Breshears et al v. ConocoPhillips Company et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Breshears and Lori Stroud
Defendant: The Vanguard Group, Inc., Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, ConocoPhillips Company and The Personal Representative of the Estate of Floyd Gilman, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00055
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT granting #16 Joint MOTION Final Judgment Entry of Agreed Judgment filed by Lori Stroud, Johnny Breshears. All relief not granted is expressly denied. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/24/2019. (mjc, )
April 22, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING. The Scheduling conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Parties filed joint motion for entry of agreed judgment. (leh, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION Final Judgment Entry of Agreed Judgment by Johnny Breshears, Lori Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Final Judgment)(Miller, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order - Corrected) (mjc, ).
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lori Stroud, Johnny Breshears. The Personal Representative of the Estate of Floyd Gilman, Jr. waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Miller, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019: #1 Waiver of Service - Ronald J Gilman) (rlf).
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company Certificate of Interested Parties (Sheridan, Matthew)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 5/2/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Parties are to submit an up-to-date Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, an agreed order related to the discovery and production of electronically stored information, and a Protective Order no later than 9:00 a.m. ten days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 4/2/2019. (mjc, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Filed by The Vanguard Group, Inc. and Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company by Johnny Breshears, Lori Stroud.(Miller, Brett)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim Filed by ConocoPhillips Company by Johnny Breshears, Lori Stroud.(Miller, Brett)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, and JOINDER of, COUNTERCLAIM AND CROSSCLAIM IN INTERPLEADER Filed by ConocoPhillips Company against Johnny Breshears, Lori Stroud, The Personal Representative of the Estate of Floyd Gilman, Jr. by The Vanguard Group, Inc., Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company.(Bishop, Gregory)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Bishop on behalf of The Vanguard Group, Inc., Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company (Bishop, Gregory)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ConocoPhillips Company.(Sales, Travis)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company. (mjc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Gerald Sheridan on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Sheridan, Matthew)
February 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (rlf)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company. (Sheridan, Matthew)
February 14, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (rlf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (Plaintiff's Original Petition as filed in the State Court action) against ConocoPhillips Company, The Personal Representative of the Estate of Floyd Gilman, Jr., The Vanguard Group, Inc., Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company, filed by Johnny Breshears, Lori Stroud.(rlf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ConocoPhillips Company from County Court at Law No. 2, case number 2019-102-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7141143), filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sales, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breshears et al v. ConocoPhillips Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vanguard Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Fiduciary Trust Company
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Travis James Sales
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Personal Representative of the Estate of Floyd Gilman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Breshears
Represented By: Brett Fisher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Stroud
Represented By: Brett Fisher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?