Johnson v. Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Glendale Johnson
Defendant: Ryan C. Hoerauf and Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas
Case Number: 6:2019cv00205
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Glendale Johnson. Ryan C. Hoerauf served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(Hommel, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ryan C. Hoerauf with attachment)(Rouse, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District Judge J. Campbell Barker for all further proceedings. District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/28/19. (tkd, )
May 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas Glendale Johnson. (rlf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Ryan C. Hoerauf)(mjc, )
May 8, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan C. Hoerauf, Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7260380.), filed by Thomas Glendale Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Glendale Johnson
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C. Hoerauf
Represented By: Richard Layne Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan C. Hoerauf, Inc. d/b/a O'Ryan Oil & Gas
Represented By: Richard Layne Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?