Hankerd v. State of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Hankerd
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and State of Tennessee
Case Number: 6:2019cv00195
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE /OBJECTIONS to #9 Order, by Kendra Hankerd. (mjc, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Kendra Hankerd extending the objection period to 6/30/2019 in order to allow Plaintiff an opportunity to secure counsel. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/29/2019. (mjc, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Allow the Case to Proceed and Issue Summons by Kendra Hankerd. (mjc, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Kendra Hankerd. (mjc, )
May 10, 2019 Mailed R&R #6 to Pltf via certified mail rrr, tracking no. 70183090000184390074. (mjc, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint filed by Kendra Hankerd, recommending this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court recommends that all other pending motions be DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff is warned that continuing to file frivolous lawsuits in this Court may result in filing restrictions being placed upon Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/9/2019. (mjc, )
May 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (gsg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Love (gsg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of case assignment. (gsg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendra Hankerd. (gsg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, State of Tennessee, filed by Kendra Hankerd.(gsg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendra Hankerd. (gsg) Modified on 5/6/2019 (gsg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hankerd v. State of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Hankerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?