Stanton v. Jarvis Christian College, Inc.
Plaintiff: Akia Stanton
Defendant: Jarvis Christian College
Case Number: 6:2018cv00479
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John D Love
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Akia Stanton. Jarvis Christian College waiver sent on 9/15/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Britton, Katherine)
September 14, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (rlf)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (rlf)
September 14, 2018 Case transferred in from Lufkin Division on 9/14/2018 Case Number 9:18-cv-159., filed by Akia Stanton.(rlf)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Change Venue. The case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/14/18. (ljw, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by Akia Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Britton, Katherine)
September 12, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 3, Motion to Change Venue. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney must refile including either a Cert of Conference or wording to show the Court that the Defendant has not been served.*** (ljw, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE First MOTION to Change Venue by Akia Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Britton, Katherine) Modified on 9/13/2018 (ljw, ).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin per Standing Referral Order 72.4. (ljw, ) Modified on 9/11/2018 (ljw, ).
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Akia Stanton. (Britton, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6935202.), filed by Akia Stanton.(Britton, Katherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Jarvis Christian College, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarvis Christian College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akia Stanton
Represented By: Katherine Britton
Represented By: Katherine Elvira Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?