Curry v. Conn Credit Corporation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Devan Curry
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC and Conn Credit Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00247
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Trans Union LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TransUnion, LLC.(Merar, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Conn Credit Corporation, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Ingle, Earl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Conn Credit Corporation, Inc..(Ingle, Earl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Diane)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Myers, Diane)
July 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TransUnion, LLC to 7/26/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax, Inc. (Seger, Forrest)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax, Inc..(Seger, Forrest)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Merar, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TransUnion, LLC.( Merar, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devan Curry. TransUnion, LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devan Curry. Equifax, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devan Curry. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devan Curry. Conn Credit Corporation, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Conn Credit Corporation, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Equifax, #2 Summons(es) - Experian, #3 Summons(es) - TransUnion)(mjc, )
June 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Devan Curry. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Frank Howard Kerney, III on behalf of Devan Curry. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7296447. (Kerney, Frank)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7296371.), filed by Devan Curry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) Conn Credit Corporation, Inc., #3 Summons(es) Equifax, Inc., #4 Summons(es) Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #5 Summons(es) TransUnion, LLC, #6 Exhibit A - Reliable Lloyds Insurance Company Letter)(Kersey, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Conn Credit Corporation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Diane LaRue Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Michael Adam Merar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Credit Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Earl L. Ingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devan Curry
Represented By: Joshua Ryan Kersey
Represented By: Frank Howard Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?