Nooner v. State Of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner
Defendant: Judge FNU Harris, Judge FNU Schewski, Judge FNU Ray, Judge FNU Wilson, Judge FNU Cavaneal, Craighead County Circuit Court, Judge FNU Barnes, Judge FNU Holmes, Judge FNU Volpe, Judge FNU Bryant, Judge Bill Webster, Judge FNU Jetser, Judge FNU Marshall, Jr, Judge O Hickey, Judge FNU Holmes, III, Judge Richard Sheppard Arnold, JUDGE FNU Baker, Judge FNU Ford, FNU Judge Kearney, Judge FNU Dawson, Judge FNU Wright, Judge FNU Moody, Jr, Judge FNU Miller, Judge FNU Deere and State of Arkansas
Case Number: 6:2019cv00252
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to the Eastern District of Arkansas Western Division; Their Case No. 4:19-CV-00389, filed 6.6.2019. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF PARTIAL SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER. It is accordingly ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the State of Arkansas, Judge FNU Bryant, Chief Judge FNU Miller, Judge FNU Holmes, Judge FNU Marshall, Jr., Judge FNU Moody, Jr., Judge FNU Wilson, Judge FNU Wright, Judge FNU Ray, Judge FNU Cavaneal, Judge FNU Deere, Judge FNU Harris, Judge FNU Kearney, Judge FNU Volpe, Judge FNU Holmes, III, Judge O. Hickey, Judge FNU Schewski, Judge FNU Barnes, Judge FNU Ford, Judge FNU Baker, Judge FNU Jetser, Judge FNU Dawson, Judge Richard Sheppard Arnold, Judge Bill Webster, and the Craighead County Circuit Court are SEVERED from this lawsuit and TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Western Division forthwith and without delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/5/2019. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee of $$3.20 within 30 days. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/5/2019. (rlf)
June 5, 2019 ***DEFENDANTS SEVERED FROM CASE NUMBER 6:19-CV-00243: State of Arkansas, Judge FNU Bryant, Chief Judge FNU Miller, Judge FNU Holmes, Judge FNU Marshall, Jr., Judge FNU Moody, Jr., Judge FNU Wilson, Judge FNU Wright, Judge FNU Ray, Judge FNU Cavaneal, Judge FNU Deere, Judge FNU Harris, Judge FNU Kearney, Judge FNU Volpe, Judge FNU Holmes, III, Judge O. Hickey, Judge FNU Schewski, Judge FNU Barnes, Judge FNU Ford, Judge FNU Baker, Judge FNU Jetser, Judge FNU Dawson, Judge Richard Sheppard Arnold, Judge Bill Webster, and the Craighead County Circuit Court.*** (rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Terrick Nooner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (with Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets) by Terrick Nooner. (rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Terrick Nooner. (rlf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Sheppard Arnold, FNU Baker, FNU Barnes, FNU Bryant, FNU Cavaneal, Craighead County Circuit Court, FNU Dawson, FNU Deere, FNU Ford, FNU Harris, O Hickey, FNU Holmes, III, FNU Holmes, FNU Jetser, FNU Judge Kearney, FNU Marshall, Jr, FNU Miller, FNU Moody, Jr, FNU Ray, FNU Schewski, State Of Texas, State of Arkansas, FNU Volpe, Bill Webster, FNU Wilson, FNU Wright, filed by Terrick Nooner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Summons)(rlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nooner v. State Of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Schewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Cavaneal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Bill Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Jetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Marshall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge O Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Holmes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Richard Sheppard Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE FNU Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Judge Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Moody, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge FNU Deere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrick Nooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?