mll, )
May 7, 2015 Filing 20 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Complaint filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Cohen, Justin)
April 30, 2015 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Peschel, #2 Ex F - July 7, 2014 Email from Matt Rodgers to Tim Krieger, #3 Declaration of B. Hawkins)(Jones, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Complaint filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dkt. No. 171 in Orion I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
April 13, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Rodgers on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Rodgers, Matthew)
April 13, 2015 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent China Huaxin, Corporate Parent China Infotech (Luxembourg) S.A., Corporate Parent Alcatel-Lucent S.A. for Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
April 13, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leisa Talbert Peschel on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Peschel, Leisa)
April 13, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Cravey, Christopher)
April 13, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. (Williams, Danny)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss ; Responses due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/10/15. (mll, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of Complaint by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
April 6, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE by Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss (Williams, Danny)
April 6, 2015 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent for Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Williams, Danny)
March 30, 2015 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015; Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. served on 3/16/2015, answer due 4/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service)(gsg)
March 27, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leisa Peschel ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Peschel Ex A - 062714 Ltr from T Krieger to M Rogers, #3 Peschel Ex B - 011414 ChriMar accused products, #4 Peschel Ex C - 042914 Ltr from M Rogers to T Krieger, #5 Peschel Ex D - 050814 Ltr from T Krieger to M Rogers, #6 Peschel Ex E - Orion Order, #7 Neil Anderson Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #8 Ex. A - 6-27-14 Ltr from T Krieger to M Yungwirth, #9 Ex. B- 2014 04 23 - Yungwirth letter to Timothy Krieger re_ ChriMar_s IC..., #10 Ex. C - 2014 4 30 Ltr from T Krieger to M Yungwirth, #11 Ex. D - Orion Order, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 12, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent S.A, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard W Hoffmann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoffmann, Richard)
March 9, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wynne, Richard)
March 9, 2015 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5089122.), filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 US PTO Notice, Form AO120)(Cohen, Justin)
March 6, 2015 Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Cohen, Justin)
March 6, 2015 Filing 1 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. ATTY TO REFILE AND LINK TO DEFENDANTS.***COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5088665.), filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Alcatel-Lucent S.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 AO120 PTO Notice)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 3/9/2015 (mjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrimar Systems, Inc. et al v. Alcatel-Lucent S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent S.A
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Richard Rodgers
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Leisa Talbert Peschel
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Kyung Tai Kim
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Richard Rodgers
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Leisa Talbert Peschel
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Kyung Tai Kim
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Richard Rodgers
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: Leisa Talbert Peschel
Represented By: Robert S McArthur
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Teri Hong-Phuc Nguyen
Represented By: Jeffrey T Lindgren
Represented By: Greg Harlan Parker
Represented By: Kyung Tai Kim
Represented By: Richard C Vasquez
Represented By: Stephen C Steinberg
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Eric W Benisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrimar Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrimar Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Vishal Hemant Patel
Represented By: Justin S. Cohen
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: David Curtis Schulte
Represented By: Richard W Hoffmann
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrimar Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Vishal Hemant Patel
Represented By: Justin S. Cohen
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: David Curtis Schulte
Represented By: Richard W Hoffmann
Represented By: Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AMX, LLC
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Christopher D Bright
Represented By: Teri Hong-Phuc Nguyen
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Brent Allen Hawkins
Represented By: Richard C Vasquez
Represented By: David H Bluestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: James Knowles
Represented By: James W Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?