Mancill et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Peter Mancill and Deborah Mancill
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc and Wright Medical Group Inc
Case Number: 6:2018cv00305
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 Scheduling conference held on 8/22/2018 before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Counsel in attendance were Rebecca Brightwell and Calvin Capshaw. (bas)
August 17, 2018 16 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order by Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 16, 2018 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Capshaw, Sidney)
August 16, 2018 14 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill . (Brightwell, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 13 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill . (Brightwell, Rebecca)
July 27, 2018 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan John O'Neil on behalf of Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (O'Neil, Ryan)
July 27, 2018 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean K Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Group Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc (Burke, Sean)
July 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2018 11:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/26/2018. (rlf)
July 9, 2018 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey M Weideman on behalf of All Defendants (Weideman, Corey)
June 26, 2018 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (rlf)
June 26, 2018 7 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-03705. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
June 22, 2018 6 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER directing that the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached to this Order, be transferred out of this MDL and remanded to the United States District Courts in which they were originally filed and from which they were transferred to the Court. The Clerk is directed to transfer the cases listed in Exhibit A to their respective District Courts. It is further ordered that the Clerk is directed to administratively close all cases listed in Exhibit B. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/22/18. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
April 3, 2018 5 SHORT FORM ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand of Deborah Mancill and Peter Mancill by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Discovery ends on 8/31/2018.(Ash, Dana) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
March 19, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed by Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 3/13/2018, answer due 4/3/2018; Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 3/13/2018, answer due 4/3/2018. (Brightwell, Rebecca) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
November 8, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca C. Brightwell on behalf of Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
September 22, 2017 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(dfb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]
September 22, 2017 1 ABBREVIATED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Deborah Mancill, Peter Mancill. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 113E-7401262.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancill et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology Inc
Represented By: Ryan John O'Neil
Represented By: Corey M Weideman
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Sean K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Ryan John O'Neil
Represented By: Corey M Weideman
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Sean K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mancill
Represented By: Rebecca C Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Mancill
Represented By: Rebecca C Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?