Realtime Data LLC v. Rackspace US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Defendant: Rackspace US, Inc, NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC, Rackspace US, Inc. and SolidFire, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Vembu Technologies, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc. and Quantum Corporation
Not Yet Classified: David Folsom
Case Number: 6:2016cv00961
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Filing 333 REDACTED - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 1/05/2018 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter, Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (sms, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 332 REDACTED - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 12/19/17 before Judge Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda Leigh, Telephone number: 877/790-3376. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter.Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (sms, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 331 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) after termination of this case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 330 FINAL JUDGMENT. The above-entitled and numbered cause of action is DISMISSED. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/01/18. (mll, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is therefore ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants any and all counterclaims asserted by Defendants against Plaintiff are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, subject to the Settlement and License Agreement of January 29, 2018, whose terms shall remain confidential, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/31/2018. (rlf)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Redact re 320 Transcript, 319 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/31/2018. (rlf)
January 30, 2018 Filing 327 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
January 30, 2018 Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 320 Transcript,,, 319 Transcript,,, by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip)
January 16, 2018 Filing 325 REDACTION Realtimes Redacted Exhibit A to its Sealed Objection to Judge Loves Ruling on Realtimes Motion in Limine No. 3 Regarding Marking by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
January 16, 2018 Filing 324 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Philip X Wang re 319 Transcript,,,. (Wang, Philip)
January 16, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Philip X Wang re 320 Transcript,,,. (Wang, Philip)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, the Court grants the stay and ORDERS Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC and Defendants NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC to submit closing documents no later than February 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/8/2018. (rlf)
January 8, 2018 Filing 321 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC(Folsom, David)
January 8, 2018 Filing 318 Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
January 5, 2018 Filing 317 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC for proceedings held on 1-5-2018 Pretrial Conference before Judge Love. (Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2018 Filing 316 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on 1/5/18 Second Pretrial Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Mirzaie, Reza)
January 5, 2018 Filing 315 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/5/2018. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2018: #1 Appendix) (srb, ).
January 4, 2018 Filing 314 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC re #262 Response to Non-Motion, NETAPP'S CORRECTED EXHIBIT B TO OBJECTIONS TO PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES (Mayer, Colette)
December 29, 2017 Filing 312 Exhibit List NetApp's Second Amended Exhibit List by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC.. (Wiener, Christopher)
December 29, 2017 Filing 311 Exhibit List REALTIME'S SIXTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 29, 2017 Filing 310 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Joint Report Regarding Exhibit List Disputes (Wang, Philip)
December 28, 2017 Filing 309 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #255 MOTION for Reconsideration re #209 Report and Recommendations, #223 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions re Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
December 22, 2017 Filing 308 Exhibit List NETAPP'S AMENDED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC.. (Mayer, Colette)
December 22, 2017 Filing 307 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC for proceedings held on 12/19/2017 Pretrial Hearing before Judge Love. (Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2017 Filing 306 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on 12/19/17 Pretrial Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 22, 2017 Filing 305 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC Joint Notice of Agreed Trial Setting and Non-Consent to Trial Before a Magistrate Judge (Henry, Claire)
December 21, 2017 Filing 304 REPLY to Response to Motion re #255 MOTION for Reconsideration re #209 Report and Recommendations, #223 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions re Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER denying #288 Motion to Postpone Trial. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/21/2017. (rlf)
December 21, 2017 Filing 302 STIPULATION re #272 Stipulation ADDITIONAL MOTION IN LIMINE STIPULATIONS by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 PRETRIAL ORDER granting in part and denying in part #274 AND #276 Motions in Limine; and Sustaining Plaintiff's Objection to Net App's Witness List #264 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/20/2017. (rlf)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER setting Second Pretrial Conference for 1/5/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/19/17. (mll, )
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #271 Motion to Strike Second Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas Rhyne, PhD. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/19/17. (mll, )
December 19, 2017 Filing 298 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/19/2017. (Court Reporter Amanda Leigh) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2017: #1 Appendix Attorney Sign in Sheet) (srb, ).
December 18, 2017 Filing 297 Exhibit List REALTIME'S FOURTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 18, 2017 Filing 296 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #295 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mirzaie Decl.)(Mirzaie, Reza)
December 18, 2017 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #288 MOTION to Continue NETAPP'S MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of R. Mirzaie, #2 Exhibit B to Mirzaie Decl., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #285 Motion for Jury Questionnaire. Accordingly, the Court will distribute the questionnaire to prospective jurors and provide the information to the parties in advance of voir dire. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2017. (rlf)
December 17, 2017 Filing 293 Exhibit List REALTIME'S THIRD AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST by Realtime Data LLC.. (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 15, 2017 Filing 292 RESPONSE in Opposition re #271 MOTION to Strike Second Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas Rhyne PhD filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul A. Kroeger, #2 Exhibit 1 Excerpts from Rhyne Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit 2 Excerpts from Storer Report, #4 Exhibit 3 NetApp Final Election of Prior Art, #5 Exhibit 4 PTAB Website, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
December 15, 2017 Filing 291 RESPONSE to #266 Response to Non-Motion, #262 Response to Non-Motion, NetApp's Objections to Realtime's Supplemental Exhibit List filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mayer, Colette)
December 15, 2017 Filing 290 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC Amount of Time for Trial (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1)(Chung, C.)
December 15, 2017 Filing 289 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Trial Time Estimates (Mayer, Colette)
December 15, 2017 Filing 288 MOTION to Continue NETAPP'S MOTION TO POSTPONE TRIAL by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Postpone Trial, #2 Exhibit A to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Postpone Trial, #3 Exhibit B to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Postpone Trial, #4 S. Storer Decl. ISO Mtn to Postpone Trial)(Mayer, Colette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2017: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
December 14, 2017 Filing 287 REDACTION to #280 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,, NetApp's Response in Opposition to Realtime's Motions in Limine (REDACTED) by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Colette Reiner Mayer (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), #6 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), #8 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED), #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17 (REDACTED), #19 Exhibit 18 (REDACTED), #20 Exhibit 19 (REDACTED), #21 Exhibit 20 (REDACTED), #22 Exhibit 21 (REDACTED), #23 Exhibit 22 (REDACTED), #24 Exhibit 23 (REDACTED), #25 Exhibit 24 (REDACTED), #26 Exhibit 25 (REDACTED), #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28 (REDACTED), #30 Exhibit 29 (REDACTED), #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
December 14, 2017 Filing 286 RESPONSE to #259 Response to Non-Motion, OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY MR. STEPHEN DELL filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickens, James)
December 14, 2017 Filing 285 Agreed MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER TO SUBMIT EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. To assist the Court in resolving these objections, the parties are ORDERED to submit the disputed exhibits and deposition designations to the Court via CD-ROM by noon on Monday, December 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/14/2017. (rlf)
December 13, 2017 Filing 283 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION for Reconsideration re #209 Report and Recommendations, #223 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions re Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
December 13, 2017 Filing 282 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #281 Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Wang, Philip)
December 12, 2017 Filing 281 RESPONSE to Motion re #274 MOTION in Limine filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Philip X. Wang, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Wang, Philip)
December 12, 2017 Filing 280 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #276 SEALED MOTION In Limine filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Colette Reiner Mayer, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dawkins transcript excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - McErlain transcript excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tashjian transcript excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - Storer Expert Rpt re Invalidity, #6 Exhibit 5 - Storer Expert Rpt re Non-Infringement, #7 Exhibit 6 - Davis Expert Rpt re Damages, #8 Exhibit 7 - Hitt Expert Report, #9 Exhibit 8 - Joint Defs' Invalidity Contentions, #10 Exhibit 9 - Disclosure of Prior Art, #11 Exhibit 10 - First Suppl Invalidity Contentions, #12 Exhibit 11 - RT's Responses to 1st Interrogatories, #13 Exhibit 12 - Website, #14 Exhibit 13 - Website, #15 Exhibit 14 - Website, #16 Exhibit 15 - Website, #17 Exhibit 16 - Website, #18 Exhibit 17 - RT-Actian settlement and license agmt, #19 Exhibit 18 - RT-Blue Coat settlement and license agmt, #20 Exhibit 19 - RT-Citrix settlement and license agmt, #21 Exhibit 20 - RT-F5 settlement and license agmt, #22 Exhibit 21- RT-MS settlement and license agmt, #23 Exhibit 22 - RT-Oracle settlement and license agmt, #24 Exhibit 23 - RT-Rackspace settlement and license agmt, #25 Exhibit 24 - RT-SAP settlement and license agmt, #26 Exhibit 25 - RT-Vembu settlement and license agmt, #27 Exhibit 26 - Order, Dkt. No. 491, #28 Exhibit 27 - Docket Navigator report, #29 Exhibit 28 - RT Trial Ex. PX218, #30 Exhibit 29 - RT Trial Exs. PX13-PX16, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
December 12, 2017 Filing 279 REDACTION to #276 SEALED MOTION In Limine by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9)(Wang, Philip)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER MOVING TRIAL DATE. The Court RESETS the trial to begin immediately following Jury Selection on 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/11/2017. (rlf)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING. The Court ORDERS an expedited response from Plaintiff on #271 Defendants' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas Rhyne, PhD. Plaintiff shall file a response by December 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/11/2017. (rlf)
December 8, 2017 Filing 276 SEALED MOTION In Limine by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Philip X. Wang, #3 Exhibit 1 - Periyagaram Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - Davis Report Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 3 - Storer Report Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 4 - Email from NetApp Counsel, #7 Exhibit 5 - Email from NetApp Counsel, #8 Exhibit 6 - NetApp Rog Responses, #9 Exhibit 7 - NetApp Depo Objections, #10 Exhibit 8 - Storer Depo Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 9 - Davis Depo Excerpts)(Wang, Philip)
December 8, 2017 Filing 275 RESPONSE to #266 Response to Non-Motion REALTIME'S RESPONSES TO NETAPP'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO REALTIME'S PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
December 8, 2017 Filing 274 MOTION in Limine by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 C. Mayer Decl. ISO NetApp's MILs, #2 Exhibit A to C. Mayer Decl., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
December 8, 2017 Filing 273 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC)(Folsom, David)
December 8, 2017 Filing 272 STIPULATION Regarding Motions in Limine by Realtime Data LLC. (Wang, Philip)
December 8, 2017 Filing 271 MOTION to Strike Second Supplemental Expert Report of Thomas Rhyne PhD by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. Responses due by 12/22/2017 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
December 7, 2017 Filing 270 RESPONSE to #264 Response to Non-Motion Realtimes Objections to Pretrial Disclosures filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Mayer, Colette)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #267 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/7/2017. (rlf)
December 6, 2017 Filing 268 Proposed Findings of Fact by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
December 6, 2017 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 6, 2017 Filing 266 RESPONSE to #262 Response to Non-Motion, NetApps Supplemental Objections to Realtime's Pretrial Disclosures filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
December 4, 2017 Filing 265 Proposed Findings of Fact by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
December 4, 2017 Filing 264 RESPONSE to PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
December 4, 2017 Filing 263 Proposed Pretrial Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Chung, C.)
December 4, 2017 Filing 262 RESPONSE to Objections to Realtime's Pretrial Disclosures by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NetApp's Objections to Realtime's Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B - NetApp's Objections to Realtime's Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit C - NetApp's Objections to Realtime's Rebuttal Designations)(Mayer, Colette)
December 4, 2017 Filing 261 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING (Smith, Melissa)
December 4, 2017 Filing 260 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING (Chung, C.)
December 1, 2017 Filing 259 RESPONSE to #254 Memorandum & Opinion, NETAPP, INC. & SOLIDFIRE, LLC'S OBJECTION TO MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY MR. STEPHEN BELL by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
December 1, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #258 Motion. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION. TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT DOCKET EVENT.*** (mjc, )
November 30, 2017 Filing 258 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION re #254 Memorandum & Opinion, NETAPP, INC. & SOLIDFIRE, LLC'S OBJECTION TO MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER DENYING DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY MR. STEPHEN DELL by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette) Modified on 12/1/2017 (mjc, ).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Granting #256 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/30/2017. (rlf)
November 29, 2017 Filing 256 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by NetApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 29, 2017 Filing 255 MOTION for Reconsideration re #209 Report and Recommendations, #223 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions re Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony by Stephen Dell. (Doc. No. 234.) (UNSEALED VERSION OF 252 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/17. (mll, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 253 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC JOINT NOTICE RE UNSEALING OF ORDER ON DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY MR. STEPHEN DELL (Mayer, Colette)
November 15, 2017 Filing 251 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 14, 2017 Filing 250 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC ORIGINAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 1, 2017 Filing 249 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re #234 Opposed SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY STEPHEN DELL filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Pickens, James)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court GRANTS #232 NetApp's MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Portions of Richard Wesel's Expert Report. #231 Defendant's MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/26/2017. (rlf)
October 25, 2017 Filing 247 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #234 Opposed SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY STEPHEN DELL filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
October 23, 2017 Filing 246 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #231 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay Chung, #2 Exhibit 15 - Discovery Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 16 - Storer Dep., #4 Exhibit 17 - Storer Rpt., #5 Exhibit 18 - Gartner Questionnaire, #6 Exhibit 19 - HA Pair Configuration Guide, #7 Exhibit 20 - Wesel Rpt.)(Chung, C.)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Entry of Stipulation; withdrawing #235 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants withdraw their affirmative defenses of estoppel, waiver, and acquiescence, and agree that they will not assert such defenses at trial. Plaintiff withdraws its motion for summary judgment regarding Defendants' affirmative defenses of estoppel, waiver, and acquiescence (ECF No. 235). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/17. (mll, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 244 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #234 Opposed SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY STEPHEN DELL filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Pickens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickens, James)
October 17, 2017 Filing 243 Joint MOTION Entry of Stipulation re #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire LLCs Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver, and Acquiescence Regarding Withdrawal of Defendants' Estoppel, Waiver, and Acquiescence Defenses and Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
October 16, 2017 Filing 242 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #231 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 C. Mayer Decl ISO Mtn to Strike Portions of Dr. Wesel's Report, #2 Exhibit 1 to C. Mayer Decl ISO Mtn to Strike Portions of Dr. Wesel's Report, #3 Exhibit 2 to C. Mayer Decl ISO Mtn to Strike Portions of Dr. Wesel's Report)(Mayer, Colette)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Granting #238 Motion to Amend.Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/10/2017. (rlf)
October 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC's motion to strike. Plaintiff has until October 10, 2017 to file a response to Defendant NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC's motion to strike portions of Dr. Wesels report regarding infringement (Dkt. No. #231 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/8/2017. (rlf)
October 6, 2017 Filing 239 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #231 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Jay Chung, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
October 6, 2017 Filing 238 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by NetApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 5, 2017 Filing 237 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #231 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
October 3, 2017 Filing 236 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #235 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire LLCs Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver, and Acquiescence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4)(Kroeger, Paul)
October 3, 2017 Filing 235 ***WITHDRAWN PER #245 ORDER*** MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire LLCs Affirmative Defenses of Estoppel, Waiver, and Acquiescence by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Paul Kroeger, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kroeger, Paul) Modified on 10/18/2017 (mll, ).
October 3, 2017 Filing 234 Opposed SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY BY STEPHEN DELL by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 C.Mayer Decl. ISO Daubert Motion, #2 Exhibit A to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Daubert Motion, #3 Exhibit B to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit C to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit D to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Daubert Motion, #6 Text of Proposed Order to NetApp's Daubert Motion)(Mayer, Colette)
September 26, 2017 Filing 233 Rebuttal Witness List by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
September 22, 2017 Filing 232 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Portions of Richard Wesel's Expert Report by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
September 21, 2017 Filing 231 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DR. WESEL'S REPORT REGARDING INFRINGEMENT by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike Portions of Dr. Wesel's Report Re Infringement, #2 Exhibit 1 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #3 Exhibit 2 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #4 Exhibit 3 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #5 Exhibit 4 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #6 Exhibit 5 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #7 Exhibit 6 to C. Mayer Decl. ISO Mtn to Strike, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #217 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike NetApp's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions.Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/15/2017. (rlf)
September 15, 2017 Filing 229 Anticipated Trial Witness List by Realtime Data LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza)
September 15, 2017 Filing 228 Trial Witness List by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
September 12, 2017 Filing 227 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #217 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
September 12, 2017 Filing 226 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J Wiener on behalf of NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC (Wiener, Christopher)
September 5, 2017 Filing 225 REPLY to Response to Motion re #217 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asserted Claims against NetApp, #2 Exhibit B - Asserted Claims against Rackspace)(Wang, Philip)
August 28, 2017 Filing 224 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #217 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mayer Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Mayer Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Mayer Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Mayer Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Mayer Decl.)(Mayer, Colette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2017: #7 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER ADOPTING #209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. All objections are OVERRULED and NetApp's #180 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/21/2017. (rlf)
August 18, 2017 Filing 222 RESPONSE to #216 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
August 17, 2017 Filing 221 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. to Stop Electronic Notification (Paxson, Sarah)
August 15, 2017 Filing 220 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Notice by NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC of Subpoena to Rackspace US, Inc. (Mayer, Colette)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Motion for Discovery. It is further ORDERED that the parties have until September 1, 2017 to complete the additional discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/15/2017. (rlf)
August 14, 2017 Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Unopposed Motion of Netapp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC for Leave to Take Discovery Limited to Settlement Between Rackspace US, Inc. and Realtime Data, LLC by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
August 11, 2017 Filing 217 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Philip Wang, #3 Exhibit A Realtime Contentions to NetApp, #4 Exhibit B Realtime Contentions to Rackspace, #5 Exhibit C Initial Invalidity Contentions, #6 Exhibit D Realtime P.R. 4-2 Disclosure, #7 Exhibit E Rackspace email, #8 Exhibit F Supplemental Invalidity Contentions, #9 Exhibit G Realtime email, #10 Exhibit H NetApp email, #11 Exhibit I Final Prior Art Election)(Wang, Philip)
August 4, 2017 Filing 216 OBJECTION to #209 Report and Recommendations Denying Motion of NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC to Dismiss or Transfer for Improper Venue by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL, granting #214 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Realtime's claims for relief against Rackspace and Rackspace's counterclaims for relief against Realtime are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/1/2017. (rlf)
July 31, 2017 Filing 214 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Rackspace US, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
July 26, 2017 Filing 213 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Thompson, Stanley)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES #196 NetApp's Second Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review and DENIES #201 Rackspace's Renewed Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/25/2017. (rlf)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. ORDER granting #210 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/25/2017. (rlf)
July 24, 2017 Filing 210 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed DCO)(Chung, C.)
July 21, 2017 Filing 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #180 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/21/2017. (rlf)
July 18, 2017 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re #196 Second MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Second Renewed Motion) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SECOND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer ISO NetApp, Inc. & Solidfire, LLC's Reply ISO Second Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending IPR, #2 Exhibit 1 to C.R. Mayer Decl. ISO Reply ISO Second Renewed Motion to Stay)(Mayer, Colette)
July 14, 2017 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #201 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
July 11, 2017 Filing 206 RESPONSE in Opposition re #196 Second MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Second Renewed Motion) filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Philip)
July 10, 2017 Filing 205 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #180 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
July 6, 2017 Filing 204 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Diek O Van Nort on behalf of NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6366170. (Van Nort, Diek)
July 6, 2017 Filing 203 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Shaelyn K Dawson on behalf of NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6366125. (Dawson, Shaelyn)
June 30, 2017 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re #180 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
June 30, 2017 Filing 201 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Storm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Storm, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2017: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
June 28, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC of SAP America, Inc. (Mayer, Colette)
June 28, 2017 Filing 199 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC of Subpoena to SYBASE, INC. (Mayer, Colette)
June 28, 2017 Filing 198 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Subpoena to Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless (Storm, Paul)
June 27, 2017 Filing 197 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #196 Second MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Second Renewed Motion).. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 (IPR2016-00972 -1002 Trial Hrg Ord), #2 Exhibit 11 (IPR2016-00978 -980 Trial Hrg Ord), #3 Exhibit 12 (Asserted Claims), #4 Exhibit 13 (Third Suppl PICs), #5 Exhibit 14 (2017-06-09 Email), #6 Exhibit 15 (Dell HP Stay Order), #7 Exhibit 16 (Teradata Stay Order), #8 Exhibit 17 (Veritas Stay Order), #9 Exhibit 18 (EMC Stay Order), #10 Exhibit 19 (IPR2017-01627 (RS) Pet. '530 patent), #11 Exhibit 20 (IPR2017-01627 (RS Joinder ('530 patent), #12 Exhibit 21 (IPR2017-01629 (RS) Pet. '908 patent), #13 Exhibit 22 (IPR2017-01629 (RS) Joinder '908 patent))(Mayer, Colette)
June 27, 2017 Filing 196 Second MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Second Renewed Motion) by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration Colette Reiner Mayer, #3 Exhibit 1 (IPR Pet. '992), #4 Exhibit 2 (IPR Pet. '513), #5 Exhibit 3 (IPR Pet. '728), #6 Exhibit 4 (IPT Pet. '506), #7 Exhibit 5 (IPR2017-00365 DI and Joinder), #8 Exhibit 6 (IPR2017-00366 DI and Joinder), #9 Exhibit 7 (IPR2017-00364 DI-Joinder), #10 Exhibit 8 (IPR2017-00179 DI), #11 Exhibit 9 (IPR2017-00176 DI))(Mayer, Colette)
June 26, 2017 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #180 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/17. (mll, )
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Second Mediation Completion due by 10/16/2017. Jury Selection set for 1/16/2018 09:00AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/22/17. (mll, )
June 22, 2017 Filing 192 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liao, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Subpoena to Microsoft Corporation (Storm, Paul)
June 21, 2017 Filing 190 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Subpoena to Citrix Systems, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
June 21, 2017 Filing 189 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Subpoena to Blue Coat Systems, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
June 21, 2017 Filing 188 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Subpoena to Oracle America, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
June 21, 2017 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended DCO)(Storm, Paul)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court GRANTS #158 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions as to Rackspace. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to serve amended infringement contentions with respect to Rackspace's Managed Backup product that are consistent with the Court's Order regarding #156 NetApp's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Infringement Contentions within seven (7) days of this Order. The Court further ORDERS that Rackspace may, if it so chooses, serve Amended Invalidity Contentions within thirty (30) days of this Order without seeking further leave of Court. The Court further sua sponte EXTENDS the Dispositive Motion Deadline for all parties to October 3, 2017. The Court ORDERS all parties to meet and confer and submit an amended Docket Control Order to the Court consistent with this deadline extension within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/19/2017. (rlf)
June 16, 2017 Filing 185 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #158 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RACKSPACE US, INC - CORRECTED filed by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Storm, Paul)
June 16, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Conkle, Christian)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/14/17. (mll, )
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTATE JUDGE. The Court OVERRULES each of NetApp and SolidFire's objections to the Memorandum, Opinion & Order of the United States Magistrate Judge. Docket No. 110. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/14/17. (mll, )
June 14, 2017 Filing 181 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #158 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RACKSPACE US, INC filed by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Paul V. Storm, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Storm, Paul)
June 9, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the Northern District of California by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A (ECF No. [54-3]), #2 Attachment B (ECF No. [54-2]))(Mayer, Colette)
June 9, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC - Notice of Subpoena to Vembu Technologies, Inc. - (Mayer, Colette)
June 9, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Notice of Subpoena to F5 Networks, Inc. (Mayer, Colette)
June 9, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Notice of Subpoena to Ranga Sourirajan (Mayer, Colette)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #162 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Parties are ORDERED to proceed pursuant to the Amended Docket Control Order #167 issued 6-02-2017. This includes a current Fact Discovery Deadline of 7-10-2017 for all parties in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/08/17. (mll, )
June 8, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. re #162 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order (Rackspace's Non-Opposition) (Storm, Paul)
June 7, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Vivasvat Keswani (Liao, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2017 Filing 173 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Subramanian Periyagaram (Liao, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Subpoena to Greg Taleck (Liao, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2017 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #158 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RACKSPACE US, INC filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chung, C.)
June 5, 2017 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
June 5, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtime Data LLC Notice of Disclosure of Experts (Henry, Claire)
June 2, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC --Defendants' Notice of Disclosure of Experts (Mayer, Colette)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/2/2017. (rlf)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. It is ORDERED that the briefing schedule on NetApps motion shall be as follows: NetApp's motion to amend Docket Control Order due Wednesday, May 31, 2017. Realtime's opposition due Monday, June 5, 2017. No reply/sur-reply to be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/1/2017. (rlf)
June 1, 2017 Filing 165 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #160 Order, Terminate Motions Docket Control Order by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order)(Storm, Paul)
May 31, 2017 Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 31, 2017 Filing 163 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #162 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. (Attachments: #1 EX 1, #2 EX 2, #3 EX 3, #4 EX 4, #5 EX 5, #6 EX 6, #7 EX 7, #8 EX 8, #9 EX 9, #10 EX 10, #11 EX 11, #12 EX 12, #13 EX 13, #14 EX 14)(Smith, Melissa)
May 31, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit C. Mayer, #2 Mayer Decl. Ex. 15 - May 26 Email re Depositions, #3 Mayer Decl. Ex. 16 - May 18 Email re Extension of Case Schedule, #4 Mayer Decl. Ex. 17 -2017-02-23 Esposito ltr to Liao re Realtime doc prod deficiencies, #5 Mayer Decl. Ex. 18 - May 19 Email Chain re OCR Issues, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 30, 2017 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Opposition re #158 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RACKSPACE US, INC filed by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Storm, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2017: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/19/2017. (rlf)
May 18, 2017 Filing 159 Joint MOTION re #121 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order)(Storm, Paul)
May 15, 2017 Filing 158 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AS TO DEFENDANT RACKSPACE US, INC by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jay Chung, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
May 12, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 4/27/2017 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2017. (sms, )
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. #117 NetApp's Motion to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance is GRANTED-IN-PART. Realtime is ORDERED to serve Supplemental Infringement Contentions consistent with P.R. 3-1 within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/10/2017. (rlf)
May 5, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James N Pickens on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Pickens, James)
May 1, 2017 Filing 154 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Realtime Data LLC for proceedings held on April 27, 2017 for the Markman Hearing before Judge John D. Love. (Wang, Philip)
April 27, 2017 Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 4/27/2017. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (srb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2017: #1 Appendix) (srb, ).
April 24, 2017 Filing 152 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #130 Renewed Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/24/17. (mll, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #106 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/24/17. (mll, )
April 21, 2017 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Esposito, #2 Exhibit A)(Mayer, Colette)
April 19, 2017 Filing 148 Joint Claim Construction Chart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Philip)
April 17, 2017 Filing 147 RESPONSE to Motion re #130 MOTION to Stay -RENEWED MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW OF PATENTS-IN-SUIT filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Philip X. Wang, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Wang, Philip)
April 17, 2017 Filing 146 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey Z.Y. Liao, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jeffrey Z.Y. Liao)(Chung, C.)
April 17, 2017 Filing 145 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES NetApp and SolidFires Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Declaration. (Doc. No. 133.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/17/2017. (rlf)
April 17, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Estimated Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Chung, C.)
April 12, 2017 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 MOTION to Strike UNTIMELY EXPERT DECLARATION filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Jay Chung, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Chung, C.)
April 11, 2017 Filing 141 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
April 10, 2017 Filing 140 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #139 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mayer, Colette)
April 10, 2017 Filing 139 DEFENDANTS RACKSPACE US, INC., NETAPP, INC., AND SOLIDFIRE, LLC'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Realtimes opposition to Dkt. No. #117 due Monday, April 17, 2017. Defendants reply due Friday, April 21, 2017. Realtimes sur-reply due Monday, April 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/10/2017. (rlf)
April 7, 2017 Filing 137 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule on Motion (Dkt. No. 117) to Strike Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike Declaration of Dr. Zeger. REaltime's opposition due April 12, 2017, No Reply / Sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/6/2017. (rlf)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Realtime's Opposition due April l7, 2017, no reply/sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/6/2017. (rlf)
April 5, 2017 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT DECLARATION by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
April 5, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION to Strike UNTIMELY EXPERT DECLARATION by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Esposito, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Mayer, Colette)
April 5, 2017 Filing 132 Joint MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON RENEWED MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW OF PATENTS-IN-SUIT by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
April 5, 2017 Filing 131 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #130 MOTION to Stay -RENEWED MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW OF PATENTS-IN-SUIT.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 27, #15 Exhibit 28)(Mayer, Colette)
April 5, 2017 Filing 130 MOTION to Stay -RENEWED MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW OF PATENTS-IN-SUIT by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Esposito, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Mayer, Colette)
April 4, 2017 Filing 129 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 --REPLY ISO MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS AGAINST NETAPP, INC. AND SOLIDFIRE, LLC TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer)(Mayer, Colette)
March 31, 2017 Filing 128 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jay Chung, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11, #13 Ex. 12, #14 Ex. 13, #15 Ex. 14, #16 Ex. 15, #17 Ex. 16, #18 Ex. 17)(Chung, C.)
March 30, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Henry, Claire)
March 29, 2017 Filing 126 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC re #111 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, NOTICE OF CORRECTED EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF COLETTE REINER MAYER #111 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2, #2 Exhibit A-3, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit E-2, #10 Exhibit E-3, #11 Exhibit F-2, #12 Exhibit F-3)(Mayer, Colette)
March 29, 2017 Filing 125 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
March 29, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, LLC of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
March 29, 2017 Filing 123 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE by Fujitsu America, Inc., NetApp, Inc., Quantum Corporation, Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, LLC (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING TECHNICAL TUTORIAL) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 3/29/2017 (mjc, ).
March 29, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #123 Notice. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED BY ATTORNEY.*** (mjc, )
March 28, 2017 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chung, C.)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/27/17. (mll, )
March 24, 2017 Filing 120 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 23)(Smith, Melissa)
March 24, 2017 Filing 119 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14- Part 1, #2 Exhibit 14- Part 2, #3 Exhibit 14- Part 3, #4 Exhibit 14- Part 4, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20, #10 Exhibit 21, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 24)(Smith, Melissa)
March 24, 2017 Filing 118 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 11- Part 2, #3 Exhibit 11 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit 12- Part 1, #5 Exhibit 12- Part 2, #6 Exhibit 12- Part 3, #7 Exhibit 12- Part 4, #8 Exhibit 13- Part 1, #9 Exhibit 13- Part 2, #10 Exhibit 13- Part 3, #11 Exhibit 13- Part 4)(Smith, Melissa)
March 24, 2017 Filing 117 Opposed MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Realtime Data LLC's Infringement Contentions and to Compel Compliance Under P.R. 3-1 by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Collette Reiner Mayer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10 part 1, #13 Exhibit 10 part 2, #14 Exhibit 10 part 3, #15 Exhibit 10 part 4)(Smith, Melissa)
March 24, 2017 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed DCO)(Chung, C.)
March 23, 2017 Filing 115 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Rackspace US, Inc., NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC)(Folsom, David)
March 22, 2017 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Storm, Paul)
March 20, 2017 Filing 113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
March 14, 2017 Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 -Declaration of Ravi Kavuri filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
March 14, 2017 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2, #2 Exhibit A-3, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit E-2, #10 Exhibit E-3, #11 Exhibit F-2, #12 Exhibit F-3)(Mayer, Colette)
March 14, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION for Reconsideration re #104 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, and Objections to Order #104 by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of AJ Mahajan, # 3)(Mayer, Colette)
March 13, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE by Realtime Data LLC re #100 Order, Terminate Motions (Liao, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2017 Filing 108 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chung, C.)
March 6, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Wang, Philip)
March 6, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Storm, #3 Exhibit 1 to Storm Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Storm Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Storm Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Storm Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Storm Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Storm Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Storm Declaration)(Storm, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2017: #10 Revised Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES #51 NetApp and SolidFires MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/27/2017. (rlf)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES #54 Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court also DENIES NetApp and SolidFires alternative request for severance and transfer. The Court DENIES AS MOOT #101 NetApp and SolidFires Motion to Stay the Litigation Pending Resolution of NetApp and SolidFires Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/27/2017. (rlf)
February 23, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE by Fujitsu America, Inc. re #81 Reply to Response to Motion, #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit Defendant Fujitsu America, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder with Defendants NetApp, Inc. and Solidfire, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Inter Parties Review (Kim, Rudy)
February 15, 2017 Filing 102 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Quantum Corporation)(Folsom, David)
February 15, 2017 Filing 101 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Resolution of Defendants NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC's Motion to Transfer by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer, #3 Exhibit 1 to Mayer Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Mayer Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Mayer Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Mayer Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Mayer Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Mayer Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Mayer Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Mayer Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Mayer Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Mayer Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Mayer Decl., #14 Exhibit 12 to Mayer Decl.)(Mayer, Colette)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/15/2017. (rlf)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/14/17. (mll, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
February 13, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE by Quantum Corporation re #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit, #81 Reply to Response to Motion / Defendant Quantum Corporation's Notice of Joinder with Defendants NetApp, Inc. and Solidfire, Inc's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Novikov, Eugene)
February 13, 2017 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order by NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 13, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. re #81 Reply to Response to Motion, #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Joinder with Defendants NetApp and Solidfire, Inc.) (Storm, Paul)
February 13, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document #94 Rackspace US, Inc.'s Joinder with Defendants Netapp, Inc. and Solidfire, Inc.'s Motion to Stay submitted by Rackspace US, Inc. Wrong event used. Correction should be made within one business day. (rlf)
February 9, 2017 Filing 94 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***MOTION to Stay re #81 Reply to Response to Motion, #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit (Joinder with NetApp Inc. and Solidfire, Inc.) by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Storm, Paul) Modified on 2/13/2017 (rlf).
January 31, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE by Quantum Corporation OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING P.R. 4-1 (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
January 31, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rackspace US, Inc. P.R. 4-1 (Storm, Paul)
January 30, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fujitsu America, Inc. P.R. 4-1 (Tindel, Andy)
January 18, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE by Quantum Corporation of Compliance with Additional Disclosures (Craft, Roger)
January 18, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE by Rackspace US, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures (Storm, Paul)
January 18, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC of Compliance Regarding Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
January 17, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Fujitsu America, Inc. Additional Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
December 15, 2016 Filing 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
December 15, 2016 Filing 84 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Chung, C.)
December 8, 2016 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California in Support re #82 Reply to Response to Motion filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Realtime v. Dropbox - Dropbox Reply iso Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 Realtime v. Dropbox - Order Granting Motion to Transfer, #3 Exhibit 3 Map - Boulder to San Jose vs. Boulder to Tyler)(Mayer, Colette)
December 8, 2016 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
December 8, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Mayer, Colette)
December 1, 2016 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of RICHARD G. TASHJIAN, #2 Affidavit of PAUL A. KROEGER, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kroeger Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Kroeger Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Kroeger Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
December 1, 2016 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, C.)
November 28, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rackspace US, Inc. (Storm, Paul)
November 23, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Quantum Corporation OF COMPLIANCE WITH INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Craft, Roger)
November 23, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE by Fujitsu America, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Hubin, Daniel)
November 23, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Markman Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2017. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/4/2017. Jury Selection set for 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/16/2016. (gsg)
November 16, 2016 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2016. (srb)
November 15, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom, filed by Fujitsu America, Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
November 15, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of SolidFire, LLC (Lamb, William)
November 15, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of SolidFire, LLC (Smith, Melissa)
November 14, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of NetApp, Inc. (Lamb, William)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Realtime Data LLC. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Vembu Technologies, Inc and all counterclaims asserted by Defendant against Plaintiff are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/14/16. (mll, )
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/16. (mll, )
November 14, 2016 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Vembu Technologies, Inc. by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Realtime Data LLC's Notice of Mediator with regard to Fujitsu America, Inc., filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Realtime Data LLC proposes Hon. David Folsom and Rackspace US, Inc. proposes Hon. Jeff Kaplan, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom (with respect to Realtime Data LLC and Quantum Corporation), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom (with respect to Realtime Data LLC, NetApp, Inc. and SolidFire, LLC), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Henry, Claire)
November 14, 2016 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Entry of Case Management Documents by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed E-Discovery Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Discovery Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Protective Order)(Henry, Claire)
November 11, 2016 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Mayer, Colette)
November 11, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Change Venue Or, In The Alternative, Sever and Transfer Claims Against NetApp and SolidFire to Northern District of California by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John Engates, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Scott Dawkins)(Mayer, Colette)
November 11, 2016 Filing 53 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #52 Affidavit in Support of Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Mayer, Colette)
November 11, 2016 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit Declaration of Colette Reiner Mayer filed by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Mayer, Colette)
November 11, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review of Patents-In-Suit by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette)
November 11, 2016 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rackspace US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rackspace Hosting, Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC for Rackspace US, Inc.. (Storm, Paul)
November 11, 2016 Filing 49 Sealed Document. Realtime Data LLC's Certificate of Interested Parties. (Henry, Claire)
November 11, 2016 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Certificate of Interested Parties under seal by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
November 9, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE by SolidFire, LLC Certification of Interested Parties (Mayer, Colette)
November 9, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE by NetApp, Inc. Certification of Interested Parties (Mayer, Colette)
November 9, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE by Fujitsu America, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Hubin, Daniel)
November 8, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Quantum Corporation CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Craft, Roger)
November 7, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Marie Paxson on behalf of Rackspace US, Inc. (Paxson, Sarah)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/07/16. (mll, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
October 28, 2016 Filing 40 NetApp, Inc.'s and SolidFire, LLC's ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC.(Mayer, Colette)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying as moot #26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/26/16. (mll, )
October 25, 2016 Filing 38 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by Rackspace US, Inc..(Storm, Paul)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 11/16/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/24/16. (mll, )
October 19, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Clayton Hubin on behalf of Fujitsu America, Inc. (Hubin, Daniel)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:16cv961 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. All pending motions, with the exception of venue, are DENIED as moot, and shall be refiled in the lead case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/19/16. (mll, )
October 19, 2016 Consolidated Defendants added: Fujitsu America Inc, Quantum Corporation (6:16cv1035); Vembu Technologies Inc (6:16cv1037). (mll, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colette Reiner Mayer on behalf of NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC (Mayer, Colette)
October 11, 2016 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, LLC, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '506 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '728 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '867 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '992 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '530 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '513 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '908 Patent)(Henry, Claire)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Responses due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/20/16. (mll, )
September 16, 2016 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 6, 2016 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolidFire, LLC (Jacobs, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NetApp, Inc. (Jacobs, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint, by NetApp, Inc., SolidFire, LLC.(Jacobs, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.. (Storm, Paul)
September 6, 2016 Filing 26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rackspace US, Inc.. (Storm, Paul)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Party. SolidFire, LLC is substituted for SolidFire, Inc. as a defendant in this case. SolidFire, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/1/16. (mjc, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, LLC, filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '506 patent, #2 Exhibit B - '728 patent, #3 Exhibit C - '867 patent, #4 Exhibit D - '992 patent, #5 Exhibit E - '530 patent, #6 Exhibit F - '513 patent, #7 Exhibit G - '908 patent)(Henry, Claire)
August 30, 2016 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
August 23, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Kroeger, Paul)
August 23, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #21 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rackspace US, Inc. to 9/6/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 19, 2016 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace US, Inc..( Storm, Paul)
August 16, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NetApp, Inc. to 9/6/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
August 16, 2016 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NetApp, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant NetApp, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 8-22-2016. Service of process for NetApp, Inc. has been waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/01/16. (mll, )
July 29, 2016 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Waiver of Service by NetApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 25, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #14 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rackspace US, Inc. to 8/22/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to Rackspace US, Inc. on 7/1/2016, by personal service; answer due: 7/22/2016. (mll, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to NetApp, Inc. on 7/1/2016, by personal service; answer due: 7/22/2016. (mll, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to SolidFire, Inc. on 7/1/2016, by personal service; answer due: 7/22/2016. (mll, )
July 22, 2016 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rackspace US, Inc..( Storm, Paul)
July 19, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire)
June 30, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(mll, )
June 29, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Chung, C.)
June 29, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Liao, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ledahl, Brian)
June 29, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 29, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Fenster, Marc)
June 29, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Henry, Claire)
June 29, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Realtime Data LLC (Ward, Thomas)
June 29, 2016 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtime Data LLC (Fair, Andrea)
June 29, 2016 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Realtime Data LLC. (Fair, Andrea)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea)
June 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NetApp, Inc., Rackspace US, Inc., SolidFire, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5813904.), filed by Realtime Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 7,161,506, #3 Exhibit B - United States Patent No. 9,054,728, #4 Exhibit C - United States Patent No. 7,358,867, #5 Exhibit D - United States Patent No. 7,378,992, #6 Exhibit E - United States Patent No. 7,415,530, #7 Exhibit F - United States Patent No. 8,643,513, #8 Exhibit G - United States Patent No. 9,116,908)(Fair, Andrea)
June 29, 2016 Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realtime Data LLC v. Rackspace US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realtime Data LLC
Represented By: Christian W Conkle
Represented By: Philip X Wang
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Stanley H Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Represented By: James N Pickens
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace US, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetApp, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: Shaelyn K Dawson
Represented By: Christopher J Wiener
Represented By: Diek O Van Nort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolidFire, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Michael A Jacobs
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: Shaelyn K Dawson
Represented By: Christopher J Wiener
Represented By: Diek O Van Nort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackspace US, Inc.
Represented By: Paul V Storm
Represented By: Sarah Marie Paxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolidFire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vembu Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Rangarajan Sourirajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fujitsu America, Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Represented By: Rudy Y Kim
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Hubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Quantum Corporation
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Clement S Roberts
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?