REALTIME DATA LLC d/b/a IXO, v. Echostar Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: REALTIME DATA LLC d/b/a IXO,
Defendant: EchoStar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems, LLC
Consol_defendant: EchoStar Corporation and Hughes Network Systems LLC
Case Number: 6:2017cv00084
Filed: February 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 174 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Jagadish August 3, 2018 Non-infringement Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/29/2018. (saenz, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/25/18. (mll, )
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 42 Report and Recommendations, and granting-in-part and denying-in-part 28 Motion to Dismiss filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, EchoStar Corporation. Specifically, the Court DENIES EchoStar/ Hughes's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and GRANTS EchoStar/Hughes's Request for partial dismissal under Rule 12(b)(6). Realtime's claims of willful infringement and pre-suit indirect infringement are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/21/17. (mjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REALTIME DATA LLC d/b/a IXO, v. Echostar Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REALTIME DATA LLC d/b/a IXO,
Represented By: C. Jay Chung
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Brian D Ledahl
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EchoStar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Network Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: EchoStar Corporation
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Adam R Shartzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Hughes Network Systems LLC
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Adam R Shartzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?