Garrett et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Garrett and Shirley Webster Garrett
Defendant: Bill Bar, Nancy Pelosi, Administrative Office of the United States Court, United States of America, Chuck Schumer and Elizabeth Shumaker
Case Number: 6:2019cv00196
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Dwayne Garrett. (mjc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Dwayne Garrett on 6/21/2019 as to #8 Judgment, #7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations.(mjc, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail, R&R #4 , sent to Dwayne Garrett. Note: Unclaimed. (mjc, )
June 18, 2019 Mailed Order #7 and Final Judgment #8 to Dwayne Garrett via certified mail rrr, tracking no. 70183090000184390203, and to Shirley Webster Garrett via certified mail rrr, tracking no. 70183090000184390296. (mjc, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and all pending motions are denied as moot. All claims, counterclaims and third-party claims in this suit are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety. Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/17/2019. (mjc, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court orders all other pending motions denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/17/2019. (mjc, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by Dwayne Garrett, Shirley Webster Garrett. (mjc, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Shirley Webster Garrett on 5/28/2019 as to #4 Report and Recommendations. (mjc, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #1 Complaint, filed by Shirley Webster Garrett, Dwayne Garrett. The Court RECOMMENDS that the above captioned action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Furthermore, the Court RECOMMENDS that all other pending motions be DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/22/2019. (gsg)
May 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiffs. (mjc, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mjc, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Administrative Office of the United States Court, Bill Bar, Nancy Pelosi, Chuck Schumer, Elizabeth Shumaker, United States of America. (mjc, )
May 6, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-47163. (mjc, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrative Office of the United States Court, Bill Bar, Nancy Pelosi, Chuck Schumer, Elizabeth Shumaker, United States of America, filed by Shirley Webster Garrett, Dwayne Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Documents, #2 Exhibit - EDTX Lawsuit)(mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Webster Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Office of the United States Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?