Tinnus Enterprises, LLC et al v. Telebrands Corporation
Plaintiff: Tinnus Enterprises, LLC and Zuru Ltd.
Defendant: Telebrands Corporation
Case Number: 6:2016cv00033
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 725 REDACTED VERSION OF 719 SEALED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/15/2019. (rlf)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER ADOPTING 359 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this Court. All objections are OVERRULED and Defendants' Motion (Docket No. 298 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/17/2017. (rlf)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN PART 335 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Alan Ratliff's Opinion on Lost Profits, Including Price Erosion. The Court GRANTS-IN-PART Defendants' Motion, however, Mr. Ratliff will be permitted an opportunity to file an amended expert report to address the ZURU Ltd. sales associated with the generation of lost profits. Defendants' Motion is DENIED-IN-PART as to Mr. Ratliff's price erosion opinions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/11/2017. (rlf)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. The Court GRANTS-IN-PART 329 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Paragraphs 34 through 50 and 56 through 66 of Dr. Kamrin's rebuttal expert report are hereby STRICKEN. Within 14 days of the issue of this Order, Dr. Kamrin may file an amended report consistent with the admonitions set forth herein. 331 Defendants' Motion to Strike is DENIED. The parties shall file a joint report to inform the Court whether the doctrine of equivalents will be asserted in this case by August 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/11/2017. (rlf)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 182 Report and Recommendations and overruling all objections. The parties are further ORDERED to meet and confer within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Order and submit to the Court a proposed bond amount and injunctive order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/3/2017. (rlf)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER re 162 Claim Construction Brief filed by Tinnus Enterprises, LLC, Zuru Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/13/2016. (gsg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinnus Enterprises, LLC et al v. Telebrands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinnus Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru Ltd.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telebrands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?