Reece v. Davis
Plaintiff: David Dewayne Reece
Defendant: Lori Davis
Case Number: 6:2018cv00584
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
2 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gretchen B. Merenda on behalf of Lori Davis (Merenda, Gretchen)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. Case reassigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield for all further proceedings. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/4/2018. (saenz, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by David Dewayne Reece on 11/20/2018 as to #4 Order, #5 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State. (mjc, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SERVICE by Lori Davis through the Attorney General for the State of Texas regarding #5 Order to Show Cause - Habeas Petition - State, by Laura Haney on 11/14/2018. (mjc, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HABEAS PETITION - STATE. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Copy of order to Edward Marshall and Laura Haney via electronic noticing including petition and any supporting documents.. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/13/2018. (mjc, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER construing #2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by David Dewayne Reece as a motion to proceed ifp and granting the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/13/2018. (mjc, )
November 8, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (Form mailed) (saenz, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge (saenz, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for David *Dewayne Reece. (saenz, ) *Modified on 11/8/2018 (saenz, ).
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by David *Dewayne Reece. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Corpus in Cause No 10F0086-202-A, #2 Motion to Subpoena in Cause No 10F0086-202-A, #3 Affidavit of Truth, #4 Envelope(s))(saenz, ) *Modified on 11/8/2018 (saenz, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dewayne Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?