Noble v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edd Noble
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00230
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Seger, Forrest)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Seger, Forrest)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Receivables Performance Management, LLC (Malone, Robbie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Receivables Performance Management, LLC.(Malone, Robbie)
June 20, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Equifax Information Services, LLC to 7/15/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Equifax Information Services, LLC.( Seger, Forrest)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edd Noble. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edd Noble. Receivables Performance Management, LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Receivables Performance Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Receivables)(gsg)
May 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
May 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edd Noble. (rlf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (rlf)
May 24, 2019 District Judge J. Campbell Barker and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (rlf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Receivables Performance Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7282338.), filed by Edd Noble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Receivables Performance Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Performance Management, LLC
Represented By: Robbie LuAnn Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edd Noble
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?