Reneau v. Spur 248 Steak, LLC d/b/a Steak N Shake et al
Plaintiff: Sean Reneau
Defendant: Spur 248 Steak, LLC d/b/a Steak N Shake and Randall B. Hanson
Case Number: 6:2016cv01126
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 114 Report and Recommendations. All Defendants (with the exception of Spur 248 Steak, LLC, which is currently automatically stayed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362), are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/28/2019. (mjc, )
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 52 Report and Recommendations and denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sean Reneau. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/4/17. (mjc, )
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge as the findings and conclusions of this Court. Plaintiff's Motion for Potential Plaintiffs (Docket No. 24 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/24/2017. (rlf)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court DENIES 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The Court also STRIKES 38 Defendant's Amended Answer. The parties are advised to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this District. Specifically, Plaintiff is advised that a future failure to comply with the meet and confer requirements of Local Rule 7(h) will result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/6/2017. (rlf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reneau v. Spur 248 Steak, LLC d/b/a Steak N Shake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Reneau
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spur 248 Steak, LLC d/b/a Steak N Shake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall B. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?