Mack v. RPC, Inc.
Plaintiff: Coris Mack
Defendant: RPC, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00319
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of RPC, Inc. (Thompson, Gregory)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RPC, Inc.. RPC, Inc. waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Thompson, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mjc, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Coris Mack. (Mayfield, Marc)
July 17, 2019 District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mjc, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7351843.), filed by Coris Mack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayfield, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. RPC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coris Mack
Represented By: Marc Christopher Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPC, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?