Johnson v. Gregg County Sheriff Dept., et al
Plaintiff: Korea Witcher Johnson
Defendant: Cobb County Juvenile Court, Cobb County Georgia Department of Family and Children Services, Cobb County Sheriff Department and Gregg County Sheriff Department
Case Number: 6:2019cv00308
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Korea Johnson as to Order #12 (gsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remove the use of the United States Postal Service for service in case 6:19-cv-308 by Korea Witcher Johnson. (ksd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the United States Magistrate Judge re #1 Complaint, filed by Korea Witcher Johnson. It is recommended that the complaint be dismissed with prejudice Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/5/2019. (gsg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to protect this case by Korea Witcher Johnson. (mjc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to obtain the identity of the judge who "ordered my abduction" to add her as a defendant in this case by Korea Witcher Johnson. (mjc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to add the transport company and guards as defendants by Korea Witcher Johnson. (mjc, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cobb County Georgia Department of Family and Children Services, Cobb County Juvenile Court, Cobb County Sheriff Department, Gregg County Sheriff Department, filed by Korea Witcher Johnson.(mjc, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Korea Witcher Johnson on 7/25/2019 as to #5 Order, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (gsg)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/22/2019. (gsg)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO REPLEAD re #1 Complaint, filed by Korea Witcher Johnson. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this Order to file an Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/22/2019. (gsg)
July 10, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (ksd )
July 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Korea Witcher Johnson. (ksd)
July 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **CONSENT FORM MAILED TO PLAINTIFF.** (ksd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (ksd )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Korea Witcher Johnson. (ksd )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cobb County Georgia Department of Family and Children Services, Cobb County Juvenile Court, Cobb County Sheriff Department, Gregg County Sheriff Department filed by Korea Witcher Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksd ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #3 Supplement) (ksd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Gregg County Sheriff Dept., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Juvenile Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Georgia Department of Family and Children Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korea Witcher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?