Jentzen v. Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Nathan Jentzen
Defendant: Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00068
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference re-set for 5/15/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/3/2019. (rlf)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Nathan Jentzen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hommel, William)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/26/2019. (rlf)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC. (Waters, Nancy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC.(Waters, Nancy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC. and emailed to plaintiff for service. (rlf)
February 27, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
February 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nathan Jentzen. (rlf)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (rlf)
February 27, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7158008.), filed by Nathan Jentzen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jentzen v. Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Jentzen
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Louise Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?