Realtime Data LLC v. Actian Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC doing business as IXO
Defendant: Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and David Keyzer
Consolidated Defendant: BMC Software, Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., Dell Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Teradata Corporation and Teradata Operations, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Realtime Data LLC
Case Number: 6:2015cv00463
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120), after disposition. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rlf)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 656 FINAL JUDGMENT. It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/6/2017. (rlf)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Civil Action 6:15cv468 is SEVERED from this Lead Consolidated Case per #655 Order vacating consolidation. Consolidated Defendant Riverbed Technology Inc is terminated from this civil action, and all future pleadings related to Civil Action 6:15cv468 should be filed in that case only.*** (mll, )
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER that the Consolidation Order #16 is now VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/12/17. (mll, ) Modified on 10/13/2017 (mll, ).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 654 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Riverbed)(Folsom, David)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 653 RESPONSE to Motion re #652 MOTION to Strike #650 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MOTION to Strike #650 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 651 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #628 MOTION to Alter Judgment Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Disregard Jury's Superfluous Invalidity Findings that Violate the Court's Instructions filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 650 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #633 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Claims 1 and 14 of the '530 Patent Are Not Invalid filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DX-081 - Franaszek, #2 Exhibit B - IPR2016-00375, Paper No. 8, #3 Exhibit C - IPR2016-00972, Paper No. 24)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 649 RESPONSE to #629 Trial Brief SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO RIVERBED'S BENCH BRIEF ON EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 648 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Claim 1 of the '513 Patent filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Wang, Philip)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #640 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to mediate with Judge Folsom is extended until 9-13-2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/31/17. (mll, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #642 Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED FILING #645 .*** (mjc, )
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 646 REPLY to Response to Motion re #633 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Claims 1 and 14 of the '530 Patent Are Not Invalid filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Wang, Philip)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 645 RESPONSE to #629 Trial Brief - Riverbed's Reply in Support filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 644 REPLY to Response to Motion re #631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Claim 1 of the '513 Patent filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DX-014)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 643 REPLY to Response to Motion re #630 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED FILING AT #645 .***REPLY to Response to Motion re #631 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Claim 1 of the '513 Patent filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/31/2017 (mjc, ).
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 641 REPLY to Response to Motion re #628 MOTION to Alter Judgment Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Disregard Jury's Superfluous Invalidity Findings that Violate the Court's Instructions filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Wang, Philip)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Joint MOTION Extend Mediation Deadline by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 639 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document Declaration of Christian W. Conkle: #638 Response to Non-Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Conkle, Christian)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 638 RESPONSE to #629 Trial Brief PLAINTIFF REALTIME DATA LLCS OPPOSITION TO RIVERBEDS BENCH BRIEF ON EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 637 RESPONSE in Opposition re #633 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Claims 1 and 14 of the '530 Patent Are Not Invalid filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Reader Expert Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 636 RESPONSE in Opposition re #628 MOTION to Alter Judgment Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Disregard Jury's Superfluous Invalidity Findings that Violate the Court's Instructions filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 635 SEALED Opposition to Riverbed's Post-Trial Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Claim 1 of the '513 Patent #631 filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Phillip X. Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Wang, Philip) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2017: #14 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 634 RESPONSE in Opposition re #630 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Claims 1 and 14 of the '530 Patent Are Not Invalid by Realtime Data LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Riverbed's SEALED Appendix in Support of Its Post-Trial Briefs (Attachments: #1 Appendix I (App. 001-124), #2 Appendix II (App. 125-287), #3 Appendix III (App. 288-353), #4 Appendix IV (App. 354-500)) (Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Claim 1 of the '513 Patent by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468*** MOTION for Entry of Judgment by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***TRIAL BRIEF on Equitable Estoppel by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468*** MOTION to Alter Judgment Rule 59(e) Motion to Amend Judgment to Disregard Jury's Superfluous Invalidity Findings that Violate the Court's Instructions by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip X. Wang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting #625 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/17. (mll, )
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL SCHEDULE. Parties shall contact the Honorable David Folsom to schedule a mediation conference to be completed within 45 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 06/23/17. (mll, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liao, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #602 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Pickens, James) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR POST-TRIAL MOTIONS by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER denying as moot #573 Joint Motion to Amend the Pretrial Schedule; #583 Sealed Motion to Clarify, or in the Alternative for Reconsideration of, the Court's Ruling on Riverbed's Hearsay Objections to PX-168 AND PX-193; AND, #590 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Resolution of Dispute Regarding Pretrial Order and Associated Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/19/2017. (rlf)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***REPLY to Response to Motion re #602 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from DX-014)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***RESPONSE in Opposition re #602 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Afternoon Session held on May 26, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Morning Session held on May 26, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Afternoon Session held on May 25, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Morning Session held on May 25, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PM Session held on May 24, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas). Modified on 9/26/2017 (dlc, ).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Morning Session held on May 24, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Afternoon Session held on May 23, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial - Morning Session held on May 23, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial - Afternoon Session held on May 22, 2017 before Judge Robert Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial -Morning Session held on May 22, 2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (dkm, ) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***SEALED Jury Notes. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Redacted (foreperson's name) Verdict Form. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Sealed Verdict Form. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Defendant's Final Admitted Exhibit List. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Plaintiff's Final Admitted Exhibit List. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Jury Instructions. (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Minute Entry for day five of trial held and completed on 5/26/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ***SEE MEMBER CASE*** 6:15cv468 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Agreed Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: #1 Verdict Form)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Minute Entry for day four of trial held on 5/25/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Minute Entry for day three of trial held on 5/24/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15CV468*** Proposed Jury Instructions by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 7/6/2017 (bas).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Minute Entry for day two of trial held on 5/23/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this Court. All objections are OVERRULED and Riverbed's Motion #437 is DENIED as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #512 . Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/23/17. (mll, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court ADOPTS the findings of the United States Magistrate Judge as the findings of this Court. All objections are OVERRULED and the Court finds that no construction is necessary for the phrases as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judge's Order #555 . Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/23/17. (mll, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this Court. Riverbed's Motion #436 is DENIED, and specifically DENIED with respect to U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530 and U.S. Patent No. 9,116,908 as set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation #556 . Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/23/17. (mll, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 582, Motion to Clarify. PLEASE IGNORE. See #583 Motion to Clarify for corrected pleading*** (mll, )
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ***SEE MEMBER CASE 6:15cv468***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Jury Selection and first day of trial held on 5/22/2017. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas) Modified on 7/5/2017 (bas, ).
May 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 591 RESPONSE to Motion re #590 MOTION Request for Resolution of Dispute Regarding Pretrial Order and Associated Documents (Verdict Form, Jury Instructions filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jay Chung email)(McComas, Debra)
May 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION Request for Resolution of Dispute Regarding Pretrial Order and Associated Documents (Verdict Form, Jury Instructions by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Proposed Pretrial Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 170520 Realtime v. Riverbed - Amended Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Riverbed Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Realtime Depo Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Riverbed's Second Amended Deposition Designations, #5 Exhibit E -170519 RT 5th Amended Exhibit List, #6 Exhibit F - Riverbed's Third Amended Trial Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit G - Realtime v Riverbed 2d Am Proposed Joint Jury Instructions, #8 Exhibit H - Realtime's Jury Verdict Form, #9 Exhibit I - Riverbeds Jury Verdict Form)(Chung, C.)
May 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 588 SEALED RESPONSE to #583 Realtime's Sealed Motion to Clarify, or in the Alternative for Reconsideration, Regarding the Court's Ruling on Riverbed's Hearsay Objection to PX-168 and PX-193 filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PX-0168, #2 Exhibit B - PX-0193, #3 Exhibit C - PX-0194, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from McErlain Deposition Transcript, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS DESIGNATIONS AND ORDER TO RESPOND TO #583 Realtime's Motion to Clarify. Riverbed is ORDERED to file a Response to Realtimes Motion by May 20, 2017 at NOON. Court defers ruling on #492 FINDINGS OF UNDISPUTED FACT IN MARKING OPINION AS IT RELATES TO PARTIES STIPULATION OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. In light of other developments to the parties disputes, they are ORDERED to submit an amended Joint Pretrial Filing by May 20, 2017 at NOON that provides the remaining issues to be tried in the case, including an updated list of patents and asserted claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/19/2017. (rlf)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 587 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on 05/19/2017 Second Pre Trial Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Wang, Philip)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/19/2017. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2017: #1 Appendix) (srb, ).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO #510 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All objections are OVERRULED and Riverbed's #440 Motion to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher is DENIED-IN-PART and specifically DENIED with respect to Realtime's allegedly new infringement theories as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judges Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/19/2017. (rlf)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Second Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Riverbed's Second Amended Exhibit List)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 SEALED MOTION Realtime's Motion to Clarify, or in the Alternative for Reconsideration, Regarding the Court's Ruling on Riverbed's Hearsay Objection to PX-168 and PX-193 by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conkle, Christian)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MOTION re #551 Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion in Limine,,,, MOTION TO CLARIFY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR RECONSIDERATION, REGARDING THE COURT'S RULING ON RIVERBED'S HEARSAY OBJECTION TO PX-168 AND PX-193 by Realtime Data LLC. (Conkle, Christian)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 581 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Claim Construction Presentation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sivinski, Stephanie)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #574 Notice (Other) OBJECTIONS TO RIVERBEDS AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Conkle, Christian)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 PLAINTIFF REALTIME DATA LLCS RESPONSE TO RIVERBEDS OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON RIVERBEDS MOTION TO STRIKE INFRINGEMENT THEORIES AND TESTING FROM THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. MITZENMACHER (DKT. NO. 542) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 578 SEALED RESPONSE by Realtime Data LLC to Riverbed's Objections to Report and Recommendations of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Direct and Indirect Infringement #552 Notice (Other) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2017: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC AMENDED PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Amended Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Designation Objections and Counter Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Objections to Amended Exhibit List)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Proposed Jury Instructions by Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. re #566 Notice (Other) Correction of Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Corrected Amended Deposition Designations)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Joint MOTION to Amend Pretrial Schedule by Realtime Data LLC. (Conkle, Christian)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER UNSEALING COURT ORDERS AT DOCKET NOS. #538 , #555 AND #556 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/15/2017. (rlf)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER ADOPTING #492 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All objections are OVERRULED and #438 Riverbed's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages is DENIED as set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/15/2017. (rlf)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER ADOPTING #499 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. All objections are OVERRULED and #436 Riverbed's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement is DENIED-IN-PART, and specifically DENIED with respect to U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513 as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/15/2017. (rlf)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 569 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference - Amended held on May 4, 2017 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017. (dkm, )
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO #485 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All objections are OVERRULED and #441 Riverbed's to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judge's Order #485 . Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/15/2017. (rlf)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO #482 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All objections are OVERRULED and #443 Riverbed's Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART as set forth herein and in the Magistrate Judges Order #482 . Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/15/2017. (rlf)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Amended Pretrial Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Deposition Designations)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Lodging Deposition Designations (Mirzaie, Reza)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Exhibit List , Fourth Amended by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER GRANTING #525 Riverbed's MOTION in Limine 1. Counsel may approach the bench to address the admissibility of such testimony at such time Realtime believes proper foundation for the testimony has been laid. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/12/2017. (rlf)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE by BMC Software, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., SAP America, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Bittner, Michael)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 561 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Joint Pretrial Hearing held on May 4, 2017 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darlene K. May,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2017. (dkm, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 560 SEALED RESPONSE by Realtime Data LLC to #531 Riverbed's Objections to Report and Recommendation on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 559 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Regarding Sealed Orders (Dkts. 538, 555, 556) (Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/8/2017. (rlf)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING the portion of #440 Riverbed's Motion that remains pending, and specifically DENYING Riverbed's Motion with respect to Dr. Mitzenmacher's allegedly irrelevant testing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/8/2017. (rlf)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #572 .***SEALED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the pending portion of #436 Defendant Riverbed Technology, Inc.s (Riverbed) Motion for Summary Judgement of Non-Infringement be DENIED. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Report and Recommendation, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Report and Recommendation can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/5/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/15/2017 (rlf).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #572 .***SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re disputed claim phrase in U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530 and U.S. Patent No. 9,116,908. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Report and Recommendation, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Report and Recommendation can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/5/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/8/2017 (rlf). Modified on 5/15/2017 (rlf).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER GRANTING #525 Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/5/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/8/2017 (rlf).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra J McComas on behalf of Riverbed Technology, Inc. (McComas, Debra)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 512, Report and Recommendation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER regarding Motions in Limine and Objections to Exhibits. Court granting in part, denying in part, and deferring on ruling #525 Sealed Defendant's Motion in Limine and #527 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine as listed in order. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer pursuant to the Courts instructions regarding exhibits. Realtime is ORDERED to pay all fees and costs for a 1-hour supplemental deposition of Mr. Carter with respect to his supplemental rebuttal expert report. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/4/2017. (rlf, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER SETTING SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ADDITIONS TO PARTIES' PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Second Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2017 10:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/4/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/4/2017 (rlf).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/4/2017. (Court Reporter Darlene May) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2017: #1 Appendix) (srb, ).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 548 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on May 4, 2017 Pre-Trial Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Hoffman, Adam)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 STIPULATION Regarding Additional Motions in Limine by Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Agreed Motions in Limine (Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Exhibit List REALTME DATA LLCS OBJECTIONS TO RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC.S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Exhibit List REALTIME DATA LLCS THIRD AMENDED EXHIBT LIST by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Trial Time Estimates (Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 510, Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC Estimates of Amount of Time Needed at Trial (Pickens, James)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 SEALED RESPONSE to #511 Riverbed's Sealed Objections to Magistrate's Opinion and Order filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickens, James)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER UNSEALING COURT ORDERS AT DOCKET NOs #499 , #510 and #512 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/2/2017. (rlf)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #572 .***SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES #514 Riverbeds Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Arthur Keller and Mr. Robert Mills Based on Improper Apportionment. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Order, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Order can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/1/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/15/2017 (rlf).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER RESETTING JURY SELECTION. Jury Selection is reset for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/1/2017. (rlf)
April 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 536 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #535 Sealed Document, Notice of Reordered Pages for the Zeger Declaration Filed at Dkt. No. 535-1 (Attachments: #1 Zeger Declaration)(Wang, Philip)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Doc. 516 and Doc. 535 are set for 5/4/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srb)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Sealed Document. Responsive Claim Construction Brief Regardingthe Occurs Faster Limitation of the 530 and 908 Patents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Wang, Philip) REALTIME DATA LLC d/b/a IXO,
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 534 SEALED RESPONSE to #527 Realtime's Motions in Limine, filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Detwiler Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Project Remix Teaser, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 533 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #525 PLAINTIFF REALTIME DATA LLCS RESPONSE TO RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY,INC.S MOTIONS IN LIMINE SEALED MOTION filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF PAUL KROEGER, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Kroeger, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2017: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2017 (slo, ). Modified on 4/28/2017 (slo, ).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #498 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF REALTIME DATA LLC'S RESPONSE TO RIVERBED'S OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. MITZENMACHER'S EXPERT REPORT ON DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS AND INDIRECT INFRINGEMENT (Kroeger, Paul)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 499, Report and Recommendation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Agreed Proposed Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #513 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Robert Mills Regarding Convoyed Sales filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/27/2017. (rlf)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Noelle Sivinski on behalf of Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Sivinski, Stephanie)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 MOTION in Limine by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #520 Motion in Limine submitted -- no certificate of conference. Correction should be made by within (1) business day (rlf)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 523, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ***REPLACES # 523***Sealed Document. REALTIME DATA LLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING ITS SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF MR. ROBERT MILLS re #493 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reza Mirzaie, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 4/26/2017 (ch, ).
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 518, Response in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Padian Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Detwiler Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reader Expert Rpt. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Realtime's Am. Trial Witness List, #5 Exhibit 5 - McErlain Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fallon Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #514 MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Reports of Dr. Keller and Mr. Mills Based on Improper Apportionment filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reza Mirazie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Sealed Document. REALTIME DATA LLCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING ITS SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE THE EXPERT REPORT OF MR. ROBERT MILLS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reza Mirazie, #2 Exhibit 1)(Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 4/26/2017 (ch, ).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 STIPULATION REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #520 MOTIONS in Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 Part 1 of 3, #12 Exhibit 11 Part 2 of 3, #13 Exhibit 11 Part 3 of 3, #14 Exhibit 12)(Kroeger, Paul)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION in Limine by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) Modified on 4/26/2017 (rlf).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 RESPONSE in Opposition re #513 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Robert Mills Regarding Convoyed Sales filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 ***PLEASE USE CORRECTED ORDER***Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2017: #2 Text of Proposed Order CORRECTED PROPOSED ORDER) (ch, ). Modified on 4/25/2017 (ch, ).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***RESPONSE in Opposition re #513 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Robert Mills Regarding Convoyed Sales filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 4/25/2017 (ch, ).
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Each side is limited to designating 250 exhibits for trial absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/21/2017. (rlf)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Villasenor Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Villasenor Expert Report Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 2 - 12/28/2007 Reply to Office Action, #4 Exhibit 3 - 530 Patent (highlighted), #5 Exhibit 4 - 937 Patent, #6 Exhibit 5 - 937 Patent Reexamination Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 6 - Graf Dictionary Excerpt, #8 Exhibit 7 - McDaniel Dictionary Excerpt, #9 Exhibit 8 - IEEE Dictionary Excerpt)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Regarding Sealed Orders (Dkts. 499, 510, 512) (Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Reports of Dr. Keller and Mr. Mills Based on Improper Apportionment by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Robert Mills Regarding Convoyed Sales by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #539 .***SEALED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #437 Defendant Riverbed Technology, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgement on Direct and Indirect Infringement be DENIED. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Report and Recommendation, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Report and Recommendation can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Judge John D. Love on 4/19/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/2/2017 (rlf).
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #507 Motion to Strike and #508 Motion to Strike submitted. Certificate of conference required. Correction should be made by within one business day. (rlf)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 511 SEALED NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 492, Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #539 .***SEALED ORDER denying in part #440 Motion to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/17. (mll, ) Modified on 5/2/2017 (rlf).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Riverbed's SEALED Third Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motions to Strike: #507 #508 (Attachments: #1 Part VII (App. 1155-1358))(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Mr. Robert Mills Regarding Convoyed Sales by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 4/19/2017 (rlf).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Strike the Supplemental Expert Reports of Dr. Keller and Mr. Mills Based on Improper Apportionment by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 4/19/2017 (rlf).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Conkle, Christian)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC REALTIME'S PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mirzaie, Reza)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 4/11/2017 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2017. (sms, )
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 502, REALTIME'S PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney to refile.*** (rlf)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Riverbed's Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibit List)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.***NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC REALTIME'S PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 4/17/2017 (rlf).
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS #491 and #492 Sealed Memorandum Opinions and Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/13/2017. (rlf)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Second Mediation - suspended (Riverbed Technology, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #539 .***SEALED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that #436 Defendant Riverbed Technology, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement be DENIED-IN-PART, and specifically be DENIED with respect to U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Report and Recommendation, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Report and recommendation can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/13/2017. (rlf) Modified on 5/2/2017 (rlf).
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 485, Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER for parties to submit claim construction arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2017. (gsg)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2017 re #436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc., #440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc., #437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2017: #1 Appendix) (srb, ).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER to UNSEAL COURT'S MEMORANDUM OPINIONS AND ORDERS #481 , #482 AND #485 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/10/2017. (rlf)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Regarding Sealed Orders (Dkts. 491, 492) (Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. of Objections to Dkt. 482, Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #501 .***SEALED MEMORNDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES Riverbeds Motion for Partial Summary Judgement Barring Pre-Suit Damages. (Doc. No. #438 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/4/2017. (rlf) Modified on 4/13/2017 (rlf).
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #501 .***SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying #433 Plaintiff Realtime's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Invalidity and Marking Expert Clifford Reader. Within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Order, the parties shall file a notice with the Court as to whether this Order can be unsealed, or request appropriate redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/3/2017. (rlf) Modified on 4/13/2017 (rlf).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Regarding Sealed Orders (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 RESPONSE to #488 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Proposed Pretrial Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A (Realtime's Witness List), #2 Ex. B (Riverbed's Witness List), #3 Ex. C (Jury Instructions), #4 Ex. D (Verdict Form))(Chung, C.)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 PREQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS/REAL TIME REPORTING by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on Each Day of Jury Trial set for May 22, 2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (Chung, C.) Modified on 3/31/2017 (dlc, ).
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #495 ***SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #441 Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/17. (mll, ) Modified on 4/10/2017 (rlf).
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER REGARDING HEARING TIMES. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/29/17. (mll, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 REQUEST for Daily Transcripts/Real Time Reporting by Riverbed Technology, Inc. for proceedings held on Each Day of Jury Trial set for May 22, 2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (Chiarizio, Matthew) Modified on 3/28/2017 (dlc, ).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #495 ***SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying part #443 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/24/17. (mll, ) Modified on 4/10/2017 (rlf).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #495 ***SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying part #442 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/24/17. (mll, ) Modified on 4/10/2017 (rlf).
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 NOTICE by Riverbed Technology, Inc. re #438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages Riverbed's Notice Regarding Laches (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jones, Charles)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip X. Wang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Wang, Philip)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED SUR-REPLY to #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James N. Pickens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Pickens, James)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re #442 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Keller and Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Mills on Apportionment filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO RIVERBED'S #440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Jay Chung, #2 Exhibit 5)(Chung, C.)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pickens, James)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #441 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of PAUL KROEGER, #2 Exhibit 13)(Kroeger, Paul)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #433 MOTION Exclude Opinions of Defendants Invalidity and Marking Expert Dr. Clifford Reader filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Jones, Charles)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills, #441 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement, #436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #433 MOTION Exclude Opinions of Defendants Invalidity and Marking Expert Dr. Clifford Reader , #438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages, #440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher, #442 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Keller and Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Mills on Apportionment, #437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement : Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srb)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Riverbed's SEALED Second Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions to Strike: #467 #468 #469 #470 (Attachments: #1 Part VI (App. 1017-1154))(Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 REPLY to Response to Motion re #436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 REPLY to Response to Motion re #442 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Keller and Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Mills on Apportionment filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 REPLY to Response to Motion re #440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Riverbed's SEALED First Supplemental Appendix in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions to Strike: #465 #463 #464 (Attachments: #1 Part V (App. 982-1016))(Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 REPLY to Response to Motion re #438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REPLY to Response to Motion re #437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REPLY to Response to Motion re #441 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/10/2017. (rlf)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amending the Docket Control Order)(Chung, C.)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #433 MOTION Exclude Opinions of Defendants Invalidity and Marking Expert Dr. Clifford Reader filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Wang, Philip)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER granting #458 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rex Andrew Mann terminated from Defendants EchoStar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/7/2017. (rlf)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel) by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Rex)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #443 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Reza Mirzaei, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF MICHAEL MITZENMACHER, #2 Exhibit OF PHILIP WANG, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF MICHAEL MITZENMACHER, #2 Affidavit OF C. JAY CHUNG, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #442 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Keller and Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Mills on Apportionment filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF REZA MIRZAIE, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 PART 1 OF 2, #4 Exhibit 2 PART 2 OF 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Pickens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickens, James)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF PAUL KROEGER, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #441 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF PAUL KROEGER, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #433 MOTION Exclude Opinions of Defendants Invalidity and Marking Expert Dr. Clifford Reader filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mitzenmacher Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Packeteer Infringement Contentions, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER WITHDRAWING #445 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Villasenor. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/1/2017. (rlf)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #445 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Villasenor (Wang, Philip)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting #439 Motion to Sever and Consolidate. Defendants EchoStar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems, LLC are severed from Lead Case (6:15-cv-463) and the member case (6:15-cv-466) and consolidated into Case No. 6:17-cv-84 for all purposes, and all proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/22/2017. (rlf)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ***Consolidated Defendants ECHOSTAR CORPORATION and HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC are SEVERED from this civil action and CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:17-CV-84.*** (rlf)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Michael Jones, II on behalf of Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Jones, Charles)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #449 *** MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Villasenor by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wang, Philip) Modified on 3/1/2017 (rlf).
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Riverbed's SEALED Omnibus Appendix in Support of its Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions to Strike: #436 #437 #438 #440 #441 #442 #443 (Attachments: #1 Part I (App. 001 - 437), #2 Part II (App. 438 - 520), #3 Part III (App. 521-821), #4 Part IV (App. 822 - 981))(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Mr. Mills by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Keller and Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Mills on Apportionment by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 441 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Mitzenmacher's Expert Report on Doctrine of Equivalents and Indirect Infringement by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theories and Irrelevant Testing from the Expert Report of Dr. Mitzenmacher by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Joint MOTION to Sever AND CONSOLIDATE by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Barring Pre-Suit Damages by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Direct and Indirect Infringement by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION CONCERNING SEVER INTO CASE NO. 6:17-CV-84 AND STAY OF CASE NOS. 6:15-CV-463 AND 6:15-CV-466 AS TO ECHOSTAR/HUGHES by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION CONCERNING ECHOSTAR/HUGHES JUPITER PRODUCTS by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION Exclude Opinions of Defendants Invalidity and Marking Expert Dr. Clifford Reader by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James N Pickens on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Pickens, James)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/9/2017. (rlf)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amending the Docket Control Order)(Riffe, Timothy)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex Andrew Mann on behalf of EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Mann, Rex)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC - Expert Disclosures Under FRCP 26(a)(2) (Riffe, Timothy)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Riverbed Technology, Inc. - Expert Disclosures Under FRCP 26(a)(2) (Chiarizio, Matthew)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #421 Motion to Stay. This case shall proceed in accordance with #420 Amended Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/29/16. (mll, )
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 REPLY to Response to Motion re #421 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Instituted Inter Partes Reviews Of All Asserted Claims filed by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Wesley Samples, #2 Exhibit A: July 31, 2016 PTAB Statistics, #3 Exhibit B: IPRs and Lead Case Trial Dates, #4 Exhibit C: Lex Machina PTAB Time to Decision, #5 Exhibit D: Email, #6 Exhibit E: Email, #7 Exhibit F: First Amended Infringement Contentions Adding Products)(Riffe, Timothy)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 RESPONSE in Opposition re #421 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Instituted Inter Partes Reviews Of All Asserted Claims filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of C. Jay Chung, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Chung, C.)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting #422 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Realtime Data LLC's Response to Defendants' contemporaneously filed Motion to Stay Pending Instituted Inter Partes Reviews of All Asserted Claims be filed by 11-18-2016. Any Replies to the Motion must be filed by 11-21-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/16. (mll, )
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MOTION to Expedite Briefing On Motion To Stay (Dkt. No. 421) by EchoStar Corporation, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riffe, Timothy)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Instituted Inter Partes Reviews Of All Asserted Claims by EchoStar Corporation, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PR2016-01002 DI, #2 Exhibit IPR2016-00972 DI, #3 Exhibit IPR2016-00978 DI, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Riffe, Timothy)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/09/16. (mll, )
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shartzer, Adam)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SEALED TRANSCRIPT - EARLY DAMAGES EXPERT HEARING HELD ON OCTOBER 13, 2016 BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN D. LOVE. COURT REPORTER: SHEA SLOAN, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov (sms, )
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court OVERRULES the objections to #362 Memorandum, Opinion, & Order of the United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/01/16. (mll, )
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court ADOPTS #360 the Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this Court; denying #316 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. All objections are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/01/16. (mll, )
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Final Election of Asserted Prior Art (Samples, John)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC for proceedings held on 10/13/2016 Early Damages Expert Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Shartzer, Adam)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on 10/13/2016 Early Damages Expert Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Henry, Claire)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Second Mediation Completion due by 2/28/2017. Jury Selection set for 5/15/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/19/16. (mll, )
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER entered re #409 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/19/16. (mjc, )
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed DCO)(Chung, C.)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed DCO)(Chung, C.)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Philip X Wang on behalf of Realtime Data LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5985210. (Wang, Philip)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Consolidated Defendant Dell Inc (6:15cv468) SEVERED from this Consolidated Lead Case and CONSOLIDATED with Civil action 6:16cv89.*** (mll, )
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting #404 Motion to Sever; granting #405 Motion to Consolidate. Defendant Dell Inc. is severed from the lead case (6:15-cv-463) and the member case (6:15-cv-468), and this action against Dell is consolidated with the recently-filed action against Dell (6:16-cv-089). The early damages expert hearing scheduled for 10-13-2016 is canceled as between the Moving Parties and this early damages expert hearing is consolidated with the early damages expert hearing scheduled in Case No. 6:16-cv-089 that is set for 7-06-2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/11/16. (mll, ) Modified on 10/12/2016 (mll, ).
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion to Consolidate Early Damages Expert Hearings by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Joint MOTION to Sever and Consolidate by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #397 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is extended until 10-14-2016 to allow Riverbed to depose Brian Detwiler. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/07/16. (mll, )
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 RESPONSE to Motion re #397 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Non-Opposition filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER denying #391 Motion for Leave to Cancel Early Damages Expert Matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/06/16. (mll, )
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NINTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/06/16. (mll, )
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING re #397 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. The Court ORDERS that the following briefing schedule apply: Realtime's Response Due 5:00 p.m. on 10-07-2016; Riverbed's Reply Due 12:00 p.m. on 10-10-2016. No surreply without good cause and leave from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/06/16. (mll, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Extend Discovery by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Emerson, John)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #395 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,, (to Serve Early Damages Reports on the Court) by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 EIGHTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Second Mediation Completion due by 2/28/2017. Early Damages Expert/Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/13/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 5/15/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/03/16. (mll, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #389 Order, Terminate Motions by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER re #391 Joint MOTION for Leave to Cancel Early Damages Matters as to Certain Defendants filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Riverbed Technology, Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, EchoStar Corporation, Realtime Data LLC. The Moving Parties are given leave to file a stipulation consistent with this Order within seven days of the date of this order if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/20/16. (mll, )
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Goutham Rao (Attachments: #1 Deposition Subpoena, #2 Document Subpoena, #3 Attachment A)(Mirzaie, Reza)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Joint MOTION for Leave to Cancel Early Damages Matters as to Certain Defendants by EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to F5 Networks, Inc. To Testify At A Deposition And To Produce Documents (Chung, C.)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SEVENTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/9/2016. (gsg)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #367 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Mandan Tammineedi (Attachments: #1 Deposition Subpoena, #2 Document Subpoena, #3 Attachment A)(Mirzaie, Reza)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Matt Mahoney (Attachments: #1 Deposition Subpoena, #2 Document Subpoena, #3 Attachment A)(Mirzaie, Reza)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 RESPONSE to #370 Objection to Claim Construction, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting #371 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Christopher Carraway terminated as Counsel for Defendant Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/16. (mjc, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #372 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Christopher Carraway terminated as Counsel for Defendants Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. and HP Enterprise Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/16. (mjc, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #374 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garth Alan Winn terminated as Counsel for Defendants Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. and HPEnterprise Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/16. (mjc, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting #373 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Garth Alan Winn terminated as Counsel for Defendant Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/17/16. (mjc, )
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting #377 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kyle B Rinehart terminated as Counsel for Defendants Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. and HP Enterprise Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/16/16. (mjc, )
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #376 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John D Vandenberg terminated as Counsel for Defendants Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. and HP Enterprise Services, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/16/16. (mjc, )
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting #375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John D Vandenberg terminated ac counsel for Defendant Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/16/16. (mjc, )
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Kyle B. Rinehart by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to John D. Vandenberg by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to John D. Vandenberg by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Garth A. Winn by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Garth A. Winn by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to J. Christopher Carraway by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to J. Christopher Carraway by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting #327 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #328 Motion for Joinder. Defendants may seek relief on future deadlines through a meet and confer or from the Court if they believe such relief is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/11/16. (mjc, )
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #320 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #321 Sealed Motion; granting #322 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #326 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants may seek relief on future deadlines through a meet and confer or from the Court if they believe such relief is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/11/16. (mjc, )
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 SIXTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/09/16. (mll, )
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #327 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Invalidity Contentions filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #312 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #358 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Realtime Data LLC and Defendants SAP America Inc. and Sybase Inc. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants and all counterclaims asserted by Defendants against Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice. Further ordered that all claims, defenses, and/or counterclaims brought in 6:15-cv-469 against Hewlett-Packard Co., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, and Dell Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal has no effect on the claims, defenses, and/or counterclaims made by Hewlett-Packard Co., Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, or Dell Inc.against Plaintiff in other actions, including 6:15cv463. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/2/16. (mjc, )
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/2/2016. (gsg)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/28/16. (mll, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #326 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions As To Defendants Echostar Corporation And Hughes Network Systems, LLC, #319 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT DELL INC., #320 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC. filed by Dell Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the United States Magistrate Judge re #316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Riverbed Technology, Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, EchoStar Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Dell Inc. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 316) be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/28/2016. (gsg)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman and Motion Proceedings held on 7/7/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2016. (sms, )
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPLY to Response to Motion re #327 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Invalidity Contentions, #328 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. 327) filed by Dell Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #348 Motion to Supplement the Claim Construction Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/22/16. (mjc, )
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REPLY to Response to Motion re #326 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions As To Defendants Echostar Corporation And Hughes Network Systems, LLC, #319 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT DELL INC., #320 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC. filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re #348 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RECORD filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of C. Jay Chung, #3 Exhibit A)(Mirzaie, Reza)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #327 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Invalidity Contentions, #328 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. 327) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of C. Jay Chung, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Chung, C.)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/14/16. (mll, )
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Oracle America, Inc. for proceedings held on 07/07/2016 Claim Construction Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Smith, Melissa)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on July 7, 2016 Markman Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Henry, Claire)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION RECORD by Dell Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE in Opposition re #326 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions As To Defendants Echostar Corporation And Hughes Network Systems, LLC, #320 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC. filed by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Wesley Samples, #2 Exhibit 1)(Chiarizio, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2016: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RESPONSE in Opposition re #321 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT ORACLE AMERICA, INC. filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hawkinson, #2 Ex 1 2015-09-14 Infringement Contentions, #3 Ex 2 - 2015-12-03 Perez to Counsel enclosing Oracle production, #4 Ex 3 - 2015-12-03 Lantier to Liao re Source Code Inspection, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT DELL INC. filed by Dell Inc., Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. DISREGARD AND SEE ENTRY #345 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re #319 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT DELL INC. filed by Dell Inc., Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/8/2016 (gsg).
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Sever. Case number 6:15-cv-467 is no longer consolidated with lead case number 6:15-cv-463. Case number 6:15-cv-467 is consolidated with case number 6:16-cv-088, and 6:16-cv-088 shall be the lead case in the newly consolidated action. The clerk is instructed to add the consolidated Defendants along with their lead and local counsel to the lead case (6:16-cv-088), and additional counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/07/16. (mll, )
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 7/7/2016, Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2016 re #316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Riverbed Technology, Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, EchoStar Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Dell Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (srb)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Consolidated Defendants Severed and Consolidated with Civil Action 6:16cv088: Oracle America Inc, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co, HP Enterprise Services LLC (6:15cv467). (mll, )
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Oracle America, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Dell Inc.)(Folsom, David)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settlement (SAP America, Inc. and Sybase, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Notice of Supplemental Facts) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PTABs IPR Denial)(Henry, Claire)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC OF DENIAL OF INSTITUTION OF RELATED INTER PARTES REVIEW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 REPLY to Response to Motion re #316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Kim, Olivia)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Institution of Related Inter Partes Review Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER REGARDING MARKMAN HEARING TIME LIMITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/16. (mll, )
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER OF PARTIAL STAY. All deadlines in the above-captioned actions related to Realtimes case against Defendants SAP America, Inc. and Sybase, Inc. are hereby stayed up to and including 8-22-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/28/16. (mll, )
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 14)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 RESPONSE in Opposition re #316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Zeger, #3 Declaration of C. Jay Chung, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Estimated Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Fenster, Marc)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants Motion for Leave to Supplement Their Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. 327) by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Invalidity Contentions by EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 530 v Osterlund, #2 Exhibit B - 530 v Assar, #3 Exhibit C - 530 v Crawford, #4 Exhibit D - 530 v Clark, #5 Exhibit E - 513 v Wang, #6 Exhibit F - 908 v Osterlund, #7 Exhibit G - Email from Emerson to Mirzaie, #8 Exhibit H - Email from Emerson to Mirzaie and Chung, #9 Exhibit I - IPR2016-00980 Petition (992 Patent), #10 Exhibit J - IPR2016-00978 Petition (513 Patent), #11 Exhibit K - IPR2016-00972 Petition (530 Patent), #12 Exhibit L - IPR2016-01002 Petition (908 Patent), #13 Exhibit M - Defendants' Elections of Prior Art, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions As To Defendants Echostar Corporation And Hughes Network Systems, LLC by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #323 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the above-captioned actions related to Realtime's case against SAP are hereby stayed up to and including 8-22-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/16. (mll, )
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Joint MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines as to SAP America, Inc. and Sybase, Inc. by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Joint MOTION to Stay All Case Deadlines as to SAP America, Inc. and Sybase, Inc. by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE CO. AND HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT ORACLE AMERICA, INC. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RIVERBED TECHNOLOGY, INC. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT DELL INC. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF C. JAY CHUNG, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING #303 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Reviews filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Dell Inc., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, HP Enterprise Services, LLC, Sybase, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/14/2016. (gsg)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REPLY to #305 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Actian Corporation, Dell Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dacus, Deron)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Dr. Charles D. Creusere, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Kim, Olivia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2016: #10 Exhibit B - Searchable) (mjc, ).
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #314 Response in Opposition to Motion (Notice of Correction) (Henry, Claire)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #303 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Reviews filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Oracle America, Inc. re #306 Joint MOTION to Sever and Consolidate (Smith, Melissa)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/02/16. (mll, )
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Riffe, Timothy)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting #307 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kyunghoon John Woo terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/27/16. (mll, )
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. Notice of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Smith, Melissa)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Smith, Melissa)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John K. Woo by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woo, Kyunghoon)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Sever and Consolidate by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reza Mirzaie, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mirzaie Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mirzaie Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Mirzaie Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Mirzaie Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Mirzaie Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Mirzaie Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Mirzaie Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Mirzaie Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Mirzaie Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Mirzaie Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Mirzaie Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Mirzaie Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Mirzaie Declaration, #15 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Kenneth Zeger, #16 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dr. Zeger)(Mirzaie, Reza)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC OF SUBMISSION OF TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Henry, Claire)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Reviews by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Dacus, Deron)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER re #296 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., HP Enterprise Services, LLC, EchoStar Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Dell Inc. Request to file motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2016. (gsg)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #289 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Letter Brief filed by Realtime Data LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mirzaie, Reza)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER appointing David Keyzer to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/02/16. (mll, )
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 AGREED NOTICE of Proposed Technical Advisor by Realtime Data LLC re #289 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae of David Keyzer)(Henry, Claire)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Riverbed Technology, Inc)(Folsom, David)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Notice of Compliance with Court's Docket Control Order #197 : Letter Brief filed by Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Vandenberg, John)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #292 Motion to Construe More than 10 Terms. Parties may request that the Court construe up to 18 claims terms. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/18/16. (mll, )
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Fair, Andrea)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Joint MOTION to Construe More Than Ten Terms filed by Plaintiff and by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2016: #2 Plaintiff's Proposed Order, #3 Defendant's Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (EchoStar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems, LLC)(Folsom, David)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER denying as moot #261 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/16. (mll, )
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Consolidated Defendant Teradata Operations, Inc (Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv470) is hereby SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California per #225 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (mll, )
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/04/16. (mll, )
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE by Teradata Operations, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D Vandenberg on behalf of Dell Inc. (Vandenberg, John)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garth Alan Winn on behalf of Dell Inc. (Winn, Garth)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of Dell Inc. (Carraway, John)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #259 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth L DeRieux and Daymon Jeffrey Rambin terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/2016. (gsg)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #280 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mark Shiqian Zhai terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/2016. (gsg)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth L. DeRieux and D. Jeffrey Rambin by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mark S. Zhai by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #261 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Teradata filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REPLY to Response to Motion re #261 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Withdraw #275 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw ECF Nos. 24 and 25 in member case 6:15-cv-466. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/24/16. (mjc, )
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re #261 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw ECF Nos. 24 and 25 in member case 6:15-cv-466 by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Jacobson Eber on behalf of Teradata Operations, Inc. (Eber, Michelle)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC (PR 4-2 Disclosures) (Henry, Claire)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. of Compliance re Service of Disclosures (Bittner, Michael)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Melissa)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE by Dell Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv468), Dell Inc. Notice Regarding Privilege Disputes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice Regarding Privilege Disputes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC Regarding Privilege Disputes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Samples, John)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teradata Operations, Inc. re Privileged Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Walsh, Thomas)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Plaintiffs opposition brief shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m., March 23, 2016. Teradatas reply brief shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m., March 24, 2016. Plaintiffs sur-reply brief shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m., March 25, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/21/2016. (gsg)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. Notice Regarding Privilege Disputes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. re #181 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #95 Order [Notice of Compliance] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bittner, Michael)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Stay by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Morando, James)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/11/16. (mll, )
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R McCullough on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (McCullough, Matthew)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #197 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Dell Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Realtime Data LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER denying #239 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting early claim construction and summary judgment hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/08/16. (mll, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #251 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Crystal Roberts terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/07/16. (mll, )
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ANSWER to #242 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ANSWER to #241 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE to #239 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Responsive Letter Brief)(Henry, Claire)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Crystal Roberts by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Oracle America, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #248 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Realtime Data LLC. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Realtime Data, LLC and Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/02/16. (mll, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE that the hearing set on Wednesday, March 2, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. has been CANCELLED. (srg)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Chung, C.)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ANSWER to #234 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ANSWER to #233 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ANSWER to #232 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #240 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Realtime Data LLC, Dropbox, Inc. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Dropbox Inc and all counterclaims asserted by Defendant against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/22/16. (mll, )
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ANSWER to #228 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Riverbed Technology, Inc..(Chiarizio, Matthew)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ANSWER to #105 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Realtime Data LLC by Dell Inc., Dell Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dropbox, Inc., Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Notice of Compliance with Court's Docket Control Order #197 : Letter Brief filed by Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Carraway, John)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #238 Joint MOTION to Stay re #223 Order on Motion to Stay, (Motion to Extend Stay): Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 09:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (srg)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Joint MOTION to Stay re #223 Order on Motion to Stay, (Motion to Extend Stay) by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC. (Samples, John)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dell Inc., Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #230 Motion to Substitute Party. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. is substituted for Hewlett-Packard Company in Case Nos. 6:15-cv-463, 6:15-cv-467, and 6:15-cv-469. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/05/16. (mll, )
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Party Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. is SUBSTITUTED for Hewlett-Packard Company in this Consolidated Lead Case per #235 Order. (mll, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ANSWER to #228 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Dell Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ANSWER to #106 Amended Complaint, (DEFENDANTS' SAP AMERICA INC. AND SYBASE, INC.'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT), COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc..(Lutton, Katherine)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ANSWER to #103 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, EchoStar Corporation.(Riffe, Timothy)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ANSWER to #102 Amended Complaint, by Dropbox, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Stipulation by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #227 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/03/16. (mll, )
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Dell Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,378,992, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530, #3 Exhibit C - - U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 9,116,908)(Henry, Claire)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Against Riverbed Technology, Inc. and Dell Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Against Riverbed Technology, Inc. and Dell Inc., #3 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,378,992, #4 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530, #5 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513, #6 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 9,116,908)(Henry, Claire)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #184 Report and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #128 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, SAP America, Inc., Dropbox, Inc., Dell Inc., Hughes Network Systems, LLC, HP Enterprise Services, LLC, Sybase, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, AND #44 Motion to Dismiss filed by Dell Inc. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/21/2016. (gsg)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER transferring Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv470 to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/19/16. (mll, )
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER transferring Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv465 to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/12/16. (mll, )
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #221 Motion to Stay. The current stay of all deadlines in theabove-entitled cause relating to Plaintiff's case against Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software, Inc. is hereby extended to 2-11-2016. If further extensions are requested, they will be set for a hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/12/16. (mll, )
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Actian Corporation, Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Pervasive Software Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Teradata Operations, Inc. (P.R. 4-1) (Dacus, Deron)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Joint MOTION to Stay (Motion to Extend Stay) by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC (PR 4-1) (Henry, Claire)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #202 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/31/15. (mll, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/31/15. (mll, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #207 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/04/16. (mll, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 RESPONSE to #201 Objection to Report and Recommendations, by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #204 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/31/2015. (gsg)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #205 Motion to Amend infrignement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/31/2015. (gsg)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC re #95 Order (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Samples, John)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. re #95 Order (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Bittner, Michael)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teradata Operations, Inc. re Damages Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions as to Oracle America, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PR 3-1 Disclosure Cover Pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Notice of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures) (Smith, Melissa)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Teradata Operations, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PR 3-1 Disclosure Cover Pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Riverbed Technology, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PR 3-1 Disclosure Cover Pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Echostar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems, LLC by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PR 3-1 Disclosure Cover Pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Dell Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PR 3-1 Disclosure Cover Pleading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 OBJECTION to #184 Report and Recommendations by Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Carraway, John)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Crystal Roberts on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Oracle America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5527191. (Roberts, Crystal)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Stay. The current stay of all deadlines relating to Plaintiff's case against Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software, Inc. is hereby extended to 1-11-2016. Parties shall submit closing documents by 1-11-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/15. (mll, )
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Stay re #183 Order on Motion to Stay, (Motion to Extend Stay) by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/07/15. (mll, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. re #95 Order (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES) (Bittner, Michael)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469) (Notice of Disclosures Regarding Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4(b)) (Carraway, John)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Invalidity Contentions (Smith, Melissa)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Riverbed Technology, Inc. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #181 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Dell Inc., Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2015: #2 Revised Order (no signature lines)) (sm, ).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Riffe, Timothy)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dropbox, Inc. regarding Additional Disclosures (Kerr, Peter)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Oracle America, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Carraway, John)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teradata Operations, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. #44 & #128 ) be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/30/15. (mll, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the above-entitled cause relating to Plaintiff's case against Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software, Inc. are hereby stayed to 12-11-2015. Parties shall submit closing documents by 12-11-2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/15. (mll, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION to Stay with respect to Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/13/15. (mll, )
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER that Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC and Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc. shall submit closing documents no later than 12-11-2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/10/15. (mll, )
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPLY TO RESPONSE in Support re #123 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Defendants Actian Corporation And Pervasive Software Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Morando, James)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, LINKED TO A TERMINATED MOTION, ATTY MUST CORRECT AND REFILE. Documents # 175 and 177, Reply and Surreply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) Modified on 11/10/2015 (sm, ).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: successful (Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc.)(Folsom, David)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENANTS ACTIAN CORPORATION AND PERVASIVE SOFTWARE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Morando, James) Modified on 11/10/2015 (sm, ).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Stephen Mcerlain by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Steven Bo by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of James Fallon by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion Declaration of Gerald Padian by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #169 Response in Opposition to Motion by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Mirzaie, Reza)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #162 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California; Responses due by 11/5/2015; Replies due by 11/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/02/15. (mll, )
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew James Hawkinson on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Oracle America, Inc. (Hawkinson, Matthew)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #89 Order, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Mirzaie, Reza)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints filed by Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Carraway, John)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Grewal on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Grewal, Monica)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Hayes Lantier on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Lantier, Gregory)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #128 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints, #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Extension of Deadlines regarding Defendants Actian Corporation and Pervasive Software Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/27/15. (mll, )
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/23/2015. (gsg)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/20/15. (mll, )
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints, #123 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Attachment A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Attachment B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Attachment C to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Attachment D to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Attachment E to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Attachment F to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Attachment G to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Attachment H to Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Attachment I to Request for Judicial Notice)(Mirzaie, Reza)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ANSWER to #131 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ANSWER to #127 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ANSWER to #126 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #89 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, by Actian Corporation, Dell Inc., Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Pervasive Software Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order -Exhibit 2)(Dacus, Deron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2015: #3 REVISED EXHIBIT 2 (Docket control order with no lines)) (sm, ).
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File TO EXTEND CERTAIN DEADLINES AS TO REALTIME DATA, LLC AND PERVASIVE SOFTWARE, INC. by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morando, James)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California; Responses due by 10/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/07/15. (mll, )
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by BMC Software, Inc. re Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Chibib, Michael)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teradata Operations, Inc. re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Mirzaie, Reza)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Riffe, Timothy)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #125 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Realtime Data LLC, BMC Software, Inc. All claims and causes of action between Plaintiff and Defendant BMC Software Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees, expenses and costs. The Clerk is ORDERED to terminate Defendant BMC Software from the lead case. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/05/15. (mll, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Actian Corporation (Morando, James)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Riverbed Technology, Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Chiarizio, Matthew)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. Amended Notice Regarding Initial Disclosures (Dacus, Deron)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dropbox, Inc. Amended Notice Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Kerr, Peter)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Dropbox, Inc. (Kerr, Peter)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Dacus, Deron)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dropbox, Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Kerr, Peter)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #118 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California ; Replies due by 10/19/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/02/15. (mll, )
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits On Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaints. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/02/15. (mll, )
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Teradata Operations, Inc..(Whitaker, Mark)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 26 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaints by Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaints by Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. Responses due by 10/19/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraway, John)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ANSWER to #104 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Oracle America, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ANSWER to #104 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467).(Smith, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BMC Software, Inc., Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying as moot #23 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #26 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #31 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/30/15. (mll, )
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morando, James)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT), #31 MOTION to Dismiss (Henry, Claire)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9-3-2015 before Judge John Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891.
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Kroeger, Paul)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on 9/3/2015 Scheduling Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Henry, Claire)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Sever and, MOTION to Change Venue to The Northern District of California by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mark Milani, #3 Declaration of Steve Springsteel, #4 Declaration of James W. Morando, #5 Exhibit 1 to Morando Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Morando Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Morando Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Morando Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Morando Declaration)(Morando, James)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply on their Motion to Dismiss #98 and #99 in the above-captioned actions is hereby extended to 10-01-2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/17/15. (mll, )
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/17/15. (mll, )
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Henry, Claire)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle B Rinehart on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469) (Rinehart, Kyle)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D Vandenberg on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469) (Vandenberg, John)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469) (Carraway, John)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garth Alan Winn on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469) (Winn, Garth)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants Reply on their Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 98 and 99) by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morando, James)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Teradata Operations, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '812 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '812 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Oracle America, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '812 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AMENDED COMPLAINT against EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dropbox, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BMC Software, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '812 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '992 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '530 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '513 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '812 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT), #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder to Dkt. 23) filed by Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT), #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder to Dkt. 23) filed by BMC Software, Inc., Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blue Spike v Google)(Carraway, John)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motions to Dismiss; Replies due by 9/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/09/15. (mll, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/09/15. (mll, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/09/15. (mll, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ANSWER to #71 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Realtime Data LLC . (Henry, Claire)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Joint MOTION for Entry of Phased Limits Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Phased Limits Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ANSWER to #69 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Realtime Data LLC.(Henry, Claire)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 3-14-2016; Second Mediation Completion due by 2/28/2017. Evidentiary/Early Damages Expert Hearing set for 9/8/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 5/15/2017 09:00AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Markman Hearing set for 7/7/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/04/15. (mll, )
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/4/2015. (gsg)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/4/2015. (gsg)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/4/2015. (gsg)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Scheduling Conference held on 9/3/2015. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, )
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #76 Response to Motion,, by SAP America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Teradata Operations, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/02/15. (mll, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Bittner, Michael)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint MOTION regarding Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, Protective Order and Phased Limits Order re #30 Order, Set Hearings by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order regarding E-Discovery, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Protective Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Disputed Discovery Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Disputed Phased Limits Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Oracle America, Inc. (Lamb, William)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom, filed by Realtime Data LLC. re #30 Order, Set Hearings (Henry, Claire)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Foundational Orders by Actian Corporation, BMC Software, Inc., Dell Inc., Dell Inc., Dropbox, Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Oracle America, Inc., Pervasive Software Inc., Riverbed Technology, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc., Teradata Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order (DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Hotline Conference held on 8/26/2015. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording.) (mjm, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/25/15. (mll, )
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT), #31 MOTION to Dismiss , #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder to Dkt. 23) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Hayes Lantier on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5354777. (Lantier, Gregory)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Monica Grewal on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5353745. (Grewal, Monica)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Teradata Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/19/15. (mll, )
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by Oracle America, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE to (Plaintiff's Answer to Teradata Operations, Inc.'s Counterclaims; docket entry #19 in member case 6:15-cv-470) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Realtime Data LLC by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469).(Smith, Melissa)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Carraway on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Carraway, John)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. CERTIFICATE OF FINANCIALLY INTERESTED PARTIES (Morando, James)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. re #30 Order, Set Hearings (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA INC. AND SYBASE, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS OR ENTITIES) (Bittner, Michael)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. Certification of Interested Parties (Dacus, Deron)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE by Oracle America, Inc. Certificate of Interested Persons (Smith, Melissa)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by BMC Software, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Chibib, Michael)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Teradata Operations, Inc. Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Whitaker, Mark)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Samples, John)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Certificate of Interested Parties (Henry, Claire)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Dropbox, Inc. Certification of Interested Parties (Dacus, Deron)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan M Kent on behalf of Dropbox, Inc. (Kent, Ryan)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE to (Plaintiff's Answer to Oracle America, Inc.'s Counterclaims; docket entry #22 in member case 6:15-cv-467) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) Certificate of Interested Persons (Smith, Melissa)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 23) is due on August 24, 2015. Plaintiffs deadline to respond Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Dkt. 31) is due on August 27, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/6/2015. (gsg)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wesley Samples on behalf of EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Samples, John)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy W Riffe on behalf of EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Riffe, Timothy)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE to (Plaintiff's Answer to Dell, Inc.'s Counterclaims; docket entry #17 in member case 6:15-cv-468) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT), #31 MOTION to Dismiss by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE to (Plaintiff's Answer to Hewlett-Packard Company and HP Enterprise Services, LLC's Counterclaims; docket entry #19 in member case 6:15-cv-467) by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rex Andrew Mann on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Mann, Rex)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Bittner, Michael)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Kelly Lutton on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc., Dell Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Oracle America, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,378,992, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 6,597,812)(Henry, Claire)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder to Dkt. 23) by Dell Inc., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corrine M Saylor on behalf of Dell Inc. (Saylor, Corrine)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle B Rinehart on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Rinehart, Kyle)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D Vandenberg on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Vandenberg, John)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garth Alan Winn on behalf of SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Winn, Garth)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Riverbed Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Riverbed Holdings, Inc. for Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Riverbed Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Michael Woods on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Inc. (Woods, James)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Dunham on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Inc. (Dunham, Thomas)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Han Kyu Lee on behalf of Teradata Corporation, Teradata Operations, Inc. (Lee, Han Kyu)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Kim, Olivia)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Olivia M Kim on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467) (Kim, Olivia)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 9/3/2015 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/24/15. (mll, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel C Callaway on behalf of Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5312559. (Callaway, Daniel)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyunghoon John Woo on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Woo, Kyunghoon)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems, LLC (Riffe, Timothy)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dropbox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Attachment 1 was replaced on 7/27/2015, per attorney to correct proposed order) (sm, ). Modified on 7/27/2015 (sm, ).
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BMC Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boxer Parent Company, Inc., Corporate Parent BMC Software Finance, Inc. for BMC Software, Inc.. (Chibib, Michael)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAP AMERICA, INC., SYBASE, INC., HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, HP ENTERPRISE SERVICES, LLC, DELL, INC., BMC SOFTWARE, INC., ECHOSTAR CORPORATION, HUGHES NETWORK SYSTEMS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by BMC Software, Inc., Dell Inc., EchoStar Corporation, HP Enterprise Services, LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv467), Hewlett-Packard Company(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv469), Hughes Network Systems, LLC, SAP America, Inc., Sybase, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Melsheimer, Thomas)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Nicholas Patariu on behalf of BMC Software, Inc. (Patariu, David)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Karl Gates on behalf of BMC Software, Inc. (Gates, Matthew)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Conor Monroe Civins on behalf of BMC Software, Inc. (Civins, Conor)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Shiqian Zhai on behalf of Teradata Corporation, Teradata Operations, Inc. (Zhai, Mark)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Laurence Whitaker on behalf of Teradata Corporation, Teradata Operations, Inc. (Whitaker, Mark)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Roy Lynn on behalf of Teradata Corporation, Teradata Operations, Inc. (Lynn, Jamie)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:15cv463 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants' Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/23/15. (mll, )
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Consolidated Defendants added: BMC Software Inc (6:15cv464); Dropbox Inc (6:15cv465); EchoStar Corporation, Hughes Network Systems LLC (6:15cv466); Oracle America Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, HP Enterprise Services LLC (6:15cv467); Riverbed Technology Inc, Dell Inc (6:15cv468); SAP America Inc, Sybase Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, HP Enterprise Services LLC, Dell Inc (6:15cv469); Teradata Corporation, Teradata Operations Inc (6:15cv470). (mll, )
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pervasive Software Inc. to 7/24/2015; Actian Corporation to 7/24/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc..( Morando, James)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Actian Corporation on 5/19/2015, by personal service. (mll, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc.( Morando, James)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pervasive Software Inc. to 7/9/2015; Actian Corporation to 7/9/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Liao, Jeffrey)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ledahl, Brian)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Hoffman, Adam)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Mirzaie, Reza)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Fenster, Marc)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, )
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ward, Thomas)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Henry, Claire)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actian Corporation, Pervasive Software Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5189707.), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,378,992, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,415,530, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,643,513)(Henry, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realtime Data LLC v. Actian Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC doing business as IXO
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: James N Pickens
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Christian W Conkle
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Johnny Ward, Jr
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Kyunghoon John Woo
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actian Corporation
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Daniel Chilton Callaway
Represented By: James William Morando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pervasive Software Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Chilton Callaway
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: James William Morando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BMC Software, Inc.
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Michael Chibib
Represented By: Conor Monroe Civins
Represented By: Matthew Karl Gates
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dropbox, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Aaron Kerr
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Ryan M Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: EchoStar Corporation
Represented By: Adam R Shartzer
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: John Wesley Samples
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Timothy W Riffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hughes Network Systems, LLC
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: John Wesley Samples
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Timothy W Riffe
Represented By: Adam R Shartzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Gregory Hayes Lantier
Represented By: Crystal G. Roberts
Represented By: Monica Grewal
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Matthew James Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Monica Grewal
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Edward G Poplawski
Represented By: Crystal G. Roberts
Represented By: Garth Alan Winn
Represented By: John Christopher Carraway
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Gregory Hayes Lantier
Represented By: Matthew James Hawkinson
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Olivia M Kim
Represented By: Kyle B Rinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: HP Enterprise Services, LLC
Represented By: Edward G Poplawski
Represented By: Monica Grewal
Represented By: Olivia M Kim
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Garth Alan Winn
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew James Hawkinson
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Kyle B Rinehart
Represented By: John Christopher Carraway
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Crystal G. Roberts
Represented By: Gregory Hayes Lantier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Riverbed Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew Philip Chiarizio
Represented By: John Russell Emerson
Represented By: Charles Michael Jones, II
Represented By: Debra J McComas
Represented By: Stephanie Noelle Sivinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Dunham
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: James Michael Woods
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Corrine Saylor Davis
Represented By: Garth Alan Winn
Represented By: John Christopher Carraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Carraway
Represented By: Kyle B Rinehart
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Represented By: Garth Alan Winn
Represented By: Katherine K. Vidal
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sybase, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Rex Andrew Mann
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Garth Alan Winn
Represented By: Kyle B Rinehart
Represented By: Matthew R McCullough
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Represented By: John Christopher Carraway
Represented By: John D Vandenberg
Represented By: Katherine K. Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Teradata Corporation
Represented By: Mark Shiqian Zhai
Represented By: Han Kyu Lee
Represented By: Mark Laurence Whitaker
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Jamie Roy Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Teradata Operations, Inc.
Represented By: Han Kyu Lee
Represented By: Michelle Jacobson Eber
Represented By: Mark Laurence Whitaker
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Jamie Roy Lynn
Represented By: Mark Shiqian Zhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Realtime Data LLC
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Johnny Ward, Jr
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Represented By: Kyunghoon John Woo
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?