Coker v. Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO.
Plaintiff: Jason Coker
Defendant: Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00211
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO..( Mazingo, Jason)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District Judge J. Campbell Barker for all further proceedings. District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/28/19. (tkd, )
June 4, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. to 7/8/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO..( Mazingo, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Coker. Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (gsg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. and emailed to Plaintiff for service. (rlf)
May 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
May 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jason Coker. (rlf)
May 10, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (rlf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7263820.), filed by Jason Coker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO.
Represented By: Jason Dwain Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Coker
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?